Mayberry v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mariah Lyn Mayberry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00038
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mariah Lyn Mayberry: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (3/12/2021); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (3/2/2021); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (3/1/2021) on 3/12/2021; 3/2/2021; 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Larkin, Robin)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk of the Court assigned this case to the expedited track, pursuant to the Local Rules of Practice for this Court, LRCiv 16.2 (b) (1) (A) (i). Review attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 3/11/2021. (MCO)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie A. Bowman for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation, in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and LRCiv. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-21-00038-TUC-RM (LAB). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/10/2021. (MCO)
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-00038-TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol)
March 4, 2021 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 2/2/2021. (MCO)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A. Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-38-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Mariah Lyn Mayberry. (Larkin, Robin) (MCO)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mariah Lyn Mayberry. (Larkin, Robin) (MCO)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW filed by Mariah Lyn Mayberry. (Larkin, Robin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayberry v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Lyn Mayberry
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?