Gonzales v. Borderland Construction Company Incorporated
Plaintiff: Perla Gonzales
Defendant: Borderland Construction Company Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00139
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Referring Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Perla Gonzales: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/14/21 to Borderland Construction Company, Inc. . (Hunt, Marshall)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, this action is referred to Magistrate Judge Lynnette C. Kimmins for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings in this case shall be designated, as follows: CV 21-139 TUC DCB (LCK). (see Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 5/6/2021. (MCO)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge David C Bury. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-139-TUC-DCB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbe Morrison Goncharsky on behalf of Borderland Construction Company Incorporated. (Goncharsky, Abbe)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 8, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Courtney Lowery on behalf of Plaintiff Perla Gonzales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 8, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Josh Sanford on behalf of Plaintiff Perla Gonzales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Perla Gonzales. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Borderland Construction Company Incorporated. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19308138. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-139-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Perla Gonzales. (Hunt, Marshall) (JAM)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19308138 filed by Perla Gonzales. (Hunt, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Borderland Construction Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borderland Construction Company Incorporated
Represented By: Abbe Morrison Goncharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Gonzales
Represented By: Marshall Ray Hunt
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Courtney Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?