Ash et al v. Pima, County of et al
Plaintiff: Tris Ash and Michael Ash
Defendant: Pima, County of, Unknown Parties, Andrew Cecil, Oscar Pierson, Seth Svob and Fernando Aguilar
Case Number: 4:2021cv00391
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pima, County of. (Petersen, Andrew)
August 18, 2022 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tris Ash, Michael Ash.(Redmon, Nathaniel)
August 17, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Michael Ash, Tris Ash. Incorrect event selected: Motion to Amend/Correct found in the Motions and Related Filings category. Correct event: Amended Complaint found in the Complaints and Other Initiating Documents category. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file using the correct event. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
August 12, 2022 Filing 23 *First MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Tris Ash. (Redmon, Nathaniel) *Modified to remove motion type on 8/17/2022 (ARC).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Within seven days, Plaintiffs may file the Amended Complaint. It is further ordered that Defendants may file an Answer to the Amended Complaint within 21 days of service of the Amended Complaint upon the four additional Defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 8/4/2022. (ARC)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting the #19 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the following deadlines are extended: Disclosure of lay witnesses to November 14, 2022; Disclosure of expert witnesses to November 1, 2022; and Completion of all discovery, supplemental disclosure, and discovery responsesto December 30, 2022. All other deadlines in the Court's scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/29/22. (JAM)
July 29, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Defendant Pima, County of. (Petersen, Andrew)
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Amend)(Petersen, Andrew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Michael Ash, Tris Ash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Redmon, Nathaniel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions Joint Settlement Status Report by Michael Ash, Tris Ash. (Redmon, Nathaniel)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pima, County of. (Petersen, Andrew)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Ordered by Senior Judge Raner C Collins.(BEM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that the Case Management Conference, currently set for Tuesday, April 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. Counsel shall submit to the Court a brief Joint Settlement Status Report on or before Friday, July 15, 2022 and every 90 days thereafter. All discovery, including answers to interrogatories, production of documents, depositions, and requests for admissions, must be completed by Saturday, October 01, 2022. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before Tuesday, November 15, 2022. Counsel shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before Thursday, December 01, 2022, unless dispositive motions are filed. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 4/7/2022. (See Order for complete details)(ARC)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time Stipulated MTC CMC by Tris Ash. (Redmon, Nathaniel)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tris Ash, Michael Ash. (Redmon, Nathaniel) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 4/6/2022 (ARC).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for Tuesday, April 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least twenty-one (21) days before the Case Management Conference. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report with the Court no later than seven (7) days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 2/22/2022. (See Order for complete details)(ARC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Pima, County of.(Petersen, Andrew)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pima County for negligence, wrongful death, and respondeat superior are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint is due 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 2/8/22. (JAM)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca K O'Brien on behalf of Pima, County of. (O'Brien, Rebecca)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Ellen Ridge Brown. (Brown, Ellen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Petersen on behalf of Pima, County of. (Petersen, Andrew)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #4 ) is granted. Defendant must file an answer to the Complaint within 14 days after the Court rules on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 10/4/2021. (ARC)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Mtn. for Extension of Time to File Answer)(Morlacci, Maria)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : All state law claims Partial Motion to Dismiss by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Good Faith Consultation Certificate)(Morlacci, Maria)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20213870. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19919915 filed by Pima, County of. (Morlacci, Maria) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 A to Notice of Removal)(BAC)
September 30, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule 102(a) Fastar Certificate upon Pima County on 9/14/21. (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ash et al v. Pima, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tris Ash
Represented By: Nathaniel Scott Redmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ash
Represented By: Nathaniel Scott Redmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima, County of
Represented By: Maria Morlacci
Represented By: Andrew James Petersen
Represented By: Ellen Ridge Brown
Represented By: Rebecca K O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Svob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?