Majalca-Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dionne Majalca-Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00447
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-00447-TUC-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Oum, Sathya)
November 19, 2021 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. Within sixty (60) days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff shall file an opening brief in support of his claim that the Administrative Law Judge and Appeals Council erred in finding the Plaintiff was not under a disability. Within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 11/2/21. (CKS)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is GRANTED, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 11/2/21. (CKS)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C. Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00447-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Dionne Majalca-Williams. (Miller, Audrey) (SCA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dionne Majalca-Williams. (Miller, Audrey) (SCA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dionne Majalca-Williams.(Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majalca-Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Majalca-Williams
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?