Kastigar et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard J Kastigar, Jr. and Denise Kastigar
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International Incorporated, Mercedes-Benz AG, Mercedes-Benz Research & Development North America and Daimler AG
Case Number: 4:2021cv00501
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr: Proof of Service re: S&C upon MB International Inc., MB Research & Development on 01/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Cohen, Avinoam)
January 28, 2022 Filing 20 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (DLC)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. The deadline for Mercedes-Benz, USA, LLC, and Mercedes-Benz Research & Development North America to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including 2/9/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 1/26/22. (JAM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER or MOTION to Dismiss by Mercedes-Benz Research & Development North America, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER)(Petersen, Bradley) *Modified docket text to match document title on 1/27/2022 (JAM).
January 19, 2022 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Mercedes Benz USA LLC on 01/05/2022. (Cohen, Avinoam)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EX PARTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appoint International Process Server. Plaintiffs are permitted to effect service of process on Defendants pursuant to the provisions of the Hague Convention. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 1/11/22. (JAM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 EX PARTE MOTION to Appoint International Process Server by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Avinoam)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 Document was filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 1/10/2022 (ARC).
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Second MOTION to Appoint International Process Server filed by Richard J Kastigar, Jr., Denise Kastigar. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 *Second MOTION to Appoint International Process Server by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. (Cohen, Avinoam) *Modified to remove Ex Parte designation. Modified to reflect incorrect PDF attached, attorney notified to refile on 1/4/2022 (ARC).
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 MOTION to Appoint Order Appointing International Process Server filed by Richard J Kastigar, Jr., Denise Kastigar. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
December 30, 2021 Filing 10 *MOTION to Appoint Order Appointing International Process Server by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. (Cohen, Avinoam) *Modified to remove Ex Parte designation. Modified to reflect incorrect PDF attached, attorney notified to refile on 1/3/2022 (ARC).
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 *Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)*Modified on 12/14/2021 to reflect correct file date (DLC).
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Revised Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. (Cohen, Avinoam)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz AG, Mercedes-Benz Research & Development North America, Mercedes-Benz US International Incorporated, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Richard J Kastigar, Jr., Denise Kastigar. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Richard J Kastigar, Jr., Denise Kastigar. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20127052. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D. Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-501-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. (Cohen, Avinoam) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MCO)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20127052 filed by Richard J Kastigar, Jr, Denise Kastigar. (Cohen, Avinoam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO)
December 6, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Avinoam Cohen on behalf of Plaintiffs Denise Kastigar, Richard J Kastigar, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kastigar et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Kastigar, Jr.
Represented By: Avinoam Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kastigar
Represented By: Avinoam Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Bradley W Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz US International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Research & Development North America
Represented By: Bradley W Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?