Becerra v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dorothy Becerra
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00045
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Referring Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting unopposed #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration shall file the Answer and Administrative Record on or before 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 03/23/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HM)
March 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint unopposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Oum, Sathya)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins for all pretrial proceedings and a report and recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and 72.2. of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-22-00045-TUC-SHR (LCK). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/22/22. (JAM)
March 18, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Scott H Rash. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-00045-TUC-SHR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Oum, Sathya)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form resent and deadline reset (x2). (DLC)
February 9, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. Within sixty (60) days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff shall file an opening brief in support of his claim that the Administrative Law Judge and Appeals Council erred in finding the Plaintiff was not under a disability. Within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 1/31/22. (CKS)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is GRANTED, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 1/31/22. (CKS)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-45-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Dorothy Becerra. (Miller, Audrey) (JAM)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dorothy Becerra. (Miller, Audrey) (JAM)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dorothy Becerra. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becerra v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Becerra
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?