Gann et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Gann, Jason Nelson and Brent Darnell
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00080
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 24 Defendant General Motors LLC's ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Fischer, C)
April 8, 2022 Filing 23 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Richard Gann, Jason Nelson, Brent Darnell. (Shumway, G) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 4/11/2022 (ARC).
April 6, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Richard Gann . (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Shumway, G)
April 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Gann. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
April 5, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants filed by Richard Gann.(Shumway, G)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Eric J. Markovich for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation, in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and LRCiv. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-22-80-TUC-RM(EJM). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/21/2022. (ARC)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-80-TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that a telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on April 28, 2022 at 3:00 PM, before United States Magistrate Judge Markovich's law clerk, Sara Demers. The conference call shall be initiated by Plaintiff's attorney, with all of the parties on the line. Pursuant to Rule 26(f), counsel are directed to meet and confer at least 21 days prior to the conference. The parties shall file with the Court, on or before April 21, 2022, a joint report reflecting the results of their conference.Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 3/17/22. (See attached Order for complete details)(JAM)
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Fischer, C)
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 9, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Theresa Varin Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Richard Gann. (Shumway, G)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form resent and deadline reset (x2). (DLC)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED re: Certificate of Service on General Motors by Plaintiff Richard Gann. (Shumway, G) *Modified to correct event type and modified docket text to match document title on 3/2/2022 (JAM).
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Redacted Complaint by Richard Gann . (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Redacted Complaint)(Shumway, G)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiffs' Complaint under seal. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs shall file a redacted copy of the complaint, redacting photographs of the minors. A Notice of Filing Redacted Complaint, with the redacted complaint as the main document, should be filed electronically using the Notice (Other) event. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 2/17/22. (KAH)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20350153. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-80-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brent Darnell, Richard Gann, Jason Nelson. (Shumway, G) (ARC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20350153 filed by Richard Gann, Brent Darnell, Jason Nelson. (Shumway, G) (KAH) Modified on 2/17/2022 to seal per Operations Manager per pending order to seal (KAH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gann et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gann
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Nelson
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Darnell
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?