Estados Unidos Mexicanos v. Diamondback Shooting Sports Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Estados Unidos Mexicanos
Defendant: Diamondback Shooting Sports Incorporated, SNG Tactical LLC, Loan Prairie LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Hub, Ammo A-Z LLC and Sprague's Sports Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2022cv00472
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint All Defendants. IT IS ORDERED, all Defendants have until 1/13/23 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. If a motion to dismiss is filed in response to the Complaint, Plaintiff shall be permitted 60 days to file a response to the motion and Defendants shall have 30 days to file a reply. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/13/22. (BAC)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Neal, Ryan)
November 18, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jon Lowy on behalf of Plaintiff Estados Unidos Mexicanos. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Loan Prairie, LLC d/b/a The Hub on 11/14/22. (Shadowen, Steve)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon SnG Tactical, LLC on 10/26/22. (Shadowen, Steve)
November 14, 2022 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civl Cover Sheet upon Sprague's Sports, Inc. on 10/20/22. (Shadowen, Steve)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Diamondback Shooting Sports, Inc on 10/24/22. (Shadowen, Steve)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Ammo A-Z on 10/21/22. (Shadowen, Steve)
October 28, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorneys Deirdre Mulligan, Jonathan Lowy, and Nicholas Shadowen terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Cindy K Jorgenson. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-00472-TUC-CKJ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
October 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tina J Miranda on behalf of Plaintiff Estados Unidos Mexicanos. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 21, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steve D Shadowen on behalf of Plaintiff Estados Unidos Mexicanos. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ammo A-Z LLC, Diamondback Shooting Sports Incorporated, Loan Prairie LLC, SNG Tactical LLC, Sprague's Sports Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 10, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21188449. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-472-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
October 10, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (O'Neal, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21188449 filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (O'Neal, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estados Unidos Mexicanos v. Diamondback Shooting Sports Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estados Unidos Mexicanos
Represented By: Deirdre R Mulligan
Represented By: Jonathan Lowy
Represented By: Nicholas W Shadowen
Represented By: Ryan Douglas O'Neal
Represented By: Steve D Shadowen
Represented By: Tina J Miranda
Represented By: Jon Lowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamondback Shooting Sports Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNG Tactical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Prairie LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Hub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammo A-Z LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprague's Sports Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?