United States of America v. 46,990 in Tether ("USDT") et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 46,990 in Tether ("USDT"), 9,9990 in Binance Coin ("BNB"), 319,112,718 in BitTorrent Chain ("BTTC"), 102,070,628.68 in SHIBA INU ("SHIB"), 1,253.602517 in Fantom ("FTM"), 3.998335 in Ethereum ("ETH"), 145,400.1033 in Tether ("USDT"), 305,871.433 in Monetha ("MTH"), 45,838.48318 in Dogecoin ("DOGE"), 63,850 in Tether ("USDT"), 2.83040268 in BTC Bitcoin ("BTC") and 77.72361915 in ETC Ethereum Classic ("ETC")
Claimant: David Morthland
Case Number: 4:2022cv00493
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed 3/6/23, judgment is entered awarding all right, title, and interest in the Defendant Cryptocurrencies to Claimant David Morthland. United States shall promptly return the Defendant Cryptocurrencies to Claimant. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorney's fees, and expenses. This action is closed. (BAC)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, The Court adopts the Parties' Stipulation for Compromise Settlement (Doc. #16 -1) as its findings of fact. The United States' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment Awarding All Right, Title, and Interest in Defendants to the Sole Claimant, David Morthland is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment awarding all right, title, and interest in the Defendant Cryptocurrencies to Claimant David Morthland, and close this action. Upon entry of this Judgment, the United States shall promptly return the Defendant Cryptocurrencies to Claimant. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorneys fees, and expenses. Based upon the allegations set forth in the Complaint filed on 10/24/22, and the Parties' Stipulation for Compromise Settlement, the Court hereby enters this Certificate of Reasonable Cause under 28 USC 2465, and finds the United States had reasonable cause to seize and arrest the Defendant Cryptocurrencies, and commence and prosecute this forfeiture action against the Defendant Cryptocurrencies. This Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/6/23. (BAC)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Bostwick, Reese)
January 23, 2023 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shyam Batra, Rambilas Ramtej, Rohit Sharma. (BAC)
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against Rohit Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bostwick, Reese)
January 6, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against Rambilas Ramtej. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bostwick, Reese)
January 6, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against Shyam Batra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bostwick, Reese)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Publication by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Bostwick, Reese)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Notice of Service re: Notice of Forfeiture Action upon Rohit Sharma on 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bostwick, Reese)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Notice of Service re: Notice of Forfeiture Action upon Rambilas Ramtej on 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bostwick, Reese)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Notice of Service re: Notice of Forfeiture Action upon Shyam Batra on 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bostwick, Reese)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Certified Mail Receipt re: Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem upon David Morthland on 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bostwick, Reese)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Claimed Property by David Morthland. (BAC)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Notice of Service re: Warrant of Arrest In Rem upon 46,990 in Tether ("USDT"), et al. on 11/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bostwick, Reese)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-493-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by United States of America. (Bostwick, Reese) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 46,990 in Tether ("USDT") et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reese Valiant Bostwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 46,990 in Tether ("USDT")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9,9990 in Binance Coin ("BNB")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 319,112,718 in BitTorrent Chain ("BTTC")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 102,070,628.68 in SHIBA INU ("SHIB")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1,253.602517 in Fantom ("FTM")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.998335 in Ethereum ("ETH")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 145,400.1033 in Tether ("USDT")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 305,871.433 in Monetha ("MTH")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45,838.48318 in Dogecoin ("DOGE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 63,850 in Tether ("USDT")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.83040268 in BTC Bitcoin ("BTC")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 77.72361915 in ETC Ethereum Classic ("ETC")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Morthland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?