Arizona, State of et al v. Michael D Lansky LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of, Alabama, State of, Arkansas, State of, People for the State of California, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Hawaii, State of, Idaho, State of, People of the State of Illinois, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Louisiana, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland Office of Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, People of the State of Michigan, Minnesota, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, Nevada, State of, New Hampshire, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, People of the State of New York, North Carolina, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Oregon, State of, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, State of, South Carolina, State of, Tennessee, State of, Texas, State of, Utah Division of Consumer Protection, Vermont, State of, Commonwealth of Virginia, Washington, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wisconsin, State of and Wyoming, State of
Defendant: Michael D Lansky LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Avid Telecom, Michael D Lansky individually as a Member/Manager/Chief Executive Officer of Michael D Lansky LLC doing business as Avid Telecom and Stacy S Reeves individually as a Manager/Vice President of Michael D Lansky LLC doing business as Avid Telecom
Case Number: 4:2023cv00233
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Referring Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, the #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Defendants shall have a 35 page limit on their responsive pleading. The Unopposed #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Refer is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Refer is extended to 11/6/23. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/16/23. (BAC)
October 13, 2023 Filing 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Stay and Refer by Indiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeoman, Joseph)
October 13, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Joseph Hubble filed by Alyse Meislik. (Meislik, Alyse)
October 13, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyse Meislik on behalf of Arizona, State of. (Meislik, Alyse)
October 6, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay and Refer by Michael D Lansky LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tracebacks)(Ende, Neil)
October 6, 2023 Filing 29 LODGED Proposed re: #28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Michael D Lansky LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Threatening Emails, #2 Exhibit Robocall Mitigation Plan, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Stacey S. Reeves, #4 Proposed Order)(Ende, Neil)
October 6, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Michael D Lansky LLC. (Ende, Neil)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING as moot #25 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/5/23. (BAC)
October 2, 2023 Filing 26 *SUPPLEMENTAL Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michael D Lansky, Michael D Lansky LLC, and Stacy S Reeves. (Ende, Neil) *Modified to correct filers and correct event type on 10/3/2023 (MYE).
October 2, 2023 Filing 25 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michael D Lansky, Michael D Lansky LLC, and Stacy S Reeves. (Ende, Neil) *Modified to correct filers on 10/3/2023 (MYE).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, the #20 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, extending the time to defend for 21 days from the filing date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, the #19 Application for Entry of Default is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 9/14/23. (BAC)
September 14, 2023 Filing 23 *RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' #19 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Defendant Michael D Lansky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mathew Albaugh - Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application Motion for Extension of Time - Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Silsa Cabezas, #4 Exhibit Summary of Defense to Complaint - Ex 4) (Ende, Neil) *Modified to correct event type on 9/15/2023 (BAC).
September 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Neil S Ende on behalf of Defendants Michael D Lansky LLC, Stacy S Reeves (dba Avid Telecom). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Indiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeoman, Joseph)
September 8, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO DOCKETING OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND REQUEST FOR ACCEPTANCE NUMC PRO TUNC by Michael D Lansky . (Ende, Neil)
September 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time by Michael D Lansky. (Ende, Neil)
September 8, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Indiana, State of against Defendants Michael D. Lansky, L.L.C, dba Avid Telecom, Michael D. Lansky, and Stacey S. Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeoman, Joseph)
September 5, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brendan T Flynn on behalf of Plaintiff Connecticut, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 3, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James M Rankin on behalf of Plaintiff Mississippi, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Asa Edwards on behalf of Plaintiff North Carolina, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 31, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Texas, State of . (Johnson, Wade)
July 28, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Deepta Janardhan on behalf of Plaintiff New Jersey, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED, Lee Stein, Anne Chapman and Mitchell Stein Carey Chapman, PC shall be removed from the official service list for this action, and as recipient for email through the CM/ECF system. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/21/23. (BAC)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for 45 days. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint shall be extended to 9/7/23. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/21/23. (BAC)
July 21, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorneys Kim Carlson McGee, Deepta Janardhan and James Rankin terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 20, 2023 Filing 15 EX PARTE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stacy S Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Stein, Lee)
July 11, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney Emily Barth terminated as counsel of record per attorney request, party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiffs' complaint by Stacy S Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stein, Lee) *Modified to correct event type on 7/12/2023 (BAC).
July 10, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Geoffrey L Ward on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Virginia. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 29, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jacqueline Ortiz on behalf of Plaintiff New Mexico, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 23, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Timothy Lundgren on behalf of Plaintiff People for the State of California. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Benjamin E Bellus, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Iowa, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee David Stein on behalf of Stacy S Reeves. (Stein, Lee)
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona, State of: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/23/2023 to Michael Lansky and AVID Telecom . (Dilweg, Laura)
June 16, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bernard Ardavan Eskandari on behalf of Plaintiff People for the State of California. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 16, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Donald J Haas on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Kentucky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Austin Ostiguy, Tyler Corcoran on behalf of Plaintiff Tennessee, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bianca Feierstein on behalf of Plaintiff Colorado, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 13, 2023 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona, State of: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 23, 2023 to Stacey Reeves . (Dilweg, Laura)
June 13, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nicklas Arnold Akers on behalf of Plaintiff People for the State of California. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 9, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Tambling on behalf of Plaintiff Alabama, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #9 Motion for Leave to Appear due to incorrectly being filed directly into civil case. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 8, 2023 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wade A. Johnson by Texas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wade)
June 8, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Wade A Johnson, David Shatto on behalf of Plaintiff Texas, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 7, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam Teitelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff District of Columbia. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 6, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kathleen Hyland, Erin Bridget Leahy on behalf of Plaintiffs Maryland Office of Attorney General, Ohio, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 6, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Philip Ziperman, Stephen Nicholas Provazza on behalf of Plaintiffs Maryland Office of Attorney General, Rhode Island, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Cindy K Jorgenson. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-233-TUC-CKJ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 2, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David Zisook, Benjamin Michael Peterson on behalf of Plaintiffs Georgia, State of, Wyoming, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kristin M Simons, Danielle Alicia Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff South Carolina, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brandon James Bingle, Matthew Edward Willoughby, Jordan Roberts on behalf of Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Oklahoma, State of, Oregon, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey Alan Koziar on behalf of Plaintiff New Jersey, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kevin McLean, Ted Hobson on behalf of Plaintiffs Utah Division of Consumer Protection, Vermont, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Glenna Goldis on behalf of Plaintiff People of the State of New York. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tracy Nayer, Danielle Wilburn Allen, Elin Alm, Parrell D Grossman on behalf of Plaintiffs North Carolina, State of, North Dakota, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mina Shahin, Alexandra Kory, Ashley T Wentz, Gregory A Myszkowski on behalf of Plaintiffs Washington, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wisconsin, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dashiell Radosti on behalf of Plaintiff Delaware, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey Alan Koziar, Matthew Edward Willoughby on behalf of Plaintiffs New Jersey, State of, Oklahoma, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Benjamin Michael Peterson on behalf of Plaintiff Wyoming, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher Leong on behalf of Plaintiff Hawaii, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Patrick Crotty, Miles Vaughn on behalf of Plaintiff Florida, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Stephanie N Guyon on behalf of Plaintiff Idaho, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam Teitelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff District of Columbia. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Philip Heimlich, Elizabeth Blackston on behalf of Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Douglas Scott Swetnam, Joseph Yeoman on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rosailda Perez on behalf of Plaintiff People for the State of California. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William R Pearson on behalf of Plaintiff Iowa, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lindsay Summer Dawson on behalf of Plaintiff Alabama, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Amanda J Wentz on behalf of Plaintiff Arkansas, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michel Singer Nelson on behalf of Plaintiff Colorado, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan Thomas Costa on behalf of Plaintiff Delaware, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bennett Gregory Hartz on behalf of Plaintiff Minnesota, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sarah M Dietz on behalf of Plaintiff Kansas, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michaela Hohwieler on behalf of Plaintiff Nebraska, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michelle Christine Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Nevada, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mary Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff New Hampshire, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael Schwalbert on behalf of Plaintiff Missouri, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anna Schneider, Andrew Butler on behalf of Plaintiff Montana, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Laura Lee Barry Wommack on behalf of Plaintiff Maine, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Elizabeth Cho on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Cathryn Elise Gits on behalf of Plaintiff Louisiana, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kathy P Fitzgerald, Michael S Hill on behalf of Plaintiff People of the State of Michigan. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Christine Newman on behalf of Nevada, State of. (Newman, Michelle)
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael D Lansky, Michael D Lansky LLC, Stacy S Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 23, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21933010. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-0233-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
May 23, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Alabama, State of, Arizona, State of, Arkansas, State of, Colorado, State of, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Hawaii, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland Office of Attorney General, Minnesota, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, Nevada, State of, New Hampshire, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, North Carolina, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Oregon, State of, People for the State of California, People of the State of Illinois, People of the State of Michigan, People of the State of New York, Rhode Island, State of, South Carolina, State of, Tennessee, State of, Texas, State of, Utah Division of Consumer Protection, Vermont, State of, Washington, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wisconsin, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Dilweg, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
May 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21933010 filed by Mississippi, State of, Texas, State of, Indiana, State of, Wisconsin, State of, People for the State of California, Washington, State of, Louisiana, State of, Arizona, State of, Hawaii, State of, Wyoming, State of, People of the State of Michigan, Georgia, State of, Oregon, State of, Maine, State of, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Maryland Office of Attorney General, Nevada, State of, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, People of the State of Illinois, District of Columbia, West Virginia, State of, Rhode Island, State of, North Dakota, State of, Kansas, State of, Minnesota, State of, Missouri, State of, Connecticut, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Iowa, State of, New Jersey, State of, Vermont, State of, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Utah Division of Consumer Protection, Alabama, State of, Colorado, State of, Ohio, State of, Delaware, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Florida, State of, North Carolina, State of, Nebraska, State of, South Carolina, State of, People of the State of New York, Commonwealth of Virginia, Montana, State of, Idaho, State of, New Mexico, State of, Tennessee, State of, Arkansas, State of. (Dilweg, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of et al v. Michael D Lansky LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Dylan Jones
Represented By: Joseph Hubble
Represented By: Laura Dilweg
Represented By: Alyse Meislik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Robert D Tambling
Represented By: Lindsay Summer Dawson Barton
Represented By: Robert Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Amanda J Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People for the State of California
Represented By: Bernard A Eskandari
Represented By: Nicklas A Akers
Represented By: Rosailda Perez
Represented By: Timothy D Lundgren
Represented By: Bernard Ardavan Eskandari
Represented By: Nicklas Arnold Akers
Represented By: Timothy Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado, State of
Represented By: Michel Singer Nelson
Represented By: Bianca Feierstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut, State of
Represented By: Kim Carlson McGee
Represented By: Brendan T Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaware, State of
Represented By: Ryan Costa
Represented By: Dashiell Radosti
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Emily Barth
Represented By: Adam Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Miles Vaughn
Represented By: Patrick Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia, State of
Represented By: David A Zisook
Represented By: David Zisook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Christopher JJ Leong
Represented By: Christopher Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Represented By: Stephanie N Guyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Illinois
Represented By: Elizabeth Blackston
Represented By: Philip Heimlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Douglas S Swetnam
Represented By: Joseph D Yeoman
Represented By: Douglas Scott Swetnam
Represented By: Joseph Yeoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: William Pearson
Represented By: Benjamin E Bellus, Jr.
Represented By: William R Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Sarah M Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Donald J Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana, State of
Represented By: Cathryn E Gits
Represented By: Cathryn Elise Gits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maine, State of
Represented By: Laura Lee Barry Womack
Represented By: Laura Lee Barry Wommack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Office of Attorney General
Represented By: Kathleen P Hyland
Represented By: Philip Ziperman
Represented By: Kathleen Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Kathy P Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael S Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: Bennett Gregory Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: James S Rankin, Jr.
Represented By: James M Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Michael A Schwalbert
Represented By: Michael Schwalbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Andrew Butler
Represented By: Anna Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Represented By: Michaela J Hohwieler
Represented By: Michaela Hohwieler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Michelle C Newman
Represented By: Michelle Christine Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Mary F Stewart
Represented By: Mary Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Jeffrey Koziar
Represented By: Deepta Janardhan
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koziar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico, State of
Represented By: Jacqueline Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York
Represented By: Glenna Goldis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina, State of
Represented By: Danielle Wilburn Allen
Represented By: Tracy Nayer
Represented By: Asa Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Parrell D Grossman
Represented By: Elin Alm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio, State of
Represented By: Erin Bridget Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Matthew E Willoughby
Represented By: Matthew Edward Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon, State of
Represented By: Jordan M Roberts
Represented By: Jordan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Brandon J Bingle
Represented By: Brandon James Bingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhode Island, State of
Represented By: Stephen N Provazza
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Kristin Simons
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Robertson
Represented By: Kristin M Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee, State of
Represented By: Austin C Ostiguy
Represented By: Tyler T Corcoran
Represented By: Austin Ostiguy
Represented By: Tyler Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas, State of
Represented By: David Shatto
Represented By: Wade A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Division of Consumer Protection
Represented By: Kevin McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont, State of
Represented By: Edwin L Hobson
Represented By: Ted Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Geoffrey L Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington, State of
Represented By: Alexandra Kory
Represented By: Mina Shahin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Ashley T Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin, State of
Represented By: Gregory A Myszkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Benjamin M Peterson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Lansky LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Avid Telecom
Represented By: Neil S Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Lansky individually as a Member/Manager/Chief Executive Officer of Michael D Lansky LLC doing business as Avid Telecom
Represented By: Neil S Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy S Reeves individually as a Manager/Vice President of Michael D Lansky LLC doing business as Avid Telecom
Represented By: Anne Michelle Chapman
Represented By: Lee David Stein
Represented By: Neil S Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?