Barten v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bryan Barten
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv00267
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Referring Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to #9 Stipulation: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company has until and including August, 15, 2023 to file its answer. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/4/23. (JAM)
July 28, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Alicyn)
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicyn Marie Freeman on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Freeman, Alicyn)
July 27, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas A Biscup on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Barten. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 27, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Cindy K Jorgenson. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-00267-TUC-CKJ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 12, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 12, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21998023. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-267-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
June 12, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Bryan Barten. (Zebrowski, Paul) (MCO)
June 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21998023 filed by Bryan Barten. (Zebrowski, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barten v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Barten
Represented By: Paul Zebrowski
Represented By: Thomas A Biscup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alicyn Marie Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?