Kiani et al v. Automatic Data Processing Incorporated
Plaintiff: Amir Kiani, Amir Monshizadeh and Chelsea Campbell
Defendant: Automatic Data Processing Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2023cv00508
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count One: Breach of Fiduciary Duty of Loyalty by Amir Kiani. (Veranes, Margot)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Counter Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Count One of the Counterclaim (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED. Counter Defendant shall have up to and including January 5, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Count One of the counterclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make the following changes to the case docket: There shall only be one Counter Claimant and one Counter Defendant. The Counter Claimant shall be Automatic Data Processing Incorporated and the Counter Defendant shall be Amir Kiani. The Clerk of Court shall delete Counter Defendant Automatic Data Processing Incorporated and Counter Claimant Amir Kiani from the case docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 12/28/2023. (SCA)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Amir Kiani. (Enoch, Nicholas)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 *Counterdefendant Kiani's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM by Amir Kiani.(Enoch, Nicholas) *Modified to remove counterclaim event and correct docket text on 1/5/2024 (MYE).
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated. (Kroeger, Joseph)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, a telephonic Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/31/2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Arizona Time), before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file with the Court, on or before 1/24/2024, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 12/7/2023. (MCO)
December 6, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ADP Atlantic LLC, Corporate Parent Automatic Data Processing Incorporated for Automatic Data Processing Incorporated. (Kroeger, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Automatic Data Processing Incorporated by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated.(Kroeger, Joseph)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Automatic Data Processing Incorporated filed by Amir Kiani, Chelsea Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Enoch, Nicholas)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Chelsea Campbell, Amir Kiani . (Enoch, Nicholas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Collective Action Complaint (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including November 29, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 11/16/2023. (MCO)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Joint Motion to Extend Defendants Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Collective Action Complaint by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Joseph)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22471409. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-508-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached.PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MYE)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated. (Kroeger, Joseph) (MYE)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20234421. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22471409 filed by Automatic Data Processing Incorporated. (Kroeger, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-7)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiani et al v. Automatic Data Processing Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Kiani
Represented By: Ivelisse Bonilla-Torrado
Represented By: Margot Veranes
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Shannon Lori Giles
Represented By: Taylor Michele Secemski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Monshizadeh
Represented By: Ivelisse Bonilla-Torrado
Represented By: Margot Veranes
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Shannon Lori Giles
Represented By: Taylor Michele Secemski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Campbell
Represented By: Ivelisse Bonilla-Torrado
Represented By: Margot Veranes
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Shannon Lori Giles
Represented By: Taylor Michele Secemski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Data Processing Incorporated
Represented By: Audrey Elaine Chastain
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?