Dial v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Shaundelle Dial
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2024cv00066
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Stay Responsive Deadlines (Doc. #39 ) is granted. A deadline to respond to the Complaint, if necessary, will be set in the screening order. Defendant's Motion to Vacate Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #33 ) is denied as moot. Defendant's Request re: Screening Order (Doc. #34 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/4/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.) (SCA)
March 8, 2024 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Response Deadlines by United States of America. (Hollywood, Kaitlin)
March 5, 2024 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #26 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re: #25 Motion to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Shaundelle Dial. (3 pages) (EJA)
March 5, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION to Request for Perjury Sanctions by Shaundelle Dial. (2 pages) (EJA)
March 5, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION for Default Judgment by Shaundelle Dial. (1 page) (EJA)
February 28, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for How Long the Defendants have to respond to Complaint by Shaundelle Dial. (1 page) (SCA)
February 20, 2024 Filing 34 REQUEST re: Screening Order by Defendant United States of America. (Hollywood, Kaitlin)
February 20, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION to Vacate Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by United States of America. (Hollywood, Kaitlin)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's First Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #31 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before April 8, 2024 Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/14/2024. (SCA)
February 13, 2024 Filing 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hollywood, Kaitlin)
February 6, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA)
February 6, 2024 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-01026 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 25) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. The Clerk of Court is further directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/30/2024 (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 30, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/30/2024. (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Filing 26 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex_1_Attachs_A_C, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Judge, Timothy) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Judge, Timothy) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 23, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shaundelle Dial. Address updated. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 22) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/2/2024 (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Shaundelle Dial.(dj) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 U.S. MARSHAL - 285 FORM returned by USM. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 20 U.S. MARSHAL - 285 FORM returned by USM. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs motion (Doc. 18) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/21/2023 (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by Shaundelle Dial.(aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document 15. Mail sent to Shaundelle Dial. Mail resent. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to United States of America and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice) (mw) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/30/2023) (mw). [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 9) to reopen is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN the above-captioned action. The order (Doc. 7) dismissing this case based on plaintiffs failure to comply with the courts Administrative Order is VACATED. The application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (Doc. 13). The application to proceed in forma pauperis filed on September 21, 2023 is DISMISSED as an incomplete form. (Doc. 10). The complaint is DEEMED filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the summons with a copy of the complaint (Doc. 1) to the United States Marshal for service on defendant United States of America. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/27/2023 (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shaundelle Dial. (dj) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaundelle Dial.(dj) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 SECOND THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 09/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 AO 399 Service Form Completed by Plaintiff. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaundelle Dial.(aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen Case by Shaundelle Dial.(aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
August 31, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Sheet and Copy of #7 Order sent to Plaintiff. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 Letter to Court from Shandelle Dial re case. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/29/2023. (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 5) is GRANTED. Pursuant to the 30-Day Administrative Order, plaintiff SHALL either: (1) [t]ender payment in the amount of $402.00 to the Clerk of Court; or (2) Fully complete and file a proper application to proceed in forma pauperis no later than August 21, 2023. (See Doc. 4). If plaintiff fails to timely comply with the terms set forth in the Administrative Order (Doc. 4), his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/21/2023 (mw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File In Forma Pauperis by Shaundelle Dial.(sh) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 06/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/22/2023) (lp). [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 2 UNCERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shaundelle Dial. (lp) Modified on 6/22/2023 (lp). [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Shaundelle Dial. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Tort Claim Letter)(lp) Modified on 6/22/2023 (lp). [Transferred from pamd on 2/6/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dial v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaundelle Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kaitlin Shaw Hollywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?