Burtman v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Svetlana Burtman
Defendant: Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram and Drug Enforcement Administration
Case Number: 4:2024cv00144
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 5/3/24. (See attached Order for complete details.) (MYE)
April 15, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram re: #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #17 Order on Motion for TRO . (Linton, Michael)
April 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #17 Order on Motion for TRO by Svetlana Burtman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Joel)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED Plaintiff's TRO Motion (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/28/24. (MYE)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 Sealed Document: Exhibit F in Support of #10 Defendants' Response to #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, Exhibits 16-23) (KAH)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Exhibit F in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/26/24. (KAH)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for Motions Hearing held March 26, 2024, before United States District Judge Scott H. Rash. There being no objection by the Plaintiff, the Court GRANTS the Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibit F in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ). Further, the Court GRANTS the Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena (Doc. #13 ). The parties present argument to the Court regarding the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) The Court takes the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT and will issue a ruling in the near future. Appearances: Harvey Steinberg, Christopher Boeckx, and Joel Richardson for the Plaintiff: Svetlana Burtman. Michael Linton and Lark Saad for the Defendants: Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram, and Drug Enforcement Administration. Court reporter: Christine Coaly. Hearing held 2:33 p.m. to 3:17 p.m. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGF)
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linton, Michael)
March 26, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Harvey Steinberg on behalf of Plaintiff Svetlana Burtman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 FILED at (Doc. #16 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit F re: #11 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Exhibit F in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, Exhibits 16-23)(Linton, Michael) Modified on 3/27/2024 (KAH).
March 21, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Exhibit F in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linton, Michael)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Linton, Michael)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED the TRO Hearing is VACATED and RESET to 3/26/2024 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall appear in Courtroom 5C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion shall still be filed NO LATER THAN 3/21/2024, at 5:00 p.m., and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Plaintiffs shall not file a reply absent leave from the Court. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/21/24. (MYE)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Svetlana Burtman: Declaration of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Exhibit 1 to Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Attachments, Proposed Order re Motion, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Order Setting TRO Hearing upon DOJ, MERRICK GARLAND, ATTORNEY GENERAL by and through Gary M. Restaino, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona; ANNE MILGRAM, ADMINISTRATOR; DOJ, DEA by and through Gary M. Restaino, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on March 19, 2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Delivery By Private Process Server on Anne Milgram by and through Gary M. Restaino, US Attorney, District of Arizona, served on March 19, 2024 at 2:00 pm)(Kalish Boeckx, James)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion shall be filed NO LATER THAN 3/21/2024, at 12:00 p.m., and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Plaintiffs shall not file a reply absent leave from the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the TRO hearing on 3/20/2024 is VACATED and RESET to 3/25/2024 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall appear in Courtroom 5C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/19/24. (MYE)
March 15, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 15, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Harvey Steinberg, James Christopher Kalish Boeckx, Joel Aaron Richardson on behalf of Plaintiff Svetlana Burtman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Svetlana Burtman. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion, if any, shall be filed NO LATER THAN Tuesday, March 19, 2024, at 12:00 PM. Plaintiffs shall not file a reply absent leave from the Court. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for Wednesday, March 20, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before this Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 3/14/2024. (DPS)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Svetlana Burtman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Anne Milgram, Administrator, DOJ, DEA, c/o U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona)(Kalish Boeckx, James)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22844786. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-144-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (titled as Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Svetlana Burtman. (Kalish Boeckx, James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(ARC)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22844786 filed by Svetlana Burtman. (Kalish Boeckx, James) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burtman v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Burtman
Represented By: Harvey Steinberg
Represented By: James Christopher Kalish Boeckx
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Michael Louis Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Milgram
Represented By: Michael Louis Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Michael Louis Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?