Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams and Debra Haaland
Case Number: 4:2024cv00183
Filed: April 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Summons, Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint, Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, and Proof of Service of Case Initiating Documents upon U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (4/25/2024); Debra Haaland (4/25/2024); Martha Williams (4/25/2024); United States Attorney General (4/26/2024); Civil-Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona (4/25/2024). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Haaland, #2 Proof of Service - Williams)(Rankin, Benjamin)
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Debra Haaland, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 19, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rankin, Benjamin)
April 19, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Center for Biological Diversity.(Rankin, Benjamin)
April 19, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Center for Biological Diversity . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF)(Rankin, Benjamin)
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Magistrate Judge Consent Form upon United States Fish and Wildlife Service (4/5/2024); Debra Haaland (4/5/2024); Martha Williams (4/5/2024); U.S. Attorney General (4/8/2024); Civil-Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona (4/5/2024). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Haaland, #2 Proof of Service - Williams)(Rankin, Benjamin)
April 5, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jonathan Carter Evans, Benjamin Rankin on behalf of Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Debra Haaland, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22898906. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00183-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity. (Rankin, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
April 1, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Rankin, Benjamin) (SCA)
April 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22898906 filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Rankin, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Benjamin Rankin
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?