Tee v. Shea et al
Plaintiff: Ignatius M Tee, Jr.
Defendant: Shannon M Shea and Carlos Del Toro
Case Number: 4:2024cv00240
Filed: May 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 5/14/2024 before District Judge Raner C. Collins. Court Reporter Scott M. Coniam, Telephone number 602-322-7248. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 6/20/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2024. (CJS)
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Emergency TRO hearing) by Ignatius M Tee, Jr for proceedings held on 5/14/2024, Judge Raner C Collins hearing judge(s). (Greene, Jason)
May 14, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed May 14, 2024, judgment is entered against Plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (ARC)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Emergency #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Emergency Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Page Count, and Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue are DENIED. The Emergency Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Page Count is GRANTED. Having declined to issue the relief sought, this matter is now closed, and the Clerk of Court shall docket accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 5/14/2024. (ARC)
May 14, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior District Judge Raner C. Collins: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 5/14/2024. Argument heard. The Court takes the matter UNDER ADVISMENT. Ruling to issue. APPEARANCES: Jason J. Greene, Esq. present for Plaintiff Ignatius M. Tee, Jr.; AUSA Gabriel A. Peraza for present for Defendants Carlos Del Toro and Shannon M. Shea. (Court Reporter Scott Coniam via Zoom.) Hearing held 10:05 AM to 11:12 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LML)
May 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gabriel A. Peraza appearing for Carlos Del Toro, Shannon M Shea. . (Peraza, Gabriel)
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, Ex. H by Plaintiff Ignatius M Tee, Jr. (Greene, Jason)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Carlos Del Toro, Shannon M Shea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Peraza, Gabriel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Ignatius M Tee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons 2, #2 Summons Summons 3)(Greene, Jason)
May 13, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jason J Greene on behalf of Plaintiff Ignatius M Tee, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that oral argument is set for May 14, 2024 at 9:50 a.m. before the Hon. Raner C. Collins. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 5/10/24. (MYE)
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by Ignatius M Tee, Jr. The clerk is unable to issue the Summonses submitted, as the language does not exactly match the AO 440 summons form and only one defendant name should appear on each summons. Please submit summons forms with exact language that matches the AO 440 form or use the AO 440 form. One Summons per defendant is required. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the corrected documents. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23036254. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00240-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Ignatius M Tee, Jr. (Greene, Jason) (BAC)
May 10, 2024 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Leave of Court to Exceed Page Count, MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction should not Issue by Ignatius M Tee, Jr. (Greene, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAC)
May 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23036254 filed by Ignatius M Tee, Jr. (Greene, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tee v. Shea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignatius M Tee, Jr.
Represented By: Jason J Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon M Shea
Represented By: Gabriel A Peraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Del Toro
Represented By: Gabriel A Peraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?