San Gabriel Basin v. Aerojet-General Corp, et al
Plaintiff: California Department of Toxic Substances Control, United States of America and San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority
Defendant: Linderman Living Trust, dft Teledyne Industries Inc, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Seachrome Corporation, Roc-Aire Corp, Roy A Clayton Trust, Maureen Kessler, Lee Pharmaceuticals, -, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Sarah O'Leary, Del Mar Metal Finishing, Frazen Trust, Sam C Longo, Jr, TNT Carpet Tile Marble Inc., Jebbia Trust, APW North America Inc, Lisa D Kessler, Tonks Properties, Tan Lam, Marge Carson Inc, Waymire Drum Company Inc, La Victoria Foods Inc, J A B Holdings Inc, DOES 6 through 10, inclusive, Newair Inc, Randon Products, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Southern California Edison Company, Pacific Coast Drum Company, -, Artistic Polishing and Planting Inc, Wallace H Siegel, Longo Associates LLC, Smittybilt Inc, Mammoet Western Inc, International Medication Systems Ltd, -, M&T Company, Chemrite Corporation, Robert G Vanderbosch, JCI Environmental Services, Sarah J O'Leary, Servex Inc, Andruss Family Trust, Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc., Shirley Levine, Allee Trust, Oscar Levine, Mark Kessler, Western Markings Inc, LA Die Mold Inc, Cynthia Chau, Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust, Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc, Aircraft Stamping Co Inc, Mary A Rockenbach Trust, Clamp MFG Co, Ted Levine Drum Company, Benito Velasquez, Prime Engineering, -, Tri-Fitting MFG, Plastic Dress-Up Company, Michael Kessler, Edith O Nelson, Bruce and Gloria Kessler Family Trust, Mary A Rockenbach, Chevron Research & Technology Co, GRD and Associates, Sam C Longo, Sr, Manufacturers Development, Palmer Battery Company, The Linderman Living Trust, Edith O Nelson Revocable Trust, Bruce Kessler, -, West Coast Metal Finishing Inc, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Co, Vanderbosch Family Trust, WDC Liquidating Inc, Earl Butler & Associates Inc, Barbee Trust, Allegheny Technology Inc, Norma Clayton, Durham Trasportation Inc, Eagle Metal Finishing Co Inc, L E Tepfer Co Inc, Kawie Trust, Rush Street Properties, LLC, Edwin H Franzen, Craneveyor Corp, David Chau, Multi-Chemical Products, Richard D'Epifanio, One Dollar Cleaner, Hartwell Corporation and Manufacturer's Service Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Rudolph B Barbee, Don Tonks, -, Quaker Chemical Corporation, -, Plastic Engineered Components Inc, Time Realty Investments Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Aerojet-General Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Art Weiss, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Claudean Mullins Kawie individually, Astro Seal Inc, Claudean Mullins Kawie, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Chevron USA Inc, Roy Tonks, TDY Industries Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually, Art Weiss Inc and Mary Brkich
Counter Defendant: James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, Lyle P Archer, Los Angeles County Flood Control District, Gloria Jebbia, Southern California Water Company, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Clamp Mfg Co Inc, Baerbel Janneberg, MCP Chemicals International Inc, Everett Phillips, Quaker Construction Products Inc, Durham Family Limited Partnership, Carlisle Coatings and Waterproofing Incorporated, JAB Holdings Inc, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, Astronautic Enamelers Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, San Gabriel Valley Water Company, Lawrence Felix, Los Angeles County, Does 1 through 20, C P Leu, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Leu Machine and Tool, Edward H Franzen, Southern California Edison Co, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, Electronic Solutions, Durham Transportation Inc, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, Cardco, Monterey Park City of, Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, Phillips and Malone, Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc and Quality Construction Products Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Robert Malone, Jack Stout, Golden State Water Company, Armand Felix, City of Monterey Park and Richard Felix
Consolidated Counter Defendant: Robert Malone, Jr
Counter Claimant: Claudean Mullins Kawie as Trustee of the Kawie Trust, Jack Barry Zwahlen as Trustee of the Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust, Chevron U S A Inc and Craneveyor Corp.
Special Master: Timothy P. Gallagher
Interested Party: Central Mutual
Case Number: 2:2002cv04565
Filed: June 11, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Audrey B Collins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 JUDGMENT AND ORDER CLOSING CASE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: As a result of the various Orders re Dismissal of the defendants in this action and those defendants' respective cross-complaints and third-party complaints, if any, the various Order Approving Settlements of the defendants and Issuing Bar Orders, and the Order to Dismiss Remaining Claims, the Court finds that there are no remaining claims to adjudicate in the above-referenced matter and therefore enters a final Judgment and Order closing this case. All parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
February 4, 2013 Filing 1281 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #1279 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
January 24, 2013 Filing 1280 Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #1279 , Order, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,,,, #1277 , Order,,,,, #1278 e-mailed to courtdocs@hkclaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 Recipient rejected. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to rmulvihill@hkclaw.com and whart@hkclaw.com. Informed both attorneys that their primary email address had been updated. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Proposed Final Judgment by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court has approved the parties' stipulation to dismiss any remaining claims in the above-captioned actions without prejudice. If no claims remain in these cases, the Court ORDERS the parties to lodge a proposed final judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. If not, the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint report within 10 days of the date of this Order explaining what claims remain and how the parties intend to proceed. (bp)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER TO DISMISS REMAINING CLAIMS by Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: To the extent any claims brought by the plaintiffs San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority ("WQA"), Golden State Water Company, which was formerly know as Southern California Water Company ("GSWC"), San Gabriel Valley Water Company ("SGVWC") and the City of Monterey Park ("City") (collectively, "Water Entities") remain after this Court enters the [Proposed} Order re Dismissal of Allegheny Technologies Incorporated and TDY Industries, Inc., and Retention of Jurisdiction (the "Allegheny Dismissal Order"), such claims in the above-captioned action hereby are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent any counter-claims brought by any defendant in the above-captioned actions remain after this Court enters the Allegheny Dismissal Order, such counter-claims in the above-captioned actions remain after this Court enters Allegheny Dismissal Order, such third-party claims in the above-captioned actions hereby are dismissed without prejudice. Any other remaining claim in the above-captioned actions hereby is dismissed without prejudice. Nothing in this Order affects this Court's prior orders retaining jurisdiction over prior Settlement Agreements. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. (bp)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF ALLEGHENY TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND TDY INDUSTRIES, INC. AND RETENTIONOF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re #1275 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The claims of plaintiffs San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority ("WQA"), Golden State Water Company, which was formerly known as Southern California Water Company ("GSWC"), San Gabriel Valley Water Company ("SGVWC") and the City of Monterey Park ("City") (collectively, "Water Entities") in the abovecaptioned actions against Allegheny Technologies Incorporated and TDY Industries, Inc. (now known as TDY Industries, LLC), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Allegheny Technologies Incorporated and TDY Industries, Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, TDY Industries, Inc.'s counterclaims and third party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that TDY Industries, Inc.'s counterclaims and third party claims are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. 3. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. (bm)
January 18, 2013 Filing 1276 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Please Note! This filing is to Dismiss Remaining Claims, [not to dismiss case], filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
January 18, 2013 Filing 1275 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendants Allegheny Technology Inc, TDY Industries Inc filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
January 16, 2013 Filing 1273 NOTICE filed by plaintiff United States of America. Notice of Resolution of All Matters (Allen, Gabriel)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER CONFIRMING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT(S) AND BARRING ANY FUTURE CLAIMS AGAINST ROBERT MALONE AND EVERETT PHILLIPS by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1272 Motion for Settlement: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That the motion for Good Faith Settlement Motion brought by Robert Malone is granted and found to be in 'good faith' pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 877 et seq AND consistent with the purposes of the Comprehensive, Environmental Response, Compensation and Liability Act 42 U.S.C. Sections 9601 et seq AND that and all claims past, present and future are HEREBY BARRED against Robert Malone by any party for contribution, equitable comparative indemnity, cost recovery, or full, partial or comparative indemnity arising out of, relating to, or in connection with the matters addressed in the settlements. This ORDER shall also be applicable to Mr. Malone's former partner at Phillips and Malone Production Machine Company, EVERETT PHILLIPS. (bm)
January 11, 2013 Filing 1272 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Motion by Third Party Defendant Robert Malone for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Third Party Defendant Robert Malone. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by Third Party Defendant Robert Malone for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Confirming Good Faith of Settlement(s) and Barring Any Future Claims Against Robert Malone and Everett Phillips, #3 Declaration Declaration of Robert D. Schmidt in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Motion by Third Party Defendant for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #4 Declaration Volume 1 - Declaration of Robert Malone in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Motion by Third Party Defendant for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #5 Declaration Volume 2 - Declaration of Robert Malone in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Motion by Third Party Defendant for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #6 Declaration Volume 3 - Declaration of Robert Malone in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Motion by Third Party Defendant for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order)(Schmidt, Robert)
December 17, 2012 Filing 1271 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court acknowledges recent orders thathave been processed. Counsel for plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority discuss additional stipulation that will be e-filed with the Court. Counsel Gabriel Allen, Esq. confer with Court with respect to resolving the matters at hand. The Court having heard from counsel, grants counsel 30 days to January 17, 2013, to e-file the needed paper work. The Court commends counsel and Special Master Tim Gallagher on all their hard work and efforts spent resolving this matter.Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (lw)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 ORDER GRANTING ALLEGHENY TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1266 Motion for Settlement: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against TDY by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitablecomparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER ENTERING CONSENT DECREE by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1263 Request for Settlement: The Court has considered United States of America and California Department of Toxic Substances Control's ("Plaintiffs") Unopposed Request to Enter Proposed Consent Decree. The Decree resolves claims against TDY Industires, LLC ("Defendant") related to the groundwater contamination at the South El Monte Operable Unit of the San Gabriel Valley Area 1 Superfund Site. The Court finds that the Consent Decree is fair, reasonable, in the public interest, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA, and hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' request. It is hereby ORDERED that the Proposed Consent Decree between Plaintiffs and Defendant shall be entered by the Court in this case. (bm)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1268 DECLARATION of Tiffany R. Hedgpeth in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1266 filed by Defendants Allegheny Technology Inc, TDY Industries Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff TDY Industries Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1267 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1266 filed by Defendant TDY Industries Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff TDY Industries Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1266 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Allegheny Technology Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
December 12, 2012 Filing 1265 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report for December 2012 filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
December 11, 2012 Filing 1264 MEMORANDUM in Support of REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decree #1263 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Allen, Gabriel)
December 11, 2012 Filing 1263 REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decree filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Gabriel)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF ART WEISS, INC., DEL RAY INDUSTRIAL ENTERPRISES, INC., QUAKER CHEMICAL CORPORATION, AND MULTI-CHEMICAL PRODUCTS, INC., AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1257 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Art Weiss, Inc., Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc., Quaker Chemical Corporation, and Multi-Chemical Products, Inc., and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Art Weiss, Inc. ("Art Weiss"), Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc. ("Del Ray"), Quaker Chemical Corporation ("Quaker"), and Multi-Chemical Products, Inc. ("Multi-Chem") (collectively, "Settling Defendants"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Art Weiss, Del Ray, Quaker and Multi-Chem are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Art Weiss's, Del Ray's, Quaker's and Multi-Chem's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Art Weiss's, Del Ray's, Quaker's and Multi-Chem's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Art Weiss's, Del Ray's, Quaker's and Multi-Chem's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SHIRLEY LEVINE AND OSCAR LEVINE, AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1256 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Shirley Levine and Oscar Levine, and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendants Shirley Levine, individually and as Trustee of the Ted and Shirley Levine Family Trust, and Oscar Levine, as Trustee of the Levine Trust, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against defendants, individually and as Trustee of the Ted and Shirley Levine Family Trust, and Oscar Levine, as Trustee of the Levine Trust, are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF TED LEVINE DRUM COMPANYAND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1255 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Ted Levine Drum Company and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Ted Levine Drum Company, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Ted Levine Drum Company are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1258 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachments 2: [Proposed] Orders #1255 , #1256 , #1257 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): No caption page submitted for proposed orders. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1257 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Multi-Chemical Products, Quaker Chemical Corporation filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1256 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Oscar Levine, Shirley Levine filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1255 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ted Levine Drum Company filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 26, 2012 Filing 1262 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Lodging #1254 , Settlement Agreement, #1253 e-mailed to tagajanian@murchisonlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User unknown'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2012 Filing 1254 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Settlement Agreement, #1253 (Jonas, Lori)
October 26, 2012 Filing 1253 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with TDY Industries, LLC filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, Part 1, #2 Appendix A, Part 2, #3 Appendix A, Part 3, #4 Appendix A, Part 4, #5 Appendix A, Part 5, #6 Appendix B and C)(Jonas, Lori)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT TED LEVINE DRUM COMPANYS MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT, #1240 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against the Defendant Ted Levine Drum Company by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in San Gabriel Valley Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx), City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-5909 ABC (RCx) and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (lw)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS SHIRLEY LEVINE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TED AND SHIRLEY LEVINE FAMILY TRUST, AND OSCAR LEVINE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE LEVINE LIVING TRUST'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS, #1241 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against the Levine Family by any party (including any potentially responsible parties underCERCLA or any joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in San Gabriel Valley Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx), City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-5909 ABC (RCx) and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (lw)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1250 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robin M Cleary counsel for Defendant Jebbia Trust. Robin M. Cleary will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Robin M. Cleary is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Norf J. Jebbia Trust (Cleary, Robin)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1249 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robin M Cleary counsel for Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd. Robin M. Cleary will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Robin M. Cleary is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant International Medication Systems, Ltd. (Cleary, Robin)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1248 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robin M Cleary counsel for Defendant Smittybilt Inc. Robin M. Cleary will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Robin M. Cleary is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Smittybilt Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1247 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robin M Cleary counsel for Defendant Roc-Aire Corp. Robin M. Cleary will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Robin M. Cleary is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Roc-Aire Corporation (Cleary, Robin)
September 20, 2012 Filing 1243 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #1242 by Clerk of Court Other: Documents will be accepted as e-filed; The Court sets new motion hearing dates for both, motions will be heard on October 29, 2012 @ 10:00 a.m., counsel to appear on new date and time. Counsel to adhere to the rules and procedures of the Court when e-filing motions pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 RE: Motions for Settlement Approval #1240 , #1241 . (bm)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF EARL BUTLER & ASSOC., INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1236 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Earl Butler & Assoc., Inc. and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendant EBA, Inc., which was formerly known as Earl Butler & Assoc., Inc., only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against EBA, Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF ASTRO SEAL, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1235 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Astro Seal, Inc. and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Astro Seal, Inc., only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Astro Seal, Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Astro Seal, Inc.'s counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Astro Seal, Inc.s counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Astro Seal, Inc.'s third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF CRANEVEYOR CORPORATION AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1234 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of CraneVeyor Corporation and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against CraneVeyor Corporation, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against CraneVeyor Corporation are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1242 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motions for Settlement Approval #1240 , #1241 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for incorrect date #1240 . Motion is untimely and noticed for incorrect date #1241 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 18, 2012 Filing 1241 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approving Settlement and Barring Certain Claims filed by Defendant Shirley Levine. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration to Motion re Settlement, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Geocaris, #3 Proposed Order re Granting Settlement, #4 Appendix (re Motion re Settlement))(McDonald, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2012 Filing 1240 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It filed by Defendant Ted Levine Drum Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration re Motion re Settlement, #2 Exhibit A to Geocaris Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Re Motion re Settlement, #4 Appendix (Proof of Service re Motion re Settlement))(McDonald, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1239 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #1237 e-mailed to MJohnson@manatt.com bounced due to Delivery to the following recipients failed.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2012 Filing 1237 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachments 2: Proposed Order Attachments #1234 , #1235 , #1236 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed orders lack captions. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismissal of Longo Associates, LLC, Sam c. Longo Jr., Sam C. Longo, Sr and Seachrom Corporation and Retention of Jurisdiction, #1227 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendants Longo Associates, LLC, Sam C. Longo, Jr., Sam C, Longo, Sr., and Seachrome Corporation, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against defendants Longo Associates, LLC, Sam C. Longo, Jr., Sam C, Longo, Sr., and Seachrome Corporation are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. re: Longo Associates LLC, Seachrome Corporation, Sam C Longo, Jr and Sam C Longo, Sr terminated. (lw)
September 13, 2012 Filing 1236 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Earl Butler & Associates Inc filed by Plaintiff Earl Butler & Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
September 13, 2012 Filing 1235 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Astro Seal Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
September 13, 2012 Filing 1234 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Craneveyor Corp filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 MINUTES: ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference (In Chambers): A status conference in this case is set for Monday, September 17, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The Courthas received the parties' joint status report, filed on September 12, 2012. Pursuant to the request of the parties, the Court CONTINUES that status conference to Monday, December 17, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, December 12, 2012.The stay of discovery and motions previously entered remains in effect. (Docket No. 1173.) IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1229 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report for September 2012 filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1228 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment 2: Proposed Order #1227 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Exhibit page not needed. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 11, 2012 Filing 1227 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Sam C Longo, Jr, Sam C Longo, Sr, Longo Associates LLC, Seachrome Corporation filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Request to Substitute Attorney Robert S. Niemann of Keller & Heckman LLP in place and stead of Robert S. Niemann of Seyfarth Shaw LLP for Third-Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc #1226 is GRANTED. (ir)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Request to Substitute Attorney Robert S. Niemann of Keller & Heckman LLP in place and stead of Robert S. Niemann of Seyfarth Shaw LLP for Third-Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd #1225 is GRANTED. (ir)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Request to Substitute Attorney Robert S. Niemann of Keller & Heckman LLP in place and stead of Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP for Third-Party Defendant The Norf J. Jebbia Trust etc #1224 is GRANTED. (ir)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1226 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Robert S. Niemann, Keller & Heckman LLP in place of attorney Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP filed by Third Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1225 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Robert S. Niemann, Keller & Heckman LLP in place of attorney Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP filed by Third Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1224 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Robert S. Niemann, Keller & Heckman LLP in place of attorney Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP filed by Third Party Defendant Gloria Jebbia, Jebbia Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation #1218 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against MaryBrkich, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Mary Brkich are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Mary Brkich's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Mary Brkich's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Mary Brkich's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions aredismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1221 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: Roc-Aire Corporation, Third-Party Defendant, to substitute Robert S. Niemann, Keller and Heckman LLP, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record in place and stead of Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP. (bm)
August 24, 2012 Filing 1221 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Robert S. Niemann, Keller & Heckman LLP in place of attorney Robert S. Niemann, Seyfarth Shaw LLP filed by Third Party Defendant Roc-Aire Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1219 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #1211 by Clerk of Court. Other: Document is hereby STRICKEN; counsel to adhere to the rules and procedures of the Court when e-filing documents ensuring that each document is e-filed properly; no mandatory courtesy copies were received for this document and is not needed because it is being stricken from the record; pursuant to the rules of the Court mandatory chambers copies are due by 12:00 noon the next business day after e-filing; counsel to resubmit the request and proposed order for substitution. RE: Notice of Association of atty; req & ord attached #1205 . (bm)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1218 STIPULATION for Order Re Dismissal of Mary Brkich and Retention of Jurisdiction, STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Mary Brkich filed by plaintiff and third party defendant Golden State Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Dismissal of Mary Brkich)(Hoch, Steven)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, pursuant to the Stipulation #1218 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Mary Brkich, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Mary Brkich are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Mary Brkich's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Mary Brkich's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Mary Brkich's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
August 22, 2012 Filing 1216 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Substitution of Attorney #1215 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). Other error(s) with document(s): notice should not have been e-filed, only attachments 1 and 2 should have been submitted. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 21, 2012 Filing 1217 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #1216 , Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #1215 e-mailed to sgorman@santa-clarita.com bounced due to 554 5.4.4 SMTPSEND.DNS.MxLoopback; DNS records for this domain are configured in a loop; 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 Recipient rejected (R4)' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2012 Filing 1215 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney filed by Third Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Order on Request for Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF PACIFIC COAST DRUM COMPANY AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1204 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Pacific Coast Drum Company and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Pacific Coast Drum Company, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Pacific Coast Drum Company are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF NEWAIR, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1203 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Newair, Inc. and Retention of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendant Newair, Inc. ("Newair"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Newair are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Newair's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Newair's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Newair's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins pursuant to Stipulation to Dismiss M&T Company and Retention of Jurisdiction #1202 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against M&T Company, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against M&T Company are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, theclaims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, M&T Company's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that M&T Company's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. M&T Company's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1211 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Substitution of Attorney #1205 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1210 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. correcting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1201 (Cheney, Brent)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1209 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Substitution of Attorney/Stipulation to dismiss #1199 , #1200 , #1201 . The following errors were found: Documents 1119 & 1200 Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Substitute Attorney(G-01) under Requests. Document # 1201 Title page is missing on proposed order, should not be entitled "Stipulation". Other error: re: Doc #1199 and #1200 - Clerical errors made in docket entries re: missing name of party and/or name of attorney being substituted in and out. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1208 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1204 . The following error was found: Proposed Order not submitted as a separate document with a Title caption page; Also Proposed Order is submitted twice within the document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1207 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1203 . The following error was found: Document appears to contain 2 Stipulation within one document. Proposed Order is not submitted as a separate document with a Title caption page. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1206 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1202 . The following error was found: Proposed Order does not contain a Title caption page. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1205 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Third Party Defendant Roc-Aire Corp. (Attachments: #1 Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert) DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 8/23/12, DOCUMENT #1219 . Modified on 8/23/2012 (bm).
August 15, 2012 Filing 1204 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Pacific Coast Drum Company filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1203 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Newair Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1202 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant M&T Company filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1201 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Golden State Water Company filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1200 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney filed by Third Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1199 Notice of Substitution of Attorney (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Sbustitution of Attorney)(Niemann, Robert)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Motion by Defendant Craneeveyor Corp for Entry of Order approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1192 . Any and all past, present, or future claims against CraneVeyor by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (ir)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Motion by Defendant Seachrome Corporation for entry of Order approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1191 . Any and all past, present, or future claims against Seachrome by anyparty (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED, subject only to Seachrome failing to make its second and third installment payments as described in the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Motion by Defendant Earl Butler & Associates Inc for entry of order approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1188 . Any and all past, present, or future claims against EBA by any party(including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (ir)
July 25, 2012 Filing 1193 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimants Craneveyor Corp, Earl Butler & Associates Inc, re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good-Faith Settlement And Bar Order #1191 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1188 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good-Faith Settlement And Bar Order #1192 served on July 25, 2012. (Babich, Phillip)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1192 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good-Faith Settlement And Bar Order filed by Defendant Craneveyor Corp. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities in Support of Motion by Defendant Craneveyor Corp. For Entry of Order Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Declaration of Todd O. Maiden in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Todd O. Maiden, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion For Entry of Order Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order)(Maiden, Todd)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1191 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good-Faith Settlement And Bar Order filed by Defendant Seachrome Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Declaration of Todd O. Maiden in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Todd O. Maiden, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order)(Maiden, Todd)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1190 DECLARATION of Todd O. Maiden In Support Of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1188 filed by Defendant Earl Butler & Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maiden, Todd)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1189 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1188 filed by Defendant Earl Butler & Associates Inc. (Maiden, Todd)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1188 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendant Earl Butler & Associates Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Maiden, Todd)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY DEFENDANTS AND THRID PARTY PLAINTIFF ART WEISS; And Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc. For Entry Of Order Approving Good Faith Settlement And Bar Order by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1185 Motion for Settlement. (bm)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY DEFENDANTS AND THRID PARTY PLAINTIFFS ASTRO SEAL, INC. FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1186 Motion for Settlement. (bm)
July 18, 2012 Filing 1186 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Motion for Entry or Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendant and 3rd Party Plaintiff Astro Seal Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in Support of Motion or Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Declaration James Macdonald in Support of Motion for Entry or Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #3 Proposed Order on Motion for Entry or Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order)(Macdonald, James)
July 18, 2012 Filing 1185 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Motion for Entry or Order Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendants and 3rd Party Plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ot Motion Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of James Macdonald in Support of Motion Approving Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Bar Order)(Macdonald, James)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST DRUM COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT by Judge Audrey B. Collins. #1184 (bp)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement between Pacific Coast Drum Company and Water Entities filed by defendant Pacific Coast Drum Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah M. Hart in Support of Motion for Order Approving Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Granting Pacific Coast Drum Company's Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Water Entities)(Hart, Sarah)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER ENTERING CONSENT DECREE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court has considered United States of America and California Department of ToxicSubstances Control's ("Plaintiffs") Request to Enter Proposed Consent Decrees. The two Decrees resolve claims against Art Weiss, Art Weiss, Inc., and Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc. ("Art Weiss Defendants"); Astro Seal, Inc.; Craneveyor Corp. ("Craneveyor"); EBA, Inc.; M&T, LLC; Mary Brkich; New Air, Inc.; Pacific Coast Drum ("PCD"); Quaker Chemical Corp. ("Quaker"); and Seachrome Corporation ("Seachrome") related to the groundwater contamination at the South El Monte Operable Unit of the San Gabriel Valley Area 1 SuperfundSite. The Court finds that the Consent Decrees are fair, reasonable, in the public interest, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA, and hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' request. It is hereby ORDERED that the Proposed Consent Decrees between Plaintiffs and Defendants shall be entered by the Court in this case. (ir)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 MINUTES: ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference (In Chambers): A status conference in this case is set for Monday, July 16, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The Court hasreceived the parties joint status report, filed on July 11, 2012. Pursuant to the request of the parties, the Court CONTINUES that status conference to Monday, September 17, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, September 12, 2012. The stay ofdiscovery previously entered remains in effect. (Docket No. 1173.) IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
July 11, 2012 Filing 1181 STATUS REPORT -- Joint Status Report for July 2012 filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Bloomgarden, Craig)
July 6, 2012 Filing 1180 MEMORANDUM in Support of REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decrees #1179 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Allen, Gabriel)
July 6, 2012 Filing 1179 REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decrees filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Entering Consent Decrees)(Allen, Gabriel)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, pursuant to Stipulation #1177 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Shelley Linderman, as trustee of The Linderman Trust ("Linderman"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Linderman are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E., 3.F., and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Linderman's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Linderman's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Linderman's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice.The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1177 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Shelley Linderman filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1176 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Two Partial Consent Decrees and Request That Court Take No Action at This Time re Settlement Agreement, #1174 , Settlement Agreement, #1175 (Jonas, Lori)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1175 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with Seachrome Corporation filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, Part 1, #2 Appendix A, Part 2, #3 Appendix A, Part 3, #4 Appendix A, Part 4, #5 Appendix B-D)(Jonas, Lori)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1174 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with Art Weiss; Art Weiss, Inc.; Astro Seal, Inc.; Craneveyor Corp.; Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc.; EBA, Inc. d/b/a Earl Butler & Assocs.; M&T, LLC; Mary Brkich; New Air, Inc.; Pacific Coast Drum Co.; Quaker Chemical Corp. filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, Part 1, #2 Appendix A, Part 2, #3 Appendix A, Part 3, #4 Appendix A, Part 4, #5 Appendix B-E)(Jonas, Lori)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CONTINUING Status Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: A status conference in this case is set for Monday, May 14, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The Court has received the parties' joint status report, filed on May 9, 2012. In light of the pending settlements in principle, the Court STAYS all discovery between Plaintiffs and Defendants Allegheny Technologies Inc. and TDY Industries, LLC until settlement is memorialized and a consent decree is approved by the Court. Should the parties fail to agree on acceptable language or if the consent decree is not entered by the Court, the parties shall notify the Court and request that the discovery stay be lifted. Pursuant to the request of the parties, the Court CONTINUES the status conference to Monday, July 16, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, July 11, 2012. (bm)
May 9, 2012 Filing 1172 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report for May 2012 filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION OF DEFENDANT The Linderman Trust For Order Approving Settlement And Bar Order by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Amendment (Motion related) #1148 : Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against Linderman by any party (including any potentially Responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Request to Enter Proposed Consent Decree #1167 . The Decree resolves claims against Linderman Living Trust A and Rush Street Properties, LLC ("Defendants") related to the groundwater contamination at the South El Monte Operable Unit of the San Gabriel Valley Area 1 Superfund Site. The Court finds that the Consent Decree is fair, reasonable, in the public interest, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA, and hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' request. It is hereby ORDERED that the Proposed Consent Decree between Plaintiffs and Defendants shall be entered by the Court in this case. (ir)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1169 NOTICE of Entry of order granting application for good faith settlement, re: Order on Application for Settlement,,, #1166 , filed by defendants Quaker Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Karen)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1168 MEMORANDUM in Support of REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decree Unopposed Request to Enter Proposed Consent Decree #1167 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jonas, Lori)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1167 REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decree Unopposed Request to Enter Proposed Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Entering Consent Decree)(Jonas, Lori)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ORDER GRANTING QUAKER CHEMICAL CORPORATION AND MULTI-CHEMICAL PRODUCTS, INC.'S Application For Good Faith Settlement Determination And Bar Order by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1161 Application for Settlement: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all and all past, present, or future claims and cross-claims against Quaker and MCP by any party (including any potentially responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the issues addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CONTINUING Status Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: A status conference in this case is set for Monday, April 9, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The Court has received the parties' joint status report, filed on April 4, 20120. Pursuant to the request of the parties, the Court CONTINUES that status conference to Monday, May 14, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, May 9, 2012. (bm)
April 4, 2012 Filing 1164 STATUS REPORT April Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
April 4, 2012 Filing 1163 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for Settlement Approval of good faith settlement determination and bar order #1161 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Karen)
April 4, 2012 Filing 1162 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Application for Settlement #1161 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Application. A stand-alone proposed order can be submitted by e-filing a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 3, 2012 Filing 1161 APPLICATION for Settlement Approval of good faith settlement determination and bar order filed by Defendants Quaker Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Johnson, Karen)
March 27, 2012 Filing 1160 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: Request for approval of substitution of attorney and Order as attachment document #1153 will be STRICKEN, these document must be filed alone not as an attachments to a notice ; Counsel must adhere to the rules of the Court when e-filing documents. Please e-file request for substitution of attorney and proposed order as attachment over for the Judge consideration. Mandatory courtesy copies were not received for these documents, counsel to follow rules of Court. (ir)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: A status conference in this case is set for Monday, March 26, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. After speaking with Special Master Timothy P. Gallagher, the Court CONTINUES that status conference to Monday, April 9, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, April 4, 2012. (lw)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANTS EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICH FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1145 Motion for Order: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against Brkich by any party (including any potentially Responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1157 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Substitution of Attorney #1153 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Case number should read CV 02-4565-ABC (JCx). Case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as of 08/02/11. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (afe)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1156 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment (Motion related), #1149 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Case number should read CV 02-4565-ABC (JCx). Case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as of 08/02/11. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (afe)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1155 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment (Motion related), #1148 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Case number should read CV 02-4565-ABC (JCx). Case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as of 08/02/11. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (afe)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1154 STATUS REPORT March Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1153 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by plaintiff/third party defendant Golden State Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proposed Order)(Hoch, Steven) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY THE COURT FILED 3/27/12**Modified on 3/28/2012 (ir).
March 15, 2012 Filing 1149 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order,,,,,, #1144 filed by Defendant Linderman Living Trust. (Bunch, Bradley)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Settlement Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: After speaking with Special Master Timothy P. Gallagher, the Court ORDERS the following parties to appear for a settlement conference at Special Master Gallagher's offices on Thursday, March 22, 2012 at 12:00 p.m.: Principals, insurers, and counsel Tiffany R. Hedgpeth for Defendants Allegheny Technologies Inc./TDY Industries, Inc.; Principals and counsel James Geocaris for Defendant Ted Levine Drum Company/Shirley Levine, as Trustee of the Ted and Shirley Levine Family Trust/Oscar Levine, as Trustee of the Levine Trust; Gabriel Allen and Lori Jonas, counsel for the United States; and Principals and counsel for all Water Entity Plaintiffs; and Principals and counsel Brent Cheney for San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (bm)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 MINUTE ORDER re Settlement Conference (In Chambers) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: the Court ORDERS the following parties to appear for a Settlement Conference at Special Master Gallagher's offices on 3/22/2012 at 12:00 PM. (jp)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1148 Amendment to MOTION for Order for GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE LINDERMAN TRUST FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER #1144 filed by Defendant Linderman Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 1-4 ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 5-10 ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 11-16 ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 17-22 ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 23-28 ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #8 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE LINDERMAN TRUST FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER)(Bunch, Bradley)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF M & T COMPANY FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER #1138 : Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against M & T by any party (including any potentially responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recover, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER GRANTING Motion of M and T Company for Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order #1138 by Judge Audrey B. Collins that any and all past, present, or future claims against M and T by any party (including any potentially responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (jp)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #1133 NEWAIR INC.S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR OF ORDER: The unopposed Motion for Entry or Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order filed by Newair, Inc., on February 14, 2012 being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered, the Court finds that: 1. The SEMOU Agreement Among Certain Water Entities and Newair, Inc. ("Settlement Agreement"), which is attached as Exhibit A to the Declaration of Timothy D. McCollum filed in support of the Motion ("Settlement Agreement") is a "good faith" settlement within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure 877 and 877.6; and 2. The Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purpose of the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act, 42 U.S.C. 9601 et seq. ("CERCLA"). Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against Newair, Inc. by any party (including any potentially Responsible party under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
March 6, 2012 Filing 1145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICHS FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by Defendant Mary Brkich. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICHS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICHS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICHS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #4 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICHS FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER)(Bunch, Bradley)
March 6, 2012 Filing 1144 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE LINDERMAN TRUST FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by Defendant Linderman Living Trust. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 1-4 ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 5-10 ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 11-16 ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 17-22 ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A Pages 23-28 ATTACHMENT TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM INSUPPORT OF THE LINDERMAN TRUSTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #8 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE LINDERMAN TRUST FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER)(Bunch, Bradley)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF BENITO VELASQUEZ AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1140 : Pursuant to the previously filed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Benito Velasquez And Retention Of Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Benito Velasquez, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Benito Velasquez are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1142 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment #2: Proposed Order #1140 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
February 29, 2012 Filing 1140 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Benito Velasquez filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
February 27, 2012 Filing 1141 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding settling defendants. The Court having heard from counsel, acknowledges on the record of parties that have settled and parties that remain to be settled. Special Master Tim Gallagher continues to conduct settlement efforts with parties. Parties of Allegheny Technology Inc., Craneveyor Corp., Ted Levine Drum Company, and the Department of Justice to contact special master to set up meeting this week. It is ORDERED that counsel return to court for a further status conference March 26, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Joint report due March 20, 2012. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (lw)
February 23, 2012 Filing 1139 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Partial Consent Decree, #1136 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): document should be filed as a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the Partial Consent Decree. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
February 22, 2012 Filing 1138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by Defendant M&T Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF M & T COMPANYS MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF M & T COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF M & T COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #4 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF M & T COMPANY FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER)(Bunch, Bradley)
February 22, 2012 Filing 1137 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Settlement Agreement, #1136 (Jonas, Lori)
February 22, 2012 Filing 1136 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with Defendants Linderman Living Trust and Rush Street Properties filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, Part 1, #2 Appendix A, Part 2, #3 Appendix A, Part 3, #4 Appendix A, Part 4, #5 Appendix B-F)(Jonas, Lori)
February 21, 2012 Filing 1135 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pursuant to Stipulation #1132 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendant Hartwell Corporation ("Hartwell"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (whichParagraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Hartwell are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement (ir)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1133 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by DEFENDANT Newair Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF NEWAIR, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF NEWAIR, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. McCOLLUM IN SUPPORT OF NEWAIR, INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #4 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF NEWAIR, INC. FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER)(Bunch, Bradley)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1132 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Hartwell Corporation Hartwell Corporation filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 MINUTES: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding settling defendants. The Court having heard from counsel, acknowledges on the record of parties that have settled and parties that remain to be settled. Special Master Tim Gallagher continues to conduct settlement efforts with parties. Court and counsel discuss dates provided to the Court in the joint status report. The Court sets thefollowing schedule: Discovery Cut-Off: September 28, 2012 fact, October 29, 2012 plaintiffs expert disclosures and reports due, December 21, 2012 defendants expert disclosure and reports due, February 21, 2012 plaintiffsrebuttal of expert disclosures and reports due; Expert Discover Cut-Off: March 21, 2013; Law & Motion Cut-Off: April 22, 2013; Motion in Limine: June 3, 2013; Joint Exhibit List: July 31, 2013; Pretrial Conference Order: August 7, 2013; Final Pre Trial Conference {Phase I}: August 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., trial counsel to be present; Jury Trial {Phase I}: September 17, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. It is ORDERED that counsel return to court for a further status conference February 27, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Joint report due February 21, 2012 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1130 STATUS REPORT -- Joint filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Bloomgarden, Craig)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1128 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment #1: Proposed Order, #1127 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION AND GENCORP INC., AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation #1127 : Pursuant to the above Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Aerojet-General Corporation ("Aerojet") and GenCorp Inc., only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Aerojet and GenCorp Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Aerojet's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. or the last sentence of Paragraph 3.B. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Aerojet's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. or the last sentence of Paragraph 3.B. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Aerojet's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. 3. Each dismissed party shall bear its own costs of suit. (bm)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1127 STIPULATION to Dismiss Aerojet-General Corporation and Gencorp Inc. Aerojet-General Corporation filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
December 28, 2011 Filing 1126 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ann Rushton counsel for Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control. Adding Olivia Karlin, Deputy Attorney General as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Ann Rushton will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control (Rushton, Ann)
December 19, 2011 Filing 1125 MINUTES OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding lifting stay. The Court having heard from counsel, hereby extends the stay until January 15, 2012. Counsel request in open Court that stay be lifted as to settling and principal defendants with respect to discovery. The extended stay date of January 15, 2012 also applies to discovery issues. Discovery will not be due until 30 days thereafter by no later than February 15, 2012. Court discuss settlement discussion that have taken place before the Special Master Tim Gallagher. The Court having heard from counsel, determines that further settlement efforts will be fruitful. Counsel ask to extend themselves to be available to work with special master this month to try and conduct further settlement. It is ORDERED that counsel return to court for a further status conference January 30, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Joint report due January 23, 2012. Counsel to notify Court if settlement has been reached. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
December 16, 2011 Filing 1124 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sarah M Hart counsel for Defendant Pacific Coast Drum Company. Adding Sarah M. Hart as attorney as counsel of record for Pacific Coast Drum Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pacific Coast Drum Company (Hart, Sarah)
December 14, 2011 Filing 1123 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sheila E Fix counsel for Defendant Wallace H Siegel. Sheila E. Fix will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Sheila E. Fix is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Allen Siegel and Wallace Siegel (Fix, Sheila)
December 12, 2011 Filing 1122 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 MINUTE: ORDER Extending Stay (In Chambers): The Court has reviewed the parties joint status report filed on November 14, 2011 and has consulted with Special Master Timothy P. Gallagher on the matters raised therein. The Court agreeswith Special Master Gallaghers recommendation that briefly extending the stay in this case until the next status conference on Monday, December 19, 2011 may aid the settlement negotiations with the remaining Defendants. Therefore, the stay is extended to that date. The parties are still ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than December 12, 2011 and the Court will keep the December 19, 2011 status conference on calendar unless the parties notify the Court otherwise. In light of the extension of the stay, Defendants TDY Industries, Inc. and Seachrome Corporations deadline to respond to the outstanding written discovery propounded by the United States is also extended until 27 days after December 19, unless the parties agree otherwise.The Court continues the stay of all discovery and other litigation obligations of the Settling in Principle Defendants until those settlements are finalized. The Court ORDERS each Defendant that has not yet executed a settlement agreement with the Water Entity Plaintiffs and a consent decree with theGovernment Plaintiffs to appear at the December 19 status conference. They and Third Party Water Entity Defendants should be prepared to discuss at the December 19 status conference the briefing schedule for any planned motionsIT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, pursuant to Stipulation #1117 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Zwahlen, only, are dismissed without prejudice. Zwahlen's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed without prejudice. Zwahlen's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions aredismissed without prejudice. (ir)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1119 NOTICE of Change of address by Brian D Langa attorney for Third Party Defendants Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes. Changing attorneys address to 700 South Flower Street, Suite 2325, Los Angeles, CA 90017-4209. Filed by Third Party Defendants Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes. (Langa, Brian)
November 14, 2011 Filing 1118 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
November 10, 2011 Filing 1117 STIPULATION to Dismiss Jack Barry Zwahlen Jack Barry Zwahlen filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 31, 2011 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order,,, #1116 e-mailed to shoch@bhfs.com, kvozenilek@bhfs.com, mduncan@bhfs.com bounced due to unable to connect successfully to the destination server. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to shoch@bhfs.com, kvoxenilik@bhfs.com, mduncan@bhfs.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. (Wilson, Tammie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF MAMMOET WESTERN, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Mammoet Western, Inc., only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Mammoet Western, Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1114 (lw)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation #1112 the Water Entities claims against Air Distribution Products and Sarah J. O'Leary as Trustee of the Vanderbosch Family Trust Vanderbosch Family Trust ONLY are dismissed with prejudice except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Air Distribution Parties are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (lc)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1114 STIPULATION to Dismiss Mammoet Western, Inc. Mammoet Western Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Re Mammoet Western, Inc.)(Cheney, Brent)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1113 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment #2: Proposed Order #1112 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order does not have title page and/or case caption. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1112 STIPULATION to Dismiss Air Distribution Products and Sarah J. O'Leary as Trustee of the Vanderbosch Family Trust Vanderbosch Family Trust filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1111 FINAL JUDGMENT regarding The Tonks parties pursuant to FRCP 54(b) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: On 8/19/11 the Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination and Entry of Final Judgment #1032 was submitted. Judgment is hereby entered in accordance with the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as set forth in this Courts Order Approving the Settlement Agreement between the Tonks and the Water Entities and imposing the Bar Order as referenced above, and in accordance with this Courts entry of the above-referencedStipulated Order. 2. Judgment is hereby entered under Rule 54(b) because there is no just reason for delay for the following reasons: (a) Judgment fully resolves all claims pleaded by and against the Tonks; (b) Judgment will have the benefit of streamlining the litigation by dismissing several parties, which is especially important given the size and complexity of the SEMOU Cases;(c) Judgment will reduce litigation expenses for the parties; (d) Judgment advances the remedial objectives of CERCLA. 3. There is no prevailing party and each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. There being no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is ordered to enter this Final Judgment forthwith and without further notice. (ir)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, pursuant to Stipulation #1105 . The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Tonks Properties, Roy Tonks, and Don Tonks (deceased hereinafter referred to as the Estate of Don Tonks and his personal representative Janet M. Tonks) (sometimes collectively, the Tonks), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Tonks Properties, Roy Tonks, and the Estateof Don Tonks and his personal representative Janet M. Tonks are subject toParagraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, the counterclaims of Tonks Properties, Roy Tonks, and the Estate of Don Tonks and his personal representative Janet M. Tonks, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that the Tonks counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. The third-party claims of Tonks Properties, Roy Tonks, and the Estate of Don Tonks and his personal representative Janet M. Tonks, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Western Markings, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into thisOrder by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Western Markings are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (ir)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1108 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1105 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect - Correct Number: CV 02-4565-ABC (JCx). Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment - Proposed Order with Title page. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1107 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1104 . The following error was found: Proposed Order shall be submitted as an attachment to the document with case caption information, not as an exhibit or as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1106 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Settlement #1041 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vallette, Kent)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1105 STIPULATION to Dismiss Tonks Properties, Roy Tonks and Estate of Don Tonks and His Personal Representative Janet M. Tonks Tonks Properties filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 18, 2011 Filing 1104 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Western Markings, Inc. Western Markings Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1100 ,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Time Realty Investments, Inc., only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Time Realty Investments, Inc. are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Time Realty Investments, Inc.'s counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Time Realty Investments, Inc.s counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Time Realty Investments, Inc.s third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. Time Realty Investments Inc, terminated. (lw)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 MINUTE: ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference (In Chambers): In light of developments in the ongoing mediation and settlement efforts by the parties in these cases, the Court STAYS all proceedings in these matters for 30 days. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Monday, November 14, 2011 to update the Court on the status of the case and proposing new dates if necessary IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation and Proposed Order re Dismissal of Time Realty Investment, Inc #1100 . The following errors were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Title Page not attached to Proposed Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1100 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Time Realty Investments, Inc. Time Realty Investments Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
October 13, 2011 Filing 1097 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Status Report #1094 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text indicates that attached document is a Joint Stipulation. Proposed order attachment does not indicate a caption and case number. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: A status conference in these cases is set for Monday, October 17, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Based on the parties' joint status report filed on October 11, 2011, the Court finds that no status conference is needed at this time. Therefore, the Court CONTINUES the status conference to Monday, December 19, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Monday, December 12, 2011. (bm)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF MAMMOET WESTERN, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1096 : Pursuant to the above Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Mammoet Western, LLC, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Mammoet Western, LLC are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
October 12, 2011 Filing 1096 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Mammoet Western, Inc. Mammoet Western Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Cheney, Brent)
October 12, 2011 Filing 1095 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. correcting Stipulation to Dismiss Case #1094 (Cheney, Brent)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1094 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Cheney, Brent)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1093 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
October 6, 2011 Filing 1092 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Matthew O'Rahilly Kovacs counsel for Defendant Wallace H Siegel. David F. Wood will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Allen Siegel and Wallace Siegel, Individually and as Trustees of Siegel Trust (Kovacs, Matthew)
October 6, 2011 Filing 1091 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Matthew O'Rahilly Kovacs counsel for Defendant Wallace H Siegel. Sheila E. Fix will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Allen Siegel and Wallace Siegel, Individually and as Trustees of Siegel Trust (Kovacs, Matthew)
October 6, 2011 Filing 1090 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Matthew O'Rahilly Kovacs counsel for Defendant Wallace H Siegel. Matthew O. Kovacs will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Allen Siegel and Wallace Siegel, Individually and as Trustees of Siegel Trust (Kovacs, Matthew)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF MARY BRKICH AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pursuant to the above Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Mary Brkich, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against mary Brkich are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlment Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Mary Brkich's counterclaims, only, in the above-captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Mary Brkich's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the countercliams are dismissed without prejudice. Mary Brkich's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
September 29, 2011 Filing 1088 DISCLOSURE Supplemental Disclosure filed by ThirdParty Defendant Golden State Water Company (Nieblas, Kari)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1087 ANSWER to Counterclaim #1004 filed by Counter-Defendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1086 ANSWER to Counterclaim #1010 filed by Counter-Defendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1085 ANSWER to Counterclaim #1009 filed by Counter-Defendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
September 22, 2011 Filing 1084 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William Benjamin DeClercq counsel for Defendants Allee Trust, Plastic Dress-Up Company. William B. DeClercq will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.William B. DeClercq is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Allee Trust and Plastic Dress-Up Company (DeClercq, William)
September 22, 2011 Filing 1083 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed Order #1081 , Motion for Entry of Order #1082 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging #1081 , Motions-Settlement #1082 . Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document for both entries. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 21, 2011 Filing 1082 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order,, #1077 filed by Defendant Mary Brkich. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRADLEY L. BUNCH IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit EXH. A. TO DECLARATION OF BRADLEY L. BUNCH)(Bunch, Bradley)
September 21, 2011 Filing 1081 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order, #1078 filed by Defendant Mary Brkich. (Bunch, Bradley)
September 16, 2011 Filing 1080 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER of Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 9/22/11. Document and docket text must match; counsel to adhere to the rules and regulation of the Court when e-filing; The Court has not received courtesy copies for documents # 1077, 1078. Counsel is reminded that mandatory courtesy copies are due by 12:00 noon the next business day after e-filing see General Order 08-02(IV)(D) and 08-11; Local Rule 11-3, sanctions may be imposed for non-compliance with the rules and regulation of the Court. RE: MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER #1078 (ir)
September 13, 2011 Filing 1079 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Order #1078 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): A stand-alone proposed order should be e-filed as a Notice of Lodging, with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 12, 2011 Filing 1078 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by Defendant Mary Brkich. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Bunch, Bradley) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response by the Court filed 9/16/11** Modified on 9/16/2011 (ir).
September 12, 2011 Filing 1077 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER filed by Defendant Mary Brkich. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLC, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRBICK'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRADLEY L. BUNCH IN SUPPORT OF EMB LLS, BOB BRKICH, DOMINIC MORTELLARO, THE EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARY BRKICH'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER, #3 Exhibit EXH. A to DECLARATION OF BRADLEY L. BUNCH)(Bunch, Bradley)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF RUDOLPH B.BARBEE re Stipulation #1057 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities' claims in the above-captioned actions against Barbee, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Barbee are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Barbee's third-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice; 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (lom)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF NELSON TECHNICAL COATINGS, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1058 , IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. ("Nelson Technical"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against nelson Technical are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement.... Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. terminated. (lw) Modified on 9/7/2011 (lw).
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Dismiss #1054 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against defendants Michael Kessler, as Trustee of The Kessler Living Trust, Lisa D. Kessler, as Trustee of The Kessler Living Trust, Mark Kessler, individually and as Trustee of The Kessler Living Trust, and Maureen Kessler, individually and as Trustee of The Kessler Living Trust (collectively, "the Kesslers"), only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against the Kesslers are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice; and 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (lom)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Dismiss #1056 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. It is hereby Ordered: 1. Plaintiffs' (the "Water Entities'") respective claims in the above-captioned actions (the "Actions") against Chevron U.S.A. Inc. ("Chevron"), only, are dismissed with prejudice as to the Water Entities' claims against Chevron arising out of, directly or indirectly, groundwater Contamination within the geographic confines of the SEMOU that originated or is alleged to have originated from 2750 Rosemead Boulevard and 9420 Garvey Avenue, South El Monte, CA (the "Site"), except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against Chevron in the Actions (i) concern groundwater Contamination in the geographic area of the SEMOU alleged to have originated from sites other than the Site or (ii) are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice; 2. In addition, Chevron's counterclaims, only, in the Actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to (i) the final sentence of Paragraph 3.B of the Settlement Agreement or (ii) Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Chevron's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to (i) the final sentence of Paragraph 3.B of the Settlement Agreement or (ii) Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice; 3. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement; and 4. The costs and attorneys fees of the Water Entities and Chevron shall be borne as provided in the Settlement Agreement. (lom)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF THE SIEGELS AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION #1059 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against the Siegels are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities' claims against the Siegels are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice; and 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. (lom) Modified on 9/7/2011 (lom).
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #1066 Defendant Time Realty Investments, Inc.'s Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination. (lom)
September 1, 2011 Filing 1070 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Shelley Linderman, Linderman Living Trust, M and T Company, M&T Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A) as to Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District, Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bunch, Bradley)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #1065 Ex Parte Application By Time Realty Investments, Inc.'s For Order Eliminating Hearing On Motion For Order Approving Good Faith Settlement: The Ex Parte application of Defendant Time Realty Investments, Inc. for Order Eliminating hearing on Motion for Order Approving Good Faith Settlement being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered, and there being no opposition to the Application, the Court GRANTS the application U No hearing on the unopposed Motion is necessary. The Court will render a decision based upon the papers filed in support thereof. (bm)
August 31, 2011 Filing 1068 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reponse as to Amended Complaint,, #998 filed by Defendant Linderman Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE)(Bunch, Bradley)
August 30, 2011 Filing 1067 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Application for Good Faith Settlement #1066 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Hearing date indicated in docket entry text does not match hearing date indicated in caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 29, 2011 Filing 1066 APPLICATION for Hearing Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Defendant Time Realty Investments Inc. Application set for hearing on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Richard) Modified on 8/30/2011 (ab). ***9/26/2011 AT 10:00 AM DATE REFLECTED ON DOCUMENT***
August 29, 2011 Filing 1065 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination filed by Defendant Time Realty Investments Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Richard)
August 29, 2011 Filing 1063 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachments #2: Proposed Order attachments #1054 , #1056 , #1057 , #1058 , #1059 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) ***NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** Pursuant to the provisions of Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that entry of this Order is necessary for the just and efficient resolution and effective management of this case. This Order supersedes all prior case management and general discovery orders entered by the Court in these actions. This Case Management Order, and any additional pretrial casemanagement orders entered in this proceeding shall apply to all of the followingcases: (1) San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corp., et al. (CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx)); (2) City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corp., et al. (CV 02-0509 ABC (RCx)); (3) Southern California Water Co. v. Aerojet- General Corp., et al. (CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx)); (4) San Gabriel Valley Water Co. v. Aerojet-General Corp., et al. (CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx)); and (5) United States of America, et al. v. Seachrome Corporation, et al. (CV 11-0382-ABC (RCx)) (the "Government Lawsuit") (hereinafter collectively referred to as the "SEMOU Cases") The Court previously has ordered all five SEMOU Cases consolidatedfor all pretrial purposes, including discovery and law and motion. Suchconsolidation does not constitute a determination that any of the actions should or should not be consolidated for trial, and does not have the effect of making any person or entity a party to an action in which he, she or it has not been named and served..... Further Status Conference - October 17, 2011 at 10:00 A.M; Last day for Third-Party Water Entity Defendants to file motions to dismiss, See Court's - August 26, 2011 Order. Last day for Plaintiffs or Defendants to file early motions for summary judgmentrelated to perchlorate, if any - WILL NOT BE FILED, PER AUGUST 15, 2011 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Quarterly Joint Status Conference Reports - Due seven (7) days before scheduled Status Conference Joint Status Report..... (lw)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF TRI-FITTING MANUFACTING COMPANY, INC. AND RETENTION OF JURSIDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities claims in the above-captioned actions against Tri- Fitting, only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against Tri-Fitting are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. In addition, Tri-Fittings counterclaims, only, in the above captioned actions against the Water Entities are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraph 3.D. of the Settlement Agreement. To the extent that Tri- Fitting's counterclaims against the Water Entities are subject to Paragraph 3.D. of theSettlement Agreement, the counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Tri-Fittingsthird-party claims, only, in the above-captioned actions are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement.re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1049 (lw)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF PLASTIC DRESS-UP COMPANY AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Water Entities' claims in the above-captioned actions against PDUC,only, are dismissed with prejudice, except to the extent subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement (which Paragraphs are incorporated into this Order by this reference). To the extent that the Water Entities claims against PDUC are subject to Paragraphs 3.D., 3.E. and 6 of the Settlement Agreement, the claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Court agrees to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and resolve any disputes arising under the Settlement Agreement. re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1048 (lw)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS VACATING Motion Deadline by Judge Audrey B. Collins: In the parties' August 15 joint status report, the parties agreed to a briefing schedule and hearing date of October 17, 2011. In the contemporaneously entered Case Management Order, various discovery deadlines have been set as well. In that status report, certain "Settling in Principle Defendants" (Astro Seal, Inc., Art Weiss, Inc., Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc., Art Weiss, Multi-Chemical Products, Inc., Quaker Chemical Corporation, M&T Company, and the Linderman Trust) requested that the Court relieve them from any future deadlines, All discovery obligations are STAYED as they relate to the Settling in Principle Defendants. In response, the Third Party Water Entity Defendants do not express any objection to staying the Settling in Principle Defendants' upcoming discovery obligations. Therefore, that request is GRANTED and all discovery obligations are STAYED as they relate to the Settling in Principle Defendants. Thus, the most prudent course is to VACATE the briefing schedule proposed by the parties in the August 15 joint status report as to all Third Party Water Entity Defendants and to stay the filing of any of the Third Party Water Entity Defendants' motions to dismiss and for sanctions unless and until the Settling in Principle Defendants' settlements are not finalized. Because the Settling in Principle Defendants indicate that the settlements likely cannot be finalized until approximately three months after the August 15 status report, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report no later than November 15, 2011 updating the Court on the status of the settlements and setting a new briefing schedule on the motions if necessary. Contemporaneously with this Order, the Court has entered the parties' Case Management Order with the changes noted. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1059 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1058 STIPULATION to Dismiss Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1057 STIPULATION to Dismiss Rudolph Barbee, Ind. and as Trustee of Barbee Family Trust Rudolph B Barbee filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1056 STIPULATION to Dismiss Chevron USA, Inc. Chevron USA Inc filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1055 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Eric M McLaughlin counsel for Defendants Craneveyor Corp, Seachrome Corporation, Counter Claimants Craneveyor Corp., Craneveyor Corp., Seachrome Corporation, Seachrome Corporation, Seachrome Corporation. Eric M. McLaughlin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Eric M. McLaughlin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Seachrome Corporation; CraneVeyor Corp. (McLaughlin, Eric)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1054 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant The Kesslers Lisa D Kessler, Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, Michael Kessler filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 26, 2011 Filing 1053 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachments #2: Proposed Orders #1048 , #1049 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case caption not indicated for proposed orders. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1051 Amendment to MOTION for Order for Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order #1042 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to August 29, 2011 #1043 CORRECTED DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE A. HOBEL [attaching Exhibits B and C] filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hobel, Lawrence)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1049 STIPULATION to Dismiss Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company, Inc. Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Co filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1048 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Plastic Dress-Up Company filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cheney, Brent)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #1042 Motion Of Defendants Aerojet-General Corporation And Gencorp Inc. For Order Approving Good-Faith Settlement And Bar Order: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, conditional upon the payment by Aerojet of its second settlement payment on or before December 5, 2011, any and all past, present, or future claims against Aerojet-General Corporation or GenCorp Inc. by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. This Order shall take effect on December 8, 2011, unless the Water Entities identified in the Settlement Agreement notify the Court before that date that Aerojet failed to make its second payment under the Settlement Agreement. (bm)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #1043 Ex Parte Application by Aerojet-General Corporation and Gencorp Inc. for Order Eliminating Hearing on Motion for Order Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order. No hearing on the unopposed Motion is necessary. The Court will render a decision based upon the papers filed in support thereof. (lw)
August 24, 2011 Filing 1047 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion for Settlement #1042 , Attachment #2: Prop. Order #1043 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Hearing date indicated in caption of attached document does not match docket entry text #1042 . Proposed order attachment requires at least 2 lines of text to allow for judge's signature pursuant to Local Rule 58.10 #1043 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 24, 2011 Filing 1046 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Karen Mayann Johnson counsel for Counter Defendant Quaker Construction Products Inc. Mary A. Watson (aka Mary Watson Fisher) will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Mary A. Watson (aka Mary Watson Fisher) is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation/Multi-Chemical Products, Inc. (Johnson, Karen)
August 24, 2011 Filing 1045 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Karen Mayann Johnson counsel for Consol Counter Defendant Quaker Construction Products Inc. Stephen M. Nichols will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Stephen M. Nichols is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Quaker Chemical Corp/Multi-Chemical Products, Inc. (Johnson, Karen)
August 23, 2011 Filing 1044 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, PROOF served on 08/23/2011. (Hobel, Lawrence)
August 23, 2011 Filing 1043 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to August 29, 2011 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hobel, Lawrence)
August 23, 2011 Filing 1042 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Good-Faith Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Hobel, Lawrence) Modified on 8/26/2011 (ab).**HEARING DATE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2011**
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT Regarding The Tonks Parties As Being In Good Faith And Imposing Bar Of Claims by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1032 Motion for Settlement: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. (bm)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #1035 Mammoet Western, Inc.'s Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order: MAMMOET WESTERN, INC.'s Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order (the "Motion"), filed August 19, 2011, being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered and there being no opposition to the Motion, the Court finds that the Agreement Among Certain Water Entities and MAMMOET WESTERN, INC., (the "Settlement Agreement"), attached as Exhibit "A" to the Declaration of John G. Nursall filed in support of the Motion, is a "good faith" settlement within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure 877 and 877.6, and is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purpose of the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act, 42 U.S.C. 9601 et seq.("CERCLA"). Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against MAMMOET WESTERN, INC. by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or related to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (bm)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ORDER ENTERING CONSENT DECREES by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #1026 REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decrees, Re SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT #986 , SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT #987 : The Court finds that the Consent Decrees are fair, reasonable, in the public interest, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA, and hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' request. It is hereby ORDERED that the Proposed Consent Decrees between Plaintiffs and Defendants shall be entered by the Court in this case. (bm)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME For Third Party Defendants To Respond To Third Party Complaint Of TDY Industries, Inc. granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #1028 , by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Upon the stipulation of Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs, Quaker Chemical Corporation; Art Weiss; Art Weiss, Inc.; Del Ray Industrial Enterprises, Inc.; and TDY Industries, Inc., and Third Party Defendants San Gabriel Valley Water Company; Golden State Water Company; and City of Monterey Park (collectively, "Third Party Defendants"), and for good cause, IT IS ORDERED that: The deadline for Third Party Defendants to file and serve their response to the Third Party Complaint of TDY Industries, Inc. For (1) Contribution Under CERCLA, 42 U.S.C. 9613(f); (2) Declaratory Relief Under CERCLA, 42 U.S.C. 9613(g)(2); (3) Contribution Under State Law; (4) Declaratory Relief Under 28 U.S.C. 2201; (5) Declaratory Relief Under State Law; and (6) Common Law Equitable Indemnity is extended to the twentieth (20th) court day following the date the next status conference is held in the above-captioned SEMOU Litigation, unless the Court later orders the response deadline to be deferred until Phase 3 of the litigation, or otherwise extends the response deadline. (bm)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1037 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, re Notice of Lodging, #1036 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Bar Order #1032 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #1034 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #1033 served on 8/19/11. (Vallette, Kent)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1036 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Bar Order #1032 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Settlement re the Tonks parties, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Order)(Vallette, Kent)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1035 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendant Mammoet Western Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mammoet Western, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order, #2 Declaration of John G. Nursall in Support, #3 Proposed Order Granting Mammoet Western, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order)(Swain, Michael)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1034 DECLARATION of Roy W. Tonks In support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Bar Order #1032 filed by Counter Claimants Don Tonks, Don Tonks, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Roy Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Tonks Properties, Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Consol Third Party Plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Consol Counter Claimants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Counter Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Third Party Plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Vallette, Kent)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1033 DECLARATION of Defendants In support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Bar Order #1032 filed by Counter Claimants Don Tonks, Don Tonks, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Roy Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Tonks Properties, Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Consol Third Party Plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Consol Counter Claimants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Counter Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Third Party Plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks. (Vallette, Kent)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1032 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Bar Order filed by Defendants Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Vallette, Kent)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Joint Statement #1030 . 1. Absent further Order of this Court, and subject to Orders of Chief District Judge Audrey B. Collins, discovery in this matter will be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules generally applicable to all federal civil actions in this District. 2. To the extent the parties wish to propose that special discovery procedures be utilized in this case or that a discovery conference be held before this Court, they may submit any such proposal to the Court by September 15, 2011. 3. The Court will not hold a discovery status conference on August 22, 2011. (hr)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 STATEMENT -- Joint Statement by Plaintiffs and Defendants in Response to August 12, 2011 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Chooljian filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #1019 . (Bloomgarden, Craig)
August 17, 2011 Filing 1029 STATEMENT -- Third Party Water Entity Defendant Supplemental Statement Re Joint Status Conference Report filed by Third Party Defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District re: Status Report #1021 . (Duchesneau, Peter)
August 17, 2011 Filing 1028 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Third Party Defendant Golden State Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time for Third Party Defendants to Respond to Third Party Complaint of TDY Industries, Inc.)(Nieblas, Kari)
August 17, 2011 Filing 1027 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Re: REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decrees Unopposed Request to Enter Consent Decrees #1026 (Jonas, Lori)
August 17, 2011 Filing 1026 REQUEST for Settlement Approval of Consent Decrees Unopposed Request to Enter Consent Decrees filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Entering Consent Decrees)(Jonas, Lori)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 MINUTE: ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference (In Chambers): The Court has reviewed the parties Joint Status Report filed on August 15, 2011 #1021 . Based on the representations therein, the Court hereby CONTINUES the status conference from August 22, 2011 to Monday, October 17, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney #1020 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the City of Monterey Park be included in service of all future notices, orders and documents filed in the lead case through its attorney of record: John C. Cotti, Email: JCotti@LocalGovLaw.com; Jenkins & Hogin LLP, 1230 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 110, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266, Telephone: (310) 643-8448, Facsimile: (310) 643-8441. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the name of Vicki E. (Victrin) Land of King Cheng & Miller LLP, former counsel for City of Monterey Park, be removed from the service list of the lead case. (bm)
August 16, 2011 Filing 1023 ANSWER to Counterclaim #974 filed by Counterdefendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
August 16, 2011 Filing 1022 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Substitute Attorney #1020 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 15, 2011 Filing 1021 STATUS REPORT -- Joint filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Bloomgarden, Craig)
August 15, 2011 Filing 1020 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney filed by Counter-Defendant and Cross-Defendant Monterey Park City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Request for Service)(Cotti, John)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE (1) SUBMISSION OF ANY PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER; (2) POTENTIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: In accordance with Chief District Judge Collins' August 5, 2011 Order Striking Case Management and General Discovery Order, any proposed General Discovery Order should be presented to this Court for consideration. This Court orders any such proposed order to be submitted no later than 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, August 18, 2011. See order for details. (hr)
August 12, 2011 Filing 1018 ANSWER to Counterclaim #967 filed by Counterdefendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
August 10, 2011 Filing 1017 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Re-Lodging of Case Management Order re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #1015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Revised Case Management Order)(Cheney, Brent)
August 9, 2011 Filing 1016 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven L Hoch on behalf of Consol Third Party Defendant Southern California Water Company, ThirdParty Defendant Southern California Water Company, Counter Defendant Southern California Water Company, Consol Counter Defendant Southern California Water Company (Hoch, Steven)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS STRIKING Case Managment and General Discovery Order by Judge Audrey B. Collins: In anticipation of the status conference set for August 22, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., the parties lodged a proposed Case Management and General Discovery Order. (Docket No. 1008.) However, the portion of the proposed order regarding discovery should be addressed directly to Magistrate Judge Chooljian. Therefore, the Court STRIKES the lodged Case Management and General Discovery Order in its current form. The parties are ORDERED re-lodge with Chief Judge Collins a proposed Order containing only the Case Management portion (pages 1 through 12 up to line 5) and section VII "Failure to Comply" (page 24, lines 1719). This revised Order should be lodged no later than Wednesday, August 10, 2011. If desired, the parties should present the discovery portion (pages 12 through 24) to Magistrate Judge Chooljian separately. The August 22, 2011 status conference remains on calendar and the parties are still required to file a joint status report no later than Monday, August 15, 2011. (bm)
August 3, 2011 Filing 1014 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #1012 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Appearance. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 2, 2011 Filing 1013 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for any discovery and/or post-judgment maters that may be referred.. Case number will now read CV 02-04565 ABC(JCx). (rn)
August 2, 2011 Filing 1012 NOTICE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PHILLIP R. KAPLAN AND KELI N. OSAKI ON BEHALF OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA AND UPPER SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT filed by Third-Party Defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PHILLIP R. KAPLAN AND KELI N. OSAKI ON BEHALF OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA AND UPPER SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT (Osaki, Keli)
August 1, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #1011 as to Third Party Defendants Golden State Water Company, Monterey Park City of, San Gabriel Valley Water Company. (bm)
August 1, 2011 Filing 1011 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendants City of Monterey Park, Golden State Water Company, San Gabriel Valley Water Company, filed by defendants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, TDY Industries Inc, Art Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Third Party Complaint) (bm)
July 29, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #1010 as to plaintiff and counterdefendant United States of America. (bm)
July 29, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #1009 as to plaintiff and counterdefendant United States of America. (bm)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1010 DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT SEACHROME CORPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant United States of America, filed by counterclaimant Seachrome Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Counterclaim)(bm)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1009 DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT CRANEVEYOR CORP.'S COUNTERCLAIM against Defendant and Counterclaimant United States of America, filed by defendant and counterclaimant Craneveyor Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Counterclaim)(bm)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1008 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re Joint Proposed Case Management and General Discovery Order re Motion Hearing, Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #977 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Joint Proposed] Case Management and General Discovery Order)(Cheney, Brent) ***DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 8/5/11, DOCUMENT #1015 .*** Modified on 8/8/2011 (bm).
July 29, 2011 Filing 1007 NOTICE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PETER E. VON HAAM ON BEHALF OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT filed by Third-Party Defendant Metropolitan Water District of Southern California. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PETER E. VON HAAM ON BEHALF OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Osaki, Keli)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1006 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #998 Defendant and Counterclaimant CraneVeyor Corp.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Craneveyor Corp, Craneveyor Corp..(Maiden, Todd)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1005 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #998 Defendant and Counterclaimant Seachrome Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Seachrome Corporation Seachrome Corporation.(Maiden, Todd)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1004 DEFENDANT AND COUNTER-CLAIMANT TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant United States of America, filed by counterclaimant TDY Industries Inc. (bm) (bm).
July 25, 2011 Filing 1003 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #998 of USA and California DTSC filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant TDY Industries Inc.(Fellers, Denise)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1002 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant & Counterclaimant Astro Seal Inc.(Macdonald, James)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1001 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants & Counterclaimants Art Weiss Inc.(Macdonald, James)
July 13, 2011 Filing 1000 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #993 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices/Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Other error(s) with document(s): If change of address needs to be made in listed underlying matters, then a G-06 must be filed in each and every underlying case where change is to be made. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
July 12, 2011 Filing 997 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information #993 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 11, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint, #998 as to Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control, United States of America. (bm)
July 11, 2011 Filing 998 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Aerojet-General Corporation, Art Weiss Inc, Astro Seal Inc, Craneveyor Corp, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Linderman Living Trust, Mammoet Western Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Rush Street Properties, LLC, Seachrome Corporation, TDY Industries Inc, Time Realty Investments Inc, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties amending Second Amended Complaint 290 , filed by plaintiffs California Department of Toxic Substances Control, United States of America. (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2011: #1 Summons) (bm).
July 11, 2011 Filing 996 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim, Answer to Complaint (Discovery), #942 filed by Counterdefendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
July 11, 2011 Filing 995 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #940 filed by Counterdefendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
July 11, 2011 Filing 994 ANSWER to Counterclaim #935 filed by Counterdefendant United States of America.(Katz, Adam)
July 8, 2011 Filing 993 NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by DEENDANTS Craneveyor Corp, Earl Butler & Associates Inc, Sam C Longo, Jr, Sam C Longo, Sr, Longo Associates LLC, Manufacturer's Service Inc, Seachrome Corporation, Vanderbosch Family Trust, Western Markings Inc. (Standifer, Rose)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER GRANTING PDU DEFENDANT'S Application For Good Faith Settlement Determination And Judgment by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #976 Application for Settlement: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against PDU Defendants by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, in any and all of the following cases, and all related cases (collectively the "SEMOU Cases"): (a) San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., and related Third Party Complaint(s) USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx); (b) San Gabriel Valley Water Company. v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., and related Third Party Complaint(s), USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6346 ABC (RCx); (c) Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., and related Third Party Complaint(s) USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6340 ABC (RCx); (d) City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., and related Third Party Complaint(s), USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-5909 ABC (RCx) and in the 2007 Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and forever barred. (bm)
July 5, 2011 Filing 991 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint #985 , Initial Disclosure #989 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Disclosure #989 . Other error(s) with document(s): Document #985 should not be electronically filed. Pursuant to General Order 10-07, counsel is not permitted to e-file initiating documents. Any such initiating document must be manually filed at the Civil Intake section of the clerk's office. Summons needs to be issued by clerk. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 5, 2011 Filing 990 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control, re Miscellaneous Document #989 Initial Disclosures served on 7/1/2011. (Rushton, Ann)
July 1, 2011 Filing 989 Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control's Initial Disclosures filed by Plaintiff California Department of Toxic Substances Control (Rushton, Ann)
July 1, 2011 Filing 988 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Partial Consent Decrees and Request That Court Take No Action At This Time re Settlement Agreement, #987 , Settlement Agreement, #986 (Jonas, Lori)
July 1, 2011 Filing 987 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with Mammoet Western, Inc., Time Realty Investments, and Tonks Properties filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A (Part 1), #2 Appendix A (Part 2), #3 Appendix A (Part 3), #4 Appendix A (Part 4), #5 Appendix B, C, D and E)(Jonas, Lori)
July 1, 2011 Filing 986 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Partial Consent Decree with Aerojet-General Corporation filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A (Part 1), #2 Appendix A (Part 2), #3 Appendix A (Part 3), #4 Appendix A (Part 4), #5 Appendix B and C)(Jonas, Lori)
July 1, 2011 Filing 985 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jonas, Lori)
June 30, 2011 Filing 984 Initial DISCLOSURE and/or Second Supplemental filed by Defendant Astro Seal Inc (Macdonald, James)
June 30, 2011 Filing 983 Initial DISCLOSURE and/ or Second Supplemental filed by Defendant Art Weiss Inc (Macdonald, James)
June 27, 2011 Filing 982 NOTICE of Entry of ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING CLAIMS AND DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE GROUP OF 10 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS, re: Judgment,,,,,, #979 , filed by Third Party Defendant APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 23, 2011 Filing 976 APPLICATION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement Determination and Motion for Entry of Order of Dismissal and Final Judgment and Bar Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Allee Trust, Plastic Dress-Up Company. Application set for hearing on 7/25/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William B. DeClercq in Support of PDU Defendants' Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement; Order of Dismissal and Final Judgment; and Bar Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of William B. DeClercq, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B. Part 1 to Declaration of William B. DeClercq, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2 to Declaration of William B. DeClercq, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PDU Defendants' Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination and Proposed Judgment)(DeClercq, William)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: La Victoria Foods Inc's motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order #965 . (1) the Third Party Master Complaint in the consolidated cases and all causes of action or claims for relief in such complaint are hereby dismissed with prejudice as to La Victoria Foods, Inc.; (2) any and all past, present, or future claims against LaVictoria Foods, Inc. by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement and CD, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (ir)
June 21, 2011 60 DAY DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #974 as to Counterdefendant United States of America. (lw)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Ex Parte Application of Defendant Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion for an Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It #973 DENIED. (ir)
June 20, 2011 Filing 979 FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING CLAIMS AND DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE GROUP OF 10 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: any and all claims asserted against the G10 Defendants, and each of them, in the SEMOU Cases, which is comprised of the following actions: San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. v. Aerojet- General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx); San Gabriel Valley Water Company. v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6346 ABC (RCx); Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6340 ABC (RCx); and City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-5909 ABC (RCx), are hereby dismissed with prejudice. any and all past, present, or future claims by potentially responsible parties or joint tortfeasors or co-obligors against any or all of the G10 Defendants for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the settlement between the Plaintiffs herein and the G10 Defendants, which agreement is entitled the Agreement Among Certain Water Entities and Certain SEMOU Cooperating Parties and is attached as Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian D. Langa submitted in support of the Motion, or the matters asserted in the SEMOU Cases, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are barred. (ir)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NELSON TECHNICAL COATINGS, INC.S MOTION FOR ORDERAPPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMSAGAINST IT #971 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: any and all past, present, or future claims against the Defendant Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed inSan Gabriel Valley Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDCCentral District of California, Case No. CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), SouthernCalifornia Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, CentralDistrict of California, Case No. CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx), City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02- 5909 ABC (RCx) and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (ir)
June 20, 2011 Filing 977 MINUTES: RENEWED MOTION TO APPROVE CONSENT JUDGMENT [CV 07-6873-DOCUMENT 64]; MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT [CV 02-4565- DOCUMENT 955]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Case called. Counsel make appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding the above motions.In open Court, the Court signs proposed orders and judgments pertaining to the motions. Court and counsel confer regarding pending Third-Party Water Entity Defendants motions to dismiss and motions for Rule 11 sanctions filed in 2004. The Court ORDERS that those motions, document numbers 511 , 512 , 513 , 641 , and 642 , be STRICKEN from the record. Third-Party Water Entity Defendants are ORDERED to re-file the motions by no later than August 31, 2011. The parties are to stipulate to a briefing schedule no shorter than provided by the Local Rules, with a hearing date no earlier than October 3, 2011.The Court conducts the scheduling conference. Pursuant to the Joint Rule 26(f) Report e-filed by counsel, the Court adopts the schedule provided by Plaintiffs on page 21 of the Joint Report as follows: (1) the deadline to file joint discovery plan, modify the Case Management Order, modify the General Discovery Order, and modify the Stipulation re Discovery Protocol is July 29, 2011; (2) the last date to file and serve third-party claims against the Water Entity Plaintiffs is August 1, 2011; and (3) a further status conference is set for August 22, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed no later than August 15, 2011. The Court ORDERS that quarterly status conferences will be held, with parties and counsel to appear in person, not telephonically. The Court ORDERS that joint status reports be filed no later than seven days before each conference. Court and counsel discuss further motions to be presented to the Court. Having heard from counsel, the Court DECLINES to rule on the phasing of discovery at this time. The parties are ORDERED to proceed at this time in phase I based on Plaintiffs proposed three-phase approach, with the issue of phasing to be revisited at a later date. Defendants request to set a deadline to add other third parties and third-party claims is DENIED at this time.The Court ORDERS that Third Party Water Entity Defendants motions to dismiss and motions for Rule 11 sanctions will be briefed first. The Court also ORDERS that any motion from Defendants on the issue of divisibility of perchlorate from VOC contamination and any cross-motion from Plaintiffs related to that issue be briefed at the same time as the motions to dismiss and motions for Rule 11 sanctions. The parties agree to discuss the possibility of stipulating to undisputed facts that would be relevant to the divisibility motions and the Court urges them to do so to simplify ruling on those motions. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer pursuant to Local Rule 7-3 before filingthose motions to discuss those issues. Brian Langa, liaison counsel for the Group of 10 Defendants and Third-Party Non-Water Entity Defendants makes an oral request to be relieved as counsel of record for Third-Party Non-Water Entity Defendants. The Court GRANTS the oral request in open Court. Mr. Langa will prepare and lodge Order IT IS SO ORDERED Judge Audrey B. Collins.Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
June 17, 2011 Filing 975 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Seachrome Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent: Great American Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent: Atlantic Mutual Insurance Company for Seachrome Corporation. (lw)
June 17, 2011 Filing 974 COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America filed by plaintiff Seachrome Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued on Counterclaim)(lw)
June 17, 2011 Filing 973 DEFENDANT NELSON TECHNICAL COATINGS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Between Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. and Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Aganist It #971 filed by Defendant Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JAMES A. GEOCARIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NELSON TECHNICAL COATINGS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT NELSON TECHNICAL COATINGS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT)(Geocaris, James)
June 17, 2011 Filing 972 ANSWER Defendant Seachrome Corporation's Answer To Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Seachrome Corporation.(Maiden, Todd)
June 17, 2011 Filing 971 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Between Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. and Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Aganist It filed by Defendant Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/18/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Geocaris in Support of Motion for Order Approving Settlement of Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc. With Water Entity Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order Granting Nelson Technical Coatings, Inc's Motion for Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs)(Geocaris, James)
June 16, 2011 Filing 970 NOTICE of Entry of Order Granting Siegel Defendants' Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination filed by Defendants Wallace H Siegel. (Kovacs, Matthew)
June 13, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #967 as to Defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation. (bm)
June 13, 2011 Filing 969 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Quaker Chemical Corporation, re Counterclaim #967 , ummons and Certificate of Interested Parties. served on Lori Jonas and Gabriel Allen on behalf of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant USA by electronic mail on 6/13/2011. (lw)
June 13, 2011 Filing 968 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Quaker Chemical Corporation. (bm)
June 13, 2011 Filing 967 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant United States of America, filed by defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation. (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2011: #1 Summons on Counterclaim) (bm).
June 10, 2011 Filing 966 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority.. (Bloomgarden, Craig)
June 3, 2011 Filing 965 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval and Bar Order filed by Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Steven R. Tekosky, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven R. Tekosky, #4 Proposed Order)(Tekosky, Steven)
June 3, 2011 Filing 962 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #961 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed Order should be submitted as separate document, please review Local Rule 52-4.1 Separate Order. A separate order shall be electronically filed with any stipulation, application, motion or request of the parties requiring an order of the court....... The Stipulation was submitted TWICE - as main document and proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER CONTINUING DATE FOR FILING OF JOINT RULE 26(F) by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #961 : Based on the foregoing Stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties may have until June 10, 2011 to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (bm)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Document accepted as e-filed RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #961 ; counsel to adhere to the rules and regulations of the Court when e-filing. (ab)
June 1, 2011 Filing 961 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(F) Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloomgarden, Craig)
May 26, 2011 Filing 960 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Enforce #959 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Stipulation. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed as a separate, additional attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 25, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #925 as to Defendant Craneveyor Corp. (bm)
May 24, 2011 Filing 959 STIPULATION to Enforce Previously Entered Protective Order filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Jonas, Lori)
May 23, 2011 Filing 958 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachments #5, 6: Request for Judicial Notice #955 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Document should be e-filed as a separate, stand-alone document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 20, 2011 Filing 955 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Group of 10 Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment, #3 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #4 Declaration of Brian D. Langa, #5 Request for Judicial Notice Part 1 (Part of Exhibit A), #6 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2 (Rest of Exhibit A and Exhibit B))(Langa, Brian)
May 20, 2011 Filing 954 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Eric M McLaughlin counsel for Defendants Craneveyor Corp, Seachrome Corporation, Counter Claimant Craneveyor Corp.. Adding Eric M. McLaughlin as attorney as counsel of record for CraneVeyor Corp. (Defendant and Counterclaimant); Seachrome Corporation (Defendant) for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant; Defendant Craneveyor Corp.; Seachrome Corporation (McLaughlin, Eric)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 957 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT KESSLER DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME by Judge Audrey B. Collins: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT AS MOOT #953 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing On Kessler Defendants' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against Them. (lw)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF KESSLER DEFENDANTS FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST THEM by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against the Kessler Defendants by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in San Gabriel Valley Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx), City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-5909 ABC (RCx) and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. RE: granting #952 Motion for Settlement (lw)
May 18, 2011 Filing 953 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 5/23/2011 filed by Defendants Lisa D Kessler, Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, Michael Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of V. Thomas Meador in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Cho, Monique)
May 18, 2011 Filing 952 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement with Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against Them filed by Defendants Lisa D Kessler, Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, Michael Kessler. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of V. Thomas Meador in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Cho, Monique)
May 16, 2011 Filing 947 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter A Nyquist counsel for ThirdParty Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp. Darshann M. Padilla will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Darshann M. Padilla is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Third Party Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp (Nyquist, Peter)
May 16, 2011 Filing 946 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kirk A Hornbeck, Jr counsel for Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. Kirk A. Hornbeck will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kirk A. Hornbeck is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation (Hornbeck, Kirk)
May 13, 2011 Filing 945 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and counterclaimant TDY Industries Inc, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #936 , Counterclaim #935 , Summons Issued served on May 10, 2011. (Moskal, Brian)
May 13, 2011 Filing 944 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian Edward Moskal counsel for Defendants Chevron USA Inc, TDY Industries Inc. Adding Brian Edward Moskal as attorney as counsel of record for TDY Industries, Inc. and Chevron USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants TDY Industries, Inc. and Chevron USA Inc. (Moskal, Brian)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 951 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Audrey B. Collins, ORDERING Answer and Counterclaim submitted by Defendant Craneveyor Corp received on 5/9/2011 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Lacking Counterclaim Caption. (lw)
May 12, 2011 Filing 950 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk of Court, by A. Bridges, Deputy Clerk. Documents accepted as e-filed; Clerk spoke to counsel with respect to the above documents; counsel will adhere to the rules and regulations of the Court when e-filing such documents in the future. RE: Answer to Complaint #923 , Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim #925 Notice re Summons #926 , (lw)
May 12, 2011 Filing 939 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hartwell Corporation, re Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,, #934 served on 05/11/2011. (Inglin, Sonja)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS WALLACE H. SIEGEL, Individually And As Trustee Of The Siegel Trust, And Allen Siegel's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For An Order Shortening Time To Hear The Siegel Defendants' Application For Good Faith Settlement Determination by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying as moot #929 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing. (bm)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS WALLACE H. SIEGEL, Individually And As Trustee Of The Siegel Trust, And Allen Siegel's Application For Good Faith Settlement Determination by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #928 Application for Settlement: Defendants WALLACE SIEGEL, individually and as trustee of the Siegel Trust, and ALLEN SIEGEL, individually, (collectively hereinafter the "Siegel Defendants") Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination ("Motion"), filed on May 10, 2011, being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered and there being no opposition to the Motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion. (bm)
May 10, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #940 as to defendant Astro Seal Inc. (bm)
May 10, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #942 as to Defendants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss. (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 949 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Astro Seal Inc. Related Case(s): CV 07-06873 ABC(RCx), CV 07-06980 ABC (FFMx), CV 10-7056 ABC(RCx), CV 02-06340 ABC(RCx), CV 02-04565 ABC(RCx) and CV 02-05909 ABC(RCx) (rn)
May 10, 2011 Filing 948 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants and Counter claimants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc. Related Case(s): CV 07-06873 ABC(RCx), CV 07-06980 ABC (FFMx), CV 10-7056 ABC(RCx), CV 02-06340 ABC(RCx), CV 02-04565 ABC(RCx) and CV 02-05909 ABC(RCx) (rn)
May 10, 2011 Filing 943 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Companies, Other Affiliate Quaker Chemical Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Other Affiliate Quaker Construction Products, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation, Other Affiliate Quality Construction Products, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation, Other Affiliate Carlisle Coatings And Waterproofing Incorporated, a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Multi-Chemical Produces, Inc., a Dissolved California Corporation, Other Affiliate Multi-Chemical Products, Inc., a California Corporation, Other Affiliate MCP Chemicals International, Inc. a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Lyle P. Archer, an Individual, Other Affiliate C.P. Leu, an Individual, Other Affiliate Leu Machine and Tool, a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Robert Malone, an Individual, Other Affiliate Everett Phillips, an Individual, Other Affiliate Philips & Malone, a California Partnership, Other Affiliate Lee Pharmaceuticals, a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Tri-Fitting Mfg. Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group, Other Affiliate Constitution State Insurance Company/Travelers Insurance, Other Affiliate Allianz Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Mercury Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of The West for Art Weiss, Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc. (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 942 ANSWER OF ART WEISS, ART WEISS, INC. and DEL RAY INDUSTRIAL ENTERPRISES, INC. to Complaint 1 , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America filed by defendants Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss. (bm) (ir). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2011: #1 Summons on Counterclaim) (bm).
May 10, 2011 Filing 941 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Astro Seal Inc, identifying Other Affiliate CPI Leasing, LLC, Other Affiliate PPB Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate AS Technology, LLC, Other Affiliate HTI, LLC, Other Affiliate Linderman Trust, Other Affiliate Purex Corporation, Ltd., a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Purex Pool Products, Other Affiliate Purex Corporation, a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Purex Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Purex Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate PII Acquisitions, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate PII Holdings, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Purex Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Purex Pool Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate TP Industrial, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Companies fka St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ACE/Cigne Insurance Company fka Aetna Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Companies fka Insurance Company of the Pacific Coast, Other Affiliate Zurich North America fka Northern Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance company fka American States Insurance, Other Affiliate The Dial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Hartford Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Pentair, Inc. for Astro Seal Inc. (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 940 ANSWER to Complaint 1 , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America filed by defendant Astro Seal Inc. (bm) (ir). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2011: #1 Summons on Counterclaim) (bm).
May 10, 2011 Filing 936 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant TDY Industries Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Allegheny Technologies, Incorporated, Other Affiliate London Market Insurance Companies, Other Affiliate Youell & Companies, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies, Other Affiliate Resolute Management, Inc. for TDY Industries Inc, TDY Industries Inc. (bm)
May 10, 2011 60 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #935 as to Defendant and Counter-Claimant TDY Industries Inc. (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 935 DEFENDANT AND COUNTER-CLAIMANT TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant United States of America, filed by defendant and counter-claimant TDY Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Counterclaim) (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 931 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Craneveyor Corp, served on Summons; Certificate of Interested Parties. (Maiden, Todd)
May 10, 2011 Filing 930 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answers and Counterclaims #923 , #925 , Summons #926 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Documents #923 and #925 should not be electronically filed. Pursuant to General Order 10-07, counsel is not permitted to e-file initiating documents. Any such initiating document must be manually filed at the Civil Intake section of the Clerk's Office. Summons needs to be issued, then manually filed with Answers and Counterclaims. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 10, 2011 Filing 929 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to May 16, 2011 Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination filed by Defendant Wallace H Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sheila E. Fix in support of Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination)(Kovacs, Matthew)
May 10, 2011 Filing 928 APPLICATION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement Determination Notice of Settlement and Application for Good Faith Settlement Determination filed by Defendant Wallace H Siegel. Application set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David F. Wood in support of Application for Good Faith Settlement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Wood Declaration in support of Application for Good Faith Settlement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Wood Declaration in support of Application for Good Faith Settlement, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Application for Good Faith Settlement, #5 Affidavit Proof of Service of Application for Good Faith Settlement)(Kovacs, Matthew)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT HARTWELL CORPORATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARRING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #915 Motion for Settlement: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against Hartwell by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasors or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in San Gabriel Valley Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx), City of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-5909 ABC (RCx) and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (see document for further details) (bm)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER GRANTING CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #906 Motion: Based on the above findings and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that any and all past, present, or future claims against Chevron by any party (including any potentially responsible parties under CERCLA or any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor) for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the above-captioned consolidated cases and in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are BARRED. (see document for further details) (bm)
May 9, 2011 Filing 932 MINUTES OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT AND THIRD PARTY CHEVRON USA INC. FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER [DOCUMENT 906]; MOTION BY DEFENDANT HARTWELL CORP. FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH WATER ENTITY PLAINTIFFS AND BARING CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IT [DOCUMENT 915] Hearing held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court acknowledges no oppositions have been e-filed as to the motions. Court notes non-appearance of parties opposing motions in open Court. The Court signs both proposed order with respect to the above motions. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
May 9, 2011 Filing 927 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Counterclaimant Craneveyor Corp, identifying CNA Insurance Co.; CNA Casualty Co.; Resolute Management, Inc.; Associated International Insurance Company. (Maiden, Todd)
May 9, 2011 Filing 926 NOTICE Summons filed by Counterclaimant Craneveyor Corp. (Maiden, Todd)
May 9, 2011 Filing 925 ANSWER Defendant Craneveyor Corp.'s Answer and Counter-Claim filed by Defendant Craneveyor Corp.(Maiden, Todd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2011: #1 Summons on Counterclaim) (bm).
May 9, 2011 Filing 924 ANSWER to USA's Complaint (CV 11-0382) filed by defendant and counterclaimant TDY Industries Inc.(Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
May 9, 2011 Filing 923 ANSWER to USA's Cmplt (CV11-0382) filed by Defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim)(Johnson, Karen)
May 9, 2011 Filing 922 STATUS REPORT Update filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jonas, Lori)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: that the United States of America be included in service of all future notices and orders. (ir)
May 3, 2011 Filing 920 REQUEST for Order for Service and Notice of addition of counsel of Record filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
May 2, 2011 Filing 919 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hartwell Corporation, re Order on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing,,, #917 served on Order Granting Defendant Hartwell Corporations Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Hartwell's Motion For Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It. (Inglin, Sonja)
May 2, 2011 Filing 918 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hartwell Corporation, re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #915 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to May 9, 2011 on Hartwell's Motion for Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It #916 served on Notice of Motion of Defendant Hartwell Corporation for Order Approving Settlement With Water entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Sonja Inglin in Support of Motion of Defendant Hartwell Corporation for Order Approving Settlement With Water entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It; [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of Defendant Hartwell Corporation for Order Approving Settlement With Water entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It; Defendant Hartwell Corporations Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Hartwell's Motion For Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of Sonja A. Inglin In Support Of Defendant Hartwell Corporations Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Hartwell's Motion For Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Hartwell Corporations Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Hartwell's Motion For Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It; Stipulation Naming Hartwell Corporation as Defendant and Extending Time for Hartwell Corporation to Respond to Third Amended Complaint of SGVWC; and [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation Naming Hartwell Corporation as Defendant and Extending Time for Hartwell Corporation to Respond to Third Amended Complaint of SGVWC.. (Inglin, Sonja)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HARTWELL CORPORATION'S Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Hartwell's Motion For Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #916 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing: Hartwell Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion For An Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs And Barring Certain Claims Against It ("Application"), filed on April 28, 2011, being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered and there being no opposition to the Application, the Court GRANTS the Application. Hartwell's Motion shall be heard on May 9, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 680 of the Roybal Federal Building, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California. (bm)
April 28, 2011 Filing 916 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to May 9, 2011 on Hartwell's Motion for Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It filed by Defendant Hartwell Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonja A. Inglin in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Inglin, Sonja)
April 28, 2011 Filing 915 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Order Approving Settlement With Water Entity Plaintiffs and Barring Certain Claims Against It; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Hartwell Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonja A. Inglin in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Inglin, Sonja)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #911 Ex Parte Application Shortening Time To Hear Hear Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Settlement And Bar Order: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s ("Chevron") Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ("Application") to Hear Chevron's Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Bar Order ("Motion"), filed on April 25, 2011, being before the Court, and the evidence presented having been fully considered and there being no opposition to the Application, the Court GRANTS the Application. Chevron's Motion shall be heard on May 9, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 680 of the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
April 26, 2011 Filing 913 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Order #909 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): A stand-alone proposed order should be e-filed as a separate, additional attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 25, 2011 Filing 912 DECLARATION of Tiffany R. Hedgpeth in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to April 28, 2011 Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Bar Order #911 filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 911 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to April 28, 2011 Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Bar Order filed by defendant and third party plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 910 NOTICE Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Ex Parte Application and Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Bar Order filed by defendant and third party plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 909 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER re MOTION for Order for Approving Settlement and Bar Order Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order #906 filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 908 DECLARATION of Tiffany R. Hedgpeth in support of MOTION for Order for Approving Settlement and Bar Order Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order #906 filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 907 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for Approving Settlement and Bar Order Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order #906 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 25, 2011 Filing 906 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Settlement and Bar Order Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Bar Order filed by defendant and third party plaintiff Chevron USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Hedgpeth, Tiffany)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 905 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Government Lawsuit is consolidated with the previously consolidated Water Entity Lawsuits for all pretrial purposes (the Consolidated SEMOU Lawsuits). On or before April 29, 2011, the remaining parties in the Consolidated SEMOU Lawsuits, excluding defendants and third-party defendants who have signed settlement agreements with plaintiffs or third party plaintiffs in the actions in which they are named, shall meet to discuss the topics set forth in Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1. The parties shall file a Rule 26(f) Report on or before June 3, 2011. A Scheduling Conference in the Consolidated SEMOU Lawsuits shall occur on June 20, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 602 of this Court. Rule 26(a) Disclosures:a) The remaining parties in the Government Lawsuit shall serve their Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures no later than June 30, 2011. b) In the Water Entity Lawsuits, should any remaining party request in writing that any other remaining party update its prior Rule 26(a) Disclosure, then those parties shall meet and confer regarding the need for such an updated disclosure. Any updated Rule 26(a) Disclosure shall be due 60 days from the completionof the meet and confer process, but no earlier than June 30, 2011. No requests for discovery may be served in the Consolidated SEMOU Lawsuits prior to June 30, 2011. Attorneys for Aerojet-General Corporation are relieved of any further duties as third-party plaintiffs liaison counsel. (See document for further details). (ir)
April 8, 2011 Filing 904 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kara Elizabeth Granowitz counsel for Defendant Pacific Coast Drum Company. Adding Kara E. Granowtiz as attorney as counsel of record for Pacific Coast Drum for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pacific Coast Drum (Granowitz, Kara)
April 7, 2011 Filing 903 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Status Report #901 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Joint Proposed] Status Conference Order)(Cheney, Brent)
March 28, 2011 Filing 902 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case. Court discuss consolidation of case. Counsel have no objections to consolidating. The Court having heard from counsel, consolidates CV 11-0382 ABC (RCx) with CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx) and all other consolidated cases as follows: CV 02-5909 ABC (RCx), CV 02-6340 ABC (RCx), and CV 02-6346 ABC (RCx), for pretrial and trial purposes. The Court ORDERS all further documents and proceedings occur under the lead case, CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx) ONLY, and that CV 11-0382 ABC (RCx) be closed. Counsel to meet and confer with special master Timothy Gallagher with respect to the logistics of case. Court and counsel confer regarding consent decree in CV 10-7056 ABC (RCx). Counsel informed that papers have been received and order was signed on Friday, March 25, 2011, with a minute order to follow, with respect to the proposed judgment. Court and counsel discuss discovery issues in CV 07-6873 ABC (RCx). The Court having heard from counsel, allows plaintiffs and group of ten settling defendants to each e-file a sur-reply by no later than April 4, 2011, not to exceed 5 pages. Stephen Tuggy, liaison counsel for 3rd party plaintiffs makes an oral request to be relieved as counsel. The Court GRANTS the oral request in open Court. Counsel for plaintiffs will prepare order. Court sets the following dates as to all cases: counsel to meet and confer regarding local rule 26(f), 26-1, and local rule 26(a) by April 29, 2011. Counsel ORDERED to e-file an updated joint 26(f) report as to all remaining defendants by no later than June 3, 2011. The Court sets a scheduling conference for June 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., if deemed unnecessary the hearing will not take place. (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2011: #1 Main Document) (ab).
March 22, 2011 Filing 901 STATUS REPORT Corrected Joint Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
March 22, 2011 Filing 900 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. correcting Status Report #899 (Cheney, Brent)
March 21, 2011 Filing 899 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
March 17, 2011 Filing 898 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Substitute Attorney #897 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Request. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 16, 2011 Filing 897 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Kent Leeds Vallette in place of attorney Timothy D. McCollum filed by Counter-Claimant Tonks Properties. (Vallette, Kent)
February 11, 2011 Filing 896 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information #895 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
February 10, 2011 Filing 895 NOTICE Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation. (Johnson, Karen)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER RE EXTENSION OF STAY AND CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The stay on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case hereby is continued until March 28, 2011, to allow additional time for the parties to focus on settlement efforts and for the recently filed action styled United States of America and California Department of Toxic Substances Control vs. Seachrome Corporation, et al., CV 11-00382 ABC (JCx) (the Governments Action), to become at issue. The litigation stay remains lifted for the limited purpose of allowing the Group of 10 to renew its Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order (the Good Faith Motion) and for any pleadings in response to the Good Faith Motion. The parties are ordered to appear before the Court for a status conference on March 28, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., at which time the Court also will schedule a status conference in the Governments Action, in order to permit a discussion of coordinating the prosecution of these actions and the Governments Action. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than March 21, 2011. All other provisions of this Courts Case Management Order dated September 13, 2010 [Docket No. 878] shall remain in effect. (ir)
January 28, 2011 Filing 893 STATUS REPORT -- Joint Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloomgarden, Craig)
January 5, 2011 Filing 892 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aaron P Allan counsel for Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. Changing Firm Name to Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Valley Water Company (Allan, Aaron)
December 1, 2010 Filing 889 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gina E Och counsel for Defendant Time Realty Investments Inc. Gina E. Och will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Gina E. Och is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Gina E. Och (Och, Gina)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The stay on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case hereby is continued until January 31, 2011, to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts.The litigation stay remains lifted for the limited purpose of allowing the Group of 10 to renew its Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order (the Good Faith Motion) and for any pleadings in response to the Good Faith Motion. The status conference set for December 6, 2010, is hereby taken off calendar and the Parties are ordered to appear before the Court for a status conference on February 7, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than January 31, 2011. All other provisions of this Courts Case Management Order dated September 13, 2010 [Docket No. 878] shall remain in effect. (ir)
November 29, 2010 Filing 887 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Report filed by Counter Claimant Aerojet-General Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tuggy, Stephen)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #885 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: Time Realty Investments, Defendant, to substitute Tim M. Agajanian, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record in place and stead of Timothy D. McCollum. (bm)
November 18, 2010 Filing 885 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Tim M Agajanian in place of attorney Timothy D. McCollum filed by defendant Time Realty Investments Inc. Request set for hearing on 12/13/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Och, Gina)
October 7, 2010 Filing 884 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter A Nyquist counsel for ThirdParty Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp. Shannon Lee McLaughlin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Shannon Lee McLaughlin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Third Party Defendants Eemus Manufacturing Corporation and Janneberg Trusts f/k/a Servex Corp. (Nyquist, Peter)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #877 Patricia Chen's REQUEST for Order to be Relieved as Attorney of Record for Defendant Plastic Engineered Components Inc. (lom)
September 15, 2010 Filing 879 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request To Be Relieved as Attorney of Record #877 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order should be submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Request. A stand-alone proposed order should be submitted as a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 14, 2010 Filing 877 REQUEST for Relief from Attorney of Record filed by Defendant Plastic Engineered Components Inc. (Chen, Patricia)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 878 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case hereby is continued until December 6, 2010 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. The "Group of 10" third-party defendants shall file a renewed Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order (the "Good Faith Motion"). Before the Group of 10 files this renewed Good FaithMotion, the Parties shall meet and confer regarding the substance of this motionand the briefing schedule for it. The Parties shall agree to proposed briefingschedule that will allow the Good Faith Motion to be heard by this Court on thesame date that this Court hears the United States Environmental Protection Agencys renewed motion for entry of Consent Decree in United States v. AndrussFamily Trust, Case No. CV 07-06873. The Litigation Stay is hereby lifted for the limited purpose of allowing the Group of 10 to renew its Good Faith Motion and for any pleadings in response to the Good Faith Motion. The Parties also shall meet and confer on requests for discovery related to the Good Faith Motion, if any, including whether such requests should be coordinated with any such requests in the Consent Decree #2 Action. The Status Conference scheduled for September 17, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby taken OFF-CALENDAR. The Parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for a status conference on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than December 1, 2010. (ir)
September 10, 2010 Filing 876 Joint Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheney, Brent)
September 8, 2010 Filing 875 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): One (1) through (28); One (1) bulky document, document number B0544 ; RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #857 . (dmap)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 874 MINUTES: STATUS CONFERENCE (In Chambers): On July 27, 2010, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued a mandate in CV 07-6873, reversing and remanding this Courts denial of non-settling PRPs request to intervene. On July 1, 2010, the Ninth Circuit also issued a mandate in CV 02-4565 reversing and remanding the Courts approval of the settlement of the G10 Third-Party Defendants. The parties in these matters are ORDERED to appear before the Court for a status conference on Friday, September 17, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are also ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than Friday, September 10, 2010 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
July 12, 2010 Filing 869 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER re STAY OF PROCEEDINGS held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until September 30, 2010 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (bm)
July 1, 2010 Filing 868 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 , CCA # 08-56589. The decision of the District Court is VACATED and REMANDED. Mandate received in this district on 7/1/10. (cbr)
April 15, 2010 Filing 867 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #865 by Clerk of Court that the document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by April 20, 2010. RE: Substitution of Attorney #864 . (bm)
April 14, 2010 Filing 866 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Proceedings: Stay of Proceedings. The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until July 13, 2010 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (mg)
April 14, 2010 Filing 865 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Substitution of Attorney #864 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). Other error(s) with document(s): Counsel is using outdated form. G-01 Order should be submitted with the Request at the time of filing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 13, 2010 Filing 864 Substitution of Attorney (Agajanian, Tim) ***DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 4/15/10, DOCUMENT #867 .*** Modified on 4/15/2010 (bm).
April 7, 2010 Filing 863 NOTICE of Change of address by Rose Louise Standifer attorney for Defendants Craneveyor Corp, Earl Butler & Associates Inc, Sam C Longo, Jr, Sam C Longo, Sr, Longo Associates LLC, Manufacturer's Service Inc, Seachrome Corporation, Vanderbosch Family Trust, Western Markings Inc. Changing attorneys address to Reed Smith LLP, 101 Second Street, Suite 1800, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendants Craneveyor Corp, Earl Butler & Associates Inc, Sam C Longo, Jr, Sam C Longo, Sr, Longo Associates LLC, Manufacturer's Service Inc, Seachrome Corporation, Vanderbosch Family Trust, Western Markings Inc. (Standifer, Rose)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MINUTES: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (In Chambers); The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until April 12, 2010 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
November 6, 2009 Filing 860 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs and representatives from the California Department of Toxic Substances, the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, the U.S. Department of Justice, and the California Attorney Generals Office, and all other parties and insurers in this matter, appear before the Special Master for a mandatory settlement conference on December 9, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 680. The Court's Order is not intended to alter or replace the mandatory settlement conference set by the Special Master for 11/20/09 at 9:00 a.m. (mg)
September 24, 2009 Filing 857 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 08-56589. The record consists of Tweenty eight (28) volumes; One (1) bulky document and One (1) special handling #654 re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 . (dmap)
September 14, 2009 Filing 856 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER re STAY OF PROCEEDINGS held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until January 11, 2010 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (bm)
August 6, 2009 Filing 853 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority (Cheney, Brent)
August 6, 2009 Filing 852 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brent G Cheney counsel for Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. Changing Parker, Milliken, Clark, O'Hara & Samuelian to 555 South Flower Street, 30th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071-2440. Changing bcheney@pmcos.com to bcheney@pmcos.com. Filed by Plaintiff Brent G. Cheney (Cheney, Brent)
August 6, 2009 Filing 851 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Notice of Change of Attorney #849 , Notice of Association of Counsel #850 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event for Notice of Change of Attorney is Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Correct event for Association of Counsel is Notices-Association of Counsel. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
August 5, 2009 Filing 850 NOTICE Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
August 5, 2009 Filing 849 NOTICE Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
May 29, 2009 Filing 848 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven R Tekosky attorney for Consol Third Party Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc, Consol Counter Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc, ThirdParty Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc, Counter Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc, changing Address to 333 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 4270, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant La Victoria Foods, Inc. (Tekosky, Steven)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #837 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Marc R Greenberg for Durham Family Limited Partnership and Durham Transportation Inc, James F Kuhne, Jr for Durham Family Limited Partnership and Durham Transportation Inc. as attorney in place and stead of Gary A. Wexler. (bm)
May 12, 2009 Filing 839 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Third Party REQUEST to Substitute Attorney #837 . Requests to Substitute Attorney are not set for hearing unless ordered by the Court. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
May 11, 2009 Filing 838 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER re STAY OF PROCEEDINGS held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until September 14, 2009 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (bm)
May 11, 2009 Filing 837 Third Party REQUEST to Substitute attorney Marc R. Greenberg/James F. Kuhne, Jr. in place of attorney Gary A. Wexler filed by Third Party Defendants Durham Transportation, Inc. and filed by Third Party Defendants Durham Family Limited Partnership. Request set for hearing on 5/15/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Request For Approval fo Substitution of Attorney)(Kuhne, James)
May 8, 2009 Filing 836 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Judges' initials are not included in case number RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #834 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #835 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
May 7, 2009 Filing 835 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mark Lawrence Stermitz counsel for Consol Third Party Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company, Consol Counter Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. Changing FIRM NAME to Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard & Shapiro LLP. Filed by Third Party Defendant/Courterdefendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company (Stermitz, Mark)
May 7, 2009 Filing 834 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aaron P Allan counsel for ThirdParty Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company, Counter Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. Changing FIRM NAME to Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard & Shapiro LLP. Filed by Third Part Defendant/Counterdefendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company (Allan, Aaron)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 filed by Don Tonks, -, Shelley Linderman, M&T Company, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, The Linderman Living Trust, CCA # 08-56589. Appellees' unopposed motions for an extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The answering briefs are due June 8, 2009. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the later-served answering brief. Court records do not currently reflect that the district court has issued the certificate of record. Appellants shall monitor the issuance of the certificate of record. Order received in this district on 4/22/09. (lr)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins pursuant to the Request #825 , the stay in the above-entitled consolidated action is hereby lifted to enter the Request for dismissal of Third-party defendants. (ir)
March 25, 2009 Filing 827 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: REQUEST to Lift Stay #825 does not have proposed order submitted as a separate attachment to the Request to Lift Stay and has no separate caption page. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
March 24, 2009 Filing 826 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Barbee Trust, Rudolph B Barbee, Rudolph B Barbee. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Langa, Brian)
March 24, 2009 Filing 825 REQUEST to Lift Stay on Case re For Sole Purpose of Filing Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Rudolph B Barbee, Rudolph B Barbee. (Langa, Brian)
January 26, 2009 Filing 822 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the stay on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until April 27, 2009 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. IT IS SO ORDERED. (da)
October 30, 2008 Filing 821 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary Agnes Watson counsel for Defendants Quaker Chemical Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products, Consol Third Party Plaintiffs Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Consol Third Party Defendants Quaker Chemical Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Consol Counter Claimants Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Consol Counter Defendants Quaker Chemical Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Third Party Plaintiffs Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Third Party Defendants Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Counter Claimants Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Counter Defendants Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation. Filed by Plaintiff/Defendant Quaker Chemical and Multi-Chemical Products, Inc. (Watson, Mary)
October 27, 2008 Filing 820 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 (McCollum, Timothy)
October 9, 2008 Filing 819 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 10/15/08 RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #815 (ir)
October 8, 2008 Filing 818 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 6/23/08 and 8/18/08; Court Reporter: Katherine Stride; Court of Appeals Case Number: 08-56589; Re: #806 (McCollum, Timothy)
October 8, 2008 Filing 817 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by consol third party defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #814 served on October 7, 2008. (Stermitz, Mark)
October 8, 2008 Filing 816 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #815 does not have party case caption indicated on face page of this document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
October 7, 2008 Filing 815 notice OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #814 served on October 7, 2008. (Stermitz, Mark)
October 7, 2008 Filing 814 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mark Lawrence Stermitz counsel for Consol Counter Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. Changing firm name to Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs & Shapiro, LLP. Adding Mark L. Stermitz as attorney as counsel of record for San Gabriel Valley Water Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Valley Water Company (Stermitz, Mark)
September 30, 2008 Filing 813 IN CHAMBERS MINUTES OF Judge Audrey B. Collins, the Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery and motion work in this case, nunc pro tunc, until January 26, 2009 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. IT IS SO ORDERED. (da)
September 26, 2008 Filing 812 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 as to Defendant M&T Company; Receipt Number: 111721 in the amount of $455. (dmap) Modified on 9/30/2008 (dmap).
September 25, 2008 Filing 811 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 08-56589, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 as to Defendants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Shelley Linderman. (car)
September 24, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 (lr)
September 24, 2008 Filing 810 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Defendants M&T Company, James Andruss as The Linderman Living Trust,Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Shelley Linderman, re a $5.00 filing fee and a $450.00 docket fee are required to be paid to the Clerk, U.S. District Court. re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 (lr)
September 24, 2008 Filing 809 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION form issued regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 as to Defendants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Shelley Linderman. (lr)
September 22, 2008 Filing 808 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Appellants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Shelley Linderman, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #806 served on September 19, 2008. (McCollum, Timothy)
September 19, 2008 Filing 806 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendants/Appellants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Shelley Linderman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Revised Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Order Re Approval, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Final Judgment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Order Entering Judgment, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Representation Statement)(McCollum, Timothy)
September 8, 2008 Filing 805 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: You did not enter a description of the attachment in the docket entry. There should always be a description. Account information (for Cathereine Wieman) has not been updated in the ECF system. You must immediately update your information by going to Utilities - Maintain your address/Maintain your e-mail address. This is the second deficiency that has been sent regard updating your account information. RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #804 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
September 8, 2008 Filing 804 (Nyquist, Peter)
September 4, 2008 Filing 803 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: a generic notice was used as the event in this filing. There is a specific event called Notice of Change of Attorney Information under Notices. Attorney has not updated her name change in the ECF system. This must be done immediately. RE: Notice (Other) #793 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
August 27, 2008 Filing 802 NOTICE of Entry of FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING CLAIMS AND DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE GROUP OF 10 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS; PROOF OF SERVICE, re: Judgment,,,,,, #796 , filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust. (Langa, Brian)
August 27, 2008 Filing 801 NOTICE of Entry of ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 54(b), APPROVING SETTLEMENTS AND IMPOSING BAR OF CLAIMS; PROOF OF SERVICE, re: Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #795 , filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust. (Langa, Brian)
August 27, 2008 Filing 800 NOTICE of Entry of REVISED ORDER RE: G10 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT; ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT; AND BAR ORDER; PROOF OF SERVICE, re: Order,,, #798 , filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust. (Langa, Brian)
August 27, 2008 Filing 799 NOTICE of Entry of ORDER RE: APPROVAL OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; PROOF OF SERVICE, re: Order,,, #797 , filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company. (Langa, Brian)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 798 REVISED ORDER RE: G10 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF: ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT; AND BAR ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The following Order is identical to the Courts July 15, 2008, except that the Court has clarified footnote five as presented herein: (see document for further details). The Court will apply the pro tanto approach to the G10 Defendants' settlement of Plaintiffs CERCLA sections 107(a), 113(f), and state-law claims. The Court DENIES the non-settling Defendants' request for further discovery. The Court will impose a cost recovery bar order if it concludes that the settlement was made in good faith. The Court DENIES the non-settling Defendants' request for an evidentiary hearing, but DEFERS ruling on the good faith of the settlement. The Court ORDERS the parties to appear for oral argument on Monday, August 4, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (bm)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER RE: APPROVAL OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court finds that the settlement is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA and was reached in good faith within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure sections 877 and 877.6. Therefore, the Court GRANTS the G10 Defendants' motion for approval of the good faith of the instant settlement. The Court will sign the proposed Order and Final Judgment: (1) approving the settlement and determining it was reached in good faith; (2) dismissing all claims, with prejudice, against the G10 Defendants in the four SEMOU cases, including third-party complaints; and (3) barring any claims by potentially responsible parties, joint tortfeasors, or co-obligors for contribution, cost recovery, or indemnity against the G10 Defendants for matters asserted in this action or addressed in the settlement agreement, regardless of when such claims are asserted. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 20, 2008 Filing 796 FINAL JUDGMENT Barring Claims and Dismissing with Prejudice The Group of 10 Third Party Defendants by Judge Audrey B. Collins: any and all claims asserted againstthe G10 Defendants, and each of them, in the SEMOU Cases, which is comprised ofthe following actions: San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV 02-4565 ABC (RCx); San Gabriel Valley Water Company. v. Aerojet-GeneralCorporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6346ABC (RCx); Southern California Water Company v. Aerojet-General Corporation, etal., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-6340 ABC (RCx); andCity of Monterey Park v. Aerojet-General Corporation, et al., USDC, Central District of California, Case No. CV-02-5909 ABC (RCx), are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Any and all past, present, or future claims by potentially responsible parties or joint tortfeasors or co-obligors against any or all of the G10 Defendants for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out ofor relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the settlement between the Plaintiffs herein and the G10 Defendants, which agreement is entitled the Agreement Among Certain Water Entities and Certain SEMOU Cooperating Parties and is attached as Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian D. Langa submitted in support of the Motion, or the matters asserted in the SEMOU Cases, regardless of when such claims are asserted, are barred. (ir)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 54(b), APPROVING SETTLEMENTS AND IMPOSING BAR OF CLAIMS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Motion for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 is GRANTED in its entirety. The Court makes the following Findings and Further Orders: 1. The G10 Defendants are: James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust and James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, dated September 22, 1987 (collectively, Andruss); APW North America Inc. formerly known as Zero Corporation, erroneously sued as APW North American, Inc. f/k/a Zero Corporation, and Electronic Solutions (collectively Electronic Solutions);Cardco, and Cardinal Industrial Finishes (collectively, Cardinal); EemusManufacturing Corp. (Eemus); International Medication Systems, Ltd. (IMS);Baerbel Janneberg as Trustee of the Janneberg Trusts, f/k/a Servex Corp.(Janneberg); Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust (Jebbia); Roc-Aire Corp. (Roc-Aire); Smittybilt, Inc. (Smittybilt); and Southern California Edison (SCE). 2. The settlement between the G10 Defendants and the San Gabriel Water Quality Authority, City of Monterey Park, San Gabriel Valley Water Company, and Golden State Water Company (formerly known as Southern California Water Company) collectively, Plaintiffs) is hereby approved as substantively fair,reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA. 3. The settlement was entered into in good faith within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure Sections 877 and 877.6, and within the guidelines provided by Tech-Bilt Inc. v. Woodward Clyde & Assoc., 38 Cal.3d 488, 499 (1985). 4. As more specifically set forth in the 2007 Settlement Agreement at Section II, which agreement is attached as Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian D. Langa filed in support of the G10 Defendants Motion, the matters addressed in thesettlement are any and all claims arising out of or in any way connected with alleged contamination in the SEMOU, from any cause whatsoever, arising out of or in any way connected with, directly or indirectly, each G10 Defendants ownership, operation, arrangement, transportation, or activities at its respective site. 5. Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 113(f)(2), federal common law, and California Code of Civil Procedure Section 877.6, the Court finds that any and all past, present, or future claims by potentially responsible parties or joint tortfeasors or co-obligors against any or all of the G10 Defendants for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the settlement or the matters asserted in the SEMOU Cases, regardless of when such claims are asserted,are barred. Such claims are barred regardless of whether they are brought pursuant to CERCLA or pursuant to any other federal or state statute or common law. 6. The Third Party Master Complaint in the SEMOU Cases and all causesof action in such complaint are hereby dismissed with prejudice as to the G10Defendants. 7. All future complaints and cross-complaints by potentially responsible parties or joint tortfeasors or co-obligors against any or all of the G10 Defendants for contribution, equitable comparative contribution, cost recovery, or full, partial, or comparative indemnity, arising out of or relating to, or in connection with, the matters addressed in the settlement agreement or the matters asserted in the SEMOU Cases are hereby dismissed with prejudice. 8. Applying traditional rules of equity, this Court concludes, as part of any further calculation of liability, that the G10 Defendants have paid their fair and equitable share of SEMOU costs regarding matters addressed in the settlement, and thus, claims by potentially responsible parties or joint tortfeasors or co-obligors against one or more settling G10 Defendants pursuant to CERCLA section 107(a) regarding matters addressed in the settlement are barred. 9. There is no just reason for delay. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), final judgment is hereby entered in favor of the G10 Defendants. (ir)
August 18, 2008 Filing 794 MINUTES OF Status and Trial Setting Conference, Motion for good faith Settlement held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The case is called and counsel are present. The Court hears oral argument. The Court hereby takes the Motion for good faith Settlement under submission. The Court to issue order. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
August 15, 2008 Filing 793 NOTICE Change of Attorney Information filed by Third Party Defendants Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Baerbel Janneberg. (Mitchell, Catherine)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT HEARING by Judge Audrey B. Collins: On July 15, 2008, the Court ordered the parties to appear on Monday, August 4, 2008, for oral argument on the good faith of the plaintiffs settlement with the G10 defendants. Having reviewed the parties stipulation in which they agree to continue the hearing to August 18, 2008, to accommodate calendar conflicts, and good cause being shown therefore, IT IS ORDERED THAT the hearing on the good faith of the settlement shall be continued from August 4, 2008 to August 18, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. (ir)
July 18, 2008 Filing 790 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, re Stipulation to Continue #789 served on 07/18/2008. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 18, 2008 Filing 789 STIPULATION to Continue Good Faith Settlement Hearing from August 4, 2008 to August 18, 2008 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 18, 2008 Filing 788 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, re Notice of Association of Counsel #787 through Lexis Nexis File and Serve served on 07/18/2008. (Tuggy, Stephen)
July 18, 2008 Filing 787 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation (Tuggy, Stephen)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER REGARDING G10 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT; ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT; AND BAR ORDER #749 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court will apply the pro tanto approach to the G10 Defendants settlement of Plaintiffs CERCLA sections 107(a), 113(f), and state-law claims. The Court DENIES the non-settling Defendantsrequest for further discovery. The Court will impose a cost recovery bar order if it concludes that the settlement was made in good faith. The Court DENIES the non-settling Defendants request for an evidentiary hearing, but DEFERS ruling on the good faith of the settlement. The Court ORDERS the parties to appear for oral argument on Monday, August 4, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (ir)
July 10, 2008 Filing 783 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: RE: Supplement(Motion related) #776 : Incorrect document is attached to docket entry. Document attached is not Supplement to Motion for Settlement Approval, but entitled PROOF OF SERVICE THROUGH VERILAW TECHNOLOGIES, INC. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
July 7, 2008 Filing 782 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, re Notice (Other) #780 of Technological Error served on 07072008. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 7, 2008 Filing 781 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 Supplemental Briefing Re Necessity and Scope of Evidentiary Hearing filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 7, 2008 Filing 780 NOTICE Notice of Technological Error filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Re: Filing of Supplemental Briefing) (Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 3, 2008 Filing 779 SUPPLEMENT AL Memorandum in Support of G10 Defendants' Motion for Order Approving Settlement filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
July 3, 2008 Filing 778 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, re Supplement(Motion related) #776 served on 070308. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
July 3, 2008 Filing 777 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 Brief Regarding Evidentiary Hearing in Pro Tanto Allocation filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
July 3, 2008 Filing 776 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 Supplemental Briefing Re Necessity and Scope of Evidentiary Hearing filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 775 MINUTES: Defendant's motion for entry of order approving settlement #749 ; Order of dismissal and final judgment and bar order; Defendant Art Weiss Inc's motion to strike expert declaration of Philip Miller #762 . Motions are taken under submission by Judge Audrey B. Collins Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
June 23, 2008 Filing 774 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: Additional Briefing on Motion for Approval of Settlement held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is a motion to approve a settlement among Plaintiffs and various Defendants (G10 Defendants). The Court held oral arguments on June 23, 2008 and ordered theparties to provide further briefing on two specific issues. The G10 Defendants, Plaintiffs, and the nonsettling Defendants are ORDERED to submit simultaneous briefs, no longer than 10 pages, addressing two questions: (1) Is an evidentiary hearing always necessary when applying the pro tanto approach tosettlement allocation? (2) If the Court determines that an evidentiary hearing is necessary, what is the appropriate scope of that hearing in this case?Plaintiffs may also submit two additional pages of briefing in response to the matters asserted by the non-settling Defendants at oral argument. The parties are ORDERED to file these briefs no later than Thursday, July 3, 2008 with two courtesy copies delivered directly to chambers. The Court will set a hearing date once it determines what type of hearing is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
June 17, 2008 Filing 773 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority, re Response in Support of Motion, #767 served on June 16, 2008. (Cheney, Brent)
June 17, 2008 Filing 772 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #766 , Motion Related Document,,,,,,,,, #770 , Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, #771 , Motion Related Document,,,,,,,,, #769 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #768 served on 06/16/08. (Langa, Brian)
June 16, 2008 Filing 771 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Philip Miller #762 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 16, 2008 Filing 770 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 PART 2 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 16, 2008 Filing 769 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 PART 1 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 16, 2008 Filing 768 DECLARATION of Brian D. Langa In Support of Reply In Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 16, 2008 Filing 767 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 Reply Memorandum of Plaintiffs in Support of G10 Defendants' Motion for Order Approving Settlement filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (Cheney, Brent)
June 16, 2008 Filing 766 REPLY Support MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, Andruss Family Trust, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Langa, Brian)
June 10, 2008 Filing 765 DECLARATION of Brad L. Bunch in support of Opposition MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Counter Defendant Mary Brkich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 7 to Bunch Declaration in Support of Opposition)(McCollum, Timothy)
June 10, 2008 Filing 764 DECLARATION of Timothy D. McCollum in support of Opposition MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Counter Defendant Mary Brkich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 9 to McCollum Declaration in Support of Opposition)(McCollum, Timothy)
June 10, 2008 Filing 763 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants The Linderman Living Trust, M&T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Tonks Properties, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Counter Defendant Mary Brkich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2 and 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 4, 5, 6 and 7)(McCollum, Timothy)
June 9, 2008 Filing 762 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Philip Miller filed by Non Settling Defendants Art Weiss Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/23/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Macdonald, James)
June 9, 2008 Filing 761 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, re Declaration (Motion related) #757 , Motion Related Document, #758 , Motion Related Document, #759 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #756 served on 06092008. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
June 9, 2008 Filing 760 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendant Hartwell Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
June 9, 2008 Filing 759 EXHIBITS TO DEC. OF STEPHEN A. TUGGY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT (VOL. II, EXHS. G-K) re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
June 9, 2008 Filing 758 EXHIBITS TO DEC. OF STEPHEN A. TUGGY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT, VOL. I (EXHS. A-F) re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
June 9, 2008 Filing 757 DECLARATION of Stephen A. Tuggy in opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
June 9, 2008 Filing 756 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (Hornbeck, Kirk)
May 29, 2008 Filing 753 STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (In Chambers) held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until September 26, 2008 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (ps)
May 23, 2008 Filing 752 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #751 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,, #750 served on 05/23/08. (Langa, Brian)
May 23, 2008 Filing 751 DECLARATION of Brian D. Langa MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Company, APW North America Inc, Consol Third Party Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Consol Counter Defendants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Counter Claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian Langa Part 2#2 Declaration Declaration of Brian D. Langa part 3#3 Declaration Declaration of Brian D. Langa Part 4)(Langa, Brian)
May 23, 2008 Filing 750 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order #749 filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2#2 Request for Judicial Notice Part 3)(Langa, Brian)
May 23, 2008 Filing 749 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal and Bar Order filed by Third Party Defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, International Medication Systems Ltd, Jebbia Trust, Roc-Aire Corp, Servex Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, APW North America Inc, Cardco, Electronic Solutions, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Edison Company.Motion set for hearing on 6/23/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Unpublished Authorities#2 Proposed Final Judgment#3 Proposed Order #4 Declaration Declaration of Philip Miller)(Langa, Brian)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, Granting Stipulation to Lift Stay on Case #747 The concurrently filed Stipulation Requesting Limited Lifting of Stay is hereby approved. The stay on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case remains in effect until May 30, 2008, to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts; however, the Court hereby lifts the stay for the limited purpose of permitting the G10 Defendants to file their motion for good faith settlement determination and dismissal, permitting any other parties to file papers in opposition to or in support of such a motion, and holding a hearing on the motion. (es)
May 6, 2008 Filing 747 First STIPULATION to Lift Stay Stipulation filed by Third Party Defendant Cardinal Industrial Finishes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Requesting Limited Lifting of Stay)(Langa, Brian)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Granting REQUEST to substitute Miles Chen Law Group, P.C. in place and stead of Fulbright & Jaworski, L.L.P. (bm)
April 8, 2008 Filing 743 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel filed by Defendant Plastic Engineered Components Inc, LA Die Mold Inc. (Mainland, Richard)
March 14, 2008 Filing 736 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #735 served on 03/14/08. (Valenzuela, Ronald)
March 13, 2008 Filing 735 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ronald A Valenzuela counsel for Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, Consol Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, Consol Counter Claimant Aerojet-General Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, Counter Claimant Aerojet-General Corporation, Counter Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. Ronald A. Valenzuela will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Ronald A. Valenzuela is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Aerojet-General Corporation (Valenzuela, Ronald)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Granting Substituting attorney Aaron P Allan for San Gabriel Valley Water Company in place and stead of attorney Barry C Groveman. (yl)
March 3, 2008 Filing 728 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Aaron P. Allan in place of attorney Gregory J. Patterson In Ref. to Doc. No. 725 filed by Third Party Defendant and Counter-Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Patterson, Gregory)
March 3, 2008 Filing 727 NOTICE Notice of Errata Re: Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney filed by Third Party Defendant and Counter-Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. In Ref. to Doc. No. 725 (Patterson, Gregory)
February 28, 2008 Filing 725 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Aaron P. Allan in place of attorney Gregory J. Patterson filed by Third Party Defendant and Counter-Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Patterson, Gregory)
February 26, 2008 Filing 724 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Third Party Defendant and Counter-Defendant San Gabriel Valley Water Company. (Patterson, Gregory)
February 25, 2008 Filing 726 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Richard D Williams re Minutes Order regarding Stay of Proceedings #723 . (jp)
February 20, 2008 Filing 723 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS held before Judge Audrey B. Collins : The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until May 30, 2008 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
February 8, 2008 Filing 722 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brent G Cheney attorney for Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority, changing address and firm name for WQA's attorneys of record, Craig S. Bloomgarden and Brent G. Cheney to Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP, 11355 W. Olympic Boulvard, Los Angeles, CA 90064, telephone 310-312-4000, facsimile 310-312-4224, email: cbloomgarden@manatt.com, bcheney@manatt.com. Filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority (Cheney, Brent)
December 11, 2007 Filing 721 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Susan Yun Lee of Fulbright and Jaworski (ir)
December 11, 2007 Filing 720 Mail Returned addressed to Susan Yun Lee re Minutes of In Chambers filed, Nov. 26, 2007, Staying Case, #712 (da)
December 10, 2007 Filing 719 Mail Returned addressed to Scott Warmuth re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Staying Case, #712 (da)
December 7, 2007 Filing 718 Mail Returned addressed to Steven R. Tekosky re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Staying Case, #712 (da)
December 7, 2007 Filing 717 Mail Returned addressed to David B. Sadwick re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Staying Case, #712 (da)
December 7, 2007 Filing 716 Mail Returned addressed to Richard D Williams re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Staying Case, #712 (da)
December 5, 2007 Filing 715 Mail Returned addressed to Martin Roy Robles, Martin Roy Robles & Associates, 2120 Huntington Dr, South Pasadena, CA 91030 (vh)
December 5, 2007 Filing 714 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris, James A Geocaris Law Offices, 20321 Acacia St, Ste 200, Newport Beach, CA 92660 (vh)
December 5, 2007 Filing 713 Mail Returned addressed to Gregory P Martin, Gregory P Martin Law Offices, 20109 Big Rock Dr., Malibu, CA 90265 (vh)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MINUTES: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (In Chambers); The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until February 28, 2008 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus onsettlement efforts IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins (ir)
August 30, 2007 Filing 711 SEMOU LIAISON COUNSEL and Master Service Lists for All Lawsuits (Updated 8/29/07) filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (ad)
August 14, 2007 Filing 710 Mail Returned addressed to David B Sadwick re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #709 (es)
July 31, 2007 Filing 709 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until 11/30/2007 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. (pcl)
May 21, 2007 Filing 708 Substitution of Attorney filed. Defendant Rudolph B Barbee, as trustee of the Barbee Family frust, hereby substitutes Jennifer T Taggart, a partner with Demetrious, Del Guercio, Springer & Francis, LLP, as attorney of record in place and stead of attorney David E Cranston, Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger, LLP, approved by Judge Audrey B. Collins.(pcl, )
April 13, 2007 Filing 707 Mail Returned addressed to David B Sadwick re #706 Minute Order (pcl, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 706 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until 8/3/2007 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. Court Reporter: Not Present. (pcl, )
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 703 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ORDERING letter submitted by Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation received on 12/29/2006 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(pcl, )
December 29, 2006 Filing 704 Letter from Attorney Lawrence A Hobel. Nico Van Aelstyn is no longer at the firm of Heller Ehrman, LLP. Please forward all correspondence relating to the above-entitled cause to: Stephen Tuggy, Esq, Heller Ehrman, LLP, 333 South Hope Street, 39th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. (pcl, )
December 12, 2006 Filing 705 Mail Returned addressed to David B.Sadwick re #702 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, (bp, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 702 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Audrey B. Collins. The court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until Monday, April 2, 2007 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlment efforts. Court Reporter: not present. (pbap, )
August 29, 2006 Filing 701 Mail Returned addressed to Robert Oliver re #699 Minute Order. (jp)
August 29, 2006 Filing 700 Mail Returned addressed to David B. Sadwick re #699 Minute Order. (jp)
August 16, 2006 Filing 699 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the STAY on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case until 11/27/2006 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (pcl, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney Sonja A Inglin in place of attorney Dennis A Winston 695 (shb, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 695 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Sonja A Inglin in place of attorney Dennis A Winston filed by Defendant Hartwell Corporation. Lodged order. (shb, )
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney John F. Cermak Jr in place of attorney Joel S. Moskowitz 696 (shb, )
July 21, 2006 Filing 696 REQUEST to Substitute attorney John F. Cermak Jr in place of attorney Joel S. Moskowitz filed by Defenant Hartwell Corporation. Lodged Order. (yl, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 694 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court continues the stay on all responsive pleading, discovery, and motin work in this case until Tuesday, August 29, 2006 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. IT IS SO ORDERED.Court Reporter: Not Present. (shb, )
March 22, 2006 Filing 693 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #690 Minute Order (jag, )
March 22, 2006 Filing 692 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #689 Minute Order (jag, )
March 3, 2006 Filing 691 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Adding Michael G Martin for Central Mutual as attorney as counsel of record for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by interested party Central Mutual (jag, )
February 24, 2006 Filing 690 MINUTES by Judge Audrey B. Collins; Pursuant to the Special Masters recommendation, the following parties in this matter are no longer to participate in Court ordered costs as of 2/28/06: Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc; Astronautic Enamelers; Edwin A Franzen individually and as trustee of the Franzen Trust for 10665 Rush Street South El Monte; Claudean Mullins Kawie individually and as trustee of the Kawie Trust; Robert E Malone; Everett Phillips; and Mary Brkich.Court Reporter: n/a. (jag, )
February 21, 2006 Filing 689 MINUTES by Judge Audrey B. Collins; All responsive pleading discovery and motion work in this case is STAYED until 5/29/06 in order to allow for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts. Case stayed.Court Reporter: n/a. (jag, )
November 14, 2005 Filing 688 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen A Tuggy, Ronald A Valenzuela attorney for Defendant, Consol Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, changing address to 333 South Hope Street, Suite 3900 Los Angeles CA 90071-3043. Filed by defendant/third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation (jag, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 687 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #684 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held. (sv)
November 2, 2005 Filing 686 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #684 Minute Order (jag, )
October 28, 2005 Filing 685 NOTICE of Change of Address by David F Wood attorney for Defendant Wallace H Siegel, changing address to 10960 Wilshire Boulevard, 18th Floor Los Angeles CA 90024-3702. Filed by defendant Wallace Siegel (jag, )
October 21, 2005 Filing 684 MINUTES by Judge Audrey B. Collins; All responsive pleading, discovery and motion work in this case is STAYED until Monday 2/27/06 in order to allow time for the parties to continue to focus on settlement efforts.Court Reporter: n/a. (jag, )
September 6, 2005 Filing 683 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Thomas J Bois, II for Astro Seal Inc in place and stead of attorney Gregory P Martin by Judge Audrey B. Collins.(jag, )
August 8, 2005 Filing 682 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #680 Substitution of Attorney (old Form G-1) (jag, )
August 2, 2005 Filing 681 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #680 Substitution of Attorney (old Form G-1) (jag, )
July 19, 2005 Filing 680 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Richard D Williams for Shirley Levine in place and stead of attorney Albert M Cohen by Judge Audrey B. Collins.(jag, )
July 6, 2005 Filing 679 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #675 In Chambers Order/Directive - minute order. (pbap, )
June 28, 2005 Filing 678 NOTICE of entry of order to remove motions to dismiss and motions for sanctions from the Courts calendar without prejudice filed by third party defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. (jag, )
June 22, 2005 Filing 677 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #675 Minutes (jag, )
June 7, 2005 Filing 675 MINUTES before by Judge Audrey B. Collins: STAY OF PROCEEDING (In Chambers). All responsive pleading, discovery, ad motion work int his case is STAYED until Monday, October 24, 2005 in order to allow time for the parties to focus on settlement efforts. The parties have agreed to take all pending MOTIONS for Sanctions 641 , 513 , 516 , 511 , 512 , 642 off calendar at this time and must file a stipulation with the court no later than Monday, June 20,2005. The currently scheduled hearing date of June 27, 2005 is hereby VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (jp, )
May 23, 2005 Filing 674 NOTICE of Change of Address by attorneys Patricia Jean Chen, Colin Lennard, Richard R Mainland for defendant Plastic Engineered Components Inc, changing address to Fulbright and Jaworski LLP, 555 South Flower Street, Forty-First Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071; Telephone number: 213-892-9200; Facsimile number: 213-892-9494. (jp, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 673 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #671 Order (jag, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 672 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re #671 Order (jag, )
April 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins; Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority dismisses defendant Claudean Mullins Kawie, as trustee of Kawie Trust which has represented that it is negotiating an ability-to-pay settlement with the United States and has entered into a tolling agreement with plaintiffs from this action without prejudice. Claudean Mullins Kawie terminated.(jag, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 670 NOTICE of Change of FIRM NAME by attorney Lawrence A Hobel, Stephen A Tuggy, Ronald A Valenzuela for Defendant, Consol Third Party Plaintiff, Consol Counter Claimant, ThirdParty Plaintiff, Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation, changing FIRM NAME to Heller Ehrman. Filed by defendant/third party plaintiff and counterclaimant Aerojet-General Corporation (jag, )
April 6, 2005 Filing 669 Mail Returned addressed to Angelina Shepardson re MO #665 (jag, )
March 24, 2005 Filing 668 Mail Returned addressed to Stuart L Weisser re #665 Minute order (jag, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 667 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #665 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, (jag, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 666 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third party Plaintiff and Counterclaimants Claudean Mullins Kawie, individually and as Trustee of the Kawie Trust; individually and Trustee of the Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust as part of the Master Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (pj, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 665 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS: All responsive pleading, discovery, and motion work in this case is STAYED until Monday, June 27, 2005. The Court hereby CONTINUES hearing date on all pending MOTIONS 512 , 513 , 641 , 642 , 511 , 512 516 . Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2005 at 10:00 AM. by Judge Audrey B. Collins.Court Reporter: Not Present. (pj, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 664 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Albert M Cohen for Shirley Levine in place and stead of Malissa Hathaway McKeith by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (shb, )
January 26, 2005 Filing 662 NOTICE of Change of Address by attorneys Craig S. Bloomgarden, Brent G. Cheney, Scott D. Olson for Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority, changing address to Steefel Levitt & Weiss, 550 South Hope Street, Suite 2350, Los Angeles, CA 90071. (gk, )
January 24, 2005 Filing 663 MINUTES: Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference is held under the direction of Special Master Timothy Gallagher by Judge Audrey B. Collins Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir, )
January 24, 2005 Filing 661 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #657 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held (rl, )
January 11, 2005 Filing 658 Mail Returned addressed to James A Geocaris re #655 Notice Dismissing Party(ies)(mu, )
January 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins : All responsive pleading, discovery and motion work in this case is STAYED until 3/28/2005 in order to allow time for the parties to focus on settlement efforts. The Court hereby CONTINUES the 1/24/2004 hearing date on all pending motions to 3/28/2005 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are further ORDERED to appear for a Status/Settlement Conference on 1/24/2005 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are not required to file a Joint Status Report.Court Reporter: Not Present. (el, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 655 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Defendant Norma Clayton, as Trustee of Roy A Clayton Trust, which has represented that it is negotiating an ability-to-pay settlement with the United States and has entered into a tolling agreement with plaintiffs, from the above-captioned action without prejudice. (el, )
December 27, 2004 Filing 656 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney David F Wood for Wallace H Siegel in place and stead of attorney James H Turken by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (rl, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 660 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Malissa Hathaway McKeith for Nelson Technical Castings in place and stead of Lance Jurich by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (el, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 659 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Malissa Hathaway McKeith for Ted Levine Drum Company in place and stead of Loeb and Loeb LLP by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (el, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 653 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Malissa Hathaway McKeith of Lewis Brisbois in place and stead of Loeb and Loeb by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (el, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 652 Substitution of Attorney filed. Substituting attorney Malissa Hathaway McKeith for Pacific Coast Drum Company in place and stead of Lance Jurich by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (el, )
November 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MINUTES: BRIEFING SCHEDULE (In Chambers) Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, County of Los Angeles and Los Angeles Flood Control District filed a Motion forRule 11 sanctions. On 11/12/2004, the Court stayed all discovery and motion work in this case and continued the hearing on the motion until 1/24/2005. The parties are ORDERED to follow Local Rules 7-9 and 7-10 governing oppositions and replies. Accordingly, any opposition to the motion must be filed by no later than 1/17/2005. The parties are ORDERED to deliver courtesy to chambers by Judge Audrey B. Collins.Court Reporter: Not Present. (el, )
November 12, 2004 Filing 650 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS: (In Chambers) All responsive pleading, discover and motion work in this case is STAYED until 1/14/2005 in order to allow time for the parties to focus on settlement efforts. The Court hereby continues the 12/13/2004 hearing date on all pending Motions to 1/24/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. The parties are further ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on 1/24/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. A Joint Status Report must be filed by 1/18/2005. The curent status conference scheduled for 12/13/2004 is hereby VACATED.Court Reporter: Not Present. (el, )
October 21, 2004 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re proposed order granting ex parte application for leave to file surreply submitted by defendant Aerojet-General Corporation. (pj, )
October 20, 2004 Filing 649 SURREPLY in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); 512 filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (shb, )
October 15, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Judith A Zipkin is 213-250-7900. (bp, )
October 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 648 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Felix Astronautic to answer third-party plaintiff's complaint in the above-referenced action shall be extended to November 30, 2004 by Judge Audrey B. Collins (bp, )
October 15, 2004 Filing 647 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Claimant Claudean Mullins Kawie, Trustee of the Kawie Trust pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to JAB Holdings Inc.f/k/a J.A. Bozung Company (el, )
October 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MINUTES OF ORDER RE: Third Party Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Surreply (In Chambers) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court GRANTS the EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply 638 in part and ORDERS Third Party Plaintiffs to file a surreply (not to exceed five pages) that solely addresses the issue of qualified immunity. The surreply must be filed no later than 10/20/04. The Court DENIES leave to file a sur-surreply. Court Reporter: Not Present. (mch, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 646 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file surreply 638 ; Declaration of Byron Gee in support thereof filed by Third Party Defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. (mch, ) Modified on 10/15/2004 (mch, ).
October 12, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 512 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 513 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 641 MOTION for Sanctions, 642 MOTION for Sanctions, 511 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mch, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 643 MINUTES OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND STATUS CONFERENCE (In Chambers) held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: All discovery and motion work in this case is STAYED until Monday 12/13/04 in order to allow time for the parties to focus onsettlement efforts. The motions to dismiss the Master Third Party Complaint filed on 7/9/04 and motions for Rule 11 sanctions currently scheduled for hearing on 11/1/04 are hereby CONTINUED to Monday 12/13/04 at 10:00 AM. The parties are further ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on 12/13/2004 10:00 AM. A Joint Status Report must be filed by Monday 12/6/04. The current status conference scheduled for 11/8/04 is hereby VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (mch, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 645 AMENDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Third Party Counterdefendants Claudean Mullins Kawie, as Trustee of The Kawie Trust; Shelley Linderman, as Trustee of the Linderman Trust; M and T Company; Time Realty Investments Inc; Don Tonks and Roy Tonks and Tonks Properties LLC; Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company; Jack Barry Zwahlen, as Trustee of Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust filed by Non-Water Entity ThirdParty Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp. (el, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 642 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions against Third Party Plaintiffs filed by Third Party Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mch, ) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/20/11**Modified on 6/24/2011 (ir).
October 8, 2004 Filing 641 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions against Third Party Plaintiffs filed by Third Party Defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mch, ) *STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/20/11**Modified on 6/24/2011 (ir).
October 8, 2004 Filing 640 DECLARATION of Soniya Ziegler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply 638 filed by Defendant TDY Industries Inc. (mch, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 639 DECLARATION of Ronald A Valenzuela in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply 638 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (mch, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 638 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Third Party Plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. Lodged Order. (mch, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 637 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against the County of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles County Flood Control District, pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 513 filed by Third Party Defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. (mch, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 636 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against the County of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles County Flood Control District, pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 513 filed by Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District. (mch, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 635 JOINT REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss first and second claims for relief and first, second, fifth and sixth counterclaims for failure to state a claim (FRCP 12b(b)) 514 . (mch, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 634 REPLY to Opposition to Motion to dismiss Master Third Party complaint by The Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District 511 filed by Third Party Defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. (ir, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 633 REPLY to Opposition to Joint Motion of Government Entities to Dismiss Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief and Counterclaims Eight through Eleven on grounds of failure to comply with California Tort Claims filed by Third Party Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Monterey Park City of, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. (ir, )
September 29, 2004 Filing 632 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party counter claimant Eemus Manufacturing Corp as to counterdefendants Claudean Mullins Kawie individually, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks -, Roy Tonks, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually. (mg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 631 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information by attorney Scott D Pinsky for Defendant Rudolph B Barbee. He is no longer associated with the above-entitled case. There are other attorneys from his former law form who have appeared in this case and are on the Courts docket. (mg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 629 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Document #628 was issued erroneously. Docket entry, filed 9/20/04, is proof of service of summons and third party complaint on third party defendant APW North American Inc. This entry is not a separate document, but part of document #627 628 (mg, )
September 22, 2004 Filing 630 SEMOU LIAISON COUNSEL and Master Service Lists for all lawsuits (revised 9/21/04) filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Astronautic Enamelers; Served on 7/8/04, Answer due 7/28/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Lawrence Felix. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Lawrence Felix; Served on 7/8/04, Answer due 7/8/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Lawrence Felix and/or Astronautic Enamelers; Served 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Lawrence Felix. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District; Served 7/7/04, Answer Due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Pam Wheatley. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Southern California Edison Co; Served 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Laura Davila. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Roc-Aire Corp; Served 7/7/04, Answer Due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Jason Collins. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, Art Weiss Inc upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust; Served 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon International Medication Systems Ltd; Served 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Lawrence Felix. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes; Served on 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Lawrence Felix. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Cardco; Served on 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Lawrence Felix. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust; Served 7/8/04, Answer due 7/28/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Brian Langa, Esq. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marita Trust; Served on 7/8/04, Answer due 7/28/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited) statute, upon Brian Langa, Esq. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss; upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc. Served 7/8/04, Answer due 7/28/04. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Brian Langa, Esq. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 Filing 628 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon APW North American Inc., F/K/A Zero Corporation and Electronic Solutions; served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited), upon Vivian Imperial. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, ) Modified on 9/23/2004 (mg, ).
September 20, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust; served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004. The Summons and third party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 Filing 627 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987; served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004. The Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute not cited). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
September 20, 2004 Filing 604 ANSWER TO THE MASTER COUNTERCLAIMS of non-water entity third party defendants filed by counter-defendant Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc.(mg, )
September 17, 2004 Filing 605 ANSWER TO NON-WATER ENTITY THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by counter-defendants Mary Brkich, Claudean Mullins Kawie individually, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually.(mg, )
September 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 588 SECOND ADDENDUM TO PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman.(mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 626 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by third party defendant Smittybilt Inc. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 625 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by third party defendant Gloria Jebbia. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 624 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by third party defendant International Medication Systems Ltd. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 623 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by third party defendant Roc-Aire Corp. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 622 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 621 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 620 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Roc-Aire Corp. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Robin Michelle Hardy, Robert Stephen Niemann is 415-397-8549. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 619 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Gloria Jebbia. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 587 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Roc-Aire Corp pursuant to FRCP Rule 26. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 586 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc pursuant to FRCP Rule 26. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 585 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Gloria Jebbia as Trustee for the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust pursuant to FRCP Rule 26. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 584 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd pursuant to FRCP Rule 26. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 583 INSURANCE DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant International Medication Systems Ltd pursuant to second amended general discovery order. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 582 INSURANCE DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Roc-Aire Corp pursuant to second amended general discovery order. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 581 INSURANCE DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Gloria Jebbia as Trustee for the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust pursuant to second amended general discovery order. (mg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 580 INSURANCE DISCLOSURE filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Smittybilt Inc pursuant to second amended general discovery order. (mg, )
September 13, 2004 Filing 618 SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(e) filed by Consol Third Party Defendants and Third Party Counter Claimants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust and James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22. 22, 1987 (mg, )
September 13, 2004 Filing 617 NOTICE of Order appointing Timothy P Gallagher Special Master for the purpose of conducting settlement discussions and taking 9/23/04 hearing off calendar; filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 616 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss first and second claims for relief and first, second, fifth and sixth counterclaims for failure to state a claim (FRCP 12b(b)) 514 filed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 615 OPPOSITION to MOTION of the County of Los Angeles and Los Angeles County Flood Control District to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint 513 filed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 614 OPPOSITION to MOTION of Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Upper San Gabriel Valley Water District to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint of 511 filed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 613 OPPOSITION TO TORT CLAIMS ACT Motion to dismiss eighth through eleventh counterclaims filed by third party plaintiffs Mary Brkich, Claudean Mullins Kawie individually, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks -, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 612 DECLARATION of Tiffany R Hedgpeth in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster 512 filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 611 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster 512 filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 610 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss third party complaint against Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster 512 filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 609 DECLARATION of James C MacDonald in support of third party plaintiffs opposition to government entities MOTION to Dismiss Case 513 filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 608 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of third party plaintiffs opposition to government entities MOTION to Dismiss Case 513 filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 607 OPPOSITION to the government entities MOTION to Dismiss Case 513 filed by third party plaintiffs Aerojet-General Corporation, Art Weiss Inc, Astro Seal Inc, Mary Brkich, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Claudean Mullins Kawie, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation -, TDY Industries Inc, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks -, Roy Tonks, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Art Weiss, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 606 JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO Water Providers MOTION to Dismiss first and second claims for relief and first, second, fifth and sixth counterclaims for failure to state a claim (FRCP 12b(b)) 514 filed by defendant Plastic Engineered Components Inc. (mg, )
September 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER APPOINTING TIMOTHY P. GALLAGHER SPECIAL MASTER FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND TAKING SEPTEMBER 23, 2004 OFF CALENDAR by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS), re Order #493 (dts, )
September 9, 2004 Filing 579 ADDITIONAL SIGNATURE PAGE and Addendum to Joint Report re Discovery Plans 576 , filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mch, )
September 9, 2004 Filing 578 NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION to Appointment of Timothy P Gallagher as Special Master filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mch, )
September 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Discovery documents should not be filed unless part of a motion. Local Rule 26-2.; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: Disclosure 567 .(dts, )
September 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 571 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting third party defendants Astronautic Enamelers Inc and Lawrence Felix an extension of time to answer the third party plaintiffs complaint. Answer due 10/15/2004.(mg, )
September 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 602 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ORDERING Answer submitted by Counter Defendant Aerojet-General Corporation received on 9/7/04 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(mg, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 577 INITIAL AND/OR SUPPLEMENTAL FRCP 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff Art Weiss (mch, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 576 JOINT REPORT RE Discovery Plans (mch, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 573 DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT (No. 1) filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 603 ANSWER TO MASTER COUNTERCLAIMS of non-water entity third party defendants; filed by third party counter-defendant Aerojet-General Corporation.(mg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 601 ANSWER to Master Counterclaims of non-water entity third party defendants filed by consolidated counter-defendant Multi-Chemical Products Inc.(mg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 600 ANSWER TO MASTER COUNTERCLAIMS of non-water entity third party defendants; filed by third party counterclaimant Quaker Chemical Corporation.(mg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 599 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS of non-water entity third party defendants; filed by counter-defendant TDY Industries Inc. Demand for Jury Trial.(mg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 574 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY and production of Kessler Defendants liability insurance policies filed by defendants Lisa D Kessler, Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, Michael Kessler. (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 570 FRCP 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 569 MASTER SET OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 568 MASTER SET OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Baerbel Janneberg (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 567 FRCP 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc, Electronic Solutions (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 566 FRCP 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendants Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 565 FRCP 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Los Angeles County Flood Control District (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 564 FRCP 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 563 FRCP 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Defendants County of Los Angeles (mg, ) Modified on 9/9/2004 (mg, ).
September 3, 2004 Filing 562 INITIAL DISCLOSUREs filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Southern California Edison Co (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 561 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Consol Third Party Plaintiffs Mary Brkich, Claudean Mullins Kawie, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks -, Roy Tonks, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen, Tonks Properties (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 560 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendants Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, and Michael Kessler, and Lisa D Kessler, both individually and as co-trustees of the Kessler Living Trust (mg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 559 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of pursuant to FRCP, 26(A)(1) of third party defendants and third party counterclaimants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust and James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, dated 9/22/87. (mg, )
September 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 556 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PARAGRAPH 2 OF THE GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER RE REIMBURSEMENT FOR AND IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : DENYING PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (SEE SECOND AMENDED GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE)(dts, )
September 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SECOND AMENDED GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman,(SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)(dts, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 554 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and (c) as to third party defendants Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust and Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust from the above-captioned action without prejudice. (mg, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 553 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and (c) as to third party defendant JAB Holdings Inc; f/k/a JA Bozung Company from the above-captioned action without prejudice. (mg, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 552 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and (c) as to third party defendants Edward H Franzen as Trustee of the Franzen Trust and Franzen Trust from the above captioned-action without prejudice. (mg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 558 AFFIDAVIT of Timothy V. P. Gallagher pursuant to FRCP Section 53(b)(3). (mg, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 551 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Aircraft Stamping Co Inc without prejudice. (mg, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 549 ANSWER to Master Third Party Complaint 399 ; Jury Demand; filed by consolidated third party defendant Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation.(mg, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 548 ANSWER to Master Third Party Complaint 399 ; Jury Demand; filed by consolidated third party defendant Quaker Chemical Corporation.(mg, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 546 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third Party Defendants and Third Party Counter Claimants James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust and James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987. (nhac, )
August 25, 2004 Filing 557 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District, Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins DENYING Stipulation modifying paragraphs 21 and 22 of the general discovery order re submission of privilege logs. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Lee Pharmaceuticals, a California corporation; served on 7/26/2004, answer due 8/15/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Scott, Warmuth, Person authorized to accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Phillips and Malone, a California General Partnership; served on 7/27/04, answer due 8/16/04; The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Everett Phillips, person authorized to accept by leaving papers with Ilnorme Phillps, wife/co-occupant. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Everett Phillips, an individual; served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by substituted service, by Federal statute, upon Ilnorme Phillps, Wife/Co-occupant. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Phillips and Malone, a California General Partnership; served on 7/24/2004, answer due 8/13/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Robert Malone, Person authorized to accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 25, 2004 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon Robert Malone, an individual; served on 7/24/2004, answer due 8/13/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 25, 2004 Filing 547 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by consolidated third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, upon MCP Chemicals International Inc; served on 7/12/2004, answer due 8/1/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon James Bolotin, Person authorized to accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 24, 2004 Filing 545 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals. (mg, )
August 24, 2004 Filing 544 JOINT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by third party defendants and counterdefendants Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, Los Angeles County and Los Angeles County Flood Control District. Request set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM. (mg, )
August 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) FIRST AMENDED GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman, re Order #492 (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)(dts, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 523 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Document entitled Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc's Updated Initial Disclosures, filed 8/18/04, was erroneously docketed to 2:02-cv-4565 ABC (RCx) instead of to 2:02-cv-6346 ABC (RCx). 522 (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 654 JOINT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Third Party Defendants, Counter Defendants Astronautic Enamelers Inc, Lawrence Felix, Richard Felix, Armand Felix, Jack Stout, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Lyle P Archer, APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Lyle P Archer, Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, Astronautic Enamelers Inc, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Clamp Mfg Co Inc, Durham Transportation Inc, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, Lawrence Felix, Edward H Franzen, International Medication Systems Ltd, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, La Victoria Foods Inc, Lee Pharmaceuticals, C P Leu, Leu Machine and Tool, Los Angeles County, MCP Chemicals International Inc, Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, Robert Malone, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, Monterey Park City of, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a California Corporation, Multi-Chemical Products Inc a dissolved California Corporation, Everett Phillips, Phillips and Malone, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Quaker Construction Products Inc, Quality Construction Products Inc, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Southern California Water Company, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. (jp, )
August 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Audrey B. Collins, ORDERING Joint request for judicial notice submitted by Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster, Los Angeles County, and Los Angeles County Flood Control District, received on 8/17/04, is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Not signed by all counsel. Judges copy not identical to original.(mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 533 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Jack Barry Zwahlen, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 532 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 531 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 530 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Time Realty Investments, Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendants Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 529 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff M and T Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 528 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Shelley Linderman, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 527 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Claudean Mullins Kawie pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to third party defendant Astronautic Enamelers Inc. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 526 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Multi-Chemical Products Inc and Quaker Chemical Corporation, pursuant to FRCP 41(a), as to third party defendants 1) JAB Holdings Inc, 2) Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, 3) Edwin H Franzen. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 525 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. (mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 524 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Joint Request for Judicial Notice by Consol Third Party Defendants and counterdefendants and Notice of Lodging of Certified Copies.(mg, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 522 UPDATED INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Defendant La Victoria Foods Inc. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 598 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Baerbel Janneberg. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 597 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Consol Third Party Defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 596 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims on behalf of consolidated third party defendant Baerbel Janneberg. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 595 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by consolidated third party defendant Eemus Manufacturing Corp. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 594 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer of non-water entity third party defendants, and adoption of Master Counterclaims of non-water entity third party defendants; filed by consolidated third party defendant Southern California Edison Co. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 593 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Master Counterclaims filed by consolidated third party defendant James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, et al. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 592 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Counterclaims filed by consolidated third party defendants Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes. Demand for Jury Trial. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 591 NOTICE of adoption and adoption of the Master Answer and Master Counterclaims on behalf of third party defendants APW North America Inc. Demand for Jury trial (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 590 MASTER COUNTERCLAIM against counter defendants Aerojet-General Corporation, Mary Brkich, Del Rey Industrial Enterprises Inc, Claudean Mullins Kawie individually, Shelley Linderman, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Multi-Chemical Products Inc, Quaker Chemical Corporation -, TDY Industries Inc, Time Realty Investments Inc, Time Realty Investments Inc, Don Tonks -, Roy Tonks, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Art Weiss, Jack Barry Zwahlen individually, filed by consolidated third party defendants / counter claimants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Durham Family Limited Partnership, Durham Transportation Inc, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd -, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Aerojet-General Corporation.(mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 589 MASTER ANSWER OF NON-WATER ENTITY THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS to the Master Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims, with Jury Demand, filed by consolidated third party defendants APW North America Inc, James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors Trust UDT, Dated September 22, 1987, Cardco, Cardinal Industrial Finishes, Durham Family Limited Partnership, Durham Transportation Inc, Eemus Manufacturing Corp, Electronic Solutions, International Medication Systems Ltd -, JAB Holdings Inc, Baerbel Janneberg, Gloria Jebbia, Roc-Aire Corp, Smittybilt Inc, Southern California Edison Co.(mg, ) Modified on 9/22/2004 (mg, ).
August 17, 2004 Filing 541 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, dismissing the Eighth Counterclaim brought by Counterclaimants Claudean Mullins Kawie; Shelley Linderman; M and T Company; Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc; and Jack Barry Zwahlen against Counterdefendants. Dismissing the Eighth Counterclaim by Counterclaimants Time Realty Investments Inc; Don Tonks; and Roy Tonks brought against Counterdefendants Southern CA Water Company and City of Monterey Park. Dismissing the Eighth Counterclaim brought by Counterclaimant Mary Brkich against Counterdefendant Southern CA Water Company. The voluntary dismissals without prejudice are made pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the FRCP. Filed by third party plaintiffs / counterclaimants Mary Brkich, Claudean Mullins Kawie, Shelley Linderman, M and T Company, Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, Jack Barry Zwahlen. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 540 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Jack Barry Zwahlen, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 539 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 538 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, Tonks Properties, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 537 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Time Realty Investments Inc, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 536 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff M and T Company, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 535 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Shelley Linderman, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 534 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Claudean Mullins Kawie, pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), as to third party defendant Lawrence Felix. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ORDERING Answer to Third Party Complaint submitted by Consol Third Party Defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals - received on 8/16/04 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 519 ANSWER to Consolidated Master Third Party Complaint 399 filed by third party defendant La Victoria Foods Inc.(mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 518 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties; and Corporate Party Disclosure Statement, filed by Consolidated Third Party Defendant Cardco. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 517 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties; and Corporate Party Disclosure Statement of Consol Third Party Defendants APW North America Inc and Electronic Solutions. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 516 NOTICE OF Joinder of 512 Water Providers to portions of Watermasters Notice of MOTION and Motion to Master Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims, filed by third party defendants / third party counterdefendants Monterey Park City of, San Gabriel Valley Water Company, Southern California Water Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 515 DECLARATION of John H Holloway in support of: 1) Water Providers MOTION to Dismiss portions of the Master Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims 514 ; and 2) Government Entities MOTION to Dismiss portions of the Master Complaint and Counterclaims for failure to comply with tort claims act; filed by third party defendant Monterey Park City of. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 514 JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND JOINT MOTION to Dismiss first and second claims for relief, and first, second, fifth and sixth counterclaims for failure to state a claim (FRCP 12b(b)) filed by third party defendants Monterey Park City of, San Gabriel Valley Water Company, Southern California Water Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Frederick W Pfaeffle is 213-617-7801. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 513 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against the County of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles County Flood Control District, pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); filed by third party defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Flood Control District. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mg, ) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/20/11**Modified on 6/24/2011 (ir).
August 17, 2004 Filing 512 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); filed by third party defendant Main San Gabriel Basin Watermaster. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mg, ) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/20/11**Modified on 6/24/2011 (ir).
August 17, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Peter R Duchesneau, Mark David Johnson, Craig A Moyer is 310-312-4224. (mg, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 511 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Master Third Party Complaint against the Metropolitan Water District of Southern CA and Upper San Gabriel Vally Municipal Water District, pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed by third party defendants Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins. (mg, ) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/20/11**Modified on 6/24/2011 (ir).
August 16, 2004 Filing 521 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint 399 filed by third party defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals.(mg, )
August 12, 2004 Filing 510 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Quaker Chemical Corporation, upon third party defendant International Medication Systems Ltd; served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute, upon David Nassif, Agent, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 10, 2004 Filing 509 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, dismissing third party defendants JAB Holdings Inc, Edward H Franzen, Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, without prejudice. (mg, )
August 10, 2004 Filing 508 REQUEST for modification to general discovery Order filed by non-water entity third party defendants Cardinal Industrial Finishes and Cardco. (mg, )
August 9, 2004 Filing 506 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint 290 filed by Defendants Mark Kessler, Maureen Kessler, Lisa D Kessler, and Michael Kessler. (mg, )
August 9, 2004 Filing 505 NOTICE OF ORDER RE Appointment of Special Master filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
August 9, 2004 Filing 504 NOTICE OF GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 503 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Art Weiss Inc, Del Ray Industrial Enterprises Inc, Art Weiss, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) as to third party defendant Clamp Mfg Co Inc, without prejudice. (mg, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 502 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, upon Electronic Solutions; served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004. The Third Party Summons and Master Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon CT Corporation System - Agent authorized to receive service of process, by leaving with Margaret Wilson, Process Specialist. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 507 SEMOU LIAISON COUNSEL and Master Service Lists for all lawsuits (Revised 8/4/04) filed by plaintiff San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority. (mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 501 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Jack Barry Zwahlen, Trustee of the Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 500 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 499 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, and Tonks Properties LLC, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 498 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Time Realty Investments Inc, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 497 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff M and T Company, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned.(mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 496 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Shelley Linderman, Trustee of the Linderman Trust, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 495 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiff Claudean Mullins Kawie, Trustee of the Kawie Trust, upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Survivors trust Udt, Dated September 22, 1987, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon James Andruss as Trustee of the Andruss Family Trust, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon APW North American Inc f/k/a Zero Corporation, by serving Vivian Imperial, served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, As Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Mona Sue Art, as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, by serving Brian Langa, Esq., served on 7/8/04, answer due 7/28/04; Upon Lawrence Flix and/or Astronautic Enamelers Inc by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardco, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Cardinal Industrial Finishes, by serving Lawrence Felix, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon International Medical Systems Inc, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Gloria Jebbia as Trustee of the Norf James Jebbia Testamentary Trust, by serving Sean Smith, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Upper San Gabriel Valley Municipal Water District, by serving Pam Wheatley, served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004; Upon Roc-Aire Corp, by serving Jason Collins, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04; Upon Southern California Edison, by serving Laura Davila, served on 7/7/04, answer due 7/27/04. The Summons (Third Party) [To First Amended Third Party Complaint] and First Amended Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 494 MINUTES OF Discovery Status Conference held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : The Court's general discovery order to issue.Tape #: 303/304. (dts, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 493 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS),(dts, )
August 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) GENERAL DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLETE DETAILS),(dts, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 491 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by defendant and consolidated third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc, upon consolidated third party defendant JAB Holdings Inc, f/k/a JA Bozung Company, by serving Robert J Bozung, person Authorized to Accept Service of Process, by CCP 416.10; served on 6/1/2004, answer due 6/21/2004; upon consolidated third party defendant Durham Family Limited Partnership, by serving Carolyn Mulrooney, Authorized Agent for Service of Process, by CCP 416.40; served on 6/21/04, answer due 7/11/04; upon consolidated third party defendant Smittybilt Inc, by serving Greg Carr, VP Operations, Authorized to accept, by CCP 416.10; served on 7/1/2004, answer due 7/21/2004. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 490 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and (c) as to third party defendants Artistic Polishing and Plating Inc, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Exemption Trust, Mona Sue Art as Trustee of the Art 1981 Revocable Living Marital Deduction Trust, without prejudice. (mg, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 489 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) as to third party defendant JAB Holdings Inc (f/k/a Bozung Company), without prejudice. (mg, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 488 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff TDY Industries Inc pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) as to third party defendant Edwin H Franzen as Trustee of the Franzen Trust, without prejudice. (mg, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 487 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by third party plaintiffs Multi-Chemical Products Inc and Quaker Chemical Corporation, upon third party defendant International Medication Systems Ltd; Served on 7/7/04, Answer due 7/27/04. The Third Party Summons and Third Party Complaint were served by personal service, by State statute, upon David Nassif, Agent, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 486 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Multi-Chemical Products Inc and Quaker Chemical Corporation, pursuant to FRCP 41(a), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc, without prejudice. (mg, )
August 2, 2004 Filing 485 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Consolidated Third Party Plaintiff Mary Brkich. (mg, )
August 2, 2004 Filing 484 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Aerojet-General Corporation, pursuant to FRCP 41(a), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc, from the consolidated third party complaint, without prejudice. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 483 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Jack Barry Zwahlen, Trustee of the Jack Barry Zwahlen Family Trust, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co, Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 482 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Tri-Fitting Manufacturing Company Inc, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 481 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiffs Don Tonks, Roy Tonks, and Tonks Properties LLC, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 480 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Time Realty Investments Inc pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 479 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff M and T Company, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 478 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by third party plaintiff Shelley Linderman, Trustee of the Linderman Trust, pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c), as to third party defendant Clamp Manufacturing Co Inc. (mg, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 477