James Nolan v. Los Angeles City of, et al
Plaintiff: Dean Anderson, Roy P Ballesteros, Jason Lee Beatty, Dianne L Burns, Robert A Calderon, O'Neil L Carter, Angela Chu, Harold R Cox, Cynthia Danzek, Tom Danzek, William E Dougherty, Richard A Duran, Ietia G Eston, Brian P Gilman, Jonathan Goode, Joe J Hernandez, Ellis Imaizumi, Ricky L Johnson, Johnnie Jones, Jr, Richard I Levy, Samuel Earl Mark, Howard Matthews, James J May, Jr, Leonard A Miller, Kinard S Moffatt, Martha Moran, Wayne Morey, Hubert A Nino, James Nolan, Robert Nowak, Edward R Perez, Henry C Quan, Juan Santos, Jr, Shelley Savage, Greg Strenk, Linda Thompson, Tamara Joann Van Duyne, Morey Wayne, Oscar Winslow and Johnnie Zamora
Defendant: City of Los Angeles and Does
Unknown: Attorney Settlement Officer Coordinator, Gregory G Petersen, Jeffrey W Johnson and John F Walter
Movant: Helen Lopez
Case Number: 2:2003cv02190
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Feess
Presiding Judge: Andrew J. Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Gary A. Feess: After careful consideration of the relevant factors, the Court DENIES the request tocontinue the trial 1035 and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the claims of Plaintiffs ONeil Carter, Angela Chu, Tom Danzek and Henry Quan for lack of prosecution. See document for details. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (smo)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: Order Vacating Hearing. The Court has received Plaintiffs' motions for attorneys fees and costs. (Docket Nos. 970, 981.) The Court takes this matter under submission. Accordingly, the hearing previously scheduled for December 2, 2013, is VACATED. Should the Court determine that argument of counsel is required for the resolution of this motion, a new hearing will be scheduled. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. (smo)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 996 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION. The remaining four plaintiffs in this case apply ex parte for a continuance of the trial date due to the medical condition of their counsel, Gregory Pe tersen. The Court has received a declaration from counsel's wife, but not from any medical provider. Before the Court will rule on the application, it must be provided with detailed information from Mr. Petersen's treating physicians in the form of a declaration with supporting exhibits that reports on Mr. Petersen's recent surgeries, his current diagnosis, and his prognosis, including his anticipated ability to conduct a one week trial in federal court in late January 2014. The medical information should be submitted in camera under seal. (smo)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 967 STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: 1. On or about April 12, 2011 a jury trial in this matter commenced. Plaintiffs Jason Beatty, Helen Lopez, Samuel Earl Mark and James Nolan w ere represented by Greg K. Hafif and Fenja Klaus of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and defendant City of Los Angeles was represented by Brian Walter and Geoffrey Sheldon of Liebert Cassidy Whitemore. At the conclusion of the two week trial, the Jur y issued the "Special Interrogatories and Verdict Form for Plaintiffs James Nolan, Helen Lopez, Samuel Mark and Jason Beatty" attached hereto as Exhibit "A" (Docket No. 900). Based upon this Verdict, plaintiffs and defense coun sel entered into settlement discussions, of which a Settlement Agreement and Release was negotiated. 2. The Court hereby approves the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Release as fair, reasonable, appropriate, and in accordance with law, and here by incorporates by reference herein the terms of such Settlement Agreement and Release attached hereto as Exhibit "B"; 3. Consistent with said Settlement Agreement and Release, this Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Plaintiffs Roy Ballesteros, Jason Beatty, Robert Calderon, Harold Cox, William Dougherty, Ietia Eston, Ellis Imaizumi, Rick Johnson, Johnnie Jones, Helen Lopez, Samuel Earl Mark, James J. May, Jr., Leonard Miller, Kinard Moffatt, Martha Moran, Hubert Nino, Jam es Nolan, Robert Nowak, Juan Santos, Oscar Winslow, and Johnnie Zamora, only, provided, however that the Court will retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing compliance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Release, any and all motion s for attorney's fees and costs, and this Final Order and 4. That plaintiffs O'Neil Carter, Angela Chu, Tom Danzek and Henry Quon have not agreed to the Settlement Agreement and Release, and therefore the Court shall retain jurisdiction for all the above four (4) named Plaintiffs. (bm)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 766 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re: Stipulation for Protective Order, 765 . (mz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Nolan v. Los Angeles City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Anderson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy P Ballesteros
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Beatty
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne L Burns
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Calderon
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Neil L Carter
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chu
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold R Cox
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Danzek
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Danzek
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Dougherty
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Duran
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ietia G Eston
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian P Gilman
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Goode
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe J Hernandez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Imaizumi
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L Johnson
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Jones, Jr
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard I Levy
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Earl Mark
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Matthews
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J May, Jr
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A Miller
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinard S Moffatt
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Moran
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Morey
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert A Nino
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nolan
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nowak
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R Perez
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry C Quan
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Santos, Jr
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Savage
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Strenk
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Thompson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Joann Van Duyne
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morey Wayne
Represented By: Greg K Hafif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Winslow
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Zamora
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Attorney Settlement Officer Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Eugene D Senf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jeffrey W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John F Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Connie Chuang Almond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Helen Lopez
Represented By: Miguel G Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?