Sonia E F Franco, et al v. Dow Chemical Company, et al
Plaintiff: Calipta Teresa Martinez, Freddy Victorino Caceres Flores, Andrea Melania Rodriguez, Yadira Mendoza, Dominga Lucia Cordero Diaz, Juana Antonia Flores, Sabina Cristina Medina, Francisca Esperanza Membreno, Norma Luisa Martinez Ayala, Segundo Alberto Alvarado, Gertrudis A Suarez, Francisca Antonia Artola, Julia Berta Baquedano Aguilera, Juana Francisca Gaytan Martinez, Pedro Eligio Meza Centeno, Aurora Rivera Garcia, Francisco Ramos Vanega, Ana Maria Herrera Cordero, Pedro Celestino Ramirez Oporta, Juan Ramon Lopez Mendez, Maria Del Carmen Garcia Espinoa, Jeannine Esquivel, Josefa Maria Castillo Sequeira, Maria Hilaria Medina Grillos, Rosario Martinez Peralta, Emilio Maldonado Merlo, Maria Isabel Montenegro Bermudez, Vilma Sonia Flores Romero, Sahara Ordonez M, Emelina Rios Castillo, Susana Del Carmen Vanegas, Maria Eduarda Sanchez, Maria Teresa Morales Fajardo, Petrona Del Socorro Canales Alvarez, Thelma Zelmira Fonseca Arauz, Mercedes Urbina, Maria De Jesus Reyes, Ana Maria Villalta Mendez, Juana Maria Corea Perez, Eloy Enrique Lanzas Munguia, Petrona Silva Flores, Josefa Maria Gutierrez, Maria Del Socorro Solano, Maria Ines Rodriguez Quintero, Vilma Tellez Garcia, Mercedes Del Socorro Gaitan Valle, Eva Luz Calero Peralta, Maria Del Carmen Garcia Espinoza, Leonor Ponce Mejia, Eva Luz Torrez Medina, Adilia Ulloa Grillo, Rigoberto Antonio Castillo Rodriguez, Paula Elvira Castellon, Manuel Edilberto Medina Pozo, Eda Ismelda Moreno Acuna, Ignacia Maria Miranda Rodriguez, Maria De Los Santos Munguia Pineda, Rosa Adela Blanco Palma, Candelario Agenor Medina Juarez, Gloria Maria Garcia Garcia, Maria Elena Suazo, Mariano Castano Salmeron, Ana Pastora Martinez Vegas, Maria Elena Malta, Sofia Esperanza Garcia, Maria Dolores Maravilla, Jose Ramon Rojas Vega, Concepcion Santos Brenes, Maria Elsa Reyes Balmaceda, Jeronimo Vallecillo Herrera, Silvio Jose Mejia, Noelia Tellez Garcia, Migdalia Gertrudis Romero, Mayra Estulina Lopez Flores, Fernando Altamirano, Francisca Teodora Nunez, Alejandrina Garcia Lopez, Antonia Maria Ayala Moreno, Lucila Castillo Sanchez, Marling De Los Angeles Arriola E, Aurelia Victoria Montenegro Espinoza, Silvia Concepcion Romero Ayala, Cristobal Acuna Benavides, Francisca Centeno Zapata, Antonia Isabel Alfaro Ramirez, Imelda Zamora Dolmos, Haydee Eduviges Gomez Gutierrez, Laura Ramona Chavarria Espinoza, Ramon Antonio Rodriguez, Martha Valentina Lopez Betanco, Maria De Jesus Flores, Ignacia Del Socorro Rodriguez Miranda, Virginia Esperanza Lira Chavez, Tomasa Del Socorro Luna, Ana Maria Munguia Perez, Jose Santos Villalobos Villalobos, Ana Julia Rodriguez Mendoza, Luisa Matilde Valle Paniagua, Maria Cristina Calero Salgado, Martha Isabel Turcio Varela, Gertrudis Chavez Torrez, Sonia Del Carmen Centeno Rojas, Mirna Antonia Maradiaga, Maria Dilia Urbina, Maria Celina Baquedano, Juana Francisca Hernandez, Ramona Del Carmen Garcia Peralta, Alba Margarita Cerda Romero, Jose Reynaldo Pineda, Martha Adilia Soto Guadamuz, Miguel Rafael Cerna Rueda, Mariana Del Socorro Rodriguez, Martha Andrea Nunez Mendoza, Veronica Maria Betanco, Maria Elsa Jiron Romero, Balladares Vargas, Maria Del Carmen Silva Centeno, Juana Castillo Ortega, Felix Picado Neyra, Gloria Del Socorro Alvarado Lopez, Estela Borja Aquirre, Carlos Jose Mendoza, Maria Estela Moncado Espinales, Florentina Maradiaga Rodriguez, Epifania De Los Santos Ruiz Centeno, Modesto De Jesus Videa Reyes, Audelia Funez Aleman, Maria Francisca Rodriguez, Julio Alberto Calvo Rojas, Ernesto Justino Guerrero, Fausto Zelaya Tabora, Argentina Natalia Caballero, Rodolfo De Jesus Lopez Gonzalez, Jose Isidro Garcia Castellon, Donald Antonio Guillen Picado, Dinora Mendez Mendoza, Ana Luz Arteaga Gutierrez, Juana Francisca Laguna, Marcos Antonio Caceres Martinez, Rosa Maria Rivera, Jose Francisco Centeno Hernandez, Ana Maria Luna Argueta, Pablo Antonio Morales, Gloria Justina Acevedo Prado, Miriam Del Rosario Berrios, Luz Idalia Alfaro Ramirez, Juana Francisca Hernandez Hurtado, Maria Ernestina Martinez Cano, Sonia Soza Gallego, Maria Gloria Garcia Alfaro, Jose Francisco Sanchez, Jose Esteban Salazar Silva, Nimia Esperanza Reyes, Maria Auxiliadora Berrios, Nidia Del Socorro Jimenez Sanchez, Paula Paz Moncada, Eloida Neyra Sanchez, Julia Lidia Catin, Yolanda Mercedes Aleman Espinoza, Juana Pastora Cano, Emeralda Acuna Vega, Raul Federico Paniagua, Julia Esther Cruz Castro, Francisca Del Socorro Centeno, Maria Auxiliadora Gomez Morales, Ramona Francisca Silva, Esteban Roberto Romero Martinez, Dionica Veronica Paz, Rosa Amanda Garcia Jiron, Martha Isabel Gonzalez Mendoza, Petrona Del Transito Corea, Virginia Mendoza, Amado De Jesus Rios Caceres, Aura Del Socorro Jiron Romero, Julio Guzman, Pablo Flores Espinoza, Auxiliadora Olivares Leyton, Juana Francisca Munguia Parrales, Lina Isabel Rivera Ruiz, Luisa Amanda, Julia Maria Ayala Ortiz, Maria Eudelia Hernandez Roque, Liliam Antonia Espinoza, Lucia Juliana Figueroa Garcia, Maria Luisa Leyva Jarquin, Jose Eugenio Vivas Espino, Pabla Petrona Estrada, Juan Ramon Lopez Benavides, Altagracia Del Socorro Solis Navas, Gabriela Del Carmen Silva Chavarria, Gloria Esperanza Montes Mojica, Silvia Elena Candia Santos, Jose Emilio Martinez Rodriguez, Jose Francisco Baldelomar, Santos Apolonia Espinoza H, Adriana Paulina Urbina, Nieves De Jesus Alvarez Ruiz, Eduardo Jose Estevez Aguirre, Mariano De Jesus Garcia, Ricardo Rafael Estrada Ortiz, Maria Luisa Melendez, Santos Melania Rivera Munguia, Juana Francisca Lopez Campos, Manuel De Jesus Delgadillo A, Julia Antonia Paniagua Flores, Jose Dolores Romero, Jose Benito Chavarria Membreno, Modesta Lucrecia Calero Peralta, Mariana Miriam Ortiz, Amalia Del Carmen Maltez Almendares, Lucia Lucrecia Casco Gonzalez, Dominga Lidia Diaz Caballero, Roman Evenor Estrada Rivera, Candida Rosa Reyes Aguilera, Gilberto Eleodoro Poveda Martinez, Maria Elena Aguilera Davila, Maria De Los Angeles Ortega, Juana Francisca Salazar, Lidia Maria Gumercinda Carvajal, Flor De Maria Rivas, Blanca Julia Lopez Picado, Mateo Rodriguez Mendez, Candida Rosa Moncada Quiroz, Rosario De Los Angeles Salazar I, Maria Eufemia Carmona Unez, Maria Lourdes Rostran Mendoza, Julia Rosa Centeno Torrez, Otilia Vanegas Narvaez, Maria Teresa Rodriguez, Guadalupe Moran Diaz, Juana Paula Soza Montano, Macario Torrez Gonzalez, Maria Luisa Orellana Velasquez, Candida Vicenta Pasos Aguilera, Ana Jacoba Martinez, Ivan Hipolito Navarro Urroz, Adelina Espinoza, Petrona Del Socorro Munguia, Guadalupe Pasos, Ermilia De Las Nieves Paniagua, Maria De Los Angeles Diaz Martinez, Maria Adilia Zuniga, Julia Elena Zavala Castro, Igna Idolina Orellana Velasquez, Ignacia Rostran Toval, Jose Dolores Castillo Guerrero, Jose Ramon Membreno, Eulalia Esther Mayorga, Bernarda Gladys Palma Rodriguez, Maria Isabel Reyes, Maria Margarita Trejos Rivera, Julia Bertha Velasquez Abelares, Melania Del Socorro Osorto N, Tomasa Isabel Castellon Mendoza, Mayra Del Socorro Carrillo Ramirez, Paula Maria Mendoza Benavides, Bladimir Cecilio Salazar, Jose Francisco Castillo Zepeda, Mariana De Los Angeles Garcia, Francisco Jeronimo Molina, Juan Francisco Pineda Palma and Claudio Castillo Trujillo
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company and Dow Chemical Company The
Case Number: 2:2003cv05094
Filed: July 17, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Nora M Manella
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 , CCA # 08-80090. By order filed July 13, 2010, this court suspended respondent Paul A. Traina, Esq., from practice of law in this court for six month. The court conditioned Respondent's reinstatement upon a showing that he is in good standing, with no discipline pending, in all courts and bars to which he is in good standing, with no discipline pending, in all courts and bars to which he is admitted. In re Girardi, 611 F.3d 1027, 1039 (9th Cir. 2010). Respondent Traina's petition for reinstatement, filed January 14, 2011, advised that Respondent is in good standing with the State Bar of California, and that the bar's disciplinary counsel is closing the investigation of Respondent without taking any further disciplinary action. The petition also provides evidence that Respondent's concurrent and the reciprocal suspension from the bar of the Central District of California will end upon his reinstatement to the bar of this court. Accordingly, Respondent's motion for reinstatement to the practice of law in this court is granted. The Clerk shall amend the court's records accordingly. Order received in this district on 1/21/2011. (lr)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 , CCA # 08-80090. By order filed July 13, 2010, this court suspended respondent Walter J. Lack., Esq., from the practice of law in this court for six months. The court conditioned Respondent's reinstatement upon a showing that he is in good standing, with no discipline pending, in all courts and bars to which he is admitted. In re Girardi, 611 F.3d 1027, 1039 (9th Cir. 2010). Respondent Lack's petition for reinstatement, filed January 14, 2011, advised that Respondent is in good standing with the State Bar of California, and that the bar's disciplinary counsel is closing the investigation fo Respondent without taking any further disciplinary action. The petition also provides evidence that Respondent's concurrent and reciprocal suspension from the bar of the Central District of California will end upon his reinstatement to the bar of this court. Accordingly, Respondent's motion for reinstatement to the practice of law in this court is granted. The Clerk shall amend the court's records accordingly. Order received in this district on 1/21/2011. (lr)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. In its July 13, 2010 order, the court adopted in full Judge Tashima's findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendations with respect to sanctions under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 38 and 28 USC 1912 and 1927, as they appear in the corrected version of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation that Judge Tashima filed in October 7, 2009. The court also referred the issue of sanctions to the Appellate Commissioner " to conduct whatever proceedings he deems appropriate and consistent with Judge Tashima's report." Judge Tashima's Report and Recommendation recommended sanctions within specific monetary limits,and it provided that counsel for respondents and counsel for defendants shall meet and confer and shall file a joint written report detailing whether they have reached agreement on the sum owing from each Respondent to each Defendant. Accordingly, on July 30, 2010,the court ordered the parties to file a report within thirty days. On August 30, 2010, the parties filed a joint report stating that checks satisfying respondents' obligations regarding the sanctions be been exchanged. In light of these representation, the court's orders regarding sanctions have been satisfied and the matter is now closed. Order received in this district on 9/10/2010. (dmap)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 , CCA # 03-57038. In its July 13, 2010 order, the court adopted in full Judge Tashima's findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendation with respect to sanctions under Federal Rule of appellate Procedures 38 and 28 U.S.C. 1912 and 1927, as they appear in the corrected version of the Special Master's Request and Recommendation that Judge Tashima filed on October 7, 2009. The court also referred the issue of sanctions to the Appellate Commissioner to conduct whatever proceedings he deems appropriate and consistent with Judge Tashima's report. Judge Tashima's Report and Recommendation recommended sanctions within specific monetary limits, and it provided that counsel for respondents and counsel for defendants shall meet and confer and shall file a joint written report detailing whether they have reached agreement on the sum owing from each Respondent to each Defendant. Accordingly, on July 30, 2010, the court ordered the parties to file a report within 30 days. On August 30, 2010, the parties filed a joint report stating that checks satisfying respondents' obligation regarding the sanctions have been exchanged. In light of these representations, the court's orders regarding sanctions have been satisfied and the matter is now closed. Order received in this district on 9/10/2010. (lr)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-80090. The State Bar of California has requested a copy of the report of the Independent Prosecute, Professor Rory Little. Absent any objection, the panel proposes unsealing Prof. Little's report and all other sealed documents, with the following three exceptions: (1) the Declaration of Thomas V. Girardi Relating to Mitigation filed May 13, 2009; (2) the Declaration of Pamela Kay Traina filed May 13, 2009; and (3) the Submission of Thomas V. Girardi Regarding Correction to the Court's July 13, 2010 Order filed July 23, 2010. Respondents may comment on the proposed unsealing within 14 days after the filing date of this order. Order received in this district on 9/10/2010. (lr)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 , CCA # 03-57038, 08-80090. On July 13, 2010, the court adopted in full Judge Tashima's findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendations with respect to sanctions under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 38 and 28 U.S.C. 1912 and 1927, as they appear in the corrected version of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation that Judge Tashima filed on October 7, 2009. Order received in this district on 7/30/2010. (lr)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-80080. The request of Respondents Walter J. Lack and Paul A. Traina to close to the public the hearing scheudled for tomorrow, October 15, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. and to seal the transcript of the heraing, is denied. (cbr)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 , CCA # 08-80090. Oral argument on the issue possbile discipline by this Court is scheduled for Fridaty, October 2, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom One of the James R. Browning United States Courthouse at Seventh and Mission Streets in San Francisco. A total of to one hour and fifteen minutes is scheduled for argument. Walter J. Lack, Esq., Thomas V. Girardi, Esq., Paul A. Traina, Esq., and Sean A. Topp, Esq., will have a total of up to one hour. They will go first, with the option of saving time for response. They may divide the time among themselves as they see fit. Professor Rory Little will have a total of up to fifteen minutes. He will go second. The participants should be prepared to address the possible aplicability of the American Bar Association Standards for Imposing Lawyer Sanctions, a copy of which is attached to this order. They should also be prepared to address any relevant comparisions between the issue now before the Court and three earlier discipline decisions of this Court that are attached to this order. Order received in this district on 9/14/09. (lr)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. Although the Special Master does not contemplate that his services will be required in this case with respect to any furture matters, out of an abundance of caution the Special Master hereby recuses himself from any further participation in this case. Order received in this district on 1/7/08. (car)
September 26, 2008 Filing 78 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 58 , CCA # 03-57038. The Appeal is DISMISSED. Mandate received in this district on 09/26/08. (cbr)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. The evidentiary hearing now set to commence 9/19/07, is continued to the tentative dates October 1-3, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel should endeavor to keep the entire week of October 1 as well as the week of October 22 available, if necessary, in the event the evidentiary hearing needs to be reset or extends beyond the current three-day estimate. Order received in this district on 8/30/07. (car)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. Respondents have filed a status conference statement regarding the deposition of Robert Hurtado. After reviewing respondents statement and awaiting a response from defendants, the Special Master has concluded that no status conference is necessary. Hartado is represented to be the Nicaraguan attorney for the Dole Food Interests. His depoisition is sought because it is thought that he can shed light on which Dole or entities was or were parties to the Nicaraguan Franco action. The court doubts the extent to which any dispute involving this question is relevant to these proceedings. But to the extent it is relevant, respondents have pretty much laid out their position through Angel Espinoza and the Special Master sees no need for a status conference or a ruling by him on the issue. If defendants are wrongfully refusing to produce Hartado for a deposition, respondents remedy is to move to preclude defendants from introducing any evidence to contradict the testimony respondents are entitled to adduce at the evidentiary hearing on this issue, through Espinosa and through any other means. As we all know, the recognized grounds for refusing to produce a witness under a partys control for a deposition are not many, and there does not appear to be any such applicable ground here. Therefore, the Special Master suggests that if defendants continue to not cooperate in producing Espinoswa for a depossition, respondents make an appropriate in limine motion at the final pretrial conference regarding the subject matter of that deposition. The Special Master declines to intervene further in this dispute. Order received in this district on 7/2/2007. (dmap)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. Order received in this district on 06/04/7. With apologies, the Special Master overlooked a commitment to delivver a Constitution Day lecture at U.C. Berkeley on September 17, 2007. Therefore, the commencement of the evidentiary hearing is continued to two days, from September 17, 2007, to Wednesday, Septembber 19, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. The final pretrial conference date remains as presently set on September 6, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. (cbr)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 03-57038. A telephonic status conference was held on 5/29/07, commencing at 1:00 p.m., PDT. Counsel for all parties; defendants and respondents, participated. The Special Master made the following rulings: 1. The ruling in Procedural Order 4 that respondents clients have waived the attorney-client privilege applies here. 2. The Special Master confirms that expert witness reports shall be due on 7/20/07, and that any rebuttal expert witness report shall be due three weeks after the initial expertg witness reports are due. 3. With respects to ducments which defendants have declined to produce in response to document production requests on the ground of attorney-client privilege or work product protection, defendants shall serve on respondents a privilege log of all such withheld documents, except 1. intra-law firm e-mails and memos of law firms of record representing a defendants in this case including this proceeding.Said privilege log shall be served on respondents within 14 days of the date of this status conferencel. 4. Defendants shall make Kathleen Vanderziel and Michael Carter available for deposition on a date or dates mutually agreeable to counsel. 5. The evidentiary hearing is set to commence on 9/17/07, at 9:30 a.m., in the U.S. Courthouse or Roybal Courthouse, Los Angeles, California 90012. 6. The final pretrial conference is set for 9/6/07, at 10:00 a.m., in the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Buidling, Pasadena, California. Counsel shall jointly lodge a proposed final pretrial conference order, conforming to the extent practicable to Local Ruly 16-6, by 9/4/07. Counsel shall, at the same time, file their witness lists, exhibitg lists, and any separate pretrial conference statement counsel deems required. No trial briefs need be filed, except to the extent counsel believes necessary to alert the Special Mastger to any in limine issues. Counsel will be granted the opportunity to file trial briefs at the conclusion of the evidentiary hearing. Order received in this district on 6/1/07. (car)
April 2, 2007 Filing 73 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1 through 4; 1 brown folder No 1 RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) 65 (car, )
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco,, CCA # 03-57038. Dow Chemical Company and John C. O'Quinn's motion requesting that Mr. O'Quinn be allowed to withdraw as counsel for Dow Chemical Company in this action is granted. Order received in this district on 12/26/06. (car, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 71 MINUTES: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (In Chambers) Case does not settle. Discussions continuing. Time spent on settlement was 7 hours by Judge Dickran Tevrizian Court Reporter: None Present. (ir, )
November 6, 2006 Filing 70 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, CCA # 03-57038. Order received in this district on 11/09/06. Procedural Order number 3.2 (Special Master Proceeding) (lr, )
May 10, 2006 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Address by David W Ogden attorney for Defendant Shell Chemical Company, changing Address to Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP, 1875 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006; Telephone 202-663-6000. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company (shb, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, CCA # 03-57038. Order received in this district on 04/10/06. A status conference to discuss and to determine further proceedings before the Special Master on the Order to Show Cause of 08/25/05 shall be held on 05/24/06, at the James R. Browing Courthouse, Seventh and Mission Streets, San Francisco, California. (cbr, )
August 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, CCA # 03-57038. Order received in this district on 08/29/05. Each of the following firms and individuals, counsel for appellant Franco-Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack, and attorneys Walter J. Lack, Paul A. Traina and Sean A. Topp, and Girardi & Keese, and attorneys Thomas V. Girardi and Howard B. Miller- shall show cause in writing why it or he should not be required to reimburse the appellees for fees and expenses incurred in defending this appeal. and why it or he should not be suspended, disbarred, or otherwise sanctioned, under FRAP 38 and 46 and 28 U.S.C. 1292 and 1927, for filing a frivolous appeal. See document for details. (cbr, )
June 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, CCA # 03-57038. Order received in this district on 6/22/05. Dow Chemical Company's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal is Granted. Franco's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal is Denied. Franco's Request for Sanctions Against Appellees is Denied. (ghap, )
June 9, 2005 Filing 65 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 03-57038 Record consists of 1 through 4 volumes; 1 brown folder B0001. (ghap, )
February 20, 2004 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to Circuit Court, 58 filed by Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco; Court of Appeals Case Number: 03-57038. (weap, )
November 26, 2003 Filing 63 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [58-1] 03-57038 (pjap)
November 24, 2003 Filing 62 AMENDED REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re appeal [58-1] (pjap)
November 24, 2003 Filing 61 STATEMENT of Intent Not To Order Reporter's Transcript by plaintiffs'/Appellants' in support of [58-1] (pjap)
November 17, 2003 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs on 11/14/03 of Notice of Appeal (pjap)
November 17, 2003 Filing 59 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re appeal [58-1] (pjap)
November 14, 2003 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco to 9th C/A from Dist. Court order filed 10/20/03, entered 10/21/03 [54-2], order filed 10/17/03 [50-1]. (cc: Elizabeth A. Hernandez, Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack; Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese) ) Fee: Paid, $255.00, (receipt# 52870) (cbr)
October 27, 2003 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ERRATA by plaintiff correcting motion to quash the deposition subpeona of Walter Gutierrez [55-1], motion for protective order [55-2] (el)
October 23, 2003 Filing 56 APPENDIX OF NON-FEDERAL AUTHORITIES filed by plaintiffs (pj)
October 23, 2003 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to quash the deposition subpeona of Walter Gutierrez , or in the alternative for protective order ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/13/03 Lodged proposed order (pj)
October 23, 2003 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DOLE FEED COMPANY INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (el)
October 23, 2003 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDNAT SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (el)
October 23, 2003 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS (el)
October 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella that the Court GRANTS motions to dismiss plaintiff's complaint, with prejudice by Dole Food Company, Inc., Shell Chemical Company, and The Dow Chemical Company terminating case (MD JS-6) (el)
October 20, 2003 Filing 53 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS Counsel are notified that the Court will issue a ruling on Defendants' motions to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint [16-1], [14-1], [9-1] off calendar. The matter stands submitted by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
October 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella that Defendants properly removed this case based on diversity jurisdiction. Because diversity jurisdiction exists, the court need not reach the issue of federal question jurisdiction. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to remand is DENIED [29-1] (el)
October 16, 2003 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSLATION OF EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Dr. Fernando Medina [51-1] by defendant Dole Food Co Inc (el)
October 16, 2003 Filing 51 NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ARGUE FOREIGN LAW by defendant Dole Food Co Inc; Declaration of Dr Fernando Medina (el)
October 16, 2003 Filing 49 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS Counsel are notified that the Court will issue a ruling on plaintiff's motion to remand [29-1], without oral argument. The motion is taken off the 10/20/03 calendar. The matter stands submitted by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
October 8, 2003 Filing 48 RESPONSE by defendant Dow Chemical Co to declaration of Paul A Traina [47-1] (el)
October 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella ordering Declaration of Paul Traina submitted by plaintiff received on 10/3/03 to be fld and processed; fld date to be the date the doc was stamped "received but not fld" w/the Clerk (el)
October 3, 2003 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Paul A Traina filed in further support of plaintiffs' motion to remand [29-1] and oppositions to defendants' motions to dismiss [16-1], [14-1], [9-1] (el)
October 3, 2003 Filing 45 NOTICE OF OBJECTION by defendant Dole Food Co Inc to plaintiffs' references to alledged settlement discussions in plaintiffs' reply memorandum of points and authorities in support of plaintiffs' motion to remand [29-1] (el)
September 29, 2003 Filing 43 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS No later than Friday, 10/3/03, Plaintiffs shall submit documentation of the following: (1) proof of proper service on The Dow Chemical Company of complaints filed in Nicaragua, including the date(s) of such service, and (2) documentation of the date the Nicaraguan court declared The Dow Chemical Company in contempt by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
September 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Dow Chemical Co by Michael L Brem. Designating Rick Lloyd Richmond as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella. (Fee pd) (el)
September 23, 2003 Filing 42 NOTICE OF ERRATA by plaintiffs correcting reply [41-1] (el)
September 19, 2003 Filing 41 REPLY by plaintiffs to Defendants' opposition to motion to remand [29-1]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof; Declarations of Angel Espinoza, Boanerje Ojeda and Lorena Centeno and Orlando Corrales Mejia (el)
September 5, 2003 Filing 40 JOINDER by defendant Dole Food Co Inc, joining in defendants Shell Chemical Company and The Dow Chemical Company's Memoranudm of Points and Authorities in opposition of plaintiffs' motion for remand [39-1] (el)
September 5, 2003 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND QUHTORITIES IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Shell Chemical Company and The Dow Chemical Company to plaintiffs' motion to remand [29-1] (el)
August 29, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 38 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Shell Chemical LP dba Shell Chemical Co by Alison J Nathan. Designating Kristen Bird as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella. (Fee pd) (el)
August 28, 2003 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RPELY by defendant Shell Chemical to plaintiffs' opposition motion to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint [16-1] (pj)
August 28, 2003 Filing 36 APPENDIX OF NON-FEDERAL AUTHORITIES filed by defendant Dow Chemical Co (pj)
August 28, 2003 Filing 35 REPLY IN SUPPORT by defendant Dow Chemical Co to motion to dismiss [14-1] (pj)
August 28, 2003 Filing 34 REQUEST by defendant Dow Chemical Co for Judicial Notice in support of its motion to dismiss [14-1] (pj)
August 27, 2003 Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by defendant Dole Food Co Inc to motion to dismiss complaint [9-1] (pj)
August 20, 2003 Filing 32 APPENDIX OF NON-FEDERAL AUTHORITIES by Plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, et. al. to motion to Defendant Dole Food Company's motion to dismiss complaint [9-1] (el)
August 19, 2003 Filing 30 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS The Court set the following briefing schedule for plaintiffs motion to remand [29-1]: opposition to be filed no later than 9/5/03; reply if any to be filed no later than 9/19/03. The motion is re-set for hearing at 10:00 10/20/03. The motions to dismiss by defendants Dole, Dow & Shell [16-1], [14-1] and [9-1] are continued from 10/20/03 to 10:00 11/3/03 by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
August 18, 2003 Filing 31 APPENDIX of NON-FEDERAL AUTHORITIES by Plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, et al to motion to remand [29-1] (el)
August 15, 2003 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to remand ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/3/03 (pj)
August 14, 2003 Filing 28 APPENDIX OF NON-FEDERAL Authorities by Plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, Ana Maria Paniagua Franco, Ana Maria Zavala Izquierdo, Yadira Mendoza, Juana Maria Poveda, Sofia Esperanza Hernandez, Matilde Lidia Chavez Reyes, Juana De Arco Mayorga, Petrona Del Transito Corea to motion to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint [16-1] (yl)
August 14, 2003 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, Ana Maria Paniagua Franco, Ana Maria Zavala Izquierdo, Yadira Mendoza, Juana Maria Poveda, Sofia Esperanza Hernandez, Matilde Lidia Chavez Reyes, Juana De Arco Mayorga, Petrona Del Transito Corea to motion to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint [16-1] (yl)
August 14, 2003 Filing 26 APPENDIX OF NON-FEDERAL Authorities by plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, Ana Maria Paniagua Franco, Ana Maria Zavala Izquierdo, Yadira Mendoza, Juana Maria Poveda, Esperanza Hernandez, Matilde Lidia Chavez Reyes, Juana De Arco Mayorga and Petrona Del Transito Corea to motion to dismiss [14-1] (yl)
August 14, 2003 Filing 25 OPPOSITION by plaintiff Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, plaintiff Ana Maria Paniagua Franco, plaintiff Ana Maria Zavala Izquierdo, plaintiff Yadira Mendoza, plaintiff Juana Maria Poveda, plaintiff Sofia Esperanza Hernandez, plaintiff Matilde Lidia Chavez Reyes, plaintiff Juana De Arco Mayorga, plaintiff Petrona Del Transito Corea to motion to dismiss [14-1] (yl)
August 13, 2003 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to Defendant Dole Food Company's motion to dismiss complaint [9-1]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Paul A Traina (el)
August 4, 2003 Filing 22 DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiffs Sonia Eduarda Franco Franco, et al (el)
August 1, 2003 Filing 23 NOTICE of Standing Order by defendant Shell Chemical (ca)
August 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Dow Chemical Co by Michael P Foradas. Designating C Robert Boldt as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella . (Fee pd) (el)
August 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Dow Chemical Co by Jeffrey J Zeiger. Designating C Robert Boldt as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella . (Fee pd) (el)
August 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Dow Chemical Co by Gabriela I Monahan. Designating C Robert Boldt as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella . (Fee pd) (el)
July 25, 2003 Filing 17 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS The Court sets the following briefing schedule for defendants Dow & Shell's motions to dismiss: opposition to be filed no later than 8/14/03; reply if any to be filed no later than 8/28/03. The motion remains set for hearing on 10/20/03 at 10 am by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
July 24, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Dow Chemical Co by Christopher Landau. Designating Robert C Boldt as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella . (Fee pd) (el)
July 24, 2003 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Shell Chemical to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint ; motion hearing set for 10:00 10/20/03; Memorandum of Points and Auhtorities in support; Lodged prop order (el)
July 24, 2003 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by defendant Dow Chemical Co of motion to dismiss [14-1] (el)
July 24, 2003 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Dow Chemical Co to dismiss ; motion hearing set for 10:00 10/20/03 Lodged Ord (el)
July 24, 2003 Filing 12 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS The Court sets the following briefing schedule for defendant Dole's motion to dismiss complaint: opposition to be filed no later than 8/13/03; reply if any to be filed no later than 8/27/03 the motion [9-1] is reset for hearing on 10:00 10/20/03 by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
July 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Shell Chemical by David - Ogden. Designating Christopher Tayback as local counsel. Approved by Judge Nora M. Manella . (Fee pd) (el)
July 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella (el)
July 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS Counsel are notified that the above-entitled action has been recently assigned to this Court. The correct number for this case is now CV03-5094 NM(PJWx); a copy of this Court's Standing Order is enclosed. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. The address is "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov" by Judge Nora M. Manella CR: N/A (el)
July 23, 2003 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Dole Food Co Inc to dismiss complaint ; motion hearing set for 10:00 10/6/03; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support; Lodged proposed order (el)
July 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella ordering motion to dismiss submitted by defendant Dole Food Co Inc received on 7/18/03 is not to fld but instead rejected; Denial based on: No certification of interested parties (el)
July 17, 2003 Filing 7 DEFENDANT DOLE FOOD Compan Inc's (Fraudently-Joined as a sham defendant) Consent to removal to Federal Court [1-1] (nhac)
July 17, 2003 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Dole Food Company Inc. (nhac)
July 17, 2003 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. (rrey)
July 17, 2003 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Dow Chemical Co, Shell Chemical on 7/17/03 of notice of removal of action to federal court (see document for further details) (rrey)
July 17, 2003 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Dow Chemical Co, Shell Chemical on 7/17/03 of notice to adverse parties and state court of removal to federal court (rrey)
July 17, 2003 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Shell Chemical, Dow Chemical Co (rrey)
July 17, 2003 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant Dow Chemical Co from Superior Court of the State of California, Los Angeles County, Central District (Case Number: BC295683) with conformed copy of summons and complaint referred to Discovery Patrick J. Walsh. (rrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonia E F Franco, et al v. Dow Chemical Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calipta Teresa Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Victorino Caceres Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Melania Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominga Lucia Cordero Diaz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Antonia Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Cristina Medina
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Esperanza Membreno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Luisa Martinez Ayala
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Alberto Alvarado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrudis A Suarez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Antonia Artola
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Berta Baquedano Aguilera
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Gaytan Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Eligio Meza Centeno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Rivera Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ramos Vanega
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Herrera Cordero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Celestino Ramirez Oporta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Lopez Mendez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Garcia Espinoa
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine Esquivel
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefa Maria Castillo Sequeira
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hilaria Medina Grillos
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Martinez Peralta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Maldonado Merlo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Isabel Montenegro Bermudez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilma Sonia Flores Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahara Ordonez M
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emelina Rios Castillo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Del Carmen Vanegas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Eduarda Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Morales Fajardo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrona Del Socorro Canales Alvarez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Zelmira Fonseca Arauz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Urbina
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Reyes
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Villalta Mendez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Maria Corea Perez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Enrique Lanzas Munguia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrona Silva Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefa Maria Gutierrez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Socorro Solano
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ines Rodriguez Quintero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilma Tellez Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Del Socorro Gaitan Valle
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Luz Calero Peralta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Garcia Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonor Ponce Mejia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Luz Torrez Medina
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adilia Ulloa Grillo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Antonio Castillo Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Elvira Castellon
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Edilberto Medina Pozo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eda Ismelda Moreno Acuna
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacia Maria Miranda Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Los Santos Munguia Pineda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Adela Blanco Palma
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candelario Agenor Medina Juarez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Maria Garcia Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Suazo
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Castano Salmeron
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Pastora Martinez Vegas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Malta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Esperanza Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dolores Maravilla
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Rojas Vega
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Santos Brenes
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elsa Reyes Balmaceda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeronimo Vallecillo Herrera
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvio Jose Mejia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia Tellez Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Gertrudis Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Estulina Lopez Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Altamirano
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Teodora Nunez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandrina Garcia Lopez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Maria Ayala Moreno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucila Castillo Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marling De Los Angeles Arriola E
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelia Victoria Montenegro Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Concepcion Romero Ayala
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristobal Acuna Benavides
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Centeno Zapata
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Isabel Alfaro Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Zamora Dolmos
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haydee Eduviges Gomez Gutierrez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ramona Chavarria Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Antonio Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Valentina Lopez Betanco
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacia Del Socorro Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Esperanza Lira Chavez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomasa Del Socorro Luna
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Munguia Perez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santos Villalobos Villalobos
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Julia Rodriguez Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Matilde Valle Paniagua
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cristina Calero Salgado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Isabel Turcio Varela
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrudis Chavez Torrez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Del Carmen Centeno Rojas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Antonia Maradiaga
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dilia Urbina
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Celina Baquedano
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Del Carmen Garcia Peralta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Margarita Cerda Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Reynaldo Pineda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Adilia Soto Guadamuz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Rafael Cerna Rueda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Del Socorro Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Andrea Nunez Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Maria Betanco
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elsa Jiron Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balladares Vargas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Silva Centeno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Castillo Ortega
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Picado Neyra
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Del Socorro Alvarado Lopez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estela Borja Aquirre
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Jose Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Estela Moncado Espinales
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florentina Maradiaga Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epifania De Los Santos Ruiz Centeno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto De Jesus Videa Reyes
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audelia Funez Aleman
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Francisca Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Alberto Calvo Rojas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Justino Guerrero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Zelaya Tabora
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argentina Natalia Caballero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo De Jesus Lopez Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Isidro Garcia Castellon
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Antonio Guillen Picado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinora Mendez Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Luz Arteaga Gutierrez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Laguna
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Antonio Caceres Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Maria Rivera
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Centeno Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Luna Argueta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Antonio Morales
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Justina Acevedo Prado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Del Rosario Berrios
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Idalia Alfaro Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Hernandez Hurtado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ernestina Martinez Cano
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Soza Gallego
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gloria Garcia Alfaro
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Esteban Salazar Silva
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nimia Esperanza Reyes
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Auxiliadora Berrios
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nidia Del Socorro Jimenez Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Paz Moncada
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloida Neyra Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Lidia Catin
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Mercedes Aleman Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Pastora Cano
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeralda Acuna Vega
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Federico Paniagua
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Esther Cruz Castro
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Del Socorro Centeno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Auxiliadora Gomez Morales
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Francisca Silva
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Roberto Romero Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionica Veronica Paz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Amanda Garcia Jiron
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Isabel Gonzalez Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrona Del Transito Corea
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amado De Jesus Rios Caceres
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aura Del Socorro Jiron Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Guzman
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Flores Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auxiliadora Olivares Leyton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Munguia Parrales
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Isabel Rivera Ruiz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Amanda
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Maria Ayala Ortiz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Eudelia Hernandez Roque
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliam Antonia Espinoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Juliana Figueroa Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Leyva Jarquin
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Eugenio Vivas Espino
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pabla Petrona Estrada
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Lopez Benavides
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altagracia Del Socorro Solis Navas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Del Carmen Silva Chavarria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Esperanza Montes Mojica
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Elena Candia Santos
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Emilio Martinez Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Baldelomar
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Apolonia Espinoza H
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Paulina Urbina
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nieves De Jesus Alvarez Ruiz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Jose Estevez Aguirre
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano De Jesus Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rafael Estrada Ortiz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Melendez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Melania Rivera Munguia
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Lopez Campos
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel De Jesus Delgadillo A
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Antonia Paniagua Flores
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Dolores Romero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Benito Chavarria Membreno
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesta Lucrecia Calero Peralta
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Miriam Ortiz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Del Carmen Maltez Almendares
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Lucrecia Casco Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominga Lidia Diaz Caballero
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Evenor Estrada Rivera
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Rosa Reyes Aguilera
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Eleodoro Poveda Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Aguilera Davila
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Los Angeles Ortega
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Francisca Salazar
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Maria Gumercinda Carvajal
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor De Maria Rivas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Julia Lopez Picado
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mateo Rodriguez Mendez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Rosa Moncada Quiroz
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario De Los Angeles Salazar I
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Eufemia Carmona Unez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lourdes Rostran Mendoza
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Rosa Centeno Torrez
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: