Glen Broemer v. United States
Plaintiff: Glen Broemer
Defendant: United States of America, George Tenet, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Britt Snider, Robert Helgenberger, State of California, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center, George W Bush, Dick Cheney, Tom Ridge, Clark Ervin, Winston Wiley, John E McLaughlin, A B Krongard, Lowell Jacoby, Thomas R Wilson, Thomas F Gimble, Robert Mueller, -, Glenn Fine, Michael V Hayden, Joel Brenner, Paramount Pictures, Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures, Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's, Frank Terrones, Frank's Exterminator, Frank's Pest Control, MCY Multimedia, Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less, 99CentsOnly Stores, United Online Inc/Juno, Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp, DAS Security Systems, Facter Direct, McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA, Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles, Pat's Cocktail Lounge, Archer Development Inc, Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services, California Survey Research Services, US Intelligence Committees, Pat Roberts, Orrin Hatch, Mike Dewine, Christopher S Bond, Trent Lott, Olympia Snowe, Chuck Hagel, Saxby Chambliss, John W Warner, John D Rockefeller, Carl Levin, Dianne Feinstein, Ron Wyden, Richard J Durbin, Evan Bayh, John Edwards, -, Barbara Mikulski, Bob Graham, Richard Shelby, Richard H Brian, Porter J Goss, Doug Bereuter, Sherwood L Boehlert, Jim Gibbons, Ray LaHood, Randy Duke Cunningham, Peter Hoeskstra, Richard Burr, Terry Everett, Elton Gallegly, Mac Collins, Dennis J Hastert, Jane Harman, Alcee Hastings, Silvestre Reyes, Leonard L Boswell, Collin C Peterson, Bud Cramer, Anna Eshoo, Rush Holt, Dutch Ruppersberger, Nancy Pelosi, Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government, US Intelligence Community, Does 1 - 10, NBC Studios Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Boston Concessions Group Inc, OCE' Business Services Inc, City of Pasadena, Board of Regents of California, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc, McDonalds Corporation, A Samir DaFesh, Taco Bell Corp, Taco Bell of America Inc, Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, Disney Entertainment Productions, MGM Television Entertainment Inc, MGM/UA Inc, Universal Studios Inc, Time Warner Inc, America Online Inc, Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co, Kroger Group Cooperative Inc, The Kroger Co, Zack Karni, Safeway Inc, Columbia Pictures Industries Inc, Sony Pictures Television Inc, Sony Pictures Properties Inc, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc and Sony Corporation of America
Case Number: 2:2003cv09097
Filed: December 12, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward Rafeedie
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2006. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2006 Filing 147 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1-3; (mb, )
May 10, 2006 Filing 146 **DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 45***MANDATE of 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 , CCA # 04-57117. The appeal is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 5/11/06. (dmap, ) Modified on 5/18/2006 (dmap, ).
May 10, 2006 Filing 145 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 , CCA # 04-57117. The appeal is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 5/11/06. (dmap, )
July 12, 2005 Filing 144 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 04-57117 Record consists of 3 volumes, 0 exhibits., 0 transcripts (mo, )
December 22, 2004 Filing 143 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 04-57117, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 filed by Glen Broemer,. (cbr, )
December 7, 2004 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 . (wdc, )
December 7, 2004 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 filed by Glen Broemer. (wdc, )
December 3, 2004 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: None Requested; Re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 140 . (wdc, )
December 3, 2004 Filing 140 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. Appeal of Order, Order on Motion, #124 , Filed On: 09/30/04; Entered On: 10/04/04; Order, Order on Motion, #139 Filed On: 11/17/04; Entered On: 11/18/04; Filing fee $255., Paid, receipt number 18584. cc: Glen Broemer; Robyn Crowther, Caldwell Leslie Newcombe and Pettit; Henry Patrick Nelson; Barry L. Rodolff; M. Taylor Florence; Karen Darling; Snyder Dorenfield LLP; Anthony B. Gordon; Michele Beal Bagneris; Malcolm Heineke; Cory Brente; Rebecca Torrey and Genevieve Nadeau; James Lichtman and Lisa Rafferty; Gregory Stone; Robert Lester; Boston Concessions Group, Inc.; DAS Security Systems; OCE Business Services, Inc.; Marlin and Saltzman; Corey M. Brente; Frank's Pest Control; Kenneth Gross. (wdc, ) Modified on 12/7/2004 (wdc, ).
November 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying plaintiffs REQUEST for Reconsideration of order dismissing action for failure to abide courts order 128 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(lc, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 138 REQUEST for Declaratory Relief/MOTION to Compel City of Los Angeles compliance with Plaintiffs Subpoenas for Documents and Evidence relating ot hearms to Glen Broemer. Request for other Evidence filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. (bg, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 137 REQUEST to Continue Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Dismissal Order filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. (bg, )
November 12, 2004 Filing 136 NOTICE OF JOINDER TO OPPOSITION re REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by Defendant State of California. (bg, )
November 8, 2004 Filing 135 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by defendants America Online Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, Disney Entertainment Productions, MCY Multimedia, MGM Television Entertainment Inc, MGM/UA Inc, Paramount Pictures, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Sony Pictures Properties Inc, Sony Pictures Television Inc, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc. (bg, )
November 8, 2004 Filing 134 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by defendant Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles. (bg, )
November 8, 2004 Filing 133 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by defendantRaymond Cerulli dba Pat's Cocktail Lounge. (bg, )
November 8, 2004 Filing 132 OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by defendants McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc. (bg, )
November 1, 2004 Filing 131 OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Reconsideration 128 filed by defendant County of Los Angeles. (bg, )
October 14, 2004 Filing 129 MINUTES OF Proceedings: In Chambers - Plaintiff has filed motion for reconsideration of dismissal of action. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.)Court Reporter: Not Present. (bg, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 128 REQUEST for Reconsideration regarding Court Order Dismissing action for failure to abide Courts Order filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. (bg, )
October 4, 2004 Filing 127 MINUTES of Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: re Defendant County of Los Angeles Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued by Plaintiff and Motion for Protective Order 97 . Motions are DENIED for lack of appearance by counsel.Tape #: CV04-21. (ib, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 126 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant 99CentsOnly Stores re 125 Reply Memorandum to Motion, was served upon Glen Broemer by mail on 10/1/04. (bg, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 125 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in support to MOTION to Dismiss 77 filed by defendant 99CentsOnly Stores. (bg, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case or MOTION for More Definite Statement 122 filed by defendants Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co, Kroger Group Cooperative Inc, The Kroger Co. (bg, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case the first amended complaint or in the alternatively, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by defendants Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co, Kroger Group Cooperative Inc, The Kroger Co. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow. (bg, )
September 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Edward Rafeedie As Plaintiff has provided no basis of support for his claims, the court cannot find that there is any likelihood that he will succeed on the merits of those claims. Moreover, because of the inherent unbelievability of plaintiffs claims, the court cannot find a possibility of irreparable injury or a balance of hardships that tips in his favor. The REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order and for a preliminary injunction 4 are accordingly Denied. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(bg, )
September 27, 2004 Filing 121 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs MOTION for Injunctive Relief 17 filed by specially appearing defendant Board of Regents of California. Memorandum of points and authorities (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 130 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Plaintiffs notice of vacation; notice of motion for injunctive relief; subpoena motion for injunctive relief (Justice Department); subpoena motion for injunctive relief (Federal Bureau of Investigation) subpoena motion for injunctive relief (City of Los Angeles/Los Angeles Police Department) subpoena motion for injunctive relief (County of Los Angeles) was served upon (see service list) by hand service on 10/18/04. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 120 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed upon Kroger Group Cooperative Inc served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by business or a person apparently in charge of the office of place of business, by Federal statute, upon Not indicated whom accept service. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (yc, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 119 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon The Kroger Co served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 117 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 116 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon CBS Broadcasting Inc served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (mehtod of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving servie missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 115 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Paramount Pictures served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 114 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon America Online Inc served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 113 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Boston Concessions Group Inc served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 112 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Sony Corporation of America served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, ) Modified on 9/27/2004 (bg, ).
September 23, 2004 Filing 111 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, ) Modified on 9/27/2004 (bg, ).
September 23, 2004 Filing 110 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon McDonalds Corporation served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. The Summons and First Amended Complaint were served by (method of service missing) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name/title of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, ) Modified on 9/27/2004 (bg, ).
September 15, 2004 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address by attorney Malcolm Alexander Heinicke for Defendant 99CentsOnly Stores, changing address to Munger, Tolles & Olson, 560 Mission Street, 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105-2907. Telephone number:415-512-4000 and Facsimile 415-512-4077. Filed by Defendant 99 cent only Stores (shb, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 108 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 99CentsOnly Stores. (shb, )
September 8, 2004 Request for Continuance of Defendant 99 Cent Only Stores Motion to Dismiss and OPPOSITION to all Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 74 , MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 81 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 84 , MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement 64 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 70 , MOTION to Amend/Correct 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 95 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 77 , MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement 101 , MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 87 , MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement 103 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 89 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 67 filed by Plaintiff Glen Broemer. (shb, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 107 REQUEST to Continue Defendant 99 Cent Only Stores Motion to Dismiss from September 13, 2004 to September 27, 2004 Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 77 filed by Plaintiff Glen Broemer; Opposition to all Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (shb, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 105 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Facter Direct. re 103 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement, 104 Memorandum in Support of Motion, was served on 9/7/04. (pj, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement 103 filed by defendant Facter Direct. (pj, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative for More Definite Statement filed by defendant Facter Direct. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (pj, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 106 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants NBC Studios Inc, Universal Studios Inc. Related Case(s): No related cases (rn, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants America Online Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Columbia Pictures Industries Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, Disney Entertainment Productions, MGM Television Entertainment Inc, MGM/UA Inc, Paramount Pictures, Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Sony Pictures Properties Inc, Sony Pictures Television Inc, Time Warner Inc, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (pj, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative for More Definite Statement filed by defendant NBC Studios Inc, Universal Studios Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (pj, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 100 DISCLOSURE STATMENT filed by Defendants NBC Studios Inc, Universal Studios Inc (pj, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 99 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NBC Studios Inc, Universal Studios Inc. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 94 notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MGM Television Entertainment Inc, MGM/UA Inc. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 93 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Disney Enterprises Inc, Disney Entertainment Productions, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 92 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Columbia Pictures Industries Inc, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Sony Pictures Properties Inc, Sony Pictures Television Inc. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 91 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendants America Online Inc, Time Warner Inc. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 90 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CBS Broadcasting Inc, Paramount Pictures. (yc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 88 MINUTES OF In Chambers Conference held before Judge Edward Rafeedie:, On the Court's own motion continuing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 87 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement, 67 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 70 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement, 81 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement, 74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement, 64 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement.All Motions to dismiss by defendants continued to 10/18/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie.Court Reporter: none present. (shb, )
September 2, 2004 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case; Memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof; filed by defendants Board of Regents of California. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow. (mg, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Oscar E. Rivia in support of re MOTION to Quash subpoena isued by plaintiff and 97 protective order filed by defendant County of Los Angeles. (yc, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash subpoena isued by plaintiff and motion for protective order; memorandum of poins and authorities in support; Declaration of Oscar E. Rivas. filed by defendant City of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2004 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (yc, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement 95 filed by defendants McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc. (yc, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 95 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by defendants McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (yc, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION to Dismiss complaint against defendants Taco Bell Corp and Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc pursuant to FRCP Rule 8, 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)J(6), or in the alternative, a More Definite Statement pursuant to FRCP 12(e); affidavit of Linda Gregg; filed by defendants Taco Bell Corp, Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. Lodged order. (mg, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 76 MINUTES OF Proceedings: Notice to Parties of ADR Pilot Program-Vacating Referral. Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Pilot Program, General Order 02-07, is vacated. All further settlement procedures in this action shall be pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16-14. Court Reporter: Not Present (bg, )
August 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Edward Rafeedie ORDERING Notice of motion to dismiss/ memorandum of points and authorities submitted by Defendants McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc received on 8/16/04 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(bg, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 118 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. upon Board of Regents of California waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/8/2004, answer due 9/7/2004. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey A Blair, University Counsel. (bg, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Michael D Margolin in support of late filing of defendant Raymond Cerulli dba Pats Cocktails and Pats Cafes MOTION to Dismiss 81 , filed by defendant Pat's Cocktail Lounge. (mg, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case; MOTION for More Definite Statement 81 ; filed by defendant Pat's Cocktail Lounge. (mg, )
August 23, 2004 FAX number for Attorney David K Dorenfeld, Michael David Margolin is 818-876-8484. (mg, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss complaint and first amended complaint; alternatively for More Definite Statement; filed by defendant Raymond Cerulli dba Pat's Cocktail Lounge and Pats Cafe. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (mg, )
August 23, 2004 FAX number for Attorney David K Dorenfeld is 818-876-8484. (jp, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 73 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Raymond Cerulli doing business as Pat's Cocktail Lounge and Pats Cafe. (jp, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 72 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's MOTION for Injunctive Relief (Prelminiary Injunction) 17 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (dw, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (pbap, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, and in the alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2004 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (pbap, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant 99 Cents Only Stores regarding Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss 77 ; Declaration of Eric Schiffer in support of 78 ; Notice of Lodging 79 were served on 8/20/04. (nhac, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 79 NOTICE OF LODGING and Lodging of Supplemental Material Cited in Defenant 99 Cents Only Stores Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Dismiss 77 filed by defendant 99CentsOnly Stores. (nhac, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Eric Schiffer in support of Motion to Dismiss 77 filed by defendant 99 Cents Only Stores. (nhac, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Dismissal against Plaintiff Glen Broemer filed by defendant 99 Cents Only Stores. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. Lodged Order. (nhac, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 69 NOTICE of rescheduling of motion hearing date and courtrrom location to 9/27/04 at 1:30pm filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. (rl, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for More Definite Statement 84 filed by defendant McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc. (bg, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and for plaintiffs failure to state a claim and alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by defendant McDonalds Corporation, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (bg, )
August 11, 2004 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Defendant, City of Pasadena to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. Motion set for hearing on 9/27/2004 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (rl, )
August 9, 2004 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Barry L Rodolff regarding stipulation to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's compliant as to Taco Bell Corp, Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc. (rl, )
August 9, 2004 Filing 66 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Zack Karni, MCY Multimedia. (bg, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amend Complaint 74 filed by defendants Zack Karni, MCY Multimedia. (nhac, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 74 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Zack Karni, MCY Multimedia. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Edward Rafeedie. (nhac, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.3 of General Order 224 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Edward Rafeedie for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 03-9097 ER (RZx).(rn, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss, alternatively, motion for more definite statement filed by defendant State of California. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Florence-Marie Cooper. (bp, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon 99CentsOnly Stores served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; George W Bush served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; California Survey Research Services served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; City of Los Angeles served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; City of Pasadena served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; County of Los Angeles served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; DAS Security Systems served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; A Samir DaFesh served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; Facter Direct served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; Frank's Exterminator served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; Zack Karni served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; MCY Multimedia served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; Pat's Cocktail Lounge served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; State of California served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004; Frank Terrones served on 7/19/2004, answer due 8/8/2004. The Summons and First Complaint were served by U S Mail service, by (statute missing) statute, upon (person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to complaint and alias summons was served upon Yum! Restaurant Brand Inc on (date not indicated). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Notice of vacation; Notice of motion for injunctive relief; subpoena motions was served upon Sony Picture Television; Sony Pictures Entainment; Sony pictures Studios; Columbia Pictures Industries; OCE Business Servies; NBC Studios; Time Warner; Universal Studios MGM/UA, MGM Television Entertainment, Taco Bell corp., Taco Bell of America, Yum Restaurant Servies Group, Disney Entertainment Productions, Disney Enterprises, The Walt Disney Company, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group by personal service on 7/19/04. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaitniff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief served DAS/Tom DaFesh by mail on 7/15/04 (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief served Pats Cocktail Lounge by personal service on 7/15/04 (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief served General Counsel of Regents University of CA (UCLA) by mail on 7/8/04 (bg)
July 21, 2004 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Facter Direct served on 7/12/2004, answer due 8/1/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person accepting service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Taco Bell Corp served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon CT Corp (person accepting service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to alias summons and complaint served DAS Security Systems by serving (name of person accepting service missing)by FRCP, by mail on 7/15/04. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served The Walt Disney Company by serving Marsha L Reed (Stephanie parker), Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc by serving Marsha L Reed (Stephanie Parker), Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Sony Picture Television Inc by serving Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Sony Pictures Studios Inc by serving Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc by serving Leonard Verger, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Columbia Pictures Industries Inc by serving Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served NBC Studios Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served OCE' Business Services Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Time Warner Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Universal Studios Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Disney Enterprises Inc by serving Marsha L Reed, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Disney Entertainment Productions by serving Marsha L Reed, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Taco Bell of America Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served Taco Bell Corp by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg)
July 21, 2004 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served MGM Television Entertainment Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg)
July 21, 2004 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to summons and first amended complaint served MGM/UA, Inc by serving CT Corporation System, Agent for service of process by FRCP, (date of service missing). (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Pat's Cocktail Lounge served on 7/15/2004, answer due 8/4/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by substitute service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attahed. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Frank's Exterminator served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Frank Terrones served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon Franlk Terrones. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon City of Los Angeles served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon City of Pasadena served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by (manner of service not stated) service, by FRCP statute, upon (name missing), City Clerk. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon County of Los Angeles served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Alias Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (Name of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attahed. Original Summons not returned. (bg, ) Modified on 7/23/2004 (bg, ).
July 16, 2004 Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 against defendants NBC Studios Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Boston Concessions Group Inc, OCE' Business Services Inc, City of Pasadena, Board of Regents of California, McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc, McDonalds Corporation, A Samir DaFesh, Taco Bell Corp, Taco Bell of America Inc, Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, Disney Entertainment Productions, MGM Television Entertainment Inc, MGM/UA Inc, Universal Studios Inc, Time Warner Inc, America Online Inc, Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co, Kroger Group Cooperative Inc, The Kroger Co, Zack Karni, Safeway Inc, Columbia Pictures Industries Inc, Sony Pictures Television Inc, Sony Pictures Properties Inc Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Sony Corporation of America, 99CentsOnly Stores, Archer Development Inc, Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles, Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services, Joel Brenner, George W Bush, California Survey Research Services, Central Intelligence Agency, Dick Cheney, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, DAS Security Systems, Does, Clark Ervin, Facter Direct, Glenn Fine, Frank's Exterminator, Frank's Pest Control, Porter J Goss, Michael V Hayden, Robert Helgenberger, Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less, A B Krongard, MCY Multimedia, McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA, John E McLaughlin, Robert Mueller -, National Security Agency, Paramount Pictures, Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center, Pat's Cocktail Lounge, Tom Ridge, Pat Roberts, Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's, Britt Snider, State of California, George Tenet, Frank Terrones, US Intelligence Committees, US Intelligence Community, United Online Inc/Juno, United States, Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government, Winston Wiley, Thomas R Wilson, Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp ; Party Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services; Joel Brenner; Central Intelligence Agency; Dick Cheney; Clark Ervin; Facter Direct; Glenn Fine; Thomas F Gimble; Porter J Goss; Michael V Hayden; Robert Helgenberger; Lowell Jacoby; Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less; A B Krongard; McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA; John E McLaughlin; Robert Mueller; National Security Agency; Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center; Tom Ridge; Pat Roberts; Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's; Britt Snider; Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures; George Tenet; US Intelligence Committees; US Intelligence Community; United Online Inc/Juno; United States; Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government; Winston Wiley; Thomas R Wilson; Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp; Archer Development Inc and Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles terminated ,filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon The State of California (c/o CA Attorney General) by personal service on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motionf or injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon County of Los Angeles by serving Christine (last name illegible) by personal service on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon Columbia Pictures Industries Inc on 7/12/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon Sony Corporation of America, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Columbia Pictures Inc., by personal service on 7/12/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon Taco Bell Corp Yum! Brands Inc on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon City of Los Angeles on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for injunctive Relief was served upon Franks Exterminators (Frank Terron) by personal service on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was upon City of Pasadena, Clerks Office by personal service served on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon Facter Direct Ltd by personal service on 7/12/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon State of California by personal service on 7/8/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe Amendments; Notice of Vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon 99 Cents Only by personal service on 7/12/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon MCY Multimedia by serving Zack Karini by personal service on 7/12/04. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer as to Doe amendments; Notice of vacation; Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief; Subpoena Motions for Injunctive Relief was served upon Kenneth Gross by personal service on 7/12/04. (bg, ) Modified on 7/22/2004 (bg, ).
July 14, 2004 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Sony Corporation of America. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person receiving missing) on 7/8/04. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Sony Entertainment. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person accepting service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon Columbia Pictures served on 7/12/2004, answer due 8/1/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name of person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by California Survey Research Services, upon California Survey Research Services served on 7/12/2004, answer due 8/1/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by (statute missing), upon (person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon MCY Multimedia served on 7/12/2004, answer due 8/1/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by FRCP statute, upon (name illegible). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon State of California served on 7/8/2004, answer due 7/28/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by substitute service, by FRCP statute, upon Yolanda, (last name and capacity missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 14, 2004 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Glen Broemer, upon 99CentsOnly Stores served on 7/2/2004, answer due 7/22/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by substitute service, by FRCP statute, upon (person receiving service missing). Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bg, )
July 11, 2004 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for injunctive relief (Preliminary Injunction) filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2004 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow. (bg, )
June 28, 2004 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Defendants, United States of America, et al. (yl, )
June 17, 2004 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order staying action or inthe alternative extending time to respond to the complaint. filed by Federal defendants Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER. (yc, )
June 17, 2004 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Joel Brenner, George W Bush, Central Intelligence Agency, Dick Cheney, Clark Ervin, Glenn Fine, Thomas F Gimble, Porter J Goss, Michael V Hayden, Robert Helgenberger, Lowell Jacoby, A B Krongard, John E McLaughlin, Robert Mueller -, National Security Agency, Tom Ridge, Pat Roberts, Britt Snider, George Tenet, United States, Winston Wiley, Thomas R Wilson. (mg, )
March 15, 2004 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Evan Bayh, Doug Bereuter, Sherwood L Boehlert, Christopher S Bond, Leonard L Boswell, Richard H Brian, Richard Burr, Saxby Chambliss, Mac Collins, Bud Cramer, Randy Duke Cunningham, Mike Dewine, Richard J Durbin, John Edwards -, Anna Eshoo, Terry Everett, Dianne Feinstein, Elton Gallegly, Jim Gibbons, Bob Graham, Chuck Hagel, Jane Harman, Dennis J Hastert, Alcee Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Peter Hoeskstra, Rush Holt, Ray LaHood, Carl Levin, Trent Lott, Barbara Mikulski, Nancy Pelosi, Collin C Peterson, Silvestre Reyes, John D Rockefeller, Dutch Ruppersberger, Richard Shelby, Olympia Snowe, John W Warner, Ron Wyden. (bp, )
February 26, 2004 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM - Discretionary Referral filed. Counsel are directed to jointly complete ADR Pilot Program and plaintiff's counsel (or defendant in removal cases) is directed to file Questionnaire with the Court no later than five days before the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) meeting of parties.(bg, )
February 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 01-4340 MMM (RZx). Case transfered from Judge Florence-Marie Cooper and James W. McMahon to Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Ralph Zarefsky for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 03-9097 MMM (RZx).(rn, )
February 13, 2004 Filing 5 REQUEST for Declaratory Relief filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer. (shb, )
February 13, 2004 Filing 4 REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order, REQUEST for Injunctive Relief filed by plaintiff, Glen Broemer. (shb, )
February 6, 2004 Summons Issued (60) re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to 99CentsOnly Stores, Archer Development Inc, Evan Bayh, Doug Bereuter, Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles, Sherwood L Boehlert, Christopher S Bond, Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services, Leonard L Boswell, Joel Brenner, Richard H Brian, Richard Burr, George W Bush, California Survey Research Services, Central Intelligence Agency, Saxby Chambliss, Dick Cheney, City of Los Angeles, Mac Collins, County of Los Angeles, Bud Cramer, Randy Duke Cunningham, DAS Security Systems, Mike Dewine, Does, Richard J Durbin, John Edwards -, Clark Ervin, Anna Eshoo, Terry Everett, Facter Direct, Dianne Feinstein, Glenn Fine, Frank's Exterminator, Frank's Pest Control, Elton Gallegly, Jim Gibbons, Thomas F Gimble, Porter J Goss, Bob Graham, Chuck Hagel, Jane Harman, Dennis J Hastert, Alcee Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Michael V Hayden, Robert Helgenberger, Peter Hoeskstra, Rush Holt, Lowell Jacoby, Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less, A B Krongard, Ray LaHood, Carl Levin, Trent Lott, MCY Multimedia, McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA, John E McLaughlin, Barbara Mikulski, Robert Mueller -, National Security Agency, Paramount Pictures, Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center, Pat's Cocktail Lounge, Nancy Pelosi, Collin C Peterson, Silvestre Reyes, Tom Ridge, Pat Roberts, John D Rockefeller, Dutch Ruppersberger, Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's, Richard Shelby, Britt Snider, Olympia Snowe, Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures, State of California, George Tenet, Frank Terrones, US Intelligence Committees, US Intelligence Community, United Online Inc/Juno, United States, Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government, John W Warner, Winston Wiley, Thomas R Wilson, Ron Wyden, Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp. (bp, )
February 6, 2004 Summons Issued (20) re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to 99CentsOnly Stores, Archer Development Inc, Evan Bayh, Doug Bereuter, Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles, Sherwood L Boehlert, Christopher S Bond, Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services, Leonard L Boswell, Joel Brenner, Richard H Brian, Richard Burr, George W Bush, California Survey Research Services, Central Intelligence Agency, Saxby Chambliss, Dick Cheney, City of Los Angeles, Mac Collins, County of Los Angeles, Bud Cramer, Randy Duke Cunningham, DAS Security Systems, Mike Dewine, Does, Richard J Durbin, John Edwards -, Clark Ervin, Anna Eshoo, Terry Everett, Facter Direct, Dianne Feinstein, Glenn Fine, Frank's Exterminator, Frank's Pest Control, Elton Gallegly, Jim Gibbons, Thomas F Gimble, Porter J Goss, Bob Graham, Chuck Hagel, Jane Harman, Dennis J Hastert, Alcee Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Michael V Hayden, Robert Helgenberger, Peter Hoeskstra, Rush Holt, Lowell Jacoby, Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less, A B Krongard, Ray LaHood, Carl Levin, Trent Lott, MCY Multimedia, McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA, John E McLaughlin, Barbara Mikulski, Robert Mueller -, National Security Agency, Paramount Pictures, Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center, Pat's Cocktail Lounge, Nancy Pelosi, Collin C Peterson, Silvestre Reyes, Tom Ridge, Pat Roberts, John D Rockefeller, Dutch Ruppersberger, Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's, Richard Shelby, Britt Snider, Olympia Snowe, Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures, State of California, George Tenet, Frank Terrones, US Intelligence Committees, US Intelligence Community, United Online Inc/Juno, United States, Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government, John W Warner, Winston Wiley, Thomas R Wilson, Ron Wyden, Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp. (bp, )
December 30, 2003 PREPARED ORDER RE TRANSFER Pursuant to General Order 224 (Related Case) by Clerk; related to CV 01-4340 MMM (RZx) (kc)
December 12, 2003 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION & NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Glen Broemer (jag)
December 12, 2003 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) not issued referred to Discovery James W. McMahon (jag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen Broemer v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Broemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Tenet
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Snider
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Helgenberger
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Karen S Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Amber A Logan
Represented By: Oscar E Rivas
Represented By: Traci A Kirkbride
Represented By: Henry Patrick Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Henry Patrick Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena City of/Pasadena Convention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W Bush
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Cheney
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ridge
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Ervin
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Wiley
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B Krongard
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Jacoby
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R Wilson
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F Gimble
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mueller, -
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Fine
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V Hayden
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Brenner
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America/Sony Pictures Entertainment/Columbia Pictures
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc/Von's Companies/Pavilion's
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Terrones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank's Exterminator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank's Pest Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCY Multimedia
Represented By: Anthony Bruce Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company/Ralphs/Food 4 Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99CentsOnly Stores
Represented By: Malcolm A Heinicke
Represented By: Russell F Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Online Inc/Juno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum! Brands Inc/Taco Bell Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAS Security Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facter Direct
Represented By: Genevieve C Nadeau
Represented By: Rebecca L Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation/McDonald's USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents/University of California Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat's Cocktail Lounge
Represented By: David Keith Dorenfeld
Represented By: Michael David Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Concessions Group/Distinctive Gourmet Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Survey Research Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Intelligence Committees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Roberts
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orrin Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia Snowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxby Chambliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Rockefeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Bayh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Edwards, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Mikulski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter J Goss
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bereuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood L Boehlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray LaHood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Duke Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Hoeskstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton Gallegly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J Hastert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcee Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvestre Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard L Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin C Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Eshoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Ruppersberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Agents/Employees of the US Government
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Intelligence Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Studios Inc
Represented By: James M Lichtman
Represented By: Lisa R Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Broadcasting Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Concessions Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCE' Business Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pasadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of California
Represented By: Louis M Marlin
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: Stephen P O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds Restaurants of California Inc
Represented By: M Taylor Florence
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds Corporation
Represented By: M Taylor Florence
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Samir DaFesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp
Represented By: Barry L Rodolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum Restaurant Services Group Inc
Represented By: Barry L Rodolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Entertainment Productions
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Television Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM/UA Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Studios Inc
Represented By: James M Lichtman
Represented By: Lisa R Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Online Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Dedicated Logistics Co
Represented By: Gregory E Stone
Represented By: Suzanne R Feffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Group Cooperative Inc
Represented By: Gregory E Stone
Represented By: Suzanne R Feffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co
Represented By: Gregory E Stone
Represented By: Suzanne R Feffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Karni
Represented By: Anthony Bruce Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Pictures Industries Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Television Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Properties Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: Shirley E Sanematsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?