Li-Mei Shih et al v. China Airlines Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Li-Mei Shih, Tony Huang and Vicky Huang
Defendant: China Airlines Ltd, Boeing Company and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2004cv01754
Filed: March 16, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Robert N Block
1 Judge: Margaret M Morrow
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2006. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2006 23 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court 18 , CCA # 04-56532. The appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Mandate received in this district on 04/17/06. (cbr, )
September 30, 2004 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 18 filed by Li-Mei Shih, Tony Huang, Vicky Huang, CCA # 04-56532. Order received in this district on 10/12/04. These apeals are consolidated with appeal number 04-56434. The following briefing schedule shall govern these appeals: plaintiffs shall file their joint opening briefs on or before 04/22/05; defendants' shall file their answering brief on or before 06/24/05; plaintiffs may file their joint optional reply brief on or before 07/22/05. (cbr, )
September 22, 2004 21 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 04-56532, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 18 filed by Li-Mei Shih, Tony Huang, Vicky Huang. (wdc, )
September 1, 2004 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 18 . (cbr, )
September 1, 2004 20 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to Circuit Court, 18 filed by Li-Mei Shih, Tony Huang, Vicky Huang. (cbr, )
August 25, 2004 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from plaintiffs Tony Huang, Vicky Huang, Li-Mei Shih forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to Circuit Court 18 . (cbr, )
August 25, 2004 19 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Appeal to Circuit Court 18 . (cbr, )
August 25, 2004 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by plaintiffs Tony Huang, Vicky Huang, Li-Mei Shih. Appeal of Order #17 Filed On: 07/23/04; Entered On: 07/26/04. Filing fee $255, Paid, receipt number 72768. cc: Steven D. Archer, Robins, Kaplan, Miller and Ciresi LLP; Bruce A. Finzen, Robins, Kaplan, Miller and Ciresi LLP; Frank Silane, Condon and Forsyth; Ronald A. McIntire, Perkins Coie LLP; Thomas McLaughlin, Perkins Coie LLP; Michael U. Lo; John J. Veth, Speiser Krause; Charles Herrmann, Herrmann and Associates; Brian Alexander, Kreindler and Kreindler LLP; Gretchen M. Nelson; Kreindler and Kreindler LLP; James H. Furman; William H. Wimsatt; Brian S. Letofsky, Pierce and Weiss LLP. (cbr, )
July 23, 2004 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. It is Ordered that this action is dismissed in its entirety on the grounds of forum non conveniens, subject to the following conditions: Defendants may not contest liability for compensatory damages in any action refiled at the respective plaintiffs option, in either Taiwan or the respective decedents domicile; Defendants must bear the cost of translating English-language documents and witness testimony into Mandarin Chinese as necessary; and The dismissal is without prejudice to the refiling of actions in appropriate jurisdictions within 180 days of the date of the entry of the order of dismissal, provided, however that (1) if the defendants fail to comply with any of the terms stated above or (2) if the courts of the jurisdiction in which the actions are refiled refuse or decline to accept jurisdiction, the action may be reinstated in this Court effective as of the date on which it was filed in or removed to this Court. It is furthered ordered that each party is to bear his, her, or its own attorneys fees, costs and expenses incurred in connection with this action. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(bg, )
April 21, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Richard A Lazenby, Frank A Silane is 310-557-1299. (el, )
April 21, 2004 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by attorney Richard A Lazenby, Frank A Silane for Defendant China Airlines Ltd, changing Firm Address to 1901 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 850, Los Angeles CA 90067-6010. Filed by Defendant Counsel for Defendant (el, )
April 5, 2004 15 MINUTES OF Notice to Parties of ADR Pilot program - Vacating Referral. Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Pilot Program, General Order 02-07, is vacated. All further settlement procedures in this action shall be pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16-14. Court Reporter: Not Present. (bg, )
April 5, 2004 14 MINUTES OF In Chambers - Court Order before Judge Margaret M. Morrow : Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Pilot Program, General Order 02-07, is vacated. All further settlement procedures in this action shall be pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16-14. Court Reporter: Not present. (bg, )
March 31, 2004 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant China Airlines Ltd. re 12 Notice (Other), was served on 3/31/04 served upon Steven Archer, Bruce Finz, Ronald McIntire and Thomas McLaughlin by US mail. (shb, )
March 31, 2004 12 NOTICE of filing of removal of civil action to United States District Court filed by defendant China Airlines Ltd. (shb, )
March 30, 2004 Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Robert N. Block added. Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson and Nora M. Manella no longer assigned to case. (rn, )
March 30, 2004 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE PURSUANT TO Section 5.6 of General Order 224 by Judge Dickran Tevrizian, Chair of the Related Case Assignment Committee, all related China Airlines, Ltd. cases are assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow to hear all proceedings through pretrial or as long as the Judge feels appropriate. Any discovery matters will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. The case number will now read as follows: CV 04-1754 MMM (RNBx). The Related Group Control Case Number is: CV 03-3635 MMM (RNBx).(rn, )
March 25, 2004 PREPARED ORDER RE TRANSFER Pursuant to General Order 224/5.6 (Related Case) by Clerk; related to CV 03-3635 MMM (RNBx). (rn, )
March 17, 2004 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Boeing Company. Related Case(s): CV 03-3635 MMM (RNBx) and other related group (rn, )
March 17, 2004 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Boeing Company re 5 Certificate of Interested Parties, 6 Joinder to Notice of Removal, 7 Notice of pendency of other action or proceedings, Notice of related case, was served on 3/17/2004. (jp, )
March 17, 2004 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant Boeing Company. (jp, )
March 17, 2004 6 JOINDER to Notice of Removal 1 and Statement of Supplemental Gournds for Removal, filed by defendant Boeing Company. (jp, )
March 17, 2004 5 CERTIFICATION AS to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boeing Company. (jp, )
March 16, 2004 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant China Airlines Ltd. Related Case(s): CV 03-3635 MMM (RNBx) and other related group (rn, )
March 16, 2004 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(jag, )
March 16, 2004 3 NOTICE of pendency of other actions or proceedings filed by plaintiff China Airlines Ltd. (jag, )
March 16, 2004 2 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant China Airlines Ltd. (jag, )
March 16, 2004 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed in Superior Court filed by defendant Boeing Company.(jag, )
March 16, 2004 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed in Superior Court filed by defendant China Airlines Ltd.(jag, )
March 16, 2004 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in Superior Court) by plaintiffs(jag, )
March 16, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Steven D Archer, Bree Arlyn-Pessin, Michael Aaron Geibelson is 310-229-5800. (jag, )
March 16, 2004 FAX number for Attorney Richard Anthony Lazenby, Frank A Silane is 310-557-1299. (jag, )
March 16, 2004 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC310704 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Nora M. Manella, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey W Johnson. (Filing fee $150) filed by defendant China Airlines Ltd.(jag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li-Mei Shih et al v. China Airlines Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li-Mei Shih
Represented By: Bree Arlyn-Pessin
Represented By: Bruce A Finzen
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Steven D Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Huang
Represented By: Bree Arlyn-Pessin
Represented By: Bruce A Finzen
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Steven D Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Huang
Represented By: Bree Arlyn-Pessin
Represented By: Bruce A Finzen
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Steven D Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Airlines Ltd
Represented By: Frank A Silane
Represented By: Richard A Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Melora M Garrison
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?