George Vargas v. Michael Yarborough

Case Number: 2:2004cv01949
Filed: March 22, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Jeffrey W. Johnson
Presiding Judge: George H. King
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King, Related to: R&R Adopting Report and Recommendations, 109 , 84 , 107 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (san)
December 15, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge George H. King for Report and Recommendation 107 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied; and (2) Judgment shall be entered dismissing the action with prejudice. (san)
October 10, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King, In accordance with the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge filed concurrently herewith, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice. 103 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
March 18, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO FILE STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why petitioner has failed to file a Status Report as ordered in this Courts 5/12/05 Order; or (2) Petitioner shall within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order file a Status Report, as ordered by the Court in its 5/12/05 Order. The Status Rep ort shall state the status and progress of petitioners compliance with this Courts 5/12/05 Order. A copy ofthe Courts 5/12/05 Order is attached. If petitioner fails to comply with this Order to Show Cause as outlined above, this Court may recommend that this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute this action and for failure to comply with this Courts order. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Vargas v. Michael Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?