Perfect 10 Inc v. Theodore M Hasse et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Defendant: Theodore M Hasse and Does
Case Number: 2:2004cv02585
Filed: April 13, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2004 11
NOTICE of DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. as to Theodore M Hasse Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the FRCP. MD JS-6 (pj, )
September 20, 2004 10
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than 10/12/2004 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider: Plaintiffs filing of a motion for entry of default judgment by Judge S. James Otero: Court Reporter: Not Present. (pj, )
September 2, 2004 9
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS: Plaintiff is directed to take steps to close this action by requesting the clerk to enter judgment or by applying to the Court for entry of judgment if government by FRCP 55(b)(2). Such request or application shall be filed no later than 9/23/04 by Judge S. James Otero :Court Reporter: None Present. (pj, )
August 19, 2004 8
DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to Defendant Theodore M Hasse (pj, )
August 4, 2004 6
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 19, 2004 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider: Answer by the defendant or plaintiffs request for default by Judge S. James Otero Court Reporter: Not Present (pj, )
July 9, 2004 4
MINUTES: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than 15 days from date of order why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution The Court will consider: Proof of service of summons and complain. Answer by the defendant or Plaintiff request for entry of default or Plaintiffs filing of motion for entry of default judgment by Judge S. James Otero Court Reporter: Not Present. (pj, )
May 19, 2004 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Lourdes G. Baird, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 97-6967 LGB (SHx)(rn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect 10 Inc v. Theodore M Hasse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey N Mausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore M Hasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?