Eloise Hayes et al v. Los Angeles City of et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv03032
Filed: April 29, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge A. Howard Matz, in favor of Jeff Winkler and Toby Byrd. Costs are hereby awarded to the Individual Defendants Toby Byrd and Jeff Winkler, according to proof. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kbr)
December 3, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Unopposed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Continuance of the Trial and related dates 123 . The new Trial is 4/28/2009. The remaining pretrial dates, including the last day for hand-serving motions in limine arising from the depositions of Byrd and Winkler, are continued in relation to the new trial date. (jp)
September 15, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Status Conference Following Dismissal of Appeal held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Cause called; appearances made. Court and counsel determine the surviving claims (Bird/Winkler) and the Courtsets 9/29/2008 as the last day plaintiff may fil e a motion to enlarge discovery which should be noticed for hearing on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM. Any motions in limine must be filed by 10/27/2008. Court orders the dates as indicated on Further Scheduling and Case Management Order filed this date. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eloise Hayes et al v. Los Angeles City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?