United States of America v. 924 North Beverly Drive, Beverly Hills, California

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 924 North Beverly Drive, Beverly Hills, CA
Claimant: DAS Corporation, Erica M Kim and Optional Capital Inc
Case Number: 2:2004cv03386
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Referring Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: Audrey B. Collins
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981 Civil Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 218 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT RELEASING AND RETURNING CERTAIN DEFENDANT PROPERTIES TO CLAIMANTS SE YOUNG KIM AND YOUNG AI KIM by Judge Audrey B. Collins:IT IS ORDERED that the following defendant properties shall be released and returned to claimants Se Young Kim and Young Ai Kim, through their counsel of record Eric Honig, forthwith: 1. $174,315.16 seized from Wilshire State Bank Account no. 3219380 in the name of Se Young Kim, presently in the custody of the United States District Court, including all accrued interest thereon; 2. A 2004 Mercedes Benz CL 500, presently in the custody of the United States Marshal's Service; and 3. A Mercedes Benz S500, presently in the custody of the United States Marshal's Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall release and return the above funds by check payable to Se Young Kim and Young Ai Kim; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall forthwith execute and filed with the Department of Motor Vehicles a withdrawal of t he lien it placed on the defendant Mercedes Benz S500 (currently in the possession of claimant Se Young Kim, pursuant to the courts November 13, 2007 order releasing custody of the vehicle to him), and any other documents necessary to terminate any interest of the United States in said vehicle; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Se Young Kim and Young Ai Kim shall not be liable for any costs incurred for the storage or maintenance of the Mercedes Benz vehicles during the pendency of these proceedings , or any other costs incurred by any of the parties to this action relating to the seizure, storage or maintenance of the vehicles. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court hereby retains jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of ensuring prompt and complete compliance with this Judgment by the Clerk of Court, the USMS and the parties. (bm)
May 17, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (bm)
November 13, 2012 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Considering the joint motion of Claimants Christopher Kim, Erica Kim, Bora Lee, Se Young Kim, and Young Ai Kim and Intervenors Law Office of Eric Honig and Eric Honig for attorney fees, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall pay $39,062.50 in attorney fees directly to the Law Office of Eric Honig, within 14 days from the entry of this judgment. (bm)
November 7, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT RE: INTERVENTION ATTORNEY'S FEES (AMENDING DOCKET NO. 702) by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (bm)
October 13, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Upon consideration of the motion of the Kim claimants for summary judgment as to all defendant properties based on res judicata and collateral estoppel, inter alia, It Is Hereby Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the motion is granted. It Is Further Ordered that all defendant properties, as described below, are dismissed from these cases: CV 04-2788, CV 04-3386, and CV 05-3910 (see document for details). It Is Further Ordered that the Plaintiff Governme nt forthwith withdraw its lis pendens recorded against the defendant Beverly Drive property. It Is Further Ordered that the Plaintiff Governement forthwith withdraw its Request for Assistance directed to The Central Authority of Switzerland for the freeze of Defendant Credit Suisse Private Banking Account. It Is Further Ordered that all defendant properties shall be returned and released forthwith to the Kim Claimants. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 924 North Beverly Drive, Beverly Hills, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 924 North Beverly Drive, Beverly Hills, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DAS Corporation
Represented By: Philip G Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Erica M Kim
Represented By: Eric Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Optional Capital Inc
Represented By: Mary Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John E Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?