Enodis Corporation v. Continental Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Enodis Corporation
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company and Transportation Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Continental Casualty Company and Transportation Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Enodis Corporation and Roes
Movant: Munger Tolles and Olson LLP and The Trane Company
Case Number: 2:2004cv04357
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Referring Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 227 , it is ORDERED that Case No. CV 04-4357 CAS (PJWx) is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, fees and expenses. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
November 2, 2012 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant's Motion in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing Evidence at Trial Related to its Claim for Punitive Damages 168 is DENIED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
June 11, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiff's filed a Motion for Reconsideration 156 , seeking reconsideration of the sole issue of the $9.5 million payment allegedly made to settle the Stefanyshyn plaintiffs ' alter ego claims. Because the Court misapprehended the scope of the Freeland Settlement by erroneously concluding it encompassed claims asserted only Indiana Avoidance Action and no other claims, reconsideration of its prior order is appropria te. Accordingly, with regard to plaintiff's claimed $9.5 million, defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. All other rulings as set forth in the Court's 4/16/2012 order 152 shall remain in effect. In accordance with the foregoing, plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
March 26, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court finds that judgment should be entered in favor of Defendants Continental Casualty Company and Transportation Insurance Company (collectively referred to herein as "CNA") on Plaintiff Enodis Corporation's, formerly known as the Welbilt Corporation, ("Enodis") claim for relief. Furthermore, the Court finds that judgment should be entered in favor of Enodis on CNA's counterclaim. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enodis Corporation v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By: Hellar-Ann Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Reid L Denham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By: Hellar-Ann Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Enodis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enodis Corporation
Represented By: J Joseph Bainton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Munger Tolles and Olson LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey L Bleich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The Trane Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L Bleich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?