Alvaro Quezada v. Al K Scribner

Case Number: 2:2004cv07532
Filed: September 10, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Marc L. Goldman
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman re Joint APPLICATION for Bittaker Protective Order 124 . See order for more information. (twdb)
December 5, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DISTRICT ATTORNEY FILES by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman re Stipulation for Protective Order 114 . (See document for details.) FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, and upon stipulation of the parties: IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
October 13, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Respondent Al K. Scribner's ("Respondent") Motion for Review of United States Magistrate Judge's Partial Denial of Respondent's Motion to Depart From Mandate came on for regular calendar before the Court 98 by Judg e Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court finds that the Magistrate Judge was not clearly erroneous in deciding that the Superior Court made a ruling solely on procedural grounds and that Pinholster does not apply. As such, the Court OVERRULES Respondent's objections to the Magistrate Judge's order and AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judge's order. (lom)
August 19, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman: granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to depart from the Ninth Circuit Mandate. (twdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvaro Quezada v. Al K Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?