Michael Demirdjian v. William Sullivan

Petitioner: Michael Demirdjian
Respondent: William Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2004cv08245
Filed: October 4, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: George H King
1 Judge: Jennifer T Lum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 123 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #120 , Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #101 2 volumes and 2 boxes of State Lodged documents(kyc)
February 2, 2017 122 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #98 CCA # 09-56453.The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered August 10, 2016, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion #121 AFFIRMED] (mat)
August 10, 2016 121 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian. CCA # 09-56453. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mat)
March 5, 2014 120 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 09-56453. Record consists of 2 volumes and 2 boxes of State Lodged documents. Re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 (mkr)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order 119 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. Appellant's unopposed motion for a fifth extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due January 23, 2014. Order received in this district on 12/6/2013. (dmap)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order 118 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. Appellant's late unopposed motion for a fourth extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due December 9, 2013. Order received in this district on 10/30/13. (mat)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order 117 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. The appellee's unopposed motion for a fifth extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is now due June 12, 2013. Any further motion to extend the due date of the answering brief is disfavored. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 5/9/2013. (dmap)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order 116 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellee's motion for a third extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. Brief is set. Order received in this district on 4/11/13. (car)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order 115 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. The appellee's unopposed motion for a third extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is now due April 12, 2013. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 3/14/2013. (dmap)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order 114 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. The appellee's unopposed motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is now due March 13, 2013, The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 2/6/2013. (dmap)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order 113 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellee's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. [see document for further information]. Order received in this district on 12/14/12. (car)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order 112 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed motion to file a late oversized opening brief is granted. The briefing schedule has been set. Order received in this district on 11/13/12. (car)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order 111 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's late-filed unopposed motion for a 6th extension of time in which to file the opening brief is granted. [See document for further information]. Order received in this district on 9/14/12. (car)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order 110 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed late motion for a fifth extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is now due September 6, 2012. The answering brief is due October 8, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 8/22/2012. (dmap)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order 109 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed motion for a 4th extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The briefing schedule has been set. Order received in this district on 7/24/12. (car)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order 108 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed motion for a 3rd extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The briefing schedule has been set. Order received in this district on 5/22/12. (car)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order 107 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian, CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed motion for a 2nd extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The briefing schedule has been set. Order received in this district on 4/5/12. (car)
March 14, 2012 106 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1 through 2; 2 Boxes of state lodged documents RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #101 (car)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order 104 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian CCA # 09-56453. The appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is now due April 9, 2012. The answering brief is due May 10, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 2/9/2012. (dmap)
December 19, 2011 103 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 as to Petitioner Michael Demirdjian; Receipt Number: LA032720 in the amount of $455. (car)
September 10, 2009 105 Receipt of Acknowledgment by the 9th CCA RECEIVED 2 Volumes; 2 Boxes of State Lodged Documents Re Appellate No 09-56453, Notice of Appeal #98 (car)
September 10, 2009 102 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56453, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 as to Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (lr)
September 10, 2009 101 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Record consists of 2 volumes, 2 Boxes of States Lodged Documents. re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 (lr)
September 10, 2009 100 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 filed by Michael Demirdjian. Transcripts: None Requested. (lr)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 99 Order by Judge George H. King Denying Certificate of Appealability. Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #98 . (lr)
September 1, 2009 98 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Appeal of Judgment #97 . (Filing Fee Not Paid.) (Arfa, Fay)
August 26, 2009 97 JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King,IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in this action is dismissed with prejudice #96 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 96 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE #91 by Judge George H. King (es)
July 20, 2009 95 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued) #91 filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian.(Arfa, Fay)
July 20, 2009 94 Traverse filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian Withdrawal of re: Traverse #93 (Arfa, Fay)
July 20, 2009 93 TRAVERSE to Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #77 filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (Arfa, Fay)
July 1, 2009 92 NOTICE OF FILING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 7/21/2009. (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendation) (ca)
July 1, 2009 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum. THE COURT, THEREFORE, RECOMMENDS that the District Court issue an Order: (1) approving and adopting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing that Judgment be entered denying the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and dismissing this action with prejudice, Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) 1 . (ca)
July 31, 2008 90 TRAVERSE to Respondent's Answer filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (Arfa, Fay)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order 89 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Answer to Complaint #85 #88 . Petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of this Order to file a response to respondents answer. Petitioners response is due July 31, 2008. No Further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. (san)
June 28, 2008 88 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Answer to Complaint #85 filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Request)(Arfa, Fay)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Traverse #86 . See order for specifics. (dp)
May 28, 2008 86 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Time)(Arfa, Fay)
April 28, 2008 85 ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Respondent William Sullivan.(Johnsen, Michael)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Request for Leave to File Oversized Memorandum of Points and Authorities #83 (dp)
April 22, 2008 83 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Request for Leave to File Oversized Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent William Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to file Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Answer)(Johnsen, Michael)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order 82 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME to File an Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #81 (dp)
April 3, 2008 81 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME to File an Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent William Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to file an Answer to Petition for Wrti of Habeas Corpus)(Johnsen, Michael)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order 80 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re First EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME to File an Answer #79 (dp)
February 29, 2008 79 First EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME to File an Answer filed by Respondent William Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to file an Answer)(Johnsen, Michael)
January 25, 2008 78 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum : re: Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #77 . (dp)
January 22, 2008 77 SECOND AMENDED PETITON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Petitioner Michael Demirdjian amending Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 48 ,filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian (Arfa, Fay)
January 22, 2008 76 RESPONSE filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjianto Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines #75 (Arfa, Fay)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order 75 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, Set Deadlines:Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/23/2008. (dp)
December 4, 2007 74 REPLY in opposition to Respondent's MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 48 60 filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (dp)
December 3, 2007 73 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re: MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 48 60 (dp)
December 3, 2007 72 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum : re: Application to hold case in abeyance pending Federal Petition 69 . (dp)
November 20, 2007 71 OPPOSITION to Petitioner's Application to hold case in abeyance pending Federal Petition 69 for a Third Time; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Respondent William Sullivan. (vm)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order 70 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION TO STAY AND ABEY FIRST AMENDED PETITION by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, The Court ORDERS Respondent to file a response to the Application to Stay by November 20, 2007. (See minute order for specifics)re Application to hold case in abeyance pending Federal Petition 69 (vm)
November 13, 2007 69 Application to Stay and hold case in Abeyance pending Federal Petition filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged proposed order. (vm)
November 8, 2007 68 REPLY filed by Respondent William Sullivan to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 67 (vm)
November 1, 2007 67 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case re First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 48 60 filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (vm)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order 66 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum, re APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File 65 . Extension granted. Response due November 9, 2007. No further extensions. (dp)
October 5, 2007 65 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged proposed order. (dp)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order 64 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File 63 (dp)
September 6, 2007 63 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged proposed order. (dp)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File 61 (dp)
July 31, 2007 61 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged proposed order. (dp)
July 13, 2007 58 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re opposition to motion to dismiss. Opposition due July 31, 2007. (dp)
July 11, 2007 60 MOTION to dismiss first amended petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 48 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; filed by respondent (ear)
July 11, 2007 59 NOTICE OF LODGING; copies of documents related to the challenged conviction in Los Angeles County Superior Court case number GA043471; filed by respondent; Lodged 2 boxes (ear)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Application for Enlargement of Time 56 is GRANTED and that Respondent shall have to and including 7/18/2007 in which to file a Motion to Dismiss, and to and including 8/2/2007 in which to file an Answer. The Court Order of 3/20/2007 shall remain otherwise in effect. (pcl)
June 8, 2007 56 APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 8/2/2007 filed by respondent William Sullivan. Lodged propoed order. (dp)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order 55 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/3/2007 54 . No further extensions. (dp, )
May 11, 2007 54 APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 7/3/2007 filed by respondent William Sullivan. Lodged proposed order. (dp, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order 53 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File 52 (dp, )
April 12, 2007 52 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File filed by respondent William Sullivan. Lodged proposed order. (dp, )
April 2, 2007 FAX number for Deputy Attorney General Michael Robert Johnsen is 213-897-6496. (pcl, )
April 2, 2007 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Robert Johnsen on behalf of Respondent William Sullivan. (pcl, )
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION. ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum that Respondent William Sullivan file answer to the petition not later than 5/4/2007. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 4/20/2007.(dp, )
March 15, 2007 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to to file first Amended Petition; supporting memorandum; declaration of Fay Arfa filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged Order. (et)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order 49 ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition is filed on this date. (jp)
March 15, 2007 48 FIRST AMENDED PETITON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent William Sullivan amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) 1 filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jp)
February 20, 2007 46 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. (dp, )
February 15, 2007 45 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (pcl, )
January 8, 2007 43 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum RE: receipt of status Report 42 . Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 2/15/2007. (dp, )
January 3, 2007 44 STATUS REPORT ON STATE HABEAS PETITION filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jj, )
November 28, 2006 41 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 1/5/2007. (dp, )
November 21, 2006 42 Status Report of state habeas petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (lc, )
October 4, 2006 40 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting MOTION to Continue to Stay and Abey Petitioner's Currently Pending Petition 37 . See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
September 7, 2006 39 REPLY to Petitioners MOTION for Further Stay 37 filed by respondent William Sullivan. (pcl, )
September 5, 2006 38 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re Petitioner's Status Report and Motion to Continue to Stay and Abey. Respondent's reply due within seven days. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
August 23, 2006 37 MOTION to Continue to Stay and Abey Petitioner's Currently Pending Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (gk, )
August 23, 2006 36 STATUS REPORT On State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (gk, )
July 11, 2006 34 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 8/30/2006. (dp, )
July 10, 2006 35 STATUS REPORT ON STATE HABEAS PETITION filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (yl, )
May 9, 2006 33 STATUS REPORT ON STATE HABEAS PETITION filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (yl, )
May 9, 2006 32 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 7/10/2006. (dp, )
April 4, 2006 31 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status conference report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 5/15/2006. (dp, )
March 31, 2006 30 STATUS REPORT ON STATE Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (yl, )
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order 28 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report., Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 4/1/2006. (dp, )
February 1, 2006 29 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order 26 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 2/1/2006. (dp, )
December 14, 2005 27 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
October 25, 2005 25 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order 24 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 12/15/2005. (dp, )
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order 23 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re respondent's motion for reconsideration of order granting stay. Motion is denied. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
September 14, 2005 22 RESPONSE to MOTION for Reconsideration of order granting stay 21 filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
September 8, 2005 Opinion or Order 20 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re Motion for Reconsideratin filed by respondent. Petitioner to file opposition by September 16, 2005. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
September 6, 2005 21 MOTION for Reconsideration of order granting stay filed by respondent William Sullivan. (jag, )
August 26, 2005 Opinion or Order 18 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re receipt of status report by petitioner. Set Deadlines: Next Status Report due by 10/25/2005. (dp, )
August 25, 2005 19 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order 17 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re status report filed by petitioner. Set Deadlines:New Status Report due by 8/29/2005. (dp, )
July 13, 2005 16 STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (dp, )
July 13, 2005 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Fay Arfa attorney for Petitioner Michael Demirdjian, changing address (suite change only) to 10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 300, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Petitioner Fay Arfa (dp, )
June 2, 2005 Opinion or Order 14 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re petitioner's status report. Next status report due by July 18, 2005. (dp, )
June 1, 2005 13 STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (dp, )
April 8, 2005 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/23/2005. (dp, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum RE: Status Report 9 . If petition is in state court is not resolved within the next 45 days, petition is ordered to file another report by May 23, 2005. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
April 4, 2005 12 STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (jag, )
February 18, 2005 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/4/2005. (dp, )
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re Status Report from petitioner. Petitioner's next status report is due by April 4, 2005. (dp, )
February 18, 2005 9 STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (dp, )
January 5, 2005 Opinion or Order 7 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Jennifer T. Lum re Status report on state court petition. If not decided with 45 days, petitioner to file status report by February 18, 2005. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
December 29, 2004 8 STATUS REPORT on State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (gk, )
December 13, 2004 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Robert Johnsen on behalf of Respondent William Sullivan (pbap, )
November 2, 2004 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Proposed order submitted by petitioner Michael Demirdjian. (dp, )
November 1, 2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/28/2004. (dp, )
November 1, 2004 Opinion or Order 5 MINUTES OF Order by Judge Jennifer T. Lum granting MOTION to Stay Case 4 . Petitioner ordered to file a Status Report by December 28, 2004. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp, )
October 29, 2004 4 MOTION to Stay Petition and Dismiss Unexhausted Claims filed by Petitioner Michael Demirdjian. Lodged lodged order. (pbap, )
October 13, 2004 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Leave to Amend by Judge Jennifer T. Lum. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2004. See Order for specifics. (dp, )
October 4, 2004 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to the provisions of the Local Rules, the within action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge George H. King and referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer T Lum to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further matters as appropriate. The Court must be notified within 15 days of any change of address. (rrey, )
October 4, 2004 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge George H. King and referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer T Lum.(Filing fee $ 5.) , filed by petitioner Michael Demirdjian.(rrey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Demirdjian v. William Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Demirdjian
Represented By: Rose Fay Arfa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Sullivan
Represented By: Pamela C. Hamanaka
Represented By: Michael Robert Johnsen
Represented By: David C Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?