Log Cabin Republicans v. United States of America et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Log Cabin Republicans
Defendant: Donald H Rumsfeld and United States of America
Petitioner: James E Pietrangelo, II
Case Number: 2:2004cv08425
Filed: October 12, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2014 Filing 350 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Devon A Myers counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Devon Myers is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Myers, Devon)
February 11, 2013 Filing 349 Mail Returned addressed to James E Pietrangelo re Receipt for Release of Exhibits by Exhibits Custodian (G-27) #346 . Reason: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (adu)
February 8, 2013 Filing 348 Mail Returned addressed to James E Pietrangelo re Receipt for Release of Exhibits by Exhibits Custodian (G-27) #347 . Reason: Unable to Forward. (adu)
December 17, 2012 Filing 347 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS Permanent; Rcpt of exhibits upon: notice of destruction from exhibit custodian; Released Exhibits:Depos; Receiver: Flaurneua Furonda. (am)
December 17, 2012 Filing 346 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS Permanent; Rcpt of exhibits upon: notice of destruction from exhibit custodian; Released Exhibits:Depos; Receiver: Mehraad Rhalley (am)
July 25, 2012 Filing 345 STIPULATION for Settlement filed by Defendants Log Cabin Republicans, James E Pietrangelo, II, Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America.(Freeborne, Paul)
June 29, 2012 Filing 344 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. ORDER by Deputy Clerk of Court: The document is accepted as filed, RE Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #342 . (ad)
June 15, 2012 Filing 343 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #342 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 15, 2012 Filing 342 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Changing Firm and address to Musick, Peeler & Garrett LLP, One Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2000, 624 S. Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90017-3833. Changing e-mail, phone number and fax number to d.woods@mpglaw.com; Telephone: (213) 629-7622; Facsimile: (213) 624-1376. Adding Dan Woods, Esq. as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 14, 2012 Filing 341 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #339 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information G-06. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 12, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Dan Woods, Musick, Peeler & Garrett LLP on behalf of Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 12, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE Form G-06 Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES, PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS ORDERED: 1. Log Cabins motion for an award of attorneys fees and expenses shall be continued and reset for hearing on September 10, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom No. 2, in the above-referenced court at the Eastern Division Courthouse. 2. Log Cabin shall file and serve its motion and supporting papers no later than July 30, 2012. 3. The government shall file and serve its opposition no later than August 13, 2012. 4. Log Cabin shall file and serve any reply no later than August 20, 2012. 5. In all other respects the parties will comply with the Courts May 4, 2012, Order. (am)
June 1, 2012 Filing 337 STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees from 07/02/2012 to 09/10/2012 Re: Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,, #325 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #336 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Earle)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On March 15, 2012, the Court granted the Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans ("Plaintiff"), and directed the parties to submit a stipulation providing a briefing schedule regarding the amount and reasonableness of the fees. (Doc. No. 334.) As the parties have submitted no stipulation, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff shall file its Motion no later than May 29, 2012; Defendants United States of America and Robert M. Gates ("Defendants") shall file their Opposition no later than June 11, 2012; and Plaintiff shall file its Reply no later than June 18, 2012. The parties shall submit their requests for fees, objections, and replies in the following format. The Court will hear the Motion on July 2, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. (am)
March 15, 2012 Filing 335 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1 through 2; Transcripts(s): 1; 5 Brown Folders Documents #129, #182, #183, #184, #185; 1 Transcript #40 RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #319 (car)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Based on the foregoing, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and DIRECTS the parties to meet and confer and submit a stipulation to the Court providing a briefing schedule regarding the amount and reasonableness of the fees. #326 (am)
February 27, 2012 Filing 333 MINUTES OF #326 Motion for Attorney Fees held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (ad)
February 13, 2012 Filing 332 REPLY in support MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA and FRCP 37(c)(2) MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA and FRCP 37(c)(2) #326 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Miller, Earle)
February 6, 2012 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA and FRCP 37(c)(2) MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA and FRCP 37(c)(2) #326 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
February 1, 2012 Filing 330 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings July 21, 2010, 9:00 a.m. - 12:15 p.m., July 22, 2010, 9:00 a.m. - 12:15 p.m.., and July 23, 2010, 8:30 a.m. - 10:00 a.m. (rla)
February 1, 2012 Filing 329 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 23, 2010, 8:30 a.m. - 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon A Seffens, RPR, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (rla)
February 1, 2012 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 22, 2010, 9:00 a.m. - 12:15 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon A Seffens, RPR, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (rla)
February 1, 2012 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 21, 2010, 9:00 a.m. - 12:15 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon A Seffens, RPR, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (rla)
January 12, 2012 Filing 326 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA and FRCP 37(c)(2) filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 291, #2 Declaration Dan Woods, #3 Declaration R. Clarke Cooper)(Woods, Daniel)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR HEARING OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEESAND EXPENSES by Judge Virginia A. Phillips ORDERED: Log Cabins motion for an award of attorneys fees and expenses shall be set for hearing on February 27, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom No. 2, in the above-referenced court at the Eastern Division Courthouse. Log Cabin shall file and serve its Motion and supporting papers no later than January 12, 2012. The government shall file and serve its opposition no later than February 6, 2012. Log Cabin shall file and serve any reply no later than February 13, 2012. #323 (am)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER DISMISSING AFTER REMAND FROM COURT OF APPEALS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the mandate of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (Doc. No. 322), the above-captioned case is dismissed as moot. (am)
January 6, 2012 Filing 323 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Earle)
November 18, 2011 Filing 322 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 , CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The Judgment of the district court is Vacated and Remanded with Directions to Dismiss. [See document for further information]. Mandate received in this district on 11/18/11. (car)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans; Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld CCA # 10-56634 and 10-56813. The panel has voted to deny the Petition of Appellee Log Cabin Republicans for Panel Rehearing or for Rehearing En Banc. SEE THE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Order received in this district on 11/9/2011. (dmap)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The governments emergency motion for reconsideration of this courts July 6, 2011, order lifting the stay entered November 1, 2010, is granted. See 9th Cir. R. 27-10(a)(3). This courts July 6, 2011, order is withdrawn except with respect to (a) the substitution of Leon E. Panetta, Secretary of Defense, as an appellant/cross-appellee and (b) the expedited calendaring of oral argument. The motion of Log Cabin Republicans to lift this courts November 1, 2010, stay of the district courts judgment pending appeal is granted in part. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987) (stating standard); Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Cottrell, 632 F.3d 1127, 1135 (9th Cir. 2011) (same). The circumstances have changed since November 1, 2010, and the standard for issuance of a stay is demanding. In its briefs, the government does not contend that 10 U.S.C. 654 is constitutional. In addition, in the context of the Defense of Marriage Act, 1 U.S.C. 7, the United States has recently taken the position that classifications based on sexual orientation should be subjected to heightened scrutiny. See Golinski v. U.S. Office of Pers. Mgmt., No. C 3:10-00257-JSW (N.D. Cal.) (Doc. 145, July 1, 2011) (gay and lesbian individuals have suffered a long and significant history of purposeful discrimination); Letter from Attorney General to Speaker of House of Representatives (Feb. 23, 2011) (there is, regrettably, a significant history of purposeful discrimination against gay and lesbian people, by governmental as well as private entities). The government states that the process of repealing Section 654 pursuant to the Dont Ask, Dont Tell Repeal Act of 2010, Pub. L. No. 111-322, 124 Stat. 3516 (Dec. 22, 2010), is almost complete. The President, the Secretary of Defense, and the Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff have now certified that the implementation of repeal of Dont Ask, Dont Tell is consistent with the standards of military readiness, military effectiveness, unit cohesion, and recruiting and retention of the armed forces. In addition, the government represents that only one servicemember has been discharged under Section 654 since the passage of the Repeal Act. After consideration of the governments likelihood of success on the merits, the likelihood of irreparable harm, the balance of hardships, and the public interest, we conclude that the stay entered November 1, 2010, shall remain in place in all respects save the following. The district courts judgment shall continue in effect insofar as it enjoins the government from investigating, penalizing, or discharging anyone from the military pursuant to the Dont Ask, Dont Tell policy. Briefing is completed. Order received in this district on 7/22/2011. (dmap)
July 20, 2011 Filing 319 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 10-56634 Record consists of 2 volumes, 1 transcript; One box of Lodge Deposition Transcripts (documents: 129, 182, 183, 184 and 185.) re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 (car)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Order received in this district on 7/15/11. This court has received appellant's corrected emergency motion for reconsideration of the July 6, 2011, order lifting the November 1, 2010, stay of the district court's judgment pending appeal. See order for more details. (cbr)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Order received in this district on 7/15/11. After reviewing the briefs filed the parties, it appears to the merits panel that the United States is not prepared to defend the constitutionality of 10 USC 64, which provides for the policy concerning homosexuality in the armed forces. The Government argues only that the Don't Ask, Don't Tell Repeal Act of 2010, is constitutional. See order for more details. (cbr)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #289 and #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Appellee/cross-appellants motion to lift this courts November 1, 2010, order granting a stay of the district courts judgment pending appeal is granted. See the order for the rest of the details. Order received in this district on 7/6/2011. (dmap)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The reply brief submitted on April 28, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by The Palm Center on April 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The court is in receipt of the motion of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Knights Out, OutServe, Human Rights Campaign, and Anti-Defamation League for leave to file an oversized amicus curiae brief. The motion and any future related filings shall be referred for disposition to panel that considers the merits of the case. Any further requests to file friend of the court briefs, oversized friend of the court briefs, shall be treated in the same fashion. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by Forum on the Military Chaplaincy, et al., on April 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by Servicemembers United on April 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by Asian American Justice Center, el. on April 4m, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by Servicemembers Legal Defense Network on March 31, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The answering brief submitted on March 28, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER STRIKING FILED DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECORD by Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: #295 Motion for Relief. Movant James E Pietrangelo, II, is not a party to the above-entitled action. (mrgo)
March 21, 2011 Filing 297 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Relief #295 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Freeborne, Paul)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER REGARDING TAXATION OF COSTS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: withdrawing #293 Motion for Review. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendants Motion to Retax Costs, filed March 1, 2011 (Doc. 293), is deemed withdrawn; 2. Plaintiffs costs are taxed in the amount of $20,838.36, and the Bill of Costs entered February 3, 2011 (Doc. 292) shall be modified accordingly; (see document for specifics). (mrgo)
March 9, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief filed by movant James E Pietrangelo, II. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Lodged order. (mrgo)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by The National Legal Foundation on March 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by The Conservative Congregational Christian Conference and The Church of God of Prophecy Chaplaincy Ministries on March 4, 2011 is filed.. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by The National Legal Foundation on March 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 8, 2011 Filing 294 STIPULATION for Costs against All Parties filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Taxation of Costs)(Miller, Earle)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The amicus brief submitted by Foundation for Moral Law on March 4, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
March 1, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re Bill of Costs (CV-59) #292 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The opening brief submitted on February 25, 2011 is filed. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Proposed intervenor Joseph Zernik's motion to intervene is denied. All other pending motions filed by Mr. Zernik are denied as moot. The briefing schedule set in this court's January 28, 2011 order remains in effect. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 , #254 , CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Order received in this district on 2/9/11. Proposed intervenor Joseph Zernik's motion to intervene is denied. All other pending motions filed by Mr. Zernik are denied as moot. The briefing schedule set in this court's January 28, 2011 order remains in effect. (cbr)
February 3, 2011 Filing 292 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 20,869.29 in favor of Log Cabin Republican and against United States of America, et al.. RE: #275 #277 , #279 (mb)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The opposed motion hold these appeals in abeyance is denied. The briefing schedule is reset as follows: the government's opening brief and excerpts of record are due February 25, 2011; Log Cabin Republicans' answering brief and supplemental excerpts of record are due March 28, 2011; and the government's reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. The pending motions filed by proposed intervenor Joseph Zernik shall be addressed by separate order. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. Briefing is temporarily stayed pending disposition of appellants' opposed motion to stay appellate proceedings. The motion to stay shall be decided in due course. The pending motions filed by proposed intervenor Joseph Zernik shall be addressed by separate order. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #289 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634, 10-56813. The joint motion to expedite is granted in part. The previously established cross-appeal briefing schedule is vacated. The court adopts the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' joint motion as follows: the government's opening brief and excerpts of record are due January 24, 2011; Log Cabin Republicans' answering brief and supplemental excerpts of record are due February 22, 2011; and the government's reply brief is due March 8, 2011. The court also adopts the parties' proposed expansion of the word limits for the answering brief and reply brief to 16,500 words and 8,000 words, respectively. The court denies the parties' request to schedule oral argument in this case for a date certain. The case will be calendared in due course. The motion to expedite filed by Log Cabin Republicans on November 19, 2010 is denied as moot. Order received in this district on 7/06/2011. (lr)
November 19, 2010 Filing 290 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56813 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #289 as to Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (dmap)
November 18, 2010 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, #83 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7829715 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Cross-Appeal Representation Statement)(Woods, Daniel)
November 9, 2010 Filing 288 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Corrected APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants All Defendants #279 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Miller, Earle)
November 8, 2010 Filing 287 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, 10/18/2010; 2:39 PM (Lanza, Theresa)
November 8, 2010 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, 10/18/2010; 2:39 PM. Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2011. (Lanza, Theresa)
November 4, 2010 Filing 285 OBJECTIONS to Corrected APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants All Defendants #279 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. Appellee's motion for leave to file an oversize response to appellant's motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED. Appellant's motion to stay the district court's October 12, 2010, order pending appeal is GRANTED.1 The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. Order received in this district on 11/1/2010. (lr)
October 29, 2010 Filing 279 Corrected APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Application set for hearing on 11/12/2010 at 10:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs CV-59)(Miller, Earle)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. The amicus brief submitted by Servicemembers Legal Defense Work on October 25, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 11/01/2010. (lr)
October 28, 2010 Filing 278 BILL OF COSTS DEFICIENCY NOTICE RE: Notice (Other) #275 , Miscellaneous Document #276 . The following deficiency was noted on the Application to Tax Costs: L.R. 54-3.2: Hearing should be noticed before the clerks designee and not the judge. Counsel is to re-notice the corrected hearing information. Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: APPLICATIONS/Clerk to Tax Costs. Bill of Cost was not submitted as separate attachment. (am)
October 28, 2010 Filing 277 APPLICATION to CORRECT Notice (Other) #275 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Application set for hearing on 11/12/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia A. phillips. (Miller, Earle)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. The amicus brief submitted by Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., on October 25, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 11/01/2010. (lr)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. The amicus brief submitted by The Palm Center on October 25, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 11/1/2010. (lr)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. The amicus brief submitted by Servicemembers United on October 25, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 11/01/2010. (lr)
October 27, 2010 Filing 276 Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans re: Notice (Other) #275 (Woods, Daniel)
October 27, 2010 Filing 275 NOTICE Application to Clerk to Tax Costs filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America, CCA # 10-56634. This court has received appellant's emergency motion to stay the district court's October 12, 2010 order pending appeal. The order is stayed temporarily in order to provide this court with an opportunity to consider fully the issues presented. Appellee may file an opposition to the motion for a stay pending appeal by 10/25/10. To expedite consideration of the motion, no reply shall be filed. Order received in this district on 10/20/10. (car)
October 20, 2010 Filing 273 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/6/09, 11/16/09, 1/29/09, 3/9/09, 4/26/10, 7/13/10, 7/14/10, 7/15/10, 7/16/10, 7/20/10 (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/20/10, 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/16/10, 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 270 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/15/10, 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/14/10, 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/13/10, 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/26/10, 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/9/09, 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/29/09, 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/9/09, 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/16/09, 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/6/09, 1:30 pm. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Preston, Phyllis)
October 20, 2010 Filing 261 AMENDED MINUTES ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN EMERGENCY STAY held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: None of the factors the Court weighs in considering whether to enter a stay favors granting a stay here. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Defendants' Application for a Stay. #260 (am)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN EMERGENCY STAY by Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: #253 Application to Stay. Having considered the papers filed in support of, and in opposition to, the Application, as well as the arguments advanced by counsel at the hearing, the Court DENIES the Application for the following reasons as well as those set forth on the record at the hearing. (See document for specifics) (mrgo)
October 18, 2010 Filing 259 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips RE: Emergency APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Court's October 12, 2010 Judgment and Permanent Injunction #253 . The Court hears oral argument, and takes the matter under submission. Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (mrgo)
October 15, 2010 Filing 258 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56634 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #254 as to Defendant Donald H Rumsfeld and United States of America. (dmap)
October 15, 2010 Filing 257 OPPOSITION to Emergency APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Court's October 12, 2010 Judgment and Permanent Injunction #253 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Woods, Daniel)
October 14, 2010 Filing 256 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 . (Gardner, Joshua)
October 14, 2010 Filing 255 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #254 (Gardner, Joshua)
October 14, 2010 Filing 254 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Appeal of Judgment, Permanent Injunction #252 , Memorandum & Opinion,,, #232 , Memorandum & Opinion,,, #250 , Order #212 , Order, #226 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, #170 , Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #251 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
October 14, 2010 Filing 253 Emergency APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Court's October 12, 2010 Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
October 12, 2010 Filing 252 JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (am)
October 12, 2010 Filing 251 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER COURT TRIAL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 52] signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For these reasons, Plaintiff is also entitled to judgment on its claim for violation of the First Amendment's guarantees of freedom of speech and petition. (am)
October 12, 2010 Filing 250 AMENDED & FINAL MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Throughout the consideration and resolution of this controversy, the Court has kept well in mind the overriding principle that "judicial deference to such congressional exercise of authority is at its apogee when legislative action under the congressional authority to raise and support armies and make rules and regulations for their governance is challenged." Rostker, 453 U.S. at 70. Nevertheless, as the Supreme Court held in Rostker, "deference does not mean abdication." Id. at 67, 70. Plaintiff has demonstrated it is entitled to the relief sought on behalf of its members, a judicial declaration that the Don't Ask, Don't Tell Act violates the Fifth and First Amendments, and a permanent injunction barring its enforcement. (am)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For the foregoing reasons, the Court: (1) DECLARES that the act known as "Don't Ask, Don't Tell"2 infringes the fundamental rights of United States servicemembers and prospective servicemembers and violates (a) the substantive due process rights guaranteed under the Fifth Amendment to the United States Constitution, and (b) the rights to freedom of speech and to petition the Government for redress of grievances guaranteed by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution; (3) ORDERS Defendants United States of America and the Secretary of Defense immediately to suspend and discontinue any investigation, or discharge, separation, or other proceeding, that may have been commenced under the "Don't Ask, Don't Tell" Act, or pursuant to 10 U.S.C. 654 or its implementing regulations, on or prior to the date of this Order; (4) GRANTS Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans' request to apply for attorneys' fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412; and (5) GRANTS Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans' request to file a motion for costs of suit, to the extent allowed by law. #233 (am) Modified on 10/12/2010 (la).
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER (Nunc Pro Tunc as of 7/10/10) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (am)
September 29, 2010 Filing 247 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings July 13, 14, 15, 20, 21, 22, and 23, 2010 (partial trial days) (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Friday, 07/23/10; 10:26 AM (Trial Day 8, Vol. II). Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 245 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, 07/22/10; 1:42 PM (Trial Day 7, Vol. II). Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Wednesday, 07/21/10; 1:20 PM (Trial Day 6, Vol. II). Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Tuesday, 07/20/10; 1:24 PM (Trial Day 5, Vol. II). Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, 7/15/10; 11:03 AM (Trial Day 3, Vol. II). Court Reporter Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Wednesday, 7/14/10; 10:48 AM (Trial Day 2, Vol. II). Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 240 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Tuesday, 07/13/10; 1:33 PM (Vol. III). Court Reporter Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
September 29, 2010 Filing 239 SUPPLEMENT to Objections - non-motion #235 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Parker, Ryan)
September 28, 2010 Filing 238 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans attaching (Proposed) Amended Judgment and Permanent Injunction re Memorandum & Opinion,,, #232 (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Amended Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Woods, Daniel)
September 28, 2010 Filing 237 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. ORDER by Clerk of Court: The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document within 24 hours of issuance of this notice; Moving party to file a Notice of Lodging, the proposed judgment is to be uploaded as an attachment; the "Proposed Judgment" is to be sent to the Chamber's e-mail box for Court's review and consideration. RE: Proposed Judgment #233 . (ad)
September 24, 2010 Filing 236 Response of Plaintiff LCR to Defendants' Objections to Proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction re: REQUEST for Judgment and Permanent Injunction #233 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Miller, Earle)
September 23, 2010 Filing 235 OBJECTIONS to REQUEST for Judgment and Permanent Injunction #233 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Parker, Ryan)
September 17, 2010 Filing 234 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Judgment and Permanent Injunction #233 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (am)
September 16, 2010 Filing 233 REQUEST for Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Miller, Earle)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court finds Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (sometimes referred to in this Order as "Log Cabin," "LCR," or "Plaintiff"), a non-profit corporation, has established standing to bring and maintain this suit on behalf of its members. Additionally, Log Cabin Republicans has demonstrated the Don't Ask, Don't Tell Act, on its face, violates the constitutional rights of its members. Plaintiff is entitled to the relief sought in its First Amended Complaint: a judicial declaration to that effect and a permanent injunction barring further enforcement of the Act. (see document image for further details) Plaintiff shall submit a Proposed Judgment, including a Permanent Injunction, consistent with the terms of this Memorandum Opinion, no later than 9/16/2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ad)
August 12, 2010 Filing 228 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06/28/2010; 3:27 PM (Lanza, Theresa)
August 12, 2010 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, June 28, 2010; 3:27 PM. Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
July 30, 2010 Filing 225 TRIAL BRIEF on the Admissibility of the Doe Declaration filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America.. (Parker, Ryan)
July 30, 2010 Filing 224 TRIAL BRIEF on the Admissibility of Exh. 38, Lt. Col. John Doe's Declaration filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (Woods, Daniel)
July 23, 2010 Filing 231 Witness List filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (mrgo)
July 23, 2010 Filing 230 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Log Cabin Republicans, Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (mrgo)
July 23, 2010 Filing 229 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (mrgo)
July 23, 2010 Filing 223 MINUTES OF Court Trial (8th Day) held and completed before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Closing arguments made. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. The Court finds: Case submitted. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. The parties have not later than July 30, 2010, to submit briefs on whether the declaration of John Doe shall be admitted in evidence or not. The briefing shall be limited to 5 pages. MATTER STANDS SUBMITTED.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens, Theresa Lanza. (am)
July 22, 2010 Filing 222 MINUTES OF Court Trial (7th day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff and defendant rest. Bench Trial continued for 7/23/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens, Theresa Lanza. (am)
July 22, 2010 Filing 215 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RULING ON ADMISSION OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS AND OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WITNESSES OFFERED IN LIEU OF LIVETESTIMONY held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: (See document for further information) (am)
July 21, 2010 Filing 221 MINUTES OF Court Trial (6th day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued for 7/22/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Theresa Lanza, Deborah Parker. (am)
July 20, 2010 Filing 220 MINUTES OF Court Trial (5th day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued for 7/21/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Theresa Lanza. (am)
July 16, 2010 Filing 219 MINUTES OF Court Trial (4th day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued for 7/20/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Deborah Parker. (am)
July 15, 2010 Filing 218 MINUTES OF Court Trial (3rd day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Bench Trial continued for 7/16/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Theresa Lanza, Deborah Parker. (am)
July 14, 2010 Filing 217 MINUTES OF Court Trial (2nd day )held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued for 7/15/2010at 09:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Theresa Lanza, Deborah Parker. (am)
July 13, 2010 Filing 216 MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL (1st Day) held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Opening statements made. Witneses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued for 7/14/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, Deborah Parker. (am) Modified on 7/23/2010 (am).
July 9, 2010 Filing 214 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Amendment to Miscellaneous Document #207 Amended Index of Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Defendants' Counter-Designations and Objections Thereto (Woods, Daniel)
July 8, 2010 Filing 213 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (Woods, Daniel)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For the reasons set forth above, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion. (am)
July 6, 2010 Filing 211 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Legislative Privilege and Expert Testimony on Legislative History filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (Woods, Daniel)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE #178 #179 #180 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Re Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony; Motion in Limine to Exclude "Certain of Plaintiff's Exhibits"; and Motion in Limine to Exclude "Certain of Plaintiff's Exhibits". (am)
June 30, 2010 Filing 209 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR REALTIME REPORTING held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On its own motion, the Court clarifyies its prior ruling at the hearing on June 28, 2010. At the hearing, Mr. Gardner notified the Court he intended "to use TrialDirector, and... realtime." (June 28, 2010, Hearing Tr. 59:5-6.) The Court replied, "[t]hat's fine." (Id. 59:10.) The Court's ruling referred to the use of TrialDirector. Realtime transcripts of proceedings are, however, not available to the parties. If the parties wish to receive daily transcripts of the hearing, they maycontact Phyllis Preston, the Court reporter, to order daily transcripts of the hearing. (am)
June 28, 2010 Filing 208 MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY #178 ; TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXHIBITS #179 ; TO EXCLUDE LAY WITNESS TESTIMONY #180 held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Court conducts the Pretrial Conference which is placed on the record. Motions in limine are held and submittedCourt Reporter: Therea Lanza. (am)
June 28, 2010 Filing 207 Index of Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Defendants' Counter-Designations and Objections Thereto filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America (Woods, Daniel)
June 28, 2010 Filing 206 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, of Trial Subpoena for Robert Joseph MacCoun, served on June 18, 2010. (Woods, Daniel)
June 24, 2010 Filing 205 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain of Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits #179 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Parker, Ryan)
June 24, 2010 Filing 204 REPLY in Support MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Lay Witness Testimony #180 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Simpson, W)
June 24, 2010 Filing 203 REPLY in support MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude expert testimony #178 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua)
June 23, 2010 Filing 202 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Regarding Application of Witt Standard of Review filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief, #2 Declaration of Michael D. Almy with Exh A, #3 Declaration of Jenny L. Kopfstein, #4 Declaration of Anthony Loverde with Exh A, #5 Declaration of Joseph Christopher Rocha with Exh A, #6 Declaration of Stephen Vossler)(Woods, Daniel)
June 23, 2010 Filing 201 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.Patrick Hunnius is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 22, 2010 Filing 199 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Adding Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 22, 2010 Filing 198 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude expert testimony #178 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Feldman, #2 Declaration of Patrick Hagan and Exhs A & B)(Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
June 22, 2010 Filing 195 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Lay Witness Testimony #180 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Scott and Exh A)(Woods, Daniel)
June 22, 2010 Filing 194 Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain of Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits #179 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Woods and Exhs A and B)(Woods, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 200 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants United States of America and Robert Gates, of Documents from Plaintiff's List of Proposed Exhibits: (see document for details). (mg)
June 21, 2010 Filing 197 NOTICE OF LODGING Certain of Plaintiffs Proposed Exhibits filed by defendant United States of America (am)
June 21, 2010 Filing 196 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant United States of America (am)
June 21, 2010 Filing 193 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Woods, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 192 Revised Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (Woods, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 191 Exhibit List filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America.. (Freeborne, Paul)
June 21, 2010 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 189 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans re [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #171 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Woods, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 188 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law #186 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Parker, Ryan)
June 21, 2010 Filing 187 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
June 21, 2010 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
June 18, 2010 Filing 181 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America of Certain of Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits. (Parker, Ryan)
June 18, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Lay Witness Testimony filed by defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, #2 Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, #3 E-mail string, May 17-20, 2010, #4 E-mail from plaintiffs counsel dated June 7, 2010 (subjects of witnesses testimony), #5 E-mail from plaintiffs counsel dated June 7, 2010 (designations of 30(b)(6) deposition testimony), #6 Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #7 Deposition of Jamie Scott Brady, #8 Deposition of Dennis Drogo, #9 Deposition of Paul Gade, #10 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W)
June 18, 2010 Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain of Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
June 18, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude expert testimony filed by defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
June 17, 2010 Filing 185 NOTICE OF LODGING Deposition Transcripts filed by defendant United States of America (am)
June 17, 2010 Filing 184 NOTICE OF LODGING Deposition Transcripts filed by defendant United States of America (am)
June 17, 2010 Filing 183 NOTICE OF LODGING Deposition Transcripts filed by defendant United States of America (am)
June 17, 2010 Filing 182 NOTICE OF LODGING Deposition Transcripts filed by defendant United States of America (am)
June 17, 2010 Filing 177 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Adding Devon A. Myers as attorney as counsel of record for Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 17, 2010 Filing 176 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Adding Earle Miller as attorney as counsel of record for Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 16, 2010 Filing 175 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Adding Aaron A. Kahn as attorney as counsel of record for Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Woods, Daniel)
June 16, 2010 Filing 174 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America of Deposition Transcripts. (Parker, Ryan)
June 10, 2010 Filing 173 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.. (Hunnius, Patrick)
June 9, 2010 Filing 172 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Addressing Standard of Review filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits 1 & 2)(Freeborne, Paul)
June 3, 2010 Filing 171 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER (1) CONTINUING JUNE 7, 2010 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; (2) SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On its own motion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 7, 2010 in this action to June 28, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. The Court sets trial of this matter for July 13, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. The Court further orders that the parties submit pretrial documents required either by the Local Rules or Scheduling Order of this Court in accordance with the following schedule: (See document for scheduled deadline) (am)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: denying in part defendants' #136 Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent it is based on a lack of standing. The Court grants the parties leave to file supplemental briefs for the sole purpose of discussing application of the Witt standard to Plaintiff's substantive due process claim. Defendant may file its supplemental memorandum of points and authorities, along with any further supporting evidence, no later than June 9, 2010. Plaintiff may file its response no later than June 23, 2010. Neither side's supplemental memoranda shall exceed fifteen pages, exclusive of tables of contents and authorities. (mrgo)
May 13, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue #168 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's, #2 Proposed Order Defendants')(Hunnius, Patrick)
May 11, 2010 Filing 168 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference from June 7, 2010 to Indefinitely filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.(Hunnius, Patrick)
May 3, 2010 Filing 167 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Plaintiff's Second Supplemental (Post-Hearing) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
May 3, 2010 Filing 166 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures)(Parker, Ryan)
April 26, 2010 Filing 165 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #136 held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument.The Court will allow both sides to file a supplemental brief, not to exceed 10 pages in length on or before May 3, 2010. The Court takes the matter under submission.Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (am)
April 26, 2010 Filing 164 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
April 26, 2010 Filing 163 DECLARATION of C. Martin Meekins Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
April 23, 2010 Filing 162 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Parker, Ryan)
April 22, 2010 Filing 161 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 12, 2010 Filing 160 EXHIBIT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 Appendix In Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Parker, Ryan)
April 12, 2010 Filing 159 REPLY in Support MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Simpson, W)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DISCOVERY RULING by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion. #135 (am)
April 5, 2010 Filing 157 APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE (PAGES 1701-3094) In Support of Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix LCR Appendix 1701-1800, #2 Appendix LCR Appendix 1801-2500, #3 Appendix LCR Appendix 2501-3094)(Hunnius, Patrick)
April 5, 2010 Filing 156 APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE (PAGES 1201-1700) In Support of Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix LCR Appendix 1201-1329, #2 Appendix LCR Appendix 1330-1400, #3 Appendix LCR Appendix 1401-1500, #4 Appendix LCR Appendix 1501-1600, #5 Appendix LCR Appendix 1601-1700)(Hunnius, Patrick)
April 5, 2010 Filing 155 APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE (PAGES 601-1200) In Support of Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix LCR Appendix 601-700, #2 Appendix LCR Appendix 701-800, #3 Appendix LCR Appendix 801-900, #4 Appendix LCR Appendix 901-1000, #5 Appendix LCR Appendix 1001-1100, #6 Appendix LCR Appendix 1101-1200)(Hunnius, Patrick)
April 5, 2010 Filing 154 APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE (PAGES 1-600) In Support of Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix LCR Appendix 1-200, #2 Appendix LCR Appendix 201-300, #3 Appendix LCR Appendix 301-400, #4 Appendix LCR Appendix 401-500, #5 Appendix LCR Appendix 501-600)(Hunnius, Patrick)
April 5, 2010 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Hillman in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 152 DECLARATION of Alan Okros in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Melissa Sheridan Embser-Herbert in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Robert MacCoun in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Lawrence Korb in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Nathaniel Frank in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Terry Hamilton in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Jamie Ensley in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Aaron Belkin in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Craig Engle in support of opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Philip Bradley in support of opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Dan Woods In Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 141 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #136 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
April 1, 2010 Filing 139 REPLY in support of MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's March 16, 2010 Discovery Ruling #135 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
April 1, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua Edward Gardner on behalf of Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America (Gardner, Joshua)
March 30, 2010 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's March 16, 2010 Discovery Ruling #135 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Woods, Daniel)
March 29, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Appendix, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul)
March 26, 2010 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's March 16, 2010 Discovery Ruling filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Freeborne, Paul)
March 26, 2010 Filing 134 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul)
March 23, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/18/2010; 9:07 AM (Lanza, Theresa)
March 23, 2010 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, 2/18/2010; 9:07 AM. Court Reporter Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2010. (Lanza, Theresa)
March 19, 2010 Filing 131 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/15/10 9:54 a.m. (bem)
March 19, 2010 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/15/10 9:54 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, phone number 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2010. (bem)
March 18, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #128 (Parker, Ryan)
March 18, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America of Deposition Transcripts. (Parker, Ryan)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, The Court has read and considered all papers filed in support of and in opposition to: (a) "Log Cabin Republicans' Motion to Compel Production of Documents", filed 2/22/10; (b) "Log Cabin Republicans' Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Defendants to Comply with Log Cabin Republicans' Notice of Deposition, etc.", filed 3/5/10; and (c) Plaintiff's "Ex Parte Application for an Order that Certain Requests for Admissions Be Deemed Admitted or for Further Responses", filed 3/8/10. The Court heard oral argument on the Documents Motion, the Deposition Application and the RFA Application on 3/15/10. With respect to the Documents Motion: Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Defendants shall produce all documents within the possession, custody or control of the Department of Defense that are responsive to one or more of the following Document Requests: Nos. 2,4,32,33, 34,43,44,45,46,47,54,55,56, and 38. The Court finds that Defendants waived the deliberative process privilege by failing timely to invoke the privilege properly. Except as expressly stated, the Documents Motion is denied. The Court denies the Documents Motion as to the following documents Requests: (a) Request No. 58; (b) Request No. 39; and (c) Request No. 40. The Court has ordered production with respect to Request No. 38 because Defendants waived the deliberative process privilege and failed adequately to support their general claim of any non-waived protections under the attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine. With respect to the Deposition Application: On or before 4/15/10, the Department of Defense shall produce for a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition a person or persons prepared to testify concerning those areas specified in the Notice of Deposition as Areas Nos. 1,2,3,4,6,7,10,14,15, and 17. Except as expressly stated, the Deposition Application is denied. With respect to the RFA Application: Within 10 days of the date of this Order, Defendant USA shall unqualifiedly admit or deny Requests for Admissions Nos. 3,4,5, and 81-105, the Court having overruled all objections thereto. To the extent the RFA Application seeks an order deeming admitted Requests for Admissions nos. 3,4,5, and 81-105, the RFA Application is denied without prejudice. Except as expressly stated, the RFA Application is denied. Requests for Admissions Nos. 10,13,14,15, and 106-119 employ objectionably vague and ambiguous terms. (See document for further information.) Any party seeking review of this Order shall cause the preparation and filing of a transcript of the 3/15/10 hearing. (sp)
March 15, 2010 Filing 126 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #124 , Miscellaneous Document #123 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Proof of Service (subsequent document). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (am)
March 15, 2010 Filing 125 MINUTES OF 1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (2) HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH LOG CABIN REPUBLICANS NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF USA AND ROBERT M. GATES (3) HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER THAT CERTAIN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED OR FOR FURTHER RESPONSESDiscovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. The court hears argument. Matters are taken under submission. Court Recorder: Courtsmart. (sp)
March 12, 2010 Filing 124 Proof of Service of LCR's Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Defendants to Comply with LCR's Notice of Deposition of USA and Gates filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
March 12, 2010 Filing 123 Proof of Service of Ex Parte Application for an Order That Certain Requests for Admissions be Deemed Admitted or for Further Responses filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER PERMITTING PARTIES TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS OUTSIDE THE DISCOVERY PERIOD by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Defendants are hereby approved to depose Plaintiff s experts Alan Okros, Melissa Sheridan Embser-Herbert, and Lawrence Korb outside of the discovery period. All depositions must be complete by April 5, 2010. (am)
March 10, 2010 Filing 122 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Take Depositions Outside of the Discovery Period filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
March 10, 2010 Filing 121 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for That Certain Requests For Admissions Be Deemed Admitted Or For Further Responses #119 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Parker, Ryan)
March 8, 2010 Filing 120 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendants to Comply with Plaintiff's F.R.C.P. Notice of Deposition of USA and Gates #118 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Freeborne, Paul)
March 8, 2010 Filing 119 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for That Certain Requests For Admissions Be Deemed Admitted Or For Further Responses filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Hunnius, Patrick)
March 5, 2010 Filing 118 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendants to Comply with Plaintiff's F.R.C.P. Notice of Deposition of USA and Gates filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Hunnius, Patrick)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Re Privacy Act Confidentiality by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sp)
March 4, 2010 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents #104 filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mr. Bill Carr)(Parker, Ryan)
March 4, 2010 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents #104 Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
March 4, 2010 Filing 114 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court having considered the arguments of both sides presented at the Status Conference convened on February 18, 2010 regarding a stay of theproceedings in this case, or an extension of the trial date or discovery cut-off date, hereby declines to issue either a stay or any extension. Trial remains set to commence June 14, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. (am)
March 2, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Supplemental Memoranda Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents #110 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: STIPULATIONS/Extend Time to File. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (am)
March 2, 2010 Filing 112 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunnius, Patrick)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The parties shall have until Thursday, 3/4/10 to file their supplemental memoranda regarding Plaintiff's motion to compel the production of documents. (sp)
March 1, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Supplemental Memoranda Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents filed by Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
February 23, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents #104 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ad)
February 23, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Bradley Parker on behalf of Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America (Parker, Ryan)
February 23, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney W Scott Simpson on behalf of Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America (Simpson, W)
February 22, 2010 Filing 105 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents #104 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3)(Hunnius, Patrick)
February 22, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Hunnius, Patrick)
February 18, 2010 Filing 106 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The status conference is held as stated on the record.Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (am)
February 9, 2010 Filing 103 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that a status conference is set for Thursday, February 18, 2010at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (am)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall have to and including January 19, 2010, to complete their initial designation of expert witnesses; and that the parties shall have to and including February 2, 2010 to designate rebuttal expert witnesses. (am)
December 18, 2009 Filing 101 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Expert Witness Designation Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hunnius, Patrick)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips DENYING #93 Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and for Stay: (see document image for further details). IT IS SO ORDERED. (ad)
November 16, 2009 Filing 99 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips RE: Defendant/Government's MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 . Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter(s) under submission. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (mrgo)
November 9, 2009 Filing 98 REPLY Support MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 And Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion And Appeal filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (Freeborne, Paul)
November 2, 2009 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Aaron Kahn In Opposition MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hunnius, Patrick)
November 2, 2009 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
October 22, 2009 Filing 95 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk. The document is accepted as filed. The hearing date has been rescheduled to 11/16/09 @ 10:00 a.m. RE: MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 (am)
October 20, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Hearing time should be 10:00 AM instead of 1:30 PM. RE: MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #93 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (mrgo)
October 16, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Freeborne, Paul)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Deadline for initial designation of expert witnesses is 1/5/2010; Deadline for designation of rebuttal expert witnesses is 1/19/10; Discovery cut-off is 3/15/2010; Summary Judgment Motion Hearing Cut-off is 4/26/2010; Pretrial Conference is set for 6/7/2010 at 02:30 PM; and Court Trial is set for 6/14/2010, at 08:30 AM. (gg)
July 24, 2009 Filing 91 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips DENYING Defendants' Request Regarding Discovery re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #86 and Scheduling Conference #89 . See attached Minute Order for further details. (gg)
July 14, 2009 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 25 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld.(Freeborne, Paul)
July 7, 2009 Filing 89 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court will allow the parties to enter into a stipulation setting forth the trialschedule, motion and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will consider a proposedschedule for fact discovery at the end of January 2010; expert disclosures, January 2010;summary judgment hearing cut-off, end of April, 2010; pretrial conference, June 2010; trial, June, 2010. The Court will consider vacating the discovery referral to the magistrate judge. By stipulation of the parties, the Court extends the time to file the answer on or before July 16, 2009.Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (am)
June 30, 2009 Filing 88 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: A proposed ADR-01 Order form is needed as a separate attachment to the Notice & Request or to a Notice of Lodging. RE: Notice/Request of Settlement Procedure Settlement (Sp 1) - (ADR-1), Notice/Request of Settlement Procedure Settlement (Sp 1) - (ADR-1) #87 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (mrgo)
June 29, 2009 Filing 87 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1); parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld.(Hunnius, Patrick)
June 29, 2009 Filing 86 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial not specified, filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld.. (Hunnius, Patrick)
June 25, 2009 Filing 85 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul)
June 18, 2009 Filing 84 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER (1) VACATING JUNE 22, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE; (2) SETTING MATTER FOR JULY 6, 2009 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.) (mrgo)
June 10, 2009 Filing 82 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion a status conference will be held on Monday, June 22, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 6/22/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.) (mrgo)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting in part and denying in part defendants' 29 Motion to Dismiss Case. The Court DENIES the Motion insofar as it attacks Plaintiff's standing to bring suit; DENIES the Motion as to Plaintiff's substantive due process claim; GRANTS the Motion as to Plaintiff's equal protection claim; and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Motion as to Plaintiff's First Amendment claim. (See document for further specifics) (mrgo)
March 10, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Patrick O Hunnius counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Sayema Hameed will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Sayema Hameed is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
March 9, 2009 Filing 81 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing re Defendants Motion to Dismiss, filed 2/17/09 held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission.Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (am)
February 27, 2009 Filing 79 Opposition re: Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Case Addressing The Issue of Substantive Due Process #77 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
February 23, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Motion date is not timely. Only 20 days notice. RE: Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Case Addressing The Issue of Substantive Due Process #77 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (mrgo)
February 17, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Case Addressing The Issue of Substantive Due Process filed by Federal Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Freeborne, Paul)
January 29, 2009 Filing 76 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court will allow supplemental briefing on the issue of substantive due process. The defendant shall file its supplemental opening brief on or before February 17, 2009; the plaintiff shall file response on or before February 27, 2009. The Court sets defendants motion to dismiss for March 9, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Virginia A. PhillipsCourt Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (am)
January 26, 2009 Filing 75 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, the status conference presently scheduled for Wednesday, January 28, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. is ordered continued to Thursday, January 29, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 1/29/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.) (mrgo)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-73194. Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this courtby means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. (cbr)
January 21, 2009 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendant United States of America. (Hunnius, Patrick)
December 17, 2008 Filing 72 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that a status conference is set for Wednesday, January 28,2009 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 21, 2009 (am)
December 11, 2008 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
December 11, 2008 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, of Notice of Standing Order served on 12/11/2008. (Hunnius, Patrick)
December 1, 2008 Filing 69 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 , CCA # 08-56185. The court dismisses this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Mandate received in this district on 12/1/2008. (dmap)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, CCA # 08-56185. Appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisidction. Order received in this district on 11/6/08. (car)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (am)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#08-078) approved by Chief Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, this case is transferred, from Judge George P. Schiavelli, to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV04-8425 VAP (Ex). #(at)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#08-078) approved by Chief Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, this case is transferred, from Judge George P. Schiavelli, to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV04-8425 VAP (Ex). (at)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 filed by Log Cabin Republicans, CCA # 08-56185. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $455.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment. Within 21 dyas after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show case why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (cbr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 63 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 as to Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans; Receipt Number: 109617, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 62 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 08-56185, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 as to Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (lr)
July 22, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 (lr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 61 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, re a $5.00 filing fee and $450.00 docket fee are requiree to be paid to the Clerk, U.S. District Court. re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 (lr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 filed by Log Cabin Republicans ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 08-56185. Transcripts: None Requested. (lr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION form issued regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 as to Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (lr)
July 22, 2008 Filing 58 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from PLAINTIFF Log Cabin Republicans forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #57 (Hunnius, Patrick)
July 22, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by PLAINTIFFLog Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH. A TO NOTICE OF APPEAL)(Hunnius, Patrick)
July 1, 2008 Filing 56 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George P. Schiavelli: re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Stayed,, #52 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Stayed,, #52 #53 . (tad)
June 3, 2008 Filing 55 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: wrong event: miscellaneous; correct event found under motion related documents: memorandum in opposition RE: Miscellaneous Document, #54 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc)
June 2, 2008 Filing 54 Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating Stay filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Stayed,, #52 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Stayed,, #52 #53 (West, Roger)
May 30, 2008 Filing 53 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Stayed,, #52 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Log Cabin Republicans' Ex Parte Application to Vacate Stay)(Hunnius, Patrick)
May 23, 2008 Filing 52 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George P. Schiavelli : Order Staying Action in Light of Ninth Circuits May 21, 2008 Decision in Witt v. Department of Air Force, et al.Accordingly, the submission of the motion is VACATED, and further proceedings in this action are STAYED pending the final disposition in Witt. (lc)
April 30, 2008 Filing 51 Joint REQUEST for Ruling To Chief Judge re Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (Hunnius, Patrick)
April 8, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Patrick O Hunnius counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.C. Martin Meekins is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
April 8, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Patrick O Hunnius counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans.Timothy M. Rusche is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
April 8, 2008 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Patrick O Hunnius counsel for Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. Adding Patrick Hunnius as attorney as counsel of record for Log Cabin Republicans for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (Hunnius, Patrick)
March 20, 2008 Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found wrong event: miscellaneous document; correct event found under Request category: ruling (for your "request for a decision), action was or will be taken by filer: RE Miscellaneous Document #46 (lc)
March 20, 2008 Filing 46 Joint Request For Decision In Accordance With Local Rule 83-9.2 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld (Hunnius, Patrick)
November 13, 2007 Filing 45 REPLY in support of plaintiff's supplemental authority in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 29 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (lc)
November 5, 2007 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority in SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 29 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (vh)
October 26, 2007 Filing 43 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George P. Schiavelli : Court permits plaintiff's supplemental argument in support of opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss; the Court will allow defendants to file an opposition brief by 11/5/07; plaintiff has until 11/12/07 to file a reply; additionally, as a consequence of the Court's accepting plaintiff's supplemental memorandum,the Joint REQUEST for a decision is denied as moot 42 . (lc)
October 24, 2007 Filing 42 JOINT REQUEST for Decision in Accordance with Local Rule 83-9.2 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, and Defendants United States of America. (tad)
October 24, 2007 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY in Support of Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans' Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 29 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (tad)
June 28, 2007 Filing 40 REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 6/18/07. Court Reporter: Pamela Cotten. (klg)
June 11, 2007 Filing 39 DECLARATION of John Doe filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (ad)
June 7, 2007 Filing 37 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George P. Schiavelli: Order requiring Plaintiff to file "John Doe" Declaration. Plaintiff is ordered to file this anonymous declaration by 7/11/2007. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
June 6, 2007 Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (ad)
March 26, 2007 Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George P. Schiavelli: RE: MOTION to Dismiss 29 . The Court places the above referenced motion on calendar for 6/18/2007 at 1:30 PM. Court Reporter: Not present. (pcl, )
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REQUEST FOR INTENDED DECISION Date in Accordance with LR 83-9.4 and 83-9.5 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (yl, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George P. Schiavelli: The Court has received the parties Joint Request for Determination 33 . This Order is to notify the parties that the Court recently discovered that the case file was destroyed because it was inadvertently marked "Closed" by courthouse staff. The Court, however, was able to recover what appears to be copies of the filings. Accordingly, this Court will review the copies to make sure it has all of the materials that wre taken under submission on 7/14/2006, and set a hearing at a future date. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk, )
November 14, 2006 Filing 33 JOINT REQUEST for Determination in Accordance with Local Rule 83-9.1 and 83-9.2. (gk, )
July 14, 2006 Filing 32 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George P. Schiavelli: Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 29 currently set to be heard on July 24, 2006 is taken off calendar. The Court will reschedule a hearing date after further consideration of the parties' submissions. Court Reporter: Not Present. (shb, )
July 7, 2006 Filing 31 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 29 filed by Defendant United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (yl, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Opposition to Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 29 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (shb, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Action with prejudice; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of motion to dismiss filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge George P. Schiavelli. (ir, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (yl, )
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION RE MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Plainitff's Opposition; Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Order Thereon: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The Defendants shall file their moiton to dismiss on or before June 12, 2006. 2. The plaintiff will file its opposition on or before June 30, 2006. 3. The defendants will file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on 7/7/2006. 4. Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be heard on July 24, 2006 at 1:30 pm in courtroom 7 of the Spring Street Federal Courthouse by Judge George P. Schiavelli (yl, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 26 DECLARATION of JOHN ALEXANDER NICHOLSON filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jag, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (jag, )
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge George P. Schiavelli; Defendants MOTION to Dismiss 9 is GRANTED on the grounds that LCR lacks associational standing. LCR is permitted to file and serve an Amended Complaint in compliance with this order on or before 4/28/06. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(jag, )
March 13, 2006 Filing 23 REQUEST for intended decision date in accordance with LR 83-9.4 and 93-9.5 (jag, )
December 19, 2005 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Submission of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans (jag, )
December 8, 2005 Filing 21 Defendants' Submission of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss 9 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (shb, )
October 12, 2005 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Request for Judicial Notice 19 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeldto. (ca, )
September 28, 2005 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 9 filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (ca, )
July 8, 2005 Filing 18 JOINT REQUEST for determination in accordance with Local Rule 83-9.1 and 83-9.2 (jag, )
June 29, 2005 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs Submission of Supplemental Authority; Notice of Supplemental Authority in support of Defendants Motion to dismiss 9 filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (ir, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 16 SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY in support of its opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jag, )
March 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge George P. Schiavelli: Court takes MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 under submission and off calendar. Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of the submitted pleadings. Court Reporter: Not present. (pg, )
February 28, 2005 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 11 (bp, )
February 4, 2005 Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS: The MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 is hereby CONTINUED TO 3/7/2005 at 01:30 PM by Judge George P. Schiavelli.Court Reporter: Not Present. (pj, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by defendants United States of America. (yc, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition to Defendants MOTION to Dismiss 9 filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (el, )
January 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge George P. Schiavelli : That: 1. The Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before 1/31/2005. 2. Defendants MOTION to Dismiss 9 , shall be heard on 2/7/2005 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 7 of the Spring Street Federal Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles. (el, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of points and authorities filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2005 at 01:30 PM before Honorable George P. Schiavelli. (shb, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. (jp, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 7 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 1/12/2005 re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 [6; Declaration of Dan Woods, Proposed Order Denying Application filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (shb, )
December 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge George P. Schiavelli : The Court has received Defendants Ex Parte Application for an Order Enlarging Time to File Defendants answer, motion or otherwise respond and Opposition thereto. The application is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have until 1/12/2005 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint.Court Reporter: Not Present. (el, )
December 9, 2004 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Order Enlarging Time to File Defendants' Answer, Motion or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 to and including 1/12/05; Declaration of Paul G Freeborne filed by Defendants United States of America, Donald H Rumsfeld. Lodged Proposed Order. (shb, )
October 18, 2004 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans, upon United States of America served on 10/13/2004, answer due 12/12/2004. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Laura Villa, civil process clerk on behalf of United States of America. Original Summons not returned. (bp, )
October 12, 2004 FAX number for Attorneys Sayema Javed Hameed, C Martin Meekins, Dan J Woods is 213-687-0758. (jp, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jp, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jp, )
October 12, 2004 60 Days Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (jp, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Filing fee $ 150.), filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jp, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Donald H Rumsfeld, United States of America. (Filing fee $ 150.), filed by plaintiff Log Cabin Republicans. (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Log Cabin Republicans v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H Rumsfeld
Represented By: Paul G Freeborne
Represented By: Timothy M Rusche
Represented By: Joshua Edward Gardner
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Represented By: W Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel J Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Paul G Freeborne
Represented By: Timothy M Rusche
Represented By: Joshua Edward Gardner
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Represented By: W Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel J Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James E Pietrangelo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Log Cabin Republicans
Represented By: Aaron Alexander Kahn
Represented By: Paul G Freeborne
Represented By: C Martin Meekins
Represented By: Earle D Miller
Represented By: Sayema Javed Hameed
Represented By: Timothy M Rusche
Represented By: Daniel J Woods
Represented By: Patrick O Hunnius
Represented By: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Represented By: Devon A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?