Roberto Alaniz v. Los Angeles City of et al
Plaintiff: Annissa Elaine Harsma, Barry Brooks, Omar Veloz, Juvey Mejia, Malcolm A Thomas, Dong S Park, Paul Bowser, Michael B Calhoun, Joseph Eric Chavez, Robert Guyer, Charles Joseph, Michael Karatsonyi, Salvatore De Bella, Gerardo Vazquez, Carlos Velez, John Chilstrom, Robert Olmos, Travis Kupka, Raul Rodriguez, Tarriel Hopper, Mario Cruz, Phillip Carr, Steven Eguchi, Eddie N Solomon, Matthew McNulty, John F Martinez, Edward Yoon, Steven Stranak, Marco A Rodriguez, Robert Lewis, Jason Witt, Hyong S Perkins, Francisco Macias, Thomas A Burris, Paul A Ricchiazzi, Matthew Kevin Murray, John P Castillo, Elizabeth Boccanfuso, Victor Gutierrez, Lonya C Britton, Darrel Hinson, Leonard Garza, Erik Sundstrom, David Guiterman, David A Akins, Tom Gracey, Ryuichi Ricky Ishitani, David Miner, Mario Aguilar, Larry Lee Johnson, Matthew Cundiff, Lilia Velasco, Travonne Dixon, Brent McGuyre, David Wren, Alan Bone, Myra M Kellum, Steven Grimmer, Philip Thompson, Heath Adams, Dimitrius Connor, Theodore Robert McHenry, Darrell Edward Sancho, Brett Robinson, Andy Joshua Leuridan, S Owens, Eduardo B Trinidad, Gerardo Velasco, Darius Lee, Veronica Padilla, Danh Ngo, Daniel Campbell, Fred Yamamoto, Michael J Lorenz, Karen Crawford, Derek Richard Mousseau, Salvador Flores, Christopher Cortijo, Alex Gabriel Rodriguez, Gus Martinez, -, Gregory Fuqua, Philip Anthony Walters, Martin Franco, Mitchell Allen Norling, Gerry R Chamberlain, Timothy Wunderlich, David R Ortiz, Perry Moore, Antonio Martin, John Smith, Andres Gallagher, Greg Ortiz, Timothy B Stack, Brian Gan, David Alfredo Navas, John Knighton, Jeffrey Pelczar, David Redd, Oscar Cansino, Arthur Reyna, Lon Truong, Constance White, James Chong, R Maggie Luquin, Suzanne Vukovic, Ray John Martinez, Tim OGorman, Michael Anthony Thompson, Michael Williamson, Silvia Corral, John Rice, Robert Aguilar, Joe Galindo, Juan P Silva, Stephen Michael Musso, Oscar Lopez, Jeremy Marshall Olson, Richard Parks, Ray Hallenbeck, William Snowden, Gilbert Pedregon, Daniel Garrett Thompson, Ken Furuta, Matthew Casalicchio, Steve Park, Lashawna Pugh, Dennis Nguyen, Maurice Brunel, Maurice Stewart, Francisco Carrillo, Maryann Bunag, Rayney L Arnold, George M Castro, Jimmy Grayson, Steven Ramirez, Victor M Eguez, Keith Horeczko, Gary Eugene Ross, Peter Vasquez, Daryl Scoggins, Lupe Palomares, Theodore P Maillett, Alan Parra, Jeffrey B Pailet, Bryan Harold Millner, Mike Gilbert, Christopher Campagna, George Bowens, Jr, David Nunez, Joseph Henry Cruz, Mark Austin Johnson, Vincent Deglinnocenti, Jason Zapatka, Jeffrey Stapleton, Peter M Lopez, Andy A Azodi, Carmen M Gutierrez, Florence Estella Johnson, Donald Ernest Muniz, Craig Stephen Adams, David Lin, Heather Mclean, Victor Perez, Mario Ramirez, Jr, Tracye Fields, Richard Mark Carney, Art Talamante, Robert F Chavira, Marcello Sabbatella, Mark Allen, Lolita Bermudez, James Sterling, Brent Alan Smith, Sallyann S Procaccini, Adrian Alexander Rios, Medrardo Carranza, Anthony NMI Green, Gerardo Davila, Todd Chaney, Vincent Stroway, Deshaun Hall, Thomas Small, Patricia L Blake, Anthony Magaleno, Emily Delph, Dean Watts, Dennis Lada, Rogelio Perez, Sal Ogaz, Peter Laundelius, Catherine Rymzsa Leon, Daniel Odoh, Peter Hopkins, Michael Rimkunas, Angelo Stewart, Gerardo Madera, Roger Fontes, Frank Dominguez, III, Dwayne Wilson, LaMont Jerrett, Craig Allen, George Goodyear, Charles Dwight Thomas, Michael A Pytel, Randolph Clifford Agard, Alejandro Izquierdo, John Chrispens, Craig Kojima, Brent A Smith, Stephen Gordon, Alexander Kordis, David Herskowitz, Mauricio Garcia, Anthony Cole, Scott Blackman, -, James P Moon, Demetrio Mendoza, Robert Espinoza, George Hoopes, Jeramie Andrel Schulze, Robert NMI Williamson, Ronald G Lopez, Timothy T Rolsen, Brett Deoliveira, Pablo Monterrosa, Jennifer A Grasso, Daryl Ordone, Jose Covarrubias, Juan Gonzalez, George Chavez, Stephen Redd, James Craig Ferrell, Kin Wong, Richard Krynsky, Milan A Ayers, James Franciscus Martinez, Kennith Joseph Ferro, Roy Ballesteros, Raquel Cruz, Kelvin Scott, Manuel Vides, Larry Covington, Robert A Canizales, Randy Scott Goens, Orlando T Green, II, Joseph Linares, Terence Klafke, Juan Cruz, Vincent Vicari, Robert Martin, Edward Viadaillet, Michael Stalnecker, Season Nunez, Eric Bixler, Timothy Hwan Kim, Trevor Jackson, Robert Vargas, Joan Leuck, Adrian Ferns, Scott Fairchild, Vickie Nguyen, Gary Ferrato, Ivan Guillermo, Rebecca Martinez, Antonia Serna, Neal Fine, Omar Lamont Davis, Brian Thayer, Paul Hong, David Benioff, Robert Yanez, Steven Lemmer, Nicholas Noles, Andres Cruz, Steven Smith, Jeanette Lawrence, Kevin B Study, Kenneth Robinson, David Corbet, Edward Heredia, Jeffri Norat, Anthony W T Kong, Kenneth M Montague, Joseph Pollack, Kelene Dale Gibson, Carolyn Coward, Carlos Savedra, William Monahan, Rickey Crowder, Jr, Jose Maldonado, Elliott King, Michelle Rachel Eskridge, Andrew A Paredes, Patrick Shepard Robinson, Luis Rodarte, James D Crawford, Steven Bishop, David Rosenthal, Neil Wank, Louie Lozano, Robert Louis Schlesinger, Teresa Lynn Anderson, Ian Carbonell, James Zourek, Jonathan Goode, Ramirez, John Licata, Jr, Carlton Jeter, Fredger A Alexander, Albert Gonzalez, Ricky Davis, Raymond G Wong, Robert Vasquez, Steve Griffith, Augusto Mariano, Emerson Holder, Valentin Montesdeoca, Arthur Lee Simms, Jr, Richard Romney, Marlon Prodigalidad, Arldwin Flores, Sheldon J Williams, Richard Aston, Tanza Smalls, -, Mark Griego, Kyle B Remolino, Jeffrey Brian Beacham, Arthur Antonio, Solve Loken, Ernesto Munoz, Eric Lee Windham, Charles Hicks, Kimberly Cisco, Larry Wright, Efren J Corrac, Jennifer Nicole Blomeley, Bonnie Lynn Lehigh, Michael Henry Gomez, Connor Mac Ivor, Michael Villareal, -, Jason Duplantis, Lizabett Mesa, Peter Paul Acosta, Miguel A Contreras, Maggie Sherman, George Timothy Leonard, Danny Steve Mendez, Joseph Taylor, Anthony R Ochoa, Edward P Castro, Gerardo Morales, Javier Borrego, Michael Gannon, Andre Wright, Andrea Grossman, Jeffrey X Vach, Dean Schram, Luke Baxter Walden, Randy Garcia, Clarence Speer, Joseph Mueller, Jae Hyun Sung, Carlos R Ortega, Kristen Yeager, Osmund Bouligny, Shawn David Crabbe, Eric M Reade, Jeffrey Tint, Asatur Mkrtchyan, Dennis Clifford, Alfonso Villaneda, Shawn Duke, Vaotupua Sefo Feula, Sonia Banuelos, Eva Jean Perry, Leonard Roland Perez and Jaroen Hitanukulkit
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Petitioner: Ofelia Tello
Case Number: 2:2004cv08592
Filed: October 15, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Andrew J Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 3018 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #3011 CCA # 15-56990. The judgment of this Court, entered September 13, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion #3017 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3017 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-56990. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED.(mat)
April 4, 2016 Filing 3016 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #3008 filed by Plaintiff Philip Alaniz, Jr. (Petersen, Gregory)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3015 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Ex Parte Application Requesting Additional Pages for Opposition Briefs [Dkt. 102] by Judge George H. King: Defendant City of Los Angeles filed the above-captioned Ex Parte Application, requesting a fifteen-page extension of the page limit for its Opposition briefs to the motions for attorney's fees and costs. Defendants Application is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL be permitted fifteen additional pages for each Opposition. Additionally, moving attorneys Adam Clayton, Greg Hafif, and Gregory Petersen SHALL be permitted five additional pages each for their respective optional reply briefs. The deadline for filing any optional reply briefs is extended to April 25, 2016. (bm)
January 22, 2016 Filing 3014 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge George H. King. Motion by Law Offices of Herbert Hafif for Attorneys' Fees and Costs set 1/25/16 is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and the hearing is VACATED. See order of 1/20/16 in CV 14-5661 [dkt 86] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 6, 2016 Filing 3013 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56990, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #3011 as to plaintiffs Paul Von Lutzow, Manfred G Merkens, Jr. and All Opt-In Plaintiffs. (mat)
December 24, 2015 Filing 3012 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #3011 . (Petersen, Gregory)
December 24, 2015 Filing 3011 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by All Opt-In Plaintiffs Hector Aceves, Edward N Acosta, Peter Paul Acosta, Rene Acosta, Richard Acosta, Richard Lance Adair, Craig Stephen Adams, Tony Adler, Joseph Adragna, Ashur Agena, James Agnole, Miguel Aguayo, Mario Aguilar, Robert Aguilar, Steven Aguilar, III, Benjamin E Aguilera, Vincent Aguirre, David A Akins, Teresa Akune, Philip Alaniz, Jr, Deen Alcaraz, Alan Aldegarie, Michael Christopher Alexander-Fuller, Alfonso Alfaro, Jorge Arturo Alfaro, Julio Alfonso, Christopher Wayne Allen, Craig Allen, Mark Allen, Adam Altamirano, Luis Alvarado, Alexander R Alvarez, Fernando Alvarez, Manuel Alvarez, Perry Miguel Alvarez, Ralph Alvarez, Victor Alvarez, Michael Amado, Juan C Amancio, Agnos Amarantos, John Ammons, Cheryl Amour, Teddy Amstone, Andreas An, Sang Mo An, Jaime Anchondo, Jeffrey Anderson, Teresa Lynn Anderson, Greg Andrachick, Robert Andreno, Manuel Andujo, Steven Angulo, Arthur Antonio, Michael Apodaca, Maribel Arambula, Miguel Arambula, Arca, Jorge L Arellano, Jose Antonio Arellano, Robert Arellano, James Mark Arenas, Juan R Arenas, Anthony Ares, Marlene Arguello, Ramon Argulles, David Armas, Jason Armendariz, Rayney L Arnold, Samuel Adam Arnold, Evannry Maria Arocho, Alejandro Arredondo, Victor Manuel Arrelano, Mario Arrizon, Juan Arroyo, Michael Arteaga, Manuel Arzate, Ralph Arzate, David Gibson Ashley, Richard Aston, Arnel Asuncion, John J Avalos, Rudy Avelar, Ernest Avila, Joseph Avila, Leonard Avila, Paul Avila, Carlos E Ayala, John Ayala, Milan A Ayers, Nestor D Ayson, Andy A Azodi, Rudolph Baca, Eddie Badillo, Felicia Ann Bailey, Matthew Bakotich, Anthony Balderama, Todd Baldwin, David Bambrick, Bret Andrew Banachowski, Frank Bancalari, John Banelos, Siamone Bangphraxay, Francisco Banuelos, Joyce M Banuelos, Ruben Banuelos, Sonia Banuelos, Miguel Barajas, Terry Barclay, Cynthia Barlow, Byron Anthony Barnes, Carl Barnhart, Martin Barocio, Ralph Barone, Ezequiel Barraza, Karla Barraza, Rudy Barrigan, Carlos Barrios, Michael Joseph Barrios, Kenneth Steven Bartnicki, Michael K Barz, George Bashai, William O Batista, Morris Batts, Alexander Bautista, Leah Marie Baxter, Andre Baydaline, Jesus Bazan, Jeffrey Brian Beacham, Gary Bean, Todd Behrens, Patrick Beighley, Cynthia Bello, Ryan Bellows, Michael Belmonte, Michael Beloud, Julio Benavides, Pedro Benavides, Felipe Benavidez, Jr, Donald Bender, David Benioff, Nadya P Bennyworth, Lonnie Benson, Ron Berdin, Thomas Bergren, Lolita Bermudez, Robert Bermudez, Paul Richard Bernd, Wendi Leigh Berndt, David Berumen, JR, Steven Beumer, Thomas Ewell Bibbs, John Bigrigg, Robert J Bishop, Steven Bishop, Eric Bixler, Scott Blackman, Lance Adam Blake, Michael Clark Blake, Patricia L Blake, James Michael Bland, Christopher Blankenship, Leroy Block, Barry Blocker, Charles Kevin Blomeley, Jennifer Nicole Blomeley, John Carlo Blondo, Bennie Boatwright, Elizabeth Boccanfuso, Giovanni Boccanfuso, Timothy Jason Bohac, Thomas Anthony Bojorquez, Francis J Bolan, Alan Bone, Angel Salvador Bonilla, Luis Michel Bonilla, Michel Bonilla, Rigo Bonilla, Jefferey Booker, Leonel Borja, Javier Borrego, Osmund Bouligny, Del Bourgeois, George Bowens, Jr, Inge Yolanda Bowman, Randal Bowman, Paul Bowser, Anderson Boyce, Michael Boylls, Gina M Bracht, Todd H Bracht, Lane Bragg, Kristi Brandon, David Brandstetter, Timothy Branley, Jeffery Bratcher, Adriana Bravo, Marvin Brent, Michael Briano, Todd Bridges, Eric T Briggs, Samuel Joseph Briggs, Fred Brignoni, Lonya C Britton, Robert Brogelman, Raymond Broker, Barry Brooks, Robert A Brophy, Brian Eric Brown, Carlton M Brown, Chiquita Brown, Darryl Brown, James R Brown, Laverne Brown, Nina Brown, Ralph Brown, Ricky Brown, Robin R Brown, Scott Donald Brown, Julie Browne, Greg Bruce, Maurice Brunel, Shane David Bua, Stephen Bucher, Blake Budai, Peter Bueno, Andrew Buesa, Christine Bulicz, Maryann Bunag, Jason M Burcham, Alma Burke, Todd Burns, Thomas A Burris, David Alan Burrus, Kenneth Buscarino, George Bush, II, Pete M Cabral, Ken Cabrera, Ramiro Cabrera, Pedro Topete Cabunoc, JR, Ronald Cade, Daniel J Calderon, John Manuel Calzada, Gustavo Camacho, Ralph Camarillo, Ellen Helene Cameron, Brian Jeffrey Campagna, Christopher Campagna, Jeffrey Campagna, Daniel Campbell, Mark Campbell, Dino Campodonico, Eric Campos, John E Campos, Juan C Campos, Canales Canales, Robert A Canizales, Oscar Cansino, John Caraveo, David Carbajal, Hector Steven Carbajal, Ian Carbonell, Andres Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas, Gil James Cardinez, John Dennis Carey, Jose Carias, Warner Carias, Sandra J Carlisle, Richard Mark Carney, Todd Carpenter, Cameron Carrillo, Francisco Carrillo, Saul Carrillo, James Deric Carroll, Matthew Casalicchio, Robert Casimiro, Mike Cassetta, Sophia Renee Castaneda, Osvaldo J Castillo, Warner A Castillo, Virgil Castor, Angelo Castro, Arthur Anthony Castro, Edward P Castro, George M Castro, Steve Castro, Claudia Carmen Castruita, Yolanda Caterino-Clair, Lorna Cavin, Omar Cedre, Juan Alfredo Ceja, Robert Carlos Celaya, Federico Celis, Angel Cervantes, Jorge A Cervantes, Jr, Jaime Chacon, Hector Chaidez, Gerry R Chamberlain, Howard Chan, Todd Chaney, Jing Chao, Michael Chapman, Kevin Chapple, Andrew Chase, Christy Madera Chavarria, Chris Chavez, Enrique Chavez, George Chavez, Joseph Eric Chavez, Juan Carlos Chavez, M Rene Chavez, Rudy Chavez, Tom Leo Chavez, Robert F Chavira, Jeff Chiantaretto, Daniel Chilson, John Chilstrom, Adrian Chin, Jin Cho, Samuel Y Cho, James Choi, James Chong, Gina Chovan, Howard Choy, John Chrispens, Christian J Christensen, Ya-May Christle, David H Chung, Steve Soon Chung, Joseph Ciancanelli, Frank Ciezadlo, Kimberly Cisco, Alfonso Cisneros, Charles Claeys, Arno Clair, Brett M Clark, Christopher Clark, Kelly Clark, Rosalyn E Clark, Karolin Clarke, Philip Steven Clarke, Mark Cleary, Thomas E Cleary, Paul Clements, Cecilia Cleveland, Dennis Clifford, James Clifford, Matthew Clymer, Elva Coats, Robert W Coats, John Coffey, Steven Cohen, Anthony Cole, Henry Colebrooke, Keely C Coleman, Jeffrey D Collado, Marcella Collins, John Collyer, Timothy Colomey, Richard Compton, Dimitrius Connor, Efrain Contreras, Ismael Contreras, Jose Contreras, Juan Manuel Contreras, Miguel A Contreras, John Cook, Laura Cook, David Corbet, Pedro Cordero, Randall Cordobes, David Ruben Cordova, John Cordova, Vic Corella, Diosdado Coronel, Efren J Corrac, Silvia Corral, Victor Corral, Vincent J Correa, Christopher Cortijo, Brian Michael Corwin, Robert Cosner, Bruce Leland Coss, Chad Costello, Todd Costello, Kevin Cotter, Marty Cotwright, Cominic Counts, Henry Covarrubias, Jose Covarrubias, Bobbie Covington, Larry Covington, Casey W Cox, Theresa Coyle, Shawn David Crabbe, Timothy Crabtree, David James Craig, James D Crawford, Karen Crawford, Hurley Glenn Criner, II, Mark R Cronin, Marlo V Cross, Edgar Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Joseph Henry Cruz, Juan Cruz, Mario Cruz, Raquel Cruz, Mario Cubillos, John Manuel Cuenca, David Cueto, Mary Culpepper, Matthew Cundiff, Napoleon Curry, Laura Curtin, Travis James Curtin, Jason Curtis, Gary Cusick, Timothy Dacus, Merri Dallas, Darryl Danaher, Duc Dao, Jack Davenport, Jr, Gerardo J Davila, Gerardo Davila, Crystal Nova Davis, Curtis L Davis, Daniel Davis, Dewayne Davis, John Walter Davis, Lenning Davis, III, Omar L Davis, Omar Lamont Davis, Richard Davis, Ricky Davis, Samuel Davis, Thomas Davoren, Jamal Esam Dawoudi, Thomas Dawson, Salvatore De Bella, Jorge De Jesus, III, Fred De La Cerda, Rudy De La Fuente, Gregorio R De La Rosa, Antonio De La Torre, Jeri De La Torre, Ruben De La Torre, Jorge De Los Reyes, Ronald De Wyke, A J DeBellis, Robert NMI Deamer, Victoria Collete Debellis, Vincent Deglinnocenti, Albert Del Valle, Daniel R Del Valle, Luis Delacruz, Patrick Delaney, Osvaldo Ozzie Delgadillo, Alfredo Delgado, Jose Delgado, Manuel Delgado, Alex Delieuze, Emily Delph, Sean Dempsey, Ray Denton, Brett Deoliveira, Spree Desha, Blaca E Desormaux, Wayne Albert Devey, Tony Di Paolo, Carlos Diaz, Eddie Diaz, Francisco Diaz, SR, Michael Joseph Diaz, Jose Diaz-Ibarra, Reggie Dickerson, Charles Dickinson, James Joseph Dickson, Corey Dillard, David Dimeglio, Mark Dimitt, Berzon Angcao Distor, Divinity, Andre Dixon, Travonne Dixon, Nguyen T Do, Angel Domenech, Francisco Eduardo Dominguez, Frank Dominguez, III, Joseph Dominguez, Clint S Dona, Christy Donorovich-O'Donnell, Cheri Marie Doolittle, Raymond L Dorsey, JR, Steven Dorsey, John Downey, Robin L Downey, Cynthia J Dragun, Leonard Drayton, Sergio Dario Driotez, William Driver, Daniel M Drulias, Joseph Dudas, Oscar Duenas, Robert Jon Duke, Shawn Duke, Celeste Dula, Jeremy Duncan, Kevin Dunigan, Michael W Dunn, Jason Duplantis, Arthur Duran, Dennis J Duran, Lisa M Duran, Lisa Marie Duran, Catherine Durant, Melvin Durant, Peter Durham, Gary Eagleson, Yolanda Echols, James Edwards, Kelly Edwards, Steven Eguchi, Victor M Eguez, James Eldridge, LaNita Elias, Alicia Elliott, Donni Lynn Ellison, Ralph Edward Emard, Nelson Enamorado, Scott Engedal, John Stephen Enos, Tanya Eppenger-Campbell, Telly Epperson, Corinne Ernst, James A Erwin, III, Jeremy Allen Escamilla, Carlos Escobar, Gilbert Escontrias, David M Escoto, Ernest Eskridge, Michelle Rachel Eskridge, Hector Esparza, Gisselle Espinoza, Martin M Espinoza, Mayda Espinoza, Paul Espinoza, Robert Espinoza, Manuel Esqueda, Donald Estrada, Jesse J Estrada, Jr, Michael Estrada, Tony Euyoque, Teresa L Evans, Nathan Paul Ewert, Victor E Fain, Scott Fairchild, Guy Faltinowski, Hugo Fanfassian, Marie Farrell, David M Fatool, Ferdinand Faustino, JR, Paul Fedynich, Robert Felix, Mary J Fencl, Ricardo Feria, Benedict J Fernandes, Robert Fernandez, Adrian Ferns, Gary Ferrato, Jose A Ferreira, James Craig Ferrell, Raphael Ferrer, Gabriel Ferreras, Marc Michael Ferris, Kennith Joseph Ferro, Deborah Fetters, Vaotupua Sefo Feula, Marlon Fields, Tracye Fields, Carlos M Figueira, Trasia R Figueira, Carlos Alberto Figueroa, Mario E Figueroa, Jr, Neal Fine, Jeremy Fink, Jeffrey Scott Fischer, Garrett Fitzgerald, Tony Fitzsimmons, Michael Patrick Flannery, William NMI Flannery, Matthew Fleming, Paul Floge, Alfredo Flores, Arldwin Flores, Jeanette Flores, Jesus David Flores, Joe Flores, John C Flores, Salvador Flores, Valendin
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3010 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford Granting Transfer of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs to the Hon. George King #3009 . (nbo)
December 16, 2015 Filing 3009 Joint STIPULATION for Order for transfer of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs to the Hon. George King filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting transfer of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs to the Hon. George King)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
December 7, 2015 Filing 3008 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Farris Ain, #3 Declaration Declaration of Fenja Klaus, #4 Declaration Declaration of Larry Sackey, #5 Declaration Declaration of of Michael Dawson, #6 Declaration Declaration of Miguel Cabellero, #7 Declaration Declaration of Rachael Wager LaCross, #8 Declaration Declaration of Robert Ackley, #9 Declaration Declaration of Greg Hafif, #10 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to Hafif Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H, I & K to Hafif Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit E, Pt. 1, #13 Exhibit Exhibit E, Pt. 2, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Hafif, Greg)
November 20, 2015 Filing 3007 JUDGMENT RE: Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Court has reviewed Judge George H. King's Judgment and Order Re: Approval of Settlement Agreement Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice, attached as Exhibit "A" to the City's Notice of Lodging. Judge King's Judgment and Order approved the settlement agreement between the City of Los Angeles and twenty individual plaintiffs, including Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz ("Settlement Agreement"), attached as Exhibit "B" to the Notice of Lodging; and In accordance with Judge King's Order, Judgment is hereby entered in this action and the action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. (lwag)
November 20, 2015 Filing 3006 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re: [Proposed] Judgment re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice re Order, #3005 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3005 **NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Extend Stay #3004 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders as follows: The matter is stayed until December 15, 2015. Status Conference re settlement is set for December 14, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (lwag)
October 15, 2015 Filing 3004 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walter, Brian)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3003 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND STAY #3002 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of the parties, and for good cause shown, theCourt hereby orders as follows: 1. The matter is stayed until September 30, 2015. (mu)
August 3, 2015 Filing 3002 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Jiont Stipulation to Extend Stay)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 10, 2015 Filing 3001 Formerly Approved Class Counsel for Plaintiffs, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif, Rquest for Notice Regarding Deadline for Filing Motion for Attorneu (Hafif, Greg)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2999 ORDER Re Stipulation for 90-day Stay Pending Finalization of Settlement #2998 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders as follows: The matter is stayed to August 28, 2015 and Counsel shall file an application and proposed order to extend the stay is necessary. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag)
May 21, 2015 Filing 2998 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Finalization of Settlement filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation for 90-day Stay Pending Finalization of Settlement)(Yoo, Danny)
May 19, 2015 Filing 3000 MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. King: Counsel are present and the appropriate representatives. Court conducts confidential settlement conference with counsel and the parties. The above stated cases have reached a global settlement. The terms of the settlement are placed on the record. Any pending motions shall be TAKEN OFF CALENDAR by the moving party. It remains the responsibility and duty of counsel to move the District Judge for each individual case by way of stipulation to be presented to them to vacate and stay any pending deadline dates for ninety (90) days. Fees and costs motions shall be heard by Chief Judge King. Counsel shall file the appropriate stipulation and order to dismiss the following cases: CV 14-5655-PA; CV 14-5678-JAK; CV 14-5654 JAK; CV14-5641-R; CV 14-5685-DMG; CV 14-5636-RGK; CV 14-5632-PSG; CV 14-5671-R; CV14-5690-R; CV 14-5644-R; CV 14-5696-RGK; CV 14-5638-R. Court Reporter: Khowoonsun (Koni) Chong. (bm)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2997 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of.. (Yoo, Danny)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2996 PROPOSED Special (for Plaintiff Manfred G. Merkens Jr.) JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2995 PROPOSED Special (for Plaintiff Charless D. Halliburton) JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2994 PROPOSED Special (for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz) JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2993 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Unannotated set) filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danny Y. Yoo)(Yoo, Danny)
May 11, 2015 Filing 2992 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of.. (Yoo, Danny)
May 11, 2015 Filing 2991 Witness List filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of.. (Yoo, Danny)
May 11, 2015 Filing 2990 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
March 31, 2015 Filing 2989 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 6, 2015 Filing 2988 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danny Young-In Yoo counsel for Defendant Los Angeles City of. Daniel Aguilera is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Danny Y. Yoo. (Yoo, Danny)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2987 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order Continuing Trial. ( Jury Trial set for 6/9/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford., Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) See minute order for more information. (twdb)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2986 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (# 14-080) approved by Chief Judge George H. King. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the RETIREMENT of Judge Gary A. Feess and with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, this case is transferred from Judge Gary A. Feess to the calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 04-08592 AG(AJWx). (rn)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2985 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #2971 filed by Charles D Halliburton, Manfres G Merkens, CCA # 14-55999. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. App. P. 42(b). Order received in this district on 8/25/2014. (dmap)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2984 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #2971 filed by Charles D Halliburton, Manfres G Merkens, CCA # 14-55993. Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 8/25/14. (mat)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2983 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: MOTION TO CLARIFY by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' motion to clarify the Court's May 21, 2014, order decertifying the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") collective action. (Docket No. 2973 [Motion to Clarify("Mem.")].) Specifically, Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz ("Alaniz"), Manfred Merkens ("Merkens"), and Charles Halliburton ("Halliburton") request that this Court clarify that, although the May 21, 2014, order decertified the FLSA collective action and dismissed the opt-in Plaintiffs, this dismissal did not include Merkens and Halliburton because they were individually named, along with Alanz, on the first amended complaint ("FAC"). (iD. AT 3.) The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to clarify. Merkens, Halliburton, and Alaniz still have active claims in this action. Additionally, the law Offices of Herbert Hafif, its attorneys, Greg K. Hafif, Herbert Hafif, Fenja Klaus, Kenneth L. Mariboho II, and any other attorney associated therewith, are terminated as attorneys of record in this matter for Merkens. The attorneys for Merkens are now Gregory G. Petersen and Richard L. Hutchinson of Gregory G. Petersen, ALC, and Kirby D. Farris, Jerry Adam Clayton, and Brett Turnbull of Farris, Riley & Pitt. The hearing presently scheduled for July 28, 2014, is VACATED. #2973 (bp)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2982 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: Discovery cut-off 12/19/2014. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/9/2015. Last day for hearing motions is 1/5/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2015 at 3:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/10/2015 at 8:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. See document for details. (smo)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2981 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: Order re: Trial Schedule. The Court has received and reviewed the parties' joint statement regarding the status of this lawsuit. Based on that submission, the case is set for trial according to the attached schedule. The parties will also receive a scheduling and case management order from the Court that describes the obligations of counsel in the conduct of pre-trial proceedings and the preparation of the case for trial. The parties should note that the Court is not consolidating thiscase with the Mata matter. (smo)
July 7, 2014 Filing 2980 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Order for PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CLARIFY COURTS MAY 21, 2014 ORDER DECERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION #2973 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify Court's May 21, 2014 Order Decertifying collective Action #2979 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
July 7, 2014 Filing 2979 Opposition in opposition re: MOTION for Order for PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CLARIFY COURTS MAY 21, 2014 ORDER DECERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION #2973 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
June 23, 2014 Filing 2978 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below. Re: NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents #2977 . Filed Date: 6/23/14. Other: Though this document was issued correctly for using the incorrect event, it should have been noted that the document is accepted as filed, that counsel should take notice of the CM/ECF procedures, and that any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures (bm)
June 23, 2014 Filing 2977 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Scheduling Report #2974 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Pretrial and Trial Documents-Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 23, 2014 Filing 2976 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-55999, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #2971 (dmap)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2975 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-55993, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #2969 as to Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf of the general public). (mat)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2974 JOINT REPORT of Re Scheduling filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Yoo, Danny)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2973 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CLARIFY COURTS MAY 21, 2014 ORDER DECERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public), Charles D Halliburton, Manfres G Merkens. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2972 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2971 . (Petersen, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2971 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Charles D Halliburton(an individual for himself, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Manfres G Merkens. Appeal of Order on Motion to Certify,, #2961 , Order #2967 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-13998918 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. 2961, #2 Exhibit Doc. 2967)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2970 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2969 . (Petersen, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2969 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). Appeal of Order on Motion to Certify,, #2961 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-13998711 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. 2961 Order re Motion to Decertify)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 2968 NOTICE of Change of address by Gregory G Petersen attorney for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Changing attorneys address to 4425 Jamboree Road, Suite 175, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2967 DENIED - ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Notice BY PLAINTIFF MANFRED GUIDO MERKENS NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF COUNSEL GREG K. HAFIF, ET AL. #2965 , DENIED BY ORDER OF COURT - MOOT: all plaintiffs have been dismissed except for Robert Alaniz. (lw)
June 12, 2014 Filing 2966 NOTICE Termination of Counsel Greg K. Hafif, et al filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 11, 2014 Filing 2965 NOTICE Termination of Counsel Greg K. Hafif, et al filed by Plaintiff Manfres G Merkens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2964 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DUE DATES FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT THE RESULTING JOINT REPORT by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Continue, #2963 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties 1. Continue the last date by which the Parties meet and confer to June 27,2014. 2. Continue the last date by which the Parties file with the Court a joint statement regarding scheduling to July 3, 2014. (lw)
June 6, 2014 Filing 2963 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Parties to meet and confer and submit a joint statement from June 9, 2014 and June 13, 2014 to June 27, 2014 and July 3, 2014 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Due Dates for the Parties to Meet and Confer and Submit the Resulting Joint Report)(Attorney Danny Young-In Yoo added to party Los Angeles City of(pty:dft), Attorney Danny Young-In Yoo added to party Los Angeles City of(pty:dft))(Yoo, Danny)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2962 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess: Order re: Trial Schedule. The counsel for the individually named plaintiffs in the Alaniz and Mata cases and counsel for defendant City of Los Angeles are to meet and confer and prepare a proposed schedule in each case leading to trial of the individual plaintiffs remaining off-the-clock claims. The meet and confer should take place no later than Monday, June 9, 2014, and a joint statement regarding scheduling should be filed with the Court no later than Friday, June 13, 2014. Thereafter, the Court will set the matter for a status conference. (smo)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2961 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTIONS by Judge Gary A. Feess granting #2927 Motion: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the City's motions to decertify the collective actions, and decertifies the actions. The opt-in class members are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court tolls the statute of limitations for 60 days from the date of this order. During this time, Plaintiffs will have an opportunity to pursue their individual claims. (see document for further details) (bm)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2960 ORDER DISMISSING SANDRA MAGDALENO AS AN OPT-IN PLAINTIFF WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Gary A. Feess, It is hereby ORDERED: Sandra Magdaleno is dismissed without prejudice from the herein action, re First REQUEST to Withdraw Consent to Join #2959 , Sandra Magdaleno terminated. (bp)
April 10, 2014 Filing 2959 First REQUEST to Withdraw Consent to Join filed by Opt-In Plaintiff Sandra Magdaleno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 31, 2014 Filing 2958 MINUTES OF Motion to Certify held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court circulates tentative ruling and hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the motion to decertify the collective action #2927 under submission. Initials of Preparer SMO. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (smo)
March 27, 2014 Filing 2957 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alanizto Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #2952 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #2953 Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections (Clayton, J)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2954 Mail Returned addressed to Pamela Ann Wilson re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2950 (cb)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2953 OBJECTIONS In Support of re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 Defendant's Objections to Evidence Offered In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Decertification filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Walter, Brian)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2952 OBJECTIONS In Support of re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 Defendant's Objections to Appendix of Evidence Offered In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Decertification (pages 1-1169)) filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Objections (pages 1170-2338))(Walter, Brian)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2951 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Walter, Brian)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2955 Mail Returned addressed to Bicvan T. Brown re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2950 (cb)
March 13, 2014 Filing 2956 Mail Returned addressed to Tuyet-Van T Tran re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2950 (cb)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2950 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: granting #2947 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas Brett Turnbull on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Gregory G. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
March 3, 2014 Filing 2949 DECLARATION of Gregory Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #4 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #5 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #6 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #7 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #8 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #9 Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #10 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 10 to Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #11 Exhibit Exhibits 11 to 20 to Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #12 Exhibit Exhibits 21 to 30 to Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #13 Exhibit Exhibits 31 to 40 to Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action, #14 Exhibit Exhibits 41 to 50 to Appendix of Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action)(Hafif, Greg)
March 3, 2014 Filing 2948 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-30, #5 Exhibit 31-40, #6 Exhibit 41-50, #7 Exhibit 51-60, #8 Exhibit 61-70, #9 Exhibit 71-80, #10 Exhibit 81-90, #11 Exhibit 91-100, #12 Exhibit 101-110, #13 Exhibit 111-120, #14 Exhibit 121-130, #15 Exhibit 131-140, #16 Exhibit 141-150, #17 Exhibit 151-160, #18 Exhibit 161-170, #19 Exhibit 171-180, #20 Exhibit 181-190, #21 Exhibit 191-200, #22 Exhibit 201-210, #23 Exhibit 211-220, #24 Exhibit 221-230, #25 Exhibit 231-232, #26 Affidavit, #27 Exhibit 233, #28 Exhibit 234, #29 Exhibit 235)(Farris, Kirby)
March 3, 2014 Filing 2947 First APPLICATION for attorney Douglas Brett Turnbull to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13453600 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2946 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION by Judge Gary A. Feess: Having considered Defendant's application for an Order sealing documents filed in support of Defendant's MOtion to Decertify Collective Action the Court Orders the following documents from Defendant's Appendix of Evidence in Support of Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action (Dkt. #2927-2) sealed. EXHIBITS SUBJECT TO SEAL FROM APPENDIX:Ex. 132. Relevant Greenies for Kit Stajcar, Dkt. #2927-14, pages 2173 through 2220. Ex 133. Relevant Greenies for Edward Castro, Dkt. #2927-14, Pages 2221 through 2232. Ex. 134. Relevant Greenies for Benedict Fernandez, Skt. #2927-14, Pages 2233 through 2255. IT IS SO ORDERED. granting #2943 Application for Order (lw)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2945 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Ex Parte Applications by Judge Gary A. Feess granting #2934 Ex Parte Application to Continue: Court does not believe that Plaintiffs require a continuance of over one month, as they request. The hearings previously scheduled for March 10, 2014, are hereby CONTINUED until 9:30 a.m. on March 31, 2014. Plaintiffs' oppositions shall be due on March 3, 2014. Defendant's replies shall be submitted no later than March 17, 2014. In light of the limited nature of the continuance, Defendant's request that the discovery and motion cut-off dates be extended is DENIED. Defendant may renew this request, if necessary, following the Court's ruling on the pending decertification motions. See document for details. (smo)
February 7, 2014 Filing 2944 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. correcting MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of the Notice of Errata)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 7, 2014 Filing 2943 APPLICATION for Order for Sealing Documents filed in support of Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Application for Order Sealing Documents filed in support of Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 6, 2014 Filing 2942 DECLARATION of Jerry Adam Clayton In Support Of First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 6, 2014 Filing 2941 DECLARATION of Kirby Farris In Support Of First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 6, 2014 Filing 2940 REPLY In Support of First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2939 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: granting #2930 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kirby D. Farris on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Gregory G. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2938 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: granting #2929 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jerry Adam Clayton on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Gregory G. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
February 6, 2014 Filing 2937 JOINDER in First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
February 5, 2014 Filing 2936 Opposition in opposition to re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon, #2 Declaration of Brian P. Walter)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 4, 2014 Filing 2935 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 #2934 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
February 4, 2014 Filing 2934 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing from March 10, 2014 to April 28, 2014 Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 filed by Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard L. Hutchinson, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
February 4, 2014 Filing 2933 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re First APPLICATION for attorney Kirby D. Farris to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322897 paid.) #2930 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
February 4, 2014 Filing 2932 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First APPLICATION for attorney Jerry Adam Clayton to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322852 paid.) #2929 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
February 4, 2014 Filing 2931 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION for attorney Kirby D. Farris to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322897 paid.) #2930 , First APPLICATION for attorney Jerry Adam Clayton to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322852 paid.) #2929 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
February 3, 2014 Filing 2930 First APPLICATION for attorney Kirby D. Farris to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322897 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Petersen, Gregory)
February 3, 2014 Filing 2929 First APPLICATION for attorney Jerry Adam Clayton to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13322852 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Petersen, Gregory)
January 30, 2014 Filing 2928 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #2927 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Walter, Brian)
January 30, 2014 Filing 2927 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Collective Action, #2 Appendix of Evidence in support of Defendant's Motion to Decertify Collective Action and Exhibits 1 through 19, #3 Exhibit 20 through 30, #4 Exhibit 31 through 42, #5 Exhibit 43 through 55, #6 Exhibit 56 through 64, #7 Exhibit 65 through 74, #8 Exhibit 75 through 78, #9 Exhibit 79 through 90, #10 Exhibit 91 through 101, #11 Exhibit 102 through 108, #12 Exhibit 109 through 112, #13 Exhibit 113 through 131, #14 Exhibit 132 through 134)(Walter, Brian)
January 27, 2014 Filing 2926 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2925 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR RICKY JOHNSON by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2920 : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Ricky Johnson, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2924 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR ROY BALLESTEROS by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2919 :IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Roy Ballesteros, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2923 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR JUAN SANTOS by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2918 : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Juan Santos, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2922 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR JAMES J. MAY by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2917 :IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, James J. May, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2921 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LEONARD MILLER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2916 :IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Leonard Miller, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
December 28, 2013 Filing 2920 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ricky Johnson filed by Plaintiff Ricky Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Ricky Johnson)(Hafif, Greg)
December 28, 2013 Filing 2919 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Roy Ballesteros filed by Plaintiff Roy Ballesteros. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Roy Ballesteros)(Hafif, Greg)
December 28, 2013 Filing 2918 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Juan Santos filed by Plaintiff Juan Santos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Juan Santos)(Hafif, Greg)
December 28, 2013 Filing 2917 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff James J May filed by Plaintiff James J May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for James J. May)(Hafif, Greg)
December 28, 2013 Filing 2916 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Leonard NMI Miller filed by Plaintiff Leonard NMI Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Leonard Miller)(Hafif, Greg)
November 6, 2013 Filing 2915 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED JANUARY 23, 2013 BY LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT HAFIF ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2914 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: In a status conference held today in CV03-2190 GAF (AJWx): James Nolan, et al. v. City of Los Angeles, et al., the Court lifted the stays in these two actions (CV04-8592-GAF (AJWx): Alaniz v. City of Los Angeles, et al. and CV07-6782-GAF (AJWx): Mata v. City of Los Angeles, et al.). Specifically, the Court orders that discovery is reopened and the discovery cut-off deadline is extended to April 25, 2014. The motion stays are also lifted. The last day to hear a motion is now May 5, 2014. (smo)
October 19, 2013 Filing 2913 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel Gregory G. Petersen filed by Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
September 13, 2013 Filing 2912 STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFFS AND RETAINED CLASS COUNSEL GREGORY G. PETERSEN STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED AUGUST 27, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
September 13, 2013 Filing 2911 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED AUGUST 27, 2013 BY LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT HAFIF ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ONLY filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2910 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: ORDER RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. The Court has been advised that the parties most recently concluded a mediation session with Judge Dickran Tevrizian regarding resolution of the Mata and Alaniz lawsuits. If progress is being made, it is not apparent to the Court. As the parties were advised several months ago, the Court intends to set a schedule in these cases if they are not soon resolved. Accordingly, the parties are to submit a joint report regarding the status of settlement negotiations. If the Court is not satisfied that substantial progress has been made and that the prospect of settlement appears likely within the next 60 to 90 days, the Court will proceed with scheduling conferences in both cases with the expectation that these cases will be resolved within the next six months. The parties' joint statement is to be submitted by the close of business on Friday, September 13, 2013. (bp)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2909 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR KELLY CHRISMAN by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2908 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Kelly Chrisman, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice., Kelly Chrisman terminated. (bp)
August 15, 2013 Filing 2908 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Kelly Chrisman filed by Plaintiff Kelly Chrisman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Kelly Chrisman)(Hafif, Greg)
July 15, 2013 Filing 2907 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2906 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR PETER WAACK by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2902 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Peter Waack, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. re: Peter Waack terminated. (lw)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2905 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR BELINDA ROBINSON by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2903 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Belinda Robinson, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. re: Belinda Robinson terminated. (lw)
June 19, 2013 Filing 2904 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs' Counsel Gregory Petersen, A Law Corporation and Defendant Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
June 19, 2013 Filing 2903 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Belinda Robinson filed by Plaintiff Belinda Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Belinda Robinson)(Hafif, Greg)
June 19, 2013 Filing 2902 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Peter Waack filed by Plaintiff Peter Waack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal For Peter Waack)(Hafif, Greg)
June 19, 2013 Filing 2901 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Plaintiffs Counsel Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Defendant Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
May 17, 2013 Filing 2900 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
April 19, 2013 Filing 2899 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Hafif, Greg)
April 1, 2013 Filing 2898 SUPPLEMENT to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #2892 , Notice of Lodging #2890 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Brief/Objection #2893 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
March 22, 2013 Filing 2897 JOINT STATUS REPORT of PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED JANUARY 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
March 11, 2013 Filing 2895 Notice of Electronic Filing re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #2894 e-mailed to fklaus@hafif.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 <: Recipient address rejected: User unknown in relay recipient table'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2013 Filing 2894 Opposition re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #2892 , Notice of Lodging #2890 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Brief/Objection #2893 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 8, 2013 Filing 2893 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #2892 , Notice of Lodging #2890 , EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Brief/Objection filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public).(Petersen, Gregory)
March 6, 2013 Filing 2892 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. Re: Court's Approval Of Selection Of Class Counsel In A FLSA Collective Action regarding Order, #2886 . (Hafif, Greg)
March 1, 2013 Filing 2891 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court and counsel present. Court and counsel confer and discuss the representation of the plaintiffs in these matters and the progress of any resolution. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet with Judge Dickran Tevrizian. The parties advise that they are scheduled for March 11, 2012, with Judgment Tevrizian. The parties are ORDERED to comply with this Court's prior orders regarding these matters.Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (bp)
February 28, 2013 Filing 2890 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Notice To All Plaintiffs re Order, #2886 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Notice To All Plaintiffs)(Hafif, Greg)
February 28, 2013 Filing 2889 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The court will hear the Status Conference set for Friday, 3/1/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2013 Filing 2888 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz, re Objections - non-motion #2887 , Status Report #2884 PROOF OF SERVICE served on 02/28/2013. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 28, 2013 Filing 2887 OBJECTIONS to Status Report #2883 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2886 ORDER RE CASE STATUS by Judge Gary A. Feess. This Court previously ordered the parties to meet, confer and address a number of issues regarding the resolution of the above-captioned cases. The obligations imposed by this Court have not been met. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL (rfi)
February 26, 2013 Filing 2885 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The court set a Status Conference in this matter for Friday, March 1, 2013 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. All counsel are ORDERED to appear.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2013 Filing 2884 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 22, 2013 Filing 2883 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Pursuant to Minute Order Dated January 23, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Joseph M Payton. (Hafif, Greg)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2882 ORDER RE NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS by Judge Gary A. Feess. (bp)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2881 ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER by Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court has determined that a Special Master must be appointed in these cases for the ultimate purpose of, first, resolving counsel's dispute and then mediating the lawsuits. By this order and pursuant to Rule 53, Fed.R.Civ.P., the Court appoints Hon. Dickran Tevrizian (Ret.) as the Court's Special Master. In that role, Judge Tevrizian is to undertake the following tasks: Investigate and evaluate the facts and circumstances giving rise to the dispute among plaintiffs' counsel, and mediate the dispute. If the dispute cannot be resolved, Judge Tevrizian will suggest the appropriate mechanism through which the district court can address and resolve the dispute, and develop an expedited schedule on which the matter can be resolved.(See document for further details) (bp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 2880 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court appoints Judge Dickran Tevrizian (Ret.) as Special Master under Rule 53. The Court will issue a separate order as to the appointment of the Special Master. The parties are to file a joint reports regarding the status of these cases every 28 days. The first report will be due by the closing of business on February 22, 2013, and every 38 days thereafter. As discussed in court and on the record, as the Berndt action, the Court ORDERS defendants to file the appropriate motions that are ripe for resolution. Defendants are to file their motions no later than February 25, 2013; Opposition briefs are to be filed on or before March 11, 2013 and any reply briefs are to be filed no later than March 25, 2013. The hearing on the motions will be April 1, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bp)
January 16, 2013 Filing 2879 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court sets a Status Conference set for 1/23/2013 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2878 ORDER DISMISSING CORBIN JOSEPH RHEAULT AS OPT-IN PLAINTIFF WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. IT IS ORDERED Corbin Joseph Rheault is dismissed without prejudice from the herein action. (bp)
November 3, 2012 Filing 2877 First REQUEST to Withdraw Consent to Join filed by Plaintiff Corbin Joseph Rheault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2876 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Gary A. Feess: The motion to withdraw is GRANTED #2870 (bp)
October 10, 2012 Filing 2875 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. ORDER VACATING HEARING. The Court has pending, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL BY HUNT ORTMANN (filed 9/10/12) #2870 The Court concludes that the matter is appropriate for resolution without the argument of counsel. Accordingly, the hearing previously scheduled for Monday, October 15, 2012 at 9:30 a.m., is hereby VACATED. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 1, 2012 Filing 2874 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION of John Darling, Omel Nieves, Katherine Odenbreit and Alison Gibbs to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs #2870 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
September 24, 2012 Filing 2873 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION of John Darling, Omel Nieves, Katherine Odenbreit and Alison Gibbs to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs #2870 by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif filed by Plaintiff Gary Nanson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by Hunt Ortmann)(Hafif, Greg)
September 24, 2012 Filing 2872 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition MOTION of John Darling, Omel Nieves, Katherine Odenbreit and Alison Gibbs to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs #2870 to Hunt Ortmann's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Walter, Brian)
September 11, 2012 Filing 2871 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess re: MOTION of John Darling, Omel Nieves, Katherine Odenbreit and Alison Gibbs to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs #2870 previously scheduled for 10/8/2012, a court holiday, has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2012 Filing 2870 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of John Darling, Omel Nieves, Katherine Odenbreit and Alison Gibbs to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by Attorneys for Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Darling in Support of Hunt Ortmann's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of John D. Darling, #3 Declaration of Debi A. Ramos in Support of Hunt Ortmann's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, #4 Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit in Support of Hunt Ortmann's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, #5 Proposed Order)(Nieves, Omel)
March 29, 2012 Filing 2869 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #2867 , Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #2866 , Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #2868 of Termination filed by Plaintiff Michael Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif in Support of LOHH's Objection to Plaintiffs' Notices of Termination)(Hafif, Greg)
March 27, 2012 Filing 2868 NOTICE Merkens' Notice of Termination of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Merkens' [Proposed] Order Acknowledging Termination of Herbert Hafif)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 27, 2012 Filing 2867 NOTICE Halliburton's Notice of Termination of Herbert Hafif filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Halliburton's [Proposed] Order Acknowledging Termination of Herbert Hafif)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 27, 2012 Filing 2866 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Alaniz' [Proposed] Order Acknowledging Termination of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 1, 2012 Filing 2865 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information Adding Omel Nieves filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 1, 2012 Filing 2864 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). Change of Attorney Information Re Katherine J. Odenbreit (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 1, 2012 Filing 2863 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). Of Change of Attorney Information Re Gregory G. Petersen (Odenbreit, Katherine)
February 17, 2012 Filing 2862 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Changing Firm Name to Hunt, Ortmann, Palffy, Nieves, Lubka, Darling & Mah, Inc.. Changing Email to petersen@huntortmann.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz, et al. (Petersen, Gregory)
February 17, 2012 Filing 2861 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory G Petersen on behalf of Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Petersen, Gregory)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2860 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court has been advised by counsel that the dispute over the representation of the plaintiffs has not been resolved. The Court ORDERS that the Settlement Conference set for October 5, 2011 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich is taken off calendar. (rfi)
October 4, 2011 Filing 2859 REQUEST to Vacate Settlement Conference filed by defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walter, Brian)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2858 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich:( Confidential Settlement Statement due by 9/28/2011, Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2011 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich.) (yb)
August 19, 2011 Filing 2857 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read CV 04-08592 GAF(AJWx). (rn)
April 29, 2011 Filing 2856 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Miguel G Caballero counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz.Miguel G. Caballero is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz, et al. (Caballero, Miguel)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2855 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LAURA CURTIN by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Laura Curtin, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice (bp)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2854 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR ROBERT SNEDDEN by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Robert Snedden, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
January 10, 2011 Filing 2853 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Robert Snedden filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Robert Snedden)(Caballero, Miguel)
January 10, 2011 Filing 2852 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Laura Curtin filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Laura Curtin)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2851 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF HOWARD MATTHEWS by Judge Gary A. Feess, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Howard D. Matthews, is hereby shall remain a Plaintiff in this matter. (bp)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2850 ORDER DISMISSAL FOR JENNIFER VASS by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that plaintiff Jennifer Vass, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 29, 2010 Filing 2849 Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2848 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Withdrawl of Filing of Stipulation of Dismissal for Plaintiff Howard Mathews)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 23, 2010 Filing 2848 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Howard D Mathews filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Howard Mathews)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 23, 2010 Filing 2847 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jennifer Vass filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Jennifer Vass)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2846 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR CARLOS BARRIOS by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Carlos Barrios, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2845 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR MICHAEL BRIANO by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Michael Briano, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2844 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR CALIXTO VALDIVIA by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Calixto Valdivia, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2843 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR STEPHEN WINTER by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Stephen Winter, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2842 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR AMGAD YOUSSEF by Judge Gary A. Feess,, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Amgad Youssef, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bp)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2841 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Briano filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Michael Briano)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2840 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Carlos Barrios filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Carlos Barrios)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2839 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amgad Youssef filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Amgad Youssef)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2838 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Stephen Winter filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Stephen Winter)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2837 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Calixto Valdivia filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Calixto Valdivia)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2836 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2821 , Brian Michael Corwin terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2835 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2822 , Alex Delieuze terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2834 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2823 , Jason Duplantis terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2833 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2824 , Kevin Malm terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2832 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2825 . Juli Dawn Munson terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2831 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2826 , Richard Roberts terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2830 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2827 . Joel J Ruiz terminated. (rfi)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2829 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #2828 , Michael Stalnecker terminated. (rfi)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2828 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Stalnecker filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Michael Stalnecker)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2827 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Joel J Ruiz filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Joel Ruiz)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2826 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Richard Roberts filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Richard Roberts)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2825 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Juli Dawn Munson filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Juli Munson)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2824 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Kevin Malm filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Kevin Malm)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2823 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jason Duplantis filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Jason Duplantis)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2822 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Alex Delieuze filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Alex Delieuze)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2821 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Brian Michael Corwin filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal for Brian Corwin)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2817 MEMORANDUM & ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Gary A. Feess: the City's motion for reconsideration and motion for partial summary judgment, #2806 (bp)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2816 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER VACATING HEARING by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court is presently considering the City's motion for reconsideration of the Court's order regarding Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims. The Court concludes that the matter is appropriate for disposition without the argument of counsel and hereby VACATES the hearing presently scheduled for Monday, June 28, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. #2806 Motion for Reconsideration (bp)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2815 Objections to Declaration of Oliver Lee Drummond Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims in support of re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 #2806 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 through 4)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2814 DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' DONNING AND DOFFING CLAIMS re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 #2806 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2813 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 #2806 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2812 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' ex parte application. The hearing regarding Defendant's motion for reconsideration remains calendared for hearing on Monday, June 29, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. denying #2809 Ex Parte Application to Continue (bp)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2811 OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Oliver Lee Drummond to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Reconsideratin of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning & Doffing Claims, #2 Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppositin to Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning & Doffing Claims, #3 Exhibit A to G Bate 05 - 055 to Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppositin to Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning & Doffing Claims, #4 Exhibt H to V Bate Stamp 056 - 080 to Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppositin to Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning & Doffing Claims, #5 Exhibit W to Y Bate Stamp 081 - 0158 to Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppositin to Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning & Doffing Claims, #6 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Request For Judicial Notice Filed in Suppose of Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Donning and Doffing Claims)(Klaus, Fenja)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2810 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from June 28, 2010 to November 1, 2010 #2809 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing Date on Motion for Reconsideration)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 2, 2010 Filing 2809 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from June 28, 2010 to November 1, 2010 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Klaus re Ex Parte Applicaiton for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re Donning & Doffing of the Uniform Part 1, #2 Declaration of F. Klaus re Ex Parte Applicaiton for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re Donning & Doffing of the Uniform Part 2, #3 Declaration of F. Klaus re Ex Parte Applicaiton for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re Donning & Doffing of the Uniform Part 3, #4 Declaration of F. Klaus re Ex Parte Applicaiton for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re Donning & Doffing of the Uniform Part, #5 Proposed Order re Ex Parte Applicaiton for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re Donning & Doffing of the Uniform)(Klaus, Fenja)
May 28, 2010 Filing 2808 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Geoffrey S Sheldon counsel for Defendant Los Angeles City of.Jolina A. Abrena is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2010 Filing 2807 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 #2806 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2010 Filing 2806 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,, #2798 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Reconsdieration and Defendant's Motion for Partial Summay Judgment on Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2009 Filing 2805 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Klaus, Fenja)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2804 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Changing firm name to Law Offices of Herbert Hafif. Changing e-mail to fklaus@hafif.com. Adding Fenja Klaus as attorney as counsel of record for plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Klaus, Fenja)
September 16, 2009 Filing 2803 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Fenja Klaus will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Fenja Klaus is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2802 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court having recently received a status report regarding these cases, it isordered as follows: 1. The Court will permit the Nolan case to proceed to trial separately from the later filed cases. The parties are to meet, confer and prepare a schedule leading to a trial date in or about late January 2010. 2. The Court will permit no additional discovery in the Nolan lawsuit. The parties have had ample time to conduct discovery and have in fact actually conducted substantial discovery on the donning and doffing issues. (rfi)
June 22, 2009 Filing 2801 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court and counsel confer as stated in Court and on the record. Plaintiffs counsel has until Monday, July 6, 2009 to file a document indicating what claims are left to be tried in the Nolan matter; what time period they cover; and why the matter should be tried first. Once the Court receives plaintiffs filing, a further Order will be issued. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (rfi)
June 18, 2009 Filing 2800 DECLARATION of Brian Walker in Support of Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Walter, Brian)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2799 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess.The Court having recently entered an order on the donning and doffing issue, the parties are ordered to meet and confer on or before June 12, 2009, for the purpose of preparing a joint status conference statement setting forth their proposal for the litigation of the remaining issues in this case. The joint report must be filed with the Court on or before Wednesday, June 17, 2009. The Court will conduct a status conference in this case on Monday, June 22, 2009, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for all parties are to be in attendance at the status conference. (rfi)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2798 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Gary A. Feess: the parties' cross-motions for partial summary judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' motion to strike and Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's statement of uncontroverted facts are DENIED. Defendant's motion to strike the Senf declaration and the sample survey attached as Exhibit A thereto is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice is DENIED, and Defendant's request for judicial notice are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART re 666 , 672 , 677 . (bp)
March 30, 2009 Filing 2797 MINUTES OF Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #2780 . The matter taken under submission before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (bp, )
March 9, 2009 Filing 2796 DECLARATION of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Compensation for Donning and Doffing filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Petersen, Gregory)
March 2, 2009 Filing 2795 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning and Doffing of uniform and Protective Gear. The MOTIONS are continued to 3/30/2009 at 09:30 AM. The defendant may file by Monday, 3/9/09, Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the State Law Claims. Oppositions are to be filed by 3/16/09; and, any reply is to be filed by 3/23/09. The hearing will be on 3/30/09 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (bp)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2794 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE CITED IN PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2793 DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' COMBINED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DONNING AND DOFFING CLAIMS re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2792 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 Supporting Defendant's Reply filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2791 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Combined Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Law In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary judgment re Compensation for Donning and Doffing MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #2790 Los Angeles City of. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2790 REPLY in opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart Maislin, #2 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 16, 2009 Filing 2789 REPLY Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Adjudication on Compensability of Donning & Doffing and Opposition to Defendant's Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant City of Los Angeles Combined Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law Part 1 of 2, #2 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant City of Los Angeles Combined Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law Part 2 of 2, #3 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudicaiton on Compensability of Donning & Doffing, #4 Exhibit 48 to 52 to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudicaiton on Compensability of Donning & Doffing, #5 Exhibit 53 to 59 to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudicaiton on Compensability of Donning & Doffing, #6 Plaintiffs Objections and Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 56(e), Declarations in Support of Defendant City of Los Angeles Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Donning & Doffin, #7 Notice of Manual Filing, #8 Notice of Filing of Proof of Service)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 10, 2009 Filing 2788 NOTICE OF LODGING OF NON-DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (bp)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2787 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of of NOTICE OF LODGING NON-DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE AND VIDEO RE MICHAEL MENZA DONNING AND DOFFING UNIFORM. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2786 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike DECLARATION OF EUGENE D. SENF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2785 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Compensation for Donning and Doffing filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 through 42)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2784 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 Opposing Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2783 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2782 DEFENDANT'S COMBINED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2009 Filing 2781 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear #2780 and Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Compensation for Donning and Doffing filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Entitlement to Compensation for Donning and Doffing and Related Activities, #2 Declaration of Brian P. Walter, #3 Declaration of Kevin Becker, #4 Declaration of Yvette Bass Otis, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Declaration of Stuart Maislin, #7 Exhibit 2 through 7, #8 Exhibit 8 and 9, #9 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon, #10 Exhibit 10 through 22, #11 Proposed Order re Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Entitlement to Compensation for Donning and Doffing and Related Activities)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 2, 2009 Filing 2780 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Donning & Doffing Of Protective Gear filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Pltfs' Mtn for Summary Judgment Memorandum of P&A's, #2 Pltf's Separate Statment of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclutions of Law, #3 Request for Judicial Ntc in Support of Pltfs' Mtn for MSJ, #4 Pltf's Appendix of Evidence in Supp of MTN for MSJ-Summ Adjudication, #5 Exhibit 1 to Pltfs' Appendix of Evidence, #6 Exhibit 2 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #7 Exhibit 3 through 7 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #8 Exhibit 8 through 12 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #9 Exhibit 13 through 17 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #10 Exhibit 18 through 22 to Pltfs Appendix of Evidence, #11 Exhibit 18 through 22 to Pltfs Appendix of Evidence, #12 Exhibit 28 through 32 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #13 Exhibit 33 through 37 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #14 Exhibit 38 through 42 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #15 Exhibit 43 through 47 to Pltf's Appendix of Evidence, #16 Proposed Order re Pltf's Mtn for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summ Judgmen, #17 Ntc of Filing of POS for Pltfs' Mtn for Summary Judgment)(Caballero, Miguel)
January 12, 2009 Filing 2779 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS ON DONNING & DOFFING ISSUE held before Judge Gary A. Feess: #(bp)
January 12, 2009 Filing 2778 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS ON DONNING & DOFFING ISSUE held before Judge Gary A. Feess: #(bp)
January 12, 2009 Filing 2777 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS ON DONNING & DOFFING ISSUE held before Judge Gary A. Feess: #(bp)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2776 ORDER & MEMORANDUM REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Defendant's motion for partial summary on the issue of the applicability of 207(k) and Defendant's requests for judicial notice are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on the issue of pure gap time compensation, Plaintiffs Rule 56(f) request for additional discovery, and Plaintiffs' motion to strike are DENIED by Judge Gary A. Feess, re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 (bp)
October 17, 2008 Filing 2775 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Account information was not updated in the ECF system. Your account information must be updated immediately by going to Utilities - Maintain Your Address/Maintain Your E-mail Address RE: Notice of Change of Address, #2773 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
October 17, 2008 Filing 2774 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory G Petersen attorney for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz, changing address to Petersen Law Firm, Attorneys at Law, 3100 Airway Avenue, Suite 109, Costa Mesa, CA 92626, Tel. (949) 335-1300, Fax (714) 850-0274. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Petersen, Gregory)
October 16, 2008 Filing 2773 NOTICE of Change of Address by Fenja Klaus attorney for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz, changing address to Petersen Law Firm, Attorneys at Law, 3100 Airway Avenue, Suite 109, Costa Mesa, CA 92626, Tel. (714) 814-7256, Fax (714) 369-2975, fklaus@petersenlawfirm.com. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Klaus, Fenja)
September 22, 2008 Filing 2772 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Plaintiffs' motion re entitlement to gap time compensation; Defendant City of Los Angeles' motion for partial summary judgment; Defendant City of Los Angeles' motion for partial summary judgment; Defendant City of Los Angeles's motion for partial summary judgment: The Court gives tentative rulings as stated in Court and on the record on above motions. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter taken under submission, a written order to follow.Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (bp)
September 8, 2008 Filing 2771 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 8, 2008 Filing 2770 Defendant's Objections to the Declaration of Eugene D. Senf Filed in Support of Request for Denial or Continuance of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication Under FRCP Rule 56(f) in support of re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 8, 2008 Filing 2769 REPLY in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 25, 2008 Filing 2763 REPLY Support/Opposition MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene D. Senf in Support of Request for Denial or Continuance of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudicaiton Under FRCP Rule 56(f), #2 Exhibit A re Dec of Eugene D. Senf, #3 Exhibit B re Dec of Eugene Senf, #4 Plaintiffs' Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Plaintiff Objection and Motion to Strike Decaration of Stuart Maislin, #6 Plaintiffs Objection and Mtn to Strike Dec of Truc Nguyen)(Senf, Eugene)
August 12, 2008 Filing 2762 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect even selected. Correct event is responses, replies & other motion related RE: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bp)
August 11, 2008 Filing 2761 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief #2760 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 11, 2008 Filing 2760 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages, #2 Appendix Separate Statement, #3 Declaration Stuart Maislin, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Declaration Truc Nguyen, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' Entitlement to "Gap Time" Damages)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 24, 2008 Filing 2759 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess: re: MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney #2755 . Accordingly, having found good cause, Jackson DeMarco's motion to withdraw as Plaintiff's counsel of record in this action is GRANTED. The hearing on this motion, scheduled for Monday, 7/28/08, is hereby VACATED. (bp)
July 17, 2008 Filing 2758 REPLY MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney #2755 filed by Plaintiffs Manfred G Merkens, Jr, Charles D Halliburton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik in support of Reply Brief)(Malik, M)
July 14, 2008 Filing 2757 Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel and Objection to Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero in Support of Objection to Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 2756 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney #2755 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 3, 2008 Filing 2755 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiffs Manfres G Merkens, Charles D Halliburton. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, #3 Proposed Order in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)(Malik, M)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2754 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Re: Consolidation of 207k/Gap Time Issue held before Judge Gary A. Feess. Plaintiffs to file and serve Consolidated Motion Regarding Entitlement to Gap Time Compensation 7/28/08; Defendant's Response/Cross-Motion Regarding Entitlement to Gap Time Compensation 8/11/08; Plaintiff's Reply/Opposition to Defendant's Response/Cross-Motion 8/25/08; Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion 9/8/08; and Hearing at 9:30 AM on motions 9/22/08. See order for further details. (csi) (csi)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2753 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Miguel G. Caballero, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus & Peckenpaugh #2752 . Substituting attorney Greg K Hafif for Dave McDowell in place and stead of Jackson, Demarco, Tidus & Peckenpaugh (bp)
June 12, 2008 Filing 2752 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Miguel G. Caballero, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff Dave McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 10, 2008 Filing 2750 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike the Appearances of Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen Peckenpaugh After March 4, 2008 in this matter #2748 . The court is less than pleased that it has to address such rudimentary issues. The ex parte applications are DENIED. (bp)
April 7, 2008 Filing 2749 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike the Appearances of Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen Peckenpaugh After March 4, 2008 in this matter #2748 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ruth Mijuskovic ISO Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel's Opposition to Ex Parte Application)(Malik, M)
April 4, 2008 Filing 2748 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike the Appearances of Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen Peckenpaugh After March 4, 2008 in this matter filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Lawrence#2 Proposed Order #3 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Petersen, Gregory)
April 3, 2008 Filing 2747 Supplemental Scheduling Conference Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) and Case Management Orders Dated February 1 and March 3, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Caballero, Miguel)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2746 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff, John Gardner is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess :, John D Gardner terminated. (bp)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2745 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff Donald E. Muniz is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Donald Ernest Muniz terminated. (bp)
March 26, 2008 Filing 2744 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess. Hearing is held and counsel are present. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case, including the outcome of the Maciel case, the impact of the Nolan case on Alaniz and Mata cases, mediation and trial date. The Court will develop and issue a schedule of dates. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (csi)
March 21, 2008 Filing 2743 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Miguel G Caballero counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Adding Eugene Senf as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Miguel G. Caballero (Caballero, Miguel)
March 17, 2008 Filing 2742 JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 17, 2008 Filing 2741 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Changing Law Offices of Fenja Klaus to 267 W. Bonita Avenue, Claremont, CA 91711. Changing fklaus@klauslawfirm.com to (714) 960-9500. Adding Fenja Klaus as attorney as counsel of record for Roberto Alaniz for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Roberto Alaniz (Klaus, Fenja)
March 13, 2008 Filing 2740 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs of Dismissal for Donald E. Muniz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation & Proposed Order)(Malik, M)
March 13, 2008 Filing 2739 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs of Dismissal for John Gardner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation & Proposed Order)(Malik, M)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2738 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff, Joseph Marx is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Joseph Marx terminated. (bp)
March 12, 2008 Filing 2737 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. Changing PETERSEN LAW FIRM to 21163 Newport Coast, #581, Newport Coast, CA 92657. Changing gpetersen@petersenlawfirm.com to (949) 640-8983. Adding Gregory G. Petersen as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz (Petersen, Gregory)
March 10, 2008 Filing 2736 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs of Dismissal for Joseph Marx (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Malik, M)
March 10, 2008 Filing 2735 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney M Alim Malik on behalf of Plaintiffs Criselda Pedro, Lisa Ruegg, Marty Cotwright, Phillip J Wright, Thomas W Stone, Russell Long, Richard Mendoza, Rebecca Martinez, Hal Dexter Jones, Randy Hoffmaster, Jesus Hernandez-Soto, John J Hatfield, Rebecca Martin, David Harrison, Matthew Fleming, Michael W Dunn, Howard Chan, Ernest Avila, Fred Tredy, Brent Josephson, Carlton Jeter, Jose D Hurtado, Michael Hofmeyer, James Choi, David Sanchez-Soissons, John Licata, Jr, David Lin, Josephine Mapson, Salvador Martinez, John M Ray, Angel Salvador Bonilla, Brodie Seagrave, Stephen Showler, Gregory Elias Trejo, Todd Costello, Jose Delgado, Charles Dickinson, Alma Burke, Salvador Flores, Sean Hansen, Alexander R Alvarez, George Leiva, Louie Lozano, Georgia Odom, Karla Barraza, Alan Parra, Daniel Putz, Jose Salazar, Catherine Rymzsa Leon, Vincent J Correa, Darren Stauffer, Rosa A Torres, Teddy Amstone, Carlos Barrios, Maria Muro, Josue Merida, Michael Woodings, Donovan Michael Lyons, Earl Williams, Charles Urso, Heidi Stoecklein, Maurice Stewart, Daryl Scoggins, Rodney Rodriguez, Kyle B Remolino, Paul Mosley, Armando Monarrez, Samer Issa, Paul Hong, Raymond Galluccio, Juan Arroyo, Donna J Watkins, Donald Estrada, Randall Cordobes, Ryan Bellows, John Ayala, Richard Acosta, Jason Wesley, Brent Johnson, Samnal Hong, Rosemelinda Gutierrez, Fidel Gonzalez, Randy Garcia, Joe Flores, Ferdinand Faustino, JR, Corinne Ernst, Manuel Delgado, Daniel Davis, John Caraveo, Antonio Martin, Ryan Marshall, Hector Lomelin, Victor Perez, Martin Perello, Richard Melendez, Michael Pavelka, Ricardo Oliva, Boris Oliva, Steve Nunez, Michael Morales, Bill Miller, Edward Tsai, Erik Sundstrom, Charles Strong, Charles Spicer, III, Eric Spear, George Rock, David Solis, Gary Shanahan, Ricahard Sauer, Paul Sanfillipo, Teri Robinson, Darryl Brown, Miguel Gutierrez, Brian Zavala, John Zambri, Raymond Valois, Ray Robinson, Leon Ortega, Kimberly Mole, Sean Laule, Lashawna Pugh, Guy Juneau, Brian Joachimstaler, Damon Hogan, Michael Flynn, Alfredo Flores, Marie Farrell, David M Escoto, John Chrispens, Leroy Block, Danny Shry, Kristopher Rollins, Alfonso Reyes, Robert Orlando, Steve Morris, Roger Morgan, Christopher Merrin, Craig Markel, Jeffrey Anderson, Ruben Martinez, Andre Louis, Jeanette Lawrence, Charles Wunder, Gonzalo Lara, Michael Kozak, Lyle P Knight, Michael Hall, Jimmy Grayson, Alejandro Galvan, Hector Esparza, Joseph Dudas, Keith Davis, Jack Davenport, Jr, Timothy Colomey, George M Castro, Warner A Castillo, William O Batista, Michael K Barz, Siamone Bangphraxay, Ruben Arellano, Luis Alvarado, Michel A Kozak, Joseph Ciancanelli, Alan Ramirez, Dwayne Wilson, Chris Scott, Luis Reyes, Christopher Blankenship, Juan Santos, Danny Odom, Stephen Merrin, Alejandro Arredondo, Garry McQueen, Christopher McPheeters, Ben McPheeters, Kevin Lowe, William Larkin, Ricky Johnson, Richard Hoefel, William M Young, Robert Harris, David Redd, Antonino Giambruno, Gerardo Gutierrez, Andres Cruz, Jaime NMI Gonzalez, Consuelo Gonzalez, Steve Garcia, Gary Ferrato, Ruben De La Torre, Ronald Cade, David Berumen, JR, Roy Ballesteros, Rene Zavala, Ashur Agena, Ronald Cade, Eri Poss, Marc Pooler, Michael Mitchell, Telly Epperson, Francisco Diaz, SR, Mario Arrizon, Christian Urbina, Richard Tamez, Richard Ramos, Randy Yoshioka, Carlos Sutton, Clancy Maihori, Amber McCallum, Gerald Legaspi, William NMI Flannery, Jose De Leon, Lenning Davis, III, Jose Covarrubias, Trevor Ziemba, Jason Witt, Matthew Saenz, Constance White, Sonya Tiefenbacher, John Stieglitz, Eugene Smith, Trevor Ziemba, Gabe Rodriguez, Luis Rodarte, Patrick Rimkunas, Edgar Ramos, Roseanne Parino, Scott Nunez, Joseph Avila, Jason Witt, Adrian Chin, Marlon Fields, George Selleh, Henry Colebrooke, Ignacio Murillo, Maria C Marquez, Robert Lona, Jr, Hsin-Yi Lo, Yin Y Leung, Charles J Garcia, David M Fatool, Nelson Enamorado, Jason Curtis, Henry Covarrubias, Eric Campos, Anthony Ares, Pamela Ventura, Suzanna Lowry, Chris Giargiari, Ritchie Tijerina, Matthew McNulty, Esteban Olivares, David Morales, Pedro Llanes, Heidi Llanes, Ted Reyland, Steven Ralph, Enrique Chavez, Elvis Hernandez, Marco Vargas, Sonia Rimkunas, Tarek Ismail, Marcela Garcia, Steven Angulo, Robert Vargas, Carla Taylor, John Lawrence, Christopher Razo, Jonathan Tippet, James Hagerty, George Goodyear, Emily Delph, Gary Eagleson, Timothy Crabtree, Andrew Buesa, Ricardo Verduzco, Sandra Zamora, Dennis Lada, Carl E Taylor, Christina L Reppucci, Anthony Aceves, Terry Keefer, Jesus Garcia, Scott Fairchild, Ricky Brown, Johnny Garcia, Felipe Benavidez, Jr, Angel Cervantes, Eddie Badillo, Cheryl Amour, Jose Vazquez, Terence Turner, Maria Tippet, Arlene Padilla, Peter Verschueren, Ruben Quintanar, John Onyshko, Jr, Peter Mah, Teresa Lincoln, Walter Hanna, James A Erwin, III, Jorge De Los Reyes, Gregorio R De La Rosa, Miguel A Contreras, Nestor D Ayson, Lilia Velasco, Darren Scira, Paul R Sciarrillo, Jr, Joel J Ruiz, Andrew Rowe, Robert Rodriguez, Ray L Rodriguez, Eric Obrecht, Lizabett Mesa, Peter M Lopez, Myra M Kellum, Timothy J Hope, Joel Hernandez, Orlando T Green, II, Michael Gannon, Celeste Dula, Douglas Workman, David H Chung, Anthony Perez, Jorge A Cervantes, Jr, Robert A Canizales, Daniel J Calderon, Robert A Brophy, Lonya C Britton, Jorge L Arellano, Ricardo Acosta, Benny Abucejo, Michael Williamson, Alfredo Delgado, William Kipp, Elbert W Hughes, Jr, John Hankins, Jeri De La Torre, Antonio De La Torre, Gina Chovan, Sang Mo An, John P Castillo, Jesus Zaragoza-Nunez, Van Thompson, Susan R Solley, Eric M Reade, Bridget Pickett, Sean Patcheak, Eloy Navarro, Michelle Lopez, Debbie Lopez, Jean L Jimenez, Todd Holmberg, Hugo Fanfassian, Lifernando Garcia, Christian J Christensen, Diosdado Coronel, Dino Campodonico, James Agnole, Timothy B Stack, Marsha Reyes, Robert Andreno, Robin Petillo, Richard Parks, Danh Ngo, Adrian Moody, Tina Matsushita, Marvin Sigfrido Mancia, Scarlett M Nuno, Carlos Zaragoza, Fabio Taglieri, Thomas Ty Lo, Robert NMI Williamson, Stephen Wilson, Robert E Wade, Paul Rumer, Paul A Ricchiazzi, Laura Preasmyer, Jorge Cruz, Jeff S Nolte, James Lumpkin, Ryuichi Ricky Ishitani, Victor E Fain, Eddie Diaz, Victor Suapaia, Mario Cubillos, Rosalyn E Clark, Jefferey Booker, Michael Beloud, Sean Meade, Thomas A Willers, Raymond Terrones, Brian Malneritch, Gregory Fuqua, Gerardo Vazquez, Victor Alvarez, Jaime Roussett, Carlos Mercado, Patrick Marmolejo, Ryan Whiteman, Richard Romney, Scott Koegel, Yvonne Whiteman, Wallace Wall, Pavel Gomez, Dave McDowell, Lisa Gallegos, Jesse James, Shihkuo Jack Sun, Larry Oliande, Shon Wells, Mark Maldonado, R Maggie Luquin, Carlos Lozano, Tim M Lai, Vincent Stroway, Tai Kingi, David L Hovey, Samuel Davis, Michael Pauley, Mark R Cronin, Anthony Puchi, Michael Munjekovich, David A Loera, Steven Lecours, Ronald G Lopez, Roberto San Roman, David R Ortiz, Alex Delieuze, Diane Hawking, Patrick L Murphy, Steve Griffith, Charles Surh, Ernest L Sparkman, Donald Singer, Michael James Paris, Joseph Oseguera, Joseph Mueller, Timothy T Rolsen, Mario Morales, Michael Miracle, William Joyce, Peter Vasquez, Alicia Maria Hollenback, Thomas A Burris, Robert Bermudez, Cynthia Bello, Rudy Avelar, Esther B Vasquez, Kevin E Love, Alan Aldegarie, Craig Allen, Erick Yepes, James Wallace, Ralph Camarillo, Gene Sur, William Romanelli, Randy Rico, Huy Quach, Brian L Preston, Andrew A Paredes, Ray Denton, Antonio Lopez, Jr, Kent Lau, Neal Peterson, Christopher Ralph Landry, Jee Kim, James Alan Harper, Angel Miguel Guerra, Robert Gonzalez, Rebecca Levy Gallegos, Jorge De Jesus, III, Jeffrey D Collado, Camille R Armstead, Jeremy Duncan, Marcello Sabbatella, Leroi O'Brien, Gerardo Morales, Leonard NMI Miller, Ray Hallenbeck, Timothy C Ledingham, Frank Dominguez, III, Troy S Abordo, Hector Aceves, Robert Cosner, Julio Alfonso, Arnel Asuncion, Andre Wright, Peter Sanchez, William Arthur Segee, Jeffrey B Pailet, Roger Michel, Richard R Larson, III, Paul Hendry, Will Munoz, Carmen M Gutierrez, Steven Grimmer, Efrain Contreras, Efren Acosta, Pete M Cabral, alan Little, Kristen Yeager, Raul Ramos, David Nunez, Philip Steven Clarke, Karolin Clarke, Adrian Gonzales, Mark Anthony Preciado, Byron Anthony Barnes, Michael Estrada, Cezar Orozco, Jesse Sanchez, David James Hance, Federico Celis, Ramon Hernandez, Rigo Bonilla, Vaotupua Sefo Feula, Gerry R Chamberlain, Matthew Lee Stuart, Philip James Ruiz, Marvin Brent, Juan Paz, Catherine M Sobieski, Paul Richard Bernd, Nicholas A Titirigg, Lori Sanchez, Richard McCauley, Walter A Leiva, Craig Kojima, Eric Fukute, Sunti Singhanate, Gilbert Escontrias, Carlos Escobar, Pedro Cordero, Eric T Briggs, Casey W Cox, Anthony Gonzalez, Omar Veloz, Darius Lee, Edward J Kim, Alicia Cordona Gilmer, Alan W Gilmer, Blaca E Desormaux, Nadya P Bennyworth, Ronald E Weaver, Jonathan Daniel Roman, Mark Miraglia, Milan A Ayers, Steve W Griffin, Martha Plata, Delaney Jones, Michael Apodaca, George Thomas Wilson, Jr, William B Limtiaco, Kevin Dunigan, Rex S Wells, Deen Alcaraz, Lawrence Harold Mullaly, Richard M Wells, Peter Paul Acosta, Merri Dallas, Mitchell Dan Nowlen, John F Martinez, Anthony W T Kong, Carlos Alberto Ocegueda, Ramon Martinez, Joshua Nicholas Riggs, Travis Kupka, John Hovig Jizmejian, Michael D Sledd, Carlos Medina Valdez, Richard Mark Carney, Timothy John Wienckowski, Alma Angelina Skefich, Rafael R Mora, Mario Jacinto, Steven Gus Juarez, Stephanie L Kraychur, Robert Joseph Crupi, Theodore Robert McHenry, Rhonda Howard, Ray Nimn Guerrero, Joshua Daniel Sewell, Angela Nicole Wittman, Sean Patrick Hart, Rachel Lynn Rodriguez, James C Stoa, Ismael Contreras, Frank Ciezadlo, Sheila Congboy Rizzolo, Theresa Maria Stanford, Humberto Jaime, Sonia Banuelos, Ruben Cardenas, Celia Komathy, Jeff Chiantaretto, Louis E Lozano, Todd Baldwin, David Bambrick, Robert J Bishop, Hal Dexter Jones, Alicia Elliott, Darrel Hinson, Zoutan Mako, Mark Guardado, Abe Rangel, Arthur Antonio, Mark Dimitt, Joshua Chong, Kelene Dale Gibson, Miguel Gomez, Robert Aguilar, Michael Chapman, James Zourek, Patricia Smith, Brian Gingras, David Guiterman, Alejandro Izquierdo, Dennis J Duran, Brian Thayer, Bryce Verna, Art Talamante, Todd Chaney, Sandr
March 3, 2008 Filing 2734 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess :, Joint Rule 26(f) report shall be filed by the end of business day of March 17, 2008. Status Conference set for 3/26/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess.Court Reporter: Pam Cotton. (bp)
February 25, 2008 Filing 2733 SCHEDULING REPORT of 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fenja Klaus in support of Plaintiffs' Scheduling Report#2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fenja Klaus in support of Plaintiffs' Scheduling Report#3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fenja Klaus in support of Plaintiffs' Scheduling Report)(Malik, M)
February 25, 2008 Filing 2732 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elizabeth Arce in Support of Scheduling Conference Report#2 Exhibit A in Support of Scheduling Conference Report#3 Exhibit B in Support of Scheduling Conference Report#4 Exhibit C in Support of Scheduling Conference Report)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
January 31, 2008 Filing 2731 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule 2/4/08 Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2729 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Grace Garcia (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2728 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Chalres Giuliani (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2727 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Binh Nguyen (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2726 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff James T Willis (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2725 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Caesar David Gonzalez (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2724 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Keith H Spencer (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2723 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Dennis P Kilcoyne (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2722 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Jesus Ramirez (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2721 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Hugo Trujillo (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2720 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' John Armando Warren (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2719 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Pernell Taylor (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2718 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff John E Redican (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2717 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Edgar Cruz (bp)
December 31, 2007 Filing 2716 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF RE Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Clinton T Weir (bp)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2715 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess, that the Scheduling Conference be held in this matter on 2/4/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (bp)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2714 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff, Anthony Balderama is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Anthony Balderama terminated. (bp)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2713 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess : IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference be held in this matter on 1/14/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (bp)
December 10, 2007 Filing 2712 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: The court shall prepare an expedited schedule to resolve this action. Counsel shall notify the clerk if time conflicts with other hearings. Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/17/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess.Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (bp)
December 4, 2007 Filing 2710 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz.. (bp)
December 4, 2007 Filing 2709 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Los Angeles City of, served scheduling conference report on 12/3/07. (bp)
December 3, 2007 Filing 2711 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT pursuant to Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (bp)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2708 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF, BRENT MCGUYRE FROM ACTION by Judge Gary A. Feess : (rmo)
November 28, 2007 Filing 2730 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: adding Gregory G. Petersen, M. Alim Malik, Fenja Klaus as attorney as counsel of record for Roberto Alaniz for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Pamela Ann Wilson, Eugene D. Senf, Rana S. Ziaee is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Roberto Alaniz, Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public) (cbr)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2704 ORDER regarding rule 26(f) Conference set for 12/10/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess.(bp)
October 18, 2007 Filing 2707 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff William Monahan (bp)
October 18, 2007 Filing 2706 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Suzanne Vukovic (bp)
October 18, 2007 Filing 2705 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Horacin Aguirre (bp)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2703 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff, Teresa Velez is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Teresa M Velez terminated.(bp)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2702 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Michael Graham (bp)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2701 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Sunny Sasajima (bp)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2700 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' David Brandstetter (bp)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2699 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Claudia Mendoza (bp)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2698 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Christopher Green (bp)
October 3, 2007 Filing 2686 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Patrick Higa (bp)
October 3, 2007 Filing 2685 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Susan Herold (bp)
October 3, 2007 Filing 2684 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Jonathan Miller (bp)
October 3, 2007 Filing 2683 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Gustavo Camacho (bp)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2660 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #2637 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2659 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties #2623 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2658 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties #2624 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2657 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #2621 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2656 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties #2622 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2655 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #2627 (vh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 2654 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties #2625 (vh)
September 28, 2007 Filing 2695 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Ricardo Rivera (bp)
September 28, 2007 Filing 2694 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Michael Quezada (bp)
September 28, 2007 Filing 2693 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Rudy Gonzales (bp)
September 28, 2007 Filing 2692 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Steve Morales (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2682 COSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Daniel Rios (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2681 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Marian Bausley (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2680 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Alexander Villalpando (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2679 CONSENT TO JOIN AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Ruthan Scott (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2678 CONSENT TO JOIN AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff David Perry (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2677 CONSENT TO JOIND ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Kenneth Santolla (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2676 CONSNET TO JOIND ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Timothy Scott (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2675 CONSENT TO JOIND ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Rafael Tobar (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2674 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Ralph Alvarez (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2673 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Sandra Garcia (bp)
September 25, 2007 Filing 2672 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Osvaldo Gonzalez (bp)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2653 STIPULATION AND ORDER that plaintiff, Leonel Borja is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge Gary A. Feess.(bp)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2652 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess : Plaintiff, Doug McCombs is dismissed without prejudice.(esa)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2651 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess : Plaintiff Carlos Velez is dismissed without prejudice.(esa)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2696 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Alan Kreitzman (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2691 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Earnest Williams (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2690 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Roy Agbanawag (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2689 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Salvatore De Bella (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2688 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Arca (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2687 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Brian Peel (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2671 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Chris Kliever (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2670 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Dominick Fuentes (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2669 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Deshaun Hall (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2668 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff James Moody (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2667 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Habib Munoz (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2666 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Christopher Cortijo (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2665 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Mika Kuroiwa (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2664 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff John Long (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2663 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Alfredo Rosales (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2662 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Patricia L Blake (bp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 2661 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Steven E Johnson (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2650 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Jim Tumbeiro. Due to clerical error, plaitiff's name was inadvertently referred to as "Jim Tumbeird". The true and correct name of plaintiff is Jim Tumbeiro 2194 (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2649 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Hector Chaidez (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2648 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Donald Bender (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2647 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Jeremy Fink (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2646 CONSENT TO JOIND ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Augusto Mariano (bp)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2645 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Robert Olmos (bp)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2644 CONSEN TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Peter Ponich (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2643 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Robert Scutaru (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2642 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Lorna Cavin (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2641 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Luis Delacruz (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2640 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Robert Worrall (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2639 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Jay Varga (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2638 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff James Edwards (yc)
August 30, 2007 Filing 2637 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY DOCUMENTS held before Judge Gary A. Feess : On 8/27/07, the Court denied as moot Plaintiffs request for leave to file a sur-reply in Defendant's motion regarding donning and doffing claims. Given that the request was denied, the Court STRIKES Plaintiffs notice of sur-reply brief, sur-reply brief, the accompanying declarations, and the request for judicial notice. (bg)
August 29, 2007 Filing 2636 DECLARATION of EUGENE SENF in SUPPORT of MOTION for Leave to file a Sur-Reply Brief in Response to Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Order Confirming That no "Donning and Doffing" Claims filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (lga)
August 29, 2007 Filing 2635 DECLARATION of FENJA KLAUS In SUPPORT of PLAINTIFFS (PROPOSED) MOTION for Leave to file a Sur-Reply Brief in Response to Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Order Confirming That no "Donning and Doffing" Claims filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (lga) Modified on 9/4/2007 (laverty, ginny).
August 29, 2007 Filing 2634 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS (PROPOSED) re MOTION for Leave to file a Sur-Reply Brief in Response to Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Order Confirming That no "Donning and Doffing" Claims filed by PLAINTIFF Roberto Alaniz. (lga)
August 29, 2007 Filing 2629 NOTICE of [Proposed] Sur-Reply Brief in response to reply to oppositon to defendants clarifying motion regarding donning and doffing claims filed by plaintiffs (ca)
August 29, 2007 Filing 2626 [PROPOSED] SUR-REPLY BRIEF in response to reply to opposition to clarifying MOTION regarding "Donning and Doffing" claims 2583 filed by Plaintiffs (ca)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2625 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Scott Blackman terminated, without prejudice.(yc)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2624 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Alex A Pozo terminated, without prejudice.(yc)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2623 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Jesus David Flores terminated without prejudice.(yc)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2622 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, James Rahm terminated without prejudice.(yc)
August 27, 2007 Filing 2627 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : re: MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 is DENIED.(yc)
August 27, 2007 Filing 2621 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : re: MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 . is DENIED. (see minutes)(yc)
August 24, 2007 MOTION for Leave to file a Sur-Reply Brief in Response to Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Order Confirming That no "Donning and Doffing" Claims filed by plaintiffs. (ad)
August 24, 2007 Filing 2633 OBJECTIONS in Response to Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendant's MOTION for Order (1) confirming that No "Donning and Doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and Doffing" ; allegations and (3) requiring that current plaintiffs receive a clarifying notice that this case does not include "Donning and Doffing" claims 2583 filed by Plaintiffs. (ad)
August 23, 2007 Filing 2630 OBJECTIONS of OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE, DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE KEVIN BECKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Strike 2605 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (bp)
August 23, 2007 Filing 2617 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, re Declaration of Anthony Ly 2611 , Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon 2613 , Declaration Brian P. Walter 2612 , Declaration of Detective Kevin Becker 2614 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in reply of Motion 2610 served on 8/20/2007. (ca)
August 22, 2007 Filing 2618 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY in Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiff Steve Grimes. (ca)
August 22, 2007 Filing 2616 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff re Stipulation and Order, #2520 . (ca)
August 22, 2007 Filing 2603 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : The hearing previoulsy scheduled for Monday 8/27/2007 2583 is hereby VACATED. (yc)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2615 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, re Declaration of Anthony Ly 2611 , Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon 2613 , Declaration of Brian P. Walter 2612 , Declaration of Detective Kevin Becker 2614 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in reply to opposition to clarifying motion re donning and doffing claims 2610 , served on 8/20/2007. (ca)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2614 DECLARATION of Detective Kevin Becker in support of reply to opposition to MOTION for notice clarifying donning and doffing claims 2583 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (ca)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2613 DECLARATION of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of reply to opposition to MOTION for notice clarifying donning and doffing claims 2583 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ca)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2612 DECLARATION of Brian P. Walter in support of reply to opposition to MOTION for notice clarifying Donning and Doffing claims 2583 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ca)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2611 DECLARATION of Anthony Ly in support of reply to oppositon to MOTION for notice of clarifying "Donning and Doffing" Claims 2583 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ca)
August 20, 2007 Filing 2610 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Reply to Opposition to Clarifying Motion Re: "Donning and Doffing" Claims 2583 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (ca)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2601 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Arno Clair terminated, without prejudice.(yc)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2600 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Yolanda Caterino-Clair terminated, without prejudice.(yc)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2599 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Steve Castro terminated, without prejudice.(yc)
August 15, 2007 Filing 2620 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFFS Robert Brogelman (yc)
August 15, 2007 Filing 2619 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Heath Adams (yc)
August 15, 2007 Filing 2609 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Eric Jennings (yc)
August 15, 2007 Filing 2608 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Divinity (yc)
August 15, 2007 Filing 2607 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Spree Desha (yc)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2632 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs' Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public), re Notice (Other) 2629 , Statement (Motion related) 2631 , Statement (Motion related) 2630 , Motion Related Document 2628 served on 8/13/07. (bp)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2631 OBJECTIONS and motion to strike declaration of Brian P. Walter in support of defendant's MOTION to Strike 2605 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (bp)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2628 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Strike 2605 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (bp)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2606 DECLARATION of Miguel G. Caballero in support of opposition to Defendant's Clarifying motion re Donning and Doffing claims filed by attorneys for Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (pg)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2605 Plaintiffs' Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of David A. Urban In Support of Defendant's Motion Regarding "Donning and Doffing" claims filed by plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public).Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2007 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (pg)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2604 APPENDIX OF EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDNT'S CLARIFYING MOTION RE DONNING AND DOFFING CLAIMS filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (lra)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2602 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff of Morrison & Foerster - minutes dated 7/18/07 (tami)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2589 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 filed by plaintiffs Arlene Padilla, David R Ortiz, Joseph Oseguera, Greg Ortiz, Jose Luis Padilla, Jeremy Jay Paciokowski, Gil Padilla, S Owens, Gregory Owens, Michael K Ozaki, John Padilla, Karen Owens, J Padilla. (yc)
August 13, 2007 Filing 2588 DECLARATION of Fenja Klaus in support MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 . (yc)
August 10, 2007 Filing 2598 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Brandon (yc)
August 10, 2007 Filing 2597 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Matthew Casalicchio (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2596 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Kevin W Smith (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2595 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Bennie Boatwright (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2594 CONSENT TO JOIN Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Hector Ibarra (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2593 CONSENT TO JOIN Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaitiff Joseph Adragna (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2592 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Edward Heredia (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2591 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, re MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 served on 8/6/2007. (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2590 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, re MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 served on 8/6/2007. (yc)
August 9, 2007 Filing 2587 Mail Returned addressed to 425 Market St, San Francisco Ca 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties 2523 (yc)
August 7, 2007 Filing 2581 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Rufus R Ward (yc)
August 7, 2007 Filing 2580 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Ronnie M Romero (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2586 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, re MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 served on 8/6/2007. (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2585 DECLARATION of Brian P. Walter in support MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2584 DECLARATION of David A Urban in support MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ MOTION for Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and doffing" allegations and (3) requ 2583 filed by Defendant Los Angeles City of. (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2583 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order for (1) confirming that No "Donning and Doffing" claims are at issue in this case, (2) Precluding plaintiff from discovering or advancing arguments and proof concerning "Donning and Doffing" allegations and (3) requiring that current plaintiffs receive a clarifying notice that this case does not include "Donning and Doffing" claims; Memorandum of points and authorities filed by defendant Los Angeles City of.Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2007 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. Lodged Proposed order. (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2579 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Jonathan M Kincaid (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2578 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAITNIFF James P Moon (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2577 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Hyong S Perkins (yc)
August 6, 2007 Filing 2576 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Dennis Nguyen (yc)
August 3, 2007 Filing 2575 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Samuel Y Cho (yc)
August 3, 2007 Filing 2574 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Benjamin E Aguilera (yc)
August 2, 2007 Filing 2582 Mail Returned addressed to 425 Market St, San Francisco, C 94105-2482 re Stipulation and Order, 2478 (yc)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2573 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, Clint S Dona is hereby dismissed from the action without prejudice.(yc)
August 1, 2007 Filing 2572 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFFS Edward L Kellogg (yc)
August 1, 2007 Filing 2563 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Juan P Silva (yc)
July 31, 2007 Filing 2571 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Jim Tumbeiro (yc)
July 27, 2007 Filing 2562 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY-PLAINTIFF-TAMARA A. BAUMANN 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Tamara A Baumann (et)
July 26, 2007 Filing 2570 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Teresa Zundel. (ad)
July 26, 2007 Filing 2569 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Vincent Henson. (ad)
July 26, 2007 Filing 2568 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Re Consent to Join Action for Jonathan Daniel Roman 1883 . (ad)
July 26, 2007 Filing 2565 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Re Consent to Joint Action for John Manuel Calzada 2095 . (ad)
July 25, 2007 Filing 2564 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Re Consent to Join Action for Gregg Arthur Jacobus 2074 . (ad)
July 20, 2007 Filing 2567 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Gabriel Holguin. (ad)
July 20, 2007 Filing 2566 CONSENT TO ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Silvia Corral. (ad)
July 20, 2007 Filing 2560 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Michael Tolmaire (bp)
July 19, 2007 Filing 2559 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - FRANCISCO CARRILLO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Francisco Carrillo (shb)
July 19, 2007 Filing 2558 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION - AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KURT D THURSTON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Kurt D Thurston (shb)
July 19, 2007 Filing 2557 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DINO ANGELO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Dino Angelo (shb)
July 19, 2007 Filing 2556 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL B CALHOUN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael B Calhoun (shb)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2530 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Justin Malcuit is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess thta Plaintiff Kenneth A. Nitschke is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2528 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Juvey A. Mejia is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2527 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Phillip R. Watson, Jr. is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2526 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff RICHARD YEP is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice., (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2525 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff MICHAEL BOYLLS is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice., (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2524 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Frank Schweitzer is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2523 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff SHONDIE JACKSON is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice., (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2522 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Paul McKechnie is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2521 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess that Plaintiff Terry L. Pratt is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2520 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff TANYA RODDA is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice., (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff MICHAEL RUBIN is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice., (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2518 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff KEN QUIGLEY is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice. (yc)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2517 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess :, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that plaintiff STEVEN MOODY is hereby dismissed from the captioned matter without prejudice.(yc)
July 18, 2007 Filing 2549 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - RONALD F GRIJALBA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Ronald F Grijalba (shb)
July 18, 2007 Filing 2531 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 392 is denied. (see minutes).(yc)
July 16, 2007 Filing 2548 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DARRYL SHUM re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Darryl Shum (shb)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2561 Consent to join action as a party - plaintiff - Joe Quezada [collective action pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b)]; filed by plaintiffs(ear)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2500 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - OMAR L. DAVIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Omar L Davis. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2499 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - FRANCISCO MACIAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Francisco Macias. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2498 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DAVID RIDDICK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff David Riddick. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2497 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JEFFREY S. MULHEIM in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Jeffrey S Mulheim. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2496 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ROY REZA JR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Roy Reza, Jr. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2495 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TAAJ MUHAMMAD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Taaj Muhammad. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2494 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CESAR MATA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Cesar Mata. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2493 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ADRIANNA PRADO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Adrianna Prado. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2492 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TIMOTHY R. McRATH re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Timothy R McRath. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2491 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CRYSTAL N. DAVIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Crystal N Davis. (jp)
July 13, 2007 Filing 2490 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LISA M. DURAN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Lisa M Duran. (jp)
June 29, 2007 Filing 2555 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LOLITA BERMUDEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Lolita Bermudez (shb)
June 29, 2007 Filing 2480 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff re Minutes Order #1923 . (jp)
June 26, 2007 Filing 2554 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SCOTT MICHAEL VOSTAD re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Scott Michael Vostad (shb)
June 26, 2007 Filing 2553 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TIMOTHY R McRATH re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Timothy R McRath (shb)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2478 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson :regarding defendant Response to request to production NOS 42,45-49 and 54. good cause exists to continue the date for the city of provide further responses to request NOS. 43,45,46,48,and 54 from June 25, 2007 to June 29,2007 so the responsive documetns may be organized and bates number prior to production. (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2544 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFFS Miguel Angel Nunez (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2543 CONSENT OT JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Pedro Topete Cabunoc, JR (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2542 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Luke Baxter Walden (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2541 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Manuel Esqueda (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2540 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Dontae Phillips (yc)
June 25, 2007 Filing 2539 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION 1 ,filed by plaintiff Jeramie Andrel Schulze (yc)
June 22, 2007 Filing 2489 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SIDNEY DEAN HODGES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Sidney Dean Hodges (shb)
June 22, 2007 Filing 2488 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KEVIN W PIERCE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Kevin W Pierce (shb)
June 22, 2007 Filing 2487 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CESAR I GUITRON- Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Cesar Ignacio Guitnon (shb)
June 22, 2007 Filing 2486 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - BRIAN W TYNDALL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Brian W Tyndall (shb)
June 22, 2007 Filing 2485 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DARREN HILL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Darren Hill (shb)
June 21, 2007 Filing 2546 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTON (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Del Jester (yc)
June 20, 2007 Filing 2552 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - VERONICA INEZ SAUCEDO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Veronica Inez Saucedo (shb)
June 20, 2007 Filing 2551 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - FRANK PRECIADO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Frank Preciado (shb)
June 20, 2007 Filing 2550 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MARIO ALDO PARRILLO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Mario Aldo Parrillo (shb)
June 20, 2007 Filing 2545 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Eric Wayne Holyfield (yc)
June 19, 2007 Filing 2484 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CAESAR DAVID GONZALEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Caesar David Gonzalez (shb) Modified on 7/19/2007 (shb, ).
June 19, 2007 Filing 2483 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LAURA GERRITSEN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Laura Gerritsen (shb)
June 19, 2007 Filing 2482 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF - EDWARD BELTRAN ZAMORE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Edward Beltran Zamora (shb)
June 19, 2007 Filing 2481 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SAMUEL ADAM ARNOLD re Complaint (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Samuel Adam Arnold (shb)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2538 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LARRY LEE JOHNSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Larry Lee Johnson. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2537 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JASON GEORGE JACOBSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Jason George Jacobson. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2536 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KEELY C. COLEMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Keely C Coleman. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2535 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - RANDY SCOTT GOENS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Randy Scott Goens. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2534 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SCOTT DONALD BROWN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Scott Donald Brown. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2533 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KENNETH STEVEN BARTNICKI in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Kenneth Steven Bartnicki. (jp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 2532 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DANIEL GARRETT THOMPSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by plaintiff Daniel Garrett Thompson. Modified on 7/20/2007 (jp).
June 14, 2007 Filing 2547 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LORI A LEE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Lori A Lee (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2516 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ALFONSO CISNEROS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Cisneros (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2515 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JAMES FRANCISCUS MARTINEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff James Franciscus Martinez (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2514 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JAIME CHACON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jaime Chacon (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2513 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JAMES A STOUT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff James A Stout (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2512 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - PATRICIA A STOUT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Patricia A Stout (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2511 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ALEX RYAN HOFFMASTER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Alex Hoffmaster (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2510 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ROBERT CARLOS CELAYA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Robert Carlos Celaya (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2509 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL ANTHONY MARTINEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Anthony Martinez (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2508 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - EDWARD RICHARD PETTEREZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Edward Richard Petterez (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2507 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TIMOTHY HWAN KIM re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Timothy Hwan Kim (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2506 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - STEPHEN PETER YUROCHKO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yurochko (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2505 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - RANDOLPH CLIFFORD AGARD re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Randolph Clifford Agard (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2504 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - STACIE LYNN FRENCH re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Stacie Lynn French (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2503 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - EDWARD N ACOSTA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Edward N Acosta (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2502 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ROBERT MICHAEL VILLALOBOS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Robert Michael Villalobos (shb)
June 14, 2007 Filing 2501 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JAMES A KUKKOK re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff James A Kukkok (shb)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2441 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GINA M. BRACHT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gina M Bracht. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2440 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GILBERT SANCHEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gilbert Sanchez. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2439 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PHILLIP HENRY ZALBA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Phillip Henry Zalba. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2438 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- OSCAR ALBERTO GARZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Oscar Alberto Garza. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2437 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- STEVEN COSTAS KOTSINADELIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Steven Costas Kotsinadelis. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2436 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SONNY KYNOI PATSENHANN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sonny Kynoi Patsenhann. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2435 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP RODRIGUEZ, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Phillip Rodriguez, Jr. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2434 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TIMOTHY JASON BOHAC in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Timothy Jason Bohac. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2433 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID NABIL HABIBI in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Nabil Habibi. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2432 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LEONARD ROLAND PEREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Leonard Roland Perez. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2431 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-YOUNG WOO JHEON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Young Woo Jheon. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2430 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CEDRIC RAYNARD INGRAM in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Cedric Raynard Ingram. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2429 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- SPENDORA RENE HADNOT-RICKS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Spendora Rene Hadnot-Ricks. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2428 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-LESTER M. FREEMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Lester M Freeman. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2427 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TODD H. BRACHT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Todd H Bracht. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2426 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BENJAMIN MARTIN TRAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Martin Tran. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2425 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-WAYNE KERRY GUILLARY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Wayne Kerry Guillary. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2424 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MARCO ANTONIO MUNOZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Marco Antonio Munoz. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2423 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JEFF PAUL QUINTON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeff Paul Quinton. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2422 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GABRIEL RIVAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rivas. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2421 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- SALVADOR LIZARRAGA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Salvador Lizarraga. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2420 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RICHARD KEITH LARIMER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Keith Larimer. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2419 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GABRIEL SUAREZ-VILLAMIL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Suarez-Villamil. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2418 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-STEVE SAINZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Steve Sainz. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2417 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CARLOS OLMOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Carlos Olmos. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2416 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ARA VIDAL HOLLENBACK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ara Vidal Hollenback. (et)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2415 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GARY EDWARD LEFFEW in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gary Edward Leffew. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2414 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RONALD WAYNE GRAY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ronald Wayne Gray. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2413 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RAYMONA VILLALOBOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Raymona Villalobos. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2412 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RAY JOHN MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ray John Martinez. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2411 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PHILLIP LAWRENCE MILLER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Phillip Lawrence Miller. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2410 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RUDY JOSE QUINTANILLA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Rudy Jose Quintanilla. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2409 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GREGORY CORONADO TREVINO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gregory Coronado Trevino. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2408 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CRAIG STEPHEN ADAMS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Craig Stephen Adams. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2407 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- SAM SAUL SALAZAR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sam Saul Salazar. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2406 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MAGDALENO GOMEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Magdaleno Gomez. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2405 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PETER JOHN JACK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Peter John Jack. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2404 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ERIC CRAIG WILLIAMS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eric Craig Williams. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2403 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JEREMY MARSHALL OLSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Marshall Olson. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2402 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JEFFREY BRIAN BEACHAM in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Brian Beacham. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2401 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MICHELLE RACHEL ESKRIDGE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rachel Eskridge. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2400 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARK BRIAN STRATTON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark Brian Stratton. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2399 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BERZON ANGCAO DISTOR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Berzon Angcao Distor. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2398 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CURTIS L. DAVIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Curtis L Davis. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2397 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- VICTOR MANUEL ARRELLANO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Victor Manuel Arrelano. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2396 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOSEPH ERIC CHAVEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joseph Eric Chavez. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2395 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DOUGLAS DANIEL ROACH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Douglas Daniel Roach. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2394 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOSE LUJAN REYES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Lujan Reyes, Jr. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2393 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MIGUEL ALFONSO TERRAZAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Miguel Alfonso Terrazas. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2392 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- WILLIAM CHESTER LANTZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff William Chester Lantz. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2391 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MARIO E. FIGUEROA, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mario E Figueroa, Jr. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2390 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CHRISTOPHER SMYTHE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Smythe. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2389 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN MANUEL CUENCA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Manuel Cuenca. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2388 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-EZEQUIEL BARRAZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ezequiel Barraza. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2387 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-THEODORE JARA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Theodore Jara. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2386 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MICHAEL PATRICK FLANNERY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Patrick Flannery. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2385 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRENT ALAN SMITH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brent Alan Smith. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2384 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARC MICHAEL FERRIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Marc Michael Ferris. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2383 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BRIAN ANTHONY HARRIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Anthony Harris. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2382 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MARTIN M. ESPINOZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Martin M Espinoza. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2381 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GISSELLE ESPINOZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gisselle Espinoza. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2380 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RAYMOND G. WONG in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Raymond G Wong. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2379 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DENNIS JOHN SHAW in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Dennis John Shaw. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2378 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RICHARD J. KNOPF in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard J Knopf. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2377 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BRIAN WAYNE WILSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Wayne Wilson. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2376 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JUAN CARLOS CHAVEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Juan Carlos Chavez. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2375 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JESSE JOE REYES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Joe Reyes. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2374 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-THOMAS ANTHONY GARCIA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Thomas Anthony Garcia. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2373 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JORGE ARTURO ALFARO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jorge Arturo Alfaro. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2372 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MICHAEL CLARK BLAKE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Clark Blake. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2371 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DARLENE MYREE SHELLEY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Darlene Myree Shelley. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2370 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TERESA RENAE PIKOR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Teresa Renae Pikor. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2368 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-LUIS NAVARETTE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Luis Navarette. (et)
June 12, 2007 Filing 2367 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ROBERT JOSEPH MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Joseph Martinez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2479 Mail Returned addressed to Kevin Todd Haroff re Minutes dated 6/6/07 #2014 . Addressee moved, unknown, deceased. (ad)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2369 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TROY ORION ZEEMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Troy Orion Zeeman. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2366 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN THOMAS STRASNER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Thomas Strasner. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2365 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RENE MARCEL MORALES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Rene Marcel Morales. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2364 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-OMAR FRANCO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Omar Franco. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2363 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LEEANN JONES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff LeeAnn Jones. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2362 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-OSCAR ALEJANDRO CASTELLANOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Oscar Alejandro Castellanos. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2361 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARLON GOMEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Marlon Gomez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2360 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RUBEN ORLANDO VEGA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ruben Orlando Vega. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2354 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CARLOS ALBERTO FIGUEROA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Carlos Alberto Figueroa. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2327 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DIANA ZAMORA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Diana Zamora. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2326 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- FRANCOIS JOSEPH WISE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Francois Joseph Wise. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2325 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RAYMONA K. MOUSSA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Raymona K Moussa. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2324 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MICHAEL W. SCHNEIDER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael W Schneider. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2323 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-STEVEN AGUILAR, III in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Steven Aguilar, III. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2322 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DONG S. PARK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Dong S Park. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2321 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- KEVIN L. GIVERSON, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Kevin L Giberson, Jr. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2320 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ADAM BENJAMIN LOO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Adam Benjamin Loo. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2319 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GERARDO LOZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gerardo Loza. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2318 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAMES MICHAEL BLAND in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff James Michael Bland. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2317 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOSEPH POLLACK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joseph Pollack. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2314 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- FREDDIE ROBERT ACKERLEY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Freddie Robert Ackerley. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2313 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DONNI LYNN ELLISON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Donni Lynn Ellison. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2312 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-IVAN GUILLERMO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ivan Guillermo. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2311 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ADRIANNA MARIE PRADO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Adrianna Marie Prado. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2310 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JONATHAN DAVID PASILLAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jonathan David Pasillas. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2307 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CARLOS ENRIQUE TORRES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Carlos Enrique Torres. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2306 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID RODRIGUEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Rodriguez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2305 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAMES JOSEPH DICKSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff James Joseph Dickson. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2304 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MICHAEL ANTHONY THOMPSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Anthony Thompson. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2303 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RYAN V. ICAGAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ryan V Icagan. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2300 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID WAYNE YEP in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Wayne Yep. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2298 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- SHARLON KOJRO WAMPLER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sharlon Kojro Wampler. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2296 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHRISTOPHER ALBERT VASQUEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Albert Vasquez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2293 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DARIUS IAN TRUGMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Darius Ian Trugman. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2291 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ROBERT LOUIS SCHLESINGER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Louis Schlesinger. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2290 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DIANA M. SALCIDO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Diana M Salcido. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2285 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SERGIO NAVARRO SALAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sergio Navarro Salas. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2284 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOSE ROMO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Romo. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2283 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOAQUIN RODRIQUEZ, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Rodriquez, Jr. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2282 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ARTHUR REYNA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Arthur Reyna. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2281 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CORBIN JOSEPH RHEAULT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Corbin Joseph Rheault. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2280 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LEOPOLDO REY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Leopoldo Rey. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2279 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LEO PEREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Leo Perez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2278 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JEREMY JAY PACIOKOWSKI in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Jay Paciokowski. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2277 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- OSCAR ALEJANDRO ORDONEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Oscar Alejandro Ordonez. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2276 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MALIGI AGATONU NUA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Maligi Agatonu Nua. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2275 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MATTHEW KEVIN MURRAY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Matthew Kevin Murray. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2274 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAMES J. MAY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff James J May. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2273 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- HOWARD D. MATHEWS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Howard D Mathews. (et)
June 11, 2007 Filing 2272 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- TERESA LYNN ANDERSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Teresa Lynn Anderson. (et)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2359 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CESAR IGNACIO GUITNON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Cesar Ignacio Guitnon (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2358 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - VERONICA PADILLA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Veronica Padilla (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2357 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ROGER I WATSON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Roger I Watson (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2356 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ARTURO MARES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Arturo Mares (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2355 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - John Ammons re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff John Ammons (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2353 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - WILLARD DAVID THOMASON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Willard David Thomason (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2352 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - UNNEYUNG KEVIN REE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Unneyung Kevin Ree (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2351 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LUZ ELBA MONTERO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Luz Elba Montero (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2350 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ANTHONY GREEN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Anthony NMI Green (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2349 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TOM LEO CHAVEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Tom Leo Chavez (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2348 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ERIC ALAN HURD re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Eric Alan Hurd (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2347 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JENNIFER SUSANNE HOWLETT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Susanne Howlett (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2346 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ALAN C HENRY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Alan C Henry (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2345 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL THOMAS JUDGE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Thomas Judge (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2344 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - BRIAN MICHAEL CORWIN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Brian Michael Corwin (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2343 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TERESA L EVANS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Teresa L Evans (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2342 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SHAWN DAVID CRABBE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Shawn David Crabbe (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2341 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - Jimmy Chong re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Chong (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2340 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LANCE ADAM BLAKE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Lance Adam Blake (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2339 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DAVID GIBSON ASHLEY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff David Gibson Ashley (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2338 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - EVANNRY MARIA AROCHO Re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Evannry Maria Arocho (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2337 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ATRHUR ANTHONY CASTRO Re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Arthur Anthony Castro (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2336 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - THOMAS ANTHONY BOJORQUEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Thomas Anthony Bojorquez (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2335 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JENNIFER NICOLE BLOMELEY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Nicole Blomeley (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2334 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LAVERNE BROWN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Laverne Brown (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2333 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL JOSEPH SULLIVAN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Sullivan (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2332 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DANIEL ADAM GARCIA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Daniel Adam Garcia (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2331 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - NATHAN PAUL EWERT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Nathan Paul Ewert (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2330 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CLAUDIA CARMEN CASTRUITA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Claudia Carmen Castruita (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2329 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - FELICIANO TYRONE WILSON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Feliciano Tyrone Wilson (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2328 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SALLY ELIZABETH SANTAMARIA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Sally Elizabeth Santamaria (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2316 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LISA MARIE DURAN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Lisa Marie Duran (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2315 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ERIC HERNANDEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Elvis Hernandez (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2309 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL KILPATRICK re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kilpatrick (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2308 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MARK MANUEL MAS CARENO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Mark Manuel Mascareno (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2302 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL LOPEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Lopez (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2301 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - RO9NALD HARRELL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Ronald Harrell (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2299 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - VALENTINE SCOT FLORES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Valendine Scot Flores (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2297 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KENNITH JOSEPH FERRO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Kennith Joseph Ferro (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2295 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL SHEKLOW re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Edan Michael Sheklow (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2294 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF -STEVEN SOON CHUNG re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Steve Soon Chung (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2292 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ERIC SEAN MOLLINEDO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Eric Sean Mollinedo (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2289 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - Adam Senall Green re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Adam Senall Green (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2288 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - CRYSTAL NOVA DAVIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Crystal Nova Davis (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2287 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - OMAR LAMONT DAVIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Omar Lamont Davis (shb)
June 8, 2007 Filing 2286 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - BOBBY ROMO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Bobby Romo (shb)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2477 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE of Reply to Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order to shorten time for notice of motion and motion for second mailing of notice of collective action 2473 was served on 6/6/07. filed by Plaintiffs (ir)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2271 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ENRIQUE ROBLEDO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Enrique Robledo, Jr. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2270 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RUDOLPH RIVERA, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Rudolph Rivera, Jr. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2269 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DAVID JAMES CRAIG in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David James Craig. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2268 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BENJAMIN DAVID GUTIERREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Benjamin David Gutierrez. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2267 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MATTHEW WILLIAM JONES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Matthew William Jones. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2266 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-LISA MICHELLE KELLY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Lisa Michelle Kelly. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2265 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JUAN ISRAEL ZENDEJAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Juan Israel Zendejas. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2257 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- NGUYET T. DO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Nguyen T Do. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2256 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARK DARIN LAUDERDALE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark Darin Lauderdale. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2254 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-KATHY K. RODITIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Kathy K Roditis. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2252 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRUCE LELAND COSS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bruce Leland Coss. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2251 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARICELA IBANEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Maricela Ibanez. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2249 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHRISTY MADERA CHAVARRIA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintff Christy Madera Chavarria. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2243 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SHANE DAVID BUA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Shane David Bua. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2242 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RICARDO GUTIERREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ], filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Gutierrez. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2241 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOE QUEZADA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joe Quezada. (et)
June 7, 2007 ***Parties Joe Quezada, Ricardo Gutierrez and Shane David Bua rep by Eugene D Senf, Greg K Hafif, Fenja Klaus, Gregory G Petersen, Miguel G Caballero added. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2240 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAMES CRAIG FERRELL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff James Craig Ferrell. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2239 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-EUGENE SEBATIAN OLEA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eugene Sebatian Olea. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2238 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAE HYUNG SUNG in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jae Hyun Sung. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2237 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-WALTER O. LOPEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Walter O Lopez. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2235 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ARTHUR LEE SIMMS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Simms, Jr. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2233 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GARY EUGENE ROSS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gary Eugene Ross. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2231 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ANISSA ELAINE HARSMA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Anissa Elaine Harsma. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2226 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SEAN RAMON MCGEE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sean Ramon McGee. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2225 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MARK AUSTIN JOHNSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark Austin Johnson. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2223 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- AMIE A. GUARDADO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Amie A Guardado. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2218 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ADAM SOCKIS MOORE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Adam Sockis Moore. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2216 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ROBERTO ALANIZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2214 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- PAUL SHERNEY WILLIAMS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Paul Sherney Williams. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2212 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TERESA Y. ALONZO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Teresa Y Alonzo. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2211 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GERARD JOSEPH GIBSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gerard Joseph Gibson. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2210 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-LEAH MARIE BAXTER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Leah Marie Baxter. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2209 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRET ANDREW BANACHOWSKI in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bret Andrew Banachowski. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2202 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-KENNETH MICHAEL SNOWDEN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Michael Snowden. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2201 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOSE MANUEL HERRERA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Manuel Herrera. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2200 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID GENE ROSS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Gene Ross. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2199 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SERGIO IVAN SANCHEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sergio Ivan Sanchez. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2198 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID JOHN HOPKINS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David John Hopkins. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2197 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-THOMAS GEORGE RALPH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Thomas George Ralph. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2196 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GARY SALES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gary Sales. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2195 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ROBERT ALVARADO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Alvarado. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2194 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JIM TUMBEIRD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jim Tumbeird. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2193 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ALLEN M. KAMAL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Allen M Kamal. (et)
June 7, 2007 Filing 2192 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ERIC LEE WINDHAM in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eric Lee Windham. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2476 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs, re Request for Judicial Notice 2474 , Reply 2473 , Declaration of Eugene D Senf 2475 served on 6/5/07. (ad)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2475 DECLARATION of Eugene D Senf in support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiffs. (ad)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2474 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE as to Alaniz Plaintiffs' Declarations Filed in support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by plaintiffs. (ad)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2473 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiffs. (ad)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2191 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-VINCENT NEGLIA PATA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Vincent Neglia. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2190 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SERGIO DARIO DRIOTEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Sergio Dario Driotez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2189 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-OSWALDO A. PEDEMONTE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Oswaldo A Pedemonte. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2188 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JUAN GABRIEL AGUILAR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Juan Gabriel Aguilar. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2187 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- EVA JEAN PERRY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eva Jean Perry. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2186 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID RUBEN CORDOVA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Ruben Cordova. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2185 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GEORGE TIMOTHY LEONARD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff George Timothy Leonard. Modified on 6/13/2007 (et).
June 6, 2007 Filing 2184 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SPIRO JOHN RODITIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Spiro John Roditis. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2183 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PATRICK SHEPARD ROBINSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Patrick Shepard Robinson. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2182 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHARLES DWIGHT THOMAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Charles Dwight Thomas. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2181 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARK STEPHEN HUBERT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark Stephen Hubert. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2180 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TRAVIS JAMES CURTIN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Travis James Curtin. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2179 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BRIAN JAMES MCDONALD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ], filed by Plaintiff Brian James McDonald. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2178 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BONNIE LYNN LEHIGH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Lynn Lehigh. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2177 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RICHARD LANCE ADAIR in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Lance Adair. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2176 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MANUEL ANDUJO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Manuel Andujo. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2175 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- SAMUEL JOSEPH BRIGGS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Samuel Joseph Briggs. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2174 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GIL JAMES CARDINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gil James Cardinez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2173 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CESAR RENE GONZALEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Cesar Rene Gonzalez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2172 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GUSTAVO ARIEL MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gustavo Ariel Martinez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2171 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DANNY STEVE MENDEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Danny Steve Mendez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2170 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRENT W. RIEDERICH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brent W Riederich. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2169 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ANTONIO VARGAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Antonio Vargas. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2168 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-HECTOR STEVEN CARBAJAL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Hector Steven Carbajal. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2167 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MEDRARDO CARRANZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Medrardo Carranza. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2166 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JAMAL ESAM DAWOUDI in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jamal Esam Dawoudi. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2165 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHERI MARIE DOOLITTLE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Cheri Marie Doolittle. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2164 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-THOMAS CARL GUSTAFSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Thomas Carl Gustafson. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2163 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SHAWN RYAN HOLGUIN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Shawn Ryan Holguin. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2162 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SUSAN GRIZELDA INVERNO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Susan Grizelda Inverno. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2161 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID ALLEN JAVIER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Allen Javier. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2160 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-THOMAS S. LEE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Thomas S Lee. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2159 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RICHARD WAYNE LOCKETT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Lockett. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2158 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRADLEY COULTER NIELSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bradley Coulter Nielson. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2157 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RICHARD PHILLIP PEREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Phillip Perez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2156 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LUIS ANGEL SANTIAGO, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Luis Angel Santiago, Jr. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2155 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DANIEL ANTHONY SUAREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Daniel Anthony Suarez. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2154 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-HECTOR MANUEL URENA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Hector Manuel Urena. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2153 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- PAUL JOSEPH WENTER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Paul Joseph Wenter. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2152 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ELLEN HELENE CAMERON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ellen Helene Cameron. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2151 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOSE LUIS PADILLA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Padilla. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2150 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ELIZABETH LUZ GUDINO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Luz Gudino. (et)
June 6, 2007 Filing 2014 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Gary A. Feess : regarding ex parte application for order to shorten time for motion on second mailing of notice. Accordingly, because plaintiffs fail to meet the threshold requirements for ex parte relief, the application is DENIED. If plaintiffs wish to proceed with their motion, they must calendar it as a regularly noticed motion. (yc)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2148 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- WILLIAM WALDO SANDERS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff William Waldo Sanders. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2147 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BRENT A. SMITH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brent A Smith. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2146 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JULIE R. MCINNIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Julie R McInnis. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2144 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ALDWIN VICENCIO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Aldwin Vicencio. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2143 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- THOMAS MARVIN REDSHAW in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Thomas Marvin Redshaw. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2142 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOHN XAVIER VACH, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Xavier Vach, Jr. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2141 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- STEVEN FREDERICK GROSS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Steven Frederick Gross. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2140 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- FRANCISCO EDUARDO DOMINGUEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Francisco Eduardo Dominguez. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2139 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID ALAN BURRUS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Alan Burrus. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2138 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DAVID MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Martinez. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2134 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ANGEL SAMBRANO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Angel Sambrano. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2132 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JULIO CESAR MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Julio Cezar Martinez. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2130 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- KERRY JON SUPRENANT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Kerry Jon Suprenant. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2128 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER-FULLER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Christopher Alexander-Fuller. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2126 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOSEPH POLLACK in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joseph Pollack. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2121 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ROY REZA, JR. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Roy Reza, Jr. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2120 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ERIC ALEXANDER MELENDEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eric Alexander Melendez. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2119 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ERIC CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Eric Christopher Johnson. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2118 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- PAUL LARRY SKINNER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Paul Larry Skinner. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2117 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-LANITA ELIAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff LaNita Elias. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2116 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GILBERT PEDREGON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gilbert Pedregon. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2115 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GREGORY ALAN GLODERY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gregory Alan Glodery. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2114 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- WAYNE ALBERT DEVEY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Wayne Albert Devey. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2113 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRIAN ERIC BROWN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Eric Brown. (et)
June 5, 2007 Filing 2112 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ALAN C. HENRY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Alan C Henry. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2472 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Shorten Time for Motion on Second Mailing of Notice 2443 .(vdr)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2149 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN STEPHEN ENOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Stephen Enos. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2109 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CLEMENT RUBEN TOSCANO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Clement Ruben Toscano. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2106 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DAVID MANUEL ROMERO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Manuel Romero. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2105 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MANUEL A. PEREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Manuel A Perez. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2103 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DWIGHT CHRISTOPHER NOLAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Dwight Christopher Nolan. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2101 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRUCE PARNELL STALLWORTH in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bruce Parnell Stallworth. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2100 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN WALTER DAVIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Walter Davis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2099 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ANTHONY SHANE SOLIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Anthony Shane Solis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2098 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PATRICK VINCENT ROMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Patrick Vincent Roman. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2097 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CORY PHILLIP MEISNER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Cory Phillip Meisner. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2096 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRYAN HAROLD MILLNER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bryan Harold Millner. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2095 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN MANUEL CALZAOA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Manuel Calzaoa. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2094 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-TIMOTHY JOHN MCLAUGHLIN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Timothy John McLaughlin. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2093 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHRISTINA MARIE HIGUERA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Christina Marie Higuera. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2092 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHARLES PAUL RODRIGUEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Charles Paul Rodriguez. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2091 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-CHARLES KEVIN BLOMELEY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Charles Kevin Blomeley. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2090 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ANTONIO ZAMORA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Antonio Zamora. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2089 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOYCE ANN DAVIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joyce Ann Davis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2088 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DEWAYNE DAVIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Dewayne Davis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2087 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-FRED L. WILLIAMS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Fred L Williams. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2086 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOHN ELIO MORENO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Elio Moreno. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2085 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GERARDO HERNANDEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gerardo NMI Hernandez. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2084 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JOSE ANTONIO ARELLANO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Antonio Arellano. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2083 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ANDY JOSHUA LEURIDAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Andy Joshua Leuridan. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2082 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JESUS DAVID FLORES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jesus David Flores. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2081 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PEDRO TORRES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Pedro Torres. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2080 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-RICHARD ANTONIO LUGO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Antonio Lugo. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2079 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DOUGLAS R. LONG in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Douglas R Long. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2078 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-SCOTT EDWARD THIELMAN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Scott Edward Thielman. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2077 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JAMES NICHOLAS RIVERA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff James Nicholas Rivera. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2076 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-IAN CARBONELL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ian Carbonell. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2075 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ROBERT ARELLANO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Arellano. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2074 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- GREGG ARTHUR JACOBS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Gregg Arthur Jacobs. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2073 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DARRELL EDWARD SANCHO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Darrell Edward Sancho. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2072 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-BRADLEY WARREN MOSSIE in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bradley Warren Mossie. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2071 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PHILIP ANTHONY WALTERS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Philip Anthony Walters. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2070 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RALPH EDWARD EMARD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ralph Edward Emard. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2069 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-PEDRO ZAPATA REYES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Pedro Zapata Reyes. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2068 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- LAWRENCE PHILLIP JONES in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Phillip Jones. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2067 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JOHN DENNIS CAREY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff John Dennis Carey. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2066 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-KATHY JOYCE SIMPSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Kathy Joyce Simpson. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2065 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-DEREK RICHARD MOUSSEAU in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Derek Richard Mousseau. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2064 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-JUAN ALFREDO CEJA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Juan Alfredo Ceja. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2063 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-HOWARD CHOY in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Howard Choy. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2062 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-MARY J. FENCL in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mary J Fencl. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2061 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-WALTER F. WILLIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff William F Willis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2060 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-FLORENCE ESTELLA JOHNSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Florence Estella Johnson. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2059 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MITCHELL ALLEN NORLING in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Allen Norling. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2058 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MARK PRAVONGVIENGKHAM in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark Pravongviengkham. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2057 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ORLANDO MARTINEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Orlando Martinez. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2056 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- STEPHEN MICHAEL MUSSO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Michael Musso. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2055 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- IGNACIO ROJAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Rojas. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2054 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DAVID ALFREDO NAVAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff David Alfredo Navas. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2053 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- CHRISTOPHER WAYNE ALLEN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wayne Allen. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2052 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ANTHONY R. OCHO in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Anthony R Ochoa. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2051 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- BRYAN GARY GREGSON in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Bryan Gary Gregson (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2050 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-ADRIAN ALEXANDER RIOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Adrian Alexander Rios. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2049 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- RICK MICHAEL RAFTER in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Rick Michael Rafter. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2048 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- DONALD ERNEST MUNIZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Donald Ernest Muniz. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2047 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JUAN MANUEL CONTRERAS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Juan Manuel Contreras. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2046 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- JEFFREY JOHN MARTIN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey John Martin. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2045 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- WENDI LEIGHT BERNDT in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Wendi Leigh Berndt. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2044 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- VICTORIA COLLETE DEBELLIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Victoria Collete Debellis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2043 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- A J DEBELLIS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff A J DeBellis. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2042 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- PERRY MIGUEL ALVAREZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Perry Miguel Alvarez. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2041 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MICHAEL JOSEPH BARRIOS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Barrios. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2040 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- OSCAR ONTIVEROS in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Oscar Ontiveros. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2039 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF-GLORIA JEAN WOOD in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Gloria Jean Wood. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2038 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- ANDREAS AN in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Andreas An. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2037 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS PARTY -PLAINTIFF- MANUEL RAY ZAPATA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Manuel Ray Zapata. (et)
June 4, 2007 Filing 2036 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff George Melvin McNeill (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2264 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LUIS MICHEL BONILLA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Luis Michel Bonilla (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2263 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - MICHAEL JAMES HARRINGTON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael James Harrington (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2262 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - STEVEN DOUGLAS SIEKER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Steven Douglas Sieker (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2261 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JOSEPH LEE GONZALEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Gonzalez (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2260 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JEROME CALHOUN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jerome Calhoun (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2259 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - HECTOR GUZMAN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Hector Guzman (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2258 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JUAN CARLOS RODRIGUEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Juan Carlos Rodriguez (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2255 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TIMOTHY JEROME MORRIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Timothy Jerome Morris (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2253 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - KENNETH LEE PRICE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Price (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2250 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TYRONE ROBERTO ACOSTA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Tyrone Roberto Acosta (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2248 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - Joseph Henry Cruz re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Joseph Henry Cruz (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2247 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - WILLIAM MIRZA SIMONOFF re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff William Mirza Simonoff (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2246 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LOUIS EDUARDO MARIN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Louis Eduardo Marin (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2245 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - DAVID HOULIHAN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff David Houlihan (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2244 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SOPHIA RENEE CASTANEDA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Sophia Renee Castaneda (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2236 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - TAYLOR JORDAN MCLAWS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Taylor Jordan McLaws (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2234 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - FELICIA SPRING MCADAMS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Felicia Spring McAdams (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2232 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - SHELDON J WILLIAMS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Sheldon J Williams (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2230 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ESTHER NYAPE REYES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Esther Nyape Reyes (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2229 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JUAN OCTAVIO REYES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Juan Octavio Reyes (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2228 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - THOMAS EWELL BIBBS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Thomas Ewell Bibbs (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2227 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - LUIS ENRIQUE JURADO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Luis Enrique Jurado (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2224 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - JAMES DERIC CARROLL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff James Deric Carroll (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2222 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ADAM NIEBERGALL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Adam Niebergall (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2221 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ANTONIA SERNA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Antonia Serna (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2220 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - ANGELA DOREN WIENCKOWSKI re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Angela Doren Wienckowski (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2219 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - VICTOR SAMUEL MEDRANO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Victor Samuel Medrano (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2217 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - BRIAN KELLY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Brian Kelly (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2215 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - STANLEY ALVIN KANE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Stanley Alvin Kane (shb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 2213 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PLAINTIFF - BRIAN JEFFREY CAMPAGNA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Brian Jeffrey Campagna (shb)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2471 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Roberto Alaniz(an individual for himself on behalf of all others similarly situated and on behalf o fthe general public), re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion fro Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 served on 5/31/2007. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2470 DECLARATION of Eugene D. Senf in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2469 DECLARATION of Fene Klaus in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2468 DECLARATION of Randy Toburen in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2467 DECLARATION of Michael Williamson in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2466 DECLARATION of Ted Williams in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2465 DECLARATION of Jeremy Wheeler in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shorten time for Notice of Motion and Motion for Second Mailing of notice of collective action 2443 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alaniz. (sbu)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2464 DECLARATION of Tim Walters in support EX PARTE