Carter Bryant v. Mattel Inc

Case Number: 2:2004cv09049
Filed: November 2, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Robert N. Block
Presiding Judge: Stephen G. Larson
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2011 10704 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, Pursuant to the jury's verdict and the Court's orders on the parties' motions for judgment on the pleadings, summary judgment and judgment as a matter of law, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1) Judgment is entered for MGA Entertainment, Inc. and against Mattel, Inc. on MGA Entertainment, Inc.'s counterclaim-in-reply for trade secret misappropriation. MGA Entertainment, Inc. is awarded $85 million in compensatory damages, $85 million in exemplary damages, $2,172,000 in attorneys' fees, and $350,000 in costs. 2) Judgment is entered for Mattel, Inc. and against MGA Entertainment/Inc. on MGA Entertainment, Inc.'s claims for common law unfair competition , statutory unfair competition, trade dress infringement, trade dress dilution, violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1962(c), unjust enrichment, and wrongful injunction. 3) Judgment is entered for MGA Entertainment, Inc., MGA Entertainment (HK) Limited, MGA E de Mexico S.R.L. de CV, Isaac Larian, Carlos Gustavo Machado Gomez, and IGWT 826 Investments LLC and against Mattel, Inc. and Mattel de Mexico S.A. de CV on Mattel, Inc. and Mattel de Mexico S.A. de CV's claims for copyright infringement, inte ntional interference with contractual relations, trade secret misappropriation, violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1962(c), violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1962(d), aiding and abetting breach of fiduciary duty, aiding and abetting breach of duty of loyalty, breach of contract, breach of fiduciary duty, breach of duty of loyalty, conversion, unfair competition and declaratory relief. MGA Entertainment, Inc., MGA Entertainment (HK) Limited, and Isaac Larian are awarded $105,688,073.00 in attorneys' fees and $31,677,104.00 in costs. (rla)
March 4, 2011 10130 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: re: Minutes of In Chambers Order 10129 . (See document for details.) III. MGA's motion is granted as to Mr. Wagner's opinion to the extent he relies upon the framework set forth i n the Georgia Pacific case, both for the purposes of calculating a reasonable royalty and for the purposes of apportioning MGA's unjust enrichment. MGA's motion is otherwise denied. Machado's motion is denied without prejudice to Machado seeking to strike Mr. Wagner's opinion in the event Mattel fails to admit the contracts relied upon by Mr. Wagner. (rla)
December 27, 2010 9538 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on MGA's Motion for summary judgment; Mattel's Motion for partial summary judgment; Machado's Motion for summary judgment by Judge David O. Carter: granting in part and denying in part 9044 9073 9084 . See order for further details. (twdb)
October 7, 2010 8908 Opinion or Order of the Court (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge David O. Carter: Mattel is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the protections of the attorney-client privilege and/or work product doctrine apply to the following documents: 1. Privilege Log Entry No. 29 as fou nd in Mattel Inv. Case #02-1680"; 2. The first email in the email chain found between 02-299 Priv. 0019 and 02-299 Priv. 0020 in Mattel Investigation Case #02-299"; 3. (See document for further details.) Mattel may submit its response to the instant Order in camera on or before 5:00 p.m on October 13, 2010. (rla)
February 23, 2010 7551 Opinion or Order of the Court (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge David O. Carter: RE OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY MASTERS PRIVILEGE RULINGS DURING DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL MOORE. Mattel is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, by a brief not to exceed five (5) pages filed on or before March 1, 2010, why Docket # 7547 and 7548 should not be stricken as untimely. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) Modified on 2/23/2010 (rla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter Bryant v. Mattel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?