Perfect 10 Inc v. Arlo Gilbert Featured Case

Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. alleges that Defendant Arlo Gilbert copied Plaintiff\'s copyrighted works and offered them for sale on his websites without authorization.

Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Defendant: Arlo Gilbert and Does
Case Number: 2:2004cv09098
Filed: November 3, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Audrey B. Collins
Referring Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2005 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: This action between Perfect 10 and Arlo C Gilber is dismissed with prejudice with each of the parties to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. This Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over this Action and the parties to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement between the parties, including by motion or by ex parte application as appropriate. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(ir, )
April 11, 2005 24
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGSScheduling Conference held before Judge Audrey B. Collins. The Court sets the following dates: Add Claim/Parties Cut-off: 7/11/05; Expert Disclosure reports due: 10/21/05; Rebuttal reports due: 11/4/05, Expert cut-off: 11/28/05; Discovery cut-off 10/10/2005. Law & Motion Cut-off due by 12/5/2005. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2006 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2006 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (pbap, )
March 23, 2005 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins : Denying [15] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (pbap, )
February 22, 2005 11
MINUTES before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Defendant MOTION to Dismiss Action for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [6] (In Chambers). On February 7, 2005, Defendant filed a motion to Dismiss Action for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, noticed for hearing before this Court on March 7, 2005. Defendant, however, failed to engage in a conference with opposing counsel before filing the motion. See Local Rule 7-3. The motion is therefore STRICKEN. Court Reporter: Not Present. (jp, )
February 10, 2005 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Regarding Conference by Judge Audrey B. Collins: (1) Pretrial Conference pursuant to FRCP 16 and 26 and Local Rule 26; (2) Motions and Ex Parte applications; This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Audrey B Collins, Courtroom 680 Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. All Counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and the Local Rules of Central District of California. Matter is set for a Pretrial/Scheduling Conference on 4/11/2005 10:00 AM. Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed not later than one week before the scheduling conference.(See document for further details) Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Audrey B. Collins.(ir, )
February 7, 2005 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Gary N Schumann for Arlo Gilbert, designating S Martin Keleti as local counsel. Fee PAID. Approved by Judge Audrey B. Collins.(jp, )
November 23, 2004 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 03-9113 ABC (SSx). Case transfered from Judge Paul L. Abrams and George P. Schiavelli to Judge Audrey B. Collins and Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 04-9098 ABC (SSx).(rn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect 10 Inc v. Arlo Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey N Mausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlo Gilbert
Represented By: Gary N Schumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?