Vincent Gillespie et al v. Teri Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie and Kenneth Riggs
Defendant: Teri Patterson, Ventura DAs Office, Ventura County of, Roland Purnell, Michael McKendry, Catherine Barrad, Susan Ruggles, Melissa Frick and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2005cv02332
Filed: March 28, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2005 Filing 18 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41 withou prejudice of this case. filed by plaintiffs Vincent Gillespie, Kenneth Riggs. (yc, )
October 21, 2005 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yc, )
September 21, 2005 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Plaintiffs Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, filed 9/19/05, is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a stipulation signed by Defendants counsel. (ib, )
September 19, 2005 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismissal without prejudice regarding all remaining defendants filed by plaintiffs Vincent Gillespie, Kenneth Riggs. (yc, )
August 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: SCHEDULING ORDER: The court sets the following deadlines: Last day to move to add parties - 9/20/05; Last day to complete discovery - 11/28/2005; Last day to file motions - 1/10/2006. (ib, )
August 18, 2005 Filing 15 CORRECTED filed by Plaintiff Vincent Gillespie. Complaint - (Referred), Complaint - (Referred) 1 (yc, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 12 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Catherine Barrad. (yc, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - ) 1 filed by defendants Susan Ruggles, Melissa Frick, Ventura DAs Office, Ventura County of, Michael McKendry, Catherine Barrad.(yc, )
August 2, 2005 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE ExecutedVentura DAs Office served on 7/26/2005, answer due 8/15/2005. Original Summons not returned. (yc, )
July 25, 2005 Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Plaintiffs shall file a replacement Complaint with the signatures of both plaintiffs Riggs and Gillespie, within 20 days of this order, or else plaintiff Riggs shall be deemed stricken from the Complaint and dismissed from the action. (ib, )
July 19, 2005 Filing 8 Ex-Parte Motion for an Extension of Time to complete service or, in the alternative, a dismissal without prejudice; request for guidance from the court on a certain issue filed by plaintiffs. (ib, )
July 19, 2005 Filing 7 REQUEST to Withdraw EX PARTE Motion for Extension of Time to complete service or, in the alternative, a dismissal without prejudice; request for guidance from the court on a certain issue, filed by plaintiffs 6 filed by plaintiff Vincent Gillespie. (ib, )
July 12, 2005 Filing 6 EX PARTE Motion for Extension of Time to complete service or, in the alternative, a dismissal without prejudice; request for guidance from the court on a certain issue, filed by plaintiffs. (ib, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Complaint herein was filed on 3/28/2005. On 4/5/2005, the Court issued its Order regarding further proceedings reminding plaintiffs that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), if service of the summons and complaint eas not accomplished within 120 days after filing the complaint, the action would be subject to dismissal for failure to prosecute. The 120-day period will expire on 7/26/2005. Plaintiff s are warned that their failure to effectuate service by that date may result in the dismissal of the action by reason of plaintiff's failure to prosecute(yl, )
April 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky: The 120 day period to file the proof of service re summons and complaint will expire on 7/26/05. When the pro se plaintiff is in custody, motion procedures shall be as follows: If the moving party is in custody, any opposition to motions must be filed and served no later than 14 days after service of the moving papers. Any reply must be filed and served within 30 days of service of the opposition. If the non-moving party is in custody, any opposition to motions must be filed and served no later than 30 days after service of the moving papers. Any reply must be filed and served within 10 days of service of the opposition. Joint Stipulation is not required for discovery motions. No oral argument on motions. Motions shall stand submitted after deadline for submission of briefs has passed. (ib, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (rrey, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Vincent Gillespie, Kenneth Riggs. (rrey, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendants Susan Ruggles, Melissa Frick, Teri Patterson, Ventura DAs Office, Ventura County of, Roland Purnell, Michael McKendry, Catherine Barrad Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky.(Filing fee$250.), filed by plaintiffs Vincent Gillespie, Kenneth Riggs.(rrey, )
March 28, 2005 20 Day Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred) 1 as to Susan Ruggles, Melissa Frick, Teri Patterson, Ventura DAs Office, Ventura County of, Roland Purnell, Michael McKendry, Catherine Barrad. (rrey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent Gillespie et al v. Teri Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura DAs Office
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County of
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McKendry
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Barrad
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ruggles
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Frick
Represented By: Noel A Klebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?