Ryan Rodriguez et al v. West Publishing Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs brought a federal antitrust class action against Defendants West Publishing Corporation (d/b/a BAR/BRI) and Kaplan, Inc. on behalf of class members nationwide who took a full-service bar review course from BAR/BRI between August 1, 1997 and July 31, 2006. Plaintiffs alleged that BAR/BRI illegally acquired the assets of its direct competitor West Bar in violation of Section 7 of the Clayton Act, Defendant West unlawfully conspired with Defendant Kaplan to retrain trade in the full-service bar review course in violation of Section 1 of the Sherman Act, and Defendant West wrongfully monopolized the full-service bar review course market in violation of Section 2 of the Sherman Act.

Plaintiff: Kari Brewer, Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci, Jennifer Brazeal, Reena B Frailich, Lorraine Rimson and Lisa Gintz
Defendant: Kaplan Inc and West Publishing Corporation
Petitioner: Pamela Collins Dunmore and Richard A Bodmer
Appellant: Exec/Class Counsel Sandra Disner, McGuireWoods LLP, Finkelstein Thompson LLP and Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP
Intervenor: Stephen Stetson
Other: Jonathan M Slomba, Audrey Juranek, Greg Thomas, Kareem Kamal, Andrew Gilman, John Prendergast, Matthew Kavanaugh, David Harris, Emily Grant, George Schneider, Jennifer Brown McElroy, Justin Head, Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, Richard P Le Blanc, III, James Juranek, Sarah Siegel, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sarah McDonald, Oliver Guiterrez, David Feldman, -, Sandeep Gopalan, Jeff Lang, John Bernitz, Simone Newfield, Andrea Boggio, David Zelenski, Abigail Treanor, Aaron Lukoff, Nikki Love, Stephen M Vasil, Sindell and Siegel, Daniel M Schafer, Jonathan Ricasa, Elizabeth De Long, Arcelia Trevino, Rachel Schwartz, Cameron Gharabiklou, James Puntumapanitch, David Oriol, Evans & Mullinix PA, Jason Tingle, David Orange, Cara Patton and Ryan Helfrich
Intervenor Plaintiff: Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell and Nicholas D Mermiges
Special Master: John Francis Carroll
Case Number: 2:2005cv03222
Filed: April 29, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: James W McMahon
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 827 Mail Returned addressed to Carmine Giardino, The Giardino Law Firm Inc. re Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres #825 . (gk)
April 18, 2018 Filing 826 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sidney K Kanazawa counsel for Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez. Tracy Evans Moyer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff RYAN RODRIGUEZ, REENA B. FRAILICH, LORENDANA NESCI, JENNIFER BRAZIL, and LISA GINTZ. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THIRD DISTRIBUTION AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION TO CY PRES by Judge Manuel L. Real: This Court deems Defendants' failure to oppose consent to grant the Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres #823 is GRANTED. (gk)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 824 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Motion for Order for for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres filed by Plaintiffs Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez #823 , set for hearing on March 19, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of March 19, 2018 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 16, 2018 Filing 823 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for FOR THIRD DISTRIBUTION AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION TO CY PRES filed by Plaintiff Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Blake) (Attorney Sidney K Kanazawa added to party Kari Brewer(pty:pla), Attorney Sidney K Kanazawa added to party Lorraine Rimson(pty:pla)) (Kanazawa, Sidney)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 822 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO COUNSEL FOR SCHNEIDER OBJECTORS by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court finds and ORDERS as follows: Counsel for the Schneider Objectors are hereby awarded $78,879.37 in attorneys' fees--representing the remaining balance due on the award of $315,516.37. Plaintiffs' Counsel are ordered to direct the Escrow Agent, or other appropriate entity, to make payment from the Settlement Fund to Kendrick & Nutley on behalf of Counsel for the Schneider Objectors in the amount of $78,879.37 within 30 days of the entry of this order. (gk)
August 25, 2015 Filing 821 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Directing Payment of Attorneys' Fees re Status Conference, #819 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
August 4, 2015 Filing 820 Mail Returned addressed to Sandeep Gopalan re Status Conference, #819 (kss)
June 22, 2015 Filing 819 MINUTES OF HEARING ON U.S.C.A 9th CIRCUIT MANDATE Reversing and Remandingwith Instructions held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The Mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit Reversing and Remanding is filed and spread upon the Minutes of this Court. The Court awards $315,516.37 in attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit the proposed order. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom)
June 1, 2015 Filing 818 Mail Returned addressed to Jon M Zimmerman re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Hearing, #816 (pg)
May 29, 2015 Filing 817 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR RE Minute Order #816 . Counsel are notified that the a clerical error was made on text of Docket Number #816 . As stated on the Minute Order Setting the hearing on the Mandate, the hearing is set on MONDAY, JUNE 22, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M.. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MINUTES OF ORDER SETTING HEARING on Mandate of the USCA 9TH Circuit Reversing and Remanding by Judge Manuel L. Real: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the Court hereby SETS a hearing on the Mandate of U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit Reversing and Remanding #812 on 6/2/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk)
May 15, 2015 Filing 815 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED 67 Sealed Documents received from 9th CCA RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #809 (lh)
May 6, 2015 Filing 814 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisl Joanne Dunlop counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation. Lisl Joanne Dunlop is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (Dunlop, Lisl)
May 6, 2015 Filing 813 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Lisl Joanne Dunlop counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation. Changing Address to Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP, 7 Times Square, New York, New York 10036. Changing E-mail to LDunlop@Manatt.com. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (Dunlop, Lisl)
May 1, 2015 Filing 812 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #789 CCA # 13-55222. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered March 12, 2015, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA MEMORANDUM #810 REVERSED and REMANDED with instructions] (mat)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #789 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. CCA # 13-55222. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing is DENIED. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing En Banc is also DENIED.(mat)
March 12, 2015 Filing 810 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #789 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. CCA # 13-55222. (mat)
January 21, 2015 Filing 809 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 13-55222. Sixty-seven sealed documents forwarded to Chambers in Seattle WA. (rsm)
July 2, 2013 Filing 808 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/26/12 A.M. Session re Transcript #807 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2013 Filing 807 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/26/12 A.M. Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI S. KLEEGER, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2013. (ha)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER GRANTING SCHNEIDER COUNSELS MOTION FOR ORDER EXECUTING JUDGMENT AND ORDERING DISBURSEMENT OF FEE AWARD AND COSTS by Judge Manuel L. Real, Plaintiffs Counsel are ordered to direct the Escrow Agent, or other appropriate entity, to make payment from the Gross Settlement Fund to Kendrick & Nutley on behalf of Schneider Counsel in the amount of $236,637.00 in attorneys fees and$1,726.06 in costs within five days of the entry of this order. (pj)
June 18, 2013 Filing 805 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Motion Hearing,, #804 (Kendrick, James)
June 17, 2013 Filing 804 MINUTES OF re Motion to Enforce Judgment #798 held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The parties submit on their papers as filed. The Court GRANTS the Schneider Objectors motion, for reasons as stated on the record. Schneider Objectors to submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (kti)
June 3, 2013 Filing 803 REPLY in support of MOTION to Enforce Judgment #798 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
May 29, 2013 Filing 802 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa in opposition to MOTION to Enforce Judgment #798 filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
May 29, 2013 Filing 801 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Enforce Judgment #798 filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
May 20, 2013 Filing 800 DECLARATION of C. Benjamin Nutley in support of MOTION to Enforce Judgment #798 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 799 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Enforce Judgment #798 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 798 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by objector counsel Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kendrick, James)
April 2, 2013 Filing 797 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings OCTOBER 22, 2012; A.M. SESSION re Transcript #794 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2013 Filing 796 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings JANUARY 14, 2013 A.M. SESSION re Transcript #795 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2013 Filing 795 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on JANUARY 14, 2013 A.M. SESSION. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI S. KLEEGER, CSR 10340, phone number (213)894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (mw)
March 29, 2013 Filing 794 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on OCTOBER 22, 2012; A.M. SESSION. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI S. KLEEGER, CSR 10340, phone number (213)894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2013. (mw)
February 21, 2013 Filing 793 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #789 as to Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. ; Receipt Number: LA064497 in the amount of $455. (dmap)
February 15, 2013 Filing 792 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to objectors' counsel Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich Court Reporter. Court will contact J Garrett Kendrick at jgk@private-ag.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 11/26/2012 fee hearing; 1/14/2013 fee hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kendrick, James)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #789 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, CCA # 13-55222. Appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $455.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [See document for further information]. Order received in this district on 2/13/13. (car)
February 7, 2013 Filing 790 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 13-55222, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #789 as to Objectors Ryan Helfrich, James Puntumapanitch, Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (cbr)
February 6, 2013 Filing 789 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by counsel for objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Appeal of Order Awarding Attorney Fees, #786 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Kendrick, James)
February 6, 2013 Filing 788 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. correcting Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #787 (Kendrick, James)
February 4, 2013 Filing 787 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by objectors' counsel Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Appeal of Order Awarding Attorney Fees, #786 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-11613537 paid.) (Kendrick, James)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER GRANTING SCHNEIDER COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES #772 by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court awards attorneys fees in the amount of $ $236,637.00 and costs in the amount of $1,726.06 for the reasons stated on the record at the January 14, 2013 hearing. (jp)
January 15, 2013 Filing 785 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion Hearing,, #784 (Kendrick, James)
January 14, 2013 Filing 784 MINUTES OF Schneider Objectors' motion for attorneys' fees & costs (11-10-12) #772 ; Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court hears arguments of counsel. The Court GRANTS the Schneider Objectors motion, in such amounts, and for reasons, as stated on the record. Schneider Objectors shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
December 17, 2012 Filing 783 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 Supplemental Reply filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
December 17, 2012 Filing 782 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE and Exs 1 and 2 filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4 part a, #3 Exhibit 4 part b, #4 Exhibit 4 part c, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kendrick, James)
December 11, 2012 Filing 781 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Supplemental Submission of Head-Schneider Objectors' Motion for Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses Re: Supplement(Motion related) #779 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
December 6, 2012 Filing 780 DECLARATION of J. Garrett Kendrick in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 2d Supplemental Declaration filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
December 6, 2012 Filing 779 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
November 26, 2012 Filing 778 MINUTES OF Schneider Objectors' motion for attorneys' fees & costs (11-10-12) held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The parties submit on their papers as filed.The Court orders the Schneider objectors to submit detailedtime sheets, as stated on the record, within 10 days. Plaintiffshave 5 days to file a response, and objectors have 5 daysthereafter to file any reply to the response. The matteris continued for hearing on the motion for attorneysfees to January 14, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
November 19, 2012 Filing 777 DECLARATION of J. Garrett Kendrick in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
November 19, 2012 Filing 776 REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #772 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, James)
November 15, 2012 Filing 775 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration #774 CLASS COUNSEL'S OPPOSITION TO SCHNEIDER OBJECTORS' COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS'FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez. (Rivas, Rosemary)
November 10, 2012 Filing 774 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration filed by objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Motion set for hearing on 11/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kendrick, James)
November 10, 2012 Filing 773 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum filed by objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Motion set for hearing on 11/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kendrick, James)
November 10, 2012 Filing 772 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Motion set for hearing on 11/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kendrick, James)
October 22, 2012 Filing 771 MINUTES OF HEARING ON MANDATE Vacating and Remanding on the issue of Attorney's fees to the Schneider Objectors held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is filed and spread upon the minutes of this Court. The Objector's motion for attorney fees will be filed by November 10, 2012; the opposition will be filed by November 15, 2012; and the hearing will be on NOVEMBER 26, 2012 at 10:00 A.M. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: re: USCA Mandate,,, #769 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the Court NOW SETS a hearing on the Mandate of U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit Vacating and Remanding (In Appeal # 10-56724 only) for further proceedings regarding attorneys fees as to the Schneider Objectors on October 22, 2012 at 11:00 a.m.. (pj)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #718 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich CCA # 10-56724. Schneider Appellants/Appellees' Counsel's Motion to Transfer Consideration of Attorneys' fees on Appeal to District Court, filed September 5, 2012, is granted. Order received in this district on 9/14/2012. (dmap)
September 13, 2012 Filing 769 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #713 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #712 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #722 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #719 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #718 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #659 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #726 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 CCA # 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56700, 10-56703, 10-56724, 10-56730, 10-56737, 10-56803, 10-57037. The decision of the district court is affirmed (Nos. 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56700, 10-56703, 10-56730, 10-56737, 10-56803, 10-57037). Vacated and remanded (No. 10-56724). Mandate received in this district on 9/13/2012. (dmap)
September 13, 2012 Filing 768 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #568 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 , CCA # 09-56278, 09-56314, 09-56500. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 9/13/2012. (dmap)
September 6, 2012 Filing 766 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #653 CCA # 10-55372. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 9/6/2012. (dmap)
September 6, 2012 Filing 760 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Heather H Gilhooly counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation.Joanna Shally is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation (Gilhooly, Heather)
September 6, 2012 Filing 759 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Heather H Gilhooly counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation.Steven F. Molo is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation (Gilhooly, Heather)
September 6, 2012 Filing 758 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Heather H Gilhooly counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation.Alan S. Gruber is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation (Gilhooly, Heather)
September 6, 2012 Filing 757 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Heather H Gilhooly counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation.Rebecca J. Trent is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation (Gilhooly, Heather)
September 6, 2012 Filing 756 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Heather H Gilhooly counsel for Defendant West Publishing Corporation.Marc D. Ashley is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation (Gilhooly, Heather)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr. Sandeep Gopalan. Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr. CCA # 09-56500, 10-57037. The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellant's Petitions for Panel Rehearing filed August 20 and August 24, 2012. The petitions for rehearing are denied. Order received in this district on 9/4/2012. (dmap)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 filed by Robert Gaudet Jr. Sandeep Gopalan, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr. CCA # 09-56500, 10-57037. The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellant's Petitions for Panel Rehearing filed August 20 and August 24, 2012. The petitions for rehearing are DENIED. Order received in this district on 9/4/2012. (dmap)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #713 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman CCA # 10-56700. The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellants' Petition for Rehearing filed August 23,2012.The petition for rehearing is DENIED. Order received in this district on 9/4/2012. (dmap)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr. CCA # 09-56500, 10-57037. The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellant's Petitions for Panel Rehearing filed August 20 and August 24, 2012. The petitions for rehearing are DENIED. Order received in this district on 9/4/2012. (dmap)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan CCA # 10-56737. The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellants' Petition for Panel Rehearing filed August 24, 2012. The petition for rehearing is denied. Order received in this district on 9/4/2012. (dmap)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56730, 10-56724, 10-56737, 10-57037. The Request for Judicial Notice, brought by George Schneider, Jonathan M. Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, and Ryan Helfrich (collectively, the "Schneider Objectors"), filed 5/12/11, in Appeal No. 10-55342, 10-56730, and 10-55309 is GRANTED. The Schneider Objectors' Request for Judicial Notice, filed 2/10/12, in Appeal No. 10-56724 is GRANTED. McGuire Woods LLP's Motion to Strike, filed 9/22/12, in Appeal No. 10-56737 is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 10-57037 for lack of standing is DENIED. [See document for further information]. Order received in this district on 8/10/12. (car)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56730, 10-56700, 10-56703, 10-56724, 10-56737, 10-56803, 10-57037. The above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated. Order received in this district on 8/10/12. (car)
August 7, 2012 Filing 753 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Transcripts(s): 5; T0123, T00261, T0269, T0488, T0528 RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #749 (car)
April 13, 2012 Filing 752 NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to 800 Fifth Avenue Suite 4100 Seattle, WA 98104. Filed by Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr.. (pj)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Appeals Nos. 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56730, and 10-55732. Pro se appellee Robert Gaudet has informed the Court that the appellees are unable to agree on an allocation of time between appellees for Appeals Nos.10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56730, and 10-55732. The Court therefore allocates the fifteen minutes of argument time to the Schneider Appellees, who may elect to share the time with other appellees. Order received in this district on 3/2/2012. (dmap)
February 27, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Order,, #750 e-mailed to njussim@mcquirewoods.com bounced due to unknown address error. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to njussim@mcguirewoods.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 09-56278, 09-56314, 09-56500, 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-56730, 10-55372, 10-56700, 10-56703, 10-56724, 10-56737, 10-56803, 10-57037. The Court has determined that the facts and legal arguments are adequately presented in the briefs and record and the decision process would not be significantly aided by oral argument in the following matters: Appeal Nos. 09-56314(Siegel et al.); 09-56500(Gaudet); 10-56700 (Feldman et al); 10-56703(Juranek et al); 10-56737(Lukoff et al); 10-56803(Oriol et al); and 10-57037(Gaudet and Gopalan). Therefore, the Court orders these matters submitted. [See document for further information]. Order received in this district on 2/27/12. (car)
February 9, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #749 e-mailed to niussim@mcguirewoods.ocm bounced due to unknown address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jnussim@mcguirewoods.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2012 Filing 749 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 09-56278, 5 transcripts: T0123, T00261, T0269, T0488, T0528, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 (car)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 10-55309, 10-55342, 10-55372, 10-56700, 10-56703, 10-56724, 10-56730, 10-56737, 10-56803, 10-57037. The above-captioned cases shall be assigned to the same merits panel. The motion to designate Nos. 10-55342, 10-56730 and 10-56737 as cross-appeals is denied. The motion to strike portions of the brief filed in No. 10-56737 is referred to the merits panel for resolution. Court records do not appear to indicate that excerpts of record were filed in No. 10-56803. Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellants shall tender the excerpts. Order received in this district on 10/13/11. (car)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #653 filed by Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP CCA # 10-55372. The unopposed motions filed by appellees George Schneider, Jonathan M. Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich, and Robert Joseph Gaudet for an extension of time to file the answering brief are granted. The answering briefs are due May 18, 2011. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. The court is in receipt of appellee Robert Joseph Gaudets motion to amend the case caption. Order received in this district on 05/10/2011. (dmap)
March 23, 2011 Filing 746 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #745 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION (G-06) under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
March 18, 2011 Filing 745 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. with Certificate of Service (Shang, Jia-Ming)
February 10, 2011 Filing 744 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Charles A Sturm counsel for Objectors Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. Changing address to Bank of America Center; 700 Louisiana, 48th Floor; Houston, Texas 77002. Filed by Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, and Richard P. Le Blanc, III (Sturm, Charles)
January 5, 2011 Filing 743 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 9/27/2010; Court Reporter: Skerri S. Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-57037; Re: #739 (lr)
January 3, 2011 Filing 742 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 9/27/10; Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56737; Re: #722 (Furman, Joshua)
December 28, 2010 Filing 741 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-57037, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 as to Objector/Appellants Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (lr)
December 20, 2010 Filing 738 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 9/27/2010; Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56803; Re: #726 (Palmer, Joseph)
December 6, 2010 Filing 737 MINUTES OF Settling Class Plaintiffs' motion for partial distribution of the settlement fund and for partial distribution of fees and expenses (fld 11-5-10) held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court GRANTS the motion for reasons as stated on the record, and signs the proposed orders.Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. (rs)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND TO AUTHORIZED CLAIMANTS by Judge Manuel L. Real, re MOTION for Order for Partial Distribution of the Settlement Fund and for Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses #723 . The Court finds and ORDERS as follows: Settling Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Distribution of the Settlement Fund to Authorized Claimants is GRANTED. $30 million of the Settlement Fund should be distributed immediately or as soon as practicable to Authorized Claimants in accordance with the Plan of Allocation approved by this Court on February 3, 2010, and in accordance with the procedures set forth in the Glenn Declaration dated November 3, 2010. (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISTRIBUTION OF FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting #723 Motion for Order; Settling Class Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses is GRANTED;The following payments should be made immediately or as soon as practicable from the Settlement Fund: 1. $1,597,560.84 in attorneys fees and $118,259.86 in expenses to Finkelstein; 2. $1,259,861.64 in expenses to McGuire Woods; 3. $35,237.48 in expenses to Zwerling; and 4. $252,236.64, in fees and expenses to Rust; Rust shall be entitled to a further payment of fees and expenses for theadditional costs of administering the Settlement in an amount not to exceed$175,000.00 upon completion of the Final Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund. (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw)
November 30, 2010 Filing 734 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #726 as to Objectors Evans & Mullinix PA, Jennifer Brown McElroy, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Jason Tingle; Receipt Number: LA004562 in the amount of $455. (car)
November 30, 2010 Filing 733 First AMENDED TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 3/19/2007; 6/18/2007; 7/9/2007; 6/15/2009; 7/13/2009; 11/2/2009; 12/7/2009; 8/9/2010; 9/27/2010; Court Reporter: Cindy Nirrenberg; Sheri Kleeger, Sandra Becerra, Margaret Babykin; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56730; Re: #719 (Kanazawa, Sidney)
November 30, 2010 Filing 732 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 3/19/2007; 6/18/2007; 7/9/2007; 6/15/2009; 7/13/2009; 11/2/2009; 12/7/2009; 8/9/2010; 9/27/2010; Court Reporter: Cindy Nireenberg; Sheri Kleeger; Sandra Becerra; Margaret Babykin; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56730; Re: #719 (Kanazawa, Sidney)
November 29, 2010 Filing 731 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for Partial Distribution of the Settlement Fund and for Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses #723 to Settling Class filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
November 24, 2010 Filing 730 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Order for Partial Distribution of the Settlement Fund and for Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses #723 [Request for Judicial Notice of Ninth Circuit's Order Granting Finkelstein Thompson LLP's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas] filed by Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Rivas Declaration)(Rivas, Rosemary)
November 24, 2010 Filing 729 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 9/27/10; Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56703; Re: #712 (Sturm, Charles)
November 18, 2010 Filing 740 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #739 as to Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan; Receipt Number: LA004004, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
November 17, 2010 Filing 728 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56803 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #726 (dmap)
November 17, 2010 Filing 727 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Objector(s) Evans & Mullinix PA, Jennifer Brown McElroy, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel and Jason Tingle re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #726 . (dmap)
November 17, 2010 Filing 726 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Evans & Mullinix PA, Jennifer Brown McElroy, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Jason Tingle. Appeal of Order #725 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Palmer, Joseph)
November 12, 2010 Filing 739 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. Appeal of Order #711 Filed On: 10/22/2010; Entered On: 10/25/2010; Filing fee $ 455. Paid. (lr) Modified on 12/27/2010 (lr).
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF OBJECTORS EVANS, SIEGEL, BROWN, SCHAFER, ORIOL AND TINGLE by Judge Manuel L. Real. (rs)
November 5, 2010 Filing 724 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56737, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #722 as to Objectors Aaron Lukoff, David Orange, John Prendergast. (lr)
November 5, 2010 Filing 723 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Partial Distribution of the Settlement Fund and for Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses filed by Settling Class Plaintiffs Reena B Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion, #2 Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa with Exh 1 & 2, #3 Declaration of Thomas R. Glenn ISO Motion, #4 Proposed Order re Partial Distribution of Fees and Expenses, #5 Proposed Order re Partial Distribution to Class)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
November 4, 2010 Filing 722 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff-Objector Aaron Lukoff, David Orange, John Prendergast. Appeal of Order, #700 , Order, #706 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7764094 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Order Appealed, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Order Appealed, #3 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Furman, Joshua)
November 4, 2010 Filing 720 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: September 27, 2010; Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56700; Re: #451 (Davis, John)
November 3, 2010 Filing 721 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56724, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #718 (lr)
November 3, 2010 Filing 719 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Class Counsel McGuireWoods LLP. Appeal of Order, #700 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7760016 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Appeal, #2 Exhibit B to Appeal, #3 Exhibit C to Appeal)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
November 2, 2010 Filing 718 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Appeal of Order #717 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7751825 paid.) (Kendrick, J)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, the Court denies MOTION Award for Attorney Fees #623 in all respects. (pj)
October 29, 2010 Filing 716 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Executor of the Estate of Eliot G. Disner, as successor-in-interest to Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation, Class Counsel Sandra Disner. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 Filed On: March 5, 2010; Entered On: March 5, 2010; (Attachments: #1 Order of February 3, 2010, #2 Order of October 5, 2010, #3 Representation Statement, #4 Service List Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 3-2)(Jaltorossian, Zareh)
October 28, 2010 Filing 715 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56703, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #712 as to Objectors Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (lr)
October 28, 2010 Filing 714 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56700 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #713 as to class members David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDoanld, Cara patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (dmap) Modified on 10/29/2010 (lr).
October 27, 2010 Filing 713 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by class member David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. Appeal of Order #704 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7726107 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, John)
October 27, 2010 Filing 712 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objectors Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. Appeal of Order, #709 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7721142 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Service List)(Sturm, Charles)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER DENYING ROBERT J. GAUDET, JR. AND SANDEEP GOPALAN'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE AWARD by Judge Manuel L. Real, re MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 (bp)
October 15, 2010 Filing 710 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lee S Taylor counsel for Defendant Kaplan Inc. Lee S. Taylor will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Lee S. Taylor is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Kaplan, Inc. (Taylor, Lee)
October 14, 2010 Filing 708 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 , Order on Request for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Application for Attorney Fees,,, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #698 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kendrick, J)
October 14, 2010 Filing 707 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order Denying re Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, Joseph)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER DENYING UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDREY JURANEK, AND RICHARD P. LE BLANCS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Manuel L. Real. For reasons stated on the record at the September 27, 2010 hearing on Juranek Objectors Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Objectors Motion is hereby DENIED. (rs)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, On September 27, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Manuel L. Real of the above-entitled Court the Motion of Plaintiff-Objectors Lukoff, Prendergast, and Orange for Attorneys Fees came on regularly for hearing. After reviewing the papers in support and opposition to the motion, the evidencepresented therein, and the arguments of counsel, the Motion is DENIED for the reasons set forth on the record during the hearing on the matter. (pj)
October 8, 2010 Filing 705 NOTICE OF LODGING order denying Robert J Gudet jr and Sandeep Gopalan's motion for equitable award filed by Objector Class Members Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan (pj)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real DENYING Objectors MOTION for Award of Attorney' Fees #621 . (jp)
October 8, 2010 Filing 703 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Attorneys Fees)(Furman, Joshua)
October 8, 2010 Filing 702 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sturm, Charles)
October 7, 2010 Filing 701 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, John)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MCGUIREWOODS LLP'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Manuel L. Real, re McGuireWoods LLP's Motion for Reconsideration is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; McGuireWoods LLP is awarded $500,000 in attorneys' fees for work performed on behalf of the Class from July 10, 2007 through September 10, 2010;in the nature of quantum meruit. McGuireWoods LLP's Motion for Reconsideration is otherwise denied. #630 #631 , (pj)
October 4, 2010 Filing 699 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #689 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #632 , Order on Request for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Application for Attorney Fees,,, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #698 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting in Part Denying in Part McGuirewoods LLP's Motion for Reconsideration)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
September 27, 2010 Filing 698 MINUTES OF 1) Plaintiff Counsel McGuirewoods LLP's motion for reconsideration of order denying attorneys' fees (fld 2-5-10) 2) Objectors Gaudet & Gopalan's motion for equitable award (fld 2-1-10) 3) Objectors Feldman etc's motion for award of attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 4) Objectors Siegel etc's joint request for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 5) Objectors Juranek etc's motion for attorney fees and costs (fld 2-1-10) 6) Objectors Lukoff etc's motion for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 7) Objectors Schneider etc's motion for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) #614 #615 #619 #621 #623 #626 #631 held before Honorable Manuel L. Real: The parties submit on their papers as filed. For reasons as stated on the record, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART item # 1 as listed above, and DENIES items # 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 as listed above. Each party shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (im)
September 21, 2010 Filing 697 Objection to the Declaration of Kurt W. Melchior ISO McGuire Woods LLP's Application for Reconsideration re Award of Attorneys' Fees opposition re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
September 10, 2010 Filing 696 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
September 10, 2010 Filing 695 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Objectors Aaron Lukoff, David Orange, John Prendergast. (Furman, Joshua)
September 10, 2010 Filing 694 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Appellant McGuireWoods LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa In Further Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kurt W. Melchior with Exhibits A & B ISO Motion)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
September 10, 2010 Filing 693 STATEMENT of Finkelstein Thompson LLP and Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP Regarding Mcguirewoods LLP's Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Appellants Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP re: Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #689 . (Rivas, Rosemary)
September 7, 2010 Filing 692 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP, re Amended Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #690 , Appeals Docketing Statement (A-11a), Appeals Docketing Statement (A-11a) #691 served on 9/7/2010. (Rivas, Rosemary)
September 7, 2010 Filing 691 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #653 (First Amended Notice of Appeal; Docket # 690) (Rivas, Rosemary)
September 7, 2010 Filing 690 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #653 Filed On: 3/1/2010; Entered On: 3/1/2010; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rivas, Rosemary)
August 9, 2010 Filing 689 MINUTES OF 1) Plaintiff Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP & Zwerling Schachter & Zwerling LLP's motin of reconsideration of order on attorneys' fees (fld 2-12-10) 2) Plaintiff Counsel McGuirewoods LLP's motion for reconsideration of order denying attorneys' fees (fld 2-5-10) 3) Objectors Gaudet & Gopalan's motion for equitable award (fld 2-1-10) 4) Objectors Feldman etc's motion for award of attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 5) Objectors Siegel etc's joint request for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 6) Objectors Juranek etc's motion for attorney fees and costs (fld 2-1-10) 7) Objectors Lukoff etc's motion for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) 8) Objectors Schneider etc's motion for attorney fees (fld 2-1-10) #630 #641 The Court hears arguments of counsel. The Court DENIES item # 1 as listed above, for reasons as stated on the record. On item # 2 as listed above, the Court Orders further briefing on issues as stated on the record by September 10, 2010, and CONTINUES the matter for further hearing, as well as on items # 3 through # 8, to SEPTEMBER 27, 2010 at 10:00 A.M. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (im)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 , #564 , #575 CCA # 09-56278, 09-56314, 09-56500. Order received in this district on 7/15/10. The motion of appellants Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, and Jonathan M. Slomba's to extend time to file opening brief is granted. Appellee's motion to consolidate appeal nos. 09-56278, 09-56314, and 09-56500 with appeals nos. 10-55309, 10-55342, and 10-55372 is denied. See document for details. (cbr)
July 6, 2010 Filing 687 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #641 [Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Finkelstein Thompson LLP's and Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP's Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Attorneys' Fees] filed by Plaintiffs Kari Brewer, Lorraine Rimson. (Rivas, Rosemary)
July 6, 2010 Filing 686 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Appellant McGuireWoods LLP. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
June 28, 2010 Filing 685 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 , MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #641 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
June 22, 2010 Filing 684 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Manuel L. Real: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the: All Objectors Motions for Attorney Fees, and Plaintiffs Counsels motions for reconsideration are hereby ORDERED CONTINUED FROM JULY 19, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. TO AUGUST 9, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. Any opposition papers remain due on JUNE 28, 2010, and any reply papers remain due on July 6, 2010. The continuation of the hearing date DOES NOT move the due dates of those filings. There will be NO hearing on any motion in this case onJune 19, 2010; all motions are continued to August 9, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (im)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER SCHEDULING MOTIONS FOR HEARING by Judge Manuel L. Real: Pending Motions #614 , #615 , #619 , #621 , #623 , #626 , #631 , #641 shall be reset for hearing on 7/19/10 at 10:00 am. (ir)
May 25, 2010 Filing 682 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Order for Scheduling #681 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Lodging under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
May 24, 2010 Filing 681 APPLICATION for Order for Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 filed by Sandra Disner, CCA # 10-55309. Order received in this district on 5/6/10. Court's records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely motion listed in FRAP 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing the last such motion outstanding. Accordingly, proceedings and all pending motions in this court shall be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the pending motion. See order for details. (cbr)
March 29, 2010 Filing 679 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on DECEMBER 7, 2009 11:13 A.M. TO 11:50 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Margaret J. Babykin, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2010. (Babykin, Margaret)
March 29, 2010 Filing 678 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 3-19-07, 6-18-07, 7-9-07; Court Reporter: Cindy Nireenberg, Sheri Kleeger; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-55342; Re: #651 (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
March 29, 2010 Filing 677 NOTICE Amended Notice of Intent to Order Transcripts and Statement of Issues filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
March 26, 2010 Filing 676 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 6/15/09, 7/13/09, 11/2/09, 12/7/09; Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra, Sheri Kleeger, Margaret Babykin; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-55372; Re: #653 (Rivas, Rosemary)
March 25, 2010 Filing 675 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 06/15/09; 07/13/09; 11/02/09; 12/07/09; Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra (6/15/09 & 07/13/09); Sheri Kleeger (11/02/09); Margaret Babykin (12/07/09); Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-55309; Re: #659 (Jaltorossian, Zareh)
March 25, 2010 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 6-15-09, 7-13-09, 11-2-09, 12-7-09; Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra, Sheri Kleeger, Margaret Babykin; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-55342; Re: #651 (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
March 22, 2010 Filing 673 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ORDER TRANSCRIPTS AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES filed by Appellants Finkelstein Thompson LLP and Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP. (Rivas, Rosemary)
March 19, 2010 Filing 672 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Order Transcripts and Statement of Issues filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court is in receipt of Unnamed Class Members JamesJuranek, Audrey Juranek and Richard P. Le Blancs Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Ruling. The Court construes the Motion to be an Ex Parte Application, and, upon review of the papers as submitted, DENIES the application. #667 (pj)
March 15, 2010 Filing 670 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ORDER TRANSCRIPTS AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES filed by Appellant Sandra Disner. (Jaltorossian, Zareh)
March 15, 2010 Filing 669 JOINDER in MOTION for Reconsideration and Request for Ruling #667 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
March 15, 2010 Filing 668 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-55372, 9TH CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #653 filed by Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP. (car)
March 12, 2010 Filing 667 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration and Request for Ruling filed by Objector Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (Sturm, Charles)
March 10, 2010 Filing 665 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-55342, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 (cbr)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 666 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court is in receipt of Class Counsels Ex Parte Application to reconsider the March 2, 2010 Order and to reinstate the various motions for reconsideration and motions for attorneys fees previously set for hearing on March 29, 2010. The Court has considered the papers as filed, and the Application is DENIED #662 (pj)
March 9, 2010 Filing 663 DECLARATION of Dan Drachler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule and Restore to Calendar Hearings on Motions for Reconsideration and Objectors' Motions for Fees #662 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
March 9, 2010 Filing 662 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule and Restore to Calendar Hearings on Motions for Reconsideration and Objectors' Motions for Fees filed by Class Counsel Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
March 8, 2010 Filing 664 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-55309, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 as to Executor of Estate of Eliot G. Disner and Successor-in-Interest to Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation, Class Counsel Sandra Disner Andrea Boggio. (cbr)
March 5, 2010 Filing 661 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 as to Appellant Sandra Disner, Estate of Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation, Class Counsel; Receipt Number: 133101, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
March 5, 2010 Filing 660 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #659 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service List)(Jaltorossian, Zareh)
March 5, 2010 Filing 659 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Executor of Estate of Eliot G. Disner and Successor-in-Interest to Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation, Class Counsel Sandra Disner. Appeal of Order #630 . (Filing Fee NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Representation Statement, #3 Exhibit Service List)(Jaltorossian, Zareh)
March 5, 2010 Filing 658 STATEMENT of Death and Notice of Sandra Disner, Executor of the Estate of Eliot G. Disner, as Successor-in-Interest to Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation, Class Counsel filed by Appellant Sandra Disner (Jaltorossian, Zareh)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: Class counsel McGuireWoods LLP, and, separately, Finkelstein Thompson LLP and Zwerling Schachter & Zwerling LLP, have filed Appeals in this action of this Courts Order Granting Settling Class Plaintiffs Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund Upon the Occurrence of the Effective Date and For Approval and Distribution of Attorneys Fees and Expenses entered on February 3, 2010. This Court believes it is thereby divested of jurisdiction to hear the various motions for attorneys fees of the myriad Objectors in this action, as well as Class Counsels motions for reconsideration of the very order appealed. In fact, based largely on the Order as entered on February 3, 2010. Therefore, each and every motion in this action set for hearing on March 29, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. are hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR, pending the outcome of the Appeals now before the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. IT IS SO ORDERED. #614 #615 #619 #621 #623 #626 #631 #641 M (pj)
March 1, 2010 Filing 656 OPPOSITION TO CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTIONS for Reconsideration #630 #631 , #630 #641 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (pj)
March 1, 2010 Filing 654 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #653 (Rivas, Rosemary)
March 1, 2010 Filing 653 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Class Counsel Finkelstein Thompson LLP, Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP. Appeal of Order #630 . (Filing fee $455, receipt number 0973-6600769.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Order on Appeal, #2 Exhibit B: Representation Statement of Finkelstein Thompson LLP, #3 Exhibit C: Representation Statement of Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP, #4 Exhibit D: Service List)(Rivas, Rosemary)
February 25, 2010 Filing 655 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #651 as to Appellant McGuireWoods LLP; Receipt Number: 132550, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
February 25, 2010 Filing 652 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff McGuireWoods LLP, re a $5.00 filing fee and a $450.00 docket fee are required to be paid to the Clerk, U.S. District Court. re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #651 (lr)
February 24, 2010 Filing 651 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Class Counsel McGuireWoods LLP. Appeal of Order #630 . (Filing Fee NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Appeal, #2 Exhibit Representation Statement (Ninth Cir. Local Rule 3-2))(Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 22, 2010 Filing 650 REPLY in support of Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 in Response to Order of December 2, 2009 filed by Objectors Evans & Mullinix PA, Jennifer Brown McElroy, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Jason Tingle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palmer, Joseph)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: ON EX PARTEAPPLICATION TO CONTINUE OBJECTORS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EQUITABLE AWARD, AND CLASS COUNSELS MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION #643 Good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that hearings on the followingdocketed motions be continued from February 22, 2010 to March 29, 2010 at 10:00a.m.: (See attached For Further Details) The Motions of Class Counsel for Reconsideration of Order on Attorney Feesare also continued, from March 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. to March 29, 2010 at 10:00a.m. (pj)
February 16, 2010 Filing 647 REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 filed by Objectors Aaron Lukoff, David Orange, John Prendergast. (Furman, Joshua)
February 16, 2010 Filing 646 DECLARATION of J. Garrett Kendrick In support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 16, 2010 Filing 645 REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 12, 2010 Filing 649 REPLY in support MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (pj)
February 12, 2010 Filing 644 DECLARATION of Dan Drachler in support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Objectors' Motions for Fees filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Menthe, Darrel)
February 12, 2010 Filing 643 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing from February 22, 2010 to March 15, 2010 Re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 , Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Class Counsel Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Menthe, Darrel)
February 12, 2010 Filing 642 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #641 re Finkelstein Thompson LLPs and Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLPs Motion For Reconsideration of Order on Attorneys Fees filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Kari Brewer. (Rivas, Rosemary)
February 12, 2010 Filing 641 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Rimson, Kari Brewer. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Rivas, Rosemary)
February 10, 2010 Filing 640 REPLY in support MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
February 9, 2010 Filing 639 OPPOSITION TO DAVIS, PALMER, AND STURM'S ATTORNEY'S FEE MOTIONS filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. #614 #615 #618 #619 #620 (ake)
February 9, 2010 Filing 638 OPPOSITION TO NUTLEY'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. #623 #624 (ake)
February 8, 2010 Filing 637 DECLARATION of J. Garrett Kendrick in opposition to Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 8, 2010 Filing 636 Opposition opposition re: Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 8, 2010 Filing 635 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF WILLIAM B. RUBENSTEIN re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 , Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 8, 2010 Filing 634 DECLARATION of Darrel C. Menthe In Opposition To APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 , Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Darrel Menthe Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Darrel Menthe Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Darrel Menthe Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Darrel Menthe Declaration)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 8, 2010 Filing 633 CLASS COUNSEL'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO OBJECTORS MOTIONS FOR AWARDS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES In Opposition to re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 , Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors #614 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 , MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 5, 2010 Filing 632 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 #631 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 5, 2010 Filing 631 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #630 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER GRANTING SETTLING CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND UPON THE OCCURRENCE OF THE EFFECTIVE DATE AND FOR APPROVAL AND DISTRIBUTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Manuel L. Real, #582 (pj)
February 3, 2010 Filing 629 OBJECTION TO PROPOSED ORDER re: MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. (Furman, Joshua)
February 1, 2010 Filing 628 DECLARATION of ROBERT J GUADET JR in support MOTION for Order for Equitable Award #626 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (pj)
February 1, 2010 Filing 627 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT MOTION for Equitable Award #626 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (pj)
February 1, 2010 Filing 626 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Equitable Award filed by Class Members Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (pj)
February 1, 2010 Filing 625 DECLARATION of William B. Rubenstein In support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 1, 2010 Filing 624 DECLARATION of J Garrett Kendrick In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #623 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
February 1, 2010 Filing 623 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kendrick, J)
February 1, 2010 Filing 622 DECLARATION of Joshua R. Furman In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #621 filed by Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Furman, Joshua)
February 1, 2010 Filing 621 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff-Objector Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Furman, Joshua)
February 1, 2010 Filing 620 DECLARATION of Charles A. Sturm re APPLICATION for Attorney Fees #619 filed by Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturm, Charles)
February 1, 2010 Filing 619 APPLICATION for Attorney Fees filed by Objector James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. Application set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Sturm, Charles)
February 1, 2010 Filing 618 DECLARATION of John W. Davis in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
February 1, 2010 Filing 617 DECLARATION of Steven Helfand in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
February 1, 2010 Filing 616 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #615 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
February 1, 2010 Filing 615 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Objector David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Davis, John)
February 1, 2010 Filing 614 Joint REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel For Objectors filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. Request set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Palmer, Joseph)
January 27, 2010 Filing 613 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Order, Motion Hearing,,,, #611 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Settling Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr., CCA # 09-56278, 09-56314, 09-56500. The Order Order received in this district on 1/5/10. The appellees' opposed motion to consolidate Nos. 09-56278, 09-56314 and 09-56500 is granted. Brief schedule set. (cbr)
December 7, 2009 Filing 611 MINUTES OF Settling Class Plaintiffs' motion for distribution of the net settlement fund upon the occurance of the effective date and for approval and distribution of attorneys' fees and expenses (fld 10-9-09) #582 before Judge Manuel L. Real:The Court hears arguments of counsel.The Court GRANTS the motion in such amounts and for reasonsas stated on the record.Parties shall submit a proposed order.The Court Orders that any remaining motions for attorney feesby any party shall be filed by February 1, 2010 and set forhearing on February 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (pj)
November 25, 2009 Filing 610 Response Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturm, Charles)
November 20, 2009 Filing 609 supplemental opposition in opposition re: MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
November 18, 2009 Filing 608 DECLARATION of ROBERT J. GAUDET, JR., in support of Opposition to Class Counsel's Time Sheets & Expenses #607 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (jp)
November 18, 2009 Filing 607 OPPOSITION to Class Counsel's Time Sheets & Expenses filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (jp)
November 16, 2009 Filing 606 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
November 13, 2009 Filing 605 DECLARATION of Darrel C. Menthe in support of MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-3 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-4 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-5 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-6 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-7 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-8 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-9 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Menthe Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution)(Menthe, Darrel)
November 13, 2009 Filing 604 DECLARATION of Rosemary M. Rivas in support of MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1.1 to Rivas Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2 to Rivas Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Rivas Declaration ISO Motion for Distribution)(Menthe, Darrel)
November 13, 2009 Filing 603 DECLARATION of Dan Drachler support MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (Menthe, Darrel)
November 13, 2009 Filing 602 UPDATE TO REQUESTS BY CLAIMANTS FOR REVEIW OF CLAIMS DETERMINATIONS re MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Allan Kretzmar, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Geoff Gazda, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Jor Law, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Bruce Susich, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Patrick Welch, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Paola Alvarez, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - James Renken, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Evan Catron, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Ori Blumenfeld, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Howard Wexler, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Ron Glasgow, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Luis Marchand, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Stormie Forte, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Chandra Bozelko, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Sheila Schwallie, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Thomas Hines, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 27 - Travis Hill, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 28 - Rose Hickman, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 29 - Thomas Houlihan, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 33 - Jennifer Whipple, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 34 - Laurie Nasky, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 35 - Kelly Pritt, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 36 - Lisa Siu Mendoza, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 37 - Rebecca Stegman, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 38 - Ximen Januszyk, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 40 - Gilbert Hain, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 42 - Debra Bernal, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 43 - Jeffrey Johnson, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 44 - Chad Barry, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 45 - Vanessa Jarvis, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 50 - Amos Jones, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 51 - Otu Obot, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 52 - Michael Veneziani, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 53 - Emily Chew)(Menthe, Darrel)
November 2, 2009 Filing 601 MINUTES OF Settling Class Plaintiffs' motion for distribution of the net settlement fund upon the occurance of the effective date and for approval and distribution of attorneys' fees and expenses Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court Orders counsel for Settling Class Plaintiffs to submit their time records for review by the Court by November 13, 2009.Any response by any other party to that submission shall be filed within 5 days thereafter. The matter is Ordered continued to December 7, 2009 at10:00 a.m. for hearing. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (ake)
October 29, 2009 Filing 600 REPLY Surreply in Opposition MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. (Palmer, Joseph)
October 26, 2009 Filing 599 OBJECTION opposition re: MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
October 26, 2009 Filing 598 REPLY support MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Sidney Kanazawa ISO McGuireWoods' Application for Award, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Dan Drachler ISO Zwerling Schachter's Application for Award, #3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas ISO Finkelstein Thompson's Application for Award)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 22, 2009 Filing 597 OPPOSITION to motion for attorneys fees and awards to some objectors #582 , #552 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan. (pj)
October 22, 2009 Filing 596 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 as to Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr.; Receipt Number: 124903, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
October 19, 2009 Filing 595 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. (Furman, Joshua)
October 19, 2009 Filing 594 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
October 19, 2009 Filing 593 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Palmer, Joseph)
October 19, 2009 Filing 592 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
October 15, 2009 Filing 591 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56314; (lr)
October 15, 2009 Filing 590 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 filed by Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56278; (lr)
October 12, 2009 Filing 589 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. correcting Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #585 (Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 11, 2009 Filing 588 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 13, 2009 at 10:10 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sandra L. Becerra, phone number /e-mail: VerbatimRecord@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/1/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2010. (Becerra, Sandra)
October 9, 2009 Filing 587 EXHIBIT Order to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 [Proposed] filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 9, 2009 Filing 586 REQUESTS BY CLAIMANTS FOR COURT REVIEW OF CLAIMS DETERMINATIONS re MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part Two, #2 Exhibit Part Three, #3 Exhibit Part Four, #4 Exhibit Part Five, #5 Exhibit Part Six, #6 Exhibit Part Seven, #7 Exhibit Part Eight, #8 Exhibit Part Nine, #9 Exhibit Part Ten, #10 Exhibit Part Eleven)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 9, 2009 Filing 585 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa in support of MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part Two, #2 Exhibit Part Three, #3 Exhibit Part Four)(Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 9, 2009 Filing 584 DECLARATION of Eric J. Miller in support of MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 9, 2009 Filing 583 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund #582 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
October 9, 2009 Filing 582 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed by Plaintiff Class Ryan Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Kanazawa, Sidney)
September 23, 2009 Filing 581 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 6/15/09, 7/13/09; Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56314; Re: #568 (Palmer, Joseph)
September 22, 2009 Filing 580 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr., re Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis #576 . (dmap)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: The court has considered the motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and the motion is DENIED, #576 .Attachments> (dmap)
September 18, 2009 Filing 578 OPPOSITION opposition re: MOTION to Appeal in forma pauperis #576 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
September 16, 2009 Filing 577 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56500, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #575 as to Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr.. (lr)
September 8, 2009 Filing 576 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr.. re Appeal #575 (lr)
September 8, 2009 Filing 575 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objecting Robert Gaudet, Jr.. Appeal of Order, Order Awarding Attorney Fees, #563 Filed On: 8/07/09; Entered On: 8/07/09; In Forma Pauperis Pending. (lr)
August 27, 2009 Filing 574 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 (Kendrick, J)
August 27, 2009 Filing 573 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 6/15/2009; 7/13/2009; Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56278; Re: #564 (Kendrick, J)
August 20, 2009 Filing 572 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 as to Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle; Receipt Number: 121579, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
August 18, 2009 Filing 571 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56314, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 as to Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, George Schneider, David Oriol. (cbr)
August 17, 2009 Filing 570 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #568 . (dmap)
August 17, 2009 Filing 569 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. correcting Notice (Other) #566 of Appeal (Palmer, Joseph)
August 17, 2009 Filing 568 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. Appeal of Order, Order Awarding Attorney Fees,,,, #563 . (Filing Fee NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Palmer, Joseph)
August 14, 2009 Filing 567 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56278, 9TH CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 as to Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (car)
August 14, 2009 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appeal filed by Objector Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Palmer, Joseph)
August 12, 2009 Filing 565 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #564 Filed On: 8/12/2009; Entered On: 8/12/2009; (Kendrick, J)
August 12, 2009 Filing 564 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Filing fee $455, receipt number 09730000000005726282.) (Kendrick, J)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING OBJECTORS APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Manuel L. Real: The fee applications of the Schneider/Head and Feldman Objectors are GRANTED in the amount of five percent (5%) of $325,000, or $16,250, allocated as follows: $8,125 to counsel for the Schneider/Head Objectors; and $8,125 to counsel for the Feldman Objectors. In all other respects, the various objectors' applications for the payment of attorneys' fees and costs are DENIED. #562 (ake)
August 6, 2009 Filing 562 NOTICE OF LODGING filed 8-6-2009 re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion Hearing,,,, #559 (Kendrick, J)
August 3, 2009 Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6-15-09 11:30 a.m. (ha)
August 2, 2009 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on June 15, 2009 at 11:30 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sandra L. Becerra, phone number /e-mail: Sandrabec@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2009. (Becerra, Sandra)
July 13, 2009 Filing 559 MINUTES OF HEARING ON OBJECTORS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The parties submit on their papers.The Court Orders attorneys fees in the amount of $8,125 tothe objecting parties represented by John William Davis and$8,125.00 to the objecting parties represented by C. BenjaminNutley, for a total award of $16,250. All other Objectorsrequests for attorney fees are denied, as stated on the record.Counsel shall submit proposed orders. #552 Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra. (ake)
July 10, 2009 Filing 558 REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION for Attorney Fees #552 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (pj)
July 6, 2009 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Objector Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. Re: Notice #556 (pj)
July 6, 2009 Filing 556 NOTICE TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (pj)
July 6, 2009 Filing 555 DECLARATION of C. Benjamin Nutley in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees 442 and in response to other objector's submissions filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
June 30, 2009 Filing 554 DECLARATION of Robert J. Gaudet, Jr. in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #552 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (mg)
June 30, 2009 Filing 553 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of MOTION for Fees #552 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (mg)
June 30, 2009 Filing 552 NOTICE OF MOTION for Fees filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (mg)
June 30, 2009 Filing 551 DECLARATION of C. Benjamin Nutley in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees 442 per order of June 15, 2009 filed by Objector Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. (Kendrick, J)
June 30, 2009 Filing 550 BRIEF filed by Objector Jennifer Brown McElroy. Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix, Daniel Schafer, David Oriol and Jason Tingle (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Darrell Palmer in Support of Time Record and related brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summary of Time, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Time Sheets)(Palmer, Joseph)
June 30, 2009 Filing 549 DECLARATION of Charles A. Sturm First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) #519 filed by Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturm, Charles)
June 29, 2009 Filing 548 DECLARATION of Steven F. Helfand in Support of Petition for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
June 29, 2009 Filing 547 DECLARATION of John W. Davis Pursuant to Order of June 15, 2009 Concerning Time Records filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (Davis, John)
June 28, 2009 Filing 546 NOTICE Notice of Filing Time Sheets filed by Plaintiff Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment: Time Sheets)(Furman, Joshua)
June 15, 2009 Filing 545 MINUTES OF Hearing on Mandate held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court orders the Mandate of the U.S.C.A. (9th Cir.) filed and spread upon the minutes of this Court. The Court orders that all Objectors claiming fees in this matter shall file by 6/30/2009 their attorney time sheets with time spent on their objections up to the time of the Settlement Hearings, with a hearing set on the matter of Objectors' attorney fees set for 7/13/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra. (rj)
June 12, 2009 Filing 544 NOTICE Appearance and Renewed Objections to Settlement filed by Plaintiff-Objector Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. (Furman, Joshua)
June 12, 2009 Filing 543 BRIEF filed by objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich. re proposals for addressing the mandate of the 9th Circuit on attorneys' fee issues regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, #534 . (Kendrick, J)
June 12, 2009 Filing 542 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fredricka Ung counsel for Intervenor Plaintiffs Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell, Nicholas D Mermiges, Intervenor Stephen Stetson.Fredricka Ung is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Intervenor Brian Schall (Ung, Fredricka)
June 12, 2009 Filing 541 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: docket entry should 1) have text describing the action being taken, 2) list the party the filing attorney represents and 3) Judges' initials should appear as part of the case number on the filed document RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #540 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
June 11, 2009 Filing 540 (Ung, Fredricka)
June 11, 2009 Filing 539 BRIEF filed by Objector Sarah Siegel. Evans & Mullinix, P.A., Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel Schafer, David Oriol and Jason Tingle for the Mandate Hearing on June 15, 2009 (Palmer, Joseph)
June 9, 2009 Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance (Rivas, Rosemary)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, CCA # 07-56643, 07-56833, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651,. The following parties filed motion to transfer consideration of attorneys' fees on appeal to the district court: Scheider-Head Appellants(George Schnedier, Jonathan M. Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, and Ryan Helfrich); Feldman Appellants(David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, and Greg Thomas); Pamela Collins, Appellant; and Settling Plaintiffs - Appellees. No oppostion to the moitons was received. The motions to transfer consideration of attorneys' fees on appeal to the district court are GRANTED. Order received in this district on 6/08/09. (lr)
May 29, 2009 Filing 535 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Dan Drachler counsel for Plaintiff Lorraine Rimson. Adding Dan Drachler as attorney as counsel of record for Lorraine Rimson for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Attorney Dan Drachler (Drachler, Dan)
May 28, 2009 Filing 534 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court hereby sets a hearing on the Mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit Affirming the approval of the class settlement, and Reversing and Remanding the issue of the award of attorney's fees to class counsel, and denial of fees to objectors' counsel, on JUNE 15, 2009 AT 11:00 A.M. #533 . (mg)
May 20, 2009 Filing 536 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1 thru 22; Sealed Documents(s): 68; Transcripts(s): 5; and 2 Brown folders RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) #529 (cbr)
May 15, 2009 Filing 533 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #462 , #456 , #452 , #450 , #453 , #451 , #455 , #494 , CCA # 07-56643, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651, 07-56833. The decision of the District Court is Affirmed in part, Reversed and Remanded in Part. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. Mandate received in this district on 05/15/09. (cbr)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, CCA # 07-56643, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56645, 07-56651, 07-56650, 07-56649, 07-56833. The parties are requested to meet and confer, and to submit to the clerk in advance of oral argument, a schedule allocating time among counsel. Order received in this district on 2/23/09. (lr)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING Claim Form submitted by Plaintiff, received on 2/10/09 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case closed and is on appeal; last day to submit claim form was 9/17/09. (mg)
January 23, 2009 Filing 530 APPEAL RECORD sealed documents sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 07-56643. 67 documents were sent with this transmittal. See Document for the List. Re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 (lr)
January 23, 2009 Filing 529 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 07-56643 Record consists of 22 volumes, 3 Brown Folders: B0150, B0279, B0371; 5 transcripts re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 (lr)
May 23, 2008 Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 7/9/07 Court Reporter: Sheri S. Kleeger. (bem, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real,Having read and considered the papers submitted in support of and in opposition to the Ex Parte Application, the Court DENIES the Ex Parte Application. (pj)
April 10, 2008 Filing 526 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Non-Party Stetson Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Document 519))(Gilhooly, Heather)
April 7, 2008 Filing 525 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: "Plaintiffs'-in-intervention" Stetson etc's (from Case # CV-08-810-R) First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order #519 . The Court DENIES the Ex Parte Application. Defendants shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. (jp)
March 27, 2008 Filing 524 REPLY In Support of CONDITIONAL EX PARTE APPLICATION OF STETSON PLAINTIFFS TO INTERVENE AND TO MODIFY THE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Intervenor Stephen Stetson. (Ung, Fredricka)
March 26, 2008 Filing 523 REPLY in support of First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) #519 filed by Intervenor Stephen Stetson. (Ung, Fredricka)
March 26, 2008 Filing 522 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) #519 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather H. Gilhooly In Suppport of West Publishing Corporation's Opposition to Stetson Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order)(Gilhooly, Heather)
March 26, 2008 Filing 521 DECLARATION of Eliot G. Disner re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) #519 filed by Intervenor Stephen Stetson. (Ung, Fredricka)
March 26, 2008 Filing 520 OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) #519 by Plaintiffs and Class Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Menthe, Darrel)
March 25, 2008 Filing 519 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order (Conditional) filed by Intervenor Stephen Stetson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka)
February 8, 2008 Filing 518 APPEAL FEE PAID: 9th CCA 07-56651 re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 as to Movant Pamela Collins Dunmore; Receipt Number: 104211, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr) Modified on 2/14/2008 (lr, ).
January 23, 2008 Filing 514 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David Zelenski counsel for Objector David Harris. Changing e-mail to aharris@harrisandruble.com. Adding Alan Harris as attorney as counsel of record for David Harris for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Objector David Harris (Zelenski, David)
January 23, 2008 Filing 513 NOTICE Errata to Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Objector David Harris. (Zelenski, David)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman,, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, CCA # 07-56643, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651. The Order The Order These appeals have been consolidated. On December 3, 2007, this court advised appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 that the filing and docketing fees for those appeals remained due. On December 17, 2007, appellants in appeal No. 07-56650 advise the court that the filing and docketing fees had been paid. However, a review of the district court docket does not reflect that the fes have in fact been paid. In addition, appellants in appeal No. 07-56651 have neither paid the fees, nor filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, nor otherwise responded to the court's order to show cause. Appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 shall have one final opportunity to comply with the court's December 3, 2007 order. Within 14 days from the filing date of this order appellants shall pay to the district court the $455.00 filing and docketing fees for these appeals and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis shall result in the automatic dismissal of appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. The Clerk shall re-serve a Form 4 financial affidavit on appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651. The briefing schedule previuosly established remains in effect. Order received in this district on 1/23/2008. (lr)
January 17, 2008 Filing 515 DUPLICATE ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 filed by Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Evans & Mullinix PA, Sarah Siegel, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, CCA # 07-56643, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651. The Order These appeals have been consolidated. On December 3, 2007, this court advised appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 that the filing and docketing fees for those appeals remained due. On December 17, 2007, appellants in appeal No. 07-56650 advise the court that the filing and docketing fees had been paid. However, a review of the district court docket does not reflect that the fes have in fact been paid. In addition, appellants in appeal No. 07-56651 have neither paid the fees, nor filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, nor otherwise responded to the court's order to show cause. Appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 shall have one final opportunity to comply with the court's December 3, 2007 order. Within 14 days from the filing date of this order appellants shall pay to the district court the $455.00 filing and docketing fees for these appeals and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis shall result in the automatic dismissal of appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. The Clerk shall re-serve a Form 4 financial affidavit on appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651. The briefing schedule previuosly established remains in effect. Order received in this district on 1/23/08. (lr) Modified on 1/24/2008 (lr, ).
January 15, 2008 Filing 512 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David Zelenski counsel for Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. Changing e-mail to aharris@harrisandruble.com. Adding Alan Harris as attorney as counsel of record for Ryan Rodrigues, Reena Frailich for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez (Zelenski, David)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Manuel L. Real> The Notice of change of attorney information received 1/7/08, is not to be filed but instead, rejected and is ordered returned to counsel. This case is designated an e-filing case pursuant to General Order 07-08. (shb)
January 4, 2008 Filing 510 SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
January 3, 2008 Filing 509 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez re #461 , #462 , #456 , #452 , #450 , #453 , #451 , #489 , #455 , #494 (Evans-Moyer, Tracy)
December 20, 2007 Filing 508 RESPONSE to Designation of Reporter's Transcript on Appeal filed by Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc to Designation of Record on Appeal, #506 (vh)
December 20, 2007 Filing 507 NOTICE OF RULING ON "PLAINTIFFS-IN-INTERVENTION", BRIAN SCHALL, ET AL'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBTAIN DOCUMENTS FROM THIS CASE CURRENTLY IN THE POSSESSION OF MCGUIRE WOODS LLP filed by Plaintiffs in intervention Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell, Nicholas D Mermiges. (shb)
December 18, 2007 Filing 499 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the image was not attached to the docket entry. (dmap)
December 17, 2007 Filing 501 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: DENYING AS MOOT MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles 474 Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (shb)
December 14, 2007 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 07-56650; (car)
December 13, 2007 Filing 506 JOINT DESIGNATION OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS BY UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS/OBJECTORS EVANS AND MULLINIX, P. A., SARAH SIEGEL, JENIFER BROWN MCELROY, AND DANIEL SCHAFER on Appeal by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA re #489 (lr)
December 13, 2007 Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: NONE REQUESTED; Court of Appeals Case Number: 07-56650; Re: #456 (car)
December 13, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 (car)
December 13, 2007 Filing 495 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION form issued regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 as to Objecting Class Members George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. (car)
December 12, 2007 Filing 500 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #494 ; Receipt Number: 102574 in the amount of $455. (dmap)
December 12, 2007 Filing 498 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56650 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #494 #(dmap)
December 10, 2007 Filing 505 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs-in-Intervention Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell, Nicholas D Mermiges, re Response in Opposition to Motion 502 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 504 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 503 served on 12/10/07. (shb)
December 10, 2007 Filing 504 PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERVENTION'S REPLY RE DEFENDANT KAPLAN, INC'S OPPOTITION TO MOTION to MODIFY Protective Order 58 474 ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ELIOT G DISNER filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell, Nicholas D Mermiges. (shb)
December 10, 2007 Filing 503 PLAINTIFFS-IN-INTERVEMTION'S REPLY BRIEF TO MCGUIREWOODS, LLP'S PLAINTIFF'S REENA B FRALICH, JENNIFER BRAZEAL, KARI BREWER AND LORRAINE RIMSON'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to MODIFY Stipulation and Order, Protective Order 58 MOTION to MODIFY Stipulation and Order, Protective Order 58 474 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Brian Schall, Anand L Daniell, Nicholas D Mermiges. (shb)
December 10, 2007 Filing 502 Plaintiffs-in-Intervention's REPLY BRIEF to West Publishing Corporation's OPPOSITION to MOTION to MODIFY Stipulation and Order, Protective Order 58 MOTION to MODIFY Stipulation and Order, Protective Order 58 474 . (shb)
December 7, 2007 Filing 494 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objecting Class MembersGeorge Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. Appeal of Order #471 Filed On: 11/8/07; Entered On: 11/8/07; Filing fee $455, PAID; receipt number 102499. cc: J. Garrett Kendrick, Heather H. Gilhooly. (car) Modified on 12/13/2007 (car, ).
December 3, 2007 Filing 493 DEFENDANT WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION to Motion to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Documents Currently in the Possession of McGuire Woods LLP in Los Angeles, Declaration of Heather H. Gilhool, re 58 , 474 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (vh)
December 3, 2007 Filing 492 KAPLAN, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO "Plaintiffs-In-Interventions" Motion to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order", re 58 474 filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (vh)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek, Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman, CCA # 07-56643, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651. The court sua sponte consolidates these appeals. Appeal Nos. 07-56643, 07-56645, 07-56646, 07-56647, 07-56649, 07-56650, 07-56651 are consolidated. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 are remain due. Within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appealants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 shall pay to the district court the $455.00 filing and docketing fes for these appeals and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed informa pauperis. Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed informa pauperis shall result in the automatic dismissal of appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651 by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. The clerk shall serve a form 4 financial affidavit on appellants in appeal Nos. 07-56650 and 07-56651. The following briefing schedule shall govern these consolidated appeals: Appellants shall designate the reporter's transcript by December 13, 2007. The trnscripts is due January 14, 2008. The opening briefs and excerpts of record are due February 24, 2008; the answering briefs are due March 26, 2008; and the optional reply briefs are due wihtin 14 days after service of the answering briefs. All parties on a side are encourage to join in a single brief to the greatest extend practicable. Order received in this district on 12/06/07. (lr)
December 3, 2007 Filing 490 Plaintiffs Reena B. Frailich, Jennifer Brazeal, Kari Brewer and Lorraine Rimson's MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Modify the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from This Case Currently in Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles, re 58 , 474 filed by Class Counsel. (vh)
November 30, 2007 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 10/22/07 Court Reporter: Bridget R. Montero. (bem, )
November 27, 2007 Filing 517 Mail Returned addressed to Andrew H. Gilman re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 (lr) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2008 (lr, ).
November 21, 2007 Filing 489 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Evans & Mullinix P.A., Sarah Siegel, Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed on: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #431 , Filed n: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #433 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/12 /07. cc: Joseph Darrell Palmer; Kenneth E. Nelson, Edward F. Siegel, Sidney K. Kanazwa, Steven Molo, Heather H Gilhooly, Stuart N. Senator, Carmine Giardino, Robert C. Chojnacki, Jon M. Zimmerman, Joshua R. Furman, Alan Harris, Charels A. Sturm, Ronald D. Rosengarten, David P. Schafer, C. Benjamin Nutley, John W. Davis, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long, Robert L. Arelo, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Daniel Scott Brown, Office of the Clerk James R. Browning Courthouse, United States Court of Appeals. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 487 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56651, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 filed by Pamela Collins Dunmore. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 486 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56650, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,,, #456 filed by Elizabeth De Long, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Andrea Boggio. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 485 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56645, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Rachel Schwartz, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Emily Grant, Cameron Gharabiklou, David Feldman. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 484 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56647, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 filed by Richard P Le Blanc, III, Audrey Juranek, James Juranek. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 483 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56646, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 filed by Jason Tingle, David Oriol, Oliver Guiterrez. (lr)
November 20, 2007 Filing 482 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-56643, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 filed by Justin Head, James Puntumapanitch, George Schneider, Ryan Helfrich, Jonathan M Slomba. (lr)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 481 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles by Judge Manuel L. Real: re MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles 58 474 . IT IS ORDERED that the Motion shall be continued to 12/17/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. The deadline for filing and service of any opposition to the Motion shall be December 3, 2007. The deadline for filing and service of any reply shall ve December 10, 2007. (shb)
November 13, 2007 Filing 480 PROOF OF SERVICE re Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court 477 , Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court 479 , Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court 478 served on 11/13/07 filed by Class Counsel. (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 479 NOTICE of Entry of Order Denying Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Schneider/Head Objectors, re: Order #471 , filed by Class Counsel (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 478 NOTICE of Entry of Order Denying Joint Request for Attorney Fees for Counsel for Unnamed Class Members/Objectors Evans, Siegel, Brown and Schafer, re: Order #472 , filed by Class Counsel (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 477 NOTICE of Entry of Order Denying Award of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas, re: Order #470 , filed by Class Counsel (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 476 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE re: (1)Plaintiffs-In-Interventions' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles; Declaration of Eliot G. Disner, (2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs-In-Interventions' MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles; Declaration of Eliot G. Disner; (3) [PROPOSED] Amended Protective Order; (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) filed by Plaintiffs-in-Interventions served on 11/9/07. (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 475 PROOF OF SERVICE re (1)Plaintiffs-In-Interventions' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles; (2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs-In-Interventions' MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles; Declaration of Eliot G. Disner; (3) [PROPOSED] Amended Protective Order; (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) filed by Plaintiffs-in-Interventions served on 11/24/07. (vh)
November 13, 2007 Filing 474 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY the Stipulation and Protective Order and Obtain Documents from this Case Currently in the Possession of McGuireWoods LLP in Los Angeles; Declaration of Eliot g. Disner 58 filed by Plaintiffs-in-Interventions Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged Order. (vh)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real DENYING JOINT REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel for unnamed Class Members/Objectors Evans, Siegel, Brown and Schafer 443 (shb)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real DENYING MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich 442 (shb)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real DENYING MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas 436 (shb)
November 7, 2007 Filing 473 PROOF OF SERVICE re Order #472 , Order #470 , Order #471 served on 11/7/07. Lodged Orders(vh)
November 5, 2007 Filing 466 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, Objectors Feldman et al's motion for award of attorney fees;Objectors Evans & Mullinix et al's motion for attorney fees;Objectors Schneider et al's motion for award of attorney's fees; The Court DENIES each of the above-listed motions. Plaintiff shall prepare a proposed order. 443 , 442 , 436 Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
November 2, 2007 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 ; Receipt Number: 101417 in the amount of $455. (car)
November 1, 2007 Filing 468 NOTICE OF ABSENCE OF COUNSEL ( Eliot G. Disner, attorney for Objecting Lead Plaintiffs, will not attend 11/5/07 10:00 am hearing) filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Lorendana Nesci. (vh)
November 1, 2007 Filing 467 NOTICE of RULING Regarding Unnamed Class Members Motion for Additonal Findings of Fact re: Order #457 , filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (vh)
October 31, 2007 Filing 465 JOINT REPLY in support of REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel for unnamed Class Members/Objectors Evans, Siegel, Brown and Schafer 443 filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA. (shb)
October 30, 2007 Filing 463 REPLY to Settling Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to the Feldman Objectors' MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses 436 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (vh)
October 30, 2007 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 ; Receipt Number: 101272 in the amount of $455. (cbr)
October 30, 2007 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 as to Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III; Receipt Number: 101285 in the amount of $455. (car)
October 30, 2007 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 as to Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, George Schneider, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich; Receipt Number: 101107 in the amount of $455. (car) Modified on 10/30/2007 (car, ).
October 29, 2007 Filing 469 DECLARATION of C. Benjamin Nutley in Support of Fee Application (Schneider/Head) filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, George Schneider. (vh)
October 29, 2007 Filing 464 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF Application for Award of Attorney Fees 442 filed by Objectors George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. (vh)
October 26, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #462 (lr)
October 26, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #461 (lr)
October 24, 2007 Filing 462 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by Objector Pamela Collins Dunmore. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/17; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #430 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Daniel Scott Brown; Eliot G. Disner, Steven F. Molo, Bradley S. Phillips, Charles A. Sturm; Sidney K. Kanazawa, Dan Dracher, Christine Bartholomew, Edward A. Klein, Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Robert c. Chojnacki, John W. Davis, Steven F. Helfand, Joseph J. Angersola, Anthony Valach, Joan Elizabeth Shreffler, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long, Andrea Boggio, J. Garrett Kendrick, Carmine Giardino, Douglas N. Silverstein, Joshua R. Furman, Jon M. Zimmerman, Lawrence W. Schonbrun, Robert L. Arelo, Darrell Palmer, David P. Schafer, Kenneth E. Nelson, Edward F. Siegel, Andrew H. Gilman, Stepen M. Vasil, Alan Harris, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Craig J. Walenta, Richard A. Bodner, L. Kendall Satterfield, Robert Schachter.Appellant & Appellee (lr)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real DENYING MOTION for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) 441 (shb)
October 23, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #456 (lr)
October 22, 2007 Filing 460 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition to THE FELDMAN OBJECTORS MOTION for Attorney Fees; THE SCHNEIDER/HEAD OBJECTORS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND THE EVANS, SIEGEL, BROWN AND SCHAFFFER OBJECTORS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES 442 , 443 filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (shb) Modified on 10/25/2007 (shb, ).
October 22, 2007 Filing 459 DEFENDANTS WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION AND KAPLAN INC'S JOINT OPPOSITION to OBJECTORS' MOTIONS for Attorney Fees 442 , 443 ; DECLARATION OF HEATHER H GILHOOLY filed by Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (shb)
October 22, 2007 Filing 458 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real : RE: Unnamed class members Juarek et al's MOTION for Order for for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) 441 The Court hears argument of counsel. The Court DENIES the motion.Plaintiff shall submit a proposed order.Court Reporter: Bridget Montero.(wh)
October 18, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #455 (lr)
October 17, 2007 Filing 461 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case, #432 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #430 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; cc: Charles A. Sturm; Sidney K. Kanazawa, Eliot G. Disner, Dan Dracher, Christine Bartholomew, Bradley S. Phillips, Steven F. Molo, Edward A. Klein, Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Robert c. Chojnacki, John W. Davis, Steven F. Helfand, Joseph J. Angersola, Anthony Valach, Joan Elizabeth Shreffler, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long, Andrea Boggio, J. Garrett Kendrick, Carmine Giardino, Douglas N. Silverstein, Joshua R. Furman, Jon M. Zimmerman, Lawrence W. Schonbrun, Robert L. Arelo, Darrell Palmer, David P. Schafer, Kenneth E. Nelson, Edward F. Siegel, Andrew H. Gilman, Stepen M. Vasil, Alan Harris, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Craig J. Walenta, Richard A. Bodner, L. Kendall Satterfield, Robert Schachter. (lr)
October 17, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #453 (lr)
October 17, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 (lr)
October 17, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 (lr)
October 15, 2007 Filing 454 RESPONSE of Objecting Plaintiffs to MOTION for Award Attorney Fees for (Schneider/Head Objectors) 442 ; REQUEST for Fees; Declaration of Eliot G Disner filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci. (ad)
October 15, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #450 (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 456 NOTICE OF APPEAL OF OBJECTING CLASS MEMBERS ROBERT GAUDET, JR.; ANDREA BOGGIO; SANDEEP GOPALAN; ELIZABETH DE LONG To 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, Terminated Case, #432 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #433 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/12/07; Order, #430 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan; Steven F. Molo, Bradley S. Phillips, Edward A. Klein, Sidney K. Kanazawa, Dan Drachler, L. Kendall Satterfield, Robert Schachter, Christine P. Bartholomew, Eliot G. Disner, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez, Robert C. Chojnacki, Robert L. Arleo, John William Davis, Steven F. Helfand, Joshua R. Furman, Jon M. Zimmerman, Carmine Giardino, Douglas N. Silverstein, Kenneth E. Nelson, Alan Harris, J. Garrett Kendrick, Joseph Darrell Palmer, Ronald D. Rosegarten, Lawrence W. Schonbrun, Edward F. Siegel, Joseph J. Angersola, Richard A. Bodmer, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Andrew H. Gilman David P. Schafer, Joan Elizabeth Shreffler, Anthony Valach, Stephen M. Vasil, Jay M. Wolman, Joseph J. Argensola, Craig J. Walenta, Charles A. Sturm. (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 455 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL BY UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS/OBJECTORS EVANS AND MULLINIX, P. A., SARAH SIEGEL, JENNIFER BROWN MCELROY, AND DANIEL SCHAFER to 9th CCA filed by Objectors/AppellantsJennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #431 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, Terminated Case, #432 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #430 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #433 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/12/07 ; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Joseph Darrell Palmer; Sidney K. Kanazwa, Steven Molo, Heather H Gilhooly, Stuart N. Senator, Carmine Giardino, Robert C. Chojnacki, Jon M. Zimmerman, Joshua R. Furman, Alan Harris, Charels A. Sturm, Ronald D. Rosengarten, David P. Schafer, C. Benjamin Nutley, John W. Davis, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long, Robert L. Arelo, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Daniel Scott Brown. (lr) Modified on 10/18/2007 (lr, ).
October 10, 2007 Filing 453 UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDREY JURANEK, AND RICHARD P. LE BLANCS NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by Objectors/Appellants James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case, #432 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Charles A. Sturm; Sidney K. Kanazawa, Eliot G. Disner, Dan Dracher, Christine Bartholomew, Bradley S. Phillips, Steven F. Molo, Edward A. Klein, Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Robert c. Chojnacki, John W. Davis, Steven F. Helfand, Joseph J. Angersola, Anthony Valach, Joan Elizabeth Shreffler, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long, Andrea Boggio, J. Garrett Kendrick, Carmine Giardino, Douglas N. Silverstein, Joshua R. Furman, Jon M. Zimmerman, Lawrence W. Schonbrun, Robert L. Arelo, Darrell Palmer, David P. Schafer, Kenneth E. Nelson, Edward F. Siegel, Andrew H. Gilman, Stepen M. Vasil, Alan Harris, Pamela Collins Dunmore, Craig J. Walenta, Richard A. Bodner, L. Kendall Satterfield, Robert Schachter. (lr)
October 10, 2007 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Objectors/Appellants Oliver Guiterrez, David Oriol, Jason Tingle forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #452 (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 452 UNNAMED CLASSMEMBERS AND OBJECTORS DAVID ORIOL, JASON TINGLE AND OLIVER GUITERREZS NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE NINTH CIRCUIT to 9th CCA filed by Objectors/Appellants Oliver Guiterrez, David Oriol, Jason Tingle. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case, #432 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Robert c. Chojnacki; Sidney K. Kanazawa, Steven F. Molo, Bradley S. Phillips. (lr)
October 10, 2007 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Objectors/Appellants David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 451 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by Objectors/Appellants David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #430 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given: Transcripts Designation Ordering Form; Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: Steven F. Helfand; Sidney K. Kanazawa, Steven F. Molo, Bradley S. Phillips. (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 450 NOTICE OF APPEAL(SCHNEIDER/HEAD OBJECTORS) to 9th CCA filed by Objectors George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. Appeal of Order, #429 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, #430 , Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Order, Terminated Case, #432 Filed On: 9/10/07; Entered On: 9/11/07; Forms Given Transcripts Designaiton Ordering Form Filing fee $ 455. Billed. cc: J. Garrett Kendrick; Robert C. Chojnacki, Anthony Valach, Carmine Giardino,Douglas N. Silverstein, Joshua R. Furman, Jon M Zimmerman, Lawrence W. Schonbrun, Stephen M. Vasil, John W. Davis, Stephen Lindholm, Andrea Boggio, Elizabeth DeLong, Sandeep Gopalan, Robert Gaudet, Jr., Joseph J. Angersola, Eliot Disner Darrell Palmer, Robert L. Arleo, David P. Schafer, Charles A. Sturm, Ronald D Rosengarten, Alan Harris, Joan E. Shreffler, Steve F. Helfand, Reena Frailich, Sidney M. Kanazawa, Heather H. Gilhooly, Steven F. Molo, Dan Drachler, Christine Bartholomew. (lr)
October 10, 2007 Filing 449 PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas, served on 10/10/2007. (pj)
October 9, 2007 Filing 448 CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDREY JURANEK, AND RICHARD P. LE BLANC'S REPLY TO SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL FINDINGS OF FACT UNDER FRCP 52(b), re MOTION for Order for for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) 441 filed by Objectors James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (vh)
October 3, 2007 Filing 447 DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDREY JURANEK, AND RICHARD P. LE BLANC FOR ADDITIONAL FINDINGS OF FACTS UNDER FRCP 52(B) re: MOTION for Order for for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) 441 , MOTION for Order for for discovery of claims data, objection to the affidavit of Richard Sartory, and in the alternative, motion to continue the fairness hearig until after the claim period has expired. 408 . (vh)
October 1, 2007 Filing 446 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re Declaration (Motion related) 445 , Response in Opposition to Motion, 444 served on 10/1/07. (shb)
October 1, 2007 Filing 445 DECLARATION of Richard L Sartory filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (shb)
October 1, 2007 Filing 444 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION to MOTION BY UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDREY JURANEK AND RICHARD P LE BLANK for for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) 441 filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (shb)
September 27, 2007 Filing 435 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Manuel L. Real : Unnamed class members Juranek et als motion for additional findings of fact is hereby ORDERED CONTINUED FROM OCTOBER 15, 2006 AT 10:00 A.M. TO OCTOBER 22, 2007 AT 10:00 A.M. Opposition papers remain due on OCTOBER 1, 2007, and the reply papers remain due on OCTOBER 9, 2007. The continuation of the hearing date DOES NOT move the due dates of those filings.(wh)
September 25, 2007 Filing 443 JOINT REQUEST for Attorney Fees For Counsel for unnamed Class Members/Objectors Evans, Siegel, Brown and Schafer filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Daniel M Schafer, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA.Request set for hearing on 11/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (shb)
September 25, 2007 Filing 442 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees filed by Objectors Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich, George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich.Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (shb)
September 24, 2007 Filing 440 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 437 , Declaration (Motion related) 438 , Declaration (Motion related) 439 , MOTION for Attorneys' Fees 436 served on 9/24/07. (shb)
September 24, 2007 Filing 439 DECLARATION of Steven F Helfand in support of MOTION for Attorneys' Fees 436 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (shb)
September 24, 2007 Filing 438 DECLARATION of John W Davis in support of MOTION for Attorneys' Fees 436 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (shb)
September 24, 2007 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION for Attorneys' Fees 436 filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas. (shb)
September 24, 2007 Filing 436 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas.Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (shb)
September 20, 2007 Filing 441 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for additional findings of fact under FRCP 52(b) filed by objector/movants James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III.Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (esa)
September 13, 2007 Filing 434 NOTICE OF RULING, filed by Class Counsel. (bho)
September 10, 2007 Filing 433 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Manuel L. Real.(bg)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court grants Plaintffs MOTION for Order granting approval of class action settlement 271 , The court denies Plaintiffs MOTION for awards to class plaintiffs 275 , The Court grants Class Counsel's MOTION for Attorney Fees And Reimbursement of Expenses 278 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(bg)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER DENYING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES by Judge Manuel L. Real, The application for incentive awards for class representatives is DENIED.(bg)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER Granting Class Counsel Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Judge Manuel L. Real,the Court hereby awards Class Counsel: (1) their lodestar on the effective date enhanced by a multiplier of 1.75, but not to exceed twenty-five percent of the Gross Settlement Fund on the effective date; and (2) reimbursement of their expenses as of the effective date. This award shall be paid from the Gross Settlement Fund in accordance with the terms of the Settlement and pursuant to an order of the Court.(bg)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 429 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, Objections to the Settlement - The Objections to the Settlement are overruled. Incorporation of Definitions - This Final Order and Judgment Approving Settlement incorporates by reference the definitoins in the Settlement Agreement, and all defined terms used herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement.(bg)
August 27, 2007 Filing 428 OBJECTION OF OBJECTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS TO [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT AND LAW filed by Plaintiffs Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (shb)
August 2, 2007 Filing 427 OBJECTIONS to [Proposed] order awarding attorneys fees and [Proposed] final order and judgment filed by Objectors George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch, Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. (ca)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING joint request for ruling on joint request of Evans & Mullins, Sarah Siegel and Jennifer Brown for attorney fees submitted by Objector Evans & Mullinix PA received on 7/27/07 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: not parties to action.(lc)
July 25, 2007 Filing 425 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs' Ryan Rodriguez, Orders for final approval of class settlement, incentive awards and award of attorneys' fees and expenses served on 7/25/07. (bp)
July 23, 2007 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Disbursed $38,339.00 from the registry of the Court to John Francis Carroll Esq. (npo)
July 9, 2007 Filing 411 SUPPLEMENT OBJECTIONS TO INCENTIVE FEES filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (yc)
July 9, 2007 Filing 399 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, RE: MOTION for Attorney Fees 278 is GRANTED, MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 is DENIED, MOTION for Order for granting approval of class action settlement 271 is GRANTED Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger.(yc)
July 6, 2007 Filing 410 RESPONSE TO THE PARTIS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDNG CY PRES DISTRUTION. filed by Objector James Juranek. (yc)
July 6, 2007 Filing 409 SUPPLEMENT OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL FILING BY PLAINTIFF RE: CONFLICT OF INTEREST. filed by Objector George Schneider. (yc)
July 6, 2007 Filing 408 UNNAMED CLASS MEMBERS JAMES JURANEK, AUDRDY JURANEK, AND RICHARD P. LEBLANC'S EMERGENCY MOTION for discovery of claims data, objection to the affidavit of Richard Sartory, and in the alternative, motion to continue the fairness hearig until after the claim period has expired. filed by objector James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III.Motion set for hearing on 7/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (yc)
July 5, 2007 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE regarding defendant West publishing co's violation of section 2 of the Sherman Act. (yc) (kag).
July 5, 2007 Filing 403 RE-NOTICE of Appearance OF COUNSEL filed by attorney Eliot G Disner, Sidney K Kanazawa on behalf of Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci (yc)
June 29, 2007 Filing 405 SUPPLEMENT filed by Objectors Oliver Guiterrez, David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Greg Thomas. (yc)
June 27, 2007 Filing 423 Response to June 18 Order; joint supplement to objections; request for attorney fees; and notice of intent to appear; filed by Objectors Jennifer Brown McElroy, Sarah Siegel, Evans & Mullinix PA; Motion Hearing #350 , MOTION for Attorney Fees 278 , MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs 275 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 424 Settling plaintiffs' SUPPLEMENTAL briefing in support of Motion for final approval re: 30% distribution limit to authorized claimants and Cy Pres fund for remainder; Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa; filed by plaintiffs (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 422 SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum in support of granting incentive awards to class representatives Jennifer Brazeal, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, and Ryan Rodriguez; filed by Plaintiffs; Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings #350 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 , Declaration (non-motion) 418 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 421 Class representatives Brewer's and Rimson's supplemental brief in support of application for incentive awards [Declarations of Brewer and Rimson filed herewith]; filed by Plaintiffs; Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, #350 , Declaration (non-motion) 418 , Declaration (non-motion) 417 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 420 DECLARATION of Lisa Gintz; filed by Plaintiff; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , Declaration (non-motion) 418 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 419 DECLARATION of Ryan Rodriguez; filed by Plaintiffs; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , Statement (Motion related) 345 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 418 DECLARATION of Jennifer Y. Brazeal in support of application for incentive awards; filed by Plaintiff; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 , Declaration (non-motion) 416 ; see documents for further details(ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 417 DECLARATION of Reena B. Frailich in support of application for incentive awards; filed by Plaintiff; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , Statement (Motion related) 345 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 ; see documents for further details(ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 416 DECLARATION of Lorraine Rimson in support of application for incentive award; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , Statement (Motion related) 345 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 ; see documents for further details. (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 415 DECLARATION of Loredana Nesci; filed by plaintiffs; Reply (Motion related) 365 , Declaration (non-motion) 414 , Reply (Motion related) 364 ; see documents for further details (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 414 DECLARATION of Kari Grantham Brewer in support of supplemental brief for incentive awards; filed by Plaintiff; Supplement (non-motion) 401 (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 413 Supplemental DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa in further support of MOTION for Incentive Awards to class plaintiffs; filed by Plaintiff; MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Richard L. Sartory; filed by Plaintiff; MOTION for Order for discovery of claims data, objection to the affidavit of Richard Sartory, and in the alternative, motion to continue the fairness hearing until after the claim period has expired. 408 (ear)
June 26, 2007 Filing 406 SEALED DOCUMENT SUPPLEMENT CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. (yc) (kag).
June 26, 2007 Filing 404 PROOF OF SERVICE of Declaration of Richard L. Sartory 362 , Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa 363 , Declaration of Loredana Nesci served on 06/26/07, filed by Class Counsel. See document for further details. (yca)
June 26, 2007 Filing 402 DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor regarding Publicity of Named Class Representatives' Objections to Proposed Settlement, filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yca)
June 26, 2007 Filing 401 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF regarding Approval of Proposed Settlement; Declaration of Stuart N. Senator, filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yca)
June 26, 2007 Filing 400 Robert Gaudet, Jr.; Andrea Boggio; Sandeep Gopalan; and Elizabeth De Long's SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS to Proposed Final Settlement, filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (yca)
June 22, 2007 Filing 367 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, document #364 was docketed twice - as #364 and #365. The correct document number is #364. 364 365 . (ib)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER on application of non-resident attorney Kenneth E. Nelson by Judge Manuel L. Real, on behalf of plaintiff Evans & Mullinix, designation of Darrell Palmer IS GRANTED. (yc)
June 18, 2007 Filing 398 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert L Arleo for attorney Emily M Greer to appear on behalf of Objectors Nikki Love, John Bernitz. (ad)
June 18, 2007 Filing 395 SEALED DOCUMENT - CONFIDENTIAL HARRIS EVIDENTIARY DECLARATION in support of Objections to Proposed Settlement. (ad) (kag).
June 18, 2007 Filing 394 SEALED DOCUMENT - CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Objections to Proposed Settlement. (ad) (kag).
June 18, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Robert L Arleo is 518-751-1801. (ib)
June 18, 2007 Filing 389 RESPONSE of Plaintiff-Objectors Nikki Love and John Bernitz to aggregate arguments advanced by settling Plaintiffs in support of final approval of class action settlement, filed by plaintiff-objectors Nikki Love and John Bernitz. (ib)
June 18, 2007 Filing 388 DECLARATION of James P. Tallon regarding the Class Action Fairness Act filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (ib)
June 18, 2007 Filing 351 NOTICE of deposit of funds filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. DEPOSITED CHECK FOR 12,377 W/FISCAL(yc)
June 18, 2007 Filing 350 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real; The court orders by 6/26/2007, plaintiff counsle to file documentationa sa to the computation of incentive awards to class representatives using the lodestar approach, and for both parties to brief by cy pres aspect of the settlement, as stated on the record. The matter is continuted to 7/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger.(yc)
June 15, 2007 Filing 393 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Lee S Taylor Authenticating and Attaching Documents. (ad) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2015: #1 Document 393 Part 2) (kag).
June 15, 2007 Filing 392 DECLARATION of Lee S Taylor Authenticating and Attaching Documents filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. [PUBLIC VERSION] (ad) Modified on 6/26/2007 (ad, ).
June 15, 2007 Filing 391 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (ad)
June 15, 2007 Filing 387 NOTICE of filing of REVISED DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor in support of MOTION for final approval of settlement 271 , regarding Kaplan's compliance with the requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 15, 2007 Filing 386 REVISED DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor in support of MOTION for final approval of settlement 271 , regarding Kaplan's compliance with the requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 385 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real re certain class members' attorney in connection with the stipulation and protective order dated 1/13/06.(ib)
June 15, 2007 Filing 384 DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor in support of MOTION for Order for final approval of class action settlement 271 , regarding Kaplan's compliance with the requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 15, 2007 Filing 383 NOTICE of filing of declaration of Lee S. Taylorin support of motion for final approval of settlement, regarding Kaplan's compliance with the requirements of the class action Fairness Act filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 15, 2007 Filing 382 RESPONSE of Plaintiff-Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange to "Settling Plaintiffs'" Reply Memorandum in support of final approval of class action settlement. (ib)
June 15, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Daniel Scott Brown is 352-338-1578. (ak)
June 15, 2007 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Scott Brown on behalf of Movant Pamela Collins Dunmore (ak)
June 15, 2007 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $12,377.00 into the registry of the Court from Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (ek)
June 14, 2007 Filing 397 APPLICATION of Kenneth E. Nelson for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by plaintiff Evans & Mullinix PA. Lodged Proposed Order. (ca)
June 14, 2007 Filing 396 DECLARATION of Robert Gaudet, JR in support MOTION to Unseal Document 378 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (yc)
June 14, 2007 FAX number for Objector Elizabeth De Long is 401-232-6319. (ib)
June 14, 2007 FAX number for Objector Sandeep Gopalan is 401-232-6319. (ib)
June 14, 2007 FAX NUMBER for Objector Angrea Boggio is 401-232-6319. (ib)
June 14, 2007 FAX number for objector Robert Gaudet, Jr. is 401-232-6319. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 381 NOTICE OF LODGING in support of notice of intention to appear at the final settlement hearing and objections of class members Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long to proposed class action settlement, filed by objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 380 Defendants' OBJECTIONS to Class Member Objectors Gaudet, Boggio, Gopalan and Delong's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to shorten time 376 filed by Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 379 Notice of Intention to Appear at the Final Settlement Hearing and Objections of Class Members Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long to Proposed Class Action Settlement. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 378 MOTION (proposed) to Unseal Class Certification Briefs, Summary Judgment Briefs and Expert Reports, filed by objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 377 DECLARATION of Robert Gaudet, Jr. in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to shorten time to bring motion to unseal class certification briefs, summary judgment briefs, and expert reports and to delay date of proposed settlement hearing 376 filed by Objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan, Elizabeth De Long. (ib)
June 14, 2007 Filing 376 EX PARTE APPLICATION to shorten time to bring motion to unseal class certification briefs, summary judgment briefs, and expert reports and to delay date of proposed settlement hearing, filed by objectors Robert Gaudet, Jr., Andrea Boggio, Sandeep Gopalan and Elizabeth De Long, all in pro se.(ib)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER ON APPLICATON OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY HOWARD L. STEELE, JR TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE, by Judge Manuel L. Real, on behalf of plaintiff James Juranek and Audrey Juranek, et al designated Ronald D. Rosengarten.(yc)
June 13, 2007 Filing 375 APPLICATION of non-resident attorney Howard L. Steele, Jr. to appear for plaintiffs James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, et al. Lodged proposed order. (ib)
June 13, 2007 Filing 346 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court orders Eliot Desner of Disner Law Corp.'s Ex Parte Application to Permit Lead Counsel to Speak Freely, etc. 304 denied, as stated on the record. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger.(gk)
June 11, 2007 Filing 390 COMBINED RESPONSE to Various Class Members' Objections to Stipulation and Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (ad)
June 11, 2007 Filing 374 BRIEF objecting to proposed class action settlement; declaration of Stephen Lindholm, filed by Stephen Lindholm, objecting class member. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 373 REPLY to Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz's objections to preliminarily approved settlement and conditional motion for bifurcation of certain liability issues at trial 328 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 372 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by counsel for the class re Declaration 369 , Declaration 371 , Reply 368 , Declaration 362 , Declaration 361 , Reply 364 , Declaration 370 , Reply 366 , Declaration 363 served on 6/11/07. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 371 DECLARATION of Sidney Kanazawa in further support of MOTION for final approval of class action settlement 271 filed by counsel for the class. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Hon. Daniel Weinstein in support of MOTION for Order granting approval of class action settlement 271 filed by counsel for the class. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 369 DECLARATION of Christine Pedigo Bartholomew in further support MOTION for final approval of class action settlement 271 filed by counsel for the class. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 368 REPLY MEMORANDUM of settling Plaintiffs in support of final approval of class action settlement 271 ; declarations of Sidney K. Kanazawa, Christine P. Bartholomew, Richard L. Sartory and Hon. Daniel Weinstein. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 366 REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 278 ; declaration of Sidney Kanazawa. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 365 REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION for incentive awards to class plaintiffs 275 ; declaration of Sidney Kanazawa. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 364 REPLY Memorandum in support of MOTION for incentive awards to class plaintiffs 275 filed by counsel for class.. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 363 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa in support of MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs 275 filed by counsel for Class. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 362 DECLARATION of Richard L. Sartory filed by counsel for class. (ib)
June 11, 2007 Filing 361 DECLARATION of Sidney Kanazawa in further support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 278 filed by counsel for class. (ib)
June 8, 2007 Filing 360 NOTICE of filing of assurance of compliance with protective order filed by objectors David Harris, Kareem Kamal, Matthew Kavanaugh, Simone Newfield, Jonathan Ricasa, Abigail Treanor, David Zelenski. (ib)
June 7, 2007 Filing 359 REPLY (Confidential) re Ex Parte Application to for Order to permit lead counsel; 1) to speak freely for objecting lead counsel Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz; 2) Access to McGuirewoods "Rodriguez" files and 3) the status of "co-Lead Counsel", filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz. (ib)
June 7, 2007 Filing 318 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real: Counsel are notified that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Eliot Disner of Disner Law Corp's Ex Parte application to permit lead counsel to speak freely, etc., 304 is hereby Ordered ADVANCED from 6/14/07 at 1:30 PM to 6/13/2007 at 01:30 PM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(mg)
June 6, 2007 Filing 358 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation re Memorandum in Opposition to Class-Member Objectors Gaudel, Boggio, Gopalan and Delong's Motion to Unseal Class Certification Briefs, Summary Judgment Briefs, and Expert Reports, served on 6/4/07. (ib)
June 5, 2007 Filing 357 Affirmation in response to EX PARTE APPLICATION to 1) speak freely for objecting lead counsel Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz; 2)Access to McGuirewoods files 304 , filed by Mikki Love and John Bernitz, objectors to the class Settlement Agreement. (ib)
June 5, 2007 Filing 305 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2007 at 01:30 PM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(yc)
June 4, 2007 Filing 356 DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor in opposition to Motion to Unseal filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 4, 2007 Filing 355 DECLARATION of Tammi Rice in opposition to Motion to Unseal filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 4, 2007 Filing 354 Opposition to Motion to Unseal filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (ib)
June 4, 2007 Filing 353 SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. re Response to Ex Parte Application of Eliot Disner, served on 6/4/07. (ib)
June 4, 2007 Filing 352 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. re Opposition to Motion to Unseal; Declaration of Tammi Rice in Opposition to Motion to Unseal; and Declaration of Lee S. Taylor in Opposition to Motion to Unseal, served on 6/4/07. (ib)
June 4, 2007 Filing 333 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Class-Member objectors Gaudet, Boggio, Gopaland and Delong motion to unseal class certification briefs, summary judgment briefs and expert reports filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 332 JOINDER in support of McGuirewoods LLP Opposition to Eliot G Disner ex parte application the status as co Lead counsel filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 327 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re DECLARATION of SIDNEY K. KANAZAWA 326 , OPPOSITION to Eliot G. disner and Disner Law Corporation EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Access to McGuirewoods 325 served on 3/21/07. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 326 DECLARATION of SIDNEY K. KANAZAWA in support of McGuireWoods LLP Opposition to Eliot G. Disner and Disner Law Corporation ex parte application filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 325 OPPOSITION to Eliot G. disner and Disner Law Corporation EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Access to McGuirewoods "Rodriguez" files and the status of &q uot;co Lead counsel and Objection to Eliot G. Disner self-appointment as asscociated co-counsel for the class filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 324 RESPONSE to Ex parte applic of Eliot Disner filed by Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (et)
June 1, 2007 Filing 323 OBJECTION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for appointment as co-lead counsel. (et)
May 31, 2007 Filing 304 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for supporting memorandum to permit lead counsel; 1) to speak freely for objecting lead counsel Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz; 2)Access to McGuirewoods "Rodriguez" files and 3 the status of "co Lead counsel"; Declaration of Eliot g. Disner. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER.(yc)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER ON APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward F. Siegel to Appear in a Specific Case for objectors Sindell and Siegel Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(yc)
May 31, 2007 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $12,377.00 into the registry of the Court from Defendant Kaplan, Inc. (ek, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 293 APPLICATION of Edward F Siegel for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by Objector Sindell and Siegel. Lodged Proposed order. (shb)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real GRANTED APPLICATION of Carmine Giardino for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 289 . (pbap)
May 30, 2007 Filing 288 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eliot G Disner attorney for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, changing firm name and address to Disner Law Corporation, 2029 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Gintz (bb, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 322 OBJECTIONS the proposed class action settlement; declaration of Douglas N. Silverstein, Esq. filed by Class members Objector Arcelia Trevino. (et)
May 29, 2007 Filing 289 APPLICATION of non-resident attorney Carmine Giardino to Appear in a specific case. filed by Objector Arcelia Trevino. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER. (yc)
May 25, 2007 Filing 321 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice to intent to appear through counsel at settlement hearing filed by Unnamed ClassMembers Objectors Oliver Guiterrez, Jason Tingle. (et)
May 25, 2007 Filing 320 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice to intent to appear through counsel at settlement hearing filed by Unnamed ClassMembers Objector David Oriol. (et)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Class Member/Objector Pamela Collins name known as Pamela Collins Dunmore motion to file objections to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear Out-of-time is hereby GRANTED. (et)
May 25, 2007 Filing 284 NOTICE of change of attorney informaton adding Douglas N Silverstein as counsel, filed by plaintiff-objector Arcelia Trevino. (bb, ) Modified on 6/15/2007 (bb, ).
May 24, 2007 Filing 331 OBJECTIONS by Objections Andrew H Gilman and Stephen M Vasil to Class Counsel Petition for an award of attorneys fees, and supplement objections 278 filed by Class Members Andrew Gilman and Stephen M. Vasil. (et)
May 24, 2007 Filing 330 DECLARATION of PAMELA COLLINS DUNMORE in support of class member Objector MOTION to File Objections to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear Out-Of-Time 292 filed by Class Member Objector Pamela Collins Dunmore. (et)
May 24, 2007 Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to File Objections to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear Out-Of-Time 292 filed by Movant Pamela Collins Dunmore. (et)
May 24, 2007 Filing 328 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for objection to preliminarily approved settlement, and Conditional MOTION for Bifurcation of certain liability issues at trial filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich.Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (et)
May 24, 2007 Filing 292 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Objections to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear Out-Of-Time filed by class member Pamela Collins Dunmore.Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged Proposed Order. (jl)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re APPLICATION for Order for to file objections to propsoed class action settlement and notice of intent to appear out of time. 314 is GRANTING.(yc)
May 23, 2007 Filing 316 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Manuel L. Real : The court requests preparation of the transcript of hearing held 3/19/2007 in this action by court reporter Cindy Nireenberg.(yc)
May 23, 2007 Filing 315 OBJECTIONS to proposed class action settlement and notice of intent t oappeal. filed by Movant Pamela Collins Dunmore. (yc)
May 23, 2007 Filing 314 APPLICATION to file objections to propsoed class action settlement and notice of intent to appear out of time. filed by Movant Pamela Collins Dunmore. Lodged ORDER. (yc)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING Notice of objectors motion to unseal class certification submitted by Plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal received on 5/21/2007 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rules 6.1.(yc)
May 23, 2007 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $8,585.00 into the registry of the Court from Plaintiffs. (ek, )
May 22, 2007 Filing 312 Affirmation in support of objections by class members Nikki Love and John Bernitz to the proposed class settlement. filed by Robert L. Arleo (yc)
May 22, 2007 Filing 311 NOTICE of intent to appear and objection to proposed class action settlement.(yc) filed by Anthony Valach.
May 22, 2007 Filing 310 NOTICE of intention to appear at the final settlement hearing and objections of class members Robert Gaudet Jr. Andrea boggio, sandeep Gopalan and Elizabeth De Long to proposed filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc)
May 22, 2007 Filing 309 NOTICE of intent to appear and objection to proposed class action settlement filed by class member Richard A. Bodmer. (yc)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, on application of non-resident attorney Jon Zimmerman to appear in a specific case, designation of Joshua R. Furman. (yc, )
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real,on application of non-resident attorney Charles A Sturm of Steele Sturm to appear in a specific case. and the designation of Ronald D. Rosengarten. (yc, )
May 21, 2007 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $8,585.00 chech number 2941675 into the registry of the Court from plaintiff. (yc)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorneys J Garrett Kendrick, C Benjamin Nutley is 626-204-4061. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Kenneth E Nelson is 816-421-3339. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Edward F Siegel is 216-831-6584. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney David P Schafer is 210-348-0520. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Joseph Darrell Palmer is 858-792-5655. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Ronald D Rosengarten is 818-225-5077. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Charles A Sturm is 713-659-2601. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Alan Harris is 323-931-3366. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Jon M Zimmerman is 206-686-5076. (ad)
May 21, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Joshua R Furman is 310-231-7565. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by Class Members Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 345 PRELIMINARY OBJECTION filed by Class Members Justin Head, Ryan Helfrich to Class Action Settlement MOTION for Attorney Fees 278 , and MOTION for Order for incentive awards 275 .. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Appearnce and Intent to Appear at Final Fairness Hearing filed by Class Members George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 344 OBJECTION to Class Action Settlement, Fee Petition and Incentive Award Petition filed by Class Members George Schneider, Jonathan M Slomba, James Puntumapanitch. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by objector Evans & Mullinix PA. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 343 OBJECTION filed by objector Evans & Mullinix PA to Proposed Settlement. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by objector Sarah Siegel. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 342 OBJECTION filed by objector Sarah Siegel to Proposed Settlement. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by objector Daniel M Schafer. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 341 OBJECTION filed by objector Daniel M Schafer to Proposed Settlement. (ad)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by objector Jennifer Brown McElroy. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 340 OBJECTION filed by Objector Jennifer Brown McElroy to Proposed Settlement. (ad)
May 21, 2007 OBJECTION filed by Class Members James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III to Proposed Settlement. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 339 NOTICE of Intent to Appear filed by Class Members James Juranek, Audrey Juranek, Richard P Le Blanc, III. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 338 HARRIS DECLARATION in support of Objections to proposed settlement 337 filed by Objectors David Harris, Kareem Kamal, Matthew Kavanaugh, Simone Newfield, Jonathan Ricasa, Abigail Treanor, David Zelenski. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 337 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement filed by objectors David Harris, Kareem Kamal, Matthew Kavanaugh, Simone Newfield, Jonathan Ricasa, Abigail Treanor and David Zelenski. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 336 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff-objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange, re Notice of Intent to Appear and Objections 335 , served on 5/21/07. (ad)
May 21, 2007 OBJECTIONS to Settlement of Plaintiff-Objectors filed by plaintiff-objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast, David Orange. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Exhibits. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 335 NOTICE of Intent to Appear Re Final Settlement Hearing filed by Plaintiff-Objectors Aaron Lukoff, John Prendergast and David Orange. (ad)
May 21, 2007 Filing 308 OBJECTIONS and notice of intention to appear through counsel at fairness hearing to object to proposed settlement and award of attorney fees. filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc)
May 21, 2007 Filing 307 STATEMENT of objection of class member Jay M. Wolman to the proposed settlement of class action. filed (yc)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING Letter submitted by Plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal received on 5/15/2007 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Letter Format.(yc)
May 21, 2007 Filing 287 NOTICE of intent to appear and objection to proposed class action settlement. filed by Joseph J. Angersola. (yc, )
May 21, 2007 Filing 286 APPLICATION of non resident attorney Charles A Stum to Appear in a specifi case. filed by plaintiffs James Juraned and Audrey Juranek (yc, )
May 21, 2007 Filing 285 APPLICATION of non-resident attorney Jon M. Zimmerman to Appear in a specific case. filed by plaintiffs -objectors Aaron Lukoff. David Orange, John Prendergast. Lodged order. (yc, ) Modified on 6/6/2007 (yc, ).
May 18, 2007 Filing 334 MEMORANDUM filed by McGuirewoods LLP, Class Counsel, to Clarify and Object to Brief filed by Class Representatives Gintz, Nesci and Rodriguez 281 . (ad)
May 18, 2007 Filing 303 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz, Greg Thomas regarding Declaration 300 , Declaration 295 , Declaration 297 , Declaration 299 , Objections 302 , Declaration 296 , Declaration 301 , Declaration 294 , Declaration 298 were served on 5/18/07. (ir)
May 18, 2007 Filing 302 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement and Notice of intent to appear filed by Objectors David Feldman, Cameron Gharabiklou, Emily Grant, Jeff Lang, Sarah McDonald, Cara Patton, Rachel Schwartz and Greg Thomas. (ir)
May 18, 2007 Filing 301 DECLARATION of Greg Thomas filed by Objector Greg Thomas. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Rachel Schwartz filed by Objector Rachel Schwartz. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 299 DECLARATION of Cara Patton filed by Objector Cara Patton. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 298 DECLARATION of Sarah McDonald filed by Objector Sarah McDonald. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 297 DECLARATION of Jeff Lang filed by Objector Jeff Lang. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 296 DECLARATION of Emily Grant filed by Objector Emily Grant. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Cameron Gharabiklou filed by Cameron Gharabiklou. (ca)
May 18, 2007 Filing 294 DECLARATION of David Feldman filed by Objector David Feldman. (ca)
May 17, 2007 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re lead plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Loredana Nesci and Lisa Ginta Objection to preliminarily approved settlement and conditional motion for bifurcation of certain liability issues at trial 243 filed by Loredana Nesci, Lead Plaintiff in proper (yc, ).
May 16, 2007 Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 9/18/2006. Court Reporter: Leonore A. LeBLANC. (tad, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 280 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal, re MOTION for Attorney Fees 278 , Declaration (Motion related) 279 , was served on 5/7/2007. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa re MOTION for Attorney Fees 278 filed by plantiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 278 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for award of Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses; memoranudm of points and authorities filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged ORDER. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 277 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal, re Declaration (Motion related) 276 , MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 , was served on 5/7/2007. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 276 DECLARATION of Sidney K Kanazwa in support of plaitniffs MOTION for Order for awards to class plaintiffs and 275 filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 275 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for awards to class plaintiffs and Memordum of points and authorities. filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged ORDER. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 274 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa re MOTION for Order for granting approval of class action settlement 271 filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 273 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal, re MOTION for Order for granting approval of class action settlement 271 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 272 , was served on 5/7/2007. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support of MOTION for Order for granting approval of class action settlement 271 filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 271 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for order granting approval of class action settlement filed by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (yc, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert L Arleo on behalf of Nikki Loe and John Bernitz (yc ).
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, IT IS ORDERED as follows: Defendants shall jointly forthwith deposit the sum of $28,754 with the clerk of the court as and for compensation and reimbursement to the special master for service rendered and expenses incurred. Plaintiffs shall forthwith deposit the sum of $9,585 with the clerk of the court as and for compensation and reimbursement of the special master for service rendered and expenses incurred. The clerk of the court shall pay to Johh Francis Carroll the sum of $38,339 as soon as sufficient funds are on deposit. Within 30 days after receiving payment herein, the Special Master is authorized to destroy all papers and pleadings of any kind whatsoever which have been filed with him. (yc, )
April 17, 2007 Filing 270 Final Report of the Special Master filed by Special Master John Francis Carroll. (yl, )
March 30, 2007 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 3/19/07. Court Reporter: Cindy L. Nirenberg. (dbu)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re MOTION of McGuireWoods LLP to Withdraw as Attorney 241 is denying.(yc, )
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Order for Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class MOTION for Order for Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 is granted(yc, )
March 21, 2007 Filing 265 NOTICE OF RULING Regarding Plaintiffs MOTION for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 filed by plaintiffs Kaplan Inc, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (jp)
March 21, 2007 Filing 264 NOTICE OF RULING Regarding McGuirewoods LLP MOTION of McGuireWoods LLP to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Class Representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez 241 filed by plaintiffs Kaplan Inc, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (jp)
March 21, 2007 Filing 263 PROOF OF SERVICE of Notice of Ruling regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Order granting preliminary approval of class ation settlement and directing disseminatin of notice to class (see document for further details), was served on 3/21/2007 filed by plaintiffs Kaplan Inc, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (jp)
March 20, 2007 Filing 266 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearings on the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement in this litigation, and apparently the hearing on the motion of plaintiffs counsel to withdraw from reprsentation of the three applicant plainti 248 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
March 19, 2007 Filing 258 MINUTES (1) Class counsel's motion to withdraw as counsel (2) Plaintiff motion for order granting preliminary approval of class action. before Judge Manuel L. Real :, RE: MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Order for Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class MOTION for Order for Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 is GRANTED, MOTION of McGuireWoods LLP to Withdraw as Attorney 241 DENIED. Court Reporter: Cindy Nireenberg. (yc, )
March 16, 2007 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM by Counsel regarding MOTION to Grant Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement 243 filed by Stanley D Chess. (jp)
March 12, 2007 Filing 257 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 256 , Declaration (non-motion) 254 , Declaration (non-motion) 253 , Declaration (non-motion) 255 , was served on 3/12/2007. (yc, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 256 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in further Support of MOTION for order granting preliminary approval of class action settlement 243 filed by plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (yc, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 255 DECLARATION of Eliot G. Disner filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (yc, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 254 DECLARATION of Dan Drachler filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (yc, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 253 DECLARATION of Tracy Evans Moyer filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rodriguez. (yc, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in further Support of MOTION of withdraw as counsel for class representatives. 241 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci. (yc, )
March 6, 2007 Filing 251 Notice of filing of PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, re Response in Opposition to Motion, 249 , was served on 3/5/2007. (yc, )
March 6, 2007 Filing 250 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to (1) MOTION to withdraw as counsel of record for class representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez: 24 and (2)for MOTION for Order for granting preliminary approval of class action settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 : Declarations of Lisa Gintz, Lorendana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci. (yc, )
March 5, 2007 Filing 249 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Class Representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez and Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement from 3/19/07 at 10:00 am Re: 247 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
March 5, 2007 Filing 248 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearings on the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement in this litigation, and apparently the hearing on the motion of plaintiffs counsel to withdraw from reprsentation of the three applicant plaintiffs. filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
March 2, 2007 Filing 247 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Class Representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez 241 and Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 243 from 3/19/07 at 10:00 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir, )
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Notice to Class Members, Motions for Approval of Class Action Settlement and Potential Finalization of Class Settlement Matters: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their respective undersigned counsel of record, that: A) Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement shall be filed and personally served on counsel for the defendants on or before 2/26/2007. The hearing on the Preliminary Approval Motion shall be filed on 3/19/2007 at 10:00. Preliminary Approval Order will be entered within three (3) days of the Preliminary Approval Hearing that is, by 3/22/2007. B) Class Notice: by the Preliminary Approval Order entered by the Court, with the mail notice concluding by 4/5/2007; Not later 5/4/2007, the Claims Administrator appointed by the Court shall provide Class Counsel with an affidavit or declaration. C) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Related Motions/Applications shall be filed and served on or before 5/7/2007. Hearing on the Final Approval Motion, must be filed with the Court and received by Lead Counsel and Defendants counsel no later than 5/21/2007. Counsel for any of the settling Parties may file and serve a reply on or before 6/11/2007. Final Settlement Hearing, as well as the hearing on all other motions and applications referenced in Paragraph C.1 above shall be held on 6/18/2007 at 10:00. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Manuel L. Real/ (jp)
February 26, 2007 Filing 246 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B. Frailich of Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw sa Counsel of Record 241 , Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa 242 , Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion 244 , Declaration of Sidney K. Kanazawa 245 , served on 2/26/2007. (gk, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 245 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa re Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B. Frailich. (gk, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class 243 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B. Frailich. (gk, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 243 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to Class filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B. Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 242 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Kanazawa Re Motion of McGuireWoods LLP to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Class Representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez 241 . (gk, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 241 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of McGuireWoods LLP to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Class Representatives Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci and Ryan Rodriguez; memorandum of points and authorities. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk, )
February 7, 2007 Filing 238 MINUTES held before Judge Manuel L. Real : All pending dates, including Final Pre-Trial Confernence and Jury Trial are therefore VACATED. The parties will file by 3/5/2007 a stipulated propsed scheduling order as to dates for the notice to the class and motion for approval of class action settlement and all other matters thereon regarding the finalization of the class settlment of these consolidated actions. IT is so ordered. Court Reporter: None Present. (yc, )
February 2, 2007 Filing 239 STIPULATION AND Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yl, )
January 19, 2007 Filing 237 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Manuel L. Real : FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCEis hereby ORDERED CONTINUED FROM JANUARY 22, 2007 AT 11:00 A.M. TO FEBRUARY 5, 2007 AT 11:00 A.M. Court Reporter: N/A.(wh)
January 3, 2007 Filing 236 MINUTES held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, Resetting Hearing as to In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Resetting Deadlines/Hearings #225 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.Court Reporter: None Present. (yc, )
November 28, 2006 Filing 235 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Lee S. Taylor in support of Kaplan's opposition to plaintiffs motion to permit further discovery. (kag).
November 28, 2006 Filing 234 SEALED DOCUMENT-OPPOSITION to plaintiffs motin to permit further discovery. (kag).
November 28, 2006 Filing 231 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (et )
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPUTE, throught their respective counsel of record, that Mr Sanchez may at this date opt out and with the court's approval below shall be deemed to have effectively opted out,, of the certified class inthis litigation t othe extent that he would otherwise be a memebe of that class. (yc, )
November 20, 2006 Filing 232 NOTICE of filing request of Gabriel Sanchez for leave to OPT OUT [Stipulation re OPT OUT of Garbriel Sanchez filed concurrently] filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (et )
November 8, 2006 Filing 228 AMENDED Witness List filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich.. (yc, )
November 8, 2006 Filing 227 NOTICE of filing of amended witness list filed by plaintiffs.(yc, )
November 8, 2006 Filing 226 NOTICE OF LODGING of reply to motion for reconsideration re production of documents currently being heard by the special master filed by plantiffs.(yc, )
November 1, 2006 Filing 233 SEALED DOCUMENT-OPPOSITION to plaintiff's MOTION for reconsideration re special master's August 7, 2006 order. (kag). Modified on 8/28/2015 (kag).
November 1, 2006 Filing 230 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (et )
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Courts own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference is hereby ordered CONTINUED from 11/13/06 at 11:00 to 1/8/07 at 11:00 by Judge Manuel L. Real Court Reporter: None Present. (ir, )
October 13, 2006 Filing 224 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Productioni of documents by Kaplan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration by Jia-Ming Shang. (ir, ) (kag).
October 13, 2006 Filing 223 NOTICE OF LODGING Under seal Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration regarding production of documents by Kaplan; Memorandum of Points and Authorites; Declaration of Jia Ming Shang filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (ir, )
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCITON OF CPA AND PATENT BAR REVIEW DOCUMENTS by Special Master John Francis Carroll. (gk, )
September 21, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re proposed judgment submitted by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
September 21, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Proposed statement of uncontroverted facts and conclusion of law. submitted by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
September 18, 2006 Filing 220 SEALED DOCUMENT- Deposition Pages inadvertently omitted from plantiff's evidentiary attachement volume III (kag).
September 18, 2006 Filing 219 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 is DENIED.Court Reporter: Leonore LeBlanc. (yc, )
September 5, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re order granting motion for review submitted by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
September 5, 2006 Filing 218 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real : The court finding that ther are many similar discovery issues still being heard by the Special Master, remands this motion to the Special Master to review, in tandem with the other related discovery matters currently under his review. Court Reporter: Leonore LeBlanc. (yc, )
August 29, 2006 Filing 217 REPLY in support of MOTION for Review of of special master's order 188 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Alan S. Gruber in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Special Master's Order 188 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation d/b/a BAR/BRI. (gk, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 214 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Special Master's Order 188 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation d/b/a BAR/BRI. (gk, )
August 21, 2006 Filing 216 SEALED DOCUMENT -PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES'S CONTENTIONS Re Conscious Paralleslim; Declaration of Jia-Ming Shang (yl, ) (kag).
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Supplemental Response to Kaplan Contention regarding conscious parallelism 204 . The Supplemental Response to Kaplan Contentions Regarding Conscious Parallelism lodged herewith shall be filed. (jp)
August 18, 2006 Filing 213 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File An Additional Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 201 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (kks )
August 17, 2006 Filing 205 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich regarding NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Supplemental Response to Kaplan Contention regarding conscious parallelism 204 , was served on 8/17/2006. (jp)
August 17, 2006 Filing 204 NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Supplemental Response to Kaplan Contention regarding conscious parallelism; Declaration of Jia-Ming Shang filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Lodged Proposed Order and Proposed Supplemental Response. (jp)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 06-80066. Order received in this district on 08/14/06. The court, in its discretion, denied the petition for permission to appeal the district courts May 16, 2006 order granting class action certification. (cbr, )
August 9, 2006 Filing 221 SEALED DOCMENT- SUPPLEMENT opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 ; Declaration of Jia-Ming Shang(yc, ) (kag).
August 9, 2006 Filing 207 NOTICE OF LODGING of all pleadings concerning defendant motion to compel brought in the Western District of Washington filed by plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, granting plaintiffs permission to file supplemental oppositon to Kaplan's reply in suppot of its motion for summary judgment. (yc, )
August 9, 2006 Filing 187 MINUTES held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, Resetting hearing as to MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 , Resetting Hearing as to MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 Motion set for hearing on 9/18/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.Court Reporter: None Present. The Final Pre-Trial confence is CONTINUED to 11/13/2006 at 11:00am. and the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/13/2007 at 9:00Am. (yc, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 212 SEALED DOCUMENT-TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on plaintiffs Motions to Compel Production of Documents and of Additional Witness Testimony taken Tuesday, 8/1/06(mg, ) (kag).
August 8, 2006 Filing 211 SEALED DOCUMENT-SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER Re plaintiffs combined Motion to Compel 1) Production by Kaplan of Documents Concerning Deal and 2) Answers to Deposition Questions Concerning Deal (mg, ) Modified on 8/25/2006 (sm, ). (kag).
August 8, 2006 Filing 210 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs re Final Pretrial Conference Order and Joint Exhibit List With Objections #208 ; served on 8/8/06. (mg, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 209 PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EQUITABLE RELIEF (mg, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 208 SEALED DOCUMENT-Joint Exhibit List with Objections (mg, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2015: #1 Document 208 Part 2, #2 Document 208 Part 3) (kag).
August 3, 2006 Filing 203 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File Supplemental Opposition to Kaplan Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment 201 , was served on 8/3/2006. (jp)
August 3, 2006 Filing 202 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT KAPLAN INC'S OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Supplemental Opposition to Kaplan Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment 201 ; Supporting Declaration of Lee S. Taylor. (jp) (kag).
August 3, 2006 Filing 201 NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to File Supplemental Opposition to Kaplan Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment; Declaration of Jia-Ming Shang filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Lodged Proposed Order and Under Seal Supplemental Opposition. (jp)
August 3, 2006 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (jp)
August 2, 2006 Filing 196 SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT Exhibit List. (jp) (kag).
July 31, 2006 Filing 194 SEALED DOCUMENT-RESPONSE to plaintiffs evidentiary objections to declarations of Jeff Conlon, Chris De Santis, Hal Jones; Supporting Declartion of Stuart Senator. (ATTACHING EXHIBITS(yc, ) . (kag).
July 31, 2006 Filing 193 SEALED DOCUMENT-OBJECTIONS to plaintiffs evidence.(yc, ) (kag).
July 31, 2006 Filing 192 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENT declaration of Bradley S. Phillips filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (volume II of II containing exhbits under seal)(yc, ) (kag).
July 31, 2006 Filing 191 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY brief in support of its MOTION for Summary Judgment on count two of the first amended complaint. (yc, ) (kag).
July 31, 2006 Filing 190 SUPPLEMENT declaration of Bradley S. Phillips,, filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (volume I of II containing exhibits not under seal)(yc, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 189 NOTICE of filing under seal filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 188 MOTION for Review of special master's order; Memorandum of points and authorities; and Declaration of Eliot G. Disner in support. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER. (yc, )
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The title exhibits on the caption page attached to the envelope containingthe sealed document, docket number 165, be redacted to read: "Plaintiffs combined application for special master to hear on shortened time plaintiffs motions to compel: (1)production by Kaplan or documents [current text redacted here] (2)answers to deposition questions by John Polstein."(yc, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 186 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Stuart N Senator in oppositon to plaintiff's MOTIONS to Compel(yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2015: #1 Document 186 Part 2) (kag).
July 27, 2006 Filing 185 SEALED DOCUMENT- Kaplan Inc's OPPOSITION to plaintiff's MOTIONS to Compel(yc, ) (kag).
July 27, 2006 Filing 184 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of SCOTT AUGUST in oppositon to MOTIONS to Compel(yc, ) (kag).
July 27, 2006 Filing 183 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of in opposition to plaintiffs MOTION to Compel(yc, ) (kag).
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real that the Joint Exhibit List shall be deemed Highly Confidential and the unsealed version currently in the Court files shall be removed from those files, and replaced with a version designated as Highly Confidential, filed under seal to be provided to the Court by Plaintiffs counsel.(bg, )
July 26, 2006 Filing 200 SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENT to Evidentiary Attachment to Plaintiffs Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment by defendant Kaplan Inc 147 . (jp) (kag).
July 26, 2006 Filing 198 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF ERRATA to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact. (jp) (kag).
July 26, 2006 Filing 182 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re Statement #181 , was served on 7/25/2006. (yc, )
July 26, 2006 Filing 181 SEALED DOCUMENT-SEPARATE STATEMENT genuine issues of material fact (Final) filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich (yc, ) (kag).
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDERS by Judge Earl H. Carroll, re plaintiffs MOTION to Compel 134 . IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents is DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to compel production of documents relating to BR/BRI's Patent and CPA Review Courses is denied. (yc, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 168 SEALED DOCUMENT COMBINED MOTION TO Compel production by Kaplan of:(1)Document concerning deal , (2) answers to depositon questions concerning deal ; Memorandum of poits and authorities: declaration of Eliot G. Disner in support. (yc, ) Modified on 8/25/2006 (sm, ). (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT-EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO EVIDENTIARY REFERENCES SCATTERED THROUGH THE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITED BY DEFENDANT KAPLAN INC IN ITS MOTION for Summary Judgment. [(yc, ) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 177 SEALED DOCUMENT-SEPARATE STATEMENT GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT (yc, ) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 176 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment BY DEFENDANT KAPLAN INC. (yc, ) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 175 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, re Motion Related Document #172 , Motion Related Document #173 , Motion Related Document #174 , Declaration (non-motion) 171 , was served on 7/24/2006. (yc, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 174 SEALED DOCUMENT- EVIDENTIARY ATTACHMENT TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Summary Judgment BY DEFENDANT KAPLAN INC. (yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2015: #1 Document 174 Part 2, #2 Document 174 Part 3) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 173 SEALED DOCUMENT- EVIDENTIARY ATTACHEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Summary Judgment BY DEFENDANT Kaplan Inc (yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2015: #1 Document 173 Part 2) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 172 SEALED DOCUMENT- EVIDENTIARY ATTACHMENT TO plaintiff's opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment by defendant Kaplan Inc 147 (yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2015: #1 Document 172 Part 2, #2 Document 172 Part 3) (kag). (Main Document 172 replaced on 9/16/2015) (kag).
July 24, 2006 Filing 171 DECLARATION of Scott Harvey filed (yc, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 170 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF JEFF CONLON, CHRIS DE SANTIS, hAL JONES IN OPPOSITION TO re MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 169 DECLARATION of Jia-Ming Shang filed (yc, )
July 24, 2006 Resetting hearing as to MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (yc, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 163 MINUTES held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, Resetting Hearing as to MOTION for Summary Judgment 147 , is contining to 8/14/2006 at 10am. #56 Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.Court Reporter: None Present. (yc, )
July 21, 2006 Filing 166 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW (kag).
July 21, 2006 Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT-COMBINED APPLICATION for Order for for special master to hear on shortened time plaintiffs motion to compel (1) production by Kaplan of document concerning deal (2) answers to deposition questions by John Polstein and (3) Sanctions: memorandum of points and authorities; Declarations of Eliot G. Disner, Tracy Evans Moyer and Noah E Jussim in support. Modified on 8/25/2006 (sm, ). (kag).
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : re Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law 153 .shall be deemed HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL--RESTRICTED DISTRIBUTION pursant to the terms of the protective order entered by the court in this case on or about 1/13/2006. Furthermore, the undersignted unsealed version currently in the court's file shall be replaced from those files with a designated HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL-RESTRICTED DISTRIBUTION under seal version to be provided to the court by plaintiffs counsel by filing with the clerk's office.(yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 162 Witness List filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich.. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 161 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Kaplan Inc, re Motion Related Document 154 , was served on 7/17/2006. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 160 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment on count two of the first amended complaint(yc, ) (kag).
July 18, 2006 Filing 159 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Hal Jones yc, ) (kag).
July 18, 2006 Filing 158 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Jeff Conlon (yc, ) (kag).
July 18, 2006 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in further opposition to MOTION to Compel 134 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 156 DECLARATION of Alan S Gruber in support of re MOTION to Compel 134 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 155 SEALED DOCUMENT JOINT EXHIBIT list Filed filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, ) Modified on 10/26/2006 (yc, ). (kag).
July 18, 2006 Filing 154 COMBINED REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF re MOTION to Compel 134 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich.. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 152 SUPPLEMENT declaration of Bradley S. Phillips, filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Bradley S. Phillips (volume 1 of II containing exhibits not under seal) filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Bradley S Phillips (Volum II of II containing exhibits under seal) filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 149 NOTICE of filing under seal filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Chris De Santis filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment on count two of the first amended complaint filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged proposed judgment and statement. (yc, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 146 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW yc, ) (kag).
July 17, 2006 Filing 145 NOTICE of filing under seal filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 144 PRETRIAL Witness List filed by defendant Kaplan Inc.. (yc, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation.. (yc, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 142 Witness List filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation.. (yc, )
July 12, 2006 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Alan S. Gruber re MOTION to Compel #135 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 12, 2006 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM of points in Opposition to MOTION to Compel #135 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 11, 2006 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Alan S Gruber re MOTION to Compel 134 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 11, 2006 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in in Opposition to MOTION to Compel 134 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
July 10, 2006 Filing 137 SEALED DOCUMENT-PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL RE ADEQUATE CLASS NOTICE (FILED 6/13/2006) (yc, ) (kag).
July 6, 2006 Filing 136 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re MOTION to Compel #135 , was served on 7/6/2006. (yc, )
July 6, 2006 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of CPA and Patent bar review documents; declartion of Noah E. Jussim. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER. (yc, ) (kag).
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real that Defendant West Publishing Corporation's Partial Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposal re Adequate Class Notice (filed on or about 6/13/2006) #125 shall be deemed confidential pursuant to the terms of the Protective Order entered by the Court in this case on or about 1/13/2006 and the unsealed version currently in the Court's file shall be replaced from those files with a designated, under seal version, to be provided to the Court by West's counsel via filing with the Clerk's office. (gk, ) Modified on 7/7/2006 (gk, ).
July 5, 2006 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMETNS CREATED SINCE 5/26/2006 RE lOUISIANA Bar/Bri course: Declaraion of Noah E. Juissim filed by PLAINTIFFS Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
June 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE CLASS NOTICE. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs issue the approved proposed notice of class action to the class in the following manner: Plaintiffs shall send the approved proposed notice via first class mail to reasonably locatable class memebers identified from defendant West's REGIS database at addresses updated through the United States Postal Service, supplemented by a private address update service by Judge Manuel L. Real,(bp, )
June 19, 2006 Filing 130 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real : The court finds that plaintiffs proposal re class notice is adequate, except not on Kaplan or West Publishing Websites, but it will be allowed on BarBre's Website. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed order.Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (yc, )
June 15, 2006 Filing 129 SEALED DOCMENT-SUPPLEMENT declaration of Tracy Evans Moyer in further support of plaintiff proposed re adequate class notice. (yc, ). (kag).
June 15, 2006 Filing 128 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR PROPOSED RE ADEQUATE CLASS NOTICE. (yc, ). (kag).
June 13, 2006 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Heather H. Gilhooly re 120 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 125 SEALED DOCUMENT - Defendant West Publishing Corporation's Partial Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposal Re Adequate Class Notice. (yc, ) ** SEALED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED 7/6/2006 #133 ** Modified on 7/7/2006 (gk, ). (kag).
June 13, 2006 Filing 124 SUPPLEMENT to partial opposition 120 , filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 13, 2006 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received into the registry of the Court $2,000.00 from Defendant West Publishing Corporation and $2,000.00 from Defendant Kaplan Inc. (ek, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 131 NOTICE of deposit of funds filed by defendants Kaplan Inc. deposit with the court registry $2,000. (yc, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Tracy Evans Moyer re Objections - non-motion 120 filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
June 6, 2006 Filing 121 PROPOSED RE ADEQUATE CLASS NOTICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. lodged proposed order (yc, )
June 6, 2006 Filing 120 PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF'S proposal re adequate class notice. filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 6, 2006 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Carina Wong in support of partial oppositon to plaintiffs proposed re adequate class notice. filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : NOW THEREFORE, THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE. Expert reports that relate dto whether an antiturst violation occurred shall be submitted by plaintiff's and defendants on 6/26/2006; Expert reports that relate to causation and damages shall be submitted by all parties on 7/17/2006; Plaintiffs and defendants may completit deposition of experts up to and including 8/4/2006.(yc, )
June 6, 2006 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $1,000.00 into the registry of the Court from McGuire Woods on behalf of Plaintiffs. (ek, )
June 1, 2006 Filing 117 JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding proposed method and form of class notice. filed by Plaintiff Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 5/15/06. Court Reporter: Beth Zaccaro. (lr, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 122 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 5/15/06 Court Reporter: Beth Zaccaro (lr, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, appointing special master. John Francis Carroll is appointed as special Master. (see file) The parties as required shall deposit with the clerk of the court funds for payment of the fees of the sepecial master. As the initial fund defendants shall deposit $4,000.00 and plaintiffs shall deposit $1,000.00 with the clerk of court forthwith. (yc, )
May 15, 2006 Filing 115 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real :, RE: MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 , MOTION to Certify Class #78 is grantedCourt Reporter: Beth Zaccaro. (yc, )
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, granting motion for class certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The class shall be defined as (see file). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B. Frailich, Loredana Nesci, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Kari Brewer and Lorraine Rimson shall serve as class representative for the class certified herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT McGuire Woods LLP is appointed class counsel for the class cerified herein. (yc, )
May 10, 2006 Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT- APPLICATION for Leave to File to file supplemental DECLARTION OF DANIEL RUBINFELD (yc, ) (kag).
May 9, 2006 Filing 112 NOTICE OF correction to representation in plainiffs reply brief in support of filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 (yc, )
May 8, 2006 Filing 111 COMBINED REPLY to separate opposition of defendants to plaintiffs MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
May 4, 2006 Filing 110 SEALED DOCUMENT-NOTICE OF ERRATA TO Supplemental Declaration of Douglas F. Greer In Support of their MOTION For Class Certification #78 (yl, ) Modified on 5/12/2006 (yl, ). (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF ELIOT G. DISNER In Further Support of Plaintiff's MOTION For Class Certification Pursuant to Rule 23 of The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #78 (yl, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2015: #1 Document 109 Part 2, #2 Document 109 Part 3, #3 Document 109 Part 4, #4 Document 109 Part 5, #5 Document 109 Part 6, #6 Document 109 Part 7, #7 Document 109 Part 8) (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 108 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of DOUGLAS F. GREER #78 . (yl, ) (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 107 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF RE Motion for Class Certification #78 (yl, ) (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 106 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO COUNSEL filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, was served on 5/1/2006. (yl, )
May 2, 2006 Filing 105 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of REBECCA J. TRENT IN SUPPORT of West Publishing Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yl, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2015: #1 Document 105 Part 2) (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 104 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition to MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yl, ) (kag).
May 2, 2006 Filing 103 OPPOSITION (AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS) TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to appoint special master 98 filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yl, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY In Support of Defendant's Opposition to MOTION For Class Certification #78 filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yl, )
April 27, 2006 Filing 102 SEALED DOCUMENT-NOTICE OF ERRATA to Declaration of Daniel Rubinfeld, Ph.D., in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #91 . (pcl, ) (kag).
April 25, 2006 Filing 100 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Jennifer Brazeal, re MOTION for Order for appoint special master 98 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #99 , was served on 4/24/2006. (yc, )
April 24, 2006 Filing 99 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support of MOTION for Order for appoint special master[ ; Declaration of Eliot Disner in support. (yc, ) (kag).
April 24, 2006 Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to appoint special master filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Lodged ORDER. (yc, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 97 SEALED DOCUMEN-NOTICE OF ERRATA Declaration Oliveiri in support of defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion for class certification (yc, ) (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 95 SEALED DOCUMENTECLARATION of Richard Conviser in support of defendants oppositon to plaintiffs motion for class certification (yc, ) (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 94 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Donna Skibbe in support of defendants opposition to plaintiffs MOTION for class certification #78 . (yc, ) Modified on 5/1/2006 (jp, ). (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 93 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Heather H. Gilhooly in support of defendants opposition to plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class #78 . (yc, ) Modified on 5/1/2006 (jp, ). (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 92 SEALED DOCUMENT-OPPOSITION to PLAINTIFF MOTION for class certification (yc, ) (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 91 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of DANIEL RUBINFELD PH. D in support of defendants oppositin to plaintiffs MOTION for class certification #78 . (yc, ) Modified on 5/1/2006 (jp, ). (kag).
April 10, 2006 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of David Oliveiri in support of Defendants opposition to plaitniffs MOTION for class certification. (yc, ) (kag).
April 7, 2006 Filing 96 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eliot G Disner attorney for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, changing Firm Name to McGuireWoods LLP. Filed by plaintiffs All plaintiff (yc, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The defendant may if they so choose file a consoldated memorandum of points and authorities of up to 35 pages excluding indices, exhibits and declaration in oppositin to plaintiffs class certification motion. If the defendants choose to file such a consolidated oppositon plaintiffs may file one reply memorandum of points and authorities thereto of up to 35 pages in length excluding indices exhibit and declaration. (yc, )
March 22, 2006 Filing 88 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF LODGEING OF ALL PLEADING CONCERNING DEFENDANT WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATIONS'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2015: #1 Document 88 Part 2, #2 Document 88 Part 3, #3 Document 88 Part 4) (kag).
March 17, 2006 Filing 87 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (shb, )
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Tracy Evans Moyer as counsel for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, designating Eliot G. Disner as local counsel. Fee PAID. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(yc, )
March 16, 2006 Filing 85 APPLICATION of non-resident attorney Tracy Evans Moyer to Appear in a specific case. FEE PAID. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Lodged order. (yc, )
March 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ON APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Lee Scott Taylor as counsel for Defendant Kaplan Inc, Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(yc, )
March 13, 2006 Filing 84 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT attorney Lee Scott Taylor to Appear IN A SPECIFIC CASE Pro Hac Vice. FEE paid. filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. Lodged ORDER. (yc, )
March 13, 2006 Filing 82 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re Declaration (Motion related) #81 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #79 , Declaration (Motion related) #80 , was served on 3/13/2006. (yc, )
March 13, 2006 Filing 81 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Douglas F. Greer plaintiffs memorandum in support of their MOTION for class certificaton pursuant to rule 23 of The Federal Rules of Civil procedure filed herewith (yc, ) (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2015: #1 Document 81 Part 2, #2 Document 81 Part 3) (kag).
March 13, 2006 Filing 80 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Eliot G. Disner plaintiffs memorandum in support of their MOTION for class certification pursuant to rule 23 of the Federal rules of civil procedure filed herewith. #78 (kag).
March 13, 2006 Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM in support of their MOTION for class cerification purusant to rule 23 of The Federal rules of civil procedure. (yc, ) (kag).
March 13, 2006 Filing 78 SEALED DOCUMENT-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to class Certification . (kag).
March 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real,regarding Applicatio for leave for attorney TRacy Evans Moyer to appear Pro Hac Vice. Must pay fees and submit separate application forplaintiff up to request of California Bar(yc, )
March 1, 2006 Filing 76 AMENDED NOTICE of Change of Address by Eliot G Disner, Noah E Jussim, Sidney K Kanazawa, Colleen M Regan attorney for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, changing address to Van Etten Suzumoto and Becket LLP, 1800 Century Park East, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90067; Telephone number 310-315-8200; Fax number 315-8210. Filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (jp, )
February 28, 2006 Filing 75 NOTICE of Change of Address by Noah E Jussim, Sidney K Kanazawa, Colleen M Regan attorney for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, changing address to Van Etten Suzumoto and Becket LLP, 1800 Century Park East, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Telephone number: 310-315-8200; Fax number: 310-315-8210. Filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (jp, )
February 14, 2006 Filing 74 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Discovery 71 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
February 14, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Notice of motion to compel submitted by plaintiff Jennifer Brazeal. (yc, )
February 14, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re order re nunc pro tune submitted (yc, )
February 14, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Notice of motion submitted by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real of DENIAL This cour does not work on ex parte but rather on the FRCP and local rules. (yc, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re MOTION to Compel MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Discovery 71 , was served on 2/13/2006. (yc, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 71 NOTICE OF Ex Parte application and ex parte application to set hearing on shortened time re MOTION to Compel Discovery re class interrogatories on 3/6/2006; Declaration of Jiaming Shang. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Lodged motion and 2 orders. (yc, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 70 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shortening time on joint stipulation 65 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
February 10, 2006 Moving party withdraws 61 Motion for Removal (wh, )
February 10, 2006 Filing 69 Notice of Withdrawal of motion for order that defendant remove confidentiality designations and reveal redaction son documents. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, Accordingly, the parties are HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Defendant Kaplan shall serve its submdsion on plaintiff counsle on or before 1Pm on Friday 2/10/2006, by email. Plaintiff shall serve and file the joint stipulaiton of the parties on or before 2/10/2006. The unredacted copies of documents bearingKaplan control numbers 5984,5994,5995,6013,6016,and 6154 shall be delivering to the chambers of this court for its in camera review on ir before 2/10/2006. Each party may then serve and file a supplemental memorandum not to exceed five pages in length on or before 2/14/2006. All briefs shall be served by fax or email The motion shall be heard on 2/21/2006 at 10am. (yc, )
February 7, 2006 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to modify briefing schedule and for order that defendant 62 , was served on 2/7/2006. (yc, )
February 7, 2006 Filing 63 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIIES in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to modify briefing schedule 62 Modified on 2/15/2006 (yc, ). (kag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2015: #1 Document 63 Part 2) (kag).
February 7, 2006 Filing 62 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to modify briefing schedule and for order that defendant Kaplan Inc remove confientiality designations and reveal declaration of documents; Declaraton of Eliot G. Dinser. filed by PLAINTIFFS Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
February 7, 2006 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for REMOVE CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS AND REVEAL REDACTIONS. filed by PLAINTIFF Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shortening time on joint stipulation 65 , Response in Opposition to Motion 66 , was served on 2/3/2006. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 66 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for shortening time on joint stipulation 65 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 65 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Order shortening time on joint stipulation filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER AND JUGMENT. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re joint stipulation re plaintiffs submitted by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re proposed order denying motion to compel submitted by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The application to resolve whether plaintiffs contention interrogatoies regarding class issues is denied without prejudice. (yc, )
February 1, 2006 Filing 59 APPLICATION for attorney JOANNA SHALLY to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (jag, )
January 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real :, PROTECTIVE ORDER (see document for details. This order is not binding on the court or court personnal. The court may amend this order at any time. (yc, )
January 10, 2006 Filing 57 NOTICE of lodging of stipulation and (proposed) protective order filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
January 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY, PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES PREVIOUSLY SET by Judge Manuel L. Real : Discovery cut-off 7/17/2006. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit List and Winess List to be filed and served on or before 7/17/06; Pre-trial Conference Order to be lodged on or before 7/31/06; Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2006 at 11:00 AM; Trial set for 9/12/2006 at 9:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. All dates calculated based upon these dates shall be continued accordlingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply to class certification motion practice: Hearing May 15, 2006 at 10:00 a.m.; Opening brief filing and service deadline 3/13/06; Opposition filing and service deadline 4/10/06; Reply filing and service deadline 5/1/06. IT IS SO ORDERED.(ca, )
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : on application non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case.granting 53 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney LisL Joanne Dunlop on behalf of West Publishing Corporation, designating Heather Hersh Gilhooly as local counsel. (yc, )
December 15, 2005 Filing 53 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT attorney Lisl Joanne Dunlop to Appear in a specific case. FEE PAID. filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. Lodged order. (yc, )
December 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real,on applcation of non-resident attornry to appear in a specific case William P. Butterfield of Finkelstein Thompson & Loughran. (yc, )
November 28, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER (yc, )
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DENIED ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real,REGARDING ex parte application to shortne time. (yc, )
November 22, 2005 Filing 51 NOTICE OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing 50 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
November 22, 2005 Filing 50 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time to hear plaintiffs conditional moton (a)to set date, terms and conditions of deposition of Richard Conviser and (b) to file protective order re discovery; Declaration of Eliot G Disner. filed by PLAINTIFFS Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
November 22, 2005 Filing 49 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 11/21/2005 48 filed by DEFENDANT West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
November 21, 2005 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing 50 , was served on 11/21/2005. (yc, )
November 21, 2005 Filing 48 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 11/21/2005 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 11/21/2005 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Manuel L. Real. Lodged PROPOSED ORDER AND PROPOSED PROPECTIVE ORDER. (yc, )
November 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, regarding case management order no 1. (see document for details)(yc, )
November 3, 2005 Filing 45 MINUTES by Judge Manuel L. Real :, Set Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2006 11:00 AM before Honorable Manuel L. Real. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2006 09:00 AM before Honorable Manuel L. Real.Court Reporter: None Present. (yc, )
October 19, 2005 Filing 44 NOTICE of lodging of proposed case management order no 1 filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez. (yc, )
October 17, 2005 Filing 43 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing Plaintiff motion to consolidate Cv05-3222 and Cv6211 R and any related actions that may be subsequently filed with this court.before Judge Manuel L. Real : The court grants the motion. Plaintiff shall file a proposed order of consolidation in each of the actionsCourt Reporter: Carole Elkins. (yc, )
October 11, 2005 Filing 42 REPLY on motion to Consolidate Cases 37 filed by Kari Brewer and Lorraine Rimson. (yc, )
October 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Stuart N. Senator-Munger, Tolles & Olson in place of attorney Jeffrey A LeVee- Jones Day 38 is approved(yc, )
October 3, 2005 Filing 40 RESPONSE to MOTION to Consolidate Cases 37 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
October 3, 2005 Filing 39 RESPONSE to MOTION to Consolidate Cases 37 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
September 30, 2005 Filing 38 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Stuart N. Senator-Munger, Tolles & Olson in place of attorney Jeffrey A LeVee- Jones Day filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. Lodged Proposed order. (yc, )
September 19, 2005 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Heather Hersh Gilhooly, Edward A Klein, Marc D Ashley, Wayne Dale Collins, Steven F. Molo, Rebecca J Trent on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation (sv)
September 16, 2005 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate filed by plaintiffs Kaplan Inc, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Manuel L. Real. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp, )
August 15, 2005 Filing 35 JOINT REPORT of counsel filed; (yc, )
August 1, 2005 Filing 33 MINUTES by Judge Manuel L. Real :, RE: MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 is deniedCourt Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (yc, )
July 25, 2005 Filing 32 REPLY memorandum in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
July 13, 2005 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 filed by plaintiffs Kaplan Inc, Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
July 8, 2005 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address by attorney Jeffrey A LeVee, Courtney M Schaberg, Brian A Sun for Defendant Kaplan Inc, changing address to Jones Day, 555 South Flower Street, Fiftieth Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by defendant, Kaplan, Inc. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 30 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 8 and affirmative defenses of defendant filed by defendant, West Publishing Corporation.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Wayne Dale Collins for West Publishing Corporation, designating Raymond D Just as local counsel. Fee Paid. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Alan S Gruber for West Publishing Corporation, designating Raymond A Just as local counsel. Fee Paid. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Marc D Ashley for West Publishing Corporation, designating Raymond A Just as local counsel. Fee Paid. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Steven F. Molo for Thomson Corporation, designating Raymond A Just as local counsel. Fee Paid. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Rebecca J Trent for West Publishing Corporation, designating Raymond A Just as local counsel. Fee Paid. Approved by Judge Manuel L. Real.(sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 21 APPLICATION for attorney Wayne Dale Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant, West Publishing Corporation. Lodged order. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 20 APPLICATION for attorney Alan S Gruber to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant, West Publishing Corporation. Lodged order. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 19 APPLICATION for attorney Marc D Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant, West Publishing Corporation. Lodged order. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 18 APPLICATION for attorney Steven F Molo to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant, Thomson Corporation. Lodged order. (sv)
July 6, 2005 Filing 17 APPLICATION for attorney Rebecca J Trent to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant, West Publishing Corporation. Lodged order. (sv)
July 5, 2005 Filing 29 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 8 filed by defendant, Kaplan Inc.(sv)
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real : The parties hereby stipulated that defendants shall serve and file their answers tothe first amended complaint on or before 7/5/2005.(yc, )
June 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: re MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 . Plaintiff's opposition to the motion shall be served by midnight (Pacific Daylight Time) onJuly 13, 2005 and filed on July 14, 2005. Defendants' reply shall be served and filed on July 25, 2005. It is also agreed and stipulated that all pleadings hereinafter will be deemed timely served for all purposes if served by e-mail and First Class mail delivery. IT IS SO ORDERED.(shb, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 15 certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Edward A Friedland in support of re MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 filed by defendant West Publishing Corporation. (yc, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Andrew S Rosen in support of re MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of points and authorites in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK 10 filed by Defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to VENUE TO THE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF NEW YORK filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Manuel L. Real. (yc, )
June 7, 2005 Filing 9 REQUEST that court staff disclaim interest as potential class members. filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Reena B Frailich. (yc, )
May 26, 2005 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich (shb, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich. re Order, #3 , was served on 5/3/2005. (yc, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 6 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. Kaplan Inc answer due 6/20/2005. filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed upon Kaplan Inc served on 4/29/2005, answer due 5/19/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by personally deliveing copies service, by Federal statute, upon CT Corporation System Agent, by leaving with Gerome Jones, Process Clerk. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (yc, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Reena B Frailich, upon West Publishing Corporation served on 5/2/2005, answer due 5/22/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by not cited statute, upon Becky DeGeorge at CSC, authorized to accept service of process. Due Dilligence declaration -. Original Summons not returned. (lc, )
May 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSLE ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real. Counsel are advised that the court expects strict compliance with the provisions of the local rules of the Federal rules of civil procedure. NONCOMPLIANCE MAY LEAD TO THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS WHICH MAY INCLUDE THE STRIKING OF PLEADINGS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION. (see document for details)(yc, )
April 29, 2005 FAX number for Attorneys Noah E Jussim, Sidney K Kanazawa, Colleen M Regan is 310-315-8210. (jp, )
April 29, 2005 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich. (jp, )
April 29, 2005 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (jp, )
April 29, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (Filing fee $ 250 paid), jury demand, filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich.(jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan Rodriguez et al v. West Publishing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Exec/Class Counsel Sandra Disner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: McGuireWoods LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Finkelstein Thompson LLP
Represented By: Rosemary M Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stephen Stetson
Represented By: Fredricka Ung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Jonathan M Slomba
Represented By: James Garrett Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Audrey Juranek
Represented By: Charles A Sturm
Represented By: Ronald D Rosengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Greg Thomas
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Kareem Kamal
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Andrew Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: John Prendergast
Represented By: Jon M Zimmerman
Represented By: Joshua R Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Matthew Kavanaugh
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: David Harris
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Emily Grant
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: George Schneider
Represented By: James Garrett Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Jennifer Brown McElroy
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Justin Head
Represented By: James Garrett Kendrick
Represented By: C Benjamin Nutley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Schneider Slomba Puntumapanitch Head and Helfrich
Represented By: James Garrett Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Richard P Le Blanc, III
Represented By: Charles A Sturm
Represented By: Ronald D Rosengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: James Juranek
Represented By: Charles A Sturm
Represented By: Ronald D Rosengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sarah Siegel
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Represented By: Edward F Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Robert Gaudet, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sarah McDonald
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Oliver Guiterrez
Represented By: Robert C Chojnacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: David Feldman, -
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sandeep Gopalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Jeff Lang
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: John Bernitz
Represented By: Robert L Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Simone Newfield
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Andrea Boggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: David Zelenski
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Abigail Treanor
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Aaron Lukoff
Represented By: Jon M Zimmerman
Represented By: Joshua R Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Nikki Love
Represented By: Robert L Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Stephen M Vasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sindell and Siegel
Represented By: Edward F Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |