Darlene Couch v. Telescope Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Darlene Couch
Defendant: Fox Interactive Media Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, Project Support Team Inc, 19 Entertainment Inc, Fremantlemedia North America Inc, CKX Inc, Telescope Inc and American Idol Productions Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv03916
Filed: June 15, 2007
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: XX US, Outside California
Referring Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: Florence-Marie Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION REGARDING DUE DATE OF RESPONSIVE PLADING; ORDER: The parties have agreed to a joint response date for all Defendants. Responsive pleadings must be filed on or before 8/22/2007. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (jp)
July 13, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Kevin T. Moore as counsel for Plaintiff Darlene Couch, designating Paul R. Kiesel as local counsel [12] is GRANTED by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (et)
July 3, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 07-3537 FMC (VBKx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: CV 07-3916 FMC (VBKx). Signed by Judge Victor B. Kenton.(rn)
June 15, 2007 3
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(rrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darlene Couch v. Telescope Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Interactive Media Inc
Represented By: Joy T Teitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Support Team Inc
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19 Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremantlemedia North America Inc
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKX Inc
Represented By: Joy T Teitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telescope Inc
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Idol Productions Inc
Represented By: Brad W Seiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Couch
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?