UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Veoh Networks, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC and Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd.
Defendant: Veoh Networks, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 2:2007cv05744
Filed: September 4, 2007
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: XX US, Outside California
Referring Judge: Andrew J. Wistrich
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 619 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: The parties are familiar with their respective contentions and claimed authorities. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES the motion 587 . (See attached Minute Order for further information. No hearing is necessary. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L. R. 7-15. (jp)
January 15, 2010 617 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Investor Defendants have moved for an award of attorneys fees from UMG. After applying the factors set forth in Fogerty v. Fantasy, Inc., 510, U.S. 517, 114 S.Ct. 1023 (1994), the Court DENIES the Motion 591 . (See attached Minute Order for further information). (jp)
December 16, 2009 614 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: taking off calendar and under advisement 587 Motion for Attorney Fees ; taking off calendar and under advisement 591 Motion for Attorney Fees. (se)
December 15, 2009 613 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 612 Application to Seal Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 609 . (se)
December 7, 2009 608
EXHIBIT G to the Declaration of Brian D Ledahl in support of UMG's Opposition 606 to Veoh's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff UMG Recordings, Inc. (esa)
December 3, 2009 603
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 583 filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc. ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56777; (lr)
December 2, 2009 602
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 03/17/2008, 12/04/2008, 09/08/2009, 06/23/2008, 08/25/2008, 12/17/2008, 04/06/2009, 06/03/2009; Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg, Dorothy Babykin (Transcribed Electronically Recorded Hearings), Dina Harand (Transcribed Electronically Recorded Hearings); Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56777; Re: 583 (Batsell, Carter)
December 1, 2009 601
Objections in Opposition re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, U 590 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Batsell, Carter)
November 24, 2009 599 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Documents Under Seal 598 . The clerk of the court shall file under seal the supplemental Declaration of Erin Ranahan in support of Veoh's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. (jp)
November 23, 2009 598
APPLICATION to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan in support of Veoh's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
November 20, 2009 594
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE BILL OF COSTS filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. [December 10, 2009 at 11:00 a.m.] (Ranahan, Erin)
November 18, 2009 593 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal (1) Veoh's Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; (2) Declaration of Erin Ranahan 589 . (jp)
November 17, 2009 588
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., of Documents Filed Under Seal (see Notice of Manual Filing Dkt. 586] served on 11/17/2009. (Ranahan, Erin)
November 10, 2009 585
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56777, 9TH CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 583 as to PLAINTIFF Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (lra)
October 2, 2009 579 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: Having read the parties Joint Status Report filed on 9/23/2009, the Court concludes that if Veoh seeks to have judgment entered in this case it will have to move for summary judgment as to potential injunctive relief, or else enter into an agreement with UMG. If the parties choose to continue to litigate this case, they should comply with the following scheduling order: (1) Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2009; (2) Trial set for 12/1/2009. (jp)
September 23, 2009 578
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO COURT'S SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 ORDER filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
September 18, 2009 576
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/8/09 3:00 pm. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg, www.cindynirenberg.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
September 11, 2009 575
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court GRANTS Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment that it is entitled to the section 512(c) safe harbor 449 . The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer as to whether there are any issues remaining in this case that truly require judicial resolution. The parties must file a joint status report by not later than 9/23/2009. (jp)
September 8, 2009 574 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES: Proceedings: Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc 449 Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court previously issued its tentative order and now hears oral argume nt. For reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. Order to issue. In light of the Courts tentative ruling, the Court vacates indefinitely all pending pretrial and trial dates and deadlines.Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp)
September 2, 2009 573
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz. On the Court's own motion, the Court resets the hearing date on the Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement 449 for hearing on Tuesday, September 8, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. (kbr)
August 4, 2009 572
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/4/08 3:10pm (Nirenberg, Cindy)
August 3, 2009 570 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER REGARDING VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL UMG TO PRODUCE CHAIN OF TITLE DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: denying 432 Motion to Compel. The motion is denied without prejudice to its renewal on an expedited basis after trial, if necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
July 30, 2009 569
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Court's own motion, the Court continues the 8/3/2009 Final Pretrial Conference and All pending MOTIONS IN LIMINE to 9/14/2009 at 11:00 AM. The court also continues the two-week Jury Trial from 8/18/2009 to 9/29/2009 at 8:00 AM. (jp)
July 28, 2009 568
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/4/08 3:10pm. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg, www.cindynirenberg.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
July 27, 2009 560
Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Veoh's Motion to Compel Chain of Title Documents filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc..(Ranahan, Erin)
July 20, 2009 565
MINUTES OF CONTINUED HEARING ON VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL UMG TO PRODUCE CHAIN OF TITLE DOCUMENTS FOR THE REMAINING 80% OF IDENTIFIED COPYRIGHTS BASED ON DEFECTS ADMITTED BY UMG, ETC. held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistric. The parties are directed to submit a revised stipulation within one week that describes the matters as to which they have agreed and delineates the issues requiring resolution by Judge Matz.Court Recorder: CS 7/20/09. (mz)
July 16, 2009 523
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION the Motion by Investor Defendants for Attorney Fees and Costs 488 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (jp)
July 13, 2009 522
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
July 9, 2009 518
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 . The parties are directed to file a supplemental joint stipulation. The supplemental joint stipulation shall be filed by July 13, 2009. ( Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich.) (yb)
July 7, 2009 512
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., of Documents Filed Under Seal, served on July 6, 2009. (Ranahan, Erin)
July 6, 2009 509
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Preclude (1) Allegedly infringing videos that are not UMG's music videos; (2) Copies of screenshots that omit certain items that would appear for a Veoh user; (3) Any documents or argument specifying any of Veoh's investors or documents constituting or relating to communications to and from Veoh's investors regarding allegedly infringing videos; (4) Any evidence regarding the timing of Veoh's implementation of filtering through Audible Magic; (5) Evidence constituting and relating to press articles, blogs and communications from Veoh's users (other than relating to the users' own alleged infringement) regarding alleged infringement on Veoh; (6) Evidence and arguments that support a claim that statutory damages should be assessed by any other means other than per Compact Disc ("CD"); and (7) Evidence constituting Veoh's power point presentations and other internal materials that discuss or refer to general music strategy filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING VEOH'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 through 7)(Ranahan, Erin)
July 1, 2009 501
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6-3-09 10:08 a.m. (ha)
June 29, 2009 499
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees 488 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven A. Marenberg ISO UMG's Opposition, # 2 Declaration of Carter Batsell ISO UMG's Opposition, # 3 Exhibit A to Batsell Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Batsell Decl.)(Batsell, Carter)
June 22, 2009 498 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz, re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 497 . The hearing on Defendants' motion 488 is continued to July 20, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall submit their briefs on the motion pursuant to the schedule set forth in the parties' stipulation. (kbr)
June 16, 2009 496 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal (1) Notice of Motion and Motion by Investor Defendants for Attorneys Fees and Costs; (2) Declarations of Robert G. Badal, Annette L.Hurst, Alisa S. Edelson, and Mark G. Matuschak 494 . The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the above-listed documents. (jp)
June 15, 2009 495
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal (1) Notice of Motion and Motion by Investor Defendants for Attorneys Fees and Costs; (2) Proposed Order; (3) Declarations of Robert G. Badal, Annette L. Hurst, Alisa S. Edelson, and Mark G. Matuschak 494 served on 6/15/2009. (jp)
June 12, 2009 486
VEOH'S RESPONSE TO UMG'S OBJECTIONS TO "NEWLY SUBMITTED EVIDENCE" BY VEOH IN SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to RE ENTITLEMENT TO SECTION 512(c) SAFE HARBOR MOTION for Summary Judgment as to RE ENTITLEMENT TO SECTION 512(c) SAFE HARBOR 449 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
June 11, 2009 481 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: denying 447 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice to Veoh's ability to file a new motion raising this issue at a later stage of this case, if necessary. See document for details. (yb)
June 9, 2009 483 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Documents in support of Veoh's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safe Harbor; (1) Veoh's Reply to Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact; and (2) Veoh's Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Edelman and Horowitz, and Other Exhibits 482 . (jp)
June 8, 2009 471
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to RE ENTITLEMENT TO SECTION 512(c) SAFE HARBOR MOTION for Summary Judgment as to RE ENTITLEMENT TO SECTION 512(c) SAFE HARBOR 449 VEOH'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY VEOH filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
June 3, 2009 464
MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich:, RE: MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 , MOTION for Protective Order for Allowing Veoh to Cease Storing Video Files 447 . Court questions counsel and listens to their responses. Separate orders to issue. Court Recorder: CS 06-03-2009. (yb)
June 1, 2009 463
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATOIN OF ERIN RANAHAN)(Ranahan, Erin)
May 29, 2009 458 Opinion or Order of the Court
Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Entry of Final Judgment)(Walker, Amanda)
May 28, 2009 455
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: MOTION for Protective Order for Allowing Veoh to Cease Storing Video Files 447 . ( Motion re-set for hearing on 6/3/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich.) (yb)
May 27, 2009 456 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING Application to File Under Seal Declaration of Rebecca Calkins in support of Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safe Harbor 452 . (jp)
May 26, 2009 451
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp. of Declaration of Brian Ledahl in Opposition to Veoh's Motion for Protective Order. (Karp, Joshua)
May 22, 2009 453
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., re APPLICATION to Seal 452 served on 5/22/09. (kbr)
May 21, 2009 445
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER CALENDARING VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL UMG TO PRODUCE CHAIN OF TITLE DOCUMENTS 432 held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. The parties are advised that Veoh's Motion to Compel UMG to Produce Chain of Title Documents is calendared for hearing on Wednesday, June 3, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 690. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
May 19, 2009 444
REPLY in Opposition to MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carter Batsell (Supplemental) in Support of UMG's Opposition to Veoh's Motion to Compel Additional Chain-of-Title Documents)(Batsell, Carter)
May 15, 2009 441
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Erin Ranahan, # 2 Proposed Order Revised)(Ranahan, Erin)
May 12, 2009 440
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of 432 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carter Batsell ISO UMG's Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Batsell Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Batsell Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Batsell Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Batsell Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Batsell Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Batsell Declaration)(Batsell, Carter)
May 11, 2009 438
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File completion of mediation filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
May 7, 2009 437 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: Granting 435 UMG'S Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File to Response to Veoh's Motion to Compel UMG to Produce Further Chain of Title Documents. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: UMG'S Opposition to Veoh's Motion shall be due by May 12, 2009. (es)
May 6, 2009 436
Amendment to EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Dea 435 Omitted Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
May 5, 2009 434 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Having allowed UMG ample opportunity to frame viable claims, the Court GRANTS 320 the Investor Defendants motion to dismiss with prejudice. (se)
May 4, 2009 432
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel UMG To Produce Chain Of Title Documents For The Remaining 80% Of Identified Copyrights Based On Defects Admitted By UMG, Or Alternatively, Extending Veoh's Deadline To Complete Its Analysis Of The 20% Sample Of Chain Of Title Documents filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ranahan and Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibit F to Ranahan Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ranahan, Erin)
April 29, 2009 431
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: Court hereby VACATES Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment 336 , and DENIES the pending Ex Parte Applications 412 , 425 . The parties are not to file any further summary judgment motions until the close of non-expert discovery. Once non-expert discovery has ended, any party may file a motion or a renewed motion for summary judgment. If a motion refers to exhibits that were previously filed, the exhibits need not be filed anew. (jp)
April 28, 2009 430
Certification Re Complete Production per April 6, 2009 [Docket 401] filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. re: Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,, 401 (Ranahan, Erin)
April 27, 2009 428
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp., re: UMG's Opposition to Veoh's Ex Parte Application For Permission to Supplement the Record re: Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment served on April 27, 2009. (Batsell, Carter)
April 24, 2009 425
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement the Record in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment to Incorporate UMG's Recent Withdrawal of Alleged Infringements re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor 336 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ranahan, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Ranahan, Erin)
April 21, 2009 424
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Final Pretrial Conference continued to 8/3/2009 11:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz; Jury Trial continued to 8/18/2009 08:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. All other dates are changed accordingly. (se) Modified on 4/29/2009 (smo).
April 15, 2009 423
JOINT REPORT of Scheduling Proposals Pursuant to April 6, 2009 Order filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Badal in Support of Investor Defendants' Scheduling Proposal)(Batsell, Carter)
April 14, 2009 422
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. correcting Response (non-motion) 419 to UMG's Objections to Newly Submitted Evidence by Veoh ISO Its Motion for Summary Judgment 420 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Response to UMG's Objections)(Ranahan, Erin)
April 10, 2009 411 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion to Compel. See document for details. (yb)
April 9, 2009 408
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz Taking off calendar and under submission MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor 336 . (se)
April 8, 2009 433 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING VEOH'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal - Veoh's Opposition to UMG's Ex parte Application for Permission to Supplement the Record in support of its Opposition to Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safe Harbor; and Declaration of Melissa Purcell in support of Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safe Harbor. (jp)
April 7, 2009 407 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting 406 Application to File Under Seal Reply to plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact; Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Edelman and Horowitz, and Other Exhibits, Declarations of Metzger and Ranahan in support of Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safter Harbor. (jp)
April 6, 2009 406
APPLICATION to File Under Seal Reply to plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact; Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Edelman and Horowitz, and Other Exhibits, Declarations of Metzger and Ranahan in support of Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment re Entitlement to Section 512(C) Safter Harbor, filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. (jp)
April 3, 2009 391
DECLARATION of Brian Ledahl In Opposition To EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for To Stay Limited Discovery Between UMG and Investor Defendants 389 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ledahl, Brian)
April 2, 2009 389
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for To Stay Limited Discovery Between UMG and Investor Defendants filed by Investor Defendant Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert G. Badal and Exhibits A through E in Support of Investor Defendants' Ex Parte Application, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Investor Defendants' Ex Parte Application)(Walker, Amanda)
April 1, 2009 387
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re: Marked Deposition Transcripts re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor 336 (Batsell, Carter)
March 31, 2009 379 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE VEOH'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED INTERROGATORY RESPONSES by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: granting in part and denying in part 229 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. Compliance within 21 days is required. See document for details. (yb)
March 30, 2009 377
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Electronic Version of Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Re Entitlement to Section 512(c) Safe Harbor 336 (Batsell, Carter)
March 26, 2009 375
MINUTES OF ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON CALENDAR MARCH 30, 2009 TO APRIL 6, 2009 held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: The parties are advised that the following motions on calendar March 30, 2009, are being continued to April 6, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 690: 1) Plaintiffs motion to compel Veoh to produce its audible magic metadata; 2) Plaintiffs motion for sanctions and to compel compliance with prior court orders; and 3) Veohs motion to compel UMGs digital blog and instant messages IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
March 23, 2009 374
REPLY in Support of MOTION for Hearing Motion to Comepl UMH'S Digital Blog and Instant Messages: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 349 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Cheng, # 2 Declaration of Erin Ranahan)(Ranahan, Erin)
March 20, 2009 373
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION AND OFF CALENDAR Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 320 . (se)
March 19, 2009 371
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 336) from April 13, 2009 to April 27, 2009 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 336) from April 13, 2009 to April 27, 2009 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 336) from April 13, 2009 to April 27, 2009 370 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Golinveaux)(Ranahan, Erin)
March 18, 2009 370
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Veoh's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 336) from April 13, 2009 to April 27, 2009 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven A. Marenberg ISO UMG's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ledahl ISO UMG's Ex Parte Application, # 3 Exhibit A to Ledahl Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Ledahl Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Ledahl Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Batsell, Carter)
March 16, 2009 360
DECLARATION of AMANDA WALKER in support of Reply Memorandum to MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 320 filed by Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP. (jp)
March 13, 2009 343
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: no Certification of Interested Parties RE: Answer to Complaint 342 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (se)
March 12, 2009 358 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING VEOH'S APPLICATION TO FULE UNDER SEAL by Judge A. Howard Matz, re APPLICATION to Seal Exhibit N to the Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux. 345 (kbr)
March 11, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, Granting Veoh's Application to File Under Seal 340 (es)
March 10, 2009 341
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., re Application to File Under Seal 340 ; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal; Veoh's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel UMG'S Digital Blog and Instant Messages; Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan in Support of Motion to Compel; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel (es)
March 9, 2009 334
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., served on Veoh's application to file under seal the declaration of Erin R. Ranahan; Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan in Support of Veoh Networks, Inc., Opposition to UMG's Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Veoh to produce Its Audible Magic Metadaa; Proposed Order. (es) Modified on 3/11/2009 (es).
March 6, 2009 331
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Veoh Networks, Inc., served on Veoh Application to File Under Seal the Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan; Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan in Support of Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to UMG's Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Compliance With Prior Court Orders; Proposed Order Granting Veoh's Application to File Under Seal the Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan. (es) Modified on 3/11/2009 (es).
March 5, 2009 321 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE VEOH'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PRODUCE CHAIN OF TITLE/RIGHTS INFORMATION RE ALLGEDGLY INFRINGING WORKS by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG To Identify Works at Issue 221 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Veoh's Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part (see document for further details). (yb) Modified on 3/9/2009 (yb).
March 4, 2009 318
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp. of (1) JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING UMG'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH PRIOR COURT ORDERS and (2) DECLARATION OF BRIAN LEDAHL IN SUPPORT OF UMG'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH PRIOR COURT ODERS. (Glatstein, Benjamin)
March 2, 2009 316
PROOF OF SERVICE re Notice of Motion and Motion by Investor Defendants to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP, served on 3/2/09 by First Class Mail, Overnight Courier and Electronic Mail. (se)
February 23, 2009 307
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp. of SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DIRECT, CONTRIBUTORY, AND VICARIOUS COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, AND FOR INDUCEMENT OF COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT. (Glatstein, Benjamin)
February 18, 2009 306
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Pursuant to February 11, 2009 Order re Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
February 11, 2009 304
AMENDED ORDER RE VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL UMG TO PRODUCE CHAIN OF TITLE/RIGHTS INFORMATION RE ALLEGEDLY INFRINGED WORKS BY Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 . The motion is granted in part and denied in part. The parties are directed to lodge by February 18, 2009 a joint proposed order. See document for further details. (yb)
February 10, 2009 301
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
February 4, 2009 299
MINUTES OF ORDER REGARDING VEOHS MOTION TO COMPEL UMG TO PRODUCE CHAIN OFTITLE/RIGHTS INFORMATION REGARDING ALLEGEDLY INFRINGED WORKS held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: The motion is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. The parties are directed to lodge by February 10, 2009 a joint proposed order in substantially the same form as the order concerning this issue that was filed in UMG Recordings, Inc. v. DivX, Inc., Case No. CV 07-6835-AHM (AJWx) on February 3, 2009. IT IS SO ORDERED. 222 (es)
February 2, 2009 298
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Investor Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 174 . If plaintiffs wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, they must do so not later than 2/23/09. (se)
January 20, 2009 297 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re Stipulation for Relief, 296 .IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Veoh may have until January 26, 2009 to produce documents from its "Skype" accounts pursuant to the Court's December 23 Order, and UMG may have until January 29, 2009, to produce documents from Messrs. Urie's and Iovine's files pursuant to the Court's Decvember 29 Order. See document for further details. (yb)
January 16, 2009 296
Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Deadlines for Compliance With Discovery Orders filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
December 31, 2008 295
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: To correct a clerical error in the Courts December 29, 2008 Order docket no. 293 , the Court orders that the corrected version be docketed in lieu of the originally docketed version. (lc)
December 30, 2008 292
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12-17-08 10:32 a.m. (ha)
December 29, 2008 293
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court Denies UMG RECORDINGS, INC MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 117 . (lc) (lc).
December 23, 2008 289
MINUTES OF ORDER REGARDING UMGS MOTION TO COMPEL REGARDING (1) SEARCH TERMS,(2) CUSTODIANS, AND (3) SKYPE ACCOUNTS held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: As to issue 1, the motion is granted in part and denied in part. As to issue 2, the motion is denied. As to issue 3, the motion is granted. Compliance by January 20, 2009 is required. IT IS SO ORDERED. 257 SEE ATTACHED DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (es)
December 22, 2008 287
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/17/08 10:32a.m. & 12:23p.m. (bem, )
December 17, 2008 285
MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich:, RE: MOTION to Compel regarding (1) Search Terms, (2) Custodians, and (3) "Skype" Accounts MOTION to Compel regarding (1) Search Terms, (2) Custodians, and (3) "Skype" Accounts MOTION to Compel regarding (1) Search Terms, (2) Custodians, and (3) "Skype" Accounts 257 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff UMG Recordings, Inc. 229 , MOTION to Compel the Addition of Custodians and Production of Documents 225 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG To Identify Works at Issue 221 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Financial Information and Damages 227 . The parties have resolved part of Veoh's renewed motion to compel plaintiff to identify the works at issue. As stated on the record, plaintiff will serve supplemental responses to interrogatories 1, 2 and 3, and plaintiff will produce documents in response to request 26 by January 9, 2009. In addition the deadline for plaintiff to provide a complete list of the allegedly infringed works at issue in this case is January 16, 2009. Plaintiff may seek an extension of that deadline, if necessary. To this extent, the motion is granted. All other motions are argued and submitted for decision. Court Smart: CS 12-17-2008. (yb)
December 15, 2008 284
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG To Identify Works at Issue 221 , Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities 222 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
December 11, 2008 282
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The parties have requested that the Court extend the deadline and allow them to submit another Joint Status Report as to the claims against the "investor defendants" and the adjustment to the case schedule. The Court has strong views about whether certain of the proposals set forth in at least one of the parties' draft proposals are either consistent with the Court's proposal, necessary, or even appropriate, but will await the parties next status report. Good cause appearing, the Court extends the deadline to 12/15/2008. The Court will not grant any further extensions. (jp)
December 10, 2008 276
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG To Identify Works at Issue 221 ITS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UMG TO IDENTIFY WORKS AT ISSUE filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
December 5, 2008 272
MINUTES OF ORDER RE-CALENDARING VARIOUS DISCOVERY HEARINGS held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: The parties are advised that the following motions listed below are being continued for hearing from December 15, 2008 to December 17, 2008, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 690, Roybal Federal Courthouse. (see attached document for details) (es)
December 4, 2008 273
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Defendants' MOTION to Sever And Stay 238 , Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing 240 , and the Court's proposal as stated on the record. Defendants' Ex Parte Application is DENIED. The Court VACATES the 12/22/08 hearing date on Defendants' Motion to Sever and to Stay. The Court also ORDERS the parties to meet and confer regarding the scheduling order and the Court's proposal. Thereafter, the parties shall file on or before December 10, 2008 a joint status report. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (mg)
December 3, 2008 267
MINUTES OF ORDER REGARDING UMGS MOTION TO COMPEL VEOH TO APPEAR AT RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: Veoh has filed a statement of non-opposition. The motion is granted. 210 (es)
December 2, 2008 262
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court is about to commence work on the various motions that are now pending. (Regrettably, the crush of other work has caused a delay.) The Court has become aware that Robert Badal, Esq. represents Shelter Capital Partners LLC and Shelter Venture Fund LP. Mr. Badal is a friend of the Court. The Court has gone to lunch with him and has socialized with him (with spouses present) on infrequent occasions, although not at the residence of either couple. Mr. Badal invited the Court to speak at a legal conference in 2007. The Court does not find that this relationship will interfere with, much less prevent, the Court from carrying out its responsibilities properly and ethically. (jp)
December 1, 2008 252
SUPPLEMENT to Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Financial Information and Damages 227 PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2.3 IN SUPPORT OF VEOH'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RELATING TO FINANCIAL INFORMATION AND DAMAGES filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
November 26, 2008 239
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs Should Not Be Found in Contempt for Refusal to Comply With This Court's Order, and for an Order Enforcing Compliance with Prior Court Order filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application)(Calkins, Rebecca)
November 25, 2008 231
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp. of Declaration of Brian Ledahl in Support of UMG's Opposition to Veoh's Motion to Compel Verified Interrogatory Responses. (Batsell, Carter)
November 24, 2008 222
NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff UMG to Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Allegedly Infringed Works: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/15/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Ranahan in Support of Renewed Motion, # 2 Declaration of Rebecca Calkins in Support of Renwed Motion, # 3 Declaration of Tom Lane in Support of Renwed Motion, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion)(Ranahan, Erin)
November 21, 2008 220 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE UMG'S MOTION TO COMPEL VEOH TO PROVIDE RESPONSES OR FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM VEOH NETWORKS 71 . The Court trusts that the parties already have complied with the Court's 8-25-08 ruling. Only those issues not already resolved during the 8-25-08 hearing are addressed. See document for further details. (yb)
November 20, 2008 218 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE VEOH'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLIANTIFFS AND THEIR COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE HELD IBN CONTEMPT by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE FOUND IN CONTEMPT FOR REFUSAL TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER 215 . The ex parte application is denied without prejudice. (yb)
November 19, 2008 216
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: incorrect event selected RE: APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE FOUND IN CONTEMPT FOR REFUSAL TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER 215 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (se)
November 18, 2008 217 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE UMG'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING VEOH TO RETAIN EVIDENCE by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Requiring Veoh to Retain Evidence 190 The ex parte application is granted. (yb)
November 15, 2008 214
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS AMENDED ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING before Judge A. Howard Matz: Effective January 1, 2008, electronic filing has been mandatory for most new and pending civil cases in the USDC, Central District of California. Self-represented litigants and attorneys who take appropriate steps to opt out of the system need not comply with the following requirements. All documents which are required to be filed in an electronic format pursuant to General Order No. 08-03 must be filed electronically no later than midnight on the date due, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Documents filed late may be stricken by the Court. The Court will not accept documents which were filed electronically, but which otherwise fail to comply with filing requirements. (See document for further details). Unles s otherwise ordered, chambers paper copies of all electronically filed documents must be delivered to the courtesy box outside chambers no later than 12:00 noon the following business day. The chambers paper copies must comply with Local Rule 11-3, i.e., blue backed, font size, page numbering, tabbed exhibits, etc., unless otherwise directed. IF A DOCUMENT CONTAINS EXHIBITS THAT ARE NOT TABBED, THE COURT MAY DECLINE TO READ THE EXHIBITS. The chambers paper copy must be prominently labeled"CHAMBERS COPY" on the face page. (jp)
November 12, 2008 212
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing re: UMG's Motion to Compel Veoh to Appear at Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re: UMG Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time)(Glatstein, Benjamin)
November 7, 2008 204
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANT SHELTER CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC, SHELTER VENTURE FUND, LP'S MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 174 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (jp)
November 4, 2008 201
MINUTES OF ORDER REGARDING UMG'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: The ex parte application is denied. (SEE ATTACHED DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (es)
November 3, 2008 200
DECLARATION of Robert G. Badal in support of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 174 filed by Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP. (Hurst, Annette)
October 31, 2008 198
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 197 served on 10/31/2008. (Ranahan, Erin)
October 29, 2008 195
DECLARATION of Rebecca Lawlor Calkins In Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Identify Works At Issue and Produce Chain of Title/Rights Information Re Same ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 194 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
October 28, 2008 193 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: Veoh shall file their motion to compel plaintiff to identify works at issue and produce chain of title/right information regarding same by October 29, 2008. Any opposition shall be filed by November 7, 2008. No reply will be allowed. Hearing on the motion shall be noticed for November 13, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 690. (yb)
October 27, 2008 192
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 174 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
October 22, 2008 189
REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Compliance with Prior Court Order to Provide Supplemental Responses and Production of Documents 183 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rebecca Calkins Declaration)(Calkins, Rebecca)
October 21, 2008 188
DECLARATION of Brian Ledahl In Opposition To EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Compliance with Prior Court Order to Provide Supplemental Responses and Production of Documents 183 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ledahl, Brian)
October 20, 2008 186
DECLARATION of Benjamin Glatstein In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re: Depositions 166 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Glatstein, Benjamin)
October 17, 2008 184
DECLARATION of Rebecca Lawlor Calkins in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Compliance with Prior Court Order to Provide Supplemental Responses and Production of Documents 183 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Calkins, Rebecca)
October 16, 2008 178 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Robert Badal and Annette Hurst in place of attorney Heller Ehrman, LLP and [Proposed] Order 170 . Substituting attorney Annette L Hurst for Shelter Capital Partners LLC and Shelter Venture Fund LP, Robert G Badal for Shelter Capital Partners LLC and Shelter Venture Fund LP in place and stead of Heller Ehrman LLP. (se)
October 14, 2008 167
DECLARATION of Harvey Geller In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re: Depositions 166 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Glatstein, Benjamin)
October 10, 2008 164
STATEMENT of REPLY STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Veoh's Second Affirmative Defense 117 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
October 8, 2008 161
NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP (Badal, Robert)
October 7, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz Granting APPLICATION for attorney Mark G. Matuschak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Spark Capital LLC, Spark Capital LP.Maria K. Vento is designated as local counsel (PHV FEE PAID) 155 . (jp)
October 2, 2008 155
APPLICATION for attorney Mark G. Matuschak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.), filed by defendants Spark Capital LLC, Spark Capital LP. (jp)
September 30, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR NEW PARTIES TO BE BOUND BY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re Stipulation for Protective Order 125 . (yb)
September 29, 2008 149
STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF VEOH NETWORKS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO UMGS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: VEOHS SECOND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (17 U.S.C. § 512) re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Veoh's Second Affirmative Defense 117 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
September 23, 2008 143
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court DENIES the EX PARTE APPLICATION by Investor Defendants to Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 134 . Defendant Veoh has an interest in defending the pending Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and the resources and counsel to present fully any basis for the Court to reject that motion. The Investor Defendants have established no prejudice warranting this unusual "relief." (jp)
September 22, 2008 136
DECLARATION of Sean M. Sullivan in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment from October 20, 2008 to a date subsequent to the Courts ruling on the Investor Defendants forthcoming motions to dismiss 134 filed by Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP. (Sullivan, Sean)
September 15, 2008 131
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp., upon Shelter Capital Partners LLC served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by State statute, upon Jessica Evans, secretary. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons returned. (Ledahl, Brian)
September 10, 2008 125
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for New Parties to Be Bound By Protective Order)(Ranahan, Erin)
September 9, 2008 122
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Maria K Vento on behalf of Defendants Spark Capital LLC, Spark Capital LP (Vento, Maria)
September 8, 2008 121
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 111 , Statement 110 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
September 5, 2008 123
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs UMG Recordings, Inc., et al. re Memorandum in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, UMG's Local Rule 56-1 Statement,Declaration of Brian Ledahl, Declaration of service served on 9/5/08. (se)
September 4, 2008 115
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Annette L Hurst on behalf of Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP (Hurst, Annette)
September 3, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz DENIED Joint Stipulation Regarding Enlargement of Briefs 113 . (jp)
September 2, 2008 112
DECLARATION of ERIN R. RANAHAN re Statement 110 SUMMARY OF DISCOVERY ORDERS IN MYSPACE/GROUPER ACTIONS RELEVANT TO CURRENT DISCOVERY DISPUTES filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I)(Ranahan, Erin)
August 29, 2008 108
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 8/25/08 10:07AM. (ml)
August 28, 2008 106
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.to Notice of Decision by other Court 105 (Ledahl, Brian)
August 26, 2008 104
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Shelter Capital Partners LLC, Shelter Venture Fund LP, Spark Capital LLC, Spark Capital LP, Tornante Company LLC, Veoh Networks, Inc.; Party DOES terminated amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , filed by plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp. (jp) (se). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2008: # 1 20 Days Summon Issued on First Amended Complaint, # 2 20 Days Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint, # 3 20 Days Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint, # 4 20 Days Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint) (jp).
August 25, 2008 144
MINUTES OF 1) Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery Responses From Defendant; and 2) Defendant's Motion To Compel Further Responses And For Production Of Documents From Plaintiff held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. Court denies defendant's motion to compel withou prejudice. By September 2, 2008, the parties shall file supplemental briefs concerning plaintiff's motion to compel. The parties shall complete their core production of documents by September 30, 2008. The parties shall serve supplemental responses to the requests, and if any documents are being withheld on the ground of privilege, a specific privilege claim, by September 30, 2008. The parties shall exchange custodians and search terms by September 5, 2008. If defendant intends to rely upon an advice of counsel defense, it must notify plaintiff no later than November 15, 2008. Court Smart: CS-8/25/08. (mz)
August 22, 2008 103
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 . No hearing necessary. (se)
August 7, 2008 102
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Courts own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION Plaintiffs (Amended) Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 92 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (smo)
August 4, 2008 100
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON CALENDAR AUGUST 11, 2008 TO AUGUST 25, 2008 held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. The parties are advised that defendant's motion to compel further responses and for production of documents and plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses calendared for August 11, 2008, are being continued to August 25, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
July 28, 2008 99
SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BRIAN LEDAHL IN SUPPORT OF UMG'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM VEOH NETWORKS 71 filed (lra)
July 25, 2008 91
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Discovery Hearing, 59 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
July 24, 2008 86
DECLARATIONS OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., Veoh's Application to File Under Seal (1) Declaration of David Muller In Support of Veoh's Opposition to UMG's Motion to Compel; and (2) Exhibit I to Declaration of Golinveaux in Support of Veoh's Opposition to UMG's Motion to Compel; Exhibit I to Declaration of Goliveaux in Support of Veoh's Opposition; Declaration of David Muller in Support of Veoh's Opposition served on July 1, 2008 and Veoh's Application to File Under Seal (1) Declaration of David Muller In Support of Veoh's Opposition to UMG's Motion to Compel; and (2) Exhibit I to Declaration of Golinveaux in Support of Veoh's Opposition to UMG's Motion to Compel; [Proposed] Order Granting Veoh's Application to File Under Seal etc. served on July 24, 2008. (Ranahan, Erin)
July 22, 2008 85
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: (1) Incorrect event selected; (2) Proposed document was not submitted as separate attachment RE: Notice of Under Seal Filing 79 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (mz)
July 21, 2008 90
SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BRIAN LEDAHL IN SUPPORT IN OF UMG'S OPPOSITION OF VEOH'S MOTION TO COMPEL Further Responses and for Production of Documents from Plaintiffs UMG Recording, Inc. et al. 73 filed (lra)
July 18, 2008 70
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Courts own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (smo)
July 15, 2008 67
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court directs the parties to meet and confer and by not later than 7/18/2008 file a single, joint status report specifying one, and only one, of the following: (1) The parties jointly request the Court to rule on the pending motion. or (2) At least one party (not to be specified) requests that the Court not rule on the pending motion. (jp)
July 14, 2008 66
DECLARATION of Brian Ledahl IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
July 3, 2008 64
DECLARATION of Jennifer A. Golinveaux in opposition to MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 (DECLARATION OF JENNIFER A. GOLINVEAUX IN SUPPORT OF VEOH NETWORKS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO UMG'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS) filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C through G)(Ranahan, Erin)
June 24, 2008 60 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS FROM JULY 7, 2008 TO JULY 21, 2008 by Judge A. Howard Matz, re Stipulation for Hearing 58 : Having considered the parties Joint Stipulation Continuing Hearing Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend to Add Defendants and good cause appearing, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend to Add Defendants, which is currently noticed for July 7, 2008, is hereby continued to July 21, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Defendant shall file its opposition papers by July 4, 2008 and Plaintiffs shall file their reply papers by July 14, 2008. (bm)
June 23, 2008 59
MINUTES OF VEOH NETWORKS, INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. Plaintiff will prepare a new version of the protective order, clear it with defendant's counsel and submit it to the Court for approval.Court Smart: CS-6/23/08. (mz)
June 20, 2008 58
Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ranahan, Erin)
June 17, 2008 62
SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of ANJULI MCREYNOLDS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 54 filed (lra)
June 16, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz, granting UMG's APPLICATION toFile under SealDeclaration of Anjuli Mcreynolds In Support of UMG's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Add Defendants, filed 56 (lra)
June 11, 2008 52
OBJECTIONS in Opposition re: MOTION for Protective Order for protection of Veoh's Confidential Technological and commercial information 44 Objections to Declaration of Joseph Papa filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Ledahl, Brian)
June 9, 2008 51
DECLARATION of JOSEPH PAPA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Protective Order for protection of Veoh's Confidential Technological and commercial information 44 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
May 27, 2008 48
Amendment to MOTION for Protective Order for protection of Veoh's Confidential Technological and commercial information 44 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
May 22, 2008 47
DECLARATION of Brian Ledahl In Support of Veoh's Motion For Entry of Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order for protection of Veoh's Confidential Technological and commercial information 44 filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Ranahan, Erin)
May 20, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court
INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. See attached document for further details. (mz)
May 19, 2008 42
Interim STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
March 25, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge A. Howard Matz: Pursuant to the Stipulation 38 of the parties, the Court enteres the following schedule for this action: Last day to file motion to amend pleadings or add parties 6/16/2008., Non-expert discovery cut-off 1/12/2009. Last day to conduct settlement conference 1/20/2009. Opening expert witness disclosures 1/20/2009. Last day to hand serve and file motions (other than In Limine) 1/26/2009. Rebuttal expert witness disclosures 2/16/2009. Last day for hearing motions 2/23/2009. Last day to meet before final pretrial conference 2/23/2009. Expert discovery cut-off 3/9/2009. Last day to hand serve Motions in Limine 3/9/2009. Lodge pretrial conference order 3/23/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2009 at 11:00 AM. Trial set for 4/21/2009 at 08:00 AM. (jp)
March 21, 2008 38
Joint STIPULATION for Order to set schedule filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
March 20, 2008 37
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re Summary Judgment Briefing Filed in IO v. Veoh Re Veoh's Safe Harbor Under Section 512(c) of the DMCA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C-Part 1 of 2# 4 Exhibit C-Part 2 of 2# 5 Exhibit D-Part 1 of 3# 6 Exhibit D-Part 2 of 3# 7 Exhibit D-Part 3 of 3# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J# 14 Exhibit K# 15 Exhibit L-Part 1 of 2# 16 Exhibit L-Part 2 of 2# 17 Exhibit M)(Ranahan, Erin)
March 17, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Jury Trial set at 8:00 AM by not later than 10/6/2009, estimated length 12 days. Final Pretrial Conference; Hearing on Motions in Limine; File Agreed UponSet of Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms and Joint Statement re Disputed Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Proposed Voir Dire Qs and Agreed-toStatement of Case at 11:00 a.m., date TBD. Lodge Pretrial Conf. Order; File Memo of Contentions of Fact and Law; Exhibit List; Witness List; Status Report re Settlement, date TBD. Last day for hand-serving Motions in Limine, date TBD. Last Day to Meet Before Final Pretrial Conference (L.R. 16-2), date TBD. Last day for hearing motions at 10:00 a.m., date TBD. Last day for hand-serving motions and filing (other than Motions in Limine), date TBD. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/12/2009. ADDITIONAL MATTERS TO BE DETERMINED AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: L.R. 16-14 Settlement Choice: (3) Outside ADR. Expert Discovery cut-off, date TBD. Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure, date TBD. Opening Expert Witness Disclosure [See F.R. Civ.P. 26(a)(2)], date TBD. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/19/2009. Last Day to Amend Pleadings or add parties is 6/16/2008. (bm)
March 10, 2008 36
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-30 days, filed by Plaintiffs Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd., Universal Music Corp... (Ledahl, Brian)
February 22, 2008 35
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING held before Judge A. Howard Matz (se)
December 20, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: This case has been assigned to Judge A. Howard Matz. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on all defendants, plaintiff shall promptly do so and shall file proofs of service within three days thereafter. Defendants also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three days thereafter.Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2008.,Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2008 01:30 PM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (smo)
December 14, 2007 33
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc..(Ranahan, Erin)
November 29, 2007 32
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz : Given the decision of Judge Whelan in Veoh Networks, Inc. v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al. (07-CV-01568 TJW) (S.D. action) to dismiss that action without prejudice, this Court hereby LIFTS THE STAY in this action. In this case, on September 25, 2007, Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. (Veoh) moved to dismiss, or in the alternative transfer or stay, Plaintiff UMG Recordings, Inc.s (UMG) complaint because (1) the first-to-file rule supports dismissal given the S.D. action that was previously pending before Judge Whelan, (2) UMGs claims in this action are compulsory counterclaims in the S.D. action and (3) the convenience of the parties and witnesses warrants transfer to the Southern District. Because Judge Whelan dismissed the S.D. action and this action is related to pending cases before this Court, the Court DENIES Defendant Veohs Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay. No hearing is necessary 10 , 29 . (smo)
October 23, 2007 29
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz : The following chart reflects the key procedural developments in this case and in Veoh Networks, Inc. v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al. (07-CV-01568 TJW), which is currently pending before Judge Whelan in the Southern District of California (S.D. Action). These two actions arise from a single dispute between the same parties. Each party has brought suit in the forum of its choice. UMG is the first party to move to replace the opposing partys forum. UMGs motion was filed first and scheduled for hearing first. Given the fact that UMG filed its motion to dismiss or transfer the S.D. Action before Veoh moved to dismiss or transfer this action and given that the issues before this Court involve the same considerations that are before Judge Whelan in UMGs motion, the Court STAYS this action pending Judge Whelans ruling. This Court will not consider it an imposition if Judge Whelan grants UMGs motion to transfer the S.D. Action to this Court.No hearing is necessary. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. The Court will advise the parties if a hearing becomes necessary.(smo)
October 16, 2007 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Thomas P. Lane as counsel for Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc., designating Rebecca Lawlor Calkins as local counsel 25 is GRANTED by Judge A. Howard Matz.(jp)
October 15, 2007 25
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thoms P. Lane for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID, filed by defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. Lodged Order. (jp)
October 12, 2007 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing Date 16 . The hearing for Veoh's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to Transfer or Stay 10 is CONTINUED to 10/29/2007. Related filing deadlines shall be based upon the 10/29/2007, hearing date (see document for further details). (jp)
September 27, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
APPLICATION to File Certification as to Interested Parties Under Seal. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge A. Howard Matz. (jp)
September 26, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz, ORDERING Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Rebecca Lawlor Calkins; and Declaration of John Fitzgerald submitted by Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. received on 9/25/2007 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (jp)
September 20, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MATZ by Judge A. Howard Matz: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER ONALL DEFENDANTS AND/OR THEIR COUNSEL ALONG WITH THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, OR IF THAT IS NOT PRACTICABLE AS SOON AS POSSIBLE THEREAFTER. IF THIS CASE WAS ASSIGNED TO THIS COURT AFTER BEING REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, THE DEFENDANT WHO REMOVED THE CASE SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER ON ALL OTHER PARTIES. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge A Howard Matz. Judge Matz is intent on assuring that, as called forin Fed.R.Civ.P.1, this case will proceed so as "to secure [a], just, speedy and inexpensive determination." The parties are hereby informed of how they are expected to proceed. (See order for further details)(shb)
September 18, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 07.02 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 06-6561 AHM (AJWx). Case transfered from Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman and George H Wu to Judge A. Howard Matz and Andrew J. Wistrich for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 07-5744 AHM (AJWx).Signed by Judge A. Howard Matz (rn)
September 4, 2007 4
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Veoh Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - MBG Music Publishing Ltd.
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veoh Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Erin R Ranahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?