Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears v. Britney J Spears Featured Case
Plaintiff: Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears
Defendant: Britney J Spears
Case Number: 2:2008cv01021
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Rosalyn M Chapman
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2009 Filing 46 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REQUEST FOR LEGAL ADVICE held before Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada: In light of the foregoing authorities, the Court denies plaintiffs motion.#(am)
March 24, 2008 Filing 45 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Striking Papers Filed by Jon Eardley held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court hereby orders stricken the following documents filed by Jon Eardley: Docket No: 36, 37, 38, 39, 40. As previously stated by this Courts order, Jon Eardley has no authority to act onbehalf of Britney Jean Spears. Further filings by Mr. Eardley in this matter that purport to be on behalf of Britney Jean Spears will warrant sanctions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez ORDERING Opposition to Motion to Remand; Declaration of Jon Eardley submitted by Defendant Britney J Spears received on 2/22/2008 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (vdr)
March 3, 2008 TRANSMITTAL of documents - mailed certified copy of Corrected Remand Order with civil docket sheet to the Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District of California. (bm)
February 27, 2008 Filing 34 LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT CV 103(ab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/29/2008 (ab, ).
February 26, 2008 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of "B" filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 40 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
February 26, 2008 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of "C" filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 39 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
February 26, 2008 Filing 38 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of JON EARDLEY filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 38 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
February 26, 2008 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT APPLICATION to Seal Notice Of Removal and Declarations of Declarants B and C 36 filed by DEFENDANT Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 37 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
February 26, 2008 Filing 35 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: ***CORRECTED*** Order on the Conservators Motion to Remand #33 . (Attachments: #1) (bm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2008 (jp, ).
February 26, 2008 Filing 33 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON THE CONSERVATOR'S MOTION TO REMAND before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez : the Court finds this motin appropriate for decision without oral argument; MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 is GRANTED; the Court ORDERS case to remanded to Superior Court State of California, County of Los Angeles, Case number BP108870, Probate Court; the Court finds tht it is inappropriate to award attorney's fees in this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2008 (ab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/29/2008 (ab, ).
February 26, 2008 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Response in Support of Motion, #30 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #31 served on February 25, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2008 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wexler in Support of Motion to Remand [28 U.S.C. 1447(c)] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2008 Filing 30 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand [28 U.S.C. 1447(c)] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2008 Filing 42 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Remand Case #5 ; Declaration of Jon Eardley filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (vdr)
February 22, 2008 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservatee of the Estate James P. Spears, re Order,, #28 Proof of Service of Order on Osama Lutfi served on February 22, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTNG EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date and (3) to Extend Deadline for serving TRO Papers #18 . The hearing date on the TRO against Mr. Lutfi is extended until 1:30 pm on March 17, 2008. The TRO is extended until the new hearing date. The deadline for serving Mr. Lutfi with copies of the TRO papers is extended until five days before the new hearing date. (ir)
February 21, 2008 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, Proof of Personal Service of Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order and related papers on Osama ("Sam") Lutfi served on February 21, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2008 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) #21 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #20 , Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion) #22 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for #18 , Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #19 served on February 20, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2008 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for #18 Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wexler)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2008 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Exhibit to Motion,,,, #9 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #14 , Exhibit to Motion, #17 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 , Certificate of Interested Parties #3 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #6 , Declaration (Motion related) #8 , Declaration (Motion related) #7 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #13 , Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) #10 , MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] #11 served on February 19-20, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] #11 . Any opposition to the motion to remand must be electronically filed by 2/22/08 with courtesy copies delivered to chambers by 12:00 noon on 2/25/08. Any reply papers in support of the motion to remand must be electronically filed by 2/25/08 with courtesy copies delivered to chambers by 12:00 noon on 2/26/08. The motion to remand will be submitted on the papers. (ir)
February 20, 2008 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spearsto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #16 Response of James P. Spears, Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate, to Order to Show Cause re Remand to State Court [Docket 16] (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 21 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for #18 Notice of Filing of Joinder by Samuel D. Ingham III, Court-Appointed Attorney for Britney Jean Spears, Temporary Conservatee filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for #18 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for #18 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for Serving TRO Papers filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Notice of Lodging of February 14, 2008 Probate Court Transcript in Connection with Motion to Remand to MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (2.14.08 Probate Court Transcript))(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 16 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAURS RE REMAND TO STATE COURT held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On Feb. 14, 2008, this action was removed to this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441. However, the jurisdictional allegations appear to be defective for the reason(s) opposite the box(es) checked: SEE DOCUMENT. Accordingly, the Court orders defendant(s) to show cause in writing no later than Friday Feb. 29, 2008 why this action should not be remanded for the reasons noted above. This deadline shall not extend the time for responding to any motion for remand filed by Plaintiff(s). Plaintiff(s) may submit a response in the same time period. Plaintiff(s) must submit a response within 30 days of the date of removal if the defects are procedural and plaintiff(s) object(s) and request(s) remand. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The parties are reminded that courtesy copies are to be delivered to Chambers. Failure of defendant(s) to respond by the above date will result in the Court remanding this action to state court. (es)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. All counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, particularly Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16, 26, and the Local Rules of the Central District of California, this Court's Order for Jury Trial, and this Court's Order for Court Trial. See document for details. (es)
February 19, 2008 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] #11 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Andrew M. Wallet in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] #11 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] #11 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 10 JOINDER in MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 Notice of Filing of Joinder in Motion to Remand [28 U.S.C. 1447(c)] by Samuel D. Ingham III, Court-Appointed Attorney for Britney Jean Spears, Temporary Conservatee filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 9 EXHIBIT to MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Remand [Probate Court's Publicly Filed Documents as of Time of Removal] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R#19 Exhibit S#20 Exhibit T#21 Exhibit U#22 Exhibit V#23 Exhibit W#24 Exhibit X#25 Exhibit Y#26 Exhibit Z#27 Exhibit AA#28 Exhibit BB#29 Exhibit CC#30 Exhibit DD#31 Exhibit EE#32 Exhibit FF#33 Exhibit GG#34 Exhibit HH#35 Exhibit II#36 Exhibit JJ#37 Exhibit KK#38 Exhibit LL#39 Exhibit MM#40 Exhibit NN#41 Exhibit OO#42 Exhibit PP#43 Exhibit QQ#44 Exhibit RR#45 Exhibit SS#46 Exhibit TT#47 Exhibit UU#48 Exhibit VV#49 Exhibit WW#50 Exhibit XX#51 Exhibit YY#52 Exhibit ZZ#53 Exhibit AAA#54 Exhibit BBB#55 Exhibit CCC)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Andrew M. Wallet in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court #5 filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears.Motion set for hearing on 3/17/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. Related Case(s): None (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2008 Filing 3 Certification as to Interested Parties of James P. Spears, Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate [Local Rule 7.1-1] of Interested Parties (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2008 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008 (ds, ).
February 14, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BP 108870 with NO CONFORMED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID. ), filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. [FILED ON DEMAND STATE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, NO COMPLAINT ATTACHED FROM STATE COURT.] (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008 (ds, ).
February 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Jon J Eardley is 516-876-6906. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears v. Britney J Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney J Spears
Represented By: Jon Jay Eardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?