Universal City Studios Productions LLLP et al v. RealNetworks, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc. and Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Defendant: RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv06412
Filed: September 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Otero
Presiding Judge: Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2008 Filing 22 RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transferred from California Central has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:08-cv-04719 filed 10/14/2008. (ds)
October 3, 2008 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of documents: Electronic documents are accessible through Pacer. (bp)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge S. James Otero transferring case to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp)
October 1, 2008 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for TRO served on 10/1/08. (Pomerantz, Glenn)
October 1, 2008 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., of Notice of Errata Re Public Redacted Version Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof served on 10/1/08. (Pomerantz, Glenn)
October 1, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Errata Re Public Redacted Version Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn)
October 1, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., served on 9/30/2008. (Bal, Colleen)
October 1, 2008 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for TRO filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn)
September 30, 2008 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge S. James Otero, (bp)
September 30, 2008 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a TRO filed by Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen)
September 30, 2008 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gordon Klein in Opposition to Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction APPLICATION to Seal APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bal, Colleen)
September 30, 2008 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Buzzard in Opposition to Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION to Seal APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen)
September 30, 2008 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jacqueline Lang in Opposition to Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Prder and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction APPLICATION to Seal APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Graves, Charles)
September 30, 2008 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , Declaration of Michael Dunn 6 , APPLICATION to Seal APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly 4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Interested Parties 2 , of Public Redacted Version Declaration of Gleen D. Pomerantz 8 , Public Redacted Version Notice of Application and Ex parte Application 7 served on 9/30/2008. (et) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 8 PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION DECLARATION of GLENN D. POMERANTZ in support of Ex parte APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Or der to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2008: # 1 Exhibits A - K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibits M - O) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 7 PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLIC re Ex parte APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Or der to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities 3 filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2008: # 1 Proposed Order) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 6 DECLARATION of MICHAEL DUNN in support of Ex parte application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION and to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 5 DECLARATION of DR. ALLAN E. BELL IN SUPPORT OF IN SUPPORT OF Ex parte application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION and to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et) Modified on 9/30/2008 (et). (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 4 DECLARATION of DR. JOHN P.J. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF Ex parte application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION and to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction 3 filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Sealing (1) Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re preliminary Injunction and Declaration Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of Ex parte Application and Ex parte APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: preliminary injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities and (2) Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in support of ex parte application of Glenn D. Pomerantz in support of Application to Seal filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2008: # 1 Proposed Order) (ds).
September 30, 2008 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fox Entertainment Group, Inc. for Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation; Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc. for Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc.; Corporate Parent Viacom, Inc. for Paramount Pictures Corporation; Corporate Parent NBC Universal, Inc. for Universal City Studios LLLP, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP; Corporate Parent Walt Disney Company for Disney Enterprises, Inc. (et) (ds).
September 30, 2008 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (et)
September 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants RealNetworks, Inc., RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiffs Universal City Studios LLLP, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal City Studios Productions LLLP et al v. RealNetworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal City Studios Productions LLLP
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal City Studios LLLP
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Pictures Television Inc.
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Betsy A Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealNetworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?