Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Flash Sales, Inc., Harold's Autobody, Motoring Parts International, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Prevatte Auto Supply Inc, DJ's Autobody, Inc., Nu-Parts Automotive Products Inc, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc, Sioux Plating Co. and Harold Autobody
Defendant: Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Sabry Lee Limited, Genera Corporation, E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Sabry Lee, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. and TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd
Petitioner: Travis Burau, Trang Nguyen, National Auto Parts, Inc., Pete Sahagian, Supreme Bodywerks, Inc. and Pete Sahagian Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs doing business as Sahagian Auto Body II
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States of America
Intervenor: Westminster Mutual Insurance Company
In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antiitrust Litigation
Case Number: 2:2009ml02007
Filed: February 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 871 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CY PRES DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS #847 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting #847 Plaintiffs' Motion for Disbursement of Remaining Settlement Funds. The remaining settlement funds in the amount of $5,128.30 shall be distributed forthwith to ICAS/Loyola. (twdb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 869 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew P Kanny counsel for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Shari Mulrooney Wollman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Shari Mulrooney Wollman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd and Genera Corporation. (Kanny, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 868 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew P Kanny counsel for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Matthew P. Kanny will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Matthew P. Kanny is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd and Genera Corporation. (Kanny, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 867 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Peter E. Halle will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Peter E. Halle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 866 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy Kent Ostrander counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Aaron A. Kahn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Ostrander, Jeremy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 865 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Eyitayo O. St. Matthew-Daniel will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Eyitayo O. St. Matthew-Daniel is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 864 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Brian Ming Hom will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Brian Ming Hom is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 863 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Thomas J. Lang will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Thomas J. Lang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 862 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. William P. Quinn, Jr. will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. William P. Quinn, Jr. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 861 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Willard K. Tom will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Willard K. Tom is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 860 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Kent M. Roger will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Kent M. Roger is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 859 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 851 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 849 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 852 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 854 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 853 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 850 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 855 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 856 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 848 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 857 e-mailed to joanna.rosen@lw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected.' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 858 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 851 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 849 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 852 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 854 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 853 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 850 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 855 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 856 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 848 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 857 e-mailed to ccorbitt@zelle.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 <: Recipient address rejected: User email address is marked as invalid.' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 857 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to makerman@steyerlaw.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient makerman@steyerlaw.com not found by SMTP address lookup. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 856 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to swollman@manatt.com bounced due to 550 5.7.1 RESOLVER.RST.NotAuthorized; not authorized. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 855 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to dwoods@mckoolsmithhennigan.com bounced due to 550 5.7.1 Unable to relay for dwoods@mckoolsmithhennigan.com. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 854 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to tstmatthew-daniel@morganlewis.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 853 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to jandrews@blechercollins.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [jandrews@blechercollins.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [CY1NAM02FT003.eop-nam02.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 852 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to phalle@morganlewis.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 851 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to tlang@morganlewis.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 850 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to aakahn@whitecase.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 849 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to scuneo@cuneolaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 <: Recipient address rejected: User email address is marked as invalid.' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 848 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds #847 e-mailed to habelj@hbdlawyers.com bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host 'DNS Hard Error looking up hbdlawyers.com (MX): NXDomain' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2019 Filing 847 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Cy Pres Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jason S. Hartley, #3 Exhibit A to Hartley Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Hartley, Jason)
August 19, 2016 Filing 846 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion for Order #844 , Motion Hearing,,, Link Motions to Minutes #845 e-mailed to Herman J Hoying at hhoying@morganlewis.com bounced due to unknown address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to hhoying@astralegal.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 8, 2016 Filing 845 MINUTES OF NATIONAL AUTO PARTS, INCS MOTION TO RECOGNIZE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT CLAIMANTS Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Recognize National Auto Parts, Inc. as Successor-In-Interest to Class Action Settlement Claimants Filed by #842 . The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. The Court signs the Proposed Order. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER ON NATIONAL AUTO PARTS, INC.S MOTION TO RECOGNIZE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT CLAIMANTS by Judge George H. Wu re: #842 MOTION for Order. The Motion is GRANTED. (mrgo)
July 19, 2016 Filing 843 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Recognize National Auto Parts, Inc. as Successor-In-Interest to Class Action Settlement Claimants Filed by #842 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attorney Arthur N Bailey added to party Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class(pty:pla))(Bailey, Arthur)
July 5, 2016 Filing 842 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Recognize National Auto Parts, Inc. as Successor-In-Interest to Class Action Settlement Claimants Filed by National Auto Parts, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Tsai, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Tsai Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Tsai Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Tsai Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Tsai Declaration, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Brent A Kramer added to party National Auto Parts, Inc.(pty:bkmov)) (Kramer, Brent)
January 28, 2015 Filing 841 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Bonny E Sweeney counsel for Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Sioux Plating Co.. Changing Address to Hausfeld LLP, 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co., and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Sweeney, Bonny)
May 28, 2014 Filing 840 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/5/14 10:10 am re Transcript #839 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2014 Filing 839 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/5/14 10:10 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
May 14, 2014 Filing 838 JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, #835 The Settlement Agreement shall be binding on TYC and all Plaintiffs, including all members of the Class pursuant to the Settlement Agreement.The Court dismisses on the merits and with prejudice the AmendedConsolidated Class Action Complaint as to TYC. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and Plan of Administration andDistribution, out-of pocket expenses incurred by Counsel in the amount of$1,403,112.08 shall be reimbursed from the first Settlement Fund installment payment and the attorneys fees shall distributed in equal shares from the three (3) SettlementFund installments. Within ten (10) business days of this Order, the escrow officer isdirected to wire transfer the first share of the $7,500,000 fee award, which is$4,050,000 in attorneys fees, and out-of pocket expenses incurred by Counsel in theamount of $1,403,112.08 to a bank account identified by Co-Lead Counsel (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj)
May 12, 2014 Filing 837 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Final Judgment Order re MOTION for Settlement Approval Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation #834 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Order as to TYC Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corp.)(Hartley, Jason)
May 5, 2014 Filing 836 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement, Motion Hearing,,,,,, #835 e-mailed to tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 5, 2014 Filing 835 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN A WARD OF FEES AND EXPENSES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' SETTLEMENT WITH TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO. AND GENERA CORPORATION ; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTWITH DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND GENERA CORPORATION #825 #834 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiffs' Motions are GRANTED. Proposed Order and Judgment will be filed forthwith. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj)
April 7, 2014 Filing 834 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Keogh, #3 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
March 24, 2014 Filing 833 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/10/14 8:47 am re Transcript #832 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 24, 2014 Filing 832 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/10/14 8:47 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO SUBMITDOCUMENTS IN CAMERA PURSUANT TO LOCAL RU LE 79-5.1 by Judge George H. Wu: #826 (pj)
February 18, 2014 Filing 826 APPLICATION for Leave to File Declarations of Bonny E. Sweeney, Jason S. Hartley, Jay L. Himes and Michael Lehmann, with Exhibits Thereto, in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, In Camera filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Application set for hearing on 5/5/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 14, 2014 Filing 825 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Hartley, Jason)
February 14, 2014 Filing 824 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Declarations of Bonny E. Sweeney, Jason Hartley, Jay L. Himes and Michael Lehmann, and Exhibits Thereto, in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Fees and Expenses. (Hartley, Jason)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENTORDER AS TO EAGLE EYES TRAFFIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.AND E-LITE AUTOMOTIVE, INC by Judge George H. Wu, The Court hereby approves the terms of the Settlement Agreement asfair, reasonable, and adequate as it applies to the Class, and directs consummation ofall its terms and provisions.2. The Settlement Agreement shall be binding on the Settling Defendantsand all Plaintiffs, including all members of the Class who have not been excludedpursuant to the Settlement Agreement Having reviewed the unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys Feesand Expenses and all documents filed in relation thereto, to which no entity objected,the Court concludes that an amount equal to 25% of the Settlement Fund, $750,000,shall be awarded to Co-Lead Counsel for fees related to the prosecution of this actionand $386,303.03 shall be awarded as reimbursement for actual expenses incurred byCo-Lead Counsel between November 1, 2011 and August 31, 2013. The Plan of Administration and Distribution, annexed as Exhibit B to theDeclaration of Jay L. Himes in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement with Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd., and E-Lite Automotive, Inc., which was previously filed with the Court on July 26, 2013 (Dkt. No. 636-1), is hereby approved. (pj)
February 10, 2014 Filing 822 MINUTES OF TELEPHONICStatus Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Parties inform the Court that the matter is resolved as to Eagle Eyes Defendants. Court will review the Proposed Judgment submitted on January 9, 2014 #814 . Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj)
January 29, 2014 Filing 821 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on Joint Report #820 , the Status Conference previously scheduled for 01/30/2014 is CONTINUED to 2/10/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2014 Filing 820 REPORT of Joint Report of Plaintiffs and Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
January 16, 2014 Filing 819 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re letter of credit. The Court continues the status conference to January 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Both sides may file in camera briefs describing the nature of the problem - as indicated on the record - and/or proposed dates by noon on January 28, 2014. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (kti)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The attached redacted Tentative Ruling is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiffs Motion for an Award to Attorneys' Fees and Expenses #771 and Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation #807 , are GRANTED. (jp)
January 10, 2014 Filing 815 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Hearing re Letter of Credit previously scheduled for 1/13/2014 is CONTINUED to 1/16/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re granting MOTION for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement #807 .The firm of Garden City Group, Inc. ishereby appointed to supervise and administer the notice procedure as well asprocessing the claims.The Court will hold a hearing (Final Approval Hearing) on May 5, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, Courtroom 10, to determine the fairness, reasonableness and adequacy of the proposed settlement and whether the proposed settlement should be finally approved and a final judgment entered thereon. The Court will also consider whether to approve Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsels fee, cost, and expense application.The litigation against TYC only is stayed to the extent necessary to effectuate the proposed settlement. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFIC INSTRUCTIONS) (lc)
January 9, 2014 Filing 814 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation #807 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Rule 54(b) Final Judgment Order as to Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.)(Hartley, Jason)
January 9, 2014 Filing 813 NOTICE OF COURT-ORDERED IN CAMERA SUBMISSION filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Rosen, Joanna)
January 6, 2014 Filing 812 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES #771 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF EAGLE EYES SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION #807 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.; AND (2) GENERA CORPORATION #811 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants:(1) TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd; and (2) Genera Corporation #811 , is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Parties will comply with the schedule in the Court's ruling. Final Approval hearing is set for May 5, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. The Court's Tentative as to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses #771 and Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation #807 is circulated. Court hears argument. For reasons stated on the record, the motions are continued to January 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment will be filed by noon on January 9, 2014. Additionally, Defendants will submit the portions they wish to redact in the Court's Tentative and transcript of this proceeding by noon January 10, 2014. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (bp)
December 16, 2013 Filing 811 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #3 Declaration of Jennifer Keough, #4 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
December 6, 2013 Filing 810 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN AUTHORITIES I in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation #807 (pj)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER granting #808 plaintiffs application to file under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 27, 2013 Filing 808 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 807 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co.. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support thereof [REDACTED], #2 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in support thereof, #3 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough Regarding Notice Dissemination and Claims Administration (Eagle Eyes Settlement) & Exs. A-D thereto, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Rule 54(b) Final Judgment Order as to Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.)(Sweeney, Bonny)
November 27, 2013 Filing 806 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co. of Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order re Application to File Under Seal; portions of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Eagle Eyes Settlement and Plan of Allocation. (Sweeney, Bonny)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 805 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on November 18, 2013 #804 . Parties will file a motion for preliminaryapproval by December 16, 2013. Hearing on the motion will be held on January 6, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (jag)
November 18, 2013 Filing 804 NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
November 14, 2013 Filing 801 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 11/21/2013 to 11/25/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM by Judge George H. Wu: The Court hereby ORDERS the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus submitted herewith be GRANTED and that a Writ of Habeas Corpus AdTestificandum be issued to secure the appearance of Shiu-Ming Hsu on December5, 2013 and December 6, 2013, or other dates as the Bureau of Prisons may direct, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge George H. Wu #800 (Attachments: #1 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum) (pj)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM by Judge George H. Wu: The Court hereby ORDERS the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus submitted herewith be GRANTED and that a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum be issued to secure the appearance of Homy Hong-Min Hsu on December 5, 2013 and December 6, 2013, or other dates as the Bureau of Prisons may direct, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge George H. Wu #799 . (Attachments: #1 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum) (pj)
November 12, 2013 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS of Ad Testificandum issued AS TO Homy Hong-Min Hsu. (pj) Modified on 11/14/2013 (pj).
November 12, 2013 WRIT of Ad Testificandum issued as to Shiu-Ming Hsu. (pj)
November 8, 2013 Filing 800 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum as to Shiu-Min Hsu filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, #2 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum)(Hom, Brian)
November 8, 2013 Filing 799 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum as to Homy Hong-Min Hsu filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, #2 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum)(Hom, Brian)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #775 Defendant's TYC BROTHERINDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S ANDGENERA CORPORATION'SAPPLICATION TO FILE UNDERSEAL PURSUANT TO LOCALRULE 79-5 (mat)
October 28, 2013 Filing 794 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES #771 (pj)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 793 SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS IN CAMERA PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge George H. Wu: #778 (pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 792 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HOM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S EX PARTE REQUEST TO FILE RESPONSE TO NEW ARGUMENTS IN PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS #658 (pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 791 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S [PROPOSEDl RESPONSE TO NEW ARGUMENTS IN PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS #658 (pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 788 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 6-14 to Declaration of Jay L Himes in support of Plaintiffs' MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES #771 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8)(pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 787 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 1-4 AND 5 (pgs 1-99) TO DECLARATION OF JAY L HIMES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES #771 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3, #3 Exhibit Part 4)(pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 786 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of JAY L HIMS IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Attorney Fees #771 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 2, #2 Declaration Part 3, #3 Declaration Part 4, #4 Declaration Part 5, #5 Declaration Part 6, #6 Declaration Part 7, #7 Declaration Part 8, #8 Declaration Part 9, #9 Declaration Part 10, #10 Declaration Part 11)(pj)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TOFILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5. by Judge George H. Wu: The following document is to be filed under seal: portions of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of-Motion for an. Award ofAttorneys Fees and Expenses. #777 (pj)
October 28, 2013 Filing 774 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/29/2013 at 9:06 a.m. re Transcript #773 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2013 Filing 773 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/29/2013 at 9:06 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website: www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2014. (Cuneo, Patricia)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.S AND GENERA CORPORATIONS EX PARTE REQUEST TO FILE RESPONSE TO NEW ARGUMENTS IN PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO DEFENDANTS SETTLEMENTS by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants Request to File Responseto New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion In Limine No. 3 toexclude references to Defendants settlements is GRANTED. Exhibit A to theDefendants Request to File Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply inSupport of Motion In Limine No. 3, which was lodged under seal, shall be deemedfiled under seal. There shall be no further briefing without order of this Court #775 . (pj)
October 25, 2013 Filing 772 DECLARATION of Michael P. Lehmann in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees [Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses] #771 Amended Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co.. (Lehmann, Michael)
October 23, 2013 Filing 782 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 10/23/2013, Application to file under seal proposed order,Proposed response, Exhibits,. (pj)
October 23, 2013 Filing 778 APPLICATION for LEAVE to submit documents in support of Plaintiffs' motion for an award of attorneys fees and expenses IN CAMERA filed by Plaintiffs (pj)
October 23, 2013 Filing 777 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL portions of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs (pj)
October 23, 2013 Filing 775 APPLICATION FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 RE the [Proposed] Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of I Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants Settlements ("Response"), and (2) all exhibits to the Declaration of Brian M. Horn in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd.s and Genera Corporations Ex Parte Request to File Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants Settlements filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj) Modified on 11/5/2013 (mat).
October 23, 2013 Filing 771 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees [Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses] filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co.. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support thereof [REDACTED], #2 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support thereof (Exhibits A, B, B-1 through B-15, and C submitted in camera), #3 Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support thereof (Exhibits A through I submitted in camera), #4 Declaration Declaration of Jay L. Himes in Support thereof (Exhibits 1 through 14 submitted in camera), #5 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann in Support thereof (Exhibits A through M submitted in camera))(Sweeney, Bonny)
October 23, 2013 Filing 770 DECLARATION of Brian M. Hom ISO MIL No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants' Settlements EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MIL No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants' Settlements #769 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
October 23, 2013 Filing 769 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MIL No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants' Settlements filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Request to File Response to New Arguments in Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MIL No. 3 to Exclude References to Defendants' Settlements)(Hom, Brian)
October 23, 2013 Filing 768 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application, Proposed Order, Proposed REsponse to New Arguments in Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MIL No. 3; Exhibits to Hom Declaration ISO and Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
October 23, 2013 Filing 767 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co. of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. (Sweeney, Bonny)
October 23, 2013 Filing 766 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Sioux Plating Co. of Plainitffs' Unopposed Application to Submit Documents in camera; [Proposed] Order Granting Application; Exs. A-C to Sweeney Decl ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees & Expenses, Exs. A-I to Hartley Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Motion, Exs. 1-14 to Himes Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Motion, Exs. A-M to Lehmann Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Motion - all submitted In Camera. (Sweeney, Bonny)
October 16, 2013 Filing 790 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANT TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY AND REPORTS OF DR.RUSSELL L. LAMB #682 (pj)
October 16, 2013 Filing 789 SEALED DOCUMENT-OMNIBUS REPLY to defendants' oppositions TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 THROUGH 14 654 (pj)
October 16, 2013 Filing 785 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF PETER E.HALLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: DAUBERT MOTIONTO EXCLUDE PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY AND REPORTS OF DR. RUSSELL L. LAMB #682 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 2, #2 Declaration Part 3, #3 Declaration Part 4, #4 Declaration Part 5, #5 Declaration Part 6, #6 Declaration Part 7, #7 Declaration Part 8, #8 Declaration Part 9)(pj)
October 16, 2013 Filing 784 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION JASON S HARTLEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS MOTION IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 14 654 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 2, #2 Declaration Part 3, #3 Declaration Part 4, #4 Declaration Part 5, #5 Declaration Part 6, #6 Declaration Part 7, #7 Declaration Part 8)(pj)
October 16, 2013 Filing 783 SEALED DOCUMENT-SECOND DECLARATION Qf WILLIAM C. MYSLINSKI, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE No.1: DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY AND REPORTS OF DR. RUSSELL L. LAMB October 11, 2013 #682 (pj)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 THAT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO 1 AND THE HALLE DECLARATION AND ALL EXHIBITS BE FILED UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #763 (pj)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 THROUGH 14 UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #762 (pj)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 2, 5, 6, 9 and 10 AND DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTDS AND GENERA CORPORATIONS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 3 and 5. by Judge George H. Wu: #658 #659 (pj)
October 11, 2013 Filing 765 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re APPLICATION to Seal #763 (see attached for further details) served on 10/11/2013. (pj)
October 11, 2013 Filing 763 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL pursuant to local rule 79-5 1) REPLY in support of Motion in Limine No. 1 Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert testimony and reports filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
October 11, 2013 Filing 762 APPLICATION to file Plaintiffs' Omnibus reply to defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in limine NOs.1 through 14 UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Flash Sales, Inc., Harold Autobody, Motoring Parts International, Nu-Parts Automotive Products Inc. (pj)
October 11, 2013 Filing 761 REPLY in Support MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1 through 14 to Determine Exclusion and Admissibility of Evidence #662 REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
October 11, 2013 Filing 760 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude #683 (No. 4) and Joinder in TYC's Reply ISO MIL (No. 1) filed by Defendant Genera Corporation. (Hom, Brian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 759 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Reference to the Republic of China or Taiwan as "China" #659 , MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Criminal Fines #660 , MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence #658 , MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence #657 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 758 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Reply ISO MIL No. 1 (Daubert) Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert; Halle Declaration ISO Reply; Myslinski Declaration ISO Reply. (Hom, Brian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 757 Joint STIPULATION for Order re DPPs' MILS 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 10 and TYC's and Genera's MILS 3 and 5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 756 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply re Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 14; Declaration of Jason Hartley in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply re Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 14. (Hartley, Jason)
October 2, 2013 Filing 755 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The case was called. Counsel state their appearances on the record. Defendant TYCs representative, Professor Chang Hsu is present. Bo-Sen Von, TYC's counsel, is present. H.T. Chen, financial advisor to TYC, is present. The settlement conference is conducted off the record. Although all parties participated in good faith, no settlement was reached at this time. The Court encourages the parties to continue settlement discussions. If the parties believe that a further settlement conference will facilitate a resolution of this matter, the parties shall contact Marlene Ramirez, Courtroom Deputy Clerk, at (213) 894-0958, to arrange another settlement conference.Court Recorder: CS 10/02/13. (mr)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #753 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William P. Quinn, Jr. on behalf of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd., and General Corp., designating Brian M. Hom as local counsel. (lt)
September 23, 2013 Filing 752 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/19/13 10:56 A.M., re: Transcript #688 Redaction Request due 10/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2013. (Wilcox, Wil)
September 19, 2013 Filing 753 APPLICATION for attorney William P. Quinn, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 751 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Pursuant to the parties' request to continue the settlement conference, the Settlement Conference set for September 18, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby continued to October 2, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. (mr)
September 17, 2013 Filing 750 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Parties are informed that the Court's trial in Unites States of America v. JM Manufacturing Co, Inc., EDCV 06-55-GW is proceeding as scheduled. Therefore, the Status Conference in this action previously scheduled for 09/17/2013 has been terminated and no appearances will be required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2013 Filing 749 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jayne A Peeters counsel for Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc.. Jayne A. Peeters is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff DJ's Autobody. (Peeters, Jayne)
September 13, 2013 Filing 748 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason S Hartley counsel for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Jason M. Lindner is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Hartley, Jason)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 745 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: FURTHER SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Friday, September 13, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. Only parties participating in the September 18, 2013 settlement conference shall call in. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 7002# User Password: 5205# (mr)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE APPLICATION TO LODGE POSTHEARING MATERIALS ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #734 (pj)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Judge George H. Wu: #735 (pj)
September 9, 2013 Filing 744 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application to Lodge Post-Hearing Materials on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
September 9, 2013 Filing 743 SEALED DOCUMENT- APPLICATION to Lodge Post-Hearing Material on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 742 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING A FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: A further session of the Settlement Conference is set for September 18, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles. (mr)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR REDACTION #728 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court finds that there is good cause to redact the designated portions of the transcript of proceedings held on August 19, 2013 ("Transcript") #688 , and that there are compelling reasons sufficient to outweigh the public's interests in disclosure and to justify redaction. For these reasons and the prevailing legal authorities, the Court orders that the requested redactions be made to the Transcript and that only the redacted copy of the Transcript be made available for public view. (lom)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 739 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS EAGLE EYES TRAFFIC INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.AND E-LITE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. #636 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: The Motion is hereby Granted #636 . The Court finds that the proposed settlement with Eagle Eyes, subject to final determination following a hearing after notice to the Class, is sufficiently fair, reasonable and adequate to authorize dissemination of Notice to the Class. The Court will hold a hearing ("Final Approval Hearing") on January 6, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, to determine the fairness, reasonableness and adequacy of the proposed settlement and whether the proposed settlement should be finally approved and a final judgment entered thereon. The Court will also consider whether to approve Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's fee, cost, and expense application. AnyClass Member who follows the procedure set forth in the Notices may appear and be heard at the Final Approval Hearing. The Final Approval Hearing may be continued without further notice to the Class. (See attached document for details.) (lom)
September 6, 2013 Filing 738 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #710 , Notice (Other) #711 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices/Appearance. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Judge Wu has requested that the remaining parties hold a further settlement conference before Judge Segal. The parties shall contact Marlene Ramirez, clerk to Judge Segal, to obtain potential dates. (mr)
September 5, 2013 Filing 737 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, Set deadlines and hearings Jury Trial set for September 17, 2013, is continued to December 3, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference is continued to November 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m.Parties will contact the clerk by September 17, 2013 and the clerk will advise the parties whether the Courts other trial for September 17, 2013 will remain scheduled. In the event the Courts other scheduled trial settles, a status conference to advance pretrial and trial dates in this action will be set forSeptember 19, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (pj)
September 5, 2013 Filing 731 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #710 , Notice (Other) #711 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Appearance. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 4, 2013 Filing 736 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 9/4/2013 Defendants to file under seal, proposed order, Opposition to application. (pj)
September 4, 2013 Filing 735 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL pursuant to local rule 79-5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
September 4, 2013 Filing 730 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Notice of Lodging Amended [Proposed] Order re MOTION for Settlement Approval for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Eagle Eyes Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. #636 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order)(Sweeney, Bonny)
September 4, 2013 Filing 729 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to FIle Under Seal; Proposed Order; Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application to Lodge Post-Hearing Materials on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
September 4, 2013 Filing 728 REQUEST TO REDACT TRANSCRIPT submitted to Court Reporter Wil Wilcox re Transcript #688 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Defendants' Request for Redaction)(Hom, Brian)
September 3, 2013 Filing 734 APPLICATION TO FILE APPLICATION TO LODGE POST-HEARING MATERIAL ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (pj)
September 3, 2013 Filing 717 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application to Lodge Post-Hearing Material on Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Hartley, Jason)
August 30, 2013 Filing 741 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF JASON S HARTLEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(lom)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION to file plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' motions in limine and the declarations of Jason Hartley in support of thereof UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #707 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 726 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS 2-6 #659 , #683 , #660 , #658 , #657 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 725 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 #682 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 724 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF JASON S.HARTLEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 2- 6 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 723 SEALED DOCUMENTS-DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHERINDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12: TO ADMIT DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE MEMOS OF INTERVIEWS WITH DEFENDANTS #662 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 722 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINEN0.11: TO ADMIT AUDIO RECORDINGS OF CONVERSATIONS BETWEEN DEFENDANTS AND OTHER CO-CONSPIRATORS #662 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 721 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10: TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY THAT THERE WAS NO CONSPIRACY OR THAT THE DEFENDANTS DID NOT CONSPIRE 654 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 720 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING THE EFFECT ON DEFENDANTS OR CLASS MEMBERS OF A LARGE DAMAGE AWARD 654 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 719 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHERINDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO. DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS #662 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Judge George H. Wu: #708 (pj)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND GENERACORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT: 1) THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY ENDED SEPTEMBER 3, 2008; 2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.), INC. WITHDREW FROM THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY IN SEPTEMBER 2005; 3) PRODUCTS IN APPENDIX A TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM THE ACTION; 4) PARTS MANUFACTURED BY ONLY ONE DEFENDANT WERE NOT SUBJECT TO THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY; AND 5) PURCHASES OF CLASS MEMBERS, LKQ/KEYSTONE AND EMPIRE/POY THAT SETTLED AND PROVIDED FULL RELEASES TO TYC AND GENERA ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM ACTION #590 . The Court's tentative ruling as to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is adoptedas its final decision. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART andDENIED IN PART. If the parties are unable to resolve any disagreements surrounding the disclosure ofthe LKQ and Empire Settlement Agreements to Plaintiffs (if such disclosure is sought and/or necessary), those disputes may be raised at the September 5 status conference so long as short joint document is filed and provided to the court by noon on September 3, 2013 delineating the nature of the disputes. (pj)
August 30, 2013 Filing 712 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction from Court Reporter Wil Wilcox filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Transcript #688 . (Hom, Brian)
August 29, 2013 Filing 727 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: #713 . Final Approval Hearing set for January 6, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (jag)
August 29, 2013 Filing 718 SEALED DOCUMENT-MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu:, **DOCUMENT SEALED** (pj)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #705 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Willard Tom on behalf of TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd and Genera Corp, designating Brian Hom as local counsel. (ak)
August 29, 2013 Filing 713 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSEDSETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS EAGLE EYES TRAFFIC INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.AND E-LITE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. #636 DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND GENERACORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT: 1) THE ALLEGEDCONSPIRACY ENDED SEPTEMBER 3, 2008; 2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.), INC. WITHDREWFROM THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY IN SEPTEMBER 2005; 3) PRODUCTS INAPPENDIX A TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM THEACTION; 4) PARTS MANUFACTURED BY ONLY ONE DEFENDANT WERE NOTSUBJECT TO THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY; AND 5) PURCHASES OF CLASSMEMBERS, LKQ/KEYSTONE AND EMPIRE/POY THAT SETTLED AND PROVIDEDFULL RELEASES TO TYC AND GENERA ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM ACTION #590 #590 #636 held before Judge George H. Wu:The Court's Tentative Rulings are circulated and attached hereto are redacted copies. Court hears oralargument. Based on the Tentative and for reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' Motion forPreliminary Approval is GRANTED. The Court sets the following schedule:(1) Notice will be mailed and posted on the internet by September 12, 2013.(2) Claim forms and requests to object to the proposed settlement must be postmarked no later than November 14, 2013.(3) Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's petition for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses must be filedby no later than October 23, 2013.(4) Plaintiffs' motion for final settlement approval should be filed by November 28, 2013. -Oppositions due on or before December 11, 2013-Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, will be filed by December 18,2013 -Final Approval Hearing will be set on January 2, 2014 at 8:30a.m. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Pretrial deadlines and the Motions in Limine are TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR to be reset on September5, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
August 29, 2013 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Roger filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 29, 2013 Filing 710 NOTICE of Appearance by Herman Hoying filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 29, 2013 Filing 706 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Willard K. Tom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) #705 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Form is out-of-date. Forms and Local Rules were updated and amended as of June 1, 2013. See Notices from the Clerk, 5/2/13. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
August 27, 2013 Filing 705 APPLICATION for attorney Willard K. Tom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice. (lt)
August 26, 2013 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 8/26/2013 see attached for list of documents. (pj)
August 26, 2013 Filing 708 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
August 26, 2013 Filing 707 APPLICATION to file Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' Motions in limine and the declarations of Jason Hartley in support thereof UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (pj)
August 26, 2013 Filing 704 SEALED DOCUMENT- MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER (mat)
August 26, 2013 Filing 703 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 14 to Issue Finding That Foundation Exists filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 702 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu Pursuant to Defendants' request, upon review, the Court issues its Tentative as final, but hasredacted/sealed certain portions to maintain confidentially of certain previously sealed materials.Plaintiffs' Motion for Order That TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liabilityunder the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 , is GRANTED.Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. and Genera Corporation's Motion for SummaryJudgment That: 1) the Alleged Conspiracy Ended September 3, 2008; 2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.), Inc. Withdrew from the Alleged Conspiracy in September 2005; 3) Products in Appendix A to the Amended Complaint are to be Excluded from the Action; 4) Parts Manufactured by Only One Defendant Were NotSubject to the Alleged Conspiracy; and 5) Purchases of Class Members, LKQ/Keystone andEmpire/POY That Settled and Provided Full Releases to TYC and Genera Are to Be Excluded from Action #590 , is set for hearing on August 29,2013 at 8:30a.m. #692 . (pj)
August 26, 2013 Filing 701 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 13 to Admit Evidence Witnesses Invoked Fifth Amendment Privilege filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 700 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 9 to Exclude Percipient Witnesses filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 699 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 7 to Exclude Live Witnesses filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 698 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 6 to Exclude Failure to Mitigate Evidence filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 697 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 5 to Exclude Pass-On Evidence or Argument filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 696 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 2 to Exclude Reference to Settlements and MIL No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Settling Obligations filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 695 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 1 to Exclude References to and Evidence of Ability to Seek Treble Damages filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 694 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Reference to the Republic of China or Taiwan as "China" #659 , MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude #683 , MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Criminal Fines #660 , MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence #658 , MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence #657 REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
August 26, 2013 Filing 693 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude #682 REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to Defendants' request, upon review, the Court issues its Tentative as final, but has redacted/sealed certain portions to maintain confidentially of certain previously sealed materials.Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. And E-Lite Automotive, Inc. #636 , is GRANTED. Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. and Genera Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment That: 1) the Alleged Conspiracy Ended September 3, 2008; 2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.), Inc. Withdrew from the Alleged Conspiracy in September 2005; 3) Products in Appendix A to the Amended Complaint are to be Excluded from the Action; 4) Parts Manufactured by Only One Defendant Were Not Subject to the Alleged Conspiracy; and 5) Purchases of Class Members, LKQ/Keystone and Empire/POY That Settled and Provided Full Releases to TYC and Genera Are to Be Excluded fromAction #590 , is set for hearing on August 29, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. #636 (pj)
August 26, 2013 Filing 691 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Opposition to MIL Nos. 3, 8, 10, 11, 12. (Hom, Brian)
August 26, 2013 Filing 690 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 1; Declaration of Jason Hartley in support thereof; Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 2 - 6; Declaration of Jason Hartley in Support Thereof. (Hartley, Jason)
August 23, 2013 Filing 689 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, August 19, 2013; 10:56 A.M. re Transcript #688 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 23, 2013 Filing 688 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, August 19, 2013; 10:56 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2013. (Wilcox, Wil)
August 21, 2013 Filing 677 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Eagle Eyes Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. #636 previously scheduled for 08/26/2013 to 8/29/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2013 Filing 678 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The case was called. Counsel state their appearances on the record. Defendant's representatives, Professor Chang Hsu and Jackson Kwok, are also present. The settlement conference is conducted off the record. Although all parties participated in good faith, no settlement was reached at this time. The Court encourages the parties to continue settlement discussions. If the parties believe that a further settlement conference will facilitate a resolution of this matter, the parties shall contact Marlene Ramirez, Courtroom Deputy Clerk, at (213) 894-0958, to arrange another settlement conference.Court Recorder: CS 8/20/13. (mr)
August 19, 2013 Filing 687 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Peter E. Halle in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co LTD.'s and Genera Corporation's MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS'S 1 and 4; Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L. Lamb. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13)(mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 686 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of William C. Myslinski, Ph. D. in Support of Defendant's MOTIONS IN LIMINE Nos 1 and 4: Daubert Motions to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L Lamb. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 685 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co LTD.'s MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of MOTION IN LIMINE 1; Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L. Lamb. (mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 684 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Genera Corporation's MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of MOTION IN LIMINE 4; Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L. Lamb. (mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 683 SEALED DOCUMENT- Genera Corporation's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE 4; Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L. Lamb. (mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 682 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co LTD.'s NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE 1; Daubert Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony and Reports of Dr. Russell L. Lamb. (mat)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND THE DECLARATION OF JAY HIMES IN SUPPORT THEREOF UNDER SEAL #672 by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 #670 by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
August 19, 2013 Filing 679 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Jay L Himes in Support of PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (mat) Modified on 8/22/2013 (mat).
August 19, 2013 Filing 676 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (mat)
August 19, 2013 Filing 674 MINUTES OF Motion #571 #590 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears further oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (kti)
August 15, 2013 Filing 672 APPLICATION to File Plaintiffs Omnibus Motions in Limine and The Declaration of Jay Himes in support of thereof Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
August 15, 2013 Filing 671 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 #670 (see attached Proof of Service for further details), served on 8/15/2013. (jp)
August 15, 2013 Filing 670 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
August 15, 2013 Filing 664 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
August 15, 2013 Filing 663 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1 through 14 to Determine Exclusion and Admissibility of Evidence #662 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Arthur)
August 15, 2013 Filing 662 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1 through 14 to Determine Exclusion and Admissibility of Evidence Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION))(Hartley, Jason)
August 15, 2013 Filing 661 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 660 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Criminal Fines filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As ISO MIL No. 6 to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Criminal Fines, #2 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 659 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Reference to the Republic of China or Taiwan as "China" filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As ISO MIL No. 5 to Preclude Any Reference to The Republic of China or Taiwan as "China", #2 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 658 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As ISO MIL No. 3 to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Any Alleged Harm or Injury Suffered by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 657 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Testimony or Evidence filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As ISO MIL No. 2 to Exclude Testimony or Evidence Re Dept. of Justice's & FBI's Notes & Memoranda, #2 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 656 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application; Proposed Order; Notice of Motion & MIL No. 1; Memo of P&As Proposed Order; Notice of Motion & MIL No. 4; Memo of P&As Proposed Order; Halle Declaration; Myslinski Declaration; Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
August 15, 2013 Filing 655 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application and Proposed Order to File Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions in Limine; Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions in Limine; Declaration of Jay Himes in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions in Limine with Exhibits A through K. (Hartley, Jason)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu GRANTING Plaintiffs' Application to file Under Seal and lodge In Camera Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 #653 . (jp)
August 13, 2013 Filing 669 SEALED DOCUMENT- RESPONSE to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (mat)
August 13, 2013 Filing 668 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (mat)
August 13, 2013 Filing 667 SEALED DOCUMENT- Third Declaration of Jason S Hartley in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (mat)
August 9, 2013 Filing 653 APPLICATION to file Under Seal and lodge In Camera Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 filed by Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Flash Sales, Inc., Harold Autobody, Motoring Parts International, Nu-Parts Automotive Products Inc, Sioux Plating Co. Lodged {Prop] Order. (lom)
August 9, 2013 Filing 651 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal and Lodge In Camera & [Proposed] Order; Plaintiffs' Response to TYC's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Unde the ACPERA; Third Hartley Declaration in Support thereof and Exhibits thereto; and Sweeney Declaration in Support thereof and Exhibits thereto. (Sweeney, Bonny)
August 8, 2013 Filing 666 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Peter E. Halle in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
August 8, 2013 Filing 665 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (mat)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MINUTES ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND LODGE IN CAMERA PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Judge George H. Wu: (See Order for further details) granting #649 (yl)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for Tuesday, August 20, 2013 at 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 23, Third Floor, 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. No later than five (5) court days prior to the conference, each party shall submit a Settlement Conference Statement directly to Judge Segal via email to ss_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for further details). (mr)
August 2, 2013 Filing 650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re APPLICATION for Leave to File under seal and lodge in camera pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 #649 ; [Prop] Order; Supplemental Memorandum; Declaration of Peter Halle by mail. (lom)
August 2, 2013 Filing 649 APPLICATION to file under seal and lodge in camera pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (lom)
August 2, 2013 Filing 644 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, of Notice of Class Action Settlement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1715 served on 8/2/2013. (Rosen, Joanna)
August 2, 2013 Filing 643 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Supplemental Memo in Opposition to Motion for Order re ACPERA; Halle Declaration in Support; Lang Declaration in Support; and Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
July 31, 2013 Filing 642 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, July 29, 2013; 9:38 A.M. re Transcript #641 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2013 Filing 641 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, July 29, 2013; 9:38 A.M.. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2013. (Wilcox, Wil)
July 30, 2013 Filing 648 SEALED DOCUMENT- MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant Eagle Eyes Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. (mat)
July 30, 2013 Filing 647 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Andy Yang in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant Eagle Eyes Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. (mat)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu GRANTING Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application to file the declaration of Andy Yang and the Memorandum of points and authorities in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement UNDER SEAL #639 . (jp)
July 29, 2013 Filing 640 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER THAT TYC FORFEITED ANY CLAIM TO THEBENEFITS OF LIMITED CIVIL LIABILITY UNDER THE ANTITRUST CRIMINALPENALTY ENHANCEMENT AND REFORM ACT (filed 07/01/13; Dkt. No. 571);DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND GENERACORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT: 1) THE ALLEGEDCONSPIRACY ENDED SEPTEMBER 3, 2008; 2) SABY LEE (U.S.A.), INC. WITHDREWFROM THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY IN SEPTEMBER 2005; 3) PRODUCTS INAPPENDIX A TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM THEACTION; 4) PARTS MANUFACTURED BY ONLY ONE DEFENDANT WERE NOTSUBJECT TO THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY; AND 5) PURCHASES OF CLASSMEMBERS, LKQ/KEYSTONE AND EMPIRE/POY THAT SETTLED AND PROVIDEDFULL RELEASES TO TYC AND GENERA ARE TO BE EXCLUDED FROM ACTON(filed 07/05/13) **UNDER SEAL**; STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu:, The Courts Tentative Ruling is circulated. Court hears oral argument. Defendants supplemental briefwill be filed by August 2, 2013. Plaintiffs reply, if any, will be filed by noon on August 9, 2013. The above-entitled motions are CONTINUED to August 19, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. The Court refers the parties to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for settlement purposes.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
July 26, 2013 Filing 639 APPLICATION to file the declaration of Andy Yang and the Memorandum of points and authorities in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER GRANTING TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL COL, LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #623 by Judge George H. Wu: For the reasons and the prevailing legal authorities, the Court orders that Defendant's Reply in Support of their Evidentiary Objections be filed under seal. (See Order for further details) IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
July 26, 2013 Filing 637 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY in support of Request for evidentiary rulings on specified objections to plaintiffs' memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co LTD's and Genera Corporation's motion for partial summary judgment; declaration of Jason S Hartley in support thereof; and Statement of Genuine Disputes (pj)
July 26, 2013 Filing 636 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Eagle Eyes Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Himes with Exhibits A and B, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Keough with Exhibits A and B, #3 Declaration of Yi-Chin Ho, #4 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
July 25, 2013 Filing 634 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application and Proposed Order to File Andy Yang Declaration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Under Seal; Declaration of Andy Yang in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (Hartley, Jason)
July 24, 2013 Filing 624 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re APPLICATION to Seal #623 served on 7/24/2013. (pj)
July 24, 2013 Filing 623 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL; reply in support of request for evidentiary rulings on specified objections to plaintiffs' memorandum of points and authorities in oppositions to Plaintiffs' memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's motion for partial summary judgment; Declaration filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
July 24, 2013 Filing 622 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to File Under Seal; (Proposed) Order; Reply ISO Request for Evidentiary Rulings on Specified Objections; Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #617 Request for Hearing (jag)
July 22, 2013 Filing 635 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF PETER E.HALLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #590 . (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 633 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF PETER E HALLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 632 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 631 SEALED DOCUMENT-RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 630 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION WILLIAM C MYSLINSKI Ph.D in support of Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 629 SEALED DOCUMENT-REQUEST FOR Evidentiary Rulings on Specified Objections to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd and Defendants Genera Corporation's, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Jason S Hartley in support Thereof;p and Statement of Genuine Disputes (pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 628 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 (pj)
July 22, 2013 Filing 627 SEALED DOCUMENT- SECOND DECLARATION of JASON S HARTLEY IN support of Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 (pj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2013: #1 Part 2) (pj). Modified on 7/25/2013 (pj).
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting #619 Application to Seal (pj)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) by Judge George H. Wu: #618 (pj)
July 19, 2013 Filing 617 REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Request set for hearing on 7/29/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Hom, Brian)
July 17, 2013 Filing 608 Response to Defendants' Request for an Evidentiary Hearing re MOTION for Summary Judgment #590 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
July 15, 2013 Filing 620 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 7/15/2013. (pj)
July 15, 2013 Filing 619 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc.. (pj)
July 15, 2013 Filing 618 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL; reply in support of motion for summary judgment; response to statement of genuine disputes; the declarations of Peter E Halle and William C Myslinski Ph.d and the exhibits attached thereto order filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
July 15, 2013 Filing 607 DECLARATION of Exhibits 26-38 [Public Version] to Second Declaration of Jason S. Hartley [COVER PAGE ONLY] in support of MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26-38 [Public Version])(Sweeney, Bonny)
July 15, 2013 Filing 606 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 15, 2013 Filing 605 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to File Under Seal. (Hom, Brian)
July 15, 2013 Filing 604 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application to Seal, [Proposed] Order to Seal, Portions of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act, Second Hartley Decl. in Support thereof (in its entirety) and Exhibits 31-34 & 37-38 thereto.. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #599 (pj)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL portions of Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs motion for order to plaintiffs motion (see attached for further details) by Judge George H. Wu: #600 (pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 614 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATIONS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 613 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of THOMAS J LANG in support of TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 612 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATIONS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 (pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 611 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARTION OF JASON S HARTLEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 610 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of DR. RUSSELL L LAMB (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(pj)
July 12, 2013 Filing 609 SEALED DOCUMENT-STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER AND GENERA CORPORATIONS' UNDISPUTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj)
July 8, 2013 Filing 603 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 7/8/2013. (pj)
July 8, 2013 Filing 600 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL (A) portions of Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs motion for order (see attached for further details) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
July 8, 2013 Filing 599 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL filed by PlaintiffS (pj)
July 8, 2013 Filing 589 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 Redacted Version filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
July 8, 2013 Filing 588 DECLARATION of Exhibits 1-29 [Public Version] to Declaration of Jason S. Hartley [COVER PAGE ONLY] in opposition to APPLICATION to Seal #579 , APPLICATION to Seal #580 [Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd.'s and Genera Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-29 [Public Version] to Hartley Declaration)(Sweeney, Bonny)
July 8, 2013 Filing 587 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Joanna Rosen attorney for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Changing firm name to Latham & Watkins LLP and address to 505 Montgomery St, Suite 2000, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Rosen, Joanna)
July 8, 2013 Filing 586 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION to Seal #579 , APPLICATION to Seal #580 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd's and Genera Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 8, 2013 Filing 585 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Claim to Benefits and supporting Declaration of Thomas Lang. (Hom, Brian)
July 8, 2013 Filing 583 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application to File Under Seal, [Proposed] Order re Application to File Under Seal, Portions of Plaintiffs' Memo in Opposition to TYC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Hartley Declaration in Support thereof (in its entirety) and Certain Exhibits thereto, Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes and Response in Opp to TYC's Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law (in its entirety), Lam Declaration (in its entirety) and Exs A & B thereto. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5.1 by Judge George H. Wu: #578 (pj)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: NOTICE AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; THE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; THE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; THE DECLARATIONS OF PETER E.HALLE, JACKSON KWOK, WILLIAM C. MYSLINSKI, PH.D., AND THE EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO; AND [PROPOSEDl ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Judge George H. Wu: #579 (pj)
July 5, 2013 Filing 598 SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 597 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 596 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment that: 1) The Alleged Conspiracy Ended September 3, 2008; 2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.), Inc. Withdrew From The Alleged Conspiracy In September 2005; 3) Products in Appendix A to the Amended Complaint are to be Excluded From The Action; 4) Parts Manufactured by only one Defendant were not Subject to the Alleged Conspiracy; and 5) Purchases Of Class Members LKQ/Keystone and Empire/POY That Settled And Provided Full Releases To TYC and Genera Are To Be Excluded From Action. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 595 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jackson Kwok in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 594 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 593 SEALED DOCUMENT- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 592 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of William C. Myslinski, Ph.D., in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 591 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Peter E Halle in Support of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 590 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD 's and Genera Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment that: 1) The Alleged Conspiracy Ended September 3, 2008; 2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.), Inc. Withdrew From The Alleged Conspiracy In September 2005; 3) Products in Appendix A to the Amended Complaint are to be Excluded From The Action; 4) Parts Manufactured by only one Defendant were not Subject to the Alleged Conspiracy; and 5) Purchases Of Class Members LKQ/Keystone and Empire/POY That Settled And Provided Full Releases To TYC and Genera Are To Be Excluded From Action. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Filing 584 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A to Notice of Errata Re: Defendants' TYC Brother Industrial Co., LTD's and Genera Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO LTD'S AND GENERA CORPORATION'S file UNDER SEAL; Exhibit A to the Notice of Errata re Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment by Judge George H. Wu: #580 (pj)
July 2, 2013 Filing 582 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, served on 7/2/2013 Defendants application to file under seal, proposed order, notice of errata,. (pj)
July 2, 2013 Filing 580 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL; Exhibit A to the Notice of Errata re Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd's and Genera Corporation's memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
July 2, 2013 Filing 577 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Defendants Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Exhibit A to Notice of Errata re Memo of P&As in support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hom, Brian)
July 2, 2013 Filing 576 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Exhibit A to Notice of Errata re Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hom, Brian)
July 2, 2013 Filing 575 NOTICE of Errata re Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
July 1, 2013 Filing 579 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL: Notice and Motion for summary judgment; the memorandum of points and authorities; the statement of uncontroverted facts an conclusions of law; the Declarations of Peter E Halle, Jackson Kwok, William C Myslinksi PH.D and the exhibits attached filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
July 1, 2013 Filing 578 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL pursuant to local rule 79-5.1 portions Memorandum of Points and authorities in support of plaintiffs motion for order and Declaration of Jason S Hartley. filed by Plaintiffs Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
July 1, 2013 Filing 574 AMENDED DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #569 served on 7/1/2013. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 573 DECLARATION of Exhibits 1-25 [Public Version] to Declaration of Jason S. Hartley [COVER PAGE ONLY] in support of MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10 [Public Version] to Hartley Declaration, #2 Exhibit 11-25 [Public Version] to Hartley Declaration)(Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 572 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act #571 [Redacted Version] filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 571 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 570 Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to File under Seal; Proposed Order; Motion for Summary Judgment; Memo of P&As Statement of Undisputed Facts; Proposed Order re MSJ; Halle Declaration; Myslinski Declaration; Kwok Declaration; and Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
July 1, 2013 Filing 569 Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application to Seal, [Proposed] Order to Seal, Portions of Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the ACPERA, the Hartley Decl. in Support thereof (in its entirety) and Exhibits 15-17 & 21-25 thereto. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 568 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Summary Judgment Motion; Memo of P&As Statement of Undisputed Facts; Proposed Order re MSJ; Halle Declaration; Myslinski Declaration; Kwok Declaration; Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
July 1, 2013 Filing 567 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Portions of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order that TYC Forfeited Any Claim to the Benefits of Limited Civil Liability Under the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act; Hartley Declaration in Support thereof (in its entirety) and Exhibits 15-17 & 21-25 thereto. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 1, 2013 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer N Caringal on behalf of Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Caringal, Jennifer)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #564 . Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report is now due on June 7, 2013. 2. No other dates in this litigation are affected by this Order. (pj)
May 16, 2013 Filing 564 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Report from 05/31/2013 to 06/07/2013 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
May 15, 2013 Filing 563 NOTICE filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. re Counsel's Employment of Former Court Extern (Kahn, Aaron)
May 9, 2013 Filing 562 MINUTES OF INTERVENOR WESTMINSTER MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.'S.MOTION TO CLARIFY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO A.MEND.THE MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER (filed 04/03/13). #532 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. The Intevenor's motion is DENIED. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
May 8, 2013 Filing 561 Notice of Withdrawal of DEPO's Opposition re MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Kahn, Aaron)
May 3, 2013 Filing 560 JOINT STIPULATION Re Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Plaintiffs'.(afe)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER RE: Direct Purchaser Plaintffs' Application to file joint stipulation re: Plaintiffs' second set of interrogatories to Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. Under Seal by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The underlying documents and sealing application shall be filed, but not under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED. #558 (ca)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MINUTE ORDER RE: Joint Stipulation Re: Order for Continuance and Abeyance of Pending Discovery Motion (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Plaintiff and Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite Automotive have submitted a joint stipulation and proposed order, requesting that the Court take Plaintiff's pending discovery motion (Docket No. 546) off calendar while they finalize a tentative settlement. The Court elects to, instead, deny the motion (Docket No. 546) (on the ground that it is moot) without prejudice to renew should the settlement fall through. If that does occur, Plaintiffs counsel need only contact the court clerk and the motion will be put back on calendar, #553 . (ca)
May 3, 2013 Filing 555 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/21/13 at 9:41 a.m. re Transcript #554 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 3, 2013 Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/21/13 at 9:41 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, website: www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2013. (Cuneo, Patricia)
May 2, 2013 Filing 553 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Response to 2nd Interrogatories to Eagle Eyes from 5/22/2013 to TBD Re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Eagle Eyes Industrial Traffic Co. Ltd. #546 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER re Stipulation for Order #547 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation and ORDERS: (1) Defendants expert report is now due on May 7, 2013; and (2) Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report is now due on May 31, 2013. No other dates in this litigation are affected by this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti)
May 1, 2013 Filing 551 COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 4/30/2013 to 4/30/2013 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Court will contact Cathy Molina at cathy.molina@lw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Settlement Conference 4/30/2013. FEE PAID. (Ho, Yi-Chin)
May 1, 2013 Filing 550 COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 4/30/2013 to 4/30/2013 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Court will contact Tina Glover at glover@stuevesiegel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 4/30/2013. FEE PAID. (Hartley, Jason)
April 30, 2013 Filing 558 APPLICATION of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to file joint stipulation re: Plaintiffs second set of interrogatories to Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. filed by plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Lodged Proposed Order. (ca)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SEALING TRANSCRIPT FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATED APRIL 30, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: At the close of the settlement conference on April 30, 2013, the parties requested that the Court place the transcript of the settlement conference under seal. The parties stated good cause to the Court for sealing the transcript. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the transcript of the April 30, 2013 settlement conference be placed under seal. The Court, however, will permit the parties who were present and participated in the conference to obtain transcripts of the settlement conference. (mr)
April 30, 2013 Filing 548 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The case was called. Counsel state their appearances on the record. Defendants' representative, Susan Su, is also present. The settlement conference is conducted off the record. The case is recalled. A settlement has been reached and is recited on the record. The parties agreed to certain deadlines as part of the settlement agreement and those deadlines were recited on the record. If the parties cannot satisfy the deadlines as stated on the record, the parties shall notify Judge Segal's courtroom deputy, Marlene Ramirez, at (213) 894-0958 to notify the Court.Court Recorder: CS 4/30/13. (mr)
April 29, 2013 Filing 547 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend Deadlines for Expert Reports filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hom, Brian)
April 29, 2013 Filing 546 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Eagle Eyes Industrial Traffic Co. Ltd. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ca).
April 29, 2013 Filing 545 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application to File Joint Stipulation Under Seal; Proposed Order re Filing Joint Stipulation Under Seal; Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Eagle Eyes Industrial Traffic Co. Ltd.. (Hartley, Jason)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Friday, April 26, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 7002# User Password: 2076# (mr)
April 25, 2013 Filing 543 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Visser)(Cuneo, Sandra)
April 18, 2013 Filing 542 OPPOSITION to MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
April 18, 2013 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 (Westminster Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Clarify or, in the Alternative, Amend the Modified Protective Order) filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casey Halladay with Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Aaron Kahn with Exhibits)(Kahn, Aaron)
April 18, 2013 Filing 540 Opposition to Westminster Mutual Insurance Co.'s Motion to Clarify or Amend the Modified Protective Order Opposition re: MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for settlement proceedings. The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for Tuesday, April 30, 2013 at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 23, Third Floor, 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. No later than five calendar days prior to the conference, each party shall submit a Settlement Conference Statement directly to Judge Segal via email to ss_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for further details). (mr)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Tuesday, April 16, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 7002# User Password: 6724# (mr)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #536 Court HEREBY GRANTS the continuance of the Hearing of Westminsters Motion as follows: (1) The Hearing on Westminsters Motion shall take place on May 9, 2013, at 8:30 a.m., or as soon thereafter as is convenient for this Court; (2) Oppositions to the Motion, if any, shall be filed no later than April 18, 2013; (3) Westminsters Reply shall be filed no later than April 25, 2013. (pj)
April 10, 2013 Filing 536 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing from May 2, 2013 to May 9, 2013 Re: MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 #532 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Joanna)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #534 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter E. Halle on behalf of Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. and Genera Corp., designating Brian M. Hom as local counsel. (lt)
April 4, 2013 Filing 534 APPLICATION for attorney Peter E. Halle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
April 4, 2013 Filing 533 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court refers the parties to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for a settlement conference. Counsel shall contact Judge Segal's clerk for availability. For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs request for documents #529 , filed April 2, 2013, is hereby GRANTED. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (kti)
April 3, 2013 Filing 532 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Protective Order #243 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/2/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Linda Visser, #3 Proposed Order)(Cuneo, Sandra)
April 3, 2013 Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sandra Watson Cuneo on behalf of Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company (Cuneo, Sandra)
April 2, 2013 Filing 529 JOINT REPORT of Plaintiffs' 8th and 9th Requests for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 through 4, #3 Exhibit 5 through 10, #4 Exhibit 11 through 14)(Hartley, Jason)
April 2, 2013 Filing 528 OBJECTIONS to Status Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #522 Objections of United States to Certain Discovery Requests by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs That Are Related to the Criminal Case filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America. (Linnett, Kelsey)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Application to File Joint Status Report In Camera Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 #525 by Judge George H. Wu that there is good cause to file the Joint Status Report In Camera, and that there are compelling reasons sufficient to outweigh the public's interests in disclosure and to justify filing In Camera. For these reasons and the prevailing legal authorities, the Court orders that the Joint Status Report be filed In Camera. If the Court denies Defendants' Application, the underlying Joint Status Report and the associated Application shall be returned to counsel for Defendants without filing. (jp)
March 26, 2013 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #523 APPLICATION to Seal #525 , Proposed Order, Joint Status Report served on 3/26/2013. (jp)
March 26, 2013 Filing 525 APPLICATION TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT IN CAMERA PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed order. (bp)
March 26, 2013 Filing 524 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Pursuant to Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. and Genera Corporation's in camera filing, the Status Conference previously scheduled for 03/27/2013 is continued to 4/4/2013 at 8:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 26, 2013 Filing 523 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Joint Status Report. (Hom, Brian)
March 21, 2013 Filing 522 MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATIONStatus Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Settlement is not reached. As stated on the record, parties will meet and discuss the documents that are in the discs. Defendants will provide the documents to Plaintiffs that may be produced. Joint Report will be filed by noon on April 2, 2013. The Government may file any objections by noon on April 2, 2013. A Status Conference is set for April 4, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by April 2, 2013. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
March 21, 2013 Filing 521 SEALED DOCUMENT- MINUTES OF Status Conference (mat)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF ONLY by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date #519 . It is hereby ORDERED that: The Court's October 29, 2012 Scheduling Order, Dkt. No. 510, is hereby modified to extend only the fact discovery cut-off from March 27, 2013 to and including April 26, 2013. All other dates in the Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. (bp)
February 28, 2013 Filing 519 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 04/26/2013 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 28, 2013 Filing 518 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date, #516 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
February 22, 2013 Filing 517 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Post-Mediation Status Conference previously scheduled for 03/18/2013 to 3/21/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 21, 2013 Filing 516 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/26/2013 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 3/21/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jay Himes, #3 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite's Ex Parte Application for an Order Allotting Time at the Depositions in Taiwan for Defendant TYC's Current and Former Employees #511 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. The Court will be available to address any matters that come up during the depositions if counsel wish to call the Court. **PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS** (afe)
February 15, 2013 Filing 514 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #513 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices/Change of Attorney Information (G-6). Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or change sought. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
February 14, 2013 Filing 513 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. of Withdrawal of Attorney Appearance (Reiss, William)
February 14, 2013 Filing 512 Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application for Order re Discovery Matter, #511 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
February 13, 2013 Filing 511 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Allocating Examination Time at the Depositions in Taiwan of Defendant Tyc's Current/Former Employees filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Joanna Rosen, #4 Exhibits A-H)(Kanny, Matthew)
October 29, 2012 Filing 510 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCEeld before Judge George H Wu, Discovery cut-off 3/27/2013. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2013 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference March 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Last day to hear any motions is July 29, 2013. Parties may stipulate to the briefing schedule, except the reply, which will be filed by July 15, 2013. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (see attached for further details) (pj)
October 26, 2012 Filing 509 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, October 4, 2012; 10:37 A.M. re Transcript #508 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2012 Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, October 4, 2012; 10:37 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2013. (Wilcox, Wil)
October 25, 2012 Filing 507 STATUS REPORT -- Parties' Joint Scheduling Report filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Rosen, Joanna)
October 18, 2012 Filing 506 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer re the status of the related criminal case. The new deadline for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition is 10 days after January 23, 2013. If the Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite cannot be deposed, they shall have an additional, non-continuable 30 days to produce a witness for the 30(b)(6) depositions. Parties may appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference on October 29, 2012 provided that notice is given to the clerk by October 25, 2012. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
October 17, 2012 Filing 505 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL JON T. KING Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Lehmann, Michael)
October 17, 2012 Filing 504 STATUS REPORT re Plea and Sentencing Date in Related Criminal Case filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
October 17, 2012 Filing 503 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Wollman, Shari)
October 4, 2012 Filing 502 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Defendants informs the Court re the status of the related criminal case. The telephonic status conferenceis continued to October 18, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Parties shall file a one page status report re the plea and sentencing date of the related criminal case by noon of October 17, 2012. Counsel who are appearing telephonically are instructed to contact the clerk by October 16, 2012. The deadline for Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite to produce a witness for the 30(b)(6) depositions isextended for two weeks. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
September 20, 2012 Filing 501 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 30(B)(6) Depositions of Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite (filed 08/29/12) #486 ; Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite's Motion for a Protective Order Regarding The Depositions of Eagle Eyes and E-Lite (filed 08/29/12) #487 before Judge George H Wu: A Telephonic Conference is held. Court hears oral argument. Having considered the cross motions, the Court rules as follows: Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite will have 45 days to produce a witness for the 30(b)(6) depositions. The Court sets a Further Telephone Conference on 10/4/2012 at 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Kathy Stride. (jp)
September 20, 2012 Filing 500 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William C Hsu counsel for Defendants Sabry Lee Limited, Sabry Lee, Inc..William C. Hsu is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Sabry Lee, Inc. and Sabry Lee Ltd. (Hsu, William)
September 19, 2012 Filing 499 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu. On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Compel #486 and MOTION for Protective Order #487 are now RE-SET before Judge Wu for a telephonic conference on September 20, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel are to call the Bridge Telephone line: 213-894-0800 - Meeting ID: 7002# - User Password: 6025#. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER to file supplemental memorandum to joint stipulation re 1) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Eagle Eyes and E-Lite; and 2) Eagle Eyes and E-Lites motion for protective order UNDER SEAL, #497 by Judge George H Wu: (ca)
September 7, 2012 Filing 497 APPLICATION TO file supplemental memorandum to joint stipulation re 1) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Eagle Eyes and E-Lite; and 2) Eagle Eyes and E-Lites motion for protective order UNDER SEAL filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
September 7, 2012 Filing 496 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Amended Proposed Order re MOTION for Protective Order for Regarding the Depositions of Eagle Eyes and E-Lite #487 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order Granting Defendants Eagle Eyes and E-Lite's Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Depositions of Eagle Eyes and E-Lite)(Wollman, Shari)
September 7, 2012 Filing 495 Proof of Service of Application to File Supplemental Memo Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal; and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memo to Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30b6 Depositions and Eagle Eyes/E-Lite Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Hartley, Jason)
September 6, 2012 Filing 494 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Regarding the Depositions of Eagle Eyes and E-Lite #487 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Wollman, Shari)
September 6, 2012 Filing 493 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Supplemental Memo to Joint Stipulation re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 30b6 Depositions and Eagle Eyes/E-Lite's Motion for Protective Order. (Hartley, Jason)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh The hearing is set for 09/20/2012 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh in Courtroom 23, 3rd Floor of the Spring Street Courthouse RE: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 30(b)(6), #486 . (ca)
August 31, 2012 Filing 491 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.ursuant to FRCP Rule 30(b)(6), #486 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is incorrect. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ca)
August 29, 2012 Filing 490 EMAIL from Joanna Rosen regarding discovery dispute. (ca)
August 29, 2012 Filing 489 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh:The Court met on the telephone with counsel to discuss Defendants E-Lite and Eagle Eyes' request for an additional hour of examination of witness Polo Hsudue to the slow pace of the deposition. Counsel for the witness opposed the additional hour and argued that the deposition was moving along at a reasonable pace and that any problems Defendants' counsel were experiencing were due to counsel's decision to ask questions that were irrelevant. The Court inquired of the court reporter who reported that, compared with her experience in other depositions, the pace in this deposition was very slow. As a result, the Court granted Defendants' request for an additional hour.Court Recorder: XTR 08/29/2012. (ca)
August 29, 2012 Filing 487 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Regarding the Depositions of Eagle Eyes and E-Lite filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
August 29, 2012 Filing 486 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
August 29, 2012 Filing 485 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 07-16-2012 9:50 a.m. re Transcript #484 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 29, 2012 Filing 484 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 07-16-2012 9:50 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARY RIORDAN RICKEY, phone number MARY.USDC@YAHOO.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2012. (dc)
August 29, 2012 Filing 483 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transcript (CV), Transcript (CV), Transcript (CV) #478 (dc)
August 28, 2012 Filing 488 MINUTE ORDER RE: Telephonic Hearing Regarding Ex Parte Application & Memorandum For An Order Allocating Examination Time At The August 29 Deposition of PoloHsu, #480 held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The Court met on the telephone with counsel to discuss the allocation of time for Mr. Hsu's deposition. The Court orders that the deposition be extended from seven hours to ten hours to allow Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' counsel three hours to depose the witness.Court Recorder: XTR 08/28/2012. (ca)
August 27, 2012 Filing 482 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Allocating Examination Time at Polo Hsu Deposition #480 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew P. Kanny, #2 Exhibits A-F)(Kanny, Matthew)
August 27, 2012 Filing 481 NOTICE CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by Intervenor United States of America. (re Howard Parker) (Lem, Jacklin)
August 24, 2012 Filing 480 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Allocating Examination Time at Polo Hsu Deposition filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Himes, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A through F, #3 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
August 16, 2012 Filing 479 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 07-16-2012 9:50 a.m. re Transcript #478 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Duvall, Richard) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2012 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 07-16-2012 9:50 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARY RIORDAN RICKEY, email MARY.USDC@YAHOO.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2012. (Duvall, Richard)
August 15, 2012 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 7/16/2012 to 7/16/2012 as to Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd Court Reporter Mary Riordan Rickey. Court will contact Joanna Rosen at jrosen@manatt.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Rosen, Joanna)
July 31, 2012 Filing 476 NOTICE of Decision: Continuance of Trial in Related Criminal Matter filed by Intervenor United States of America. (Lem, Jacklin)
July 16, 2012 Filing 475 PROTECTIVE ORDER ORDER TOGOVERN CIVIL DISCOVERY WHILE PARALLEL CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGSARE PENDING #474 (pj)
July 16, 2012 Filing 474 MINUTES OF HEARING RE PROTECTIVE ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument. Based on the Court's Tentative circulated and attached hereto, and forreasons stated on the record, the Court will adopt the language proposed by TYC/Genera. The Court signs the Protective Order to Govern Civil Discovery While Parallel Criminal Proceedings are Pending (Docket No. 473-3). A Scheduling Conference is set for October 29, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Scheduling Report will be filed by noon on October 25,2012. Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (pj)
July 9, 2012 Filing 473 STATEMENT Re Protective Order To Govern Civil Discovery While Parallel Criminal Proceedings Are Pending filed by Defendant Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Statement Re Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Statement Re Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C to Joint Statement Re Protective Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
June 27, 2012 Filing 472 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 06/21/2012 to 06/21/2012 as to Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd Court Reporter Sheri Kleeger. Court will contact Erica Embray at eembray@manatt.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Entire Hearing on 6/21/2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wollman, Shari)
June 27, 2012 Filing 471 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 06/21/2012 to 06/21/2012 as to defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd Court Reporter Wil Wilcox. Court will contact Erica Embray at eembray@manatt.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Entire hearing of 6/21/2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wollman, Shari)
June 21, 2012 Filing 470 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE THE STAY (filed 04/30/12)DEFENDANTS EAGLE EYES TRAFFIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. ANDE-LITE AUTOMOTIVE, INC.'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE STAY (filed05/14/12)INTERVENOR UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER(filed 05/14/12) #458 #459 #466 held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument. Based on the Court's Tentative circulated and attached hereto, and forreasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' Motion to vacate the stay is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to extend the stay is DENIED. Intervenor's Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART. The parties are to confer regarding the scope of the protective material and file a joint brief with any agreement/disagreements by July 9, 2012. A hearing is set for July 16,2012 at 8:30 a.m. The Status Conference set for July 5, 2012, Pretrial Conference set for September 6,2012 and the Trial set for September 18, 2012, are vacated and taken off-calendar. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
May 30, 2012 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu re: MOTION for Hearing on Protective Order #466 previously scheduled for 6/4/12 8:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to 6/21/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2012 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu; The Court, on its own motion, continues Plaintiff's MOTION to Lift Stay re case #458 and Defendant's MOTION to Stay Case #459 previously scheduled for 6/4/12 08:30 a.m. to 6/21/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 25, 2012 Filing 469 REPLY Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Stay filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Linnett, Kelsey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 468 REPLY re MOTION to Lift Stay re case #458 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
May 25, 2012 Filing 467 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Hearing on Protective Order #466 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
May 23, 2012 Filing 466 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing on Protective Order filed by Intervenor United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Linnett, Kelsey)
May 23, 2012 Filing 465 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents #464 Regarding the Motion for Protective Order filed by Intervenor USA on 5/14/12 #460 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document shall be re-filed within 24 hours of receipt of this response by using the correct event as indicated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents, filed on May 22, 2012. The motion will remain set for June 4, 2012 at 8:30 am. (jre)
May 22, 2012 Filing 464 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) (Motion for Protective Order) #460 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The correct event is: Motions and select the appropriate event. The event you selected did not create a hearing date and time before the judge.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
May 21, 2012 Filing 463 REPLY MOTION to Lift Stay re case #458 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities (1) In Further Support of Motion to Vacate the Stay and (2) In Opposition to the Motions by (a) Eagle Eyes and E-Lite to Extend the Stay, and (b) the United States for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
May 15, 2012 Filing 462 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lori S Brody counsel for Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. Lori Sambol Brody will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Lori Sambol Brody is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply, Inc. (Brody, Lori)
May 14, 2012 Filing 461 STATEMENT of No Position MOTION to Lift Stay re case #458 /Response to Modification of the January 12, 2012 Stay filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
May 14, 2012 Filing 460 NOTICE Notice of Motion and Motion For Protective Order filed by Intervenor United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of Ps & As, #2 Declaration Declaration of Howard Parker, #3 Proposed Order)(Linnett, Kelsey)
May 14, 2012 Filing 459 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Joanna Rosen, #3 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
April 30, 2012 Filing 458 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re case filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jay Himes, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
April 30, 2012 Filing 457 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jason M Lindner counsel for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Changing address to 550 West C Street, Suite 1750, San Diego, CA 92101. Adding Jason M. Lindner as attorney as counsel of record for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Lindner, Jason)
April 30, 2012 Filing 456 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jason S Hartley counsel for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Changing address to 550 West C Street, Suite 1750, San Diego, CA 92101. Adding Jason S. Hartley as attorney as counsel of record for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Hartley, Jason)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO MODIFY STAY OF THE CASE #454 by Judge George H Wu: Briefing schedule set. The Hearing on this matter shall take place on June 4, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
April 25, 2012 Filing 454 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing on Motions to Modify the Stay of the Case filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
April 25, 2012 Filing 453 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jon A Tostrud counsel for Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. Changing firm name to Tostrud Law Group, P.C.. Changing e-mail to jtostrud@tostrudlaw.com. Filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company (Tostrud, Jon)
March 22, 2012 Filing 452 MINUTES OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE PAYMENTS (filed 12/16/11) #396 ; DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OFSETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (filed 02/09/12) #440 held before Judge George H Wu.The above-entitled motions are GRANTED. Court signs Second Amended Rule 54(b) Final Judgment Order. (See attached tentative for details.) Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (lom)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 451 AMENDED RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER AS TO: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED [ALLOCATED EXPENSES] by Judge George H Wu, #315 . The Court dismisses on the merits and with prejudice the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint as to the Settling Defendants only. 756,792.62 shall be awarded as reimbursement for actual expenses incurred byClass Counsel through October 31, 2011. (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (pj)
March 16, 2012 Filing 450 NOTICE Notice of Filing Proposed Orders re Plaintiffs' Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED SECOND] AMENDED RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER AS TO: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED SECOND] AMENDED RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER AS TO: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED [ALLOCATED EXPENSES])(Hartley, Jason)
March 16, 2012 Filing 449 APPLICATION for Leave to File Submit Documents in Support of Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses In Camera - Unopposed filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
March 7, 2012 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu; Pursuant to the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's request, the Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Payments, filed on December 16, 2011 and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, filed on February 9, 2012, previously scheduled for March 15, 2012 8:30 a.m. are rescheduled to March 22, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Payments and invoices will be submitted by March 16, 2012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2012 Filing 448 MINUTES OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE PAYMENTS (filed 12/16/11); DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (filed 02/09/12) hearing held before Judge George H Wu. The Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motions are continued to March 15, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (rs)
March 2, 2012 Filing 447 NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants #440 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
February 29, 2012 Filing 446 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Awards #396 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Proposed Order Second Proposed Amended rule 54(b) Final Judgment as to Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants)(Hartley, Jason)
February 27, 2012 Filing 445 CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT MADE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sabry Lee Limited, Sabry Lee, Inc., re Notice (Other) #328 Notice of Class Action Settlement served on 9/9/11. (Hsu, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 443 STATEMENT of DEPO Defendants of Compliance with Class Settlement Notification Requirements Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1715 re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants #440 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Kahn, Aaron)
February 23, 2012 Filing 444 MINUTES OF FINAL APPROVAL HEARING AS TO SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO.LTD, AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP., AND SABRY LEE (USA) INC., AND SABRY LEE LIMITED; DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE PAYMENTS (filed 12/16/11); DIRECT PURCHASE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (filed 02/02/12); the Court grants in full the motion for final approval of the class action settlement with Defendants Depo and Sabry Lee. The Direct Purchase Plaintiffs Motions are continued to March 5, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff's supplemental brief re expenses will be filed by February 29, 2012. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bp)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTIONOF ROY L. ECKHARDT TOFINAL APPROVAL OFSETTELMENT WITHDEPO/MAXZONE AND SABRY LEE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application, #437 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Objection of Roy L. Eckhardt to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee be withdrawn and as such, is deemed null and void. (pj)
February 10, 2012 Filing 441 Amendment to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants #440 Notice of Filing [Proposed] Amended Final Judgment Order as to Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 9, 2012 Filing 440 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Keough, #3 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 7, 2012 Filing 439 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/12/2012 9:51 a.m. (Cuneo, Patricia)
February 7, 2012 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/12/2012 9:51 A.M. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo, CSR 1600, website: www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2012. (Cuneo, Patricia)
February 7, 2012 Filing 437 Corrected STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion Stipulation to Withdraw Objection of Roy L. Eckhardt to Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 7, 2012 Filing 436 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion Stipulation to Withdraw Objection by Roy L. Eckhardt to Final Approval of Settlement with Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 1, 2012 Filing 435 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, NOVEMBER 3, 2011; 8:30 A.M.. (dc)
February 1, 2012 Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, NOVEMBER 3, 2011; 8:30 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ROSALYN ADAMS,, phone number 213-894-2665. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (dc)
January 24, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian Ming Hom counsel for Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Christina L. Sein will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD and GENERA CORPORATION (Hom, Brian)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP by Judge George H Wu: Having reviewed the Application of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP forLeave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Depo Auto PartsIndustrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., the Application is herebyGRANTED.IT IS THEREFORE ordered that Stephen V. Bomse, David C. Brownstein,Catherine Y. Lui, and Eric M. Hairston of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP arepermitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co.,Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. in the above-captioned case and shall beremoved from all service lists and shall no longer receive electronic notices in this case. Application to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attorney Catherine Y Lui terminated) #425 . (pj)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H Wu: The Court hereby orders that the request of:Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. to substitute Peter J. Carney, Charles C. Moore, Aaron A. Kahn, Jeremy K. Ostrander, White & Case LLP as attorney of record in place and stead of Stephen V. Bomse, et al., Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP (Attorney Eric M Hairston; Stephen V Bomse and David C Brownstein terminated) #428 . (pj)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OFSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H Wu: Request to Substitute of: Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.Peter J. Carney, Charles C. Moore, Aaron A. Kahn, Jeremy K. Ostrander, White & Case LLP stead of Attorney Eric M Hairston; Stephen V Bomse and David C Brownstein Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LL terminated; granting #429 (pj)
January 19, 2012 Filing 429 Corrected REQUEST to Substitute attorney Peter J. Carney, Charles C. Moore, Aaron A. Kahn, Jeremy K. Ostrander, White & Case LLP, in place of attorney Stephen V. Bomse, et al., Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, filed by Defendant Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kahn, Aaron)
January 19, 2012 Filing 428 Corrected REQUEST to Substitute attorney Peter J. Carney, Charles C. Moore, Aaron A. Kahn, Jeremy K. Ostrander, White & Case LLP, in place of attorney Stephen V. Bomse, et al., Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, filed by Defendant Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kahn, Aaron)
January 19, 2012 Filing 427 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Peter J. Carney, White & Case LLP in place of attorney Stephen V. Bomse, Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP filed by Defendant Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Bomse, Stephen)
January 19, 2012 Filing 426 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Peter J. Carney, White & Case LLP in place of attorney Stephen V. Bomse, Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP filed by Defendant Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd. (Bomse, Stephen)
January 19, 2012 Filing 425 APPLICATION of Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application of Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industial Co., Ltd and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.)(Bomse, Stephen)
January 12, 2012 Filing 424 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS EAGLE EYES TRAFFIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. AND E-LITE AUTOMOTIVE, INC'S MOTION TO STAY AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (filed 12/12/11) INTERVENOR UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (filed 12/21/11) #395 #402 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu:Court hears oral argument. The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. And E-lite Automotive, Inc.'s Motion to Stay and/or for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART. The Court grants a full stay of these civil proceedings through July 12,2012. Defendant's Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Intervenor United States' Motion for Protective Order, are deemed MOOT. A Status Conference is set for July 5, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by July 2,2012. The Post-Mediation Status Conference set for January 30,2012 is taken off-calendar. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #420 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles Christopher Moore on behalf of Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., designating Aaron A. Kahn as local counsel. (lt)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #419 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J. Carney on behalf of Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., designating Aaron A. Kahn as local counsel. (lt)
January 6, 2012 Filing 421 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aaron Alexander Kahn counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Adding Jeremy K. Ostrander as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. (Kahn, Aaron)
January 5, 2012 Filing 420 APPLICATION for attorney Charles C. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9738623 paid.) filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kahn, Aaron)
January 5, 2012 Filing 419 APPLICATION for attorney Peter J. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9738602 paid.) filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kahn, Aaron)
January 4, 2012 Filing 415 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Aaron A. Kahn and Jeremy K. Ostrander, White & Case LLP, on behalf of Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. (Kahn, Aaron)
December 29, 2011 Filing 414 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Protective Order #402 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna Rosen)(Rosen, Joanna)
December 29, 2011 Filing 413 REPLY in support of MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case #395 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yi-Chin Ho)(Rosen, Joanna)
December 29, 2011 Filing 412 OBJECTIONS to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #407 -- Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley [407-1] filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Joanna)
December 29, 2011 Filing 411 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Protective Order #402 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
December 28, 2011 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER to Seal. (mat)
December 28, 2011 Filing 417 SEALED DOCUMENT- APPLICATION to Seal Declaration of Kelsey Linnett in Support of United States' Motion for Protective Order. (mat)
December 28, 2011 Filing 416 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Kelsey Linnett in Support of United States' Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
December 23, 2011 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Andrews on behalf of Defendant Sabry Lee, Inc. (Andrews, John)
December 23, 2011 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William C Hsu on behalf of Defendant Sabry Lee, Inc. (Hsu, William)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION by Judge George H Wu, re MOTION for Protective Order #402 . The time for a hearing on a motion for a protective order postponing depositions that is filed and served by the United States on December 21, 2011,is shortened so that the Court will hear it on January 12, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. rather than January 19, 2012; Any opposition will be filed and served by December 29, 2011; Any reply by the United States will be filed and served by January 3, 2012. (pj)
December 22, 2011 Filing 407 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case #395 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Hartley, Jason)
December 22, 2011 Filing 406 Joint STIPULATION to Expedite Shortening Time for United States' Motion for Protective Order filed by Intervenor United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linnett, Kelsey)
December 22, 2011 Filing 405 NOTICE filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. of Non-Opposition to Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd's and E-Lite Automotive Inc.'s Motion to Stay And/Or for Protective Order and to the Intervenor United States' Motion for a Protective Order, Pursuant to L.R. 7-9 (Hom, Brian)
December 21, 2011 Filing 404 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Protective Order #402 filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America. (Linnett, Kelsey)
December 21, 2011 Filing 403 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America of Declaration and Exhibits, Application to Seal Declaration, and Proposed Order to Seal. (Linnett, Kelsey)
December 21, 2011 Filing 402 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order filed by Intervenor United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 1/19/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linnett, Kelsey)
December 21, 2011 Filing 401 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case #395 filed by Defendant Sabry Lee, Inc.. (Hsu, William)
December 20, 2011 Filing 400 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #397 , Notice (Other) #398 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Appearance under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
December 20, 2011 Filing 399 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case #395 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Brownstein, David)
December 19, 2011 Filing 398 NOTICE Of Appearance For United States of America. (Linnett, Kelsey)
December 19, 2011 Filing 397 NOTICE Of Appearance For The United States United States of America. (Linnett, Kelsey)
December 16, 2011 Filing 396 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Awards filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #8 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #9 Exhibit 5, Part 3, #10 Exhibit 6)(Hartley, Jason)
December 12, 2011 Notice of Electronic Filing re MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case #395 e-mailed to ehairston@orrick.com bounced due to unknown address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Attorney is no longer with the firm. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. (tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2011 Filing 395 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Criminal Case filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna Rosen, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion To Stay)(Rosen, Joanna)
November 23, 2011 Filing 394 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc. (Rosen, Joanna)
November 23, 2011 Filing 393 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd (Rosen, Joanna)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2)SABRY LEE (U.S.A) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED by Judge George H Wu: The Court will hold a hearing {"Final Approval Hearing") on February 23, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. (bp)
November 4, 2011 Filing 390 NOTICE of Filing Final Preliminary Approval Order and Class Notice filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Exhibit B - Final Class Notice)(Hartley, Jason)
November 3, 2011 Filing 392 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND(2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED (filed 8/29/11) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: The Court approves the preliminary approval of proposed settlements as indicated on the record. The Amended Proposed Preliminary Approval Order will be filed by noon on November 4, 2011. Court will sign order. Final Approval hearing is set for February 23, 2012 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (bp)
November 2, 2011 Filing 389 JOINT REPORT of Parties Regarding Notice of the Proposed Settlements with the Depo and Sabry Lee Defendants filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hartley, Jason)
November 1, 2011 Filing 388 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/31/11; 9:16 a.m. (Seijas, Pamela)
November 1, 2011 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/31/11; 9:16 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (Seijas, Pamela)
October 31, 2011 Filing 386 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED (filed 08/29/11) held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer re settlement verbiage. Parties will meet and agree on the wording of the settlement and file a stipulation by noon on November 2, 2011. The above-entitled motion is continued to November 3, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (im)
October 31, 2011 Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 10/31/2011 to 10/31/2011 as to Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd Court Reporter Pamela Seijas Batalo. Order for: TYC Brother Industrial Co. and Genera Corporation. Transcript portion requested: Other: 10/31/2011. Category: Daily. Daily Transcript Order due by 11/1/2011. (Hom, Brian)
October 28, 2011 Filing 383 Joint REPORT of Notice of the Proposed Settlements with the Depo and Sabry Lee Defendants filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hartley, Jason)
October 27, 2011 Filing 384 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OFPROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) DEPO AUTOPARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLELIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRYLEE LIMITED (filed 08/29/11) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears further oral argument. Parties will confer as to a final version of the notice and submit thenotice to the Court by 3:00 p.m. on October 28, 2011. The above-entitled motion is continued to October 31, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (pj)
October 25, 2011 Filing 382 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/20/2011; 8:30 AM (Stride, Katherine)
October 25, 2011 Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/20/2011; 8:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katherine M. Stride, phone number 213-894-2187. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012. (Stride, Katherine)
October 25, 2011 Filing 380 STATUS REPORT Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Re #315 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Wollman, Shari)
October 25, 2011 Filing 378 STATUS REPORT in Response to the Court's 10/20/11 Hearing Order filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2)(Hartley, Jason)
October 25, 2011 Filing 377 STATUS REPORT of Pursuant to the Court's Minute Order of 10/20/11 Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements with (1) Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp; and (2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.) and Sabry Lee Limited filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Disclosure of Individual Settlements)(Hom, Brian)
October 20, 2011 Filing 374 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS: (1) DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP.; AND (2) SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC. AND SABRY LEE LIMITED (filed 8/29/11) held before Judge George H Wu: The motion is continued to 10-27-2011 at 8:30 a.m. and a report filed by noon on 10-25-2011 is due. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (im)
October 18, 2011 Filing 379 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Andy Yang in Support of Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., LTD. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' and Defendant Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. LTD's and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.'s Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (mat)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #366 Application to file UNDER SEAL 1) supplemental brief and 2) declaration of Alice Yeh, in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of settlement pursuant to local rule 79-5 (pj)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #364 Application to file UNDER SEAL A. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Supplemental brief; B. Declaration of Andy Yang; C. Declaration of Yu-Rong Pu; D. Proof of Service (pj)
October 18, 2011 Filing 373 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., LTD.' and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.'s PROOF SERVICE OF SERVICE. (mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 372 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., LTD. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' and Defendant Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. LTD. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.'s Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval of Settlement.(mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 371 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Yu-Rong Pu in Support of Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., LTD. and E-Lite Automotive, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' and Defendant Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. LTD. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.'s Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 370 SEALED DOCUMENT- PROOF OF SERVICE (mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 369 SEALED DOCUMENT- TYC Brother Industrial Co. LTD.'s and Genera Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 368 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Alice Yeh in Support of Defendants Genera Corporation's and TYC Brother Industrial Co. LTD.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
October 18, 2011 Filing 365 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re Petition for Permission to Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 11-80199. The motion to file a supplemental brief is granted. The motions to file under seal are granted. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 7/25/11 order granting class action certification. Order received in this district on 10/17/11. (car)
October 14, 2011 Filing 366 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL (1) supplemental brief and 2) declaration of Alice Yeh, in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of settlement pursuant to local rule 79-5 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
October 14, 2011 Filing 364 APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL: A. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Supplemental brief; B. Declaration of Andy Yang; C. Declaration of Yu-Rong Pu; D. Proof of Service filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Lodged Order. (pj)
October 14, 2011 Filing 363 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING. (Hom, Brian)
October 14, 2011 Filing 362 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 Response to Plaintiffs' and Defendant Depo and Maxzone's Supplemental Brief re Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna Rosen, #2 Declaration of Yi-Chin Ho, #3 Declaration of Yu-Rong Pu, #4 Declaration of Andy Yang)(Wollman, Shari)
October 14, 2011 Filing 361 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd of 1. Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order re Application to File Under Seal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Supplemental Brief re Preliminary Approval; Declaration of Andy Yang ISO Response to Supplemental Brief; Declaration of PU ISO Response to Supplemental Brief; and Proof of Service. (Wollman, Shari)
October 6, 2011 Filing 360 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 and 5)(Hartley, Jason)
October 6, 2011 Filing 359 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Brief re Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Bomse, Stephen)
October 5, 2011 Filing 358 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/25/2011 10:20 A.M., 9/26/2011 10:04 A.M. (Cuneo, Patricia)
October 5, 2011 Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/26/2011 10:04 A.M. Court Reporter Pat Cuneo, CSR 1600, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. (Cuneo, Patricia)
October 5, 2011 Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/25/2011 10:20 A.M. Court Reporter Pat Cuneo, CSR 1600, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. (Cuneo, Patricia)
September 26, 2011 Filing 355 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL Of Proposed Settlements With Defendants: (1) Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.; And (2) Sabry Lee (U.S.A.) Inc. and Sabry Lee Limited (filed 08/29/11) Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: The Court' Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. Plaintiffs' supplemental briefs are due on or before October 6, 2011. Defendants' response will be filed by October 14, 2011. The above-entitled motion is continued to October 20, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bm)
September 22, 2011 Filing 349 OBJECTION Opposition re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of (1) Jason Hartley; and (2) Stephen V. Bomse, Both Filed in Connection With Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Approval of the Depo/Maxzone and Sabry Lee Settlements filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Objections)(Kanny, Matthew)
September 22, 2011 Filing 348 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Lang ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hom, Brian)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 347 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge George H Wu: [PROPOSED] ORDER ONDEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO. LTDS AND GENERA CORPORATIONS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKEPORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF AND SECOND DECLARATION OF JASON S.HARTLEY AND DEPO/MAXZONES ENTIRE REPLY BRIEF OR TO ALLOW FURTHER BRIEFING; ANDJOINDER #337 (pj)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 346 DENIEDBY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge George H Wu: [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANTS TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO. LTDS AND GENERA CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS CURRENTLY SET FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2011 #338 (pj)
September 16, 2011 Filing 354 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Proof of Service in Support of Eagle Eyes' and E-Lite's: (1) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, and (2) Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' TYC Brother Industrial CO. LTD and Genera Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (mat)
September 16, 2011 Filing 353 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Andy Yang in Support of Eagle Eyes' and E-Lite's: (1) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, and (2) Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' TYC Brother Industrial CO. LTD and Genera Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (mat)
September 16, 2011 Filing 352 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joanna Rosen in Support of Eagle Eyes' and E-Lite's: (1) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, and (2) Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' TYC Brother Industrial CO. LTD and Genera Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (mat)
September 16, 2011 Filing 351 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal: (A. Declaration of Joanna Rosen. (B. Declaration of Andy Yang. (C. [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal. (D. Proof of Service. (mat)
September 16, 2011 Filing 350 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Application to File Under Seal: A. Declaration of Joanna Rosen B. Declaration of Andy Yang C. [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal D. Proof of Service. (mat)
September 16, 2011 Filing 345 Memorandum in Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements Currently Set for 9/26/11 #338 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Brownstein, David)
September 16, 2011 Filing 344 Memorandum in Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Brief & Second Declaration of Jason Hartley and Depo/Maxzone's Entire Reply Brief or to Allow Further Briefing; and Joinder #337 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Brownstein, David)
September 16, 2011 Filing 341 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Brief & Second Declaration of Jason Hartley and Depo/Maxzone's Entire Reply Brief or to Allow Further Briefing; and Joinder #337 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
September 16, 2011 Filing 340 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements Currently Set for 9/26/11 #338 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu #323 . Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Submit Side letter Agreement Regarding Depo/Maxzone Settlement to Honorable George H. Wu for In Camera Review, filed on September 7, 2011 is GRANTED. Court will allow side letter to be lodged for Courts in camera review. However, Court will not consider document for purposes of approved settlement unless its in camera status is actually litigated. (im)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 343 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge George H Wu: [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTINGDEFENDANTS EAGLE EYES AND E-LITES EX PARTEAPPLICATION TO STRIKEPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OFTHE DEPO/MAXZONE ANDSABRY LEE SETTLEMENTS #334 (pj)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge George H Wu: [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STRIKING LATE-FILEDDECLARATIONS OF JOANNA ROSEN AND ANDY YANG INOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF #329 (pj)
September 15, 2011 Filing 338 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements Currently Set for 9/26/11 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Hom ISO Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, #2 Proposed Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing)(Hom, Brian)
September 15, 2011 Filing 337 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Brief & Second Declaration of Jason Hartley and Depo/Maxzone's Entire Reply Brief or to Allow Further Briefing; and Joinder filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Hom ISO Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Brief & Second Declaration of Jason Hartley and Depo/Maxzone's Entire Reply Brief or to Allow Further Briefing; and Joinder, #2 Proposed Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Strike)(Hom, Brian)
September 14, 2011 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 #334 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
September 14, 2011 Filing 335 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class to Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #326 to Plaintiffs' Application to Submit Letter Agreement for In Camera Review (Hartley, Jason)
September 13, 2011 Filing 334 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Point and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Shari Wollman, #3 Exhibits A - E to Wollman Declaration, #4 Declaration of Matthew P. Kanny, #5 Exhibits A - C to Kanny Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
September 13, 2011 Filing 333 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Amendment to Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) #331 Addendum to Declaration of Stephen V. Bomse in Support of Reply to Non-Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bomse, Stephen)
September 12, 2011 Filing 332 REPLY in support MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley)(Hartley, Jason)
September 12, 2011 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Stephen V. Bomse In Support of Reply to Non-Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brownstein, David)
September 12, 2011 Filing 330 REPLY to Non-Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Brownstein, David)
September 12, 2011 Filing 329 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Late-Filed Declarations of Joanna Rosen and Andy Yang in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #327 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
September 12, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE Pursuant to Statute 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 filed by Defendant Sabry Lee Limited, Sabry Lee, Inc.. (Hsu, William)
September 9, 2011 Filing 327 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd of Declarations of Rosen and Yang In Support of Eagle Eyes' and E-Lite's: (1) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, and (2) Notice of Joinder and Joinder in TYC Brother Industrial and Genera Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (Wollman, Shari)
September 8, 2011 Filing 326 Opposition re: APPLICATION for Leave to File Submit Side Letter Agreement for In Camera Review Regarding Depo/Maxzone Settlement #323 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
September 8, 2011 Filing 325 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., of Notice of Class Action Settlement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1715 served on September 8, 2011. (Brownstein, David)
September 7, 2011 Filing 323 APPLICATION for Leave to File Submit Side Letter Agreement for In Camera Review Regarding Depo/Maxzone Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, GRANTING Stipulation for Protective Order, #316 . (ca)
September 5, 2011 Filing 321 JOINDER filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #319 . (Kanny, Matthew)
September 5, 2011 Filing 320 DECLARATION of Thomas Lang IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GENERA CORPORATION AND TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #315 filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hom, Brian)
September 5, 2011 Filing 319 MEMORANDUM in Opposition PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
September 1, 2011 Filing 324 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu, Discovery cut-off 2/10/2012. Motions due by 7/19/2012. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2012 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Post Mediation Status Conference set for 1/30/2012 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (see attached for further details) (pj)
August 31, 2011 Filing 318 STATEMENT -- Eagle Eyes' and E-Lite's Response to Plaintiffs', Defendants Tyc's and Genera's and The Government's Joint Stipulation For Protective Order filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd re: Stipulation for Protective Order #316 . (Kanny, Matthew)
August 30, 2011 Filing 317 STATEMENT -- Parties' Proposals Re: Proposed Joint Schedule filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd re: Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #311 , Order on Motion to Certify Class Action, Motion Hearing,,,, #309 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #314 , Stipulation to Continue, #313 , Stipulation to Continue, #310 . (Kanny, Matthew)
August 30, 2011 Filing 316 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting The Joint Stipulated Protective Order)(Hom, Brian)
August 29, 2011 Filing 315 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action with Depo Auto parts INdistrial Co Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp, Sabry Lee USA Inc. and Sabry lee Limited for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Plaintiff Class Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jason S. Hartley, #3 Declaration of Jeanne C. Finegan, #4 Declaration of Tony To, #5 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE TO FILE PROPOSED JOINT SCHEDULE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR TWO WEEKS by Judge George H Wu. The Court's Schedule Conference which was to be held on August 18, 2011, is hereby continued to September 1, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. (bp)
August 17, 2011 Filing 313 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Proposed Joint Schedule and Scheduling Conference for Two Weeks from August 16, 2011 and August 18, 2011, respectively, to August 30, 2011 and September 1, 2011, respectively, or as soon thereafter as is convenient for the Court filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wollman, Shari)
August 11, 2011 Filing 312 Notification of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals case number 11-80199. (dmap)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #310 , Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties request for a two-week continuance of the following dates, as follows: (1) The Proposed Joint Schedule which was to be filed no later than August 2, 2011, shall now be filed no later than August 16, 2011; and (2) The Courts Schedule Conference which was to be held on August 4, 2011, is hereby continued to August 18, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. No other dates in this litigation are affected by this Order. (pj)
August 1, 2011 Filing 310 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Proposed Joint Schedule and Scheduling Conference from August 2, 2011 and August 4, 2011 to August 16, 2011 and August 18, 2011 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
July 25, 2011 Filing 309 MINUTES DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (fIled 09/27/10) held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument and testimony from Gary J. Dorman and Russell Lamb. The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling. Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is granted #183 . A Scheduling Conference is set for August 4, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. A proposed scheduling will be filed by August 2,2011. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FORCLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge George H Wu. The hearing on Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification be continued from July 21, 2011 to July 25, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable George Wu. (rs)
July 11, 2011 Filing 307 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Class Certification from 7/21/2011 to 7/25/2011 Re: MOTION to Certify Class #183 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
July 7, 2011 Filing 302 Supplemental Brief Re: Newly Decided Supreme Court Authority in Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #183 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Kanny, Matthew)
July 6, 2011 Filing 306 SEALED DOCUMENT- Index of Exhibits to be Filed Under Seal; From Supplemental Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
July 6, 2011 Filing 305 SEALED DOCUMENT- Responses to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason S. Hartley Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
July 6, 2011 Filing 304 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Class Certification. (mat)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM by Judge George H Wu: The Court is hereby directed to accept the Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certi9fication, Exhibits C-n to the supplemental Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in support Thereof, and Responses to Defendants Evidentiary objections to Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in support of Plaintiffs' motion for class Certification for filing UNDER SEAL granting #295 (pj)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS EXPARTE APPLICATION TOSPECIALLY SET HEARING ONMOTION FOR CLASSCERTIFICATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants Ex Parte Application isGRANTED. The hearing on Plaintiffs motion for class certification is now set for July 21, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT each side is allotted an appropriate period of time to make a formal presentation of argument and evidence in support of or in opposition to the motion for class certification IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT any expert that has submitted an expert report in this action may attend the hearing on Plaintiffs motion for class certification to provide testimony and/or answer the Courts questions. The Parties will not be permitted to question the opposing partys expert. by Judge George H Wu: #297 (pj)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: GRANTING #299 Request for Leave. Defendants Supplemental Brief Regarding Newly Decided Supreme CourtAuthority in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, shall be filedwithin two court days of the date of this Order. (pj)
June 30, 2011 Filing 299 REQUEST for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding Newly Decided Supreme Court Authority in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Request set for hearing on 7/7/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
June 30, 2011 Filing 298 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Special Hearing /to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Class Certification #297 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
June 29, 2011 Filing 297 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Special Hearing /to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Hom ISO Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Class Certification, #2 Proposed Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Class Certification)(Hom, Brian)
June 27, 2011 Filing 296 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, re APPLICATION to Seal #295 served on 06/27/2011. (pj)
June 27, 2011 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification MOTION to Certify Class #183 Supplemental Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N)(Hartley, Jason)
June 27, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of (1) Application to File Under Seal; (2) [Proposed] Order re Application to File Under Seal; (3) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Under Seal); (4) Exhibits C-N to the Supplemental Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Class Certification (Under Seal); (5) Responses to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declartion of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Class Certification (Under Seal). (Hartley, Jason)
June 24, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Joinder in Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #268 DEFENDANT SABRY LEE, INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHA MOTION for Joinder in Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #268 DEFENDANT SABRY LEE, INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHA #269 filed by Defendant Sabry Lee, Inc.. (Blecher, Maxwell)
June 21, 2011 Filing 295 APPLICATION to file reply memorandum of points and authorities in support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, exhibits C-N to the supplemental declaration of Jason S. Hartley in support thereof and responses to defendants' Evidentiary objections to declaration of Jason S. hartley in support of plaintiffs motion or class certification UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Lodged proposed order and seal documents. (pj)
June 1, 2011 Filing 291 SEALED DOCUMENT- PROOF OF SERVICE (mat)
June 1, 2011 Filing 290 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley filed by plaintiffs in Support of its Motion for Class Certification. (mat)
June 1, 2011 Filing 289 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant's NOTICE OF ERRATA to Declaration of Andy Yang in Support of their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat)
June 1, 2011 Filing 288 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal. (mat)
June 1, 2011 Filing 287 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant's APPLICATION to File Under Seal. (mat)
May 26, 2011 Filing 286 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Amendment to Objections - non-motion, #270 -- [Amended Proposed] Order -- [Redacted - Public Version] (Wollman, Shari)
May 26, 2011 Filing 285 Notice of Withdrawal of Objections - non-motion, #270 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendants' Amended Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of its Motion for Class Certification [Redacted - Public Version])(Wollman, Shari)
May 26, 2011 Filing 284 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #271 , Declaratation of Andy Yang in Support of Defendants' Memorandum -- [Redacted -- Public Version] (Wollman, Shari)
May 26, 2011 Filing 283 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd of 1. Application to File Under Seal, 2. [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal, 3. Notice of Errata of Declaration of Andy Yang ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 4. Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of their Motion for Class Certification, 5. Amended [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of their Motion for Class Certification, 6. Proof of Service. (Wollman, Shari)
May 23, 2011 Filing 281 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Application to File Under Seal; 1. Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 2. Dec. of Joanna Rosen ISO Defendants' Opposition, 3. Decl. of Andy Yang ISO Defendants' Opposition, 4. Decl. of Thomas J. Lang ISO Defendants' Opposition, 5. Decl. of Jackson Kwok ISO. (mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jackson Kwok in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 279 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Thomas J. Lang in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14, Part 15)(mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 278 SEALED DOCUMENT- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 277 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joanna Rosen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 276 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of its Motion for Class Certification.(mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat)
May 23, 2011 Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Andy Yang in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
May 16, 2011 Filing 282 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal; 1. Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 2. Dec. of Joanna Rosen ISO Defendants' Opposition, 3. D ecl. of Andy Yang ISO. (mat)
May 16, 2011 Filing 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Objections - non-motion, #270 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #271 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #268 served on May 16, 2011. (Wollman, Shari)
May 16, 2011 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class #183 -- [Redacted - Public Version] -- filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jackson Kwok [Redacted - Public Version], #2 Declaration of Thomas J. Lang, Part I [Redacted - Public Version], #3 Declaration of Thomas J. Lang, Part II [Redacted - Public Version], #4 Declaration of Joanna Rosen [Redacted - Public Version], #5 Declaration of Andy Yang [Redacted - Public Version])(Wollman, Shari)
May 16, 2011 Filing 270 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related) #191 -- Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of its Motion For Class Certification [Redacted - Public Version] filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 [Redacted] [Proposed] Order)(Wollman, Shari)
May 16, 2011 Filing 269 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #268 DEFENDANT SABRY LEE, INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Sabry Lee, Inc. Sabry Lee, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/7/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Blecher, Maxwell)
May 16, 2011 Filing 268 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd of : 1. Application to File Under Seal; 2. [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal; 3. Defendants' Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification; 4. Declaration of Joanna Rosen ISO Defendants' Opposition; 5. Declaration of Andy Yang ISO Defendants' Opposition; 6. Declaration of Thomas J. Lang ISO Defendants' Opposition; 7. Declaration of Jackson Kwok ISO Defendants' Opposition; 8. Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of their Motion for Class Certification; 9. [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Hartley Filed by Plaintiffs in Support of their Motion for Class Certification; 10. Certificate of Service. (Wollman, Shari)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation, #267 . Good cause appearing, the Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendants joint opposition to Plaintiff motion for class certification may not exceed 50 pages in length, excluding indices and exhibits. Of those 50 pages, Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co. Ltd., and E-Lite Automotive, Inc may file a supplemental opposition not exceeding seven (7) pagesin length. (pj)
May 12, 2011 Filing 267 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd and Genera Corporation TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the Joint Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit for Defendants' Joint Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Hom, Brian)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AS TOTHE DEPOSITION OF PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS to 4/29/11 #265 ;the discovery cut-off for any follow-up discovery resulting from PWCs deposition shall be 6/8/11; The Court further ORDERS that any motion to compel PWCs deposition orto resolve any disputes resulting from or arising from PWCs deposition (including any follow-up discovery) shall be heard on or before July 18, 2011. The Parties shall have until June 10, 2011, to initiate their Local Rule 37-1 meet and confer, and until June 27, 2011, to file a joint stipulation pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 with regard to: (a) compelling PWCs deposition; and/or (b) resolving any disputes pertaining to PWCs deposition, including but not limited to any follow-up discovery resulting from PWCs deposition.Accordingly, the remainder of the schedule in this case shall REMAINUNCHANGED. Pretrial conference: 11/14/11 8:30 AM; trial: 11/29/11 9:00 AM by Judge George H Wu. (see document for other specifics) (lc)
April 19, 2011 Filing 265 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to April 29, 2011 filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Granting the Joint Stipulation to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off as to the Deposition of Pricewaterhousecoopers)(Hom, Brian)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE by Judge George H Wu #183 . Hearing on the class certification motion is set for July 7, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. SEE ORDER. (im)
March 25, 2011 Filing 263 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Certain Dates Regarding Class Certification Only from 04/25/2011 and 06/06/2011 to 05/16/2011 and 06/27/2011 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
March 25, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Intervene #120 (Attachments: #1 Canadian Confidentiality Order)(Tostrud, Jon)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND: (1) THE MEDIATION DEADLINE; AND (2) THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AS TO LIMITED OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY by Judge George H Wu, Discovery cut-off shall be extended to 5/18/2011., The mediation deadline shall be extended to 4/20/2011. (bp)
March 16, 2011 Filing 260 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kanny, Matthew)
March 11, 2011 Filing 259 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order, #253 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MINUTES ORDER RE Order Denying Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Re: Absent Class Member Discovery (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Before the Court is Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (hereinafter "DPPs") motion for a protective order barring Defendants from taking the depositions of absent class members or, in the alternative, prohibiting Defendants from introducing in related class action suitsany of the evidence obtained from absent class members unless otherwise permitted by law. For the following reasons, the motion is DENIED, #253 . PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (ca)
March 8, 2011 Filing 257 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Thomas J. Lang in Support of Defendants' Position in the Concurrently filed Joint Stipulation Re: Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Re: Absent Class Member Depositions. (mat)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER Granting Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd.'s and Genera Corporation's Application to File Exhibits "B" and "C" to the Declaration of Thomas J. Lang Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, #255 (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS. (ca)
March 7, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Errata re Amended Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs for Protective Order re Discovery of Absent Class Members filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
March 4, 2011 Filing 255 APPLICATION to File Exhibits "B" and "C" to the Declaration of Thomas J. Lang Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (ca)
March 4, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery of Absent Class Members filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2011 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Hartley, Jason)
March 4, 2011 Filing 252 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery of Absent Class Members #246 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTES Order Denying Defendants' Application to File Joint Stipulation and Declaration of Thomas J. Lang Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Defendants have moved to file a Joint Stipulation and accompanying declaration under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, #249 . In it, they argue that the documents are subject to sealing because they contain material that the parties have designated as confidential. This is not a sufficient justification to support an under seal filing of a document, never mind an entire motion and all supporting material. As such, the request is denied. Defendants have requested that, in the event the Court denied their application, the documents be returned to them and not filed. That request is granted. The clerk is directed to return the documents to the counsel for the parties. (ca)
February 28, 2011 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re APPLICATION to Seal, #249 served on 02/28/2011. (ca)
February 28, 2011 Filing 249 APPLICATION to File Joint Stipulation and Declaration of Thomas J. Lang Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed Order. (ca)
February 28, 2011 Filing 248 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Defendants' Application to File Joint Stipulation and Declaration of Thomas J. Lang; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Joint Stiuplation; Joint Stipulation re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order; Declaration of Thomas J. Lang ISO Defendants' Position in Concurrently Filed Joint Stipulation; Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
February 28, 2011 Filing 247 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd of Defendants' Application to File Joint Stipulation and Declaration of Thomas Lang; [Proposed] Order; Joint Stipulation re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order re Absent Class Member Discovery; Declaration of Thomas Lang ISO Defendants' Position in Concurrently Filed Joint Stipulation; Certificate of Service. (Hom, Brian)
February 28, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery of Absent Class Members filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 3/21/2011 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason)
February 16, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re REDACTED Consolidated Amended Complaint, #158 as to defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., Sabry Lee Limited, Sabry Lee, Inc., TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (pj)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTES ORDER Plaintiffs' Ex-parte Motion to Enjoin Discovery of Absent Class Members (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Plaintiffs have brought an ex-parte motion, seeking to enjoin Defendants from conducting discovery, including depositions, on absent class members. For the following reasons, the motion is DENIED, #241 . Local Rule 37 requires any party wishing to pursue a discovery motion to meet and confer with opposing counsel and to prepare a joint stipulation setting forth the issues that are unresolved and theparties positions on the issues. Local Rule 37-2.4 provides that the Court will not consider any discovery motion in the absence of a joint stipulation, unless opposing counsel has refused to cooperate. Plaintiffs are not alleging that Defendants' counsel has refused to cooperate. For these reasons, the motion is DENIED. (ca)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF PAULA M. ROACH AS COUNSEL FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS by Judge George H Wu: #235 . Attorney Paula M Roach terminated. (im)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge George H Wu (im)
February 14, 2011 Filing 242 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Discovery of Absent Class Members #241 (Hartley, Jason)
February 14, 2011 Filing 241 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Discovery of Absent Class Members filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley with Exhs. 1 to 3)(Hartley, Jason)
February 10, 2011 Filing 240 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(ii) as to Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. (Hartley, Jason)
February 10, 2011 Filing 239 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc filed by Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc.(Hartley, Jason)
February 9, 2011 Filing 238 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #236 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Per General Order 05-07, Discovery-related matters (i.e. Protective Orders) shall be presented to the Magistrate Judge; Had the correct event been used to docket the document and a courtesy copy was forwarded to Magistrate Judge Walsh's chambers, this would not have been missed. No need to resubmit the document. (rp)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION MODIFYING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #234 , ( Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu., Jury Trial set for 11/29/2011 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu., Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.) (see attached for further information) (pj)
February 7, 2011 Filing 236 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Intervene #120 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tostrud, Jon)
February 4, 2011 Filing 235 APPLICATION of Paula M. Roach to Withdraw as Attorney filed by plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula)
February 3, 2011 Filing 234 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wollman, Shari)
January 28, 2011 Filing 233 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
January 21, 2011 Filing 232 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Robert G. Eisler on behalf of Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co.. Filed by Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co. (Bailey, Arthur)
January 18, 2011 Filing 231 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. filed by Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc..(Bailey, Arthur)
January 12, 2011 Filing 230 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Allan Steyer counsel for Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc..Henry A. Cirillo is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (d/b/a Wheeler's Autobody Supply) (Steyer, Allan)
January 11, 2011 Filing 229 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(ii) as to Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc. (Hartley, Jason)
January 11, 2011 Filing 228 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc filed by Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc.(Hartley, Jason)
January 5, 2011 Filing 227 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply filed by (Defendants and Class Plaintiffs) Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE)(Brownstein, David)
December 17, 2010 Filing 226 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #158 DEFENDANT SABRY LEE (U.S.A.) INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE AMENDED CONSOLIDAED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Sabry Lee (U.S.A.) Inc. Sabry Lee, Inc..(Blecher, Maxwell)
December 16, 2010 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Catherine Y Lui on behalf of Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. (Lui, Catherine)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge George H Wu,Good cause appearing, the stipulation is APPROVED and it is HEREBY ORDERED that TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd., Genera Corporation, Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., Eagle Eyes TrafficIndustrial Co. Ltd., and E-Lite Automotive, Inc. may file their opposition to Plaintiffs motion for class certification on or before January 7, 2011; Plaintiffs may file their reply in support of their motion for class certification on or before February 18, 2011; The hearing on Plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be heard beforethis Court on February 24, 2011 at 8:30 a.m.; and The parties will abide by the remaining terms of their stipulation. #223 , (pj)
December 6, 2010 Filing 223 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply as to MOTION to Certify Class #183 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule)(Brownstein, David)
December 3, 2010 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason A Zweig on behalf of Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc (Zweig, Jason)
December 3, 2010 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert N Kaplan on behalf of Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc (Kaplan, Robert)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #219 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eyitayo O. St. Matthew-Daniel on behalf of Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd and Genera corporation, designating Brian M Hom as local counsel. (pj)
November 22, 2010 Filing 219 APPLICATION for attorney Eyitayo O. St. Matthew-Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID on 11/22/10.) filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. Lodged Proposed order. (pj)
November 18, 2010 Filing 218 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Intervene #120 and to Defendants' Amended Objections to Proposed Modified Confidentiality Order filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Jon)
November 15, 2010 Filing 217 PROCEEDINGS: DEFENDANTS E-LITE AND EAGLE EYES' MOTION FOR A NINETY DAY EXTENSION OF ALL PENDING DATES ASSOCIATED WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FOR A SIX MONTH STAY OF THE DEPOSITIONS OF YU-CHU LIN, CHING-TSUNG LAI, SHIH CHI GARY LIN AND HOMY HSU (filed 10/28/10) held before Judge George H Wu. Court hears oral argument. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling (attached). Defendants E-lite and Eagle Eyes' Motion for a Ninety-Day Extension of all Pending Dates Associated with Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and for a Six-Month Stay of the Depositions of Yu-chu Lin, Ching-tsung Lai, Shih Chi Gary Lin and Homy Hsu, is denied. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ag)
November 12, 2010 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Objections - non-motion, #215 served on November 12, 2010. (Hom, Brian)
November 12, 2010 Filing 215 OBJECTIONS to Objections - non-motion #213 (AMENDED) Objections to Westminster Mutual Ins. Co.'s Proposed Modified Confidentiality Order filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Hom ISO Defendants' Amended Objections to Westminster Mutual Ins. Co.'s Proposed Modified Confidentiality Order)(Hom, Brian)
November 10, 2010 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Objections - non-motion #213 served on Defendants' Objections to Westminster Mutual Insurance Company's Proposed Modified Confidentiality Order. (Hom, Brian)
November 10, 2010 Filing 213 OBJECTIONS to Westminster Mutual Insurance Company's Proposed Modified Confidentiality Order on behalf of Defendants TYC Brother and Genera Corporation filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Hom, Brian)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge George H Wu GRANTING Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing #197 as follows: Plaintiffs Opposition, if any, to Eagle Eyes Motion to Extend or Stay shall be filed no later than 11/8/2010 at 12:00 PM; No Reply shall be filed; and The hearing on Eagle Eyes Motion to Stay #196 shall be heard on 11/15/2010 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
November 8, 2010 Filing 211 APPLICATION to file second declaration of Jason S Hartley UNDER SEAL in support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to motion for an extension of class certification briefing and six-month stay of certain depositions filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Lodged Proposed order. (pj)
November 5, 2010 Filing 210 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, of Application and Proposed Order to File Second Decl. of Jason Hartley in Opposition to Motion to Extend Briefing and Stay Depositions Under Seal; and Second Decl. of Jason Hartley to be Filed Under Seal in Opp. to Motion to Extend Briefing and Stay Depositions served on 11/05/10. (Hartley, Jason)
November 5, 2010 Filing 209 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Extension of Time to File -- Motion for a Ninety Day Extension of All Pending Dates Associated with Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification MOTION to Stay -- Motion for a Six Month Stay of The Depositions of Yu-Chu Lin, Ching-Tsung Lai, Shih Chi Gary Lin and Homy Hsu #196 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jason Hartley)(Hartley, Jason)
November 5, 2010 Filing 208 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application and Proposed Order to File Second Declaration of Jason Hartley re Opposition to Motion to Extend Time for Class Cert Briefing and to Stay Depositions Under Seal; Second Decl. of Jason Hartley to be Filed Under Seal re Opp. to Motion to Extend Class Cert. Briefing and Stay Depositions. (Hartley, Jason)
November 5, 2010 Filing 206 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Intervene #120 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tostrud, Jon)
November 4, 2010 Filing 207 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: Movant Westminster Mutual Insurance Company Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Confidentiality Order (filed 03/23/10) before Judge George H Wu: The tentative circulated is adopted as the Court final ruling (attached). Movant Westminster Mutual Insurance Company Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Confidentiality Order #2 is GRANTED. A redrafted proposed order will be submitted by no later than 3:00 PM., on 11/5/2010. Any objections will be filed by 11/10/2010. Court to issue order thereafter. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
November 3, 2010 Filing 205 SEALED DOCUMENT- AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Application for Leave portions of their Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Exhibits attached thereto under seal #203 is GRANTED. (ir)
November 3, 2010 Filing 203 APPLICATION to File Portions of Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiffs. (ir)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: denying #199 Ex Parte Application to Continue. (jag)
November 3, 2010 Filing 201 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from November 4, 2010 to December 6, 2010 #199 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Tostrud, Jon)
November 2, 2010 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from November 4, 2010 to December 6, 2010 #199 served on Defendants Ex Parte Application; Declaration of Brian Hom ISO Ex Parte Application; and Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application. (Hom, Brian)
November 2, 2010 Filing 199 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from November 4, 2010 to December 6, 2010 filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Hom ISO Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd's and Genera Corp.'s Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of the November 4, 2010 Hearing and for a Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order on Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd.'s and Genera Corp.'s Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of the November 4, 2010 Hearing and for a Briefing Schedule)(Hom, Brian)
October 29, 2010 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Intervene #120 (Supplemental) filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Supplemental Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Modified Protective Order)(Tostrud, Jon)
October 28, 2010 Filing 197 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to November 15, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. re #196 filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna Rosen in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Ho, Yi-Chin)
October 28, 2010 Filing 196 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File -- Motion for a Ninety Day Extension of All Pending Dates Associated with Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification( Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.), MOTION to Stay -- Motion for a Six Month Stay of The Depositions of Yu-Chu Lin, Ching-Tsung Lai, Shih Chi Gary Lin and Homy Hsu filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Joanna Rosen in Support, #3 Declaration of Ken Julian in Support, #4 Declaration of Douglas Axel in Support, #5 Declaration of George Niespolo in Support, #6 Declaration of Thomas Carlucci in Support, #7 Proposed Order)(Ho, Yi-Chin)
October 18, 2010 Filing 195 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 48 to Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
October 18, 2010 Filing 194 SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Class Certification. (mat)
October 18, 2010 Filing 193 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Re: Application to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jason Hartley in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal. (mat)
October 18, 2010 Filing 191 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Direct Purschaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (And Exhibits 1 through 47 Thereto). (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9)(mat)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER RE APPLICATION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION RULING TO SABRY LEE, INC. by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Order, #189 . The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation, and good cause appearingtherefor, hereby orders that:(1) Plaintiffs previously filed motion for class certification shall betreated as if filed in regard to the claims asserted in the Amended ClassAction Complaint against SLI; (2) All defenses against class certification presented by and on behalf of any Defendant in an Opposition to Class Certification shall be treatedas if presented by and on behalf of SLI; and(3) The Courts ruling on class certification shall apply to SLI. (pj)
September 28, 2010 Filing 189 STIPULATION for Order re Application of Class Certification Ruling to Sabry Lee, Inc. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Application of Class Certification Ruling to Sabry Lee, Inc.)(Hartley, Jason)
September 28, 2010 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, July 8, 2010; 9:53 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (Wilcox, Wil)
September 27, 2010 Filing 190 APPLICATION to file Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jason Hartley in support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc, Flash Sales, Inc., Harold's Autobody. Lodged Proposed order. (pj)
September 27, 2010 Filing 187 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of [Proposed] Order Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Hartley, Jason)
September 27, 2010 Filing 186 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, re MOTION to Certify Class #183 served on 09/24/2010. (Hartley, Jason)
September 27, 2010 Filing 185 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of Application and Proposed Order to File Memo of Points and Auth. and Decl. of Jason Hartley Under Seal; Memorandum of Points and Auth. in Support of Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of Jason Hartley in Support of Motion for Class Certification with Exhibits 1 through 48 thereto. (Hartley, Jason)
September 27, 2010 Filing 184 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, re MOTION to Certify Class #183 served on 09/24/2010. (Hartley, Jason)
September 27, 2010 Filing 183 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Hartley, Jason)
September 2, 2010 Filing 182 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David C Brownstein counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Adding David C. Brownstein as attorney as counsel of record for Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co. Ltd.; Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant David C. Brownstein (Brownstein, David)
September 1, 2010 Filing 181 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Brownstein, David)
August 31, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Eric M Hairston counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Adding Eric M. Hairston as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. and Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp. (Hairston, Eric)
August 31, 2010 Filing 179 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Deborah Kay Croyle counsel for Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. Deborah K. Croyle will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Deborah K. Croyle is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants DEPO AUTO PARTS INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. and MAXZONE VEHICLE LIGHTING CORP. (Croyle, Deborah)
August 30, 2010 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Genera Corporation, re Answer to Complaint #177 served on Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (Hom, Brian)
August 30, 2010 Filing 177 ANSWER & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Genera Corporation.(Hom, Brian)
August 30, 2010 Filing 176 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #162 , Consolidated Complaint #158 -- Joint Answer to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd.(Ho, Yi-Chin)
August 30, 2010 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd.'s Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, re Answer to Complaint #174 served on August 30, 2010. (Hom, Brian)
August 30, 2010 Filing 174 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd.(Hom, Brian)
August 30, 2010 Filing 173 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #162 , Consolidated Complaint #158 (AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp..(Bomse, Stephen)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING WESTMINSTER MUT. INS. CO.S CONSENT MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF ITS MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF SEEKING MODIFICATION TO CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Judge George H Wu: #170 . This matter having come before the Court on Westminster Mutual Insurance Companys Consent Motion to Continue Hearing of Its Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Confidentiality Order, which hearing is currently scheduled for August 30, 2010, and good cause for the same appearing, it is by the Court ORDERED that the hearing on Westminsters Motion to Intervene shall be CONTINUED until November 4, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. (im)
August 26, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shari Mulrooney Wollman on behalf of Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd (Wollman, Shari)
August 25, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Hearing from August 30, 2010 to November 4, 2010 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Tostrud, Jon)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Joint Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date Re: Class Certification Based upon Appearance of New Counsel #167 . Good cause appearing therefore, the Court HEREBY GRANTS the following six-week extension of the briefing schedule and hearing date for class certification: Plaintiff Brief 9/27/2010; Defendants Brief 12/10/2010; Plaintiffs Reply Brief 1/21/2011; Hearing on Class Certification 01/31/2011 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #164 Good cause appearing, the stipulation is APPROVED and it is HEREBYORDERED that TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd., Genera Corporation, Depo AutoParts Industrial Co., Ltd., Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., Eagle Eyes TrafficIndustrial Co. Ltd., E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Sabry Lee, Inc. and Sabry Lee Limited may file responses to the Complaint up to and including August 30, 2010., by Judge George H Wu (pj)
July 29, 2010 Filing 167 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date Re: Class Certification Based Upon Appearance of New Counsel filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wollman, Shari)
July 29, 2010 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stuart H McCluer on behalf of Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc (McCluer, Stuart)
July 28, 2010 Filing 165 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Yi-Chin Ho counsel for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Adding Yi-Chin Ho as attorney as counsel of record for E-Lite Automotive, Inc. and Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc. and Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. (Ho, Yi-Chin)
July 28, 2010 Filing 164 Amended STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #159 filed by defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Croyle, Deborah)
July 27, 2010 Filing 161 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Shari Mulrooney Wollman counsel for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd. Adding Shari Mulrooney Wollman as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc. and Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants E-Lite Automotive, Inc. and Eagle Eyes Traffic Industrial Co., Ltd. (Wollman, Shari)
July 27, 2010 Filing 159 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendants filed by DEFENDANTS Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time To Respond To The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Croyle, Deborah)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE PORTIONS OF THEIR AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO UNDER SEALby Judge George H Wu: #157 (pj) Modified on 6/11/2013 (gk).
July 26, 2010 Filing 162 SEALED DOCUMENT- Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge George H Wu granting REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Matthew P Kanny of Manett Phelp & Phillips LLC in place and stead of Jeffrey A LeVee, Eric P Enson and Kathleen P Wallace #156 . (jp)
July 22, 2010 Filing 158 [REDACTED] AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #40 ,filed by Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc, Motoring Parts International, Prevatte Auto Supply Inc, Sioux Plating Co. (pj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2011: #1 Summons Isused as to Redacted Consolidated Amd Cmp) (pj).
July 22, 2010 Filing 157 APPLICATION TO FILE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiffs Harold Autobody, Harold's Autobody, Motoring Parts International, Sabry Lee, Inc., Sioux Plating Co.. (pj)
July 22, 2010 Filing 156 APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Mannett Phelps & Phillips in place of attorney Jones Day filed by Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (Enson, Eric)
July 22, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of (1) Application to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal; (2) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application; and (3) Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Appendix A and Exhibits 1-15 attached thereto. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 19, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE of Change of address by Lori S Brody attorney for Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. Changing attorneys address to 1801 Century Park East, Suite 1095, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. (Brody, Lori)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF THEIR AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge George H Wu: The Court having considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.15(a)(2), ORDERS, ADJUDGES AND DECREES that: The filing of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' will manually file the amended consolidated class action complaint at the Court's civil intake department, (bp)
July 14, 2010 Filing 152 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Experts filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class.(Hartley, Jason)
July 13, 2010 Filing 151 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) for the Filing of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Redacted [Proposed] Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Appendix A and Redacted Exhibits 1-15, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Filing of Their Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Sweeney, Bonny)
July 13, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class of [Proposed] Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Appendix A, Exhibits 1-15. (Sweeney, Bonny)
July 8, 2010 Filing 149 MINUTES MOVANT WESTMINSTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF SEEKING MODIFICATION TO CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER (filed 03/23/10) #2 Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Court hears oral argument regarding the confidentiality order in the Canadian court.For reasons indicated on the record, Movant Westminster Mutual Insurance Company's Motion toIntervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Confidentiality Order is taken undersubmission. Parties have until August 30, 2010 to resolve this matter. Parties may stipulate to further time in the event that a response by the Canadian court has not been made.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (yl)
July 1, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE of Supplemental Filing filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tostrud, Jon)
June 28, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney David W. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-7142398 paid.) #144 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #144 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David W Stanley on behalf of Intevenor Westminsiter Mutual Insurance Company, designating Jon A Tostrud as local counsel. (pj)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge George H Wu granting #138 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File. (rs)
June 24, 2010 Filing 144 APPLICATION for attorney David W. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-7142398 paid.) filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tostrud, Jon)
June 24, 2010 Filing 143 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Intervene #120 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tostrud, Jon)
June 24, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE Notice of Appearance filed by plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc.. (Stirling, Holly)
June 23, 2010 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian Ming Hom on behalf of Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd (Hom, Brian)
June 22, 2010 Filing 140 STATEMENT Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte App filed by In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antiitrust Litigation for Extention of Time to File Brief re: Notice of Lodging #139 , EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification #138 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Enson, Eric)
June 21, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification #138 (Hartley, Jason)
June 21, 2010 Filing 138 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley)(Hartley, Jason)
June 17, 2010 Filing 137 Opposition Yes re: MOTION to Intervene #120 filed by Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Enson, Eric)
June 16, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Stephen Dampier attorney for Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co.. Changing firm name to Law Offices of M. Stephen Dampier and address to 55 North Section Street, Fairhope, AL 36532. Filed by Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co.. (Dampier, Stephen)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Application to Withdraw the appearance of Attorney John M Boylston and Andrea Sheridan Ordin #134 is GRANTED. (ir)
May 27, 2010 Filing 134 APPLICATION of John M. Boylston and Andrea Sheridan Ordin to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Withdraw)(Boylston, John)
May 26, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Christina L. Sein for TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and Genera Corporation filed by Defendants Genera Corporation, TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (Boylston, John)
May 25, 2010 Filing 132 NOTICE of Hearing of Motion to Intervene filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Jon)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Order #130 : Hearing on Class Certification Motion November 29, 2010 ( Trial set for 7/19/2011 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu., Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2011 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.) (see attached order for further details) (pj)
May 6, 2010 Filing 130 Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Defendant Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Setting Pre-Trial Schedule)(Bomse, Stephen)
May 3, 2010 Filing 129 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. Counsel will submit a modified stipulation and proposed scheduling order by May 6, 2010. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
April 28, 2010 Filing 128 STATEMENT Joint Statement of Class Plaintiffs and Defendants on the Pre-Trial Schedule filed by In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antiitrust Litigation, Defendant Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pretrial Schedule)(Bomse, Stephen)
April 28, 2010 Filing 127 STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs and Defendants on the Pre-Trial Schedule filed by In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antiitrust Litigation, Defendant Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd (Bomse, Stephen)
April 28, 2010 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle Akerman on behalf of Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (Akerman, Michelle)
April 19, 2010 Filing 125 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu, Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. The briefing schedule as to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification is set as follows: Deadline to file Motion for Class Certification July 16, 2010Opposition October 1, 2010 Reply November 15, 2010 Hearing on Motion November 29, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. In addition, the parties will submit a revised proposed scheduling order by April 28, 2010 Scheduling Conference is continued to 5/3/2010 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
April 15, 2010 Filing 124 Joint STIPULATION for Issuance of Pre-trial Schedule (Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule) filed by Defendants Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bomse, Stephen)
April 7, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason S Kilene on behalf of Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co. (Kilene, Jason)
March 25, 2010 Filing 122 NOTICE of Taking Off Calendar Westminster's Motion to Intervene filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Jon)
March 23, 2010 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to Intervene #120 filed by Intervenor Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(pj)
March 23, 2010 Filing 120 MOTION to Intervene for limited purpose of seeking modification to confidentiality filed by Movant Westminster Mutual Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (pj)
March 22, 2010 Filing 119 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu,Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. The Court orders the parties to confer as to scheduling. Any disagreements will be filed as motions with the hearing set for April 29, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Final replies will be due by April 23, 2010. Parties can stipulate regarding the briefing schedule. The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 19, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearingCourt Reporter: Sandra Becerra. (pj)
March 18, 2010 Filing 118 Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc., Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, Genera Corporation, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp., TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Hartley, Jason)
March 18, 2010 Filing 117 NOTICE of Firm Name Change filed by plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
March 10, 2010 Filing 116 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jason S Kilene counsel for Plaintiff Flash Sales, Inc.. Filed by Jason S. Kilene for reason on form G-06 In re Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antitrust Litigation (Kilene, Jason)
March 4, 2010 Filing 115 MINUTES OF HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES held before Judge George H Wu:, Hearing is held.Parties inform the Court that the discovery disputes have been resolved.A Scheduling Conference is set for March 22, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. A proposed scheduling report will befiled by noon on March 18, 2010.Parties may appear telephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the heaing. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
March 3, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arthur N Bailey on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Bailey, Arthur)
February 23, 2010 Filing 113 JOINT REPORT of STAYING AND TAKING DEPOSITIONS filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America. (Hartley, Jason)
February 2, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Henry A Cirillo counsel for Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc.. Changing firm affiliation and address to Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP, One California Street, Third Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Changing e-mail, telephone and fax number to hcirillo@steyerlaw.com, tel. 415-421-3400, fax no. 415-421-2234. Filed by plaintiff DJs Autobody, Inc. (d/b/a Wheelers Autobody Supply) (Cirillo, Henry)
January 28, 2010 Filing 111 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION filed by plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc.. (Cirillo, Henry)
January 21, 2010 Filing 110 MINUTES OF UNITED STATES' MOTION TO EXTEND STAY (filed 12/17/09) #96 #98 held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer re stay. For reasons indicated on the record, the United States Motion to Extend Stay is granted. Court lifts the stay until March 31, 2010 to conduct depositions. A joint one-page document with the list of witnesses in dispute shall be filed by February 23, 2010. A hearing regarding discovery disputes is set for March 4, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. #96 Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
January 7, 2010 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Jason Hartley in Opposition to REQUEST for Order for Granting United States' Motion to Extend Stay #98 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
January 7, 2010 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST for Order for Granting United States' Motion to Extend Stay #98 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
January 5, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen Dampier on behalf of Plaintiff Sioux Plating Co. (Dampier, Stephen)
December 23, 2009 Filing 106 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Brigid S Martin in Support of United States' Motion to Extend Stay. (mat)
December 23, 2009 Filing 105 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order to Seal (mat)
December 23, 2009 Filing 104 SEALED DOCUMENT- Application to Seal Declaration of Brigid S Martin in Support of United States' Motion to Extend Stay. (mat)
December 22, 2009 Filing 103 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall give careful attention to the deficiency/ies. Further use of incorrect events will result in your documents being stricken for failure to follow CM/ECF procedures. RE: REQUEST for Order for Granting United States' Motion to Extend Stay #98 (pj)
December 22, 2009 Filing 102 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall give careful attention to the deficiency/ies. Further use of incorrect events will result in your documents being stricken for failure to follow CM/ECF procedures. RE: Notice (Other) #96 (pj)
December 18, 2009 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Notice of Lodging under NOTICES RE: REQUEST for Order for Granting United States' Motion to Extend Stay #98 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
December 18, 2009 Filing 100 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Order under MOTION Used the cited correct event which will prompt you for scheduling a hearing before the Judge. no hearing was scheduled because the event selected. RE: Notice (Other) #96 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
December 17, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed United States of America (Martin, Brigid)
December 17, 2009 Filing 98 REQUEST for Order for Granting United States' Motion to Extend Stay filed by Intervenor United States of America. (Martin, Brigid)
December 17, 2009 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support of United States' Motion to Extend Stay filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States of America. (Martin, Brigid)
December 17, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Extend Stay filed by Intervenor United States of America. (Martin, Brigid) Modified on 1/25/2010 (pj).
November 18, 2009 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paula M Roach on behalf of Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Roach, Paula)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh (im)
November 13, 2009 Filing 92 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging Stipulated Confidentiality Order re Status Conference, Set/Clear Flags, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, #85 (Hartley, Jason)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Granting the #89 Application for Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of Attorney Katherine Anne Malcolm as Counsel for Plaintiff Dyancorn Autobody Parts, Inc. and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. IT IS THEREFORE ordered that Katherine A. Malcolm is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts, Inc. and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case and shall be removed from all service lists and shall no longer receive electronic notices in this case. (mg)
November 12, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: attorney's bar number omitted from filed document RE: Notice of Appearance #90 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
November 10, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Thomas R Merrick on behalf of Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Merrick, Thomas)
November 5, 2009 Filing 89 APPLICATION of Katherine Anne Malcolm to Withdraw as Attorney filed by plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Malcolm, Katherine)
October 23, 2009 Filing 88 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Brigid S. Martin in Support of United States' Status Report. (mat)
October 23, 2009 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order to Seal. (mat)
October 23, 2009 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT- Application to Seal Declaration of Bridid S. Martin in Support of United States' Status Report. (mat)
October 22, 2009 Filing 85 MINUTES of Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer regarding the stay of this matter. For reasons indicated on the record, the Court lifts the stay until 1/21/10 to conduct limited discovery. The Status Conference is continued to 1/21/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (mg)
October 19, 2009 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (Enson, Eric)
October 16, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [proposed] Order to Stay Discovery re Report #82 (Martin, Brigid)
October 16, 2009 Filing 82 United States' Status Report REPORT of Status filed by Intervenor Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Martin, Brigid)
October 16, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE filed by Intervenor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Notice of Under Seal Filing (Martin, Brigid)
September 21, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lori S Brody counsel for Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. Changing address to 1801 Century Park East, Suite 1440. Filed by Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc. (Brody, Lori)
September 2, 2009 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance (Terrell, Reginald)
August 7, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jason S Hartley counsel for Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc. Changing Firm Name and Address to Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, 550 West C Street, Suite 610, San Diego, CA 92101. Changing Email and Fax number to hartley@stuevesiegel.com. Adding Jason S. Hartley as attorney as counsel of record for Dynacorn Autobody Parts and the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts, Inc. and Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class (Hartley, Jason)
July 28, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE of Related Case(s) Harold's Autobody. Related Case(s): C09-03413 (Terrell, Reginald)
July 27, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE Harold's Autobody. Related Case (Terrell, Reginald)
July 27, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of Intention to Allow Time to Amend to Lapse filed by Plaintiffs Pete Sahagian, Supreme Bodywerks, Inc., Trang Nguyen, Travis Burau. (Woods, Donald)
July 6, 2009 Filing 74 MINUTES OF CV08-7613GW-JOINT Motion to dismiss the indirect purchaser plaintiffs complaint filed 5/22/2009 taken under submission. Court to issue ruling. The Court's tentative ruling is hereby circulated (attached) before Judge George H Wu:Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Granting #69 Application for Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of Willard K. Tom as Counsel for TYC Brother Industrial Co. Ltd. and General Corporation. (mg)
June 29, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re Proposed Order to Withdraw re Miscellaneous Document #69 (Boylston, John)
June 29, 2009 Filing 71 REPLY In Support Of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (LeVee, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2009 Filing 70 REPLY In Support Of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (LeVee, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2009 Filing 69 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF WILLARD K. TOM AS COUNSEL FOR TYC BROTHER INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. AND GENERA CORPORATION filed by Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd, Genera Corporation (Boylston, John) Modified on 7/1/2009 (pj).
June 22, 2009 Filing 68 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Movants Pete Sahagian, Supreme Bodywerks, Inc., Trang Nguyen, Travis Burau. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Woods, Donald)
June 22, 2009 Filing 67 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Movants Pete Sahagian, Supreme Bodywerks, Inc., Trang Nguyen, Travis Burau. (Woods, Donald)
June 16, 2009 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT Joint Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Sweeney, Bonny)
June 4, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jayne A Peeters on behalf of Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (Peeters, Jayne)
May 29, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Susan G Kupfer counsel for In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antiitrust Litigation. Adding Susan G. Kupfer as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs. (Kupfer, Susan)
May 22, 2009 Filing 63 ANSWER to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by defendants Eagle Eyes Traffic Ind Co Ltd, E-Lite Automotive, Inc..(LeVee, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2009 Filing 62 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint, #40 and Afirmative Defenses filed by defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd.(Boylston, John)
May 22, 2009 Filing 61 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint, #40 and Affirmative Defenses filed by defendant Genera Corporation.(Boylston, John)
May 22, 2009 Filing 60 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint, #40 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp..(Bomse, Stephen)
May 1, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Judges' initials missing from case number RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #58 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
April 30, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Katherine Anne Morgan counsel for Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc. Changing e-mail to KMalcolm@csgrr.com. Filed by Plaintiff Dynacorn Autobody Parts (Morgan, Katherine)
April 29, 2009 Filing 57 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc..(Wallace, Kathleen)
April 29, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Allan Steyer on behalf of Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (Steyer, Allan)
April 22, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James P Habel, Donald F Woods, Jr on behalf of Movants Pete Sahagian, Supreme Bodywerks, Inc., Trang Nguyen, Travis Burau (pj)
April 20, 2009 Filing 54 MINUTES OF Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd & Genera Corporation's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Government's Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery Hearing held before Judge George H Wu. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling (attached). On the matter of CV 08-5758 - Defendants TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. & Genera Corporation's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is denied. The Government's Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery is granted #22 . A Status Conference is set for October 22, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Kelly Roberts. (lom) Modified on 4/22/2009 (lom).
April 13, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Application to Seal (document) 49 No NEF sent (lra)
April 13, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry A Cirillo on behalf of Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (Cirillo, Henry)
April 13, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Craig C Corbitt on behalf of Plaintiff DJ's Autobody, Inc. (Corbitt, Craig)
April 7, 2009 Filing 53 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jason Hartley in Partial Opposition to Motion to Stay. (mat) (Main Document 53 replaced on 10/27/2015) (eb).
April 7, 2009 Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT - DIRECT PRUCHASER PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Partial Opposition to MOTION to Stay (lra)
April 7, 2009 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION to File Under Seal (lra)
April 7, 2009 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER granting Plaintiffs'Application to file Under Seal (lra)
April 7, 2009 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal (lra) Modified on 4/13/2009 (lra).
April 7, 2009 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 Response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Sabry Lee's Partial Oppositions to the United States' Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Croyle, Deborah)
April 7, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE of Errata filed by defendants Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. and Depo Auto Parts Industrial Co., Ltd. (Croyle, Deborah)
April 7, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lori S Brody on behalf of Plaintiff Prevatte Auto Supply Inc (Brody, Lori)
April 6, 2009 Filing 42 Defendants' Response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Sabry Lee's Partial Oppositions to the United States' Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery Opposition re: MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 filed by Defendants Depo Auto Parts Ind Co Ltd, Maxzone Vehicle Lighting Corp.. (Croyle, Deborah)
April 6, 2009 Filing 41 REPLY In Support of Motion MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States. (Martin, Brigid)
April 2, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Plaintiffs' Proposed Order re MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 (Hartley, Jason)
April 2, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Hartley, Jason)
April 2, 2009 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 filed by Plaintiff Sabry Lee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s 1 and 2 to Partial Opposition)(Blecher, Maxwell)
April 2, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William V Reiss on behalf of Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class (Reiss, William)
April 2, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance (Himes, Jay)
April 1, 2009 Filing 40 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT related to: Order from MDL creating Master Docket (Case Opening), #1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Motoring Parts International, Nu-Parts Automotive Products Inc, Prevatte Auto Supply Inc, Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc, DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co.; Demand for Jury Trial (pj) (pj).
March 31, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Maxwell M Blecher counsel for Plaintiff Sabry Lee, Inc.. Adding Maxwell M. Blecher as attorney as counsel of record for Sabry Lee, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sabry Lee, Inc. (Blecher, Maxwell)
March 31, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information Changing E-mail to cpalko@blechercollins.com. Adding Courtney A. Palko as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Sabry Lee, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sabry Lee, Inc. (Palko, Courtney)
March 27, 2009 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BRIGID S. MARTIN IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES' MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery(lra)
March 27, 2009 Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER granting Application to Seal Declaration of Brigid S. Martin (lra)
March 27, 2009 Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION to Seal Declaration of Brigid S. Martin In Support of United States' Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery (lra)
March 27, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 filed by Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc.. (Wallace, Kathleen)
March 26, 2009 Filing 28 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: Counsel are hereby notified, that on the Courts own motion, the Governments Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery, filed on March 23, 2009, and presently set for hearing on April 9, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. is continued to April 20, 2009 at 8:30 a.m.Please be advised that only the hearing date is being continued. The due dates for the briefs will remain as scheduled in connection with the original hearing date.IT IS SO ORDERED. #22 (pj)
March 25, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Anne Morgan on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Morgan, Katherine)
March 25, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bonny E Sweeney on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Sweeney, Bonny)
March 24, 2009 Filing 25 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is stricken. Counsel will file the Consolidated Class Action Complaint at the Court's Civil Intake Department. RE: Miscellaneous Document #10 (pj)
March 24, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed United States (Martin, Brigid)
March 24, 2009 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery #22 filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 5, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, Brigid)
March 23, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending United State's Notice of Motion and Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery filed by Intervenor Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Martin, Brigid)
March 23, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brigid S Martin on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff United States (Martin, Brigid)
March 20, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher L. Lebsock on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Lebsock, Christopher)
March 20, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hilary K Ratway on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Ratway, Hilary)
March 20, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jon T King on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (King, Jon)
March 20, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D Hausfeld on behalf of Plaintiffs DJ's Autobody, Inc., Sioux Plating Co. (Hausfeld, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance (Lehmann, Michael)
March 18, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kathleen P Wallace on behalf of Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc. (Wallace, Kathleen)
March 18, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric P Enson on behalf of Defendant E-Lite Automotive, Inc. (Enson, Eric)
March 18, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance (LeVee, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Initiating documents * are NOT to be e-filed, but Manually filed with Civil Intake Section.Afterwards, e-mail a conformed copy to (CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov). RE: Miscellaneous Document CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #10 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
March 17, 2009 Filing 10 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Hartley, Jason) Modified on 3/24/2009 (pj]
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL AND SCHEDULE FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Judge George H Wu,On March 9, 2009, this Court heard Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and Scheduling Order and, Good cause appearing therefor, the Court orders aThe following attorneys are designated as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the direct purchaser plaintiffs: Jason S. Hartley of Troutman Sanders, LLP; Bonny Sweeney of Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins, LLP; Michael Lehmann of Hausfeld LLP; and Jay Himes of Labaton Sucharow, LLP (hereinafter referred to as Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Interim Co-Lead Counsel).To designate attorneys to enter into stipulations necessary for the conduct of the litigation with defense counsel and plaintiffs counsel in the individual, non-class action captioned Sabry Lee, Inc. v. Genera Corporation, et al., Case No. CV08-05758 GW PJWx (the Sabry Lee Action), and in any indirect purchaser actions that are or will be pending in this Court;No later than March 16, 2009, plaintiffs shall prepare and file through ECF a single Consolidated Complaint that shall be deemed to supersede the complaints filed by the direct purchasers in each of the Related Actions. (pj)
March 9, 2009 Filing 9 MINUTES OF SACV08-1158-GW(PJWx) - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER (filed 12/18/08) UNITED STATES' MOTION TO INTERVENE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 24(B)(1)(B) (filed 03/03/09) held before Judge George H Wu:, RE: MOTION to Intervene #2 Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, The United States Motion to Intervene Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(B)(1)(B) and Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel, are granted. Counsel for plaintiff will submit an amended proposed order as to the appointment of interim lead counsel. Counsel for the government informs the Court that a Motion for stay of the action will be filed. The Court sets the following schedule: Governments initial brief March 24, 2009 Plaintiffs opposition April 2, 2009 Reply April 6, 2009 Hearing date April 9, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. The consolidated complaint will be filed by no later than March 17, 2009. Counsel are reminded to file all documents on 09MDL2007. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
March 6, 2009 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Attorney Brigid S. Martin in Support of the Untited States' Motion to Intervene. (mat)
March 6, 2009 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT- Order to Seal. (mat)
March 6, 2009 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT- Application to Seal Declaration of Attorney Brigid S. Martin in Support of the United States' Motion to Intervene. (mat)
March 3, 2009 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor United States, re Declaration (Motion related) #4 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #3 , MOTION to Intervene #2 served on 3/2/2009. (pj)
March 3, 2009 Filing 4 DECLARATION of JACKLIN CHOU LEM in support MOTION to Intervene #2 filed by Intervenor United States. (pj)
March 3, 2009 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of MOTION to Intervene #2 filed by Intervenor United States. (pj)
March 3, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene under Federal Rules Civil Procedure 24(b)(1)(B) filed by Intervenor United States. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 09-2007 GW (PJWx), In Re: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antitrust Litigation. Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: CV 08-5758 GW (PJWx); SA CV 08-1158 GW (PJWx) and CV 09-982 GW (PJWx). (ghap) (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aftermarket Automotive Lighting Products Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flash Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Jason S Kilene
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold's Autobody
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motoring Parts International
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: William V Reiss
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Katherine Anne Malcolm
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer N Caringal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prevatte Auto Supply Inc
Represented By: Lori S Brody
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Stuart H McCluer
Represented By: Jason A Zweig
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: William V Reiss
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Represented By: Robert N Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJ's Autobody, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Malcolm
Represented By: Francis O Scarpulla
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Donald Amamgbo
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: Christopher L Lebsock
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Henry A Cirillo
Represented By: Michelle Akerman
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Hilary K Ratway
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: William V Reiss
Represented By: Craig C Corbitt
Represented By: Holly Stirling
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Represented By: Jayne A Peeters
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nu-Parts Automotive Products Inc
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: William V Reiss
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynacorn Autobody Parts Inc
Represented By: Bonny E Sweeney
Represented By: Katherine Anne Malcolm
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Paula R Brown
Represented By: Susan G Kupfer
Represented By: Jason M Lindner
Represented By: William V Reiss
Represented By: Thomas R Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [