Siranush Minasyan et al v. HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sedrak Khachikyan, A. K., N. K., HK. K., Siranush Minasyan and H. K.
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive, HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A. and Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01854
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff A. K., H. K., HK. K., N. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan. Dismissal is With prejudice. (Asadi, Mohammad)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue Order to Show Cause #28 . Hearing scheduled for 8/12/10 regarding the conditional settlement be continued to 9/13/10 at 8:30 am. A copy of this Order shall be served on all parties within seven (7) days of the above date. (ir)
August 11, 2010 Filing 28 First STIPULATION to Continue OSC Hearing from August 12,2010 to August 30,2010 filed by Plaintiff A. K., H. K., HK. K., N. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asadi, Mohammad)
July 9, 2010 Filing 27 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT held before Judge George H Wu: On July 7, 2010, Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Conditional Settlement. Counsel are hereby notified that on the Courts own motion, an Order to Show Cause hearing re: Settlement is set for August 12, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the order to show cause will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on August 11, 2010. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Case, filed on June 10, 2010, and presently set for July 15, 2010, is vacated and taken off calendar. (im)
July 7, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff A. K., H. K., HK. K., N. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan. Notice of conditional settlement (Asadi, Mohammad)
June 10, 2010 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 filed by Defendant HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Allison, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2010 Filing 22 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: Plaintiffs filed a First Amended Complaint on May 18 and May 21, 2010 (docket entries 18 and 21).Plaintiffs failed to comply with General Order 08-02 and were notified by the court clerk that a redacted first amended complaint should be filed forthwith. On June 4, 2010, counsel for plaintiffs filed a redacted amended complaint. Therefore, documents number 18 and 21 are stricken and will be removed from public view. #21 , #18 . (pj)
June 4, 2010 Filing 23 FIRST REDACTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 to 50, HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc. amending Complaint, #1 ,filed by plaintiffs H. K., Siranush Minasyan, A. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, N. K., HK. K. (esa) (bm).
May 21, 2010 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does, HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc. amending Complaint, #1 ,filed by plaintiffs H. K., H. K., Siranush Minasyan, A. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, N. K. (esa) (ir).
May 19, 2010 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion) #18 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2 Initiating documents * are NOT to be e-filed, but Manually filed with Civil Intake Section. Afterwards, e-mail a conformed copy to CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
May 18, 2010 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The document is stricken. Counsel will have 24 hours from the date of this response to file the First Amended Complaint at the Court's Civil Intake Department.. RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion) #18 (pj)
May 18, 2010 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs A. K., H. K., H. K., N. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan. First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Per Judge request a copy of the first amended complaint with marked changes.)(Asadi, Mohammad)
April 29, 2010 Filing 17 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES (filed 3/22/10); Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's filing ruling (attached) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and to Strike Punitive Damages is granted with leave to amend as indicated on the record. The Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar (see minute order for further details)Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (yl)
April 19, 2010 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sedrak Khachikyan, re Notice (Other) #15 served on 04/19/2010. (Asadi, Mohammad)
April 19, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE Re: DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES filed by Plaintiff Sedrak Khachikyan. (Asadi, Mohammad)
April 19, 2010 Filing 14 REPLY to Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case and Strike Punitive Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #6 filed by Defendants HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2010 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case and Strike Punitive Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #6 filed by Defendants HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2010 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Siranush Minasyan to Pilot Program Questionnaire (ADR-9) #10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Asadi, Mohammad)
April 19, 2010 Filing 10 JOINT ADR PILOT PROGRAM QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Plaintiff Sedrak Khachikyan.(Asadi, Mohammad)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge George H Wu, ORDERING OPPOSITION to motion to dismiss complaint and to strike punitive damages; Memorandum of points and authorities submitted by Plaintiffs A. K., H. K., H. K., N. K., Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan received on 4/14/10 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Pursuant to GO 08-02 case is designated for electronic filing. (pj)
April 14, 2010 Filing 9 OPPOSITION Motion to dismiss re: MOTION to Dismiss Case and Strike Punitive Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #6 OPPOSITION Motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Sedrak Khachikyan, Siranush Minasyan. (Asadi, Mohammad)
March 22, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., served on Notice to Parties of ADR Pilot Program; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Notice to Counsel; US District Court Civility and Professionalism Guidelines. (Allison, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2010 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Strike Punitive Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #6 filed by Defendant HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Strike Punitive Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Allison, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2010 Filing 5 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for April 29, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Counselare reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection Form ADR-1 shall befiled with the Court no later than April 15, 2010. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to eachparty that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pj)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. 2. At least twenty-one (21) days prior to the Final Pre-Trial Conference (henceforth FPTC), counsel for each party and pro per litigants1 must have prepared and exchanged with each other all of the following: [See document for details] (ake)
March 15, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
March 15, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A., Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc. (ghap) (ds).
March 15, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number EC051862 with conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge George H Wu, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (Filing fee $ 350:PAID.), filed by defendants Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A.(ghap) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siranush Minasyan et al v. HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedrak Khachikyan
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. K.
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HK. K.
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siranush Minasyan
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. K.
Represented By: Mohammad Azhar Asadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank U.S.A., N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Represented By: Eric D Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Represented By: Eric D Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?