Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences v. GoDaddy.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences
Defendant: XPDreamTeam LLC, Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC, GoDaddy.com, Inc., Greendomainmarket.com, The GoDaddy Group Inc. and BDS
Case Number: 2:2010cv03738
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Carla Woehrle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #771 filed by Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. CCA # 15-56687. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat)
February 5, 2016 Filing 779 Notice of Withdrawal of Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #763 filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
November 9, 2015 Filing 778 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings AUGUST 4, 6, 7, 2015 re Transcript #777 , #776 , #775 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Chong, Khowoonsun) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2015 Filing 777 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 7, 2015, TRIAL DAY 4 - P.M. SESSION. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: KHOWOONSUN CHONG, phone number kchong12907@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Chong, Khowoonsun)
November 9, 2015 Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 6, 2015, TRIAL DAY 3 - A.M. SESSION. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: KHOWOONSUN CHONG, phone number kchong12907@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Chong, Khowoonsun)
November 9, 2015 Filing 775 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 4, 2015, TRIAL DAY 1 - P.M. SESSION. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: KHOWOONSUN CHONG, phone number kchong12907@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Chong, Khowoonsun)
November 2, 2015 Filing 773 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter. Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Trial: 08/04/2015 - 08/07/2015 by Khowoonsun (Koni) Chong, CSR 12907. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Liang, Enoch)
November 2, 2015 Filing 772 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter. Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Trial: 08/04/2015 - 08/07/2015 by Chia Mei Jui, CSR 3287. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Liang, Enoch)
October 30, 2015 Filing 774 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56687, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #771 as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (mat)
October 29, 2015 Filing 771 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, #655 , Judgment,, #759 , Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #757 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-16703731.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liang, Enoch)
October 28, 2015 Filing 770 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #769 , Exhibit (non-trial) #767 , Exhibit (non-trial) #768 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
October 26, 2015 Filing 769 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Exhibit II (Part Three) to Supplemental Declaration of Aaron M. McKown as to Declaration (Motion related), #766 . (Tufano, Jay)
October 26, 2015 Filing 768 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Exhibit II (Part Two) to Supplemental Declaration of Aaron M. McKown as to Declaration (Motion related), #766 . (Tufano, Jay)
October 26, 2015 Filing 767 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Exhibit II (Part One) to Supplemental Declaration of Aaron M. McKown as to Declaration (Motion related), #766 . (Tufano, Jay)
October 26, 2015 Filing 766 DECLARATION of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences #763 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC, #4 Exhibit DD, #5 Exhibit EE, #6 Exhibit FF, #7 Exhibit GG, #8 Exhibit HH)(Tufano, Jay)
October 26, 2015 Filing 765 REPLY in Support of Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences #763 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attorney Jay A Tufano added to party GoDaddy.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Tufano, Jay)
October 21, 2015 Filing 764 OBJECTIONS to Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences #763 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
October 15, 2015 Filing 763 Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Application set for hearing on 10/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 Amended CACD Form CV-59, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (McKown, Aaron)
October 14, 2015 Filing 762 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Application set for hearing on 10/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 CV-59, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (McKown, Aaron)
October 2, 2015 Filing 761 NOTICE to counsel re the return of exhibits to counsel. Counsel are hereby notified that the exhibits will be held until Friday, October 9, 2015, to allow counsel to retrieve the documents. The Court would appreciate counsel retrieving the documents at the earliest possible date. If the documents are not retrieved, the Courtroom Deputy will dispose of them. Arrangements for pick up should be made, via email, with the Courtroom Deputy. AB_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 30, 2015 Filing 760 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Order Entering Final Judgment) (jp)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr., as follows: Judgment is entered in GoDaddy's favor on Plaintiff's claim for cybersquatting (Dkt. 1), as set forth in the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law issued on 9/10/2015. See Dkt. #757 . All other claims asserted and parties named in this action were previously dismissed with prejudice or are hereby dismissed with prejudice. As the prevailing parties in this litigation, GoDaddy is entitled to recover costs. The Court GRANTS FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of GoDaddy and against Plaintiff as to all claims asserted in the case. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
September 17, 2015 Filing 758 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Final Judgment re Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #757 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Zecchini, Paula)
September 10, 2015 Filing 757 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. GoDaddy shall submit a proposed judgment no later than 9/18/2015. AMPAS shall file any objections to GoDaddy's proposed judgment no later than 9/25/2015. See document for further details. (gk)
September 2, 2015 Filing 756 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANTS' MARKED COPY of Plaintiff's Post-Trial [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (gk)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER REGARDING GODADDY'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #753 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GoDaddy's Application to file its Marked Copy of Plaintiff's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law under seal is GRANTED. (lom)
August 31, 2015 Filing 754 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciencesto Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #750 THE ACADEMY'S MARK-UP OF GODADDY.COM, LLC'S POST TRIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Liang, Enoch)
August 31, 2015 Filing 753 APPLICATION for Order for to File Document Under Seal filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service) (Galvin, Robert)
August 25, 2015 Filing 752 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF LODGING OF PLAINTIFFS POST-TRIAL [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW [L.R. 52-1]. (lom)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal #748 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. (jp)
August 24, 2015 Filing 750 BRIEF filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Post Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Zecchini, Paula)
August 24, 2015 Filing 749 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 #748 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Post-Trial [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION])(Liang, Enoch)
August 24, 2015 Filing 748 APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Liang, Enoch)
August 19, 2015 Filing 747 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/7/15, 9:42 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2015. (Jui, Chia)
August 19, 2015 Filing 746 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/6/15, 1:17 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2015. (Jui, Chia)
August 19, 2015 Filing 745 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/5/15, 9:01 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2015. (Jui, Chia)
August 19, 2015 Filing 744 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/4/15, 9:03 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2015. (Jui, Chia)
August 11, 2015 Filing 741 STATEMENT OF FINAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OFFERED AT TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Liang, Enoch)
August 10, 2015 Filing 740 Joint Exhibit List of Admitted Trial Exhibits filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.. (Galvin, Robert)
August 7, 2015 Filing 742 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (jp)
August 7, 2015 Filing 739 MINUTES OF Court Trial (4th Day) Completed by jury verdict/submitted to court before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Defendant(s) rest. Closing arguments made by plaintiff(s) and defendant(s). Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Case submitted. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Witnesses called and testified, via deposition. Counsel shall file their Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Monday, August 24, 2015. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui/Khowoonsum (Koni) Chong. (jp)
August 7, 2015 Filing 738 STIPULATED Exhibit List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
August 7, 2015 Filing 736 NOTICE of Reduced Exhibits filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Galvin, Robert)
August 7, 2015 Filing 735 BRIEF filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. and Plaintiff AMPAS regarding Admissability of JTX 1233 (Galvin, Robert)
August 6, 2015 Filing 737 MINUTES OF Court Trial (3rd day) Held & Continued before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 8/7/2015 at 9:00 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. Witnesses called and testified, via deposition. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui/Khowoonsum (Koni) Chong. (jp)
August 6, 2015 Filing 734 NOTICE OF REDUCED TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
August 5, 2015 Filing 733 MINUTES OF Court Trial (2nd day ) Held and Continued before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 8/6/2015 at 9:00 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. Witnesses called and testified, via deposition. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (jp)
August 4, 2015 Filing 743 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (jp)
August 4, 2015 Filing 732 MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL (1st Day) Held and Continued before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: Opening statements made. Witneses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 8/5/2015 at 9:00 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui/Khowoonsum (Koni) Chong. (jp)
August 4, 2015 Filing 731 STIPULATION for Admissions of STIPULATED FACT NO. 136 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.(Liang, Enoch)
August 4, 2015 Filing 730 FOURTH AMENDED Exhibit List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
August 3, 2015 Filing 729 Witness List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
August 2, 2015 Filing 728 STIPULATION for Admissions of STIPULATED FACT NO. 135 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.(Liang, Enoch)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING LODGING OF ADDITIONAL VOLUMINOUS TRIAL EXHIBITS ON CD-ROM by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #720 , IT IS ORDERED that (1) Trial Exhibits 6-9, 11, 14, and 16-27 will be lodged via CD-ROM on the first day of trial; and (2) The Parties will provide the Court with a separate binder of the discovery responses and correspondence from Trial Exhibits 6-9, 11, 14, and 16-27 that they intend to present at trial, marked according to the Court's rules and standing order. (gk)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Regarding Deposition Transcripts to be Lodged at Trial #722 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that On the first day of trial, the Parties will lodge with the Court copies of their electronic mark-ups of their designations, counter-designations, and objections to the deposition testimony they intend to offer. (jp)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 725 REVISED FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. (jp)
July 30, 2015 Filing 724 THIRD REVISED JOINT Exhibit List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
July 30, 2015 Filing 722 STIPULATION for Leave to Lodge Deposition Transcripts for Trial filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 30, 2015 Filing 720 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits /Additional Voluminous Documents filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Regarding Lodging of Voluminous Trial Exhibits on CD-Rom #713 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that (1) Trial Exhibits 800-848 and 1000-1257 will be lodged via CD-ROM on the first day of trial; and (2) The Parties will provide the Court with a separate binder of the discovery responses and correspondence from Trial Exhibits 800-848 and 1000-1257 that they intend to present at trial, marked according to the Court's rules and standing order. (jp)
July 29, 2015 Filing 723 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S MARKED COPY of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (gk)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER Regarding Godaddy's Application to File Documents Under Seal #714 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that GoDaddy's Application to file its Marked Copy of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law under seal is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to accept the filing under seal. (jp)
July 29, 2015 Filing 718 TRIAL BRIEF CORRECTION OF DOCKET #716 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.. (Zecchini, Paula)
July 28, 2015 Filing 717 TRIAL BRIEF filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
July 28, 2015 Filing 716 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.. (Zecchini, Paula)
July 28, 2015 Filing 715 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciencesto Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #702 THE ACADEMY'S MARK-UP OF GODADDY.COM, LLC'S L.R. 52-1 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Liang, Enoch)
July 28, 2015 Filing 714 APPLICATION for Order for to File Document Under Seal filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service) (Galvin, Robert)
July 28, 2015 Filing 713 STIPULATION for Leave to Lodge Voluminous Trial Exhibits on CD-ROM filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 22, 2015 Filing 712 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/16/15, 10:05 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2015. (Jui, Chia)
July 21, 2015 Filing 711 REVISED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
July 21, 2015 Filing 710 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. [PROPOSED] REVISED FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] REVISED FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER)(Liang, Enoch)
July 20, 2015 Filing 709 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Plaintiff's [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] re Notice of Lodging, #701 (Attachments: #1 PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION OF PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW[L.R. 52-1])(Liang, Enoch)
July 17, 2015 Filing 708 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter. Court will contact Nicole Sands at nsands@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Daily Trial Transcripts and Real Time Transmission. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Zifkin, David)
July 17, 2015 Filing 707 NOTICE of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Galvin, Robert)
July 16, 2015 Filing 706 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW [L.R. 52-1]. (gk)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to File its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law under seal #700 is GRANTED. (gk)
July 16, 2015 Filing 704 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Court and counsel confer re trial schedule and exhibit and witness lists. The Court grants the Application to File Under Seal #700 . Counsel shall file a redacted version of the under seal filing. For the reasons stated on the record, counsel shall file an amended Proposed Pretrial Conference Order and joint witness and exhibit lists. The Court Trial remains set for 8/4/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
July 16, 2015 Filing 703 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter. Court will contact Lisa Cajigas at Lcajigas@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: July 16, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Zifkin, David)
July 14, 2015 Filing 702 BRIEF filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Zecchini, Paula)
July 14, 2015 Filing 701 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Plaintiff's [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 #700 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Liang, Enoch)
July 14, 2015 Filing 700 APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Liang, Enoch)
July 13, 2015 Filing 699 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Revised Appendices A & B (Stipulated Facts) to [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order re Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order #694 (Attachments: #1 Revised Appendices A & B to [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 13, 2015 Filing 698 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Revised Appendix D to [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order re Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order #694 (Attachments: #1 Revised Appendix D to [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 13, 2015 Filing 697 REVISED Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
July 10, 2015 Filing 696 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES the Final Pretrial Conference from July 13, 2015 to THURSDAY, July 16, 2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
July 7, 2015 Filing 695 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order #694 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The separately attached Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order lacks at least two lines of text on the page that has the line provided for the signature of the judge, Local Rule 58-10.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 2, 2015 Filing 694 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Liang, Enoch)
June 29, 2015 Filing 693 STATEMENT of the Case filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC (Doan, Jimmy)
June 29, 2015 Filing 692 STATEMENT of the Case filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Zifkin, David)
June 26, 2015 Filing 691 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. correcting Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law #688 (Zifkin, David)
June 26, 2015 Filing 690 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine to Exclude, #683 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
June 25, 2015 Filing 689 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JAMES BLADEL #683 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely.: Hearing date of 7/13/2015 is untimely pursuant to Local Rule 6-1.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 23, 2015 Filing 688 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Zifkin, David)
June 23, 2015 Filing 687 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zecchini, Paula)
June 23, 2015 Filing 686 Witness List filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.. (Zecchini, Paula)
June 23, 2015 Filing 685 JOINT Exhibit List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
June 23, 2015 Filing 684 Witness List filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.. (Liang, Enoch)
June 23, 2015 Filing 683 [WITHDRAWN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JAMES BLADEL filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang and Exhibits 1-5)(Liang, Enoch) Modified on 6/26/2015 (cb).
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates #680 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that (1) The date by which each party shall file a Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law pursuant to L.R. 16-4 shall be continued from 6/22/2015 to 6/23/2015. (2) The date by which each party shall file a Witness List pursuant to L.R. 16-5 shall be continued from 6/22/2015 to 6/23/2015. (3) The date by which the parties shall file a Joint Exhibit List pursuant to L.R. 16-6.1 shall be continued from 6/22/ 2015 to 6/23/2015. (4) The date by which each party shall disclose copies of all graphic or illustrative material to be shown at trial pursuant to L.R. 16-3 shall be continued from 7/24/ 2015 to 7/30/2015. (5) The date by which Plaintiff shall lodge the Final Pretrial Conference Order with the Clerk pursuant to L.R. 16-7 and Judge Birotte's Standing Order re: Court Trial shall be continued from 6/29/2015 to 7/2/2015. (6) This stipulation shall not prejudice any other pre-trial deadlines. (jp)
June 15, 2015 Filing 681 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jimmy Tuan Anh Doan counsel for Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Adding Jimmy Tuan Anh Doan as counsel of record for GoDaddy.com, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attorney Jimmy Tuan Anh Doan added to party GoDaddy.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Doan, Jimmy)
June 15, 2015 Filing 680 STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
June 4, 2015 Filing 679 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On 6/2/2015, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on 6/3/2015. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2015 Filing 678 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Greendomainmarket.com. (Liang, Enoch)
June 3, 2015 Filing 677 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciencesto Order to Show Cause,,, #675 (Liang, Enoch)
June 2, 2015 Filing 676 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David L Zifkin counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. David I. Michaels is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff the Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, Inc.. (Zifkin, David)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 675 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATIONS AGAINST GREENDOMAINMARKET.COM by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not strike Plaintiff's allegations and claims in against Greendomainmarket.com from the SAC as immaterial. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f). Plaintiff shall show cause by filing a written response not to exceed five pages no later than June 12, 2015. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument and will consider the matter submitted upon receipt of Plaintiff's written response or lapse of Plaintiff's opportunity to respond. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Civ. L. R. 7-15. The Court will construe Plaintiff's failure to respond to this order to show cause as consent to strike Plaintiff's allegations and claims against Greendomainmarket.com from the SAC as immaterial in light of Plaintiff's earlier dismissal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
June 2, 2015 Filing 674 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #663 and STIPULATION TO FACTS RE: Domain Names and Screenshots filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences.(Liang, Enoch)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: granting #669 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F. Lee on behalf of Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and for GoDaddy.com, LLC, designating Paula L. Zecchini as local counsel. (lt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 672 SEALED DOCUMENT - FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBIT I, N, and P to the Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in support of The Academy's to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10). (jp)
May 20, 2015 Filing 671 SEALED DOCUMENT - FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS 38, 38A, 41, 42, 43, 44, and 45 to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in support of the Academy's to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12). (jp)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Submitted in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #664 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that Plaintiff's Application to Exhibits I, N and P to the Herman Declaration, and Exhibits 38, 38A, and 41-45 to the Liang Declaration under seal is GRANTED. (jp)
May 20, 2015 Filing 669 APPLICATION for attorney William F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15753307 paid.) filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
May 20, 2015 Filing 668 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert M Galvin on behalf of Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC (Attorney Robert M Galvin added to party GoDaddy.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Galvin, Robert)
May 18, 2015 Filing 667 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Under Seal Filing #664 by Clerk of Court to Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. The document is accepted as filed. The docket clerk will amend the docket entry text to reflect the caption of the attached document.Any document, incorrectly filed in the future, will be stricken. (jp)
May 18, 2015 Filing 666 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 filed 5/15/2015 #664 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Applications - Order. Notices - Under Seal Filing event utilized for docketing this filing. Please refer to the Court's website re FAQs about Judge Birotte's Procedures and Schedules. Judge Birotte is participating in the Central District of California's Pilot Project for the Electronic Submission and Filing of Under Seal Documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 15, 2015 Filing 665 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Exhibit 3 (CD-ROM) to Declaration of Joe Presbrey [Dkt No. 663 - 15]. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodging)(Liang, Enoch)
May 15, 2015 Filing 664 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 filed Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch). Modified on 5/19/2015 (jp).
May 15, 2015 Filing 663 [WITHDRAWN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Plaintiff's L.R. 56-1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of David Quinto, #4 Exhibits 1 - 51 to Quinto Declaration, #5 Exhibits 61 - 96 to Quinto Declaration, #6 Exhibits 97 - 119 to Quinto Declaration, #7 Declaration of Joe Presbrey, #8 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 to Presbrey Declaration, #9 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 to Presbrey Declaration, #10 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 to Presbrey Declaration, #11 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 to Presbrey Declaration, #12 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 to Presbrey Declaration, #13 Exhibit 1 - Part 6 to Presbrey Declaration, #14 Exhibit 2 to Presbrey Declaration, #15 Exhibit 3 to Presbrey Declaration, #16 Exhibits 4 - 9 to Presbrey Declaration, #17 Declaration of Matthew J. Herman, #18 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #19 Proposed Order, #20 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch) Modified on 6/2/2015 (cb).
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Stipulation #660 to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief for Contributory Cybersquatting as set forth in the Second Amended Complaint #170 is GRANTED. The Sixth Claim for Relief is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw)
May 4, 2015 Filing 661 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #660 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(McKown, Aaron)
May 4, 2015 Filing 660 STIPULATION to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief for Contributory Cybersquatting GoDaddy.com, LLC filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.(McKown, Aaron)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. The parties' four Motions to Compel are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows. For the foregoing reasons, the Court: DENIES GoDaddy's Motion to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents [Docket no. 575]. DENIES the Academy's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set Four [Docket no. 576], but GRANTS the Academy leave to serve four additional interrogatories related to new events, no later than seven days from the issuance of this order. GRANTS the Academy's Motion to Compel Production Re: Sixth Set of RFPs [Docket no. 578] with regard to the list of domain names marked by the July 13 key word filter and ORDERS GoDaddy to produce that list, but otherwise DENIES the Motion. DENIES the Academys Motion to Compel Production Re: Seventh Set of RFPs [Docket no. 580]. #575 #576 #578 #580 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MINUTES ORDER RE: Joint Request for Decision on Four Motions to Compel [Dkt. No. 639] by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. The parties are advised that the Court's decision on the pending motions will be issued not later than May 5, 2015. #639 (gr)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 657 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER IN PART #644 ; AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. GREGORY LASTOWKA #645 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: the Court GRANTS AMPAS's motion to modify the scheduling order IN PART as set forth in the table above. While the Court reluctantly modifies the scheduling order in light of Mr. Lastowka's untimely illness, the Court will not entertain further requests to continue any of the above deadlines absent highly unusual or extenuating circumstances. Because the Court modifies the scheduling order to permit AMPAS to substitute Dr. Abramson for Mr. Lastowka, GoDaddy's request to strike Mr. Lastowka's expert report is moot, and the Court DENIES the motion for that reason. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for determination without oral argument, and the hearing previously scheduled for April 13, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED (jloz)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 656 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND #611 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court finds GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Jury Demand. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for determination without oral argument, and the hearing previously scheduled for April 13, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 655 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT GODADDY.COM, LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #606 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court GRANTS the motion IN PART and DENIES the motion IN PART. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for determination without oral argument, and the hearing previously scheduled for April 13, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL DATES by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates #653 , and for good cause having been shown, the stipulation is GRANTED: (1) The deadline for the Parties to file dispositive motions (Round 2) shall be continued from 4/4/2015 to 4/23/2015. (2) The hearing date for dispositive motions (Round 2) shall be continued from 6/2/2015 to 6/23/2015. (3) This stipulation shall not prejudice any of the other deadlines set forth in the Court's 1/30/2015 and 2/6/2015 orders. (jp)
March 24, 2015 Filing 653 STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 652 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING 1) MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. 606); 2) MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND (DKT. 611); 3) MOTION FOR ORDER FOR MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. 644); AND 4) MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF MR. GREGORY LASTOWKA AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED EXPERT TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS (DKT. 645) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES the Motions from March 30, 2015 to Monday, April 13, 2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83-9.3, the parties are advised that the Court's decision on the pending motions will be issued by April 20, 2015. In re: Joint Request for Ruling on Four Motions to Compel #639 . (mkr)
March 16, 2015 Filing 650 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for to exclude testimony #645 Re: G. Lastowka filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula)
March 16, 2015 Filing 649 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Modifying Scheduling Order #644 to Permit Substitution of Expert Dr. Bruce Abramson for Prof. Greg Lastowka filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
March 9, 2015 Filing 648 Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Modifying Scheduling Order #644 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Zecchini in Support)(Zecchini, Paula)
March 9, 2015 Filing 647 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for to exclude testimony #645 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF MR. GREGORY LASTOWKA AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED EXPERT TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL DATES by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #643 , the deadline for the Parties to file dispositive motions (Round 2) shall be continued to 4/4/2015. The hearing date for dispositive motions (Round 2) shall be continued to 6/1/2015 at 10:00 AM. The Settlement Conference Deadline shall be continued to 6/15/2015. Final Pretrial Conference shall be continued to 7/13/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. (gk)
March 2, 2015 Filing 645 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to exclude testimony filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
February 26, 2015 Filing 644 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch Liang ISO Mx to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
February 25, 2015 Filing 643 Corrected STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
February 25, 2015 Filing 642 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Continue #640 by Clerk of Court to Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. (jp)
February 25, 2015 Filing 641 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue #640 . The following error(s) was found: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment - pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
February 25, 2015 Filing 640 STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC.(McKown, Aaron)
February 20, 2015 Filing 639 Joint REQUEST for Ruling on Four Motions to Compel [Dkt Nos. 582, 583, 584, and 585] Pursuant to L.R. 83-9 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 638 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt. 606) AND MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND (Dkt. 611) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES the Motions from February 23, 2015 to Monday, March 30, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2015 Filing 637 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 12 in Support of Zifkin Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (gk)
February 10, 2015 Filing 636 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 11 in Support of Zifkin Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(gk)
February 10, 2015 Filing 635 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 10 (Pages 34-36 and 70-71) in Support of Zifkin Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (gk)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MINUTES [In Chambers] Order GRANTING Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Application to File Documents Under Seal #617 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: The Court orders that the following documents filed by AMPAS in support of its opposition to GoDaddy's motion for summary judgment be filed under seal: 1. Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of David Zifkin, Pages 34-36, 70-71; 2. Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of David Zifkin; 3. Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of David Zifkin. (jp)
February 10, 2015 Filing 633 EXHIBIT C, E and F to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to claims asserted and issues presented by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences #606 Exhibits ISO Declaration of Aaron M. McKown Previously Filed Under Seal filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
February 9, 2015 Filing 632 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Jury Demand #611 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Zifkin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Zifkin, David)
February 9, 2015 Filing 631 REPLY in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to claims asserted and issues presented by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences #606 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown, #2 Objection to Declaration of M. Herman, #3 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Reply to Uncontroverted Material Facts)(McKown, Aaron)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue The Trial Date #625 by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., that the Trial date is CONTINUED to 8/4/2015 at 8:30 AM. This Order does not modify any of the pretrial dates set forth in the Courts Order of January 30, 2015 (Dkt. #622 ). (jp)
February 5, 2015 Filing 629 MEMORANDUM in Support of APPLICATION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal #617 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula)
February 5, 2015 Filing 628 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. The document shall be filed as a Memorandum in Support, not as a noticed motion. (cb)
February 5, 2015 Filing 627 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Application #626 . The following error(s) was found: Caption of document is incorrect. The Memorandum in support of application docket entry DOES NOT MATCH on the caption of document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
February 4, 2015 Filing 626 [STRICKEN] MEMORANDUM in Support of APPLICATION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal #617 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 2/5/2015 (cb).
February 3, 2015 Filing 625 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
February 3, 2015 Filing 624 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk of Court to Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion in Support of Application to Seal #620 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. The document shall be filed as a Memorandum in Support not as a noticed motion.2/3/ (jp)
February 2, 2015 Filing 623 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Strike Jury Demand #611 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Zecchini in Support)(Zecchini, Paula)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 622 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 605) by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr granting in part and denying in part #605 Motion to Continue: Accordingly, the Court modifies the scheduling order as follows: Expert Discovery Cut-Off (Other than Mr. Lastowka): February 2, 2015; Expert Discovery Cut-Off (Mr. Lastowka): March 2, 2015; Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, Round 2 last day to file Round 2 Dispositive Motions: March 20, 2015; Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, Round 2: May 4, 2015 at 10:00 a.m.;Final Mediation Deadline: May 27, 2015;Final Pre-Trial Conference: June 29, 2015, at 11:00 a.m.;Trial: July 14, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. CONCLUSION: In light of the foregoing, the Court GRANTS GoDaddy's motion to modify the scheduling order IN PART and DENIES the motion IN PART. The Court modifies the scheduling order only to the extent set forth in the chart above. The scheduling order remains otherwise unchanged. While the Court reluctantly modifies the scheduling order in light of unanticipated delays in expert discovery, the Court will not entertain further requests to continue any of the above deadlines absent highly unusual or extenuating circumstances. After five years of vigorous litigation and multiple continuances, it is difficult to imagine good cause to delay these proceedings further. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for determination without oral argument, and the hearing previously scheduled for February 2, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. (see document for further details) (bm)
January 29, 2015 Filing 621 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion in Support of Application to Seal #620 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: docket entry text indicates that attached document is a memorandum, which does not match caption of the attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 28, 2015 Filing 620 [STRICKEN] MEMORANDUM in Support of APPLICATION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal #617 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 2/5/2015 (cb).
January 27, 2015 Filing 619 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Judge Andre Birotte Jr. is moving his Courtroom from the Roybal Federal Building to the Spring Street Courthouse, which is located at 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Judge Andre Birotte Jr.s new Courtroom will be COURTROOM 4 of the SPRING STREET Courthouse. Effective February 2, 2015, all Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 4 of the Spring Street Courthouse, and all required Mandatory Chambers Copies shall be hand-delivered and placed in the tray outside the door to Judge Birottes chambers at the Spring Street Courthouse. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 1/27/2015 (ab).
January 27, 2015 Filing 618 Proof OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, served on Jan. 27, 2015 - Exhibits Filed Under Seal In Support Of Zifkin Declaration Filed In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (Zifkin, David)
January 26, 2015 Filing 617 APPLICATION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
January 26, 2015 Filing 616 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Under Seal Exhibits. (Zifkin, David)
January 26, 2015 Filing 615 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support Of Opposition To Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
January 26, 2015 Filing 614 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to claims asserted and issues presented by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences #606 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Statement Of Genuine Disputes Of Material Fact, And Counter-Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Declaration of D. Zifkin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Declaration of M. Herman, #22 Exhibit A, #23 Exhibit B, #24 Exhibit C, #25 Exhibit D, #26 Exhibit E, #27 Exhibit F)(Zifkin, David)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 613 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DENYING Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Application to File Certain Exhibits In Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 608) by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr: In light of the foregoing, the Court DENIES Defendant's application to file exhibits C, E, and F to the declaration of Aaron McKown in support of Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment under seal for want of any compelling reasons to do so and any attempt to narrowly tailor the sealing order. (Dkt. No. 608.) Defendant is directed to pick up its manually lodged documents within 10 days. If Defendant fails to pick up the manually lodged documents submitted along with the application to seal within 10 days, the clerk is directed to destroy them. (see document for further details) (bm)
January 15, 2015 Filing 612 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines #605 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 13, 2015 Filing 611 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
January 12, 2015 Filing 610 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines #605 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Zifkin, David)
January 12, 2015 Filing 609 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Under Seal Filing #608 . The following error(s) was found: 1. Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Leave to File Document. 2. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. [Prop] Order should be efiled as the second attachment to the Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 12, 2015 Filing 608 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed GoDaddy.com, LLC (McKown, Aaron)
January 9, 2015 Filing 607 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC of Exhibits C-G to Declaration of A. McKown in support of GoDaddy's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (McKown, Aaron)
January 9, 2015 Filing 606 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to claims asserted and issues presented by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of P. Nicks, #3 Declaration of A. McKown, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C-G, #7 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #8 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
January 5, 2015 Filing 605 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of A. McKown, #3 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ACADEMY OF MOTION PICTURE ARTS AND SCIENCES' MOTION TO JOIN GODADDY.COM LLC AS A DEFENDANT IN AMPAS I PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 25(c) by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr granting #600 Motion: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Plaintiff's Motion is hereby GRANTED. 2. Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC is hereby joined as a defendant in Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences v. GoDaddy.com, Inc., et al., Case No. CV-10-03738-AB. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for determination without oral argument, and the hearing previously scheduled for December 8, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. (bm)
November 24, 2014 Filing 603 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for to Join Godaddy.com LLC as a Defendant in AMPAS I Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) #600 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Motion Hearings Taken off calendar by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Pursuant to Local Rule 7-15, the Court takes the Motion hearings scheduled for Tuesday, November 25, 2014 at 2:00 p.m., off-calendar, and the matters are taken under submission for decision without oral argument. #589 #599 (gr)
November 17, 2014 Filing 601 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for to Join Godaddy.com LLC as a Defendant in AMPAS I Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) #600 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
November 10, 2014 Filing 600 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Join Godaddy.com LLC as a Defendant in AMPAS I Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)Motion hearings rescheduled by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Compel hearings, previously scheduled for Thursday, November 13, 2014 at 2:00 p.m., have been rescheduled to Tuesday, November 25, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. #589 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 589 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)Docket Nos: 575; 576; 578; 580 (Motions to Compel) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. On the Court's own motion, the Motion hearings, previously scheduled for Tuesday, October 28, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., have been rescheduled to Thursday, November 13, 2014 at 2:00p.m. #575 #576 #578 #580 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
October 15, 2014 Filing 598 SEALED DOCUMENT- A, B, AND C TO THE DECLARATION of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Defendant Go Daddy.Com, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to requests for production of documents, (Set Seven). (mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 597 SEALED DOCUMENT- K, L, AND R, TO THE DECLARATION of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to its requests for production of documents, set seven. (mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 596 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to compel further responses to its requests for production of documents, set seven.(mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 595 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION re: Plaintiff's Motion to compel further responses to its requests for production of documents, set seven. (mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 594 SEALED DOCUMENT- C, G, F, AND H to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Defendant Go Daddy.Com, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Requests for Production of Documents (Set Six)(mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 593 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. (mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 592 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set Four. (mat)
October 15, 2014 Filing 591 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. (mat)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file the Joint Stipulation regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set Four, the Herman Declaration, and Exhibit J to the Herman Declaration, under seal, is GRANTED. #577 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr) (Main Document 588 replaced on 10/16/2014) (gr).
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file the Joint Stipulation regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Seven, Exhibits K, L, and R to the Herman Declaration, and Exhibits A, B, and C to the McKown Declaration, under seal, is GRANTED. #581 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file the Joint Stipulation regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Six, and Exhibits C, F, G, H, and J to the Declaration of Aaron McKown, under seal, is GRANTED. #579 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
October 14, 2014 Filing 585 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Godaddy.com, LLC to Requests for Production, Set Seven #580 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
October 14, 2014 Filing 584 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Godaddy.com, LLC to Requests for Production, Set Six #578 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
October 14, 2014 Filing 583 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendants Godaddy.com, Inc. and Godaddy.com, LLC to Interrogatories, Set Four #576 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Herman)(Liang, Enoch)
October 14, 2014 Filing 582 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff, to Compel Production of Documents, and for Sanctions #575 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of A. McKown)(McKown, Aaron)
October 7, 2014 Filing 590 TEXT ONLY ENTRY RE: UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS: Judge Carla Woehrle is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email address at cw_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (gr)
October 7, 2014 Filing 581 APPLICATION for Leave to File to File Under Seal re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs, Set Seven filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
October 7, 2014 Filing 580 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Godaddy.com, LLC to Requests for Production, Set Seven filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibits A - Z to the Herman Declaration, #4 Declaration of Aaron McKown in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibits A - D to the McKown Declaration, #6 Declaration of Paul Nicks in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(Liang, Enoch)
October 7, 2014 Filing 579 APPLICATION for Leave to File to File Under Seal re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs, Set Six filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
October 7, 2014 Filing 578 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Godaddy.com, LLC to Requests for Production, Set Six filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Aaron McKown in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibits A - J to McKown Declaration, #4 Declaration of Paul Nicks in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(Liang, Enoch)
October 3, 2014 Filing 577 APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set Four filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
October 3, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses from Defendants Godaddy.com, Inc. and Godaddy.com, LLC to Interrogatories, Set Four filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Matthew J. Herman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibits A - C to Matthew Herman Declaration, #3 Exhibits D - I to Matthew Herman Declaration, #4 Exhibits J - U to Matthew Herman Declaration, #5 Exhibits V - DD to Matthew Herman Declaration, #6 Declaration of Aaron McKown in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #7 Declaration of Paul Nicks in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #8 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
October 2, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff, to Compel Production of Documents, and for Sanctions filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Aaron M. McKown ISO Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A-I ISO Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #3 Exhibit J-L ISO Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #4 Declaration Enoch Liang ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit 1-11 ISO Declaration of Enoch Liang, #6 Exhibit 12-26 ISO Declaration of Enoch Liang)(McKown, Aaron)
September 15, 2014 Filing 574 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings March 6, 2013 10:56 a.m. re Transcript #573 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2014 Filing 573 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on March 6, 2013 10:56 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2014. (kch)
September 10, 2014 Filing 572 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Application to Compel,, #333 , as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Liang, Enoch)
August 19, 2014 Filing 571 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Further Supplemental Registrar's Certificate re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (McKown, Aaron)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#14-035) approved by Chief Judge George H. King. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Andre Birotte Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Audrey B. Collins to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV10-03738 AB (CWx). (mg) Modified on 8/12/2014.
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE CONFUSINGLY SIMILAR DOMAIN NAMES IN AMPAS II CASE by Judge Audrey B. Collins. On July 28, 2014, the Academy's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on "Confusingly Similar" Domain Names came on for hearing. The Court, after reviewing the papers, the declarations and after hearing oral argument, decides as follows. The following domain names are confusingly similar as a matter of law to the Academy's trademarks. (See document for list of names) (bp)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences ("Academy") Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (docket no.563). Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC ("GoDaddy") filed an Opposition and Academy filed a Reply. The Court will resolve the Motion without oral argument and therefore VACATES the hearing set for July 28, 2014. For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion.granting #563 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (bp)
July 17, 2014 Filing 567 TRANSCRIPT ORDER GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@ringbenderlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
July 14, 2014 Filing 566 REPLY MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Re Confusingly Similar Domain Names in AMPAS II Case #563 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
July 7, 2014 Filing 565 Opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Re Confusingly Similar Domain Names in AMPAS II Case #563 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown in Support, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of A. McKown)(Zecchini, Paula)
July 7, 2014 Filing 564 Defendant, GoDaddy.com, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff AMPAS's First Amended Complaint filed in consolidated case CV13-08458-ABC(cw) (McKown, Aaron)
June 23, 2014 Filing 563 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Re Confusingly Similar Domain Names in AMPAS II Case filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang ISO Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
May 9, 2014 Filing 562 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Paula L Zecchini counsel for Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Changing firm name to Ring Bender McKown & Castillo LLLP dba Ring Bender LLLP. Changing e-mail to pzecchini@ringbenderlaw.com. Filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. and GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Zecchini, Paula)
May 9, 2014 Filing 561 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Aaron M McKown counsel for Defendant GoDaddy.com, LLC. Changing firm name to Ring Bender McKown & Castillo LLLP dba Ring Bender LLLP. Changing e-mail to amckown@ringbenderlaw.com. Filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc and GoDaddy.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
April 25, 2014 Filing 560 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney David W. Quinto on behalf of Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Attorney David W Quinto added to party Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences(pty:pla))(Quinto, David)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 559 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f), Local Civil Rule 26-1, this Court's Order dated February 11, 2014 (Dkt No. 39), this Court's Order dated March 27, 2014 (Dkt No. 548), and the scheduling conference held on April 7, 2014, the parties hereby jointly submit a Proposed Scheduling Order for the Court's review and approval. Regarding fact and expert discovery deadlines below, the permissible scope of fact discovery and expert reports are issues that, if the parties cannot resolve disagreements, should be presented to Magistrate Judge Woerhle. The parties are free to file additional dispositive motions at an earlier date than those listed below so long as each side has 2 weeks to oppose, 2 weeks to reply, and 2 weeks for the Court to consider before the hearing date. Fact Discovery Cut-Off: September 26, 2014; Expert Reports: October 28, 2014; Rebuttal Expert Reports: December 3, 2014; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: December 22, 2014; Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, Round 1 - last day to file Round 1 Dispositive Motions: January 9, 2015; Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, Round 1: February 23, 2015; Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, Round 2 - last day to file Round 2 Dispositive Motions: February 6, 2015; Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, Round 2: March 23, 2015; Final Mediation Deadline: April 17, 2015; Final Pre-Trial Conference: May 18, 2015 at 10:00 a.m.; Trial (starting on Tuesday): June 2, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (bm)
April 21, 2014 Filing 558 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Joint Scheduling Order #556 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): A stand-alone proposed order should be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the [proposed] order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying #549 Motion for Sanctions. See Minute Order for specifics. (dp)
April 15, 2014 Filing 556 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciencesto Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #553 [Proposed] Joint Scheduling Order (Liang, Enoch)
April 14, 2014 Filing 555 REPLY in support of MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Powers Against Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. #549 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 04/17/2015. (cb)
April 7, 2014 Filing 553 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel state their appearances. The Scheduling Conference is held. The Court sets the following dates: Final Pre Trial Conference: May 18, 2015 at 10:00 AM. Trial counsel to be present; Jury Trial: June 2, 2015 at 8:30 AM. Counsel are reminded of the requirements of Local Rule 16-15. Court signs Order/Referral to ADR Pilot Program in open Court, ADR Procedure No. 3. The ADR proceeding to be completed no later than April 17, 2015. The Court orders counsel to meet and confer and submit to the Court a new joint proposed schedule of dates. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
April 7, 2014 Filing 552 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Powers Against Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. #549 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 7, 2014 Filing 551 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Scheduling Conference Report #550 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Pretrial and Trial Documents-Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 2, 2014 Filing 550 JOINT REPORT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
March 31, 2014 Filing 549 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Powers Against Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch Liang, #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #545 Motion: The Court will resolve this matter without oral argument and therefore VACATES the April 7, 2014 motion hearing. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motions and hereby ORDERS Case No. CV-10-3738-ABC and Case No. CV-13-8458-ABC to be consolidated for all purposes and for trial. The Court ORDERS that all further documents and proceedings shall occur under Case No. CV-10-3738-ABC only, and that Case No. CV-13-8458-ABC shall be closed. Counsel must file all future documents in Case No. CV-10-3738-ABC only. The April 7 Scheduling Conference for Case No. CV-13-8458-ABC is now deemed a Scheduling Conference for Case No. CV-10-3738-ABC, and remains on calendar to resolve any scheduling issues the arise from the consolidation. The parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Report is due by April 2, 2014. All dates in Case No. CV-13-8458-ABC are hereby VACATED. (see document for further details) (bm)
March 24, 2014 Filing 547 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to CV-13-08458-ABC, #545 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Zifkin, #2 Exhibit 1)(Zifkin, David)
March 17, 2014 Filing 546 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to CV-13-08458-ABC, #545 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 10, 2014 Filing 545 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to CV-13-08458-ABC, filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
February 12, 2014 Filing 544 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/4/14 9:56 a.m. re Transcript #543 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2014 Filing 543 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/4/14 9:56 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2014. (ha)
February 10, 2014 Filing 542 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02/03/14; 1:54 p.m. re Transcript #541 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seijas, Pamela) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2014 Filing 541 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/03/14; 1:54 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2014. (Seijas, Pamela)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #509 Motion to Continue: The Court finds the Motion appropriate for resolution without oral argument and therefore VACATES the hearing set for February 10, 2014. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion. For these reasons, GoDaddys Motion is GRANTED. The Court is largely adopting GoDaddy's proposed dates, but has departed slightly from GoDaddys dates for item (f), and for the final pre-trial conference and trial; the Court has also added item (g). The Court CONTINUES the dates as follows: 1. All Pre-Trial deadlines are continued as follows: a. Limited Fact Discovery Cut-Off, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey, is set for April 30, 2014. b. Expert Report(s) on behalf of GoDaddy, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey fact discovery and for any expert(s) replacing Dr. Clifford Nass, are due June 4, 2014. c. Rebuttal Expert Reports on behalf of AMPAS, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey fact discovery, are due July 7, 2014. d. Expert Discovery Cut-Off is set for July 25, 2014. e. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off is set for August 15, 2014. f. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for May 20, 2014, now is set for September 22, 2014, at 10:00 a.m.. g. Final mediation deadline is October 17, 2014. 2. The Final Pre-Trial Conference is set for November 17, 2014, at 10:00 a.m.. 3. Trial is set for December 2, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 4, 2014 Filing 539 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Liang, Enoch)
February 4, 2014 Filing 538 Defendant's Motion to Compel Inspection of Presbrey-Related Computers, Production of Supplemental Responses and Production of a Qualified 30(b)(6) Witness [Dkt. No. 521] by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Defendant's motion to compel is granted in part. A further deposition of Mr. Presbrey, not to exceed two hours, is ordered for the purpose of addressing questions regarding the web cache production and the alleged discrepancies between GoDaddy's and Presbrey's data as discussed in the motion papers. Plaintiff is to provide supplemental responses to the document production requests relating to Presbrey as to which privilege objections were previously asserted. The motion is otherwise denied. (521) (gr)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S Fischer: denying #514 Motion to Disqualify Judge (shb) Modified on 2/4/2014 (shb).
February 3, 2014 Filing 536 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. See Minute Order for specifics.Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (dp) (Main Document 536 replaced on 2/4/2014) (dp).
February 3, 2014 Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Motion to Disqualify Judge, #514 , GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Recuse Hon. Audrey B. Collins. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 534 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RESETTING TIME FOR HEARING on Motion to Disqualify Judge Collins by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The motion is set for hearing at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Fischer on 2/3/14 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2014 Filing 533 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Continue #509 Trial and Modify Scheduling Order filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 23, 2014 Filing 532 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Exhibit 3 (CD-ROM) In Support of Declaration of Matthew Herman re: Academy's Opposition to GoDaddy's Motion to Compel the Inspection of Presbrey-Related Computers, Production of Supplemental Responses, and Production of a Qualified 30(b)(6) Witness. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodging of CD-ROM Exhibit)(Liang, Enoch)
January 22, 2014 Filing 531 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel THE INSPECTION OF PRESBREY RELATED COMPUTERS, PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES, AND PRODUCTION OF QUALIFIED 30(b)(6) WITNESS #521 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
January 20, 2014 Filing 530 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Disqualify Judge Hon. Audrey B. Collins #514 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 20, 2014 Filing 529 Opposition re: MOTION to Continue #509 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration iso Opposition to Motion to Amend Scheduling Order)(Liang, Enoch)
January 14, 2014 Filing 528 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #526 (Liang, Enoch)
January 13, 2014 Filing 526 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Disqualify Judge Hon. Audrey B. Collins #514 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liang, #2 Declaration of Hanson, #3 Declaration of Quinto, #4 Declaration of Singer, #5 Objections to the Affidavit of Nima Kelly)(Liang, Enoch)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Having considered the Parties Stipulation to Continue the Hearing Date, theCourt hereby continues the hearing date on the Parties Joint Stipulation Re:Motion to Compel the Inspection of Presbrey Related Computers, Production ofSupplemental Responses, and Production of Qualified 30(b)(6) Witness (Dkt. No.521) to Tuesday, February 4, 2014 at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 640.(522) (gr)
January 8, 2014 Filing 522 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date re: Parties' Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Compel the Inspection of Presbrey Related Computers, Supplemental Responses, and Production of Qualified 30(b)(6) Witness from February 3, 2014 to February 4, 2014 at 10:00 AM filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH THE DECLARATION OF AARON M. MCKOWN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE INSPECTION OF PRESBREY RELATED COMPUTERS, PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES, AND PRODUCTION OF A QUALIFIED 30(B)(6) WITNESS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GoDaddy.com's Application to file under seal Exhibits A-R to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in support of DefendantGoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence is hereby GRANTED. (513) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
January 3, 2014 Filing 521 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel THE INSPECTION OF PRESBREY RELATED COMPUTERS, PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES, AND PRODUCTION OF QUALIFIED 30(b)(6) WITNESS filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown, #2 Exhibit to Decl. of A. McKown, #3 Declaration of M. Kunkel, #4 Declaration of M. Herman, #5 Exhibit 1-14 to Decl. of M. Herman, #6 Exhibit 15 to Decl. of M. Herman, #7 Exhibit 16-21 to Decl of M. Herman, #8 Declaration of J. Presbrey)(McKown, Aaron)
January 3, 2014 Filing 520 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. correcting Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #511 (McKown, Aaron)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing on the Motion to Disqualify Judge Collins. Motion now set for hearing on 2/3/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 2, 2014 Filing 518 REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge/Magistrate Judge has been filed. Pursuant to GO 08.05 and Local Rule 72-5 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Hon. Audrey B. Collins #514 is referred to Judge Dale S. Fischer for determination. (rn)
January 1, 2014 Filing 517 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. 21-32 Re: Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Disqualify Hon. Audrey B. Collins as to Exhibit (non-trial) #516 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
December 31, 2013 Filing 516 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. 11-20 as to Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, #515 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
December 31, 2013 Filing 515 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Disqualify Judge Hon. Audrey B. Collins #514 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7-10)(McKown, Aaron)
December 31, 2013 Filing 514 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge Hon. Audrey B. Collins filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of N. Kelly, #2 Certificate of Good Faith)(McKown, Aaron)
December 26, 2013 Filing 527 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A, B, C, G, H, J, N, O, P, R, S, T to the Declaration of A Mckown in Support of Joint Stipulation Re: Defendant's Motion to Compel THE INSPECTION OF PRESBREY RELATED COMPUTERS, PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES, AND PRODUCTION OF QUALIFIED 30(b)(6) WITNESS. (mat)
December 26, 2013 Filing 524 TEXT ONLY ENTRY RE: UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS: Judge Carla Woehrle is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email address at cw_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gr)
December 26, 2013 Filing 513 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL In Connection With Its Declaration Of Aaron M. McKown In Support Of The Joint Stipulation Re: Defendant's Motion To Compel The Inspection Of Presbrey-Related Computers, Production Of Supplemental Responses, And Production Of A Qualified 30(B)(6) Witness filed by defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
December 24, 2013 Filing 512 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Exhibits to Declaration of A. McKown in support of joint stipulation. (McKown, Aaron)
December 24, 2013 Filing 511 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Court's Orders dated June 21, 2013 [Dkt. 492] and June 24, 2013 [Dkt. 499] related to the witness status of Joe Presbrey #500 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown, #2 Exhibit to Decl. of A. McKown, #3 Declaration of M. Kunkel, #4 Declaration of M. Herman, #5 Exhibit 1-14 to Decl. of M. Herman, #6 Exhibit 15 to Decl. of M. Herman, #7 Exhibit 16-21 to Decl. of M. Herman, #8 Declaration of J. Presbrey)(McKown, Aaron)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 510 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins re: MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 16(B)(4) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #509 previously scheduled, on closed motion date, 1/27/2014 AT 10:00 AM has been rescheduled. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Motion is RE-SET for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 19, 2013 Filing 509 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit A-J ISO Aaron M. McKown's Declaration, #3 Exhibit K-U ISO Aaron M. McKown's Declaration, #4 Declaration Mike Kunkle ISO Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DOMAIN NAMES ON UNIFIED LIST by Judge Audrey B. Collins: On June 21, 2013, the Court issued an Order resolving legal questions raised by the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment and/or adjudication. See Order, docket no. 491. On August 9, 2013, pursuant to the Order and as discussed at the hearing, the parties jointly submitted a Unified List of Domain Names so that the Court may rule on whether the identified domain names are, or are not, confusingly similar to the Academy's trademarks as a matter of law. See Unified List, docket no. 507. The Unified List contains the remaining disputed domain names that the parties initially identified in their Motions and many additional domain names. The Court will rule on all domain names presented. The Court commends the parties for achieving stipulations as to a number of the domain names. After careful consideration, the Court rules as follows on the disputed domain names: (see document for further details). (bm)
August 9, 2013 Filing 507 SECOND JOINT REPORT of RE: UNIFIED LIST OF DOMAIN NAMES IN THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT ARE READY FOR THE COURT TO RULE ON THE ISSUE OF CONFUSING SIMILARITY filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
July 26, 2013 Filing 506 JOINT REPORT of RE: UNIFIED LIST OF DOMAIN NAMES IN THE PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT ARE READY FOR THE COURT TO RULE ON THE ISSUE OF CONFUSING SIMILARITY filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
July 16, 2013 Filing 505 The Court mailed back the certified copies of the trademark registrations as exhibit E to declaration of A. McKown in support of opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment lodged on 4/2/13 by A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Judge Audrey B. Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: (1) MOTION FOR ORDER CLARIFYING JUNE 21 and 24, 2013 ORDERS, and (2) RESETTING DATES by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is GoDaddy's Motion for an Order Clarifying June 21 and 24, 2013 Orders (docket no. 500) and the parties' Report (docket no. 501) proposing new pretrial and trial dates. In response to the Motion, the Court hereby clarifies that Mr. Presbrey may testify as a fact witness only, not as an expert witness. The Court also hereby SETS the following dates: 1. All Pre-Trial deadlines are continued as follows: a. Limited Fact Discovery Cut-Off, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey, is set for December 31, 2013. b. Expert Report(s) on behalf of Go Daddy, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey fact discovery, are due February 4, 2014. c. Rebuttal Expert Reports on behalf of AMPAS, deriving from or relating to Joe Presbrey fact discovery, are due March 4, 2014. d. Expert Discovery Cut-Off is set for March 25, 2014. e. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off is set for April 15, 2014. f. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for November 28, 2011, now is set for May 20, 2014. 2. The Final Pre-Trial Conference is set for July 14, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. 3. Trial is set for July 28, 2014. (bm)
July 11, 2013 Filing 503 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06/24/2013; 11:00 AM re Transcript #502 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Stride, Katherine) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2013 Filing 502 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06/24/2013; 11:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katherine M. Stride, phone number 213-894-2187. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2013. (Stride, Katherine)
July 8, 2013 Filing 501 STATUS REPORT The Parties' Three Proposed Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates (Pursuant to Court's June 24, 2013 Order, Dkt. No. 499) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
July 8, 2013 Filing 500 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Court's Orders dated June 21, 2013 [Dkt. 492] and June 24, 2013 [Dkt. 499] related to the witness status of Joe Presbrey filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Zecchini, Paula)
June 27, 2013 Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motions Hearing/Status Conference on June 24, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
June 27, 2013 Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter. Court will contact Lisa Cajigas at lcajigas@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motions Hearing/Status Conference on June 24, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Michaels, David)
June 27, 2013 Filing 496 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), #495 . The following error(s) was found: This proceeding was not electronically recorded, you must select Court Reporter option when efiling the G-120. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2013 Filing 495 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
June 24, 2013 Filing 499 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [D0CUMENT 341]; MOT IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOE PRESBREY [DOCUMENT 414]; MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [DOCUMENT 430] MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GEOFFREY NUNBERG [DOCUMENT 445]; MOT TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR CAROL A. SCOTT [DOCUMENT 447] Hearing held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Matter called. Court discuss previous orders already sent out ruling on the above motions. The Court has ordered counsel present this morning to discuss re-opening discovery and the parties to be prepared to discuss certain matters including scheduling with respect to a Court trial or jury trial and discovery of Mr. Presbrey, follow-up motions, and a list of domain names. The Court having heard from counsel, hereby ORDERS counsel to meet and confer and submit three proposed pretrial conference and trial dates presumably all in the year of 2014, for approval of the Court by no later than July 8, 2013. Court and counsel discuss further settlement. Court feels in light of the summary judgment rulings that it makes sense to renew the process. Court and counsel confer regarding deposing Mr. Presbrey. The parties ordered to meet and confer with date and location that the deposition will be taken as to Mr. Presbrey. Counsel ordered to submit a list of unified domain names for ruling due by July 26, 2013. Court and counsel discuss discovery. All issues raised at to discovery should be presented back to Magistrate Woehrle or the parties can bring before the District Judge as they may apply. The Court notes discovery is now cut-off, but extended for the limited purpose of deposing Mr. Presbrey and limited to counter designation of an expert that would have discovery or to any motions to compel that might be brought before the Magistrate Judge. The Court hereby ORDERS the discovery cut-off extended to December 31, 2013 for this new discovery. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying #488 Ex Parte Application to Supplement: DENIED. (bm)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: HEARING SET FOR MONDAY JUNE 24, 2013 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Concurrent with this minute order, the Court is issuing Orders resolving the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment/adjudication, and their motions to exclude. As such, the Court will not hear oral argument on these motions on June 24, 2013. However, the Court is keeping the hearing on calendar to discuss several issues arising out of the Motions, and about moving the case forward. These issues include the following: scheduling discovery as to Joe Presbrey and the timing of any follow-up motions; the parties' submission of a unified list of domain names that they wish the Court to rule upon; how the parties intend to handle the domain names that the Academy disclosed after September 14, 2011; the timing of settlement procedure; and setting pretrial and jury trial dates. To the extent it is feasible and convenient for the parties to meet and confer on any of these issues prior to the hearing, that would be helpful. (bm)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER RE: (1) PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF NUNBERG; (2) PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF SCOTT; and (3) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PRESBREY by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying #414 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Joe Presbrey; granting #445 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Geoffrey Nunberg; granting #447 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Professor Carol A. Scott: For the foregoing reasons, the Academy's Motions to Exclude Testimony of Geoffrey Nunberg and Carol Scott are GRANTED, and GoDaddy's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Joe Presbrey is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER RE: (1) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; and (2) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting in part and denying in part #341 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #430 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: For the foregoing reasons, the Court rules as follows: Domain names that the Academy disclosed after September 14, 2011 are not at issue. The Academy's marks are distinctive; whether the Academy's marks are famous is a triable issue of fact. GoDaddy is not entitled to 15 U.S.C. 1114(2)(D)(iii)'s safe harbor. As to whether GoDaddy's conduct constitutes "using" and "trafficking in" domain names: GoDaddy is an "Authorized Licensee" for purposes of ACPA liability. GoDaddy "uses" and "traffics in" domain names in its Parked Pages Program. The Court defers ruling on whether the accused domain names are in the Parked Pages Program. The Court defers ruling on whether the accused domain names are "confusingly similar" to the Academy's marks. GoDaddy is not liable under ACPA as a registrant ACPA's "dilutive" prong does not require actual dilution. GoDaddy's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 20, 2013 Filing 490 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement the Record in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #339 #488 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Supplement)(Zecchini, Paula)
June 20, 2013 Filing 489 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Michaels, David)
June 20, 2013 Filing 488 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement the Record in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #339 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Quinto, #2 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #3 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
June 7, 2013 Filing 487 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David L Zifkin counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Changing address to 401 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 850, Santa Monica, California 90401. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Zifkin, David)
June 7, 2013 Filing 486 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David Irving Michaels counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Changing Address and Contact Numbers to 401 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 850, Santa Monica, CA 90401. Changing Phone and Fax Numbers to Ph. 310-752-2400 Fx. 310-752-2490. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Michaels, David)
May 28, 2013 Filing 485 REPLY In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE for Evidentiary Sanctions #414 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
May 21, 2013 Filing 484 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS G, H, L, M, N, P, R, S, T, U AND V to the Declaration of Matthew Herman in Support of Opposition to MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOE PRESBERY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37(C)(1). (mat)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #482 Application to Seal: Pursuant to the Court's March 18, 2011 Order [Dkt. No. 80], the Court grants Plaintiff's Application and directs the Clerk to accept the filing under seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file the Exhibits G, H, L, M, N, P, R, S, T, U and V to the Herman Declaration ISO of the Opposition under seal is GRANTED. (bm)
May 20, 2013 Filing 482 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5-1 and General Order 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (lw)
May 20, 2013 Filing 481 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE for Evidentiary Sanctions #414 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOE PRESBREY filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Herman, #2 Exhibits A-Y)(Liang, Enoch)
May 20, 2013 Filing 480 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Exhibits to the Declaration of M. Herman in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Joes Presbrey. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Michaels, David)
May 10, 2013 Filing 479 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/30/13 11:14 A.M. re Transcript #478 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 10, 2013 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/30/13 11:14 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/31/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013. (mo)
May 1, 2013 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 30, 2013, Motion to Compel. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
May 1, 2013 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 30, 2013 Motion to Compel. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Liang, Enoch)
April 30, 2013 Filing 475 MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Admissions [Dkt. No. 404] Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Plaintiff's motion is granted in part and denied in part as follows: As discussed on the record, on or before May 14, 2013, Defendant is to serve supplemental responses to the Category One requests, including requests relating to the disputed domain names. The Court declines to order further responses to the other categories of requests which are the subject of Plaintiffs motion. #404 Court Recorder: CS04/30/2013. (gr)
April 22, 2013 Filing 473 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence as to Reply (Motion related),, #417 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-F to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence, #2 Exhibit G-H to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence, #3 Exhibit I-R to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence)(McKown, Aaron)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 472 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: In light of Defendant GoDaddy's Response to (docket no. 454) to the Court's Order to Show Cause (docket no. 451), the Court hereby DENIES GoDaddy's April 10, 2013 Application to File Under Seal (docket no. 444). GoDaddy abandoned the request to file under seal as to all exhibits except Exhibit K; however, Exhibit K is missing from the document that purports to include it (the document titled "Exhibits I-R of Declaration of McKown"), and furthermore, even if Exhibit K were included not take apart this document and file Exhibit K separately. GoDaddy must refile all of the exhibits, and if it wishes to file Exhibit K under seal, it must file a separate Application seeking to do so. re: denying #444 Application to Seal (lw)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO REPLACE DOCKET NO.373 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Plaintiff's Request to Replace Dkt. No. 373 is hereby GRANTED: 1. Docket No. 373 shall be replaced with the Public Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition, attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Request (Dkt. No. 390), #391 Request for Relief (bp)
April 18, 2013 Filing 462 Counsel notified that document is accepted. Counsel is hereby reminded that documents and docket text must match or future documents not done properly will be STRICKEN. The Court will indicate the appropriate document on docket by A. Brides, Court Clerk to Judge Audrey B. Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, Plaintiff's Application to file the Supplemental Herman Declaration ISO the Supplemental Memorandum and Exhibits Q-V thereto to under seal is GRANTED. #457 (gr)
April 17, 2013 Filing 456 RESPONSE filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #451 GoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Response to Court's Minute Order [Docket 451] (McKown, Aaron)
April 17, 2013 Filing 455 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE for Evidentiary Sanctions #414 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Motions and Related Filings: Motions in Limine> In Limine-Exclude. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
April 16, 2013 Filing 474 SEALED DOCUMENT- SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Matt Herman in Support of the Academy's Joint Stipulation Re: Motion to Compel Responses to Third Set of RFA's. (mat)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE by Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The hearing date on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Presbey shall be continued from May 6, 2013 to June 24, 2013. Plaintiff's Opposition 5/20/2013, Defendant's reply 5/27/2013. (bp)
April 16, 2013 Filing 457 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5-1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 LODGED PROPOSED ORDER) (gr)
April 16, 2013 Filing 454 SUPPLEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF #440 JOINT STIPULATION RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
April 16, 2013 Filing 452 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Supplemental Declaration of Matt Herman in Support of the Academy's Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Compel Responses to Third Set of RFAs; Exhibits Q, R,S,T,U, and V. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: GODADDY.COM'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court is inclined to deny the request to file under seal, and to instead cause the documents to be filed publicly. Before denying the Application, however, the Court will allow GoDaddy.com to better explain its position why the submitted exhibits should be filed under seal. GoDaddy.com may, of course, abandon that position. Because some of the exhibits contain material provided by the Academy, the Academy may also be heard on whether the exhibits should be filed under seal. Any response to this Order must be filed no later than Wednesday, April 17, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. In the absence of timely responses, the Court will deny the Application and cause the documents to be filed publicly. (bp)
April 15, 2013 Filing 470 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF THE ACADEMY'S (1) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT;(2) ADDITIONAL UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY MOTION;(3) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTER STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERED FACTS(mat) Modified on 4/23/2013 (mat).
April 15, 2013 Filing 469 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT K to Declaration of A. McKown in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Joe Presbrey. (mat)
April 15, 2013 Filing 468 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT K to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Defendant Go Daddy.com, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence. (mat)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The application requested the Court's permission to file portions of the Combined Response under seal because it contained information designated by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. as "Confidential" or "Confidential - Attorneys' Eyes Only"--- pursuant to the Stipulation and Protective Order entered by this Court on March 18, 2011 (Dkt. No. 80). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file its Combined Response under seal is GRANTED. re: #435 Application to Seal (lw)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDERSEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF J. PRESBREY by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GoDaddy.com's Application to file under seal Exhibit K to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in support of Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Testimony of J. Presbrey is hereby GRANTED. Re: #439 Application to Seal (lw)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH THE DECLARATION OF AARON M. MCKOWN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GO DADDY.COM, INC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS ORDERED that GoDaddy.com's Application to file under seal Exhibit K to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in support of Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence is hereby GRANTED. RE: #438 (lw)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF KELLY WILLIAM LEWIS AS COUNSEL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on the Application for Withdrawal of Kelly William Lewis as counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy, Inc., e-filed on December 3, 2012. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. The docket in this matter shall be updated accordingly to reflect that Kelly William Lewis is no longer counsel of record in this matter. RE: granting #320 Application to Withdraw (lw)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF CHRISTINE NEWMAN JONES AS COUNSEL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on the Application for Withdrawal of Christine Newman Jones as counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy, Inc., e-filed on December 3, 2012. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. The docket in this matter shall be updated accordingly to reflect Christine Newman Jones is no longer counsel of record in this matter. RE:granting #319 Application to Withdraw (lw)
April 15, 2013 Filing 450 REPLY In Support MOTION for Order for TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR CAROL A. SCOTT #447 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David I. Michaels, #2 Exhibit 1)(Michaels, David)
April 15, 2013 Filing 449 REPLY In Support MOTION for Order for TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GEOFFREY NUNBERG #445 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Michaels, David)
April 11, 2013 Filing 467 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS G, H, L, M, N, AND P to the Declaration of Matthew Herman in Support of Joint Stipulation Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Request for Admissions. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
April 11, 2013 Filing 466 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Request for Admissions. (mat)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application to file its JointStipulation and Exhibits G, H, L, M, Nand P to the Herman Declaration ISO theJoint Stipulation under seal is GRANTED. #409 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (gr)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying #393 Application to Seal ; denying #400 Application to Seal. In light of the parties's Responses (docket nos. 434, 436) to the Court's Order to Show Cause(docket no. 425), the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's April 1, 2013 Applications to File Under Seal (docket nos. 393, 400). The Clerk's Office shall cause the documents submitted with these Applications to be filed publicly. (smo)
April 11, 2013 Filing 442 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Presbrey from May 6, 2013 to June 24, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date and Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Presbrey)(Michaels, David)
April 10, 2013 Filing 444 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS DECLARATION OF AARON M. MCKOWN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GO DADDY.COM, INC.'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The parties have recently completed briefing their Motions for Summary Judgment. In light ofthe volume of papers filed, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on the Motions to Monday June 24, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The Court also CONTINUES the hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude the Testimony of Nunberg and Scott to the same day, Monday June 24, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Defendant has already filed Oppositions and Plaintiff's Replies remain due April 15, 2013. The Pretrial Conference date and the Jury Trial date are hereby VACATED. The Courtanticipates resetting the trial date, if necessary, to sometime in the late fall. (smo)
April 10, 2013 Filing 437 Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Exhibits A-R In Support of Declaration of Aaron M. McKown re Objections to Evidence. (McKown, Aaron)
April 10, 2013 Filing 436 RESPONSE filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #425 GoDaddy.Com, Inc.'s Response to Court's Minute Order [Docket 425] (McKown, Aaron)
April 10, 2013 Filing 434 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciencesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #425 Academy's Response to Court's Minute Order Docket No. 425 (Michaels, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 439 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION TO EXCLUDE TESMONY OF J. PRESBREY filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (bp)
April 9, 2013 Filing 438 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION OF AARON M. MCKOWN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GO DADDY.COM, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (bp)
April 9, 2013 Filing 435 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
April 9, 2013 Filing 428 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. correcting Reply (Motion related), #410 Correcting Exhibit 7 to 410-2, David Michaels' Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Errata)(Michaels, David)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ACADEMY'S APPLICATION TO FILE MOTIONS UNDER SEAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court therefore ORDERS Academy to respond to this Order by showing the portions of the Notices of Motion and Motions (for the Numberg Motion and the Scott Motion) that is claims are confidential and eligible to be filed under seal. Because Academy states that material in the Numberg Motion was designated "confidential" by Defendant GoDaddy.com, GoDaddy.com must respond with respect to the Numberg Motion. The parties' responses to this OSC must be filed no later than Wednesday, April 10, 2013. In the absence of timely responses, the Court will deny the applications as to these documents and cause them to be filed publicly. (bp)
April 9, 2013 Filing 424 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Exhibits In Support of Aaron M. McKown's Declaration re Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence. (McKown, Aaron)
April 9, 2013 Filing 423 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #413 served on 04/09/2013. (Michaels, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 422 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed GoDaddy.com, Inc. (McKown, Aaron)
April 9, 2013 Filing 421 OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 9, 2013 Filing 420 OPPOSITION to Motion to Exclude Carol A. Scott filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO of Opposition to Motion to Exclude Carol A. Scott, #2 Exhibit ISO Declaration of Aaron M. McKown re Opposition to Motion to Exclude Carol A. Scott)(McKown, Aaron)
April 8, 2013 Filing 441 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS G, J, K, and L to Declaration of A. McKown in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL in Connection with Its Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Audrey B. Collins: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GoDaddy.com's Application to file under seal Exhibits G, J, K, and L to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in support of Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED re: #397 Application to Seal (lw)
April 8, 2013 Filing 419 REPLY In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 8, 2013 Filing 418 REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
April 8, 2013 Filing 417 REPLY Objections to AMPAS' Evidence MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Liang, #2 Declaration Herman, #3 Declaration Lastowka, #4 Declaration Presbrey, #5 Declaration Quinto, #6 Declaration Michaels, #7 Declaration Miller, #8 Declaration Aaron M. McKown, #9 Exhibit A-B, #10 Exhibit C-F, #11 Exhibit G-H, #12 Exhibit I-R)(McKown, Aaron)
April 8, 2013 Filing 416 OPPOSITION In Response to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of G. Nunberg filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Aaron M. McKown ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude G. Nunberg, #2 Exhibit ISO Aaron M. McKown's Declaration re Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude G. Nunberg)(McKown, Aaron)
April 8, 2013 Filing 415 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Exhibits to Declaration of Aaron M. McKown ISO Motion to Exclude Testimony of J. Presbrey. (McKown, Aaron)
April 8, 2013 Filing 414 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Aaron M. McKown, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C-F, #4 Exhibit G-H, #5 Exhibit I-R)(McKown, Aaron) Modified on 4/18/2013 (ab).***DOCUMENT TRUE CAPTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOE PRESBERY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37(C)(1)***
April 8, 2013 Filing 413 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's combined Response to #382 Defendant's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Defendant's Counter-Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Plaintiff's Additional Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Plaintiff's MPSJ Reply. (Liang, Enoch)
April 8, 2013 Filing 412 OPPOSITION to #382 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
April 8, 2013 Filing 411 REPLY to #382 Response to Defendants Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Defendant's Counter-Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Plaintiff's Additional Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Plaintiff's MPSJ Reply [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
April 8, 2013 Filing 410 REPLY in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Michaels ISO Reply, #2 Exhibits 1-11 to Supplemental Declaration of David Michaels)(Liang, Enoch)
April 4, 2013 Filing 427 CD-ROM OF EXHIBIT 3 to the Declaration of Joe Presbrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Lodged by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. RE: as to Declaration (Motion related), #377 . (lw)
April 4, 2013 Filing 409 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5-1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (gr)
April 4, 2013 Filing 405 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Compel; Exhibits G,H,L,M,N, and P to Herman Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
April 4, 2013 Filing 404 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Admissions of GoDaddy.com, Inc. Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Admissions [Public Redacted Version] filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 4/30/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Herman in Support of Joint Stipulation and Public Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Aaron McKown in Opposition to Joint Stipulation, #3 Declaration of Paul Nicks in Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Liang, Enoch)
April 4, 2013 Filing 403 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of CD-ROM of Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Joe Presbrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 377). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
April 4, 2013 Filing 402 NOTICE OF LODGING filed April 4, 2013 (Lodgment of Supplemental Registrar's Certificate re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #158 (McKown, Aaron)
April 3, 2013 Filing 399 DECLARATION of Carol Scott re Memorandum in Support of Motion #349 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
April 3, 2013 Filing 398 DECLARATION of Carol Scott re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #381 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 408 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David I. Michaels in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment. Vol 1. Declaration of Exhibits 1-24. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
April 2, 2013 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S (1) STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and (2) Counter-Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
April 2, 2013 Filing 406 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Greg Lastowka in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #396 Application to Seal. (bm)
April 2, 2013 Filing 397 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS Under Seal In Connection With Its Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. (bm)
April 2, 2013 Filing 392 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Nunberg re Memorandum in Support of Motion #349 for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 391 REQUEST for Relief re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #373 Unopposed Request to Replace Docket No. 373 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted Opposition), #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
April 2, 2013 Filing 390 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Nunberg re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #381 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 389 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re: Certified Copies of Trademark Registrations attached as Exhibit E to Declaration of A. McKown re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #381 (McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 388 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #385 , Declaration (Motion related) #384 , Response in Opposition to Motion #382 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #383 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #381 served on April 1, 2013. (McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 387 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #385 , Declaration (Motion related) #384 , Response in Opposition to Motion #382 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #383 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #381 served on April 1, 2013. (McKown, Aaron)
April 2, 2013 Filing 386 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits #379 , #380 , Statement #382 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Title page is missing.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Statement. Other error(s) with document(s): Statement should be linked back to opposition. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 448 DECLARATION of DAVID I. MICHAELS AND EXHIBITS 1-6 IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Order for TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR CAROL A. SCOTT #447 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (bp)
April 1, 2013 Filing 447 NOTICE OF MOTION AND TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR CAROL A. SCOTT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
April 1, 2013 Filing 446 DECLARATION of Enoch Liang in support of MOTION for Order for TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GEOFFREY NUNBERG #445 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (bp)
April 1, 2013 Filing 445 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GEOFFREY NUNBERG filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
April 1, 2013 Filing 400 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 396 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Documents Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5.1 And General Order 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 395 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, re APPLICATION to Seal #393 By United States mail served on 4/1/13. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 394 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, re APPLICATION to Seal #393 by Messenger Service served on 4/1/13. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 393 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION To File Documents Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5.1 And General Order 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
April 1, 2013 Filing 385 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Exhibits. (McKown, Aaron)
April 1, 2013 Filing 384 DECLARATION of Paul Nicks in Opposition to APPLICATION to Seal #362 re AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 1, 2013 Filing 383 OBJECTION Objections to Evidence in Support of re: APPLICATION to Seal #362 Re AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 1, 2013 Filing 382 OPPOSITION to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
April 1, 2013 Filing 381 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit E-G to Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit H to Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit I to Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit J-Q to Declaration of A. McKown in Opposition to AMPAS' Motion for Summary Judgment)(McKown, Aaron)
April 1, 2013 Filing 380 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Exhibit 2 part 9 of 13 to the DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. HERMAN in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Declaration (Motion related),, #378 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 part 10 of 13, #2 Exhibit 2 part 11 of 13, #3 Exhibit 2 part 12 of 13, #4 Exhibit 2 part 13 of 13, #5 Exhibits 3-8 to the Herman Declaration)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 379 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Exhibit 2 part 5 of 13 to the DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. HERMAN in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Declaration (Motion related),, #378 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 part 6 of 13, #2 Exhibit 2 part 7 of 13, #3 Exhibit 2 part 8 of 13)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 378 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Herman in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Herman in Support of #373 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 part 1 of 13, #3 Exhibit 2 part 2 of 13, #4 Exhibit 2 part 3 of 13, #5 Exhibit 2 part 4 of 13)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 377 DECLARATION of Joe Presbrey in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 DECLARATION of Joe Presbrey in Support of #373 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 part 5, #6 Exhibit 1 part 6, #7 Exhibits 2-8)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 376 DECLARATION of Enoch Liang in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 DECLARATION of Enoch Liang in Support of #373 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-49)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 375 DECLARATION of David Quinto in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 DECLARATION of David Quinto in Support of #373 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s 1-23, #2 Exhibit s 24-41, #3 Exhibit s 42-57)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 374 DECLARATION of Scott Miller in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 DECLARATION of Scott Miller in Support of #373 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 373 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch) (Main Document 373 replaced on 4/19/2013) (bp).
April 1, 2013 Filing 372 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #369 Served via Messenger Service served on April 1, 2013. (Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 371 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re: [Document 370] NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting documents. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting documents. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Notice of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Geoffrey Nunberg. (Liang, Enoch)
April 1, 2013 Filing 368 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Professor Carol A. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Michaels, David)
March 19, 2013 Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A, C, J, L, N and V to Declaration of A. McKown in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #365 Application to Seal (bp)
March 19, 2013 Filing 361 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Notice (Other) #353 , Declaration (Motion related) #352 served on March 15, 2013. (McKown, Aaron)
March 19, 2013 Filing 359 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related) #345 , Declaration (Motion related),,,,,, #344 , Declaration (Motion related) #342 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #349 , Declaration (Motion related),,,,,,,,,, #343 , Declaration (Motion related), #347 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 , Declaration (Motion related) #346 , Statement (Motion related) #348 served on March 14, 2013. (McKown, Aaron)
March 18, 2013 Filing 433 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. (mat)
March 18, 2013 Filing 432 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Michaels in Support of Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
March 18, 2013 Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS 1-23 in Support of Declaration of David I. Michaels in Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9)(mat)
March 18, 2013 Filing 430 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
March 18, 2013 Filing 429 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS 24-28 in Support of Declaration of David I. Michaels in Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #362 Application to Seal (bp)
March 18, 2013 Filing 358 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Audrey B. Collins The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by March 20, 2013. RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #355 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, #354 (bp)
March 18, 2013 Filing 357 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Audrey B. Collins The document is accepted as filed.. The noticed date of the motion hearing, 4/22/13, was previously ordered by the court, 12/7/2012, Doc. #322 RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 (bp)
March 18, 2013 Filing 356 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #355 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, #354 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
March 15, 2013 Filing 364 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUGMENT filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
March 15, 2013 Filing 360 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DOMAIN NAMES IN DISPUTES by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation for Order #340 . Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences, by and through its counsel of record, hereby requests dismissal of the following domain names at issue in this action with prejudice: DEMOSCARS.COM, OSCARMOVIESPOSTERS.COM, JAYLENOSCARS.NET, JAYLENOSCARS.COM, DOSCARLOS.COM, COSCARAUDIOSALES.COM, and UNCLELEOSCARSHOP.COM. Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., by and through its counsel of record, hereby stipulates to Plaintiff's request. The undersigned parties each agree that they shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs with respect to these domain names. (bp)
March 15, 2013 Filing 355 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN] OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Notice (Other) #353 , Declaration (Motion related) #352 served on March 15, 2013. (McKown, Aaron) Modified on 3/19/2013 (bp).
March 15, 2013 Filing 354 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN] OF SERVICE filed by defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related) #345 , Declaration (Motion related),,,,,, #344 , Declaration (Motion related) #342 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #349 , Declaration (Motion related),,,,,,,,,, #343 , Declaration (Motion related), #347 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 , Declaration (Motion related) #346 , Statement (Motion related) #348 served on March 14, 2013. (McKown, Aaron) Modified on 3/19/2013 (bp).
March 15, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE of Errata re: Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 15, 2013 Filing 352 DECLARATION of Oscar Gonzalez In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 15, 2013 Filing 351 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion for Summary Judgment #341 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for a hearing date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 14, 2013 Filing 365 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 and General Order 10-07. (mat)
March 14, 2013 Filing 362 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 filed by Plaintiffs Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
March 14, 2013 Filing 350 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed GoDaddy.com, Inc. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 349 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 348 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 347 DECLARATION of Aaron M. McKown In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-L, #3 Exhibit M-N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P1, #6 Exhibit P2, #7 Exhibit Q-W)(McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 346 DECLARATION of Paul Nicks In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 345 DECLARATION of Linda Jett In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 344 DECLARATION of Ron Roberts In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Kremke In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Yuan He In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Valerie Krise In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Evgeny Belyakov In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Declaration of Mark Kleinfeld In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #6 Declaration of Oscar Setiawan In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #7 Declaration of Monique Birault In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #8 Declaration of Oscar Betancur In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #9 Declaration of Beth Parker-Humphrey In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #10 Declaration of Oscar Sagastume In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #11 Declaration of Oscar Moskaluk In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment)(McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 343 DECLARATION of Frank Riedel in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Altnerative Partial Summary Judgment, #6 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #7 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #8 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #9 Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #10 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #11 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #12 Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #13 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #14 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #15 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #16 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #17 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #18 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #19 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #20 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #21 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #22 Declaration In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment)(McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 342 DECLARATION of Remy Mattei In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment #341 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 341 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment)(McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 340 STIPULATION for Order Dismissal of Certain Domain Names in Dispute filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron)
March 14, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under SealMotion and Motion Partial for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Michaels, David)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: denying #334 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Excess Pages (bp)
March 13, 2013 Filing 337 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion for Summary Judgment #334 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Brief In Excess of 25 Pages)(McKown, Aaron)
March 13, 2013 Filing 336 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Ex Parte Application #334 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Ex Parte Application. A stand-alone proposed order can be submitted by e-filing a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 13, 2013 Filing 335 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion for Summary Judgment #334 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
March 12, 2013 Filing 334 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Application for an Extension for its Motion for Summary Judgment)(McKown, Aaron)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Order and to Compel Production of Aggregate Financial Data for Years 2011 and 2012 [Dkt. No. 326] by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is denied. The motion to compel is granted in part in that. Defendant is to provide figures for aggregate banner ad revenue for 2011 and 2012. No further supplemental production of aggregate financial data is warranted at this stage of the litigation. #326 (gr)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Parties are notified that the hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for sanctions and to compel production, scheduled for March 5, 2013 is rescheduled and now set to take place on Wednesday, March 6, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. (dt)
February 19, 2013 Filing 330 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION to Compel Production of Aggregate Financial Data for Years 2011 and 2012 #326 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF AGGREGATE FINANCIAL DATA FOR YEARS 2011 AND 2012 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #2 Exhibit K-N to Declaration of Enoch H. Liang)(Liang, Enoch)
February 15, 2013 Filing 331 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS C, D, E, F and I to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Support of the Plaintiff's Joint Stipulation Re: (1) FOR SANCTIONS FOR GODADDYS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS SEPTEMBER 13, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER; AND (2) TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF AGGREGATE FINANCIAL DATA FOR YEARS 2011 AND 2012 (mat)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. On February 12, 2013, Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts & Sciences filed an Application to File Documents Under Seal ISO the Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions and to Compel. The application requested the Court's pennission to file Exhibits C, D, E, F and I to the Liang Declaration ISO of the Joint Stipulation Under Seal because it contained information designated by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. as "Confidential"-pursuant to the Stipulation and Protective Order entered by this Court on March 18,2011 [Dkt. No. 80]. #327 #328 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (gr)
February 12, 2013 Filing 328 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5-1 AND GENERAL ORDER 10-07 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. #327 (gr)
February 12, 2013 Filing 327 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of (1) Application to File Under Seal; (2) Proposed Order; (3) Exhibits C,D,E,F, and I to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Support of Plaintiff's Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Compel Production of Aggregate Financial Data for Years 2011 and 2012. (Liang, Enoch)
February 12, 2013 Filing 326 APPLICATION to Compel Production of Aggregate Financial Data for Years 2011 and 2012 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Application set for hearing on 3/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 The Academy's Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Liang, Enoch)
February 5, 2013 Filing 325 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Matthew J Herman counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Changing Firm Name to Foote, Mielke, Chavez & O'Neil LLC. Changing Email to mjh@fmcolaw.com. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Herman, Matthew)
February 5, 2013 Filing 324 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robert M Foote counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Changing Firm Name to Foote, Mielke, Chavez & O'Neil LLC. Changing E-Mail to rmf@fmcolaw.com. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Foote, Robert)
January 29, 2013 Filing 323 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Domains By Proxy, Inc. filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #321 Motion for Discovery: The Court has read and considered the Joint Motion to Continue Certain Pretrial Deadlines as well as the case file in this action. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. The following pretrial deadlines are continued for a minimum of thirty (30) days, as follows: a. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on December 13, 2012, are now due on January 14, 2013. b. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on January 10, 2013, are now due on February 11, 2013. c. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for January 31, 2013, is now set for March 4, 2013. d. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for February 7, 2013, is now set for March 14, 2013. e. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for March 18, 2013, is now set for April 22, 2013. 2. The Final Pretrial Conference shall remain set for May 6, 2013. 3. The Trial shall remain set for May 21, 2013. (bm)
December 7, 2012 Filing 321 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Discovery regarding Continue Expert Deadlines filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
December 3, 2012 Filing 320 APPLICATION to Withdraw Kelly William Lewis as Counsel filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
December 3, 2012 Filing 319 APPLICATION to Withdraw Christine Newman Jones as Counsel filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
October 26, 2012 Filing 318 STIPULATION for Order re Deposition of Plaintiff Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron)
October 26, 2012 Filing 317 STIPULATION for Order re Authenticity of Certain Documents filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron)
October 24, 2012 Filing 316 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #315 by Clerk of Court Other: Document is hereby STRICKEN; counsel to e-file document properly; document and docket text must match. RE: Stipulation regarding Authenticity of Certain Docs #314 . (bm)
October 17, 2012 Filing 315 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Certain Docs #314 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Stipulations-Order. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 16, 2012 Filing 314 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Deposition of Bob Parson filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron) DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 10/24/12, DOCUMENT #316 . Modified on 10/25/2012 (bm).
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, having read and considered the Joint Motion to Continue Trial and certain pretrial and trial deadlines #312 . Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. The following pretrial and trial deadlines are continued for a minimum of forty-five (45) days, as follows: a. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on October 29, 2012, are now due on December 13, 2012. b. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on November 26, 2012, are now due on January 10, 2013.c. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for December 17, 2012, is now set for January 31, 2013. d. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for December 17, 2012, is now set for February 7, 2013. e. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for January 29, 2013, is now set for March 18, 2013. 2. The Final Pretrial Conference, previously set for March 18, 2013, is now set for May 6, 2013. 3. The Trial, previously set for April 2, 2013, is now set for May 21, 2013. (ir)
October 8, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue Trial from April 2, 2013 to May 21, 2013 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Continue, #2 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Certain Deadlines)(McKown, Aaron)
September 26, 2012 Filing 311 NOTICE OF PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF CERTAIN DEPOSITION TOPICS SET FORTH IN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE A WITNESS TO TESTIFY AS TO CERTAIN RULE 30(B)(6) TOPICS re Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6)Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6) #298 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Hearing Re: Joint Stipulation previously set for September 26, 2012 is continued and now set for 9/27/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (dt)
September 18, 2012 Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings September 10, 2012 to September 10, 2012 as to plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Vanessa Le at vle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 10, 2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Michaels, David)
September 18, 2012 Filing 308 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #307 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect reporter, please select COURT SMART. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2012 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings September 10, 2012 to September 10, 2012 as to plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Reporter Margaret Babykin. Court will contact Vanessa Le at vle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 10, 2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Michaels, David)
September 18, 2012 Filing 306 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/10/12 10:14 a.m. re Transcript #305 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2012 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/10/12 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012. (ha)
September 14, 2012 Filing 304 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc., re Reply (Motion related) #303 in support of Joint Stipulation to Compel served on 9-14-2012. (McKown, Aaron)
September 14, 2012 Filing 303 REPLY in support of Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6)Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6) #298 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
September 13, 2012 Filing 302 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #274 , as to defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 10, 2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
September 13, 2012 Filing 301 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #300 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect reporter. Please select Court Smart. Per minute order, hearing was a digital proceeding. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2012 Filing 300 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings September 10, 2012 to September 10, 2012 as to defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter Kathryn Stride. Court will contact Laura Juarez at ljuarez@wrennbender.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 10, 2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
September 11, 2012 Filing 299 DECLARATION of Enoch Liang in relation to Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6)Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6) #298 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
September 11, 2012 Filing 298 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6) filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #2 Exhibit A-H to Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(McKown, Aaron)
September 10, 2012 Filing 297 MINUTES OF Hearing re: Supplemental Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Protective Order re Deposition of Bob Parsons [Dkt. No. 281] held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Court hears further argument re Defendants motion for protective order. The matter is submitted for decision. Court Recorder: CS09/10/2012. (gr)
September 10, 2012 Filing 296 DECLARATION of Aaron M. McKown re Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #274 Motion for Protective Order to Prevent Apex Depo of Bob Parsons filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit C-4, #7 Exhibit C-5, #8 Exhibit C-6, #9 Exhibit C-7, #10 Exhibit C-8, #11 Exhibit C-9, #12 Certificate of Service)(McKown, Aaron)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER FOR STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO COMPEL AMPAS '30(b)(6) WITNESS (ES) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Portion of Joint Stipulation shall be due to Defendants nolater than Tuesday, September 11, 2012 by 3:00 p.m.; 2. The deadline for Defendants to File the Joint Stipulation shall be no later than Tuesday, September 11, 2012 by 11:59 p.m.; 3. Reply Briefs (if any) shall be due no later than Friday, September 14 by 5:00 p.m.; 4. The Stipulation shall be heard on Wednesday, September 26, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. #288 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (gr)
September 6, 2012 Filing 288 Joint STIPULATION to Compel Deposition of AMPAS 30(b)(6) filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition)(McKown, Aaron)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR FURTHER HEARING ON GODADDY.COM'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF BOB PARSONS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's Request for Further Hearing is granted, and the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Godaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons is scheduled for September 10, 2012 at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 640 of the United States District Court for the Central District of California, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles. #281 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
August 27, 2012 Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT- SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Enoch Liang Re: Supplemental Statement after Deposition of Christine Jones. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8)(mat)
August 27, 2012 Filing 293 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION to Seal File Certain Deposition Transcripts and Supplemental Statement after Deposition of Christine Jones Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7)(mat)
August 27, 2012 Filing 292 SEALED DOCUMENT- SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Godaddy.com,Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of CEO Bob Parsons of Godaddy.com. (mat)
August 27, 2012 Filing 291 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Godaddy.com, Inc.'s Supplemental Statement re: Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
August 27, 2012 Filing 290 SEALED DOCUMENT- GODADDY.COM, INC.'s Supplemental Statement in Support of its Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Bob Parsons. (mat)
August 27, 2012 Filing 289 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY in Further Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Godaddy.com, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Bob Parsons, Former CEO of Godaddy.com. (mat)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE CERTAIN DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file the Deposition Transcript of Christine Jones, Deposition Transcript of Barbara Rechterman, and the Supplemental Statement after Deposition of Christine Jones under seal is hereby GRANTED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER ON STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENTS RELATED TO THE DEPOSITION OF BOB PARSON by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Go Daddy will file its Supplemental Statement, not to exceed 10 pages, by August 17, 2012, and the Academy will file its Rebuttal Statement, not to exceed three (3) pages, by August 21, 2012. #273 (gr) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE REPLY ISO by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to file its Reply iso Plaintiff's Opposition to GoDaddy.com, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order re Bob Parsons Deposition under seal is hereby GRANTED. #282 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER AUTHORIZING GODADDY.COM, INC. TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GoDaddy.com's Application to file under seal an unredacted version of the Supplemental Statement, Exhibits 1 through 6 to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in support of GoDaddy.com's Motion for Protective Order is hereby GRANTED. #276 (gr) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
August 23, 2012 Filing 281 REQUEST for Hearing, re MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 , filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(McKown, Aaron)
August 23, 2012 Filing 280 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. correcting Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #278 (Michaels, David)
August 22, 2012 Filing 282 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE ITS REPLY ISO; PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO GODADDY.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE BOB PARSONS UNDER SEAL filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. #80 #277 (gr)
August 22, 2012 Filing 279 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Application to File Under Seal; Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to GoDaddys Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Bob Parsons; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Michaels, David)
August 21, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Reply iso Opposition to Protective Order re Bob Parsons Deposition. (Liang, Enoch)
August 21, 2012 Filing 277 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 Reply iso Opposition filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
August 20, 2012 Filing 276 APPLICATION to Seal Documents in connection with its supplemental statement in support of motion for protective order, filed by defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (dt)
August 17, 2012 Filing 275 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order; Supplemental Statement in support of Motion for Protective Order; Declaration of A. McKown with Exhibits. (McKown, Aaron)
August 17, 2012 Filing 274 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown in support of Supplemental Statement in Support of Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 1-6 (Redacted - filed under seal), #3 Proof of Service)(McKown, Aaron)
August 15, 2012 Filing 273 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
August 14, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Liang, Enoch)
August 14, 2012 Filing 271 Supplemental Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Liang, Enoch)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court has read and considered the Joint Motion to continue trial and certain pretrial dates and trial deadlines #269 . The Court orders as follows: 1. The following pretrial and trial deadlines are continued for a minimum of fourty-five (45) days, as follows: a. The Motions and Claims Cut-Off, previously July 16, 2012, is now set for September 4, 2012.b. The Fact Discovery Cut-Off, previously August 9, 2012, is now set for September 27, 2012. c. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on September 10, are now due on October 29, 2012. d. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on October 8, 2012, are now due on November 26, 2012. e. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for October 22, 2012, is now set for December 10, 2012. f. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for J October 29, 2012, is now set for December 17, 2012. g. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for December 3, 2012, is now set for JANUARY 29, 2013 2. The Final Pretrial Conference, previously set for January 28, 2013, is now set for March 18, 2013.3. The Trial, previously set for February 12, 2013, is now set APRIL 2, 2013. ALL TRIALS ARE SCHEDULED ON TUESDAYS. (ir)
July 17, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Trial Deadlines from 02/12/2013 to 04/01/2013 filed by DEFENDANTS Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 MOTION, #2 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
May 21, 2012 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings April 10, 2012 to April 10, 2012 as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Vanessa Le at vle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Proceedings on April 10, 2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Michaels, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 267 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4-10-12 10:07 a.m. (ha)
May 21, 2012 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4-10-12 10:07 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2012. (ha)
May 21, 2012 Filing 265 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Paula L Zecchini counsel for Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Changing address to 2 Park Plaza, Suite 550, Irvine, CA 92614. Changing e-mail to pzecchini@wrennbender.com. Adding Paula L. Zecchini as attorney as counsel of record for GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. (Zecchini, Paula)
May 21, 2012 Filing 264 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aaron M McKown counsel for Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Changing address to 2 Park Plaza, Suite 550, Irvine, CA 92614. Changing e-mail to amckown@wrennbender.com. Adding Aaron M. McKown as attorney as counsel of record for GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. (McKown, Aaron)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #255 Bryan Cave's Ex Parte Application To Withdraw As Counsel And To Substitute New Counsel For Defendants: The Court has read and considered Bryan Cave, LLP's ex parte application to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domain By Proxy, Inc., as well as the case file in this action. Having read and considered the application and all papers submitted by the parties in support thereof and in opposition thereto, and good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that: 1. Bryan Cave, LLP's request that it be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. is GRANTED. 2. Aaron M. McKown and Paula L. Zecchini of the law firm Wrenn Bender McKown & Ring LLLP shall become counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. effective May 1, 2012. (bm)
May 1, 2012 Filing 262 REPLY to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel and to Substitute New Counsel Effective May 11, 2012 #255 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Zifkin, David)
April 27, 2012 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings April 10, 2012 to April 10, 2012 as to Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Gloria L. Gomez at gloria.gomez@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 10, 2012. Category: 14 Day. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McKown, Aaron)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING APRIL 26 ORDER AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #258 Request for Extension of Time to File: On April 25, 2012, Defendants filed an Ex Parte Application for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel and Substitute New Counsel. On April 26, the Court granted the Application as unopposed. However, after the Court signed Defendants' Order granting their Application but before that Order was docketed, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application seeking additional time to consider whether its needs to respond to Defendants' Application. Plaintiff filed its Application very shortly after the 24 hour opposition deadline has passed. The Court finds that it is appropriate that Plaintiff should have additional time to consider responding to Defendants' Application. The Court therefore VACATES its April 26 Order and GRANTS Plaintiff until May 1, 2012 to respond to Defendants' Application. (bm)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: It is hereby ordered that:1. Bryan Cave, LLP's request that it be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. is GRANTED. 2. Aaron M. McKown and Paula L. Zecchini of the law firm Wrenn Bender McKown & Ring LLLP shall become counsel of record for Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. effective May1, 2012. RE: granting #255 Ex Parte Application for Leave (lw) ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/27/12, DOCUMENT #260 Modified on 4/27/2012 (bm).
April 26, 2012 Filing 258 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Bryan Cave's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel and to Substitute New Counsel (Dkt. No. 255) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
April 26, 2012 Filing 257 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel and to Substitute New Counsel Effective May 11, 2012 #255 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
April 25, 2012 Filing 256 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Ex Parte Application for Leave to Withdraw #255 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Ex Parte Application. Forms for this are also located on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Proposed order can be e-filed using a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 25, 2012 Filing 255 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel and to Substitute New Counsel Effective May 11, 2012 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #2 Declaration of Paula L. Zecchini)(McKown, Aaron)
April 19, 2012 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #254 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect reporter. Please select COURT SMART. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2012 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings April 10, 2012 to April 10, 2012 as to Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter Margaret Babykin. Court will contact Gloria L. Gomez at gloria.gomez@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 10, 2012. Category: 14 Day. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Zecchini, Paula)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, having considered the Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Certain Pretrial and Trial Deadlines #249 . The following pretrial and trial deadlines are continued for a minimum of ninety (90) days, as follows: a. The Motions and Claims Cut-Off, previously April 16, 2012,is now set for July 16, 2012. b. The Fact Discovery Cut-Off, previously May 10, 2012, is now set for August 9, 2012. c. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on June 11, 2012, are now due on September 10, 2012. d. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on July 9, 2012, are now due on October 8, 2012. e. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for July 23, 2012, is now set for October 22, 2012. f. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for July 30, 2012, is now set for October 29, 2012. g. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for August 27, 2012, is now set for December 3, 2012. 2. The Final Pretrial Conference, previously set for October 22, 2012, is now set for January 28, 2013. 3. The Trial, previously set for November 5, 2012, is now set for February 12, 2013. (ir)
April 11, 2012 Filing 249 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Certain Pretrial and Trial Deadlines filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Certain PreTrial and Trial Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Certain Pretrial and Trial Deadlines)(McKown, Aaron)
April 10, 2012 Filing 248 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, For the reasons discussed on the record, Defendants motion to compel is denied in light of Defendants failure to establish substantial need for the production of materials protected as attorney work product. This order is without prejudice to the courts consideration of a renewed application for the production of limited data regarding the number and dates of impressions made by Plaintiffs litigation consultant; counsel are directed to meet and confer further regarding the availability of such data and any alternatives to such a production. #241 Motion to Compel; Court Recorder: CS 4-10-12. (lmh)
March 30, 2012 Filing 252 EXHIBIT J to the Declaration Aaron M. McKown in Support of Defendant Godaddy.Com. Inc.'s Joint Stipulation Re: Motion to Compel Further Production Documents. (mat)
March 30, 2012 Filing 251 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS 28 and 30. Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Opposition to Defendant Godaddy.Com. Inc.'s Joint Stipulation to Compel Responsive Documents. (mat)
March 30, 2012 Filing 250 JOINT STIPULATION Re: Defendant Godaddy.Com's MOTION to Compel Further Production of Responsive Documents. (mat)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: granting #244 Application to Seal. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
March 29, 2012 Filing 246 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION to Compel Further Production of Responsive Documents #241 Objections to Defendant's Reply [Docket 245] filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Michaels, David)
March 27, 2012 Filing 245 REPLY in support MOTION to Compel Further Production of Responsive Documents #241 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Nicks)(Zecchini, Paula)
March 21, 2012 Filing 244 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in connection with its Motion to Compel further Production of Responsive Documents filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
March 20, 2012 Filing 243 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Application to File Documents Under Seal; Proposed Order; Joint Stipulation re Defendant GoDaddy.com's Motion to Compel Further Production; Exhibit J to McKown Decl; Exhibits 28 and 30 to Liang Decl. (McKown, Aaron)
March 20, 2012 Filing 242 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Further Production of Responsive Documents #241 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #2 Exhibit A-E to McKown Decl, #3 Exhibit F-J to McKown Decl, #4 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #5 Exhibit A-C; 28 and 30, #6 Declaration of Matt Herman)(McKown, Aaron)
March 20, 2012 Filing 241 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Production of Responsive Documents filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (McKown, Aaron)
March 19, 2012 Filing 239 Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application to Enforce, #232 filed by Defendant Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
March 13, 2012 Filing 240 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S Opposition, Exhibits E-G to the Declaration of David I. Michaels in Support of Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 and General Order 10-07. (mat)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal in connection with Parties Joint Report Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from GoDaddy's Executive Management Team. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised on the premises whereby Plaintiff seeks to file under seal the following documents: 1. Exhibits E-G in Support of the Declaration of David I. Michaels. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. #237 Application to Seal (lmh)
March 12, 2012 Filing 237 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Exhibits E-G in Support of the Declaration of David I. Michaels filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
March 12, 2012 Filing 236 STATUS REPORT Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery From GoDaddys Executive Management Team filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Michaels, #2 Exhibit A-D In Support of Declaration of D. Michaels, #3 Exhibit E-G In Support of Declaration of D. Michaels, #4 Declaration of P. Zecchini, #5 Declaration A. McKown and Exhibits A-H)(Michaels, David)
March 12, 2012 Filing 235 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Exhibits E-G In Support of the Declaration of David I. Michaels, Application to Seal Exhibits, and Proposed Order.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Michaels, David)
February 17, 2012 Filing 234 Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application to Enforce, #233 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
February 16, 2012 Filing 233 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Compliance with Court's January 17, 2012 Order on GoDaddy.com's Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron McKown, #2 Exhibit A to McKown Decl, #3 Exhibit B-G to McKown Decl, #4 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
February 16, 2012 Filing 232 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Compliance with Court's January 17, 2012 Order on GoDaddy.com's Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron McKown, #2 Exhibit A to McKown Decl, #3 Exhibit B-G to McKown Decl)(McKown, Aaron)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, The court has reviewed the joint report submitted by the parties as directed at the January 17, 2012 hearing on Defendants motion to compel. It is ordered that: (1) the ESI search need not include Accounting Department custodians; (2) the search is to include the term (TRADEMARK! or MARK or MARKS & DILUT!); and (3) the search is to include the term LICENS!, modified with one or more additional terms focused on on-line uses, for example & (ON-LINE or INTERNET or WEBSITE). re: Status Report #230 . (lmh)
February 1, 2012 Filing 230 STATUS REPORT Re Search Terms and Custodians for Search of Plaintiff's ESI Pursuant to January 17, 2012 Hearing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
January 26, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/17/12 9:54 am (ml)
January 26, 2012 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/17/12 9:54am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2012. (ml)
January 20, 2012 Filing 224 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings January 17, 2012 to January 17, 2012 as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Vanessa Le at vle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Proceedings on January 17, 2012. Category: Daily. (Michaels, David)
January 18, 2012 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings January 17, 2012 to January 17, 2012 as to Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Gloria L. Gomez at gloria.gomez@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: January 17, 2012. Category: Expedited. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 17, 2012 Filing 219 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, (1) Defendants motion to compel production is granted as follows: Plaintiff is to produce media buy plans for the years 2007 to 2010 (Request No. 7); produce Yahoo contracts for on-line marketing, and meet and confer regarding production of a reasonable sample of backup documentation for the summary accounting produced as AMPAS 004554 (Request No. 47); produce the expert report and declarations filed by defendants on the issue of genericness in the Associazione Italiana case (Request No. 17); and produce all license agreements for the marks at issue, as well as any related correspondence regarding permissible on-line uses of the marks, for two of the years at issue (Request No. 5). In addition, Plaintiff is to conduct a further search for responsive electronically stored information. Counsel are to meet and confer regarding the search terms and custodians to be covered and are to provide a joint report to the court within two weeks. The request for imaging of Plaintiffs computer systems is denied. (2) Defendants motion for protective order is granted in part. No deposition of Mr. Parsons is to proceed prior to the currently scheduled depositions of GoDaddys other employees - particularly Ms. Jones. Within one week following those depositions, counsel may file supplemental briefs regarding the protective order motion; the court will schedule a further hearing or issue a further ruling at that time. #180 Motion for Protective Order; #167 Motion to Compel. Court Recorder: CS 1-17-12. (lmh)
January 13, 2012 Filing 227 SEALED DOCUMENT- Godaddy.com.Inc.'s Exhibits I, J, K, L, P, and U to Joint Stipulation Re: Defendant Godaddy.com, Inc.'s MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and to Image Plaintiff's Computer System. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
January 13, 2012 Filing 226 SEALED DOCUMENT- GODADDY.COM, INC.'S EXHIBITS R, S, T, U, V, W, X, Y, Z, AA and BB to Defendant Godaddy.com, Inc.'s Reply in Support of MOTION for Protective Order to Prevent Apex Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
January 13, 2012 Filing 225 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Godaddy.Com, Inc.'s Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order. (mat)
January 13, 2012 Filing 223 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS 1 and 2 in Support of PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Documents Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5.1 And General Order 10-07. (mat)
January 13, 2012 Filing 222 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 15 and 25-31 to the Declaration of Enoch Liang in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Godaddy.Com, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Bob Parsons, CEO of Godaddy.Com. (mat)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Application to file Exhibits I, J, K, L, P and U under seal is hereby GRANTED. #190 Application to Seal (lmh)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Application to file and unredacted version of its Reply Memorandum and Exhibits R, S, T, U, V, W, X, Y, Z, AA and BB under seal is hereby GRANTED. #209 Application to Seal (lmh)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on Plaintiff the Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Plaintiff) request that the Court replace Docket Nos. 193 and 193-2, Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com, Inc.s (Defendant) CEO, Bob Parsons (the Opposition), and Exhibits 4-9 and 13- 14 to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in support of the Opposition, with redacted versions attached to the Request as Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2, respectively. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised on the premises whereby Plaintiff seeks to replace the following documents with redacted versions: 1. Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Defendants CEO, Bob Parsons; and 2. Exhibits 4-9 and 13-14 of the Declaration of Enoch Liang In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Defendants CEO, Bob Parsons. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Request is GRANTED. #199 Request for Relief (lmh)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on Plaintiff the Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Plaintiff) Application to File Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com, Inc.s (Defendant) CEO, Bob Parsons, filed on December 27, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised on the premises whereby Plaintiff seeks to file under seal the following documents: 1. Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Defendants CEO, Bob Parsons; and 2. Exhibits 4-9 and 13-14 of the Declaration of Enoch Liang In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Defendants CEO, Bob Parsons. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. #208 Application to Seal (lmh)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #210 Motion to Continue: The Court has read and considered the Joint Motion to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines as well as the case file in this action. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. The following Pre-Trial deadlines are continued as follows: a. The Motions and Claims Cut-Off, previously January 16, 2012, now is set for April 16, 2012. b. The Fact Discovery Cut-Off, previously February 9, 2012, now is set for May 10, 2012. c. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on March 12, 2012, now are due June 11, 2012. d. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on April 9, 2012, now are due on July 9, 2012. e. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for April 23, 2012, now is set for July 23, 2012. f. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for April 30, 2012, now is set for July 30, 2012. g. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for May 28, 2012, now is set for August 27, 2012. 2. The Final Pre-Trial Conference, previously set for July 23, 2012, now is set for October 22, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. 3. Trial, previously set for August 7, 2012, now is set for November 5, 2012. (bm)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: granting #197 Application to Seal. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
January 12, 2012 Filing 213 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Joint Motion, #211 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): No hearing date indicated on attached document as specified in docket entry text. Incorrect time for motion hearing indicated in docket entry text. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 10, 2012 Filing 211 NOTICE OF MOTION re Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines from January 16, 2012 to April 16, 2012 #210 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (McKown, Aaron)
January 10, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines from January 16, 2012 to April 16, 2012 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines)(McKown, Aaron)
January 6, 2012 Filing 207 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/13/11 9:58 a.m. (mo)
January 6, 2012 Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/13/11 9:58 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2012. (mo)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Parties are notified that the hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel production of responsive documents and to image plaintiffs computer system, scheduled for January 10, 2012, is continued and now scheduled for hearing along with Defendants Motion for Protective Order on Tuesday, January 17, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. (dt)
January 4, 2012 Filing 209 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Under Seal In Connection With Defendant Godaddy.com, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion For Protective Order To Prevent APEX Deposition Of Godaddy.com's CEO Bob Parsons filed by defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
January 4, 2012 Filing 208 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5.1 And General Order 10-07 filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
January 4, 2012 NOTICE TO FILER OF RESCHEDULING DATES Re: Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #198 . The following date(s) has been rescheduled: Daily Transcript Order due by 1/5/2012. (mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 4, 2012 Filing 204 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of 1. Plaintiff's Application to Seal; 2. [Proposed] Order Re: Application to Seal 3. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com's, CEO Bob Parsons; and 4. Exhibits 4-9, and 13-14 of the Declaration of Enoch Liang In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Michaels, David)
January 4, 2012 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Aaron McKown in Support MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 4, 2012 Filing 202 Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence Filed in Opposition to re: MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 3, 2012 Filing 201 REPLY in Support MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 3, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 3, 2012 Filing 199 REQUEST for Relief re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #193 Plaintiff's Request to Replace Dkt Nos. 193 and 193-2 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Michaels, David)
December 30, 2011 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings December 13, 2011 to December 13, 2011 re: Motion to Compel, #167 , as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Vanessa Le at vle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Proceedings. Category: Daily. (Michaels, David)
December 28, 2011 Filing 196 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint Stipulation re: GoDaddy.com's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Image Plaintiff's Computer System filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
December 27, 2011 Filing 197 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Its Opposition to Godaddy.com Inc's Motion for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
December 27, 2011 Filing 195 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, re Notice of Under Seal Filing #194 served on 12-27-2011. (Liang, Enoch)
December 27, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
December 27, 2011 Filing 193 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons #180 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Enoch Liang In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Enoch Liang)(Liang, Enoch) (Main Document 193 replaced on 1/26/2012) (lmh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/26/2012) (lmh).
December 27, 2011 Filing 192 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Notice of Manual Filing. (Liang, Enoch)
December 21, 2011 Filing 190 GODADDY.COM, INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Documents Under Seal In Connection With The Joint Stipulation Re: Defendant Godaddy.com, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Production Of Responsive Documents And To Image Plaintiff's Computer System filed by defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged prop ord. (bm)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Application to file Exhibits A, M, N AND O under seal is hereby GRANTED. #182 Application to Seal (lmh)
December 21, 2011 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #188 . The following error(s) was found: Other Form AO435 Transcript Order Form must be amended to address the Incorrect reporter selected. Please select Courtsmart for digitally recorded proceedings. Transcript deadline terminated. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. (mw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2011 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings December 13, 2011 to December 13, 2011 re: Motion to Compel, #167 , as to Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Reporter Margaret Babykin. Court will contact Elaine Hellwig at elaine.hellwig@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Proceedings. Category: Expedited. (Zecchini, Paula)
December 20, 2011 Filing 187 DECLARATION of Enoch H. Liang re Stipulation to Compel, #184 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Opposition to Joint Stipulation to Compel Production filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibits C - I, #4 Exhibits J - P, #5 Exhibits Q - W)(Liang, Enoch)
December 20, 2011 Filing 186 DECLARATION of Scott Miller re Stipulation to Compel, #184 Declaration of Scott Miller in Opposition to Joint Stipulation to Compel Production filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
December 20, 2011 Filing 185 DECLARATION of David Quinto re Stipulation to Compel, #184 Declaration of David Quinto in Opposition to Joint Stipulation to Compel Production filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
December 20, 2011 Filing 184 Joint STIPULATION to Compel Production of Responsive Documents, etc. filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, etc., #2 Exhibit A - F of Declaration of AMM, etc., #3 Exhibit of Declartion of AMM, etc., #4 Exhibit of Declaration of AMM, etc.)(McKown, Aaron)
December 20, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. of 1) Unopposed Application to File Docs Under Seal in Connection with the Joint Stip; 2) Seal Exhibits and 3) [PROPOSED] Order. (McKown, Aaron)
December 15, 2011 Filing 191 SEALED DOCUMENT- Godaddy.Com, Inc.'s Exhibits A, M, N, and O to the Declaration of Aaron M. Mckown filed in Support of the Motion for Protective the Deposition of Godaddy.Com Ceo Bob Parsons. (mat)
December 15, 2011 Filing 182 GODADDY.COM INC.'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION To File Under Seal In Connection With Its Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Godaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons filed by defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
December 14, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Zecchini, Paula)
December 14, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for to Prevent the Deposition of GoDaddy.com CEO Bob Parsons filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/17/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Aaron McKown and supporting exhibits)(Zecchini, Paula)
December 13, 2011 Filing 212 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Plaintiffs motion to compel is granted in part. By December 30, 2011, Defendant GoDaddy is to request and confirm that each of the five executive management team members search their personal computers for documents responsive to Requests for Production Nos. 52 and 53. The motion to compel a further search of electronically-stored information is otherwise denied without prejudice. #167 Motion to Compel; Court Recorder: CS 12-13-11. (lmh)
November 29, 2011 Filing 177 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team #167 filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. McKown, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of A. McKown)(Zecchini, Paula)
November 29, 2011 Filing 176 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team #167 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
November 22, 2011 Filing 175 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Defendants motion is granted in part and denied in part. In light of the representation that unredacted billing records have been produced by Plaintiff, no further production of pre- or post-filing communications with Quinn, Emanuel is required. Within thirty days, Plaintiff is to provide supplemental responses to the following contention interrogatories: Nos. 14, 15, 16, 19, 20, 22 and 23. #146 Motion to Compel; Court Recorder: CS 11-22-11. (lmh)
November 21, 2011 Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT- Godaddy.Com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy Inc.'s Exhibits R-U to Joint Stipulation to Compel Discovery From Godaddy.Com's Executive Management Team. (mat)
November 21, 2011 Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A and O in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 and General Order 10-07. (mat)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Application to file Exhibits R through U under seal is hereby GRANTED. #172 Application to Seal (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh) (Main Document 174 replaced on 7/22/2013) (gk).
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, This cause comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from GoDaddy's Executive Management Team, filed on November 18, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised on the premises whereby Plaintiff seeks to file under seal the following documents: 1. Exhibit A to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from GoDaddy's Executive Management Team; and 2. Exhibit O to the Declaration of Enoch H. Liang in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from GoDaddy's Executive Management Team. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. #171 Application for Leave (lmh)
November 21, 2011 Filing 172 APPLICATION Unopposed to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Joint Stipulation to Compel Discovery from GoDaddy.com's Executive Management Team filed by Defendant Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. (lmh)
November 21, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal; Exhibits R-U to the Declaration of Aaron McKown in Connection with Joint Stipulation; Proposed Order. (Zecchini, Paula)
November 18, 2011 Filing 171 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File documents under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1 and General Order 10-07 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
November 18, 2011 Filing 168 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team #167 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Liang In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team, #2 Exhibit A - G In Support of Declaration of E. Liang, #3 Exhibit H - S In Support of Declaration of E. Liang, #4 Declaration of A. McKown In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team, #5 Exhibit A - D In Support of Declaration of A. McKown, #6 Exhibit E - M In Support of Declaration of A. McKown, #7 Exhibit N - U In Support of Declaration of A. McKown)(Zifkin, David) (Attachment 7 replaced on 11/21/2011) (lmh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2011: #8 Exhibit R - U In Support of Declaration of A. McKown) (lmh).
November 18, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery From GoDaddy's Executive Management Team filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Zifkin, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal; Exhibit A and O in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zifkin, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 165 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc..(McKown, Aaron)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The hearing on the Joint Stipulation on Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and Further Responses to Interrogatories shall be continued from November 8, 2011 to November 22, 2011. re Stipulation for Order, #163 (lmh)
November 4, 2011 Filing 163 Joint STIPULATION for Order Continue hearing on Joint Stipulation Re Defendants Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Joint Stipulation Re Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and Further Responses to Interrogatories)(Zecchini, Paula)
November 4, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 09/13/11 10:31am (ml)
November 4, 2011 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 09/13/11 10:31am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. (ml)
November 2, 2011 Notice of Electronic Filing re Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) #160 , Notice of Filing Redacted Transcript (G-46) #162 , Transcript (CV), Transcript (CV), Transcript (CV) #161 , Stipulation for Order, #163 e-mailed to jriley@bsfllp.com bounced due to unknown address. The primary and all other e-mail addressed associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Attorney no longer with firm. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. (Wilson, Tammie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 2, 2011 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 9/13/2011 to 9/13/11 as to Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Order for: GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Hearing. Category: Daily. Daily Transcript Order due by 11/4/2011. (McKown, Aaron)
October 27, 2011 Filing 170 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants BDS, Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., Greendomainmarket.com, The GoDaddy Group Inc., XPDreamTeam LLC amending First Amended Complaint #58 ,filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(ir)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Counsel are notified that Defendants Motion to Compel hearing set for Tuesday, November 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m is continued to Tuesday, November 8, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (lmh)
October 27, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Zifkin, David)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that the hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel, scheduled for October 25, 2011, is continued and now set to take place on Tuesday, November 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (lmh)
October 12, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notices of Change of Attorney Information #153 , #154 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 11, 2011 Filing 155 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and Further Responses to Interrogatories #146 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
October 10, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE Change of Attorney Information filed by Attorney for ACADEMY OF MOTION PICTURE ARTS AND SCIENCES Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Michaels, David)
October 10, 2011 Filing 153 NOTICE Change of Attorney Information filed by Attorney for ACADEMY OF MOTION PICTURE ARTS Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Zifkin, David)
September 29, 2011 Filing 152 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Aaron M. McKown Re: Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of David W. Quinto Under Seal. (mat)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, This Cause come before the COurt on Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of David W. Quinto Under Seal ("Motion"), filed September 27, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. #149 Application to Seal (lmh)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #145 Motion: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court has read and considered the Joint Motion to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines as well as the case file in this action. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. The following Pre-Trial deadlines are continued as follows: a. The Motions and Claims Cut-Off, previously October 17, 2011, now is set for January 16, 2012. b. The Fact Discovery Cut-Off, previously November 10, 2011, now is set for February 9, 2012. c. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on December 13, 2011, now are due March 12, 2012. d. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on January 9, 2012, now are due on April 9, 2012. e. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for January 23, 2012, now is set for April 23, 2012. f. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for January 31, 2012, now is set for April 30, 2012. g. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for February 28, 2012, now is set for COURT HOLIDAY, NEW DATE June 4, 2012 at 10:00 A.M. 2. The Final Pre-Trial Conference, previously set for April 23, 2012, now is set for July 23, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. 3. Trial, previously set for May 7, 2012, now is set for August 6, 7, 2012. TRIALS ARE ON TUESDAYS. (bm)
September 27, 2011 Filing 149 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of David W. Quinto Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
September 26, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Exhibits. (Liang, Enoch)
September 26, 2011 Filing 147 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and Further Responses to Interrogatories #146 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown, #2 Exhibit A-K to McKown Decl, #3 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang, #4 Exhibit A-C to Liang Decl, #5 Declaration of David Quinto, #6 Declaration of Scott Miller)(McKown, Aaron)
September 26, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Documents and Further Responses to Interrogatories filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (McKown, Aaron)
September 21, 2011 Filing 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Continue, #2 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, GRANTING IN PART MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) #108 .**SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: granting in part and denying in part #81 Motion to Compel. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
September 13, 2011 Filing 142 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: It is Ordered that the production may exclude the industry review and weekly recap categories; the false positive and random topic categories are to be produced. Production is to be completed within fourteen daysCourt Recorder: CS 9-13-11. (dt)
September 13, 2011 Filing 141 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/2/11 10:48AM (mw)
September 13, 2011 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/2/2011 10:48AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Dorothy Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (mw)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #102 Motion to Amend The Complaint: The Court finds the Motion appropriate for resolution without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing set for September 12, 2011. For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 1, 2011 Filing 139 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions.(mat)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED, Exhibits A and B to the Supplemental Memorandum shall be sealed. #135 Application to Seal (lmh)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #132 Application to Withdraw as Attorney: THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on the Application to Withdraw as Counsel, submitted by Joshua Riley, counsel of record for Plaintiff, filed August 29, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. The docket in this matter shall be updated accordingly to reflect that Joshua Riley no longer is counsel of record in this matter. (bm)
August 30, 2011 Filing 135 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-taking of Iowa Depositions filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
August 30, 2011 Filing 134 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) #108 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
August 30, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Exhibits A & B to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions. (Liang, Enoch)
August 29, 2011 Filing 132 APPLICATION of JOSHUA RILEY to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riley, Joshua)
August 29, 2011 Filing 131 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) #108 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Riley, Joshua)
August 29, 2011 Filing 130 REPLY in Support of MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT #102 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riley, Joshua)
August 23, 2011 Filing 129 SEALED DOCUMENT- Godaddy. Com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy Inc.'s Exhibits 3-5 to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint. (mat)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AUTHORIZING FILING OF EXHIBITS 3-5 To Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Amend First Amended Complaint Under Seal by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #127 Application for Leave. (bm)
August 22, 2011 Filing 127 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to file documents under seal in connection with Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to Amend First Amended complaint filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Lodged Order. (ir)
August 22, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. correcting Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #124 (McKown, Aaron)
August 22, 2011 Filing 125 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT #102 Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. McKown in Support of Defendant GoDaddy.Com, Inc.'s Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint)(Zecchini, Paula)
August 22, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. of Unopposed Application; [Proposed] Order and Exhibits 3-5 in Support of our Opposition to Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint. (Zecchini, Paula)
August 9, 2011 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joshua Riley in Connection with Plaintiff's Rule 30(d)(2) MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10)(mat)
August 9, 2011 Filing 122 SEALED DOCUMENT- Godaddy.Com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy Inc.'s Exhibits to the Joint Status Report Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Emails. (mat)
August 9, 2011 Filing 121 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION Re: Plaintiff's Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised on the premises whereby Plaintiff seeks to file under seal the following documents: 1. Unredacted version of the Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiff's Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions and 2. Exhibits A, B, C and D to the Declaration of Joshua Riley in Connection with Plaintiff's Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. #108 Motion to Compel (lmh)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, On August 8, 2011, Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. ("Defedants") filed an Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal in connection with the Joint Status Report Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Emails ("Joint Status Report"). The Application requested the Court's permission to file Exhibits 1 through 4 to the Joint Status Report under seal pursuant to the Stipulation and Protective Order entered by this Court on March 18, 2011 (Dkt. No. 80). Pursuant to the Court's Order on March 18, 2011 (Dkt. No. 80), the Court GRANTS Defedant's Unopposed Application to file Exhibits 1 through 4 to the Joint Status Report under seal and directs the Clerk to accept the filing under seal. #112 Application to Seal #118 Application to Seal (lmh) Modified on 9/2/2011 (lmh). Modified on 9/15/2011 (lmh).
August 9, 2011 Filing 118 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal re: Joint Statement (Motion related) #117 and Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Emails #99 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
August 8, 2011 Filing 117 JOINT STATEMENT of Further Negotiations on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responsive Emails MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Emails #99 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Riley, Joshua)
August 8, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc. of 1)Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc.'s Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal In Connectin with Joint Status Report; 2) Exhibits 1,2,3 and 4 to Joint Status Report; and 3) [PROPOSED] Order. (Zecchini, Paula)
August 2, 2011 Filing 115 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Case called. Counsel enter their appearances. Court and Counsel confer regarding ESI documents. Court orders Counsel to meet and confer. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Responsive Emails is GRANTED IN PART. Parties are to file Joint Status Report by Monday, August 8, 2011. #99 Motion to Compel; Court Recorder: CS 8-2-11. (lmh)
July 28, 2011 Filing 114 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. (mat)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint, #111 by Judge Audrey B. Collins: This Cause comes before the Court on Plaintiff's to Amend the Complaint filed July 27, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. IT IS HEREBY BY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Application is GRANTED. (lw)
July 28, 2011 Filing 112 APPLICATION to Seal an unredacted version of the Joint Stipulation and Exhibits A through D to the Declaration of Joshua Riley filed by Plaintiffs Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Lodged Proposed Order) (lmh)
July 28, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Joint Stipulation re Plaintiff's Rule 30(d)(2) Motion to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions and Exhibits A - D to Decl. of Joshua Riley in Support. (Liang, Enoch)
July 28, 2011 Filing 109 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) #108 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Declaration of Defendant's Counsel, #20 Exhibit R & S)(Riley, Joshua)
July 28, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Re-Taking of Iowa Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Riley, Joshua)
July 27, 2011 Filing 111 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in Connection With Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Lodged order. (lw)
July 27, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Liang, Enoch)
July 27, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Liang, Enoch)
July 27, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #103 , Notice of Manual Filing #104 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Lodging should have been e-filed with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed Second Amended Complaint #103 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Notices- Manual Filing (G-92) #104 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 26, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Documents in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (Riley, Joshua)
July 26, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT #102 (Riley, Joshua)
July 26, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Riley, #2 Exhibit A (under seal), #3 Exhibit B (under seal), #4 Exhibit C (under seal), #5 Exhibit D (under seal), #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Riley, Joshua)
July 19, 2011 Filing 101 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Emails #99 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Riley, Joshua)
June 22, 2011 Filing 100 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Emails #99 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Riley (Plaintiff's Attorney), #2 Exhibit A to Riley Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Riley Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Riley Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Riley Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Riley Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Riley Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Riley Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Riley Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Riley Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Riley Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Riley Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Riley Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Riley Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Riley Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Riley Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Riley Decl., #18 Exhibit Q to Riley Decl., #19 Exhibit R to Riley Decl., #20 Exhibit S to Riley Decl., #21 Exhibit T to Riley Decl., #22 Exhibit U to Riley Decl., #23 Declaration of Aaron McKown (Defendants' Attorney), #24 Exhibit 1 to McKown Decl., #25 Exhibit 2 to McKown Decl., #26 Exhibit 3 to McKown Decl., #27 Exhibit 4 to McKown Decl., #28 Exhibit 5 to McKown Decl., #29 Exhibit 6 to McKown Decl., #30 Exhibit 7 to McKown Decl., #31 Exhibit 8 to McKown Decl., #32 Exhibit 9 to McKown Decl., #33 Exhibit 10 to McKown Decl., #34 Exhibit 11 to McKown Decl., #35 Exhibit 12 to McKown Decl.)(Riley, Joshua)
June 22, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Emails filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 8/2/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Riley, Joshua)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE: ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE (In Chambers): A status conference is currently set for June 20, 2011. The Court has reviewed the parties Joint Status Report and finds that a conference will not be necessary. The Court therefore VACATES the status conference set for June 20, 2011 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
June 16, 2011 Filing 97 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Amendment to Status Report #96 (Liang, Enoch)
June 15, 2011 Filing 96 STATUS REPORT Jointly Submitted by the Parties filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE ALL PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #93 Motion to Continue: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court has read and considered the Joint Motion to Continue All Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines as well as the case file in this action. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. All Pre-Trial deadlines are continued as follows: a. Disclosure of the infringing domains, previously due on June 14, 2011, is now due on September 14, 2011. b. The Motions and Claims Cut-Off, previously July 15, 2011, now is set for October 17, 2011. c. The Fact Discovery Cut-Off, previously August 10, 2011, now is set for November 10, 2011. d. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on September 13, 2011, now are due December 13, 2011. e. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on October 7, 2011, now are due on January 9, 2012. f. Expert Discovery Cut-Off, previously set for October 21, 2011, now is set for January 23, 2012. g. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off, previously set for October 31, 2011, now is set for January 31, 2012. h. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, previously set for November 28, 2011, now is set for Monday, February 27, 2012. 2. The Final Pre-Trial Conference, previously set for January 23, 2012, now is set for April 23, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. 3. Trial, previously set for February 7, 2012, now is set for Tuesday, May 8, 2012. (bm)
June 8, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Continue #93 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Motions to continue deadlines are not noticed for court hearing, but ruled on by submission. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 7, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue All Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines filed by All Parties Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Riley, Joshua)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-15, the hearing on Plaintiff's motion to compel, scheduled for Tuesday,May 10,2011 at 10:00 a.m., is ordered off-calendar,and the motion is taken under submission for decision without oral argument. (dt)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Parties are notified that Plaintiff's motion to compel scheduled for hearing on May 3, 2011 is continued and now set for May 10, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (dt)
April 25, 2011 Filing 91 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Aggregate Financial Data and Wipo Documents. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, THIS CAUSE comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal ("Motion"), filed April 19, 2011. The Court has reviewed the file and is fully advised in the premises. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. #88 Motion to Seal Document (lmh)
April 20, 2011 Filing 88 MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits A and C filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (lmh)
April 19, 2011 Filing 87 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF AGGREGATE FINANCIAL DATA AND WIPO DOCUMENTS #81 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Riley, Joshua)
April 19, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences of Documents in Connection with Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel. (Riley, Joshua)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins re Joint Motion to Continue Trial and AllPretrial Dates and Trial Deadlines #84 . Good cause appearing The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled. All pretrial and trial deadlines are continued for a minimum of sixty (60) days, as follows: Motions and Claims Cut-off date is continued from 5/16/2011 to 7/15/2011. Initial Expert Reports, previously due on 7/11/2011, are now due on 9/13/2011. Rebuttal Expert Reports, previously due on 8/8/2011, are now due on 10/7/2001. Expert Discovery Cut-off was previously set for 8/22/2011, is now set for 10/21/2011. Dispositive Motion Cut-off was previously set for 8/29/2011, is now set for 10/31/2011. Dispositive Motion Hearing Date was previously set for 9/26/2011, is now set for 11/28/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference, currently set for 11/21/2011, is vacated and Rescheduled fro 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM. The Trial, currently set for 12/6/2011, is vacated and rescheduled fro 2/7/2012 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
April 11, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Continue Trial from December 6, 2011 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Continue Trial and All Pretrial and Trial Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Continue Trial and All Pretrial and Trial Deadlines)(Zecchini, Paula)
March 31, 2011 Filing 83 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS - ORDER by Clerk of Court, By A. Bridges, CRD to Judge Audrey B. Collins: Court notes the notice of correction was e-filed 3/31/11, reflecting correction of document entry #81 hearing to be held before Magistrate Judge Woehrle; Court will correct entry to reflect hearing to be held before the Magistrate. RE: Notice of MOTION to Compel Production of etc. #81 (lw)
March 31, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE of Correction to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Riley, Joshua)
March 30, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF AGGREGATE FINANCIAL DATA AND WIPO DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Riley, Joshua) *** TEXT MODIFIED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 3-31-2011, DOC #83 *** Modified on 4/7/2011 (lw).
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, This Protective Order shall protect against the disclosure of such confidential and private information that should not be publicly available and shall govern any designated record or information produced in this action, including all designated motions and other papers submitted to the Court, all designated deposition testimony, all designated testimony, interrogatory answers, documents and other discovery materials, whether produced informally or in response to interrogatories, requests for admissions, requests for production of documents, subpoenas, or other formal method of discovery. re Notice (Other) #79 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
March 8, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. JOINT NOTICE OF PROPOSED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order)(Riley, Joshua)
March 7, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Greendomainmarket.com. (Riley, Joshua)
February 24, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #76 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
February 24, 2011 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant XPDreamTeam LLC served on 1/4/2011, answer due 1/25/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon T. Huguet, Chief Technical Officer of XPDREAMTEAM, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint (Liang, Enoch)
February 22, 2011 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon T. Huguet, Chief Technical Officer of XPDREAMTEAM LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Liang, Enoch)
January 11, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to First Amended Complaint #73 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Initial Pleadings and Service-Answers to Complaints. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 10, 2011 Filing 73 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #58 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
January 5, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #71 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect judge indicated in caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 4, 2011 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant XPDreamTeam LLC served on 6/3/2010, answer due 6/24/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon T. Huguet, Chief Technical Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Liang, Enoch)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, GRANTING First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #69 . The deadline for GODADDY.COM, INC. and DOMAINS BYPROXY, INC. to file their respective answers in the above-captioned action shall be extended by twelve (12) days to January 10, 2011. (shb)
December 17, 2010 Filing 69 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Domains By Proxy, Inc. answer now due 1/10/2011; The GoDaddy Group Inc. answer now due 1/10/2011; GoDaddy.com, Inc. answer now due 1/10/2011, filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc.; The GoDaddy Group Inc.; GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to Pltf's FAC)(Zecchini, Paula)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended complaint, or in the alternative, motion to strike #61 is DENIED. (ir)
December 7, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Greendomainmarket.com, XPDreamTeam LLC #63 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as One Request can be filed for both defendants, or separate requests for each defendant, but should not be filed as attachments to each other. Proofs of Service on both Requests were not previously filed with the court and should not be attached as exhibits to the Requests. They should be filed as separate, stand-alone documents. No proofs of service on file for First Amended Complaint for both defendants, which supersedes the original complaint X Service against defendant greendomainmarket.com is on a John Doe. There is no physical description or title given, or that persons capacity to accept service of process. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (bm)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting #64 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua Riley on behalf of Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, designating Enoch H. Liang as local counsel. (lt)
December 6, 2010 Filing 65 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #61 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
December 3, 2010 Filing 64 APPLICATION for attorney Joshua Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application for Joshua Riley)(Liang, Enoch)
December 3, 2010 Filing 63 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Greendomainmarket.com, XPDreamTeam LLC filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang ISO Request for Default against Greendomainmarket.com, #2 Request to Enter Default agaisnt XPDreamteam LLC, #3 Declaration of Enoch H. Liang ISO Request for Default against XPDreamteam LLC, #4 Proof of Service)(Liang, Enoch)
November 19, 2010 Filing 62 OPPOSITION to re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #61 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
November 6, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Zecchini, Paula)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule by Judge Audrey B. Collins: On October 25, 2010, the parties filed a joint stipulation to extend the time to respond to the First Amended Complaint and set a briefing schedule on Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains by Proxy, Inc.s contemplated motion to dismiss. The Court GRANTS an extension until November 5, 2010 for Defendants to respond to the First Amended Complaint. However, the parties' proposed briefing schedule does not comply with the Local Rules, which require any opposition to be filed no later than twenty-one days before the hearing date and require any reply brief to be filed no later than fourteen days before the hearing date. Local Rule 7-9, 7-10. Therefore, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on any contemplated motion to dismiss: Defendants must file any motion to dismiss no later than Friday, November 5, 2010. Plaintiff must file any opposition no later than Friday, November 19, 2010. Defendants may file a reply no later than Friday, December 3, 2010. The hearing in this matter is set for Monday, December 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (bm)
October 25, 2010 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 5, 2010 re Amended Complaint, #58 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
October 12, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, #58 as to Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (bm)
October 12, 2010 Filing 58 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., Greendomainmarket.com, The GoDaddy Group Inc., XPDreamTeam LLC amending Complaint #1 , filed by plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Summons on First Amended Complaint)(bm)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, the above matter is set for trial before the Honorable Audrey B. Collins, Courtroom 680, Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (PLEASE REVIEW THIS DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. Conference to be completed no later than 45 days before the Final Pretrial date. (ir)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTES: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Motions and Claims Cut-Off: May 16, 2011; Fact Discovery and Discovery Experts Cut-Off: June 13, 2011; Initial Expert Reports Due: July 11, 2011, rebuttal August 8, 2011, expert discovery August 22, 2011; Dispositive Motion Cut-Off: August 29, 2011; Motion Hearing Date: September 26, 2011 at 10:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: November 21, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., trial counsel to be present. Jury Trial: December 6, 2011 at 8:30 a.m., estimated 5 days. Counsel are reminded of requirements of Local Rule 16-14. The Court approves Rule 16-14(3), ordered to a private mediator. Settlement to be completed 45 days before the pretrial conference. Order/Referral to ADRprogram singed in open Court. Court and counsel confer regarding identification of domains. The Court having heard from counsel, allows plaintiff 60 days before the discovery cut-off to identify any additional domain names. Counsel to meet and confer regarding any disputed names. Court and counsel discuss number of depositions to be taken by both sides. Counsel are hereby allowed to take 20 fact depositions for both sides. Counsel ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Monday, June 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Joint report to be e-filed by counsel by no later than June 15, 2011. Counsel must adhere to the rules and regulations of the Court delivering courtesy copies by 12:00 noon the next business day after e-filing, if courtesy copies are not received counsel will be sanctioned by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
September 30, 2010 Filing 54 Joint Rule 26(f) Report REPORT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON UNOPPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT REPORT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #52 Ex Parte Application: Having read and considered the Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadline to File Joint Report submitted by Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc. and Domains By Proxy, Inc. on September 28, 2010, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The deadline for the parties to file their Joint Report pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is extended from September 28, 2010 to September 30, 2010. (bm)
September 28, 2010 Filing 52 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paula L. Zecchini in Support of Unopposed ExParte Application to Extend Deadline to File Joint Report, #2 Proposed Order on Unopposed ExParte Application to Extend Deadline to File Joint Report)(Zecchini, Paula)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' GODADDY.COM, INC. AND DOMAINS BY PROXY, INC.'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying #35 Motion to Dismiss Case: Defendants' motion for a more definite statement is DENIED. Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and the Academy's claims under the UCL and for unjust enrichment, conversion and conspiracy are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court GRANTS the Academy LEAVE TO AMEND, but any amended complaint must be filed within 20 days of the filing of this Order. Failure to file a timely amended complaint will result in dismissal of the UCL, unjust enrichment, conversion, and conspiracy claims with prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins taking under submission #35 Motion to Dismiss Case: Pending before the Court is Defendants GoDaddy.com and Domains by Proxy, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, filed on July 14, 2010. (Docket No. 35.) The Court finds this matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument and VACATES the Monday, September 20, 2010 hearing date. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. The Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. (bm)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 16 and 26; AND LOCAL RULE 26; MOTIONS & EX PARTE APPLICATIONS; EFILING - MANDATORY CHAMBERS PAPER COPIES by Judge Audrey B. Collins: This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on October 5, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed not later than one week before the scheduling conference. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 6, 2010 Filing 48 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Case , or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement #35 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Zecchini, Paula)
August 24, 2010 Filing 47 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case , or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement #35 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT BDS ONLY by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #45 : Based on the stipulation of Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences and Defendant BDS, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Complaint in this above-captioned matter is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant BDS only. (bm)
August 9, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to BDS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine Newman Jones on behalf of Defendants The GoDaddy Group Inc; GoDaddy.com Inc and Domains By Proxy Inc, designating Aaron M McKown as local counsel #42 GRANTED. (ir)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #40 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelly William Lewis on behalf of Defendant, Domains by Proxy, Inc, designating Aaron M KcKown as local counsel. (shb)
July 28, 2010 Filing 42 APPLICATION for attorney Christine Newman Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKown, Aaron)
July 28, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Kelly William Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) #40 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document (Order) was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect Judges' initials appear in case number. Correct initials are ABC-CW. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (vh)
July 27, 2010 Filing 40 APPLICATION for attorney Kelly William Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT THE GODADDY GROUP INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation #36 : Having found good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1) Defendant The GoDaddy Group Inc. will be dismissed from all counts in this matter, without prejudice; 2) The Acadamy shall be entitled to leave to amend its claim against Defendant The GoDaddy Group Inc. if facts implicating Defendant The GoDaddy Group Inc.'s liability come out during the course of discovery; 3) Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be heard pursuant to the following briefing schedule: - The Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be due on July 14, 2010; - The Academy's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be due August 24, 2010; - The Defendants' reply brief shall be due September 6, 2010; - The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be set for September 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m in Courtroom 680 of the above entitled court. (bm)
July 16, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #37 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Attached document (Notice of Registrar's Certificate) should be a separate, additional attachment to the Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 15, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE OF LODGING filed July 15, 2010 (Lodgment of Registrar's Certificate) re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 (McKown, Aaron)
July 15, 2010 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The GoDaddy Group Inc. filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Enoch)
July 14, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (McKown, Aaron)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court has read and considered the Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint jointly filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences and Defendants GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc., and Domains By Proxy Inc., as well as the case file in this action. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders as follows: 1. The deadline for GODADDY.COM, INC. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action shall be further extended by seven (7) days to July 14, 2010. 2. The deadline for THE GODADDY GROUP INC. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action shall be further extended by seven (7) days to July 14, 2010. 3. The deadline for DOMAINS BY PROXY, INC. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action shall be further extended by seven (7) days to July 14, 2010. (bm)
July 9, 2010 Filing 33 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 14, 2010 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #29 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Aaron M McKown for Domains By Proxy, Inc.,Aaron M McKown for GoDaddy.com, Inc.,Aaron M McKown for The GoDaddy Group Inc.. Attorney John Lawrence Slafsky terminated (shb)
June 30, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Substitute #29 , Stipulation for Extension #30 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect judge's initials indicated in captions of attached documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 29, 2010 Filing 30 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/07/2010 filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc..(Zecchini, Paula)
June 29, 2010 Filing 29 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Aaron M. McKown; Paula L. Zecchini in place of attorney John L. Slafsky filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
June 4, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Stipulation #26 , Certification of Interested Parties #27 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect judge's initials are indicated in the caption of attached documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 3, 2010 Filing 27 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., The GoDaddy Group Inc., (Slafsky, John)
June 3, 2010 Filing 26 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Domains By Proxy, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2010; The GoDaddy Group Inc. answer now due 6/30/2010; GoDaddy.com, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2010, filed by Defendants Domains By Proxy, Inc.; The GoDaddy Group Inc.; GoDaddy.com, Inc..(Slafsky, John)
June 2, 2010 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for attorney Robert M. Foote to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983353 paid.) APPLICATION for attorney Robert M. Foote to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983353 paid.) #11 Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
June 2, 2010 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for attorney Matthew J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983487 paid.) APPLICATION for attorney Matthew J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983487 paid.) #13 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
June 2, 2010 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen C. Chavez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983447 paid.) APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen C. Chavez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983447 paid.) #12 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Liang, Enoch)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stuart H Singer on behalf of Plaintiff, Academy of Motion Picture Arts & Sciences, designating Enoch H Liang as local counsel. (shb)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES: (In Chambers): CASE TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE COLLINS: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Audrey B. Collins, Chief United States District Judge. Please substitute the initials ABC in place of the initials DSF. The case number will now read: CV 10-3738-ABC (CWx). Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials ABC be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Collins is Angela Bridges, who may be reached at (213) 894-6500. Judge Collinss courtroom is located on the 6th floor of the Roybal Federal Building, Courtroom 680. Additional information about Judge Collins may be found on the Courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov, Judges Procedures & Schedules.Please be advised that all mandatory chambers copies should be delivered directly to chambers by noon of the business day following filing. The copies shall include the E-Filed Header and/or the E-Filing Confirmation sheet. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions. In addition, all proposed orders should be electronically mailed in WordPerfect or Microsoft Word to the Judges generic e-mail address: abc_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Lastly, please review the Judges Motion calendar located on the courts website before noticing a motion for hearing. Failure to comply may result in the motion being stricken from the record and/or in the imposition of monetary sanctions by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 99-04796 ABC(CWx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Audrey B. Collins and Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-03738 ABC(CWx).Signed by Judge Audrey B. Collins (rn)
May 26, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen C. Chavez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983447 paid.) #12 , APPLICATION for attorney Robert M. Foote to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983353 paid.) #11 , APPLICATION for attorney Matthew J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983487 paid.) #13 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing was not attached to Pro Hac Vice Applications. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Nelson on behalf of Plaintiff, Academy of Motion Picture Arts & Science, designating Enoch H Liang as local counsel. (shb)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew J. Herman on behalf of Plaintiff, Academy of Motion Picture Arts & Sciences, designating Enoch H. Liang as local counsel. (yl)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFICCASE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen C. Chavez on behalf of Academy of Motion Plaintiff Picture Arts & Sciences, designating Enoch H. Liang as local counsel. (yl)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert M. Foote on behalf of Plaintiff, Academy of Motion Picture Arts & Sciences, designating Enoch H. Liang as local counsel. (yl)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER by Judge Dale S. Fischer (yl)
May 20, 2010 Filing 13 APPLICATION for attorney Matthew J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983487 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case)(Liang, Enoch)
May 20, 2010 Filing 12 APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen C. Chavez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983447 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Liang, Enoch)
May 20, 2010 Filing 11 APPLICATION for attorney Robert M. Foote to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6983353 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Liang, Enoch)
May 18, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Kathleen Chavez for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $185.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Matthew J Herman for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $185.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Robert M. Foote for Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $185.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 7 APPLICATION of non-resident for attorney DAVID NELSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION of non-resident for attorney STUART H. SINGER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. Related Case(s): CV 07-6008 ABC; CV 05-7918 ABC; CV 05-6175 ABC and CV 05-5018 ABC. (et) (ds).
May 18, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (et) (ds).
May 18, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants BDS, Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., Greendomainmarket.com, The GoDaddy Group Inc., XPDreamTeam LLC. (et)
May 18, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants BDS, Domains By Proxy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, Inc., Greendomainmarket.com, The GoDaddy Group Inc., XPDreamTeam LLC. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences v. GoDaddy.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPDreamTeam LLC
Represented By: Joshua P Riley
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: Stuart H Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains By Proxy, Inc.
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Joshua P Riley
Represented By: Christine Newman Jones
Represented By: Kelly William Lewis
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Represented By: Stuart H Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Jay A Tufano
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: William F Lee
Represented By: Robert M Galvin
Represented By: Jimmy Tuan Anh Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, Inc.
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Joshua P Riley
Represented By: Christine Newman Jones
Represented By: Robert M Galvin
Represented By: Jimmy Tuan Anh Doan
Represented By: Kelly William Lewis
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: William F Lee
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Represented By: Stuart H Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greendomainmarket.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GoDaddy Group Inc.
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Kelly William Lewis
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDS
Represented By: Joshua P Riley
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Represented By: Stuart H Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences
Represented By: Joshua P Riley
Represented By: Matthew J Herman
Represented By: Kathleen C Chavez
Represented By: James Mitchell Lee
Represented By: David L Zifkin
Represented By: Robert M Foote
Represented By: David Nelson
Represented By: Enoch H Liang
Represented By: Stuart H Singer
Represented By: David Irving Michaels
Represented By: David W Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?