In Re Quantcast Advertising Cookie Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez, Mary Huebner, Byron Griffith, Alan Bonebrake and Austin Muhs
Defendant: Hulu, LLC, Scribd, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Quantcast Corporation, MySpace, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc. and ESPN, Inc.
Petitioner: Specific Media Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jennifer Aguirre and Alejandro Godoy
In Re: Quantcast Advertising Cookie Litigation
Case Number: 2:2010cv05484
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge George H Wu, a) Carnegie Mellon University, Pittsburgh, PennsylvaniaCyLab Usable Privacy and Security Laboratory (CUPS); Center for Democracy and Technology (CDT), Washington, D.C.; Fordham Law School, New York,New York Center on Law and Information Policy; University of CaliforniaBerkeley, Californiato be split evenly between the School of Information, for research and/or education conducted and/or supervised by Professor Deirdre Mulligan and the School of Law, Center for Law & Technology; each will receive a $250,000 cy pres award and a pro ratadistribution of any monies remaining in the Settlement Fund following initial distributions.(b) Computer Freedom & Privacy Conference (CFP), New York, New York;Illinois Institute of Technology/Chicago- Kent Law School, Chicago,IllinoisCenter for Information, Society and Policy; University ofCaliforniaHastings College of Law, San Francisco, California;University of Houston Law Center, Houston, TexasCenter for ConsumerLaw; New York Law School, New York, New YorkInstitute forInformation Law and Policy; Stanford Law School, Stanford, CaliforniaCenter for Internet and Society; and Vanderbilt University Law School, Nashville, Tennessee; each will receive a cy pres award of up to $100,000to applicable special funds.(c) International Association of Privacy Professionals (IAPP), Portsmouth,New Hampshire; The Privacy Projects, Nordland, WashingtonDataPrivacy Day; and Telecommunications Policy Research Conference(TPRC), Farnham, Virginia; each will receive a cy pres award of $50,000.13. An incentive payment, not to exceed $1,500, is hereby awarded toeach of the following named plaintiffs in the Actions: Jennifer Aguirre; A.A., aminor, by and through her parent Guardian Ad Litem, Jose Aguirre; AlanBonebrake; Alejandro Godoy; Byron Griffith; J.H., a minor, by and through hisparent, Guardian Ad Litem, Jeff Hall; R.H., a minor by and through her parentGuardian Ad Litem, Jeff Hall; Mary Huebner; Erica Intzekostas; Jose Marquez;Kira Miles; Toni Miles; Terrie J. Moore; Austin Muhs; David Rona; BrittanySanchez; Edward Valdez; Gerardo Valdez; Kayla Valdez; and Brian White.Defendants shall pay $1,500 to each of the specified individuals within ten (10)business days after the Effective Date.14. Plaintiffs counsel are hereby awarded (i) attorneys fees andreimbursement of their reasonable documented expenses incurred up to andthrough the date of the Fairness Hearing in a total amount of $544,887. Suchamounts are to be paid to Plaintiffs Class Counsel from the Settlement Fundwithin ten (10) business days after the Effective Date, and in accordance withParagraphs 4.13 and 4.15 of the Settlement Agreement. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj)
June 13, 2011 Filing 82 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASSACTION SETTLEMENT; AND (2) APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS (filed 04/20/11 #76 held before Judge George H Wu: The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Plaintiffs' Motion for(1) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (2) Approval of Attorneys Fees and Costs andIncentive Awards is granted. Judgment is approved.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
June 9, 2011 Filing 81 DECLARATION of David A. Stampley in further support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #76 filed by Plaintiff Edward Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Sam P. Cannata, June 2, 2011)(Stampley, David)
June 8, 2011 Filing 80 PROPOSED FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT re MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #76 filed by Plaintiff Edward Valdez. (Kamber, Scott)
June 1, 2011 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Joni Brown Supplemental Declaration In Support Of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #76 filed by Plaintiff Edward Valdez. (Kamber, Scott)
May 31, 2011 Filing 78 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #76 Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Edward Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott A. Kamber)(Kamber, Scott)
April 22, 2011 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #76 with exhibits filed by Defendants American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., MySpace, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Scribd, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Stampley, #2 Declaration of Majed Nachawati, #3 Declaration of Jeremy Wilson, #4 Declaration of David Parisi)(Stampley, David)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING DATE FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL by Judge George H Wu #74 . The Court resets the date for plaintiffs filing of their motion for final approval of the proposed settlement in the above-captioned matters to April 19, 2011. (im)
April 14, 2011 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION for Order resetting deadline to File Motion for Final Approval and filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Reset Motion Deadline)(Stampley, David)
March 3, 2011 Filing 73 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: PLAINTIFFS Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action settlement (filed 12/03/10) before Judge George H Wu: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is held. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is granted. Court signs the revised order. All comments received by 5/31/2011, will be provided to the Court by 6/3/2011. Counsel will include the number of opt-outs. Final Approval hearing will remain set for 6/13/2011 at 9:30 AM. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 HEARING ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that: The Court, for settlement purposes only, hereby conditionally certifies pursuant to Rule 23(a) and Rules 23(b)(2) and Rules 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a class consisting of all persons in the United States who, during the Class Periods, used any web browsing program on any device to access one or more web sites or online content controlled, operated or sponsored by Defendants; Undertaking Parties New Corporation, Viacom Inc., The Walt Disney Company, or Warner Music Inc. or subsidiaries of affiliates thereof; or any other internet site employing any of Clearspring's or Quantcast's technologies involving the use of HTTP "cookies" ("Cookies") or local shared objects stored in Adobe Flash Media Local Storage ("LSO").granting #45 Motion to Certify Class Action (bp)
March 2, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion #70 , #69 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rs)
March 1, 2011 Filing 70 EXHIBIT A.3 Longform Notice (rev.) filed by Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Stampley, David)
March 1, 2011 Filing 69 EXHIBIT A.2 Publication Notice (rev.) filed by Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Stampley, David)
February 28, 2011 Filing 68 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASSACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10) held before Judge George H Wu: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is held.The redrafted notice and proposed order will be filed by March 3, 2011. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
February 28, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Title page is missing. The correct event is: NOTICE OF LODGING under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rs)
February 18, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Motion to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) re MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #45 Revised Exhibits filed by plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.2 (rev) Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit A.3 (rev) Longform Notice)(Stampley, David)
February 7, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the docket entry for the Minute Order #64 had no document number assigned and the image was not attached. The image is now attached. (mg)
January 24, 2011 Filing 64 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING by Judge George H. Wu: Proceedings: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #45 is held. Updated notice and proposed order will be filed by 2/18/11. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to 2/28/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Final Approval Hearing is set for 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (mg) (mg).
January 20, 2011 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #45 Letter identifying proposed cy pres recipients and revised exhibits filed by Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A.2 (rev), Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit Exh. A.3 (rev), Longform Notice, #3 Exhibit Exh. A.5 (rev), Notice Plan)(Stampley, David)
January 13, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTES OF Motion FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10 held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Terms of the settlement agreement are placed on the record. Counsel for plaintiff will file supplemental documents by January 20, 2011. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to January 24, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (pj)
January 12, 2011 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, December 16, 2010; 9:39 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2011. (Wilcox, Wil)
January 7, 2011 Filing 60 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. Notice Plan, Exh. A.5 to Attachment #2 as to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #45 . (Kamber, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 59 SUPPLEMENT to Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #52 filed by Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Aguirre. (Kamber, Scott)
January 4, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application and Filing Fee Due as to David A. Stampley (G-109) filed 12/9/2010 #48 . Form G-109 issued in error. Counsel filed Form G-64, Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, in the consolidated case number CV 10-05716 GW (JCGx). (gk)
January 4, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application and Filing Fee Due as to Scott A. Kamber (G-109) filed 12/9/2010 #47 . Form G-109 issued in error. Counsel filed Form G-64, Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, in the consolidated case number CV 10-05716 GW (JCGx). (gk)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #54 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeremy R Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandro Godoy, designating David C Parisi as local counsel. (vh)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #53 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nabil M Nachawati on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandro Godoy, designating David C Parisi as local counsel. (vh)
December 21, 2010 Filing 54 APPLICATION for attorney Jeremy R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7975588 paid.) filed by plaintiff Alejandro Godoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
December 20, 2010 Filing 53 APPLICATION for attorney Nabil M. Nachawati to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7969647 paid.) filed by plaintiff Alejandro Godoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
December 16, 2010 Filing 52 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10) held before Judge George H Wu: Parties will file a stipulation and proposed order consolidating remaining matters forthwith. Court hears oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Further briefing will be filed by noon on January 7, 2010. The Court continues the motion to January 13, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (im)
December 9, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Kenneth P. Trosclair for Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jeremy Wilson for Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Majed Nachawati for Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to David A. Stampley for Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Scott A. Kamber for Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 6, 2010 Filing 46 FIRST AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Quantcast Corporation, MySpace, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JibJab Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., and Scribd; related to: Class Action Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Aguirre, Alan Bonebrake, Alejandro Godoy, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, and Kayla Valdez. (gk) (pj).
December 3, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Stampley, #2 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement), #3 Exhibit B (Firm Resume))(Parisi, David)
December 3, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez of First Amended and Consolidated Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lodging First Amended and Consolidated Complaint)(Parisi, David)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #42 PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES, IT IS SO ORDERED. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for December 2, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. shall be rescheduled to December 16, 2010 at 8:30 a.m., (pj)
November 30, 2010 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from December 2, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. to December 9, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings #33 filed by Defendant Quantcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael)
November 18, 2010 Filing 41 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case(s) #39 filed by Non-Party Specific Media Inc. (jp)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENTATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge George H Wu granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph H. Malley on behalf of Plaintiff Valdez, et al., designating David C. Parisi as local counsel. (ag)
November 16, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. Related Case(s): 2:10-cv-01256-JVS-VBK; 2:10-CV-05484-GW-JCGx; 2:10-CV-05948-GW-JCGx; 2:10-CV-07112-GW-JCGx (Moradmand, Azita)
November 16, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for attorney Joseph H. Malley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7814513 paid.) filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge George H Wu granting #35 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant, designating Eric. W. Hagen as local counsel. Fee Paid. (ag)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 2, 2010 by Judge George H Wu. (rs)
November 10, 2010 Filing 35 APPLICATION for attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., MySpace, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Scribd, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hagen, Eric)
November 5, 2010 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference Date from 11/08/2010, 8:30 a.m. to 12/02/2010, 8:30 a.m. filed by Defendant Quantcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for November 8, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiffs will give notice to defendants that an appearance by both parties will be required. (im)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT THIS TIME by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #30 (pj)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: re: Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #3 . On July 23, 2010, the Clerk for the U.S. District Court issued a notice to attorney Joseph H. Malley advising that his Pro Hac Vice Application fee had not been paid. As of the date of this minute order, the Pro Hac Vice application fee of $185 remains unpaid. If counsel fails to pay within 21 days of this notice, the Clerk is directed to remove the applicants name and address information from the docket. If the applicant believes payment has been satisfied, please provide proof of payment to the Fiscal Department. (cbr)
October 11, 2010 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Time for Plaintiffs to File Consolidated Amended Complaint from October 12, 2010 to November 19, 2010 filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE AND CREATE ORGANIZATIONAL STRUCTURE FOR COUNSEL by Judge George H Wu. Pursuant to the Stipulation #28 between and among the parties, and good cause appearing therefore. The Court finds that Valdez, et al. v. Quantcast Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:10-cv-05484-GW (C.D. Cal. filed July 23, 2010) and Aguirre v. Quantcast Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:10-cv-05716-GW (C.D. Cal filed July 30, 2010) are related actions and such cases are hereby consolidated into Valdez, et al. v. Quantcast Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:10-cv-05484-GW, and are referred to herein as the Consolidated Action. Each document filed by a party to this litigation shall bear the following caption: In Re Quantcast Advertising Cookie Litig. No. 2:10-cv-05484-GW. Interim Class Counsel shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint. Nodefendant in the Actions shall be required to respond to any currently filed complaint in the Actions. Quantcast Corporation shall answer or move against the Consolidated Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days after the filing of such Consolidated Amended Complaint. (See attached Order for further information). (jp)
September 14, 2010 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:10-cv-05484-GW and 2:10-cv-05716-GW filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to consolidate and create organizational structure for counsel)(Parisi, David)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR NBC UNIVERSAL, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H Wu: Defendant NBC Universals deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended by 38 days, so that a responsive pleading will now be due on Friday, October 1, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
August 19, 2010 Filing 26 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Scribd, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by defendant Scribd, Inc..(Mendonca, Brian)
August 18, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Azita Moradmand counsel for Plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. Adding Azita Moradmand as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Gerardo Valdez, Austin Muhs and Kayla Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Plaintiffs Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Gerardo Valdez, Austin Muhs and Kayla Valdez (Moradmand, Azita)
August 18, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Charles Gratz on behalf of Defendant Quantcast Corporation (Gratz, Joseph)
August 18, 2010 Filing 23 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MySpace, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
August 18, 2010 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/01/2010 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting stipulation to extend time to respond to initial complaint by more than 30 days)(Parisi, David)
August 18, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael H Page on behalf of Defendant Quantcast Corporation (Page, Michael)
August 17, 2010 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Quantcast Corporation identifying Not Applicable as Corporate Parent. (Page, Michael)
August 17, 2010 Filing 19 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hulu, LLC answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 18 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JIBJAB Media, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 17 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MTV Networks, Inc. answer now due 9/21/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 16 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quantcast Corporation answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, by serving Maria Sanchez, Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Errata Re Docket No. 9 filed by plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant MySpace, Inc. served on 8/3/2010, answer due 8/24/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gary D. Roberts, Agent for Service of Process, by serving Tami Fortier-Gomez, Executive Litigation Administrator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant Quantcast Corporation served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vanessa Alva, Office Manager, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant JIBJAB Media, Inc. served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gregg Spiridellis, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant Scribd, Inc. served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ansori Mohammed, Agent, Business Filings Incorporated, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant NBC Universal, Inc. served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Sanchez, Process Specialist, CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Plaintiff Hulu, LLC served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bradley Ellison, Receptionist, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Inc., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant MTV Networks, Inc. served on 7/30/2010, answer due 8/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bradley Ellison, Receptionist, United States Corporation Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner, upon Defendant American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. served on 7/30/2010, answer due 9/20/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bradley Ellison, Receptionist, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Inc., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Parisi, David)
August 17, 2010 Filing 5 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2010, filed by plaintiffs Byron Griffith; Austin Muhs; Edward Valdez; Jose Marquez; Brittany Sanchez; Kayla Valdez; Alan Bonebrake; Gerardo Valdez; Mary Huebner.(Parisi, David)
July 28, 2010 Filing 4 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials BeforeJudge George H. Wu (im)
July 23, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Joseph H Malley for Plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $185.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
July 23, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alan Bonebrake, Byron Griffith, Mary Huebner, Jose Marquez, Austin Muhs, Brittany Sanchez, Edward Valdez, Gerardo Valdez, Kayla Valdez. (et) (ds).
July 23, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., MySpace, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Quantcast Corporation, Scribd, Inc. (et)
July 23, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., MySpace, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Quantcast Corporation, Scribd, Inc..Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner.(et) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2010: #1 Notice of Assignment) (ds).
July 23, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Hulu, LLC, JIBJAB Media, Inc., MTV Networks, Inc., MySpace, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Quantcast Corporation, Scribd, Inc..Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Byron Griffith, Austin Muhs, Edward Valdez, Jose Marquez, Brittany Sanchez, Kayla Valdez, Alan Bonebrake, Gerardo Valdez, Mary Huebner.(et) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2010: # 1 Notice of Assignment) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Quantcast Advertising Cookie Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Sanchez
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Valdez
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Marquez
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Valdez
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Valdez
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Huebner
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Griffith
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bonebrake
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Muhs
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulu, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scribd, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Brian Gregory Mendonca
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantcast Corporation
Represented By: Michael H Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIBJAB Media, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTV Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESPN, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobson
Represented By: Eric W Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jennifer Aguirre
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alejandro Godoy
Represented By: Jeremy R Wilson
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Nabil M Nachawati, II
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Quantcast Advertising Cookie Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Specific Media Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: Jeffrey T Thomas
Represented By: Joshua A Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?