Scott E. Pombrio v. A. Villaragosa et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges denial of access to the Los Angeles County Law Library and the Los Angeles Public Library. Claims that defendants violated the ADA with policy prohibiting library users from bringing bags into the library. Plaintiff alleges the policies prevent him from using the libraries because it causes him pain to walk between the libraries and a place where he can store his bags.

Plaintiff: Scott E Pombrio
Defendant: City-County of Los Angeles, Does Ten, Inclusive, John Doe and Mayor Antonio Villaragosa
Case Number: 2:2010cv05604
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H. King
Presiding Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 25, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2011 Filing 25 JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King, Related to: R&R Adopting Report and Recommendations, 24 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of CivilProcedure, for lack of prosecution. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mz)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge George H. King for Report and Recommendation (Issued), 22 . (mz)
February 4, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2011 (ec)
February 4, 2011 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. Re Complaint - (Referred), Complaint - (Referred) 3 (ec)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING REQUEST AND DIRECTING THE RE-SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: granting 20 Request for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's time to file his Second Amended Complaint is extended to January 15, 2011. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
December 3, 2010 Filing 20 REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Scott E Pombrio. (mz)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle (ec)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: denying 16 Application for Leave (ec)
September 9, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scott E Pombrio. (mz)
September 9, 2010 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Scott E Pombrio. (ec)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING REQUESTS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Judge George H. King: denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying 14 Request for TRO. The Request and Motion are DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
September 3, 2010 Filing 14 AMENDED TRO REQUEST PER 42 USC 2000 3(a) STATUS OF ACTION REQUEST filed by Plaintiff Scott E Pombrio. (mz)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: denying 11 Request for Appointment of Counsel ; denying 11 Request for Order (ec)
August 20, 2010 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Antonio Villaragosa, City-County of Los Angeles, and Does Ten, Inclusive; Party John Doe terminated, amending Complaint - (Referred), Complaint - (Referred) 3 ,filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio (mz)
August 20, 2010 Filing 11 APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL REQUEST AND REQUEST US MARSHAL SERVICE OF CIVIL COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (mz)
August 20, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of address filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (mz)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re Civil Rights Case by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle (ec)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle, ORDERING Five-Page Unsigined and Incomplete "Complaint Civil-ADA Rights" submitted by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio received on 8/16/10 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Document, on its face, is incomplete, and is unsigned, in violation of Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (mz)
August 16, 2010 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 6 filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (et)
August 16, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION AND NOTICE for a Preliminary Injunction ex parte application filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
August 16, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (et)
August 16, 2010 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (et)
August 16, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred) 3 as to Defendants John Doe, Antonio Villaragosa. (et)
August 16, 2010 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants John Doe, Antonio Villaragosa. Case assigned to Judge George H. King and referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee: IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED.), filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (Attachments: # 1 Summons). (et)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: granting 1 Request for Leave to Proceed in Forma. (et)
July 28, 2010 Filing 1 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). (et)
July 28, 2010 LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiff Scott E. Pombrio. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott E. Pombrio v. A. Villaragosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City-County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Ten, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Antonio Villaragosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott E Pombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?