In re Clearspring Flash Cookie Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Kira Miles, Brian White, A. A., J. H., R. H., Toni Miles and Terrie J. Moore
Defendant: Demand Media, Inc., Ustream, Inc., SodaHead, Inc., Soapnet, LLC, Project Playlist, Inc., Clearspring Technologies, Inc., Walt Disney Internet Group and Warner Bros. Records, Inc.
Petitioner: Specific Media Inc
Consolidated Defendant: Fox Entertainment Group, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: David Rona and Erica Intzekostas
In Re: Clearspring Flash Cookie Litigation
Case Number: 2:2010cv05948
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge George H Wu,.Carnegie Mellon University, Pittsburgh, PennsylvaniaCyLab UsablePrivacy and Security Laboratory (CUPS); Center for Democracy andTechnology (CDT), Washington, D.C.; Fordham Law School, New York,New York Center on Law and Information Policy; University ofCaliforniaBerkeley, Californiato be split evenly between the School ofInformation, for research and/or education conducted and/or supervisedby Professor Deirdre Mulligan and the School of Law, Center for Law &Technology; each will receive a $250,000 cy pres award and a pro ratadistribution of any monies remaining in the Settlement Fund followinginitial distributions.(b) Computer Freedom & Privacy Conference (CFP), New York, New York;Illinois Institute of Technology/Chicago- Kent Law School, Chicago,IllinoisCenter for Information, Society and Policy; University ofCaliforniaHastings College of Law, San Francisco, California;University of Houston Law Center, Houston, TexasCenter for ConsumerLaw; New York Law School, New York, New YorkInstitute forInformation Law and Policy; Stanford Law School, Stanford, CaliforniaCenter for Internet and Society; and Vanderbilt University Law School, Nashville, Tennessee; each will receive a cy pres award of up to $100,000to applicable special funds.(c) International Association of Privacy Professionals (IAPP), Portsmouth,New Hampshire; The Privacy Projects, Nordland, WashingtonDataPrivacy Day; and Telecommunications Policy Research Conference(TPRC), Farnham, Virginia; each will receive a cy pres award of $50,000.13. An incentive payment, not to exceed $1,500, is hereby awarded toeach of the following named plaintiffs in the Actions: Jennifer Aguirre; A.A., aminor, by and through her parent Guardian Ad Litem, Jose Aguirre; AlanBonebrake; Alejandro Godoy; Byron Griffith; J.H., a minor, by and through hisparent, Guardian Ad Litem, Jeff Hall; R.H., a minor by and through her parentGuardian Ad Litem, Jeff Hall; Mary Huebner; Erica Intzekostas; Jose Marquez;Kira Miles; Toni Miles; Terrie J. Moore; Austin Muhs; David Rona; BrittanySanchez; Edward Valdez; Gerardo Valdez; Kayla Valdez; and Brian White.Defendants shall pay $1,500 to each of the specified individuals within ten (10)business days after the Effective Date. 14. Plaintiffs counsel are hereby awarded (i) attorneys fees andreimbursement of their reasonable documented expenses incurred up to andthrough the date of the Fairness Hearing in a total amount of $544,887. Suchamounts are to be paid to Plaintiffs Class Counsel from the Settlement Fundwithin ten (10) business days after the Effective Date, and in accordance withParagraphs 4.13 and 4.15 of the Settlement Agreement.15. The award of attorneys fees to Plaintiffs Class counsel, as provided in paragraph 14, above, shall be allocated among Plaintiffs counsel ina fashion that, in the opinion of Plaintiffs Class Counsel, fairly compensatesPlaintiffs counsel for their respective contributions in the prosecution of theAction. The Court has considered this award of attorneys fees andreimbursement of expenses, in the amounts described in paragraph 14 (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated) (pj)
June 13, 2011 Filing 58 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; AND (2) APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS (filed 04/20/11) #53 held before Judge George H Wu: The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Plaintiffs' Motion for (1) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (2) Approval of Attorneys Fees and Costs and Incentive Awards is granted. Judgment is approved. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
June 9, 2011 Filing 57 DECLARATION of David A. Stampley in further support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #53 filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of S.P. Cannata, June 2, 2011)(Stampley, David)
June 1, 2011 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Joni Brown Supplemental Declaration In Support Of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #53 filed by Plaintiff Brian White. (Kamber, Scott)
May 31, 2011 Filing 55 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #53 Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Brian White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott A. Kamber)(Kamber, Scott)
April 22, 2011 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #53 with exhibits filed by Consol Defendant Fox Entertainment Group, Inc., Defendants Soapnet, LLC, Walt Disney Internet Group. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Erica Intzekostas, Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, David Rona, Soapnet, LLC, Brian White. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Stampley, #2 Declaration of Majed Nachawati, #3 Declaration of Jeremy Wilson, #4 Declaration of David Parisi)(Stampley, David)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING DATE FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL by Judge George H Wu #51 . The Court resets the date for plaintiffs filing of their motion for final approval of the proposed settlement in the above-captioned matters to April 19, 2011. (im)
April 14, 2011 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION for Order resetting deadline to file Motion for Final Approval filed by Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stampley, David)
March 3, 2011 Filing 50 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: PLAINTIFFS Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action settlement (filed 12/03/10) before Judge George H Wu: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is held. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is granted. Court signs the revised order. All comments received by 5/31/2011, will be provided to the Court by 6/3/2011. Counsel will include the number of opt-outs. Final Approval hearing will remain set for 6/13/2011 at 9:30 AM. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 HEARING ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that: The Court, for settlement purposes only, hereby conditionally certifies pursuant to Rule 23(a) and Rules 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a class consisting of all person in the United States who, during the Class Procedure, a class consisting of all person in the United States who, during the Class Period, used any web browsing program on any device to access one or more web site or online content controlled, operated or sponsored by Defendants; Undertaking Parties New Corporation, Viacom Inc., The Walt Disney Company, or Warner Music Inc. or subsidiaries of affiliates thereof; or any other internet site employing any of Clearspring's or Quantcast's technologies involving the use of HTTP "coolies" ("Cookies") or local shared objects stored in Adobe Flash Media local storage ("LSOs"). granting #26 Motion to Certify Class Action (bp)
March 2, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion #46 , #47 . The following error was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rs)
March 1, 2011 Filing 47 EXHIBIT A.3 to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #26 Longform Notice (rev.) filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Stampley, David)
March 1, 2011 Filing 46 EXHIBIT A.2 to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #26 Publication Notice (rev.) filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Stampley, David)
February 28, 2011 Filing 45 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASSACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10) held before Judge George H Wu: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is held.The redrafted notice and proposed order will be filed by March 3, 2011. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to 3/3/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
February 18, 2011 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENT to Exhibit (non-trial), Exhibit (non-trial) #38 filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.2 (rev) Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit A.3 (rev) Longform Notice)(Stampley, David)
January 24, 2011 Filing 43 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING by Judge George H. Wu: Proceedings: Further discussion re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #26 is held. Updated notice and proposed order will be filed by 2/18/11. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to 2/28/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Final Approval Hearing is set for 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (mg)
January 20, 2011 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #26 Letter identifying proposed cy pres recipients and revised exhibits filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A.2 (rev), Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit Exh. A.3 (rev), Longform Notice, #3 Exhibit Exh. A.5 (rev), Notice Plan)(Stampley, David)
January 18, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ian C Ballon on behalf of Defendant Demand Media, Inc. (Ballon, Ian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ian C Ballon on behalf of Defendant Demand Media, Inc. (Ballon, Ian)
January 13, 2011 Filing 39 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASSACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu. Court and counsel confer re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.Terms of the settlement agreement are placed on the record. Counsel for plaintiff will file supplemental documents by January 20, 2011. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to January 24, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (pj)
January 7, 2011 Filing 38 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. Notice Plan, Exh. A.5 to Attachment #2 as to MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) #26 . (Kamber, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENT to Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #32 filed by Consol Plaintiff Erica Intzekostas. (Kamber, Scott)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #34 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeremy R Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff David Rona, designating David C Parisi as local counsel. (vh)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #33 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nabil M Nachawati on behalf of Plaintiff David Rona, designating David C Parisi as local counsel. (vh)
December 21, 2010 Filing 34 APPLICATION for attorney Jeremy R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7975430 paid.) filed by plaintiff David Rona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
December 20, 2010 Filing 33 APPLICATION for attorney Nabil M. Nachawati to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7969793 paid.) filed by plaintiff David Rona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
December 16, 2010 Filing 32 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 12/03/10) held before Judge George H Wu: Parties will file a stipulation and proposed order consolidating remaining matters forthwith. Court hears oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Further briefing will be filed by noon on January 7, 2010. The Court continues the motion to January 13, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (im)
December 14, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sherman William Kahn on behalf of Defendant Warner Bros. Records, Inc. (Kahn, Sherman)
December 9, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Kenneth P. Trosclair for Plaintiffs A. A. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jose Aguirre, J. H. a minor by and through his parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, R. H. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, Erica Intzekostas, Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, David Rona, and Brian White. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jeremy Wilson for Plaintiffs A. A. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jose Aguirre, J. H. a minor by and through his parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, R. H. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, Erica Intzekostas, Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, David Rona, and Brian White. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Majed Nachawati for Plaintiffs A. A. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jose Aguirre, J. H. a minor by and through his parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, R. H. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, Erica Intzekostas, Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, David Rona, and Brian White. (Attachments: #1 G-64 Application, #2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk)
December 6, 2010 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Clearspring Technologies, Inc., Fox Entertainment Group, Inc., Walt Disney Internet Group, Demand Media, Inc., Soapnet, LLC, and Warner Bros. Records, Inc.; Party Project Playlist, Inc., SodaHead, Inc. and Ustream, Inc. terminated; related to: Class Action Complaint #8 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs A. A. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jose Aguirre, J. H. a minor by and through his parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, R. H. a minor by and through her parent Guardian ad Litem Jeff Hall, Erica Intzekostas, Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, David Rona, and Brian White. (gk) (pj).
December 3, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Approval of Class action Settlement) filed by plaintiffs J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Stampley, #2 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement), #3 Exhibit B (Firm Resume))(Parisi, David)
December 3, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs A. A., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White of First Amended and Consolidated Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lodging First Amended and Consolidated Complaint)(Parisi, David)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES, IT IS SO ORDERED. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for December 2, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. shall be rescheduled to December 16, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. (pj)
November 30, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Clearspring Technologies, Inc., re Stipulation to Continue #22 served on November 30, 2010. (Somvichian, Whitty)
November 30, 2010 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference from December 2, 2010 to December 9, 2010 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing #17 filed by Defendant Clearspring Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty)
November 18, 2010 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case(s) #19 filed by Non-Party Specific Media Inc. (jp)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge George H Wu granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph H. Malley on behalf of Plaintiff White, et al, designating David C. Parisi as local counsel. (ag)
November 16, 2010 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. Related Case(s): 2:10-cv-01256-JVS-VBKx; 2:10-CV-05484-GW-JCGx; 2:10-CV-05948-GW-JCGx; 2:10-CV-07112-GW-JCGx (Moradmand, Azita)
November 16, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for attorney Joseph H. Malley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7815006 paid.) filed by plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 2, 2010 by Judge George H Wu. (rs)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge George H Wu to Consolidate and Create Organizational Structure for Counsel. Pursuant to the Stipulation #13 , the Court orders Case No. 2:10-cv-05948-GW and Case No. 2:10-cv-06586-GW are related actions and such cases are hereby consolidated into White, et al. v. Clearspring Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:10-cv-05948-GW, and are referred to herein as the Consolidated Action. Each document filed by a party to this litigation shall bear the following caption: In Re Clearspring Flash Cookie Litig. No. 2:10-cv-05948-GW. (mg)
October 13, 2010 Filing 15 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing is held off the record. Court and counsel confer regarding the Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate Cases as to CV 10-5948 and CV 10-6586, filed on October 6, 2010. Court approves the order. A Status Conference is set for November 8, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: None present. (rs)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: re: Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #4 . Joseph H. Malley advising that his Pro Hac Vice Application fee had not been paid. As of the date of this minute order, the Pro Hac Vice application fee of $275 remains unpaid. If counsel fails to pay within 21 days of this notice, the Clerk is directed to remove the applicants name and address information from the docket. If the applicant believes payment has been satisfied, please provide proof of payment tothe Fiscal Department. (cbr)
October 6, 2010 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:10-cv-05948; 2:10-cv-06586 filed by plaintiff A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David)
September 20, 2010 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H Wu that You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Standing Order for further information). (jp)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 10-05484 GW(JCGx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-05948 GW(JCGx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson that this case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the FRCP which requires that the Rules be "construed to secure the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of every action." Memoranda of Points and Authorities in support of or in opposition to motion shall not exceed 25 pages. Replies, thereto, shall not exceed 12 pages (see attached Order for further information). (jp)
August 17, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. (et) (mg).
August 17, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #8 as to Defendants Clearspring Technologies, Inc., Demand Media, Inc., Project Playlist, Inc., Soapnet, LLC, SodaHead, Inc., Ustream, Inc., Walt Disney Internet Group, Warner Bros. Records, Inc. (et)
August 17, 2010 Filing 8 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Clearspring Technologies, Inc., Demand Media, Inc., Project Playlist, Inc., Soapnet, LLC, SodaHead, Inc., Ustream, Inc., Walt Disney Internet Group, Warner Bros. Records, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Terrie J. Moore, Kira Miles, J. H., Brian White, Toni Miles, A. A., R. H. (et) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2010: #1 Summons) (mg).
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: granting #1 Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Jose Aguirre as Guardian ad Litem for A.A. (et)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: denying #3 Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. as Guardian ad Litem for R.H., without prejudice petition is illegible. (et)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: denying #2 Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. as Guardian ad Litem for J.H., without prejudice petition is illegible. (et)
August 10, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Joseph H Malley for Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
August 10, 2010 Filing 3 PETITION for Appointment of Jeff Hall as Guardian ad Litem for R.H.filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. LODGED Proposed Order.(et)
August 10, 2010 Filing 2 PETITION for Appointment of Jeff Hall as Guardian ad Litem for J.H.filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. LODGED Proposed Order.(et)
August 10, 2010 Filing 1 PETITION for Appointment of Jose Aguirre as Guardian ad Litem for A.A.filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White.(et) LODGED Proposed Order. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2010: #1 Lodged Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Lodged Certificate of Interested Parties) (et). Modified on 8/12/2010 (et).
August 10, 2010 LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to DUTY Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. (et)
August 10, 2010 LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to DUTY Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs A. A., J. H., R. H., Kira Miles, Toni Miles, Terrie J. Moore, Brian White. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Clearspring Flash Cookie Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kira Miles
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian White
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. A.
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. H.
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Miles
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie J. Moore
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Specific Media Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: Jeffrey T Thomas
Represented By: Joshua A Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demand Media, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin S Dion
Represented By: Ian C Ballon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ustream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SodaHead, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soapnet, LLC
Represented By: David A Stampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Playlist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearspring Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Internet Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Records, Inc.
Represented By: Sherman William Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fox Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Rona
Represented By: Jeremy R Wilson
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Nabil M Nachawati, II
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Erica Intzekostas
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Clearspring Flash Cookie Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?