L.A. Triumph, Inc. v. Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: L.A. Triumph, Inc.
Defendant: Does, MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC and Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone
Case Number: 2:2010cv06195
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Presiding Judge: S. James Otero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2011 Filing 134 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 order) (lc)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, re Stipulation 132 this Action, and each and every claim for relief therein, is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, and that plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc., on the one hand, and defendants, MG Icon, LLC, Macys Retail Holdings,Inc., and Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone, on the other hand, generally release each other from any and all claims or liabilities. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
October 17, 2011 Filing 132 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 130 Joint Ex Parte Application to Vacate Pre-Trial Congerence and Trial dates. It is hereby ORDERED that: The pre-trial conference scheduled for October 3, 2011 is continued to Monday, November 7, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. The trial and all pending motions in limines, set for hearing on October 11, 2011, are continued to Tuesday, November 15, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Additionally, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal on Monday, November 7, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances will not be required if the case is dismissed prior to the Order to Show Cause date. (lom)
September 23, 2011 Filing 130 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Scheduling Conference, Vacate ADR Referral Notice, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 26 ( and to Vacate Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Dates and Take Hearings on Motions In Limine Off-Calendar) filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian ISO Joint Ex Parte Application to Vacate Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Dates etc., # 2 Proposed Order)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 14, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Boyajian, Nina)
September 13, 2011 Filing 128 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (# 2) to Exclude Evidence that Plaintiff is Entitled to Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits as Damages MOTION IN LIMINE (# 2) to Exclude Evidence that Plaintiff is Entitled to Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits as Damages 110 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
September 13, 2011 Filing 127 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (# 1) to Exclude To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Actual Damages, Including Lost Profits, Inventory or a Royalty MOTION IN LIMINE (# 1) to Exclude To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Actual Damages, Including Lost Profits, Inventory or a Royalty MOTION IN LIMINE (# 1) to Exclude To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Actual Damages, Including Lost Profits, Inventory or a Royalty 109 Declaration of Imran F. Vakil in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Vakil, Imran)
September 13, 2011 Filing 126 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION and MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude TESTIMONY AND DOCUMENTS SHOWING THE SALE OF MATERIAL GIRL MERCHANDISE THAT WAS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY NOT ALREADY BY DEFENDANTS OR LIVE NATION filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George Belfield ISO Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion In Limine No. 3)(Belfield, George)
September 13, 2011 Filing 125 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ARGUMENT AND EVIDENCE THAT A THIRD PARTY FABRIC MANUFACTURER NAMED ITS FABRIC MADONNA 115 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Boyajian, Nina)
September 13, 2011 Filing 124 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Argument and Evidence of Herb Ritz's Photographs of Madonna's Eyes as Used in Any of Madonna Promotions Including Madonna's 1987 Tour and DVD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Argument and Evidence of Herb Ritz's Photographs of Madonna's Eyes as Used in Any of Madonna Promotions Including Madonna's 1987 Tour and DVD 114 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian ISO Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion In Limine No. 1, # 2 Exhibit A - F to Boyajian DECL ISO Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion In Limine No. 1)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 12, 2011 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. (Belfield, George)
September 12, 2011 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
September 12, 2011 Filing 121 Witness List filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc... (Vakil, Imran)
September 12, 2011 Filing 120 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc... (Vakil, Imran)
September 7, 2011 Filing 119 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc., re APPLICATION for Order for to file an unredacted version of plaintiffs motion in limine No. 3 and file exhibits B,C, D and E in support under seal pursuant to protective order 118 , proposed order, unreadacted motion in limine No.3, proposed order served on 9/7/11. (lc)
September 7, 2011 Filing 118 APPLICATION for Order for to file an unredacted version of plaintiffs motion in limine No. 3 and file exhibits B,C, D and E in support under seal pursuant to protective order filed by plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc)
September 6, 2011 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude TESTIMONY AND DOCUMENTS SHOWING THE SALE OF MATERIAL GIRL MERCHANDISE THAT WAS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY NOT ALREADY BY DEFENDANTS OR LIVE NATION [REDACTED WITH APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONCURRENTLY SUBMITTED] filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit C - REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit D - REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit E - REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Proposed Order)(Vakil, Imran)
September 6, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. of Plaintiff's Unredacted Motion in Limine No. 3 and Exhibits B Through E Thereto. (Vakil, Imran)
September 6, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ARGUMENT AND EVIDENCE THAT A THIRD PARTY FABRIC MANUFACTURER NAMED ITS FABRIC MADONNA filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Vakil, Imran)
September 6, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Argument and Evidence of Herb Ritz's Photographs of Madonna's Eyes as Used in Any of Madonna Promotions Including Madonna's 1987 Tour and DVD filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Vakil, Imran)
September 6, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (# 6) to Exclude Any Documents, and All Related Evidence, Testimony, and Argument Not Produced in Discovery by L.A. Triumph filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motions In Limine Nos. 1-6)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 6, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (# 5) to Exclude Testimony Regarding Defendant MG Icon's Filing of an "Intent to Use" Trademark Application filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George M. Belfield)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 6, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (# 4) to Exclude Expert Testimony of Antonio R. Sarabia II, a "Business Person and Attorney" filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 6, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (# 2) to Exclude Evidence that Plaintiff is Entitled to Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits as Damages filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Boyajian)(Boyajian, Nina)
September 6, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (# 1) to Exclude To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Actual Damages, Including Lost Profits, Inventory or a Royalty filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Boyajian (Part 1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Nina Boyajian (Part 2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit E to Declaration of Nina Boyajian (Part 3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit F-G to Declaration of Nina Boyajian (Part 4 of 4))(Boyajian, Nina)
September 6, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc of (1) Ex Parte Application for Order to File Motion In Limine No. 3 Under Seal and (2) Motion In Limine No. 3. (Boyajian, Nina)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 87 by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for Details). (sch)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE by Judge S. James Otero. It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference completion date is extended from September 2, 2011 to September 13, 2011 so that the parties may complete the mediation scheduled for September 13, 2011. (bp)
August 19, 2011 Filing 105 STIPULATION to Continue MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE from 9-2-2011 to 9-13-2011 Re: Order 5 filed by DEFENDANTS MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boyajian, Nina)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE REMOVING DOCUMENT NO.99 FROM THE PUBLIC RECORD AND REPLACING IT WITH AN AMENDED AND REDACTED VERSION OF THE SAME DOCUMENT by Judge S. James Otero, re Stipulation for Order, 101 (bp)
July 20, 2011 Filing 103 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Strike Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge re Expert Report in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication of Issues and Supporting Documents, or, in the Al 102 PARTIAL OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
July 19, 2011 Filing 102 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Strike Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge re Expert Report in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication of Issues and Supporting Documents, or, in the Alternative, Placing the Declaration and Expert Report Under Seal filed by DEFENDANTS MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George M. Belfield, # 2 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 4 Proposed Order)(Boyajian, Nina)
July 19, 2011 Filing 101 STIPULATION for Order Removing Document No. 99 from the Public Record and Replacing it with an Amended and Redacted Version of the Same Document filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amended CWA Decl re Expert Report), # 2 Exhibit 1 to CWA Decl (Redacted Expert Report), # 3 Proposed Order Granting Removal of Doc. 99 from the Public Record)(Boyajian, Nina)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge S. James Otero. The parties are advised that the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. 87 , scheduled for hearing on July 25, 2011, are taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (sch)
July 14, 2011 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Arledge in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 Re Expert Report in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Anthony Sarabia)(Arledge, Christopher) (Main Document 99 replaced on 8/3/2011) (sch). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/3/2011) (sch).
July 11, 2011 Filing 98 Evidentiary Objections to Declarations re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 re Christopher W. Arledge Declaration filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Hafiz Lakhani, # 2 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Amin Lakhani)(Belfield, George)
July 11, 2011 Filing 97 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Belfield, George)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE ON WITHDRAWN MOTION (DOCKET NO. 81 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: In light of Plaintiff's withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, [Etc.], the July 12, 2011 9:30 hearing on such matter is vacated. (hr)
July 5, 2011 Filing 95 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel,,, 81 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
July 5, 2011 Filing 94 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Declarations re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
July 2, 2011 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Amin Lakhani in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
July 2, 2011 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Hafiz Lakhani in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Arledge, Christopher)
July 2, 2011 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Arledge in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T)(Arledge, Christopher)
July 2, 2011 Filing 90 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 87 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact and Conclusions of Law in Response to Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication)(Arledge, Christopher)
June 29, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone of 1) Ex Parte Application To File Under Seal Exhibits D, H And I To Declaration Of Christopher W. Arledge Filed In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Of Issues; 2) Declaration Of George M Belfield In Support Of Defendants' Ex Parte Application To File Under Seal Exhibits D, H And I To Declaration Of Christopher W. Arledge Filed In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Of Issues; 3) Declaration Of Nina D. Boyajian In Support Of Defendants Ex Parte Application To File Under Seal Exhibits D, H And I To Declaration Of Christopher W. Arledge Filed In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Of Issues; 4) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application To File Under Seal Exhibits D, H And I To Declaration Of Christopher W. Arledge Filed In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Of Issues. (Boyajian, Nina)
June 29, 2011 Filing 88 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Application Requesting Court to Consider and Decide Defendants' Re-Filed Motion for Summary Judgment 86 Without Further Notice and Opposition/Reply Papers filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support Thereof)(Arledge, Christopher)
June 27, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit to Declarations ISO of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 4 Proposed Order (1 of 2), # 5 Proposed Order (2 of 2))(Belfield, George)
June 27, 2011 Filing 86 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Application Requesting Court to Consider and Decide Defendants' Re-Filed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Boyajian ISO Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order)(Belfield, George)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge S. James Otero: Denying 78 Ex Parte Application to Strike. (rp)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge S. James Otero, re Stipulation to Seal, 77 . Denied (rp)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE ON WITHDRAWN MOTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Notice of Withdrawal 82 . In light of Plaintiff's withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced, the June 28, 2011 9:30 hearing on such matter is vacated. (hr)
June 21, 2011 Filing 82 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel 56 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arledge, Christopher)
June 20, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant MG Icon's Production of Documents Responsive to RFP's 24, 63, 74-76 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation, # 2 Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi in Support Thereof, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi, # 6 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel MG Icon's Production of Documents, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian, # 10 Exhibit D to Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian)(Arledge, Christopher)
June 16, 2011 Filing 80 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 40 ; STRIKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT 38 ; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS 39 ; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 55 , 65 . (lc)
June 16, 2011 Filing 79 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 76 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 74 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 76 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 74 78 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
June 15, 2011 Filing 78 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 76 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 74 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George M. Belfield, # 2 Proposed Order)(Belfield, George)
June 14, 2011 Filing 77 STIPULATION File File Exhibits D, H and I to Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge and Declaration of Samantha Copeman and Corresponding Uncontroverted Fact re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Belfield, George)
June 14, 2011 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Arledge in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 06/13/2011 74 , filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Arledge, Christopher)
June 14, 2011 Filing 75 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The parties are advised that MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. 38 ,scheduled for hearing on June 20, 2011, is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (lc)
June 13, 2011 Filing 74 SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact and Conclusions of Law and Supplemental Response to Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication, # 2 Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Peter R. Afrasiabi)(Afrasiabi, Peter)
June 7, 2011 Filing 73 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED AGREEMENTS AND OTHER AGREEMENTS NOT PRODUCED re: MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Producted, # 2 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Imran F. Vakil in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced, # 3 Declaration of Nina D. Boyajian in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced)(Belfield, George)
June 6, 2011 Filing 72 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Evidentiary Objections to Christopher Arledge Decl. ISO Opposition to MSJ, # 2 Evidentiary Objections to Amin Lakhani Decl. ISO Opposition to MSJ, # 3 Evidentiary Objections to Hafiz Lakhani Decl. ISO Opposition to MSJ)(Belfield, George)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) CONTINUING HEARING ON IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 . As Plaintiff's Motion was not properly noticed for hearing on June 21, 2011 and in order to bring this matter in compliance with the Local Rules, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion is continued to June 28, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants' opposing papers are due on June 7, 2011. Plaintiff's reply is due on June 14, 2011. [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (hr)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order 46 . See order for details. (hr)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: denying as moot 66 Ex Parte Application for Hearing. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel the Attendance at Deposition of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone, which appears to have been filed before, but was not received by this Court until after the Court issued its ruling on plaintiff's motion to compel, is moot and is denied as such. (hr)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER (1) VACATING HEARING DATE AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (DOCKET NO. 37) AND SANCTIONS REQUESTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: 37 Motion to Compel Deposition. The court finds Plaintiff's Motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for June 7, 2011 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. 1. Plaintiff's Motion is denied. 2. The parties and Ciccone's respective requests for monetary sanctions are denied. See order for details. (hr)
June 2, 2011 Filing 66 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing as to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel the Attendance at Deposition of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone re Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 44 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Belfield, George)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge S. James Otero, ORDERING application and order submitted by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. received on 5/3/11 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: no notice of manual filing, no protective order, no detailed face page on envelope. (lc)
June 1, 2011 Filing 65 APPLICATION for Order for to file declaration of Christopher W Arledge in support of opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment and exhibits under seal filed by plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc)
June 1, 2011 Filing 64 Amended Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication of Issues and Supporting Documents re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
June 1, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 49 Amended Opposition Filed Concurrently Herewith (Arledge, Christopher)
June 1, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. of Application to File Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Arledge, Christopher)
June 1, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is incorrect. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (hr)
May 31, 2011 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc., Service of Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Documents Under Seal; and Exhibits D, H, M, and I to Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment served on 05/31/2011. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Imran F. Vakil in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Arledge in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 57 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced 56 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Agreements and Other Agreements Not Produced filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. of Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Documents Under Seal; Exhibits D, H, I and M to the Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 31, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 49 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. No protective order on file to allow under seal filings. No notice of manual filing of under seal documents; under seal documents to be manually filed with civil intake. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 30, 2011 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Amin Lakhani in support of OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Hafiz Lakhani in support of OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Arledge in support of OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P)(Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 50 STATEMENT of of Genuine Issues of Material Fact and Conclusions of Law and Response to Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 49 Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 48 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 - Evidentiary Objections to Defendants' Declarations Filed in Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion, filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 30, 2011 Filing 47 STATEMENT of Plaintiff's Under Seal Filing and Supplemental Rule 56(d) Statement in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 26, 2011 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended)(Belfield, George)
May 24, 2011 Filing 45 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone 37 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of George M. Belfield ISO Supplemental Brief, # 2 Objections to Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge ISO Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Madonna's Deposition)(Belfield, George)
May 24, 2011 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone 37 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support Thereof, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration - Excerpts from Deposition of Dell Furano)(Arledge, Christopher)
May 19, 2011 Filing 43 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuance of Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 18, 2011 Filing 42 OPPOSITION [PARTIAL] to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
May 18, 2011 Filing 41 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuance of Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George M. Belfield ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Ex Parte Application for An Order Granting a Continuance of Hearing Date On Defendants' MSJ)(Belfield, George)
May 17, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC of Application to File Under Seal and Motion for Summary Judgment. (Belfield, George)
May 17, 2011 Filing 39 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuance of Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support Thereof; Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 2 Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order)(Arledge, Christopher)
May 16, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO Defendants' MSJ, # 2 Declarations ISO Defendants' MSJ, # 3 Exhibits to Declarations ISO Defendants' MSJ, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' MSJ (Alternative No. 1 of 2), # 5 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' MSJ (Alternative No. 2 of 2))(Belfield, George)
May 13, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/7/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition, # 2 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition, # 3 Exhibit A through K to Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge, # 4 Declaration of Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone and Nina D. Boyajian in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition, # 5 Exhibit A through T to Declarations of Ciccone and Boyajian, # 6 Appendix A to Joint Stipulation, # 7 Proposed Order)(Vakil, Imran)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING Defendants' Application to File Under Seal 29 ; STRIKING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 30 ; DEEMING MOOT Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Continuance 32 by Judge S. James Otero. As stated above, the Court strikes Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment because of Defendants' failure to comply with the Standing Order and Local Rules. Because the Motion has been stricken, Plaintiff's request for a continuance of the hearing on that Motion is MOOT. Moreover, the Court's Standing Order expressly states that "the magistrate judge assigned to the case will rule on discovery motions." The Court will not encroach upon the proper purview of the Magistrate Judge. (sch)
May 9, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John Tehranian on behalf of Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. (Tehranian, John)
May 9, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Alana Christina Srour counsel for Defendant Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. Filed by Defendant Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone (Srour, Alana)
May 6, 2011 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for a Continuance of the Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 32 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. (Belfield, George)
May 5, 2011 Filing 32 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for a Continuance of the Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge in Support Thereof with Exhibits 1 through 6, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order)(Arledge, Christopher)
May 4, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Continuance of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 30 (Belfield, George)
May 3, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declarations ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judmgnet (Alternative No. 1 of 2), # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judmgnet (Alternative No. 2 of 2))(Belfield, George)
May 3, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone of Application to File Under Seal and Notice of Motion and for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication and All Supporting Documents. (Belfield, George)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero. The Court vacates and takes off calendar the Status Conference set for Monday, March 14, 2011. All other dates set shall remain. (sch)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief is GRANTED 12 . Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone is terminated as a defendant in this action. Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. Defendant's Evidentiary Objections, however, are OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections are OVERRULED IN PART AND SUSTAINED IN PART. A Status Conference is hereby set for March 14, 2011 at 8:30 A.M. (lc)
January 10, 2011 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero;Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Pilot Program, General Order 02-07, is vacated. The Court sets the following schedule: last date to amend or add parties :2/11/11 ; discovery cutoff: 7/11/11 ; motion hearing cutoff: 8/29/11 10:00 AM; pretrial conference: 10/3/11 9:00 AM; Jury trial: 10/11/11 9:00 AM; Settlement conference referred to private mediation; all discovery dispute to be brought before magistrate judge assigned to the case; parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order.Court Recorder: CS: 1/10/11. (lc)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order, 23 . See order for details. (hr)
December 27, 2010 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc... (Arledge, Christopher)
December 13, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Governing the Use and Maintenance of Confidential Material)(Belfield, George)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief 12 , scheduled for hearing on November 29, 2010, is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (sce)
November 15, 2010 Filing 21 Objections to Declaraiton of Christopher W. Arledge In Support Of re: MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief 12 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Belfield, George)
November 15, 2010 Filing 20 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief 12 filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (Belfield, George)
November 8, 2010 Filing 19 OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE re: Declaration of Nina Boyajian re: MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief 12 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
November 8, 2010 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief 12 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Arledge, Christopher)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:( Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2011 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero.) (sce)
November 3, 2010 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, identifying Defendant and Parent company of Defendant Macys Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Boyajian, Nina)
November 3, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Macy Retail Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 14 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 3, 2010 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 9 filed by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.(Belfield, George)
November 1, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MG Icon defendants Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 11 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 29, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Boyajian ISO Motion to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Claim for Declaratory Relief)(Belfield, George)
October 29, 2010 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 9 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone.(Belfield, George)
October 29, 2010 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc., upon Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc served on 10/14/2010, answer due 11/4/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews, Authorized to Accept Service at Registered Agent Corporation Service Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Arledge, Christopher)
October 12, 2010 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone, Does, Material Girl Brand, LLC, MG Icon, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc, and DOES 1 through 10, amending Complaint 1 ; filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph. Inc. (mg) (mg).
September 16, 2010 Filing 8 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone and Material Girl Brand, LLC Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone.(Boyajian, Nina)
September 16, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendants, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone and Material Girl Brand, LLC All Defendants, (Boyajian, Nina)
August 25, 2010 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by L.A. Triumph, Inc.. (Afrasiabi, Peter)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE S. JAMES OTERO by Judge S. James Otero. Read This Order Carefully. It Controls This Case and Differs in Some Respects From the Local Rules. (See Order for Details). (sch)
August 19, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 19, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
August 19, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. (et) (ds).
August 19, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. (et)
August 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Material Girl Brand, LLC, Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueiline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff L.A. Triumph, Inc. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.A. Triumph, Inc. v. Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Nina D Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Icon
Represented By: George M Belfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc
Represented By: George M Belfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Material Girl Brand, LLC
Represented By: George M Belfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Louise Veronica Ciccone
Represented By: George M Belfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A. Triumph, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?