Howard L Abselet v. Alliance Lending Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Howard L Abselet
Defendant: Alliance Lending Group, Inc., Does, Malibu Reconveyance, LLC, Hamid Nourmand, Hamid Joseph Nourmand, Soda Partners, LLC, Van Nuys Plywood, LLC, Massoud Aaron Yashouafar and Solyman Yashouafar
Case Number: 2:2011cv00815
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2016 824 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT by Judge John F. Walter. Kadima, Whiterock and Davis shall show cause at a hearing before this Court on November 10, 2016, at 11:00 a.m., why they should not be held in contempt of Court for violating the Court's Order dated August 30, 2016. Kadima, Whiterock and Davis shall serve and file their written response to this Order, including declarations and documentary evidence on or before November 8, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
May 26, 2016 736 Opinion or Order of the Court INJUNCTION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court having held on May 23, 2016, that Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor Howard L. Abselet is entitled to an injunction. (See attachment of this Order for further details). (jp)
May 23, 2016 728 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Motion of Judgment Creditor Howard l Abselet for Injunction 706 before Judge John F. Walter: The Court finds that Plaintiff is entitled to the Preliminary Injunction. Counsel shall submit a revised proposed order not later than 5/27/2016. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (jp)
October 19, 2015 609 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge John F. Walter as follows: Judgment Debtors, and their respective agents and representatives, SHALL BE AND ARE PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED. (jp)
August 27, 2015 574 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Stipulation for Protective Order 573 . [See Order for details.] (san)
August 10, 2012 477 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Judgment is hereby awarded in favor of Plaintiff Abselet and against Defendants Alliance Lending Group, Inc., Solyman Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yasho uafar, jointly and severally, as follows: (1) in the sum of $5,986,580.20 with interest at the rate set forth below commecing on June 9, 2012, plus attorneys' fees and costs in the additional sum of $800,000.00, plus interest on that a mount at the rate as set forth below commencing 6/27/2012. (2) Said Defendants are further ordered to pay to Plaintiff Abselet the additional sum of $4,520.00 as attorneys' fees for the cost of the Motion to Enforce the Settlement; (3) Interest on all of said sums shall accrue at the rate of 6% per annum simple interest until paid in full. (See attached Judgment for further details). (jp)
June 27, 2012 467 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter (see attached Amended Judgment for further details). Based on the stipulation of Plaintiff Abselet, Nourmand and the Borrower Defendants, Plaintiff Abselet is the prevailing party as against the Borrower Defen dants, and the Borrower Defendants shall pay Abselet $450,000.00 as costs and attorneys fees provided that if any of the Borrower Defendants defaults on any of their obligations to Plaintiff Abselet under the terms of their Settlement Agreement with him, that amount shall increase to $800,000.00; Malibu's Third Party Complaint against LPS was by stipulation dismissed without prejudice. Malibu shall take nothing by way of its Third Party Complaint against LPS. (jp)
June 26, 2012 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN*** SEE TEXT ENTRY BELOW - DE 461***** 6/26/2012 (sr).
April 11, 2012 363 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: The following of Plaintiff Abselet's Claims were by stipulation dismissed without prejudice against Alliance, S-Yashouafar and M-Yashouafar. Defendants, Plainti ff Abselet is the prevailing party as against the Borrower Defendants, and the Borrower Defendants shall pay Abselet $__ as costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff Abselet shall take nothing else by way of his Second Amended Complaint (see attached Judgment for further details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard L Abselet v. Alliance Lending Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L Abselet
Represented By: Rebecca J Edelson
Represented By: Michael N Jones
Represented By: Mark A Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Lending Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malibu Reconveyance, LLC
Represented By: John Clark Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamid Nourmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamid Joseph Nourmand
Represented By: Frank W Nemecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soda Partners, LLC
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Nuys Plywood, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massoud Aaron Yashouafar
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solyman Yashouafar
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?