Camelot Distribution Group, Inc. v. Does Featured Case

Plaintiff: Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.
Defendant: Does
Movant: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Incentive Capital, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01949
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Referring Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2011 Filing 32 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal) (sch)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Dean D. Pregerson re Notice of Withdrawl 29 . THE COURT ORDERS that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sch)
June 17, 2011 Filing 30 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: At the request of the moving party, the MOTION TO INTERVENE (FILED ON 05-05-11) 17 is hereby VACATED. (lc)
June 10, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Movant Incentive Capital, LLC. correcting Notice of Withdrawal 28 Notice of Errata re Watermark on Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene and Consent to Plaintiff's Dismissal without Prejudice (Isaacs, Bruce)
June 10, 2011 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene 17 filed by Intervenor Incentive Capital, LLC. (Isaacs, Bruce)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED BY MOVANT INCENTIVE CAPITAL, LLC. 17 (FILED ON 05-05-11) set for June 13, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (sch)
June 1, 2011 Filing 26 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Movant Electronic Frontier Foundation. RE: Order on Motion for Hearing re Discovery Matter,,,,, 15 . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Seth Schoen, # 2 Exhibit A to Schoen Declaration)(McSherry, Corynne)
May 24, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 24 . The following error(s) was found:pdf is a voluntary dismissal, however there is a pending motion to intervene on Judges calendar. Format is not applicable, requires a proposed order which was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 23, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. (Hervey, Scott)
May 13, 2011 Filing 23 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear motion date with court clerk prior to filing the motion. Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 AM. The Court requires two non-blue backed courtesy copies of only the following manual and electronic filed documents: (1) All noticed motions and related documents; and (2) All ex parte applications and related documents (3) all exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Court's General Order No. 10-07 regarding ECF Courtesy Paper Copies and re location of Chambers Email address] (lc)
May 13, 2011 Filing 22 OPPOSITION Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser in Support of Order to Show Cause)(Hervey, Scott)
May 5, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by movant Incentive Capital, LLC. Related Case(s): CV 11-2323 GAF(JEMx) (lc)
May 5, 2011 Filing 20 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by movant Incentive Capital, LLC.. (lc) (lc).
May 5, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by movant Incentive Capital, LLC, identifying Other Affiliate James Mecham, Other Affiliate Patrick Hansen for Incentive Capital, LLC. (lc) (lc).
May 5, 2011 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Joseph G Pia in support MOTION to Intervene 17 ; exhibit 1(proposed complaint in intervention filed by Movant Incentive Capital, LLC. (lc) (lc).
May 5, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene; memorandum of points and authorities in support filed by Movant Incentive Capital, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc) (lc).
April 29, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Corynne M McSherry, Matthew Zimmerman on behalf of Movant Electronic Frontier Foundation (lc)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and ORDER APPOINTING AMICUS COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: On or before May 13, 2011, plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc. ("plaintiff") shall show cause why the Doe defendants should not be severed and/or dismissed from this action based on improper joinder of parties or lack of personal jurisdiction. In particular, plaintiff shall attempt to show such cause in writing by filing a Response to Order to Show Cause ("Response") that addresses the following issues. Plaintiff's Response shall not exceed twenty (20) pages in length. The Electronic Frontier Foundation is hereby appointed as Amicus Counsel in connection with proceedings related to the instant Order to Show Cause. No later than April 29, 2011, Amicus Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance. Amicus Counsel shall file a Reply to plaintiff's Response ("Reply") no later than June 3, 2011. The Reply shall not exceed twenty (20) pages in length. Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery (Document No. 11 ) and the hearing on the Motion, currently scheduled for April 27, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., are hereby vacated pending a ruling on the instant Order to Show Cause. (mr)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery is continued from April 20, 2011, to April 27, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom F of the Spring Street Courthouse. (mr)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery is continued from April 13, 2011, to April 20, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom F of the Spring Street Courthouse. (mr)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: On the court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED THAT the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery is continued from March 30, 2011, to April 13, 2011. (mr)
March 18, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A - Plamondon Decl., # 4 Exhibit B - Plamondon Decl., # 5 Exhibit C - Plamondon Decl., # 6 Proposed Order)(Plamondon, Scott)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery (Document No. 5 ) is denied without prejudice. (mr)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time for a Hearing on Motion to Expedite Discovery (Document No. 6 ) is denied. A decision on the Motion for Expedited Discovery will follow. (mr)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. The Court requires delivery of two non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies of only the following manual and electronically filed documents: (1) All noticed motions and related documents; (2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Court's General Order No. 08-02 regarding ECF Courtesy Paper Copies.] (sch)
March 11, 2011 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. (Plamondon, Scott)
March 10, 2011 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 3/16/11 of Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Plamondon, Scott)
March 10, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum ISO Motion to Expedite Discovery, # 2 Declaration Scott Plamondon, # 3 Proposed Order)(Plamondon, Scott)
March 7, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO-121) (ghap)
March 7, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
March 7, 2011 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE AND CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Parties filed by Plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc. (ghap) (ds).
March 7, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Does 1 Through 5865, inclusive. (ghap)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1 Through 5865,inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.(ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2011: # 1 Notice of Assignment) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camelot Distribution Group, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camelot Distribution Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M Hervey
Represented By: Scott M Plamondon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Corynne M McSherry
Represented By: Matthew J Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Incentive Capital, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?