Southern California Darts Association v. Southern California Darts Association Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Southern California Darts Association
Defendant: Does, Southern California Darts Association Inc and Dino M Zaffina
Case Number: 2:2012cv01899
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Gandhi
Presiding Judge: R. Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2012 Filing 55 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 12-55951 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 54 as to Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (dmap)
May 22, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 51 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-10409998 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Order)(Racine, Robert)
May 21, 2012 Filing 53 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction; Request for Sanctions 44 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Kawahito, # 2 Declaration of Marissa Weltmer, # 3 Proof of Service)(Kawahito, James)
May 21, 2012 Filing 52 REPLY Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 42 filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. (Racine, Robert)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION 31 TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. For the reasons stated in the Court's order, defendants' motions are denied. (vdr)
May 17, 2012 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE re MOTION to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction; Request for Sanctions 44 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Kawahito, James)
May 14, 2012 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction; Request for Sanctions 44 filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. (Racine, Robert)
May 14, 2012 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction; Request for Sanctions 44 filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (Racine, Robert)
May 14, 2012 Filing 47 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 42 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. David Irete, # 2 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Dino M. Zaffina's Motion for Reconsideration, # 3 Proof of Service)(Kawahito, James)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DENIED ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Continue 43 . (vdr)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner RE: Motion 31 to Dismiss Case. The 5/14/2012 hearing is taken under submission and off the motion calendar. (vdr)
May 7, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction; Request for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of James K. Kawahito, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kawahito, James)
May 4, 2012 Filing 43 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from May 14, 2012 to June 4, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kawahito, James)
May 2, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Proof of Service)(Racine, Robert)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 38 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. May 28 is a Court holiday; (shb)
May 1, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 38 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rne)
May 1, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of address by Robert E Racine attorney for Defendant Dino M Zaffina. Changing attorneys address to 3250 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1510, Los Angeles, CA 90010. Filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. (Racine, Robert)
April 30, 2012 Filing 38 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-106 DATED 5/1/2012] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. Motion set for hearing on 5/28/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Proof of Service)(Racine, Robert) Modified on 5/1/2012 (shb).
April 30, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of address by Robert E Racine attorney for Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. Changing attorneys address to 3150 Montrose Blvd., Suite 100, La Cresenta, CA 91214. Filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (Racine, Robert)
April 30, 2012 Filing 36 REPLY in support Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (Racine, Robert)
April 23, 2012 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration OF JAMES KAWAHITO, # 3 Declaration OF NAOMI STRAUS, # 4 Proposed Order DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, # 5 Proposed Order DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Kawahito, James)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (rne)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 8 . The above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on April 16, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's motion 31 to dismiss case is continued to 5/14/2012 at 9:00 AM. (vdr)
April 6, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Joinder)(Racine, Robert)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2012 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (rne)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answers 27 and 28 , for the following reasons: incorrect document attached to the docket entry. (vdr)
April 4, 2012 Filing 28 [DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 Decl. DMZ with Exh 1-3 filed by defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc.(Racine, Robert) Modified on 4/5/2012 (vdr).
April 4, 2012 Filing 27 [DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 Motion to Dismiss and Strike filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Joinder)(Racine, Robert) Modified on 4/5/2012 (vdr).
April 2, 2012 Filing 26 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Opposition.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and 13 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Kawahito, James)
April 2, 2012 Filing 25 Objections In Opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Opposition.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and 13 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Kawahito, James)
April 2, 2012 Filing 24 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Re Trademark Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend 8 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. David Irete (Supplemental), # 2 Proof of Service)(Kawahito, James)
March 28, 2012 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Southern California Darts Association, a California Corporation - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kawahito, James)
March 28, 2012 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dino M. Zaffina, an Individual - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kawahito, James)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Clerk of Court: The documents are stricken. RE: Notice (Other) 11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) 9 , 10 (shb)
March 27, 2012 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction, Declaration of Dino Zafina insupport, etc 14 , 21 mailed to James Kawahito on 3/26/12 filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (lom)
March 27, 2012 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina, identifying Other Affiliates Ronald W Tuttle, Paul A Roush, Douglas W Babbitt, Todd M Zebert, Harvey M Fischer, Barry J Houghton, Evan R Hughes, Milan Sabata, Zachary Justman, Peter Greystoke, Jim Maher, Eric Zarlenga, Brian C Brake, L David Irete, Michael A Zuk, Esq for William F Lynch, David L Ingram, Esq for Simran R Kumar. (lom)
March 27, 2012 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT of the Preliminary Injunction 8 ; filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (mg)
March 27, 2012 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 8 ; filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (mg)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION 13 , for the following reasons: incorrect document attached to entry. (vdr)
March 26, 2012 Filing 15 JOINDER in MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Opposition.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and 13 filed by Defendant Dino M Zaffina. (Racine, Robert)
March 26, 2012 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Dino M. Zaffina Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Opposition.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and 13 filed by Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Racine, Robert)
March 26, 2012 Filing 13 [DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Opposition. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Racine, Robert) Modified on 3/27/2012 (vdr).
March 26, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) 9 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) 10 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer information incomplete (see L.R. 11-3.8). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rne)
March 23, 2012 Filing 11 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-112B DATED 3/28/2012] - NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Newly Assigned Cases filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (Kawahito, James) Modified on 3/28/2012 (shb).
March 23, 2012 Filing 10 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-112B DATED 3/28/2012] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association, upon Defendant Southern California Darts Association Inc served on 3/15/2012, answer due 4/5/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Southern California Darts Association, a California Corporation - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kawahito, James) Modified on 3/28/2012 (shb).
March 23, 2012 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-112B DATED 3/28/2012] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association, upon Defendant Dino M Zaffina served on 3/15/2012, answer due 4/5/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dino M. Zaffina, an Individual - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kawahito, James) Modified on 3/28/2012 (shb).
March 19, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Re Trademark Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by PLAINTIFF Southern California Darts Association. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Naomi Straus, # 3 Declaration of Matthew Canale, # 4 Declaration of L. David Irete, # 5 Exhibit of L. David Irete (Part 1 of 4), # 6 Exhibit of L. David Irete (Part 2 of 4), # 7 Exhibit of L. David Irete (Part 3 of 4), # 8 Exhibit of L. David Irete (Part 4 of 4), # 9 Appendix, # 10 Proposed Order, # 11 Proof of Service)(Kawahito, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 7 PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 3/9/12: initiating documents. (mg)
March 9, 2012 Filing 6 PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 3/9/12: initiating documents. (mg)
March 9, 2012 Filing 5 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 3/9/12 addressed to jkawahito@kswlawyers.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (mg)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (rne)
March 6, 2012 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Southern California Darts Association. (et)
March 6, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association. (et) (mg).
March 6, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Southern California Darts Association Inc, Dino M Zaffina. (et)
March 6, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Southern California Darts Association Inc, Dino M Zaffina.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Southern California Darts Association.(et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Darts Association v. Southern California Darts Association Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Darts Association Inc
Represented By: Robert E Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino M Zaffina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Darts Association
Represented By: James K Kawahito
Represented By: Robert E Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?