Hector Montano v. Bonnie Brae Convalescent Hospital Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Hector Montano |
Defendant: |
Bonnie Brae Convalescent Hospital Inc and Does |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv03462 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Dolly M. Gee |
Presiding Judge: |
Alicia G. Rosenberg |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Accommodations |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
98
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Pursuant to the Court's Order Re: Pending Motion, filed contemporaneously with the filing of this Judgment, IT IS ADJUDGED that defendant Bonnie Brae Convalescent Hospital, Inc. shall pay plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $173,158.90 and costs in the amount of $1,812.00. (gk)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
94
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
|
July 24, 2015 |
Filing
92
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant shall, on or before 8/10/2015, show cause in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed for defendant's failure to comply with the Judgment issued by this court on 1/12/2015 82 . Failure to timely file such a declaration or to show cause as ordered will result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with the Judgment. (cw).
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
82
JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Judge Fernando M. Olguin in favor of Montano and against Bonnie Brae on Montano's claims that Bonnie Brae discriminated against Montano on the basis of his disability in violation of the FHA, FEHA, U nruh Civil Rights Act, CDPA, Rehabilitation Act, and California Business and Professions Code Section 17200; Bonnie Brae is ordered to pay Montano damages under the FHA, FEHA, and Unruh Civil Rights Act, in the amount of $65,000, with interest t o accrue at the legal rate from 1/7/2015; Bonnie Brae is ordered to pay Montano punitive damages in the additional amount of $10,000 on his claims of violations of the FHA and FEHA. (SEE ATTACHMENT JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
|
January 7, 2015 |
Filing
81
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The parties shall forthwith meet and confer regarding a proposed judgment, which plaintiff shall lodge no later than 1/12/2015. (vdr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?