Novalogic Inc v. Activision Blizzard et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Novalogic Inc
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Activision Publishing, Does, Microsoft Corporation, Penguin Group USA Inc and Voyetra Turtle Beach Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv04011
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2012 6 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 5/11/12 addressed to tgirardi@girardikeese.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (ds)
May 10, 2012 5 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Counsel are ORDERED to deliver 2 copies of all documents filed electronically in this action to Chambers. For each document filed electronically, one copy shall be marked CHAMBERS COPY and the other copy shall be marked COURTESY COPY. (kbr)
May 8, 2012 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 8, 2012 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO-120) (et)
May 8, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Novalogic Inc. (et)
May 8, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Activision Blizzard, Activision Publishing, Does 1 through 10, Microsoft Corporation, Penguin Group USA Inc, Voyetra Turtle Beach Inc. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Novalogic Inc. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: # 3 Notice of Assignment) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novalogic Inc v. Activision Blizzard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Karin G Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Publishing
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Karin G Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Karin G Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group USA Inc
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Karin G Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyetra Turtle Beach Inc
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Karin G Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novalogic Inc
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Milord A Keshishian
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Represented By: Howard B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?